Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., et a1. v. Timothy Woo
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-03329-BMC-LB
District Judge Brian M. Cogan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 9:32 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ciara M., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Corey Scott Stark +1 212 687 8200 +1 212 697 2521 cstark@dwecklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael G. O'Neill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Gerard O'Neill +1 212 581 0990 +1 212 581 5897 darrow@oneillaw.com
No Logo Elizabeth F., Plaintiff
No Logo Emmanuel F., Plaintiff
No Logo Kiam F., Plaintiff
No Logo Nathaniel S., Plaintiff
No Logo Sonny B. S. Jr., Plaintiff
No Logo Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evans J. Carter, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. +1 917 935 8168 sbs2012@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Kfirm Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian King +1 202 251 2121 bk@kfirmllp.com
No Logo Venus S., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Michael G. O'Neill

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Nathaniel Solomon +1 212 581 0990 +1 212 581 5897 aarsolo@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Administration For Children Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Janice Casey Silverberg +1 212 788 8119 +1 212 788 0877 jsilverb@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Arnold Elman, Defendant
No Logo Arthur Zanko, Defendant
No Logo Cadija R. Tibbs, Defendant
No Logo Carolyn Lumpkin, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin John Bowe, Jr +1 212 788 0878 +1 212 788 0940 mbowe@law.nyc.gov
Space Janice Casey Silverberg +1 212 788 8119 +1 212 788 0877 jsilverb@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Manhattan Trial Unit

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa Crotty +1 212 788 3000

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Madonna Marie Kasbohn +1 212 788 0951 +1 212 788 0940 dkasbohm@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Corporation Counsel for the City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Cyprian Belle, Defendant
No Logo Cyril E. Jermin, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Turbow, Defendant
No Logo Edwin Gould For Children Services Inc., Defendant
No Logo Esq. Estajo Koslow, Defendant
No Logo Esq. Marc Berk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MORGAN, MELHUISH & ABRUTYN, ESQS.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erin Anne O'Leary +1 212 809 1111 eoleary@morganlawfirm.com
No Logo Esq. Richard Colodny, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ira L. Eras

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira L. Eras +1 718 875 9264
No Logo Esq. Susan Jalowski, Defendant
No Logo Fred Levitan, Defendant
No Logo GERALD HARRIS, Defendant
No Logo Hattie L. Lucas, Defendant
No Logo Jennifer Jones Austin, Defendant
No Logo JOHN AND JANE DOE 1 TO 10, Defendant
Officially listed as "John and Jane Doe"
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Lauria, Defendant
No Logo Michael A. Ambrosio, Defendant
No Logo Michael Hess, Defendant
No Logo Molly Dieterich, Defendant
No Logo Mr. F. Balon, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Ted Marrinaro, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Timothy Woo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Theresa Crotty +1 212 788 8703 +1 212 788 0940 tcrotty@law.nyc.gov
Space Andrew James Rauchberg +1 212 788 0889 +1 212 788 0940 arauchbe@law.nyc.gov
Space Mark Galen Toews +1 718 222 2038 +1 718 222 2088 mtoews@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk +1 212 788 1165 +1 212 788 0940 ckruk@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Ms. Akhazeti, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Duran, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Giakas, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Alana Kay Gore, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Benedict Peirce, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph H. Farrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Farrell
No Logo Ms. Corlora Turnquest, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Joyce Baldwin, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Teressa Hardgrove, Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Scoppetta, Defendant
No Logo Philip C. Segal, Defendant
No Logo Regina Davis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Regina Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Davis
No Logo Ronald Bateau, Defendant
Giuliani, Rudolph Giuliani, Rudolph, Defendant
Officially listed as "Rudolph W. Giuliani"

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Antoinette Wavene Blanchette +1 212 416 8595 +1 212 416 6075 antoinette.blanchette@ag.ny.gov
No Logo Saint Joseph For Children And Families Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Conwway, Farrell, Curtin & Kelly, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kristin G. Shea +1 212 785 2929 +1 212 785 7229 kshea@conwayfarrell.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph H. Farrell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph H. Farrell
No Logo Shakima Canty, Defendant
No Logo Viviane Demilly, Defendant
  Entries (500) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: 3/7/2017 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER re [406] STIPULATION and proposed Order of settlement and discontinuance of Plaintiffs' application for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses by Timothy Woo. Plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees is hereby resolved and withdrawn with prejudice. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/6/2017 ) (Guzzi, Roseann)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: 3/6/2017 stipulation
    STIPULATION and proposed Order of settlement and discontinuance of Plaintiffs' application for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: 3/2/2017 letter
      Letter reporting agreement re attys fees by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: 1/5/2017, Terminated: 1/5/2017 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
        MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion for attorneys' fees by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
          ORDER granting [404] Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline to file motion for attorneys' fees extended to 3/6/2017. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/5/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
            LREF
            Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
            ORDER granting [404] Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline to file motion for attorneys' fees extended to 3/6/2017. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/5/2017. (Weisberg, Peggy)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 USCA Mandate
              MANDATE of USCA as to [389] Notice of Appeal filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., [387] Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Woo, [393] Notice of Cross Appeal filed by Sonny B. S. Jr., Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., Kiam F., Elizabeth F., Nathaniel S., Venus S. It is Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 10/17/16. USCA Docket #14-3780(L); 14-3841(XAP) and 14-3961(XAP). (McGee, Mary Ann)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Order on Motion for attorney fees
                ORDER terminating [382] Motion for Attorney Fees; [392] Motion to Appoint Attorney ad Litem Award of GAL Fees and Motion for Attorney Fees. These motions are terminated for administrative purposes only, without prejudice to reinstatement upon letter request within 90 days of issuance of the Second Circuit's Mandate. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/28/2015. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014, Terminated: 10/17/2016 Appeal TranscriptCourt Filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT for dates of 2/24, 2/25, 2/26/2014, before Judge Cogan, re [387] Notice of Appeal Court Reporter/Transcriber Anthony D. Frisolone, Telephone number 718-613-2487. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 12/17/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/29/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2015. (Attachments: # (1) Transcript, # (2) Transcript) (Frisolone, Anthony)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: 11/21/2014 letter
                    Letter providing information for this afternoon's telephone argument by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank  Telephone Conference
                      Minute Entry and Order for telephone argument held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/21/14. Both sides present by telephone. Decision on defendant's request to defer ruling on motion for attorneys' fees reserved. See transcript for details. (Court reporter: Anthony Frisolone.) (Weisberg, Peggy)
                        LREF
                        Blank  Order
                        ORDER re [398]. The request to defer ruling on the attorneys' fee application is granted on the condition that should the children seek to expedite the appeal, defendant will not oppose that request and will not seek any extension of his time to file any submissions on the appeal. Efficiencies suggest that the matter should be resolved after all fees that will be incurred have been incurred. The Court intends to rule promptly on the fee application if it remains outstanding once the appeal has been resolved. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/21/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                          LREF
                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone argument will be held on 11/21/2014 at 2:15 PM on defendant's [398] letter request to hold fee applications in abeyance. Defendant's counsel is directed to arrange and initiate the call and then conference in Chambers at 718-613-2230. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 11/12/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: 11/11/2014 letter
                            Letter response concerning fees application by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: 11/10/2014 letter
                              Letter Regarding Woo's Motion for Stay by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/6/2014, Entered: 11/6/2014 letter
                                Letter requesting that Plaintiff Children's fees application be held in abeyance by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                  Third Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. [393] Notice of Cross Appeal (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3-6-2014, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number (718)613-2644. Email address: LisaSchmidCCR>RMR@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2015. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3-5-2014, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number (718)613-2644. Email address: LisaSchmidCCR>RMR@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2015. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 10/23/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 3-4-2014, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number (718)613-2644. Email address: LisaSchmidCCR.RMR@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/13/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/21/2015. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014, Terminated: 10/17/2016 USCA Appeal Fees
                                          USCA Appeal Fees received $ 505.00 receipt number 4653080303 re [387] Notice of Appeal filed by Timothy Woo. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014, Terminated: 10/17/2016 Notice of cross-appeal
                                            NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL as to [380] Clerk's Judgment, by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Sonny B. Southerland, Sr, Venus S.. (Solomon, Aaron)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                              Second Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. [387] Notice of Appeal [394] Receipt of payment for Notice of Appeal. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014, Terminated: 9/28/2015 Motion to Appoint Guardian/Attorney ad Litem
                                                MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem Award of GAL Fees, MOTION for Attorney Fees by Ciara M., Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Exhibit) (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Memorandum In Support
                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support re [382] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement Papers and Guardian Ad Litem Application filed by Ciara M., Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 10/14/2014, Entered: 10/14/2014 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [382] MOTION for Attorney Fees MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement Papers and Guardian Ad Litem Application filed by Ciara M., Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                      First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. [389] Notice of Appeal (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                        Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. [387] Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/10/2014 Notice of appeal
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [381] Memorandum & Opinion, [380] Clerk's Judgment, [383] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. No fee paid. Service done electronically. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/9/2014 letter
                                                            Letter to the Court from Sonny B. Southerland, updating the mailing address as follows: 52 South Street, Staten Island, NY 10310. Docket sheet updated. (Fernandez, Erica)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 10/8/2014, Entered: 10/8/2014, Terminated: 10/17/2016 Notice of appeal
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [380] Clerk's Judgment, by Timothy Woo. (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Mail returned
                                                                Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (copy of Amended Memorandum and Decision dated 9/10/14 and Memorandum and Decision dated 9/9/14) Returned. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Mail returnedCourt Filing
                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Judge Cogan's Order of 9/23/14) returned; person not at address/office. (Guzzi, Roseann)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Mail returned
                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re [380]. Judgment sent to Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., 50 Court Street, Suite 702, Brooklyn, NY 11201. Returned with postal notations: "Return to Sender," "Not Deliverable as Addressed," "Unable to Forward." (Barrett, C)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: 9/26/2014 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER granting [382] MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement Papers and Guardian Ad Litem Application. Mr. O'Neill may supplement his motion, and Ms. Weber may file her motion, by 10/14/14. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/23/2014. C/M by Chambers. (Barrett, C)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014, Terminated: 9/28/2015 Motion for attorney fees
                                                                        MOTION for Attorney Fees , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplement Papers and Guardian Ad Litem Application by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                          AMENDED MEMORANDUM DECISION re [379] Memorandum Decision. Upon the verdict of the jury and this decision, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment against defendant in the amount of $10,000 in favor of plaintiff Sonny Southerland, Sr., and $75,000 each in favor of plaintiffs Sonny Southerland Jr., Venus Southerland, Nathaniel Southerland, Kiam Felix, and Elizabeth Felix. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/10/2014. C/M by Chambers. (Barrett, C)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 clerk's judgment
                                                                            CLERK'S JUDGMENT against defendant in the amount of $10,000 in favor of plaintiff Sonny Southerland, Sr., and $75,000 each in favor of plaintiffs Sonny Southerland Jr., Venus Southerland, Nathaniel Southerland, Kiam Felix, and Elizabeth Felix. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 9/9/2014. C/M (Clarke, Melonie) (Main Document 380 replaced on 9/9/2014) (Clarke, Melonie).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/9/2014 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                              MEMORANDUM DECISION. Upon the verdict of the jury and this decision, the Clerk is directed to enter judgment against defendant in the amount of $10,000 in favor of plaintiff Sonny Southerland, Sr., and $75,000 each in favor of plaintiffs Sonny Southerland Jr., Venus Southerland, Nathaniel Southerland, Kiam Felix, and Elizabeth Felix. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/9/2014. C/M by Chambers. (Barrett, C)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Reply in Opposition
                                                                                REPLY in Opposition Woo's Motion for Judgment As A Matter Of Law filed by Ciara M., Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: 4/25/2014 Reply in Support
                                                                                  REPLY in Support re [375] Trial Brief filed by Timothy Woo. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: 4/12/2014 Declaration
                                                                                    DECLARATION in support of post-trial brief by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 4/12/2014, Entered: 4/12/2014 Trial Brief
                                                                                      TRIAL BRIEF by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 4/11/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 Trial Brief
                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF Regarding Qualified Immunity by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: 4/10/2014 letter
                                                                                          Letter requesting additional pages for post-trial brief by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                            ORDER re [372] granting all sides 30 pages for post-trial moving and opposition briefs. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/10/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: 4/11/2014 letter
                                                                                              Letter dated 4/9/2014 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., to USDJ Cogan, requesting that Defendant Timothy Woo be denied qualified immunity. (Barrett, C)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                ORDER re [371] Letter requesting extension of time. Post-trial briefs due 4/11/2014, responses due 4/25/2014. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/1/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: 3/31/2014 letter
                                                                                                  Letter requesting extension of time for post-trial briefs by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank  Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                    ORDER terminating [351] Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement as ruled on during trial. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/9/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/7/2014 Mail returned
                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. The [354] Minute Entry sent to Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., 50 Court Street, Suite 702, Brooklyn, NY 11201, was returned w/postal notations: Return to Sender. Attempted - Not known. Unable to forward. (Barrett, C)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 jury verdict
                                                                                                        SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: 3/6/2014 jury verdict
                                                                                                          JURY VERDICT FORM (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                            ORDER OF SUSTENANCE: It is hereby ordered that the Marshal supply proper sustenance to the Seven (7) jurors empaneled in the above entitled action. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/6/2014. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial Completed
                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 3/6/2014 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations completed. Verdict returned in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant. Jurors polled and excused. The Court set the following schedule for briefing on qualified immunity: parties' briefs due 4/4/2014; responses due 4/18. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                ORDER OF SUSTENANCE: It is hereby ordered that the Marshal supply proper sustenance to the Seven (7) jurors empaneled in the above entitled action. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/5/2014. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 3/5/2014 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Closing Arguments. Jury charged. Deliberations begun and will continue 3/6/2014 at 9:30 AM.(Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 3/4/2014 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Defense rests. A Charging Conference will be held on 3/5/2014 at 9:30 AM followed by trial to continue at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South.(Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 letter
                                                                                                                      Letter in response to PL children's 3-3 letter by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: 3/3/2014 letter
                                                                                                                        Letter Regarding Jury Instructions, Verdict Sheets, etc. by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Court has made revisions to its Proposed Jury Charge and Special Interrogatories from the drafts distributed to the parties on Wednesday, 2/26/2014. The parties can pick up the Court's Revised Proposed Instructions or it can be emailed to you by request. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/3/2014. The parties also notified by telephone. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: 2/28/2014 letter
                                                                                                                            Letter re Court's Proposed Jury Charge and Special Interrogatories by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                              RESCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial is rescheduled to continue on 3/4/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/28/2014. Jurors notified (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: 2/27/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                Letter concerning Plaintiff children's proposed instruction and the Court's proposed jury charge and special interrogatories by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: For reasons known to the parties, the Court is unable to proceed with the trial today. Trial is continued to 3/3/14 at 9:30 a.m. Jurors will be separately notified. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/27/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: 2/26/2014 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by Elizabeth F., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (Solomon, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 2/26/2014 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Plaintiff Southerland rests. Plaintiff children rests. Jury Trial continued to 2/27/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 2/25/2014 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial cont'd to 2/26/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South.(Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/25/2014 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Jury Selection held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Counsel Present; Case Called; Jury Selection held on 2/24/2014; Jury Trial to Begin on 2/24/2014 after jury selection. Appearances for Plaintiffs: Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., pro se; and Michael O'Neill, Esq. Appearances for Defendant: Andrew Rauchberg, Assistant Corporation Counsel; Carolyn Kruk, Assistant Corporation Counsel. (Court Reporter: Nicole Canales.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) Modified.
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                            Letter Regarding Curative Instruction by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                              Letter proposing curative instruction and concerning video by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying [358] Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. King is not qualified to practice in this Court. The motion for pro hac vice admission is therefore denied. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/24/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: 2/24/2014, Terminated: 2/24/2014 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6748396. by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support, # (2) Proposed Order, # (3) Cert. of Good Standing) (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Jury Trial Begun
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 2/24/2014 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Opening Statements. Jury Trial continued to 2/25/2014 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re: [357] defendant's letter. The Court declines to order Mr. O'Neill to identify all witnesses that the Plaintiff Children intend to call to the stand on Monday and Tuesday of next week and in what order, but notes that Mr. O'Neill should give some notice to defendant re: his witnesses to ensure that they will be present at trial when Mr. O'Neill wants to call them. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/21/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                        Letter requesting identification and order of witnesses to be called by Plaintiff Children by Timothy Woo (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Galen Toews on behalf of Timothy Woo (aty to be noticed) (Toews, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: 2/20/2014 letter
                                                                                                                                                            Letter requesting a pretrial conference by Timothy Woo (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re [355] Letter filed by Timothy Woo. Defendant's request for yet another pretrial conference, made one day before trial, is denied. The request for bifurcation, also made one day before trial, is denied. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 2/20/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: 2/18/2014 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry and Order. This case came before the Court on January 24, 2014 on defendants motion to amend the joint pretrial order. The Court granted the motion in part and denied the motion in part. Jury selection and trial was adjourned to February 24, 2014. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Lisa Schwam.) C/M by Chambers. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: 2/14/2014 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support re [351] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Exhibit List, Confirm Additions to Witness List, and Reminder to Plaintiffs re Scope of Evidence filed by Timothy Woo. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Section 1027 of the New York Family Court Act (in 1997 and today)) (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [351] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Exhibit List, Confirm Additions to Witness List, and Reminder to Plaintiffs re Scope of Evidence filed by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: 2/13/2014, Terminated: 3/9/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Exhibit List, Confirm Additions to Witness List, and Reminder to Plaintiffs re Scope of Evidence by Timothy Woo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit May 12 1997 Letter from Ms Joan Ewing, # (2) Exhibit Five sets of printouts from the NYS Unified Court System Universal Case Management System) (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Telephone Conference
                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry and Order for telephone hearing on 2/11/2014. The parties called the Court from a deposition with a dispute and the Court ruled on it. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/23/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition to [346] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Defendant's prior pre-trial submissions filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Barrett, C)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support re [346] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Defendant's prior pre-trial submissions filed by Timothy Woo. (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [346] MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Defendant's prior pre-trial submissions filed by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: 1/22/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron N Solomon on behalf of Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (aty to be noticed) (Solomon, Aaron)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order Setting Hearing on Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion [346] to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8D South before Judge Brian M. Cogan. The hearing will be canceled if plaintiffs advise the Court that they do not oppose the motion. Mr. O'Neill will please notify whichever plaintiffs he does not represent. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/22/2014. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014, Terminated: 2/18/2014 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Defendant's prior pre-trial submissions by Timothy Woo. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Supplemental Exhibit A, # (2) Proposed Supplemental Exhibit B, # (3) Proposed Supplemental Exhibit C) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: 1/21/2014 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. O'Neill on behalf of Nathaniel S. (notification declined or already on case) (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: 1/7/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Jury selection in this matter shall begin promptly at 8:45 a.m. on 1/27/ 2014, in Courtroom 11A South. Trial shall commence immediately thereafter before the Honorable Brian M. Cogan in Courtroom 8D South. Trial will proceed daily from 9:30 a.m. to 4:30 p.m., except on 1/31/2014. The parties are hereby warned that the Court shall dismiss or default the claims or defense of any party that does not timely appear for jury selection at 8:45 a.m. on 1/27/2014, or for any part of the trial thereafter. Nathaniel Southerland, who recently relieved Mr. O'Neill as his counsel, and Sonny B. Southerland, who discharged his attorney, shall be prepared to represent themselves at trial. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 1/7/2014. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER. Jury selection scheduled for 1/27/2014 is referred to Magistrate Judge Bloom. Mr. O'Neill is directed to deliver a copy of this Order to Nathaniel Southerland and to file a letter indicating that he has done so. Chambers will mail a copy of this ECF Order to plaintiff Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/7/2014. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 12/21/2013, Entered: 12/21/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Regarding Service of Order on Nathaniel Southerland Sr. by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Sonny B. Southerland, Sr, Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [342] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney with respect to Nathaniel Southerland only. Given that Nathaniel Southerland has stated that he no longer wants Mr. O'Neill to represent him, Mr. O'Neill is relieved as counsel for plaintiff Nathaniel Southerland only. Within 7 days of receipt of this Order, plaintiff Nathaniel Southerland shall inform the Court as to whether he has found new counsel or whether he intends to proceed pro se. Plaintiff Nathaniel Southerland is reminded that trial is set to begin on 1/27/14. Mr. O'Neill is directed to deliver a copy of this Order to Nathaniel Southerland and to file a letter indicating that he has done so. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/12/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: 12/10/2013, Terminated: 12/12/2013 Motion to withdraw as attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney With Respect to Nathaniel Southerland only by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: 11/21/2013 Order on Motion to ProduceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Plaintiff Sonny B. Southerland requests a copy of the pre-trial and trial transcripts in this matter. Court reporters typically charge and collect fees for transcripts requested by the parties. Moreover, other than in criminal matters and certain other matters designated by statute, there is no right to a free transcript. Plaintiff's [339] request is therefore denied. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 11/20/2013. C/mailed to Plaintiff Sonny B. Southerland. (See document for details.) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: 11/19/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6/3/2013 to 6/7/2013, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber ANTHONY D. FRISOLONE, Telephone number 718 613 2487. Email address: AFrisolone@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/10/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/20/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/17/2014. (Attachments: # (1) Transcript, # (2) Transcript, # (3) Transcript, # (4) T) (Frisolone, Anthony)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013, Terminated: 11/20/2013 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Produce Transcripts by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/14/2013, Entered: 11/14/2013 NOTICE of Change of Address/Firm/Email
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address (docket sheet updated) by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: 11/4/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: In light of Judge Cogan's [335] Order relieving Mr. King as counsel, plaintiff shall file a letter stating his current address by 11/15/2013. It is plaintiff's obligation to keep the Court informed of his current address for the duration of this action. If plaintiff fails to keep the Court informed of his address, the Court will have no way to contact plaintiff and his case shall be dismissed. Moreover, any request regarding transcripts shall be made to the Court in writing on notice to the other parties. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 11/1/2013. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Regarding Service of Order on Sonny Southerland Sr. by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 10/31/2013, Entered: 10/31/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER. Attorney Brian King terminated. See attached order for further details. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/30/2013. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: 10/30/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Regarding Service of Order on Sonny Southerland Sr. by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. Southerland, Sr, Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: 10/29/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Regarding Bifurcation Issue by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: 10/28/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter in response to the Court's 10-21 Order by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: 10/24/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. Chambers has received a voicemail message from plaintiff Southerland this morning advising that last week, Mr. King was terminated as his counsel and that Mr. Southerland intends to proceed pro se, and requesting transcripts. The matter is ambiguous since Mr. King appeared at a status conference yesterday and did not say anything about this. Since terminations of counsel must be by written submission, Mr. Southerland is directed to confirm his advice to the Court in writing, if indeed he is sure that this is what he wishes to do, and Mr. King is Ordered to Show Cause by 10/29/13 if there is any reason he should not be relieved as Mr. Southerland's counsel. Because of the Court's uncertainty about communications between Mr. King and his client, both Mr. King and Mr. O'Neil are directed to deliver a copy of this Order to Mr. Southerland (Mr. O'Neil may arrange such delivery through his clients) and to file letters indicating that they have done so. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/22/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: 10/21/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Carolyn Elizabeth Kruk on behalf of Timothy Woo (aty to be noticed) (Kruk, Carolyn)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry and Order for Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/21/13. All parties present. Any party wishing to be heard on the issue of severing the trial of plaintiffs' claims should submit a letter by 10/28/13. The letter should also address the party's view on any collateral estoppel issues that may arise if the claims are severed. Defendant may additionally brief the issue of the admissibility of the Second Department's affirmance of the missing Family Court Order. Trial is set to begin on 1/27/14. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Lisa Schmid.) (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of LawCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [310] Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law. See attached decision. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/10/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: 10/10/2013 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [310] Notice of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(B) filed by Timothy Woo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Additional transcript pages cited in reply memorandum) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: 10/9/2013 Reply in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY in Support Memorandum in Further Support of Defendant's Motion Pursuant to Rule 50(b) filed by Timothy Woo. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 Order on Motion for TROCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying [322] Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. See attached Decision and Order. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/3/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6-12-13, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number (718)613-2644. Email address: lisaschmidccr.rmr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2014. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 6-11-13, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number (718)613-2644. Email address: lisaschmidccr.rmr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2014. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: 10/3/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 061013, before Judge Brian Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schmid, Telephone number (718)613-2644. Email address: lisaschmidccr.rmr@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/24/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/1/2014. (Schmid, Lisa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: 10/2/2013, Terminated: 10/3/2013 Motion for TRO
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Elizabeth F., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Sonny B. Southerland, Sr, Venus S.. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support) (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: 10/1/2013, Terminated: 10/1/2013 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Timothy Woo. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [321] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's reply in further support of motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(b) due by 10/9/2013. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 10/1/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Set/Reset Hearing: Due to a change in the Court's schedule, the Status Conference previously set for 10/3/2013 is reset to 10/21/2013 at 2:15 PM in Courtroom 8D South. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [320] Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's reply in further support of motion for judgment as a matter of law pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 50(b) due by 10/2/2013. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/20/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: 9/19/2013, Terminated: 9/20/2013 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in further support of Defendant's motion for judgment pursuant to Rule 50(b) by Timothy Woo. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter re Temporary Restraining Order by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [319] Letter filed for TRO by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. Premotion conference is waived. Plaintiffs may file motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order in accordance with Rule 65. Defendant to respond within 24 hours of filing. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 9/16/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/9/2013, Entered: 9/9/2013 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [310] Notice of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(B) filed by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 Jury Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Jury Notes (Marziliano, August) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2013: # (1) SEALED COURT EXHIBIT 7) (Marziliano, August).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 316 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER directing the Clerk to file the notes received from the jury, which the Court had previously read to the parties during the trial, and which are the only records of jury deliberations of which the Court is aware.. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/16/2013. (Marziliano, August)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: 8/16/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Judge Brian M. Cogan from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. RE: request for clarification regarding why trial documents of the jury's deliberation are not public. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Status Conference on 10/3/2013 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/9/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 314 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: 7/24/2013, Terminated: 7/24/2013 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [310] Notice of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(B) by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/Reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [314] Motion for Extension of Time. Southerland children's opposition to defendant's Rule 50 motion due by 9/9/2013; defendant's reply due 9/23/2013. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/24/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 7/16/2013, Entered: 7/16/2013 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re [310] Notice of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(B) filed by Timothy Woo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - 6/3/13, # (2) Exhibit B - 6/4/13, # (3) Exhibit C - 6/5/13, # (4) Exhibit D - 6/6/13, # (5) Exhibit E - 6/7/13) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 312 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: 7/15/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re Transcripts and Woo's Rule 50 Motion by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to F.R.C.P 50(b) filed by Timothy Woo. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013, Terminated: 10/10/2013 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Notice of MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law pursuant to F.R.C.P. 50(B) by Timothy Woo. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: 7/10/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter pre-motion letter by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER re [309] Letter filed by Timothy Woo. Premotion conference is waived. This letter is deemed to constitute defendant's motion under Rule 50(b). Defendant may file any additional papers in support of the motion that he wishes. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/10/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: 7/9/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. The Court believes that transcription errors were made in the trial transcript and proposes the changes notated on the attached document be made. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/8/2013. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF SUSTENANCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/12/2013. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial Completed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/12/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations completed without resolution. The court has declared a mistrial. A new trial schedule will be set in the near future. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER OF SUSTENANCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/11/2013. (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/11/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Deliberations continued to 6/12/2013 at 9:30 AM. (Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/10/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Closing arguments. Jury charged. Deliberations begun and will continue 6/11/2013 at 9:30 AM.(Court Reporter Lisa Schmid.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: 6/9/2013, Terminated: 6/9/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION in Limine by Timothy Woo. (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: 6/9/2013, Terminated: 6/9/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine to limit closing argument by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/9/2013, Entered: 6/9/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Regarding jury instructions etc. by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re [306] [307] Motions in Limine. 1. No rebuttal summation for defendant. 2. The relevant date of the Family Court Order is for the jury and may be argued based on the evidence. 3. Defendant may not argue that any constitutional violation by him is excused because Balan ordered it, but he may argue that evidence of concurrence in or direction by other ACS workers -- to the extent such evidence was received without a hearsay objection or a request for a limiting instruction -- constitutes circumstantial evidence of the existence of emergency conditions. Plaintiffs cannot now raise a hearsay objection to evidence that was received without such an objection. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/9/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER re [304] Letter filed by Timothy Woo. Order of summation will be defendant first, followed by plaintiffs. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/9/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: 6/8/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: 6/8/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Brief regarding state of mind requirement for Section 1983 by Elizabeth F., Emmanuel F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: 6/8/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Regarding Order of Closing by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: 6/7/2013, Terminated: 6/7/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION in Limine Limiting Woo's Closing Argument by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  order on motion in limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for Charging Conference held on 6/7/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Motion in Limine [300] is granted in part and denied in part for reasons stated on the record. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/6/2013, Entered: 6/6/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/6/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Plaintiff Southerland rests. Defense rests. The charging conference scheduled for this afternoon at 3:30pm is adjourned to tomorrow, 6/7/13 at 3pm in Courtroom 8D South . Jury Trial cont'd to 6/10/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by Timothy Woo (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/5/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Plaintiffs children rest. Jury Trial cont'd to 6/6/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: 6/4/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Jury Instructions by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Jury Trial Held
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/4/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial cont'd to 6/5/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South. (Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 Jury SelectionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Jury Selection held on 6/3/2013. Trial to begin on 6/3/2013 after jury selection. (Court Reporter J. Johnson) (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 6/3/2013, Entered: 6/3/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re Preserving the Rights and Claims of the Southerland Children by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Jury Trial Begun
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for Jury Trial held on 6/3/2013 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. All parties present. Opening statements. Evidence entered; testimony heard. Jury Trial cont'd to 6/4/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8D South.(Court Reporter Anthony Frisolone.) (Clarke, Melonie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [293] MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Sgt. Christopher Aitola filed by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013, Terminated: 5/31/2013 motion to quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Quash Subpoena of Sgt. Christopher Aitola by Timothy Woo. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/24/13, before Judge Bloom. Court Reporter/Transcriber TYPEWRITE WORD PROCESSING SERVICE, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2013. (Hong, Loan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 4/30/13, before Judge Bloom. Court Reporter/Transcriber ARIA SERVICES, INC., Telephone number 845-260-1377. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/21/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2013. (Hong, Loan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 5/31/2013, Entered: 5/31/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER. Any party failing to appear or appearing unprepared shall have their claim or answer stricken, as the case may be, pursuant to Rules 16(f) and 37(b)(2) (A)(v) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. See attached order for further details. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/31/2013. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury selection in this matter will begin on June 3, 2013, at 8:40 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/31/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order on Motion To Quash
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [293] Motion to Quash. Neither side is free from fault here, but the fact is a party can't subpoena a non-party witness with vacation plans 2 business days before trial and call it reasonable notice (assuming he has been served at all, which Woo disputes and there is no proof of service offered to say otherwise). Woo is the party, not the City, and not the police officer. An equally important factor is the long period of time -- literally at least nine years and in some respects since the inception of the case in 1999 -- in which plaintiffs knew about Sgt. Aitola but took no action to preserve his testimony (indeed, it is speculative to assume that Sgt. Aitola would have any recollection of this incident from 15 years ago). As to counsel's alternative suggestion, the Court cannot admit a summary or excerpt of prior testimony set forth in a brief for a host of evidentiary reasons; indeed, plaintiffs' counsel concedes that it could only be done as a sanction, and while the practice of both sides has been less than optimal, the Court is not seeing sanctionable conduct. As to whether the Family Court transcript can used since the witness is unavailable, the Court is not going to determine that yet because Mr. King won't even tell anyone if it exists. If it does, plaintiffs are not only going to have Mr. King's failure to produce it to contend with, but it is not at all clear to the Court that the prior testimony would be admissible. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/31/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER endorsed on Assistant Corporation Counsel Martin Bowe's 5/28/2013 letter: Defendant's request is denied. The deadline for completing discovery has long passed and no explanation is given for why this information is being sought now, on the eve of trial. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 5/30/2013. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 30, 2013, before Judge Cogan. Court Reporter/Transcriber H. Driscoll, Telephone number 718-613-2274. Email address: hdrisc@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/20/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/28/2013. (Driscoll, Holly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 5/30/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Regarding Co-defendants' motion for judgment as a matter of law by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER re Pretrial Conference - Final. The Court modifies its Order relieving Mr. O'Neill as counsel for Nathaniel Southerland to the following extent: Mr. O'Neal shall advise Nathaniel Southerland that Mr. Southerland has three choices (1) continue with Mr. O'Neal as his counsel; (2)have a new counsel appear for him to select the jury Monday morning who is fully prepared to proceed with the case; or (3) proceed on his own pro se. Mr. O'Neil will further convey to Mr. Southerland that failure to elect any of these choices will result in his claims being deemed abandoned. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/30/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Pretrial Conference - Interim
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 5/24/2013 (Tape #10:10-11:59.) (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Pretrial Conference - Final
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for Pretrial Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/30/13. Counsel for plaintiff children and defendant present. Counsel for plaintiff Southerland failed to appear. The Court ruled on the objections to Judge Bloom's pretrial rulings. The Court also noted that plaintiff Southerland filed a dispositive motion last night. Defendant's opposition, if any, is due 6/13/13. The Court also denied plaintiff Southerland's request to adjourn the trial. Trial will proceed as scheduled with jury selection at 8:45 am in Courtroom 11A before Judge Bloom. Finally, the Court granted Mr. O'Neill's motion to be relieved of his representation of plaintiff Nathaniel Southerland on the condition that he inform Nathaniel Southerland that he must appear on Monday pro se or with new counsel if he wishes to avoid having his claim be deemed abandoned. See transcript for details. (Court Reporter: Holly Driscoll). (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter re Judgment as a Matter of Law by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 3) (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Responding to Woo's Letter of Today by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 Witness List *
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Witness List by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: 5/29/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Agreement for Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AGREEMENT FOR VERDICT by Jury of Less than Six Members by Timothy Woo. (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Proposed Voir Dire by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Jury Instructions by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Regarding Various Issues by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Agreement for Jury Verdict
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AGREEMENT FOR VERDICT by Jury of Less than Six Members by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 proposed voir dire
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 Proposed Jury Instructions/Verdict Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Requesting Adjournment Due to Unexpected Family Emergency by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/28/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 18, 2013, before Judge Bloom. Court Transcriber: TypeWrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/28/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2013. (Rocco, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [275] Letter filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. Although the Court is sympathetic to plaintiffs' loss of their aunt or great aunt, this is a 1999 case; the trial date has been long set; the Court's calendar would mean that any adjournment would be lengthy; and the trial is not scheduled to begin until ten days after Ms. Reid's passing. Nevertheless, the Court will consider plaintiffs' request at the final pretrial conference, which will occur in any event since there is no need for plaintiffs to attend. All pretrial submissions must be made as previously directed by Judge Bloom. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/28/2013. (Cogan, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: 5/24/2013 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL ORDER: See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/24/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 Trial Brief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF (Letter) in Response to Plaintiff Children's Appeal of In Limine Decision by M/J Bloom by Timothy Woo (Pines, Jonathan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Regarding Exhibit by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter opposing introduction of video as trial exhibit by Timothy Woo (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013, Terminated: 10/17/2016 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPEAL OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Court by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: 5/23/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter Seeking Clarification of Ruling by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Regarding Exhibit by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: 5/22/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter concerning trial exhibits by Timothy Woo (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: At the March 15, 2013, conference, the Court excluded the proposed video of Elizabeth Felix's birthday party under Rule 403 of the Federal Rules of Evidence. Among other things, I cited the length of the video. I granted plaintiffs' request to resubmit an abbreviated version of the video for the Court's consideration, which counsel for Sonny Southerland Sr. speculated would be five minutes in duration, by May 17, 2013. Plaintiffs now move for an extension of time to submit the abbreviated video. Plaintiffs' request is granted. [265][264] Plaintiffs shall serve the abbreviated video on defendant and deliver it to the Court by May 22, 2013. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/20/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter Regarding video by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter re DVD Video of June 8, 1997 Birthday Party at Southerland Home by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 order on motion in limineCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [255] Motion in Limine; granting [261] Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. PRETRIAL ORDER: See Attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/17/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re Police Officer Aitola by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: 5/17/2013, Terminated: 5/17/2013 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Witness List by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter Regarding Subpoena by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: 5/16/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 5/15/13, before Judge Bloom. Court Reporter/Transcriber TYPEWRITE WORD PROCESSING SERVICE, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/6/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/17/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/14/2013. (Hong, Loan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Status Conference held on 5/15/2013 (Tape #11:15-12:52.) (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: 5/15/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew James Rauchberg on behalf of Timothy Woo (aty to be noticed) (Rauchberg, Andrew)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: 5/14/2013, Terminated: 5/17/2013 Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION in Limine To Exclude Unfairly Prejudicial Evidence by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter regarding witness Duran by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: 5/13/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Regarding Exhibit by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Counsel for defendant Woo and counsel for plaintiff Sonny Southerland Sr. have submitted communications to my law clerk by email. The parties shall not email any communications to the Court; all communications shall be filed by ECF. While the Court previously granted the parties' request to email their exhibits to the Court on May 7, 2013, the use of my law clerk's email address was a one-time privilege granted as a courtesy. The Court reiterates that plaintiff Southerland Sr. was explicitly ordered to serve his proposed exhibits by May 10, 2013. [250] Plaintiff was warned that he would be precluded from offering exhibits at trial pursuant to Rules of Civil Procedure 16(f)(1)(C) and 37(b)(2)(A)(ii) if he failed to produce them as ordered by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/10/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 Pretrial OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL ORDER: See Attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/9/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/9/2013, Entered: 5/9/2013 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 8, 2012, before Judge Bloom. Court Transcriber: ARIA SERVICES, INC, Telephone number 845-260-1377. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/10/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/7/2013. (Rocco, Christine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Status Conference held on 5/8/2013 (Tape #2:35-4:02.) (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter stating objections to plaintiffs' proposed trial exhibits by Timothy Woo (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Regarding Exhibits by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter re Mr. Southerland's Objections to Exhibits by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Regarding Ciara Manning by Elizabeth F., Emmanuel F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: 5/3/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter re Ciara Manning by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold a Pretrial Conference on 5/30/2013 at 11:00 am in Courtroom 8D South. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 5/3/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter Regarding Vendetta Jones by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re Witness List by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter by Timothy Woo (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/1/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr re Witness List (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Status Conference held on 4/30/2013. Tick #(s) 3:18-4:05. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 5/1/2013 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Granting [234] Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. The motion for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above captioned matter is granted. The admitted attorney Brian King is permitted to argue or try this particular case in whole or in part as counsel or advocate for plaintiff Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 4/30/2013. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Martin John Bowe on behalf of Timothy Woo (aty to be noticed) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 4/30/2013, Entered: 4/30/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter by Timothy Woo (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant requests an adjournment of today's conference. The request is denied. A supervising attorney from the Office of Corporation Counsel shall appear at the conference in Courtroom 11A South at 3:00 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/30/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013, Terminated: 4/30/2013 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 0207-6164920. by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit in Support, # (2) Certificate of Good Standing, # (3) Proposed Order) (King, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter by Timothy Woo (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER re [231] MOTION for Extension of Time to File filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. This motion is referred to Judge Bloom for such disposition as she deems appropriate. So Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/29/2013. (c/m - chambers) (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/29/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File responses to the pre-trial order deadline and the recent motions that followed and a copy of the transcripts from the status conference held on April 18, 2013 that the fee be waived. by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Brown, Marc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: 4/26/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter regarding witness Jones by Elizabeth F., Emmanuel F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 4/25/2013, Entered: 4/25/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re [228] Letter filed by Timothy Woo. The Court does not understand what defendant means by "briefing" the Cameron case. The Courts has read the Cameron case and sees what it say. If defendant wants to put in another letter saying more about it, that's fine. The Court is unaware of any provision of the Federal Rules that allows abstract briefing, and counsel's obvious avoidance of the words "summary judgment," which the Court has already held it is far too late to seek, coupled with his request that pretrial proceedings be held "in abeyance", suggests that this is a pretextual request to seek summary judgment without calling it that and thereby delay or avoid the trial. That is notgoing to happen. The Court will consider the Cameron case, along with anyother legal defenses, at the close of plaintiffs' case, or the close ofdefendant's case, or if necessary, after the jury returns a verdict. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/25/2013. C/M by chambers. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: 4/24/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter by Timothy Woo (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Bowe, Martin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of New York, Timothy Woo (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: 4/23/2013 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Pretrial Order objection to plaintiffs' witness list by City of New York, Timothy Woo (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 4/19/2013, Entered: 4/19/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: See attached Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/19/2013. (Sullivan, Meghan) (c/m to Sonny Southerland, Sr. via FedEx and First Class Mail) Modified on 4/19/2013 (Nair, Rekha).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: 4/22/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom: Status Conference held on 4/18/2013. Recorded. Tick #(s) 2:13 - 3:12. Appearances for Plaintiffs: Sonny B. Southerland, pro se; Michael G. O'Neill, Esq. Appearances for for Defendants: Janice Casey Silverberg, Assistant Corporation Counsel; and Martin Bowe, Assistant Corporation Counsel. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: 4/17/2013 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  "Plaintiff's Proposed Pretrial Order (1st Draft)" (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: 4/16/2013 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Pretrial Order by Elizabeth F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby amends its March 13, 2013, Scheduling Order. The Court shall hold a status conference in this matter on April 18, 2013 at 2:00 p.m. instead of 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 4/16/2013. (Frankel, Dustin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Certificate of service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by City of New York, Timothy Woo (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: 4/15/2013 Proposed Pretrial Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Pretrial Order defendants' portion by City of New York, Timothy Woo (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting in part and denying in part [217] Motion for Extension of Time to File: By letter dated March 13, 2013, defendants request an adjournment of the conference scheduled for March 28, 2013. Defendants further request an extension of time to file the proposed pretrial order. The request is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall submit their proposed portions of the joint pretrial order by April 15, 2013. No further extension shall be considered. The Court shall hold a status conference in this matter on April 18, 2013 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South. Defendants also inform the Court that Mr. Southerland's mother died. The Court offers its sincere condolences to Mr. Southerland and his family. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 3/13/2013. (Frankel, Dustin) (c/m pro se plaintiff)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: 3/13/2013, Terminated: 3/13/2013 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File pre-trial order by City of New York, Timothy Woo. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: 3/11/2013 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re [214] Letter MOTION for Discovery filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order on motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [214] Motion for Discovery. The Second Circuit did not "clearly contemplate" that further development of the record would occur in discovery; that decision was left to the district court and Judge Bloom was well within her discertion in determining that there had been more than enough time for discovery. In addition, it is doubtful that any discovery of plaintiffs is going to change the factors concerning the resolution of the qualified immunity issue. Nevertheless, given the passage of time, Judge Bloom's Order is modified only to the following extent: If any of the formerly children plaintiffs intend to testify at trial, defendants may take the deposition of each for no more than 3 hours apiece prior to April 15, 2013. Mr. O'Neill will identify who is going to testify during the week of March 4 and the dates upon which they are available; the City must take the depositions, if at all, on the dates offered. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/4/2013. (Weisberg, Peggy)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: 3/1/2013 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re [214] Letter MOTION for Discovery filed by Elizabeth F., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Nathaniel S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Venus S.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: 2/27/2013, Terminated: 3/4/2013 motion for discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION for Discovery by City of New York, Timothy Woo. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: 2/25/2013 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this case on 2/21/13. The parties shall file their proposed portions of the joint pretrial order by 3/25/13. The Court shall hold another status conference on 3/28/13 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom #11A South. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/22/2013) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order Reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan for all further proceedings. Judge Sandra L. Townes no longer assigned to case. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 2/22/2013. (Bowens, Priscilla)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Status Conference held on 2/21/2013. Tick #(s) 3:19-3:47. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/12/2013 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Court shall hold a status conference in this case on 2/21/2013, at 3:00 p.m., in Courtroom 11 A. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom, on 2/11/2013. C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  set/reset hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Set / Reset Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/21/2013 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11A South before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: 2/5/2013, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion for Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Hearing by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Siegfried, Evan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: 1/29/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter by City of New York (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, When pltff Sonny Southerland did not appear at the status conference held on 9/4/12 by 2:00 p.m., the Court went on the record and conducted the conference. Defts' counsel stated that the Second Circuit Court of Appeals did not recall the mandate but that a petition seeking a Writ of Certiorari has been filed in the US Supreme Court. The Court stayed the proceedings herein pending the determination on the Writ. Defts' counsel shall notify the parties and the Court when the Writ is decided. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/4/2012) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: 9/5/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Status Conference held on 9/4/2012. Tick #(s) 2:32-2:40. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/2/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Deft stated that they have moved to recall the mandate issued by the Second Circuit and intend to petition the US Supreme Court for a writ of certiorari. The parties are strongly urged to discuss settlement. The Court shall hold another status conference on 9/4/12 at 2:00 p.m., in Courtroom #11A unless the mandate has been recalled. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/29/12) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: 7/2/2012 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom:Status Conference held on 6/28/2012. Tick #(s) 3:15-3:42. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying [204] motion to adjourn conference. The Court scheduled the conference to be held tomorrow, on 6/28/12, at the end of May. Although the City has every right to petition for a writ of certiorari, defendants' counsel waited until the last moment to request this adjournment. Moreover, the letter request does not reflect that defendants' counsel contacted plaintiffs' counsel or Mr. Southerland to request this adjournment. Unless counsel does so and all parties consent to an adjournment, the conference shall proceed as scheduled at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 11A. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 6/27/2012. (Bloom, Lois)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: 6/26/2012, Terminated: 6/27/2012 Motion to Adjourn Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Administration for Children Services, Corporation Counsel For The City Of New York. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Second Circuit mandate issued on 5/25/12 (docket entry #202), which remanded the case in accordance with the Court's opinion, a status conference shall be held on 6/28/12 at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroom #11A. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 5/29/2012) c/m to pltff Sonny Southerland as instructed by Chambers. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012, Terminated: 10/17/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA as to [197] Notice of Appeal filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr., [195] Notice of Appeal filed by Sonny B. S. Jr., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F., Nathaniel S., Venus S., [196] Subsequent Notice of Appeal, filed by Sonny B. S. Jr., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F., Nathaniel S., Venus S.. It is Ordered that the judgment of the District Court is Affirmed in part, Vacated in part and the case is Remanded in accordance with the Opinion of this Court. Issued as Mandate: 5/25/12. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Judge Sandra L. Townes added. Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton no longer assigned to case. (Marziliano, August)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/2/2011, Entered: 9/2/2011, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Third Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [197] Notice of Appeal, [195] Notice of Appeal, [196] Subsequent Notice of Appeal. This supplemental record is being sent to the USCA. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 USCA Acknowledgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Acknowledgment for the Second Supplemental Record re: [197] Notice of Appeal, [195] Notice of Appeal, [196] Subsequent Notice of Appeal. (McGee, Mary Ann) It was received at the USCA on 11/16/10. USCA#07-4449.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/15/2010, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            The Second Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re [197] Notice of Appeal, [195] Notice of Appeal, [196] Subsequent Notice of Appeal. (Gonzalez, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. [198] Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 order on motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting PLTFFS' (except Southerland Sr.) Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 10/16/07. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [193] Memorandum & Opinion, [194] Clerk's Judgment by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. No Fee Paid IFP granted. NOA served by the Clerk. (Gonzalez, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Subsequent Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Subsequent NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [193] Memorandum & Opinion, [194] Clerk's Judgment by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. No Fee Paid for the Plaintiffs have an Appointed Counsel. NOA filed ECF. Please Note: This is a Subsequent NOA being filed to link the Parties & the Memo & Order & Judgment. It is being filed by the Appeals Clerk. (Gonzalez, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. [124] Letter, [108] Mail Returned, [175] Letter, [131] Letter, [181] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [92] Letter, [145] Letter, [139] Proposed Scheduling Order, [154] Show Cause Hearing, [122] Letter,, [177] Letter, [104] Mail Returned, [112] Order, [138] Order, [119] Mail Returned, [150] Order, [193] Memorandum & Opinion, [103] Letter, [128] Status Conference, [93] Letter, [188] Reply to Response to Motion, [157] Settlement Agreement, [129] Order, [184] Memorandum in Opposition, [173] Letter, [182] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [144] Letter, [126] Order,,,, [159] Letter, [179] Letter, [152] Letter, [174] Letter, [160] Letter, [95] Notice of Hearing, [165] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, [164] Memorandum & Opinion, [134] Status Conference, [121] Order, [153] Order to Show Cause,, [178] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [167] Rule 56.1 Statement, [105] Order, [158] Letter, [146] Transcript, [107] Order, [180] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [170] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [187] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [197] Notice of Appeal, [166] Motion for Summary Judgment, [118] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, [169] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [130] Letter, [102] Notice of Appearance, [116] Order, [168] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [115] Letter, [140] Letter, [190] Notice (Other), [132] Order,,,,, [135] Letter, [194] Clerk's Judgment, [185] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [111] Mail Returned, [136] Order,, [149] Letter, [125] Letter, [141] Letter, [186] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [172] Letter, [192] Notice (Other), [151] Status Conference, [195] Notice of Appeal, [94] Letter, [97] Docket Call, [91] Letter, [162] Motion Hearing, [106] Mail Returned, [196] Subsequent Notice of Appeal, [123] Letter, [156] Settlement Agreement, [137] Status Conference, [113] Letter, [100] Order, [163] Motion for Extension of Time to File, [120] Letter, [183] Rule 56.1 Statement, [99] Letter, [155] Settlement Agreement, [147] Stipulation, [191] Letter, [127] Status Conference, [143] Order,, [171] Memorandum in Support, [98] Order, [114] Letter, [142] Letter, [176] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [189] Motion Hearing, [133] Letter (Gonzalez, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Electronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. [124] Letter, [108] Mail Returned, [175] Letter, [131] Letter, [181] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [92] Letter, [145] Letter, [139] Proposed Scheduling Order, [154] Show Cause Hearing, [122] Letter,, [177] Letter, [104] Mail Returned, [112] Order, [138] Order, [119] Mail Returned, [150] Order, [193] Memorandum & Opinion, [103] Letter, [128] Status Conference, [93] Letter, [188] Reply to Response to Motion, [157] Settlement Agreement, [129] Order, [184] Memorandum in Opposition, [173] Letter, [182] Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, [144] Letter, [126] Order,,,, [159] Letter, [179] Letter, [152] Letter, [174] Letter, [160] Letter, [95] Notice of Hearing, [165] Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, [164] Memorandum & Opinion, [134] Status Conference, [121] Order, [153] Order to Show Cause,, [178] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [167] Rule 56.1 Statement, [105] Order, [158] Letter, [146] Transcript, [107] Order, [180] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [170] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [187] Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [166] Motion for Summary Judgment, [118] Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery, [169] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [130] Letter, [102] Notice of Appearance, [116] Order, [168] Affidavit in Support of Motion, [115] Letter, [140] Letter, [190] Notice (Other), [132] Order,,,,, [135] Letter, [194] Clerk's Judgment, [185] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [111] Mail Returned, [136] Order,, [149] Letter, [125] Letter, [141] Letter, [186] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [172] Letter, [192] Notice (Other), [151] Status Conference, [195] Notice of Appeal, [94] Letter, [97] Docket Call, [91] Letter, [162] Motion Hearing, [106] Mail Returned, [196] Subsequent Notice of Appeal, [123] Letter, [156] Settlement Agreement, [137] Status Conference, [113] Letter, [100] Order, [163] Motion for Extension of Time to File, [120] Letter, [183] Rule 56.1 Statement, [99] Letter, [155] Settlement Agreement, [147] Stipulation, [191] Letter, [127] Status Conference, [143] Order,, [171] Memorandum in Support, [98] Order, [114] Letter, [142] Letter, [176] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, [189] Motion Hearing, [133] Letter (Gonzalez, Mary)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 clerk's judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is Ordered and Adjudged that plaintiff take nothing of the defendants; and that judgment is hereby entered granting defendants' motion for summary judgment. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 10/5/2007. (Abdallah, Fida)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINION For the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum opinion and order, defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. The clerk is directed to furnish a copy of the within to the parties and to the magistrate judge. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on September 27, 2007. (Sifton, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motions terminated: [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, see Memorandum Opinion and Order dated 9/27/2007, doc # 193. (Abdallah, Fida)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDICIAL NOTICE OF OPPOSITION PAPERS NOT DOCKETED IN THE COURT RECORD TO THIS PRESENT DATE, filed by Sonny B. Souherland, Sr. (See Manila Envelope contained DVD Video Evidence attached) (Galeano, Sonia) Fwd. to USDJ Sifton.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Terminate Motions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motions terminated: [185] Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 166 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. Terminated as per document 186. (Abdallah, Fida)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: 3/2/2007 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 3/1/07 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton, requesting that this Court order or instruct Court Reporter, Allen Serman to supply Pltff with a true copy of the transcripts of the 2/6/07 hearing, at no cost. (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/12/2007 Notice - otherCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDICIAL NOTICE OF DOCUMENTS AND DVD EVIDENCE NOT DOCKETED filed by pro se Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (w/Attachment 1). (Fwd. to Judge Sifton). (Layne, Monique)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Charles P. Sifton: Motion Hearing held on 2/6/2007. Case called. Counsel for parties present. All parties present except plaintiff Sunny B. Southerland, Sr. The motion of defendants City of New York and Timothy Woo for summary judgment is argued. Decision reserved. (Court Reporter Allan Sherman) (Abdallah, Fida)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Woo, City Of New York. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: 1/17/2007 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [186] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Application granted, extending time from January 17, 2007 to January 31, 2007 for City Defendant's to serve their reply on the Summary Judgment Motion. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 1/11/2007. (Abdallah, Fida)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: 1/10/2007, Terminated: 1/17/2007 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Timothy Woo, City Of New York. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006, Terminated: 3/8/2007 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. Motions referred to Lois Bloom. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Memorandum in opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: 12/29/2006 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit Exhibit D.# (5) Exhibit Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit Exhibit F) (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: 12/7/2006 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [180] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: The time of all plaintiffs to respond to the defendants' motion for summary judgement is extended to 12/29/06. Any replies shall be served and filed by 1/17/07; Oral argument of the motion is adjourned to 2/6/07 at 4:30 PM. C/M. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 12/6/06. (Chee, Alvin)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006, Terminated: 12/7/2006 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/30/2006, Entered: 12/1/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 11/3/06 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton, requesting an extension of time of three to four weeks, to file pltff's reply to deft's motion to dismiss. (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 Order on motion for extension of time to file Response/ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Motion for summary judgment 11/30/06. Reply 12/18/06. Oral argument 1/8/07 @ 4:30. Motion for sanctions DENIEDterminating [176] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pltff. to notify the court of address change.. Ordered by JudgeCharles P. Sifton on 10/26/06. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: 11/2/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: 10/27/2006, Terminated: 11/2/2006 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendants' motin for summary judgment by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 10/26/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter stating that plaintiffs have not served opposition papers by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter dated 10/12/06 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton, "requesting that this Court impose further sanctions upon attorney Ms. Silverberg, for the intentional delay, pain and suffering, stress and lack of notification. Pltff seeks an extension of time to file opposition papers and order Ms. Silverberg to overnight Fed-Ex a true copy of counsel's motion papers." (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/12/2006, Entered: 10/12/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter in response to plaintiff, stating that defendants' motion was timely served and filed by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: 10/16/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 10/11/06 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton, re: "sanctions against defts attorney (Ms. Janice Silverberg) for failure to comply with the Court's Order dated 8/2/06, and willful delay." (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER terminating [163] Motion for Extension of Time to File See document # 166 motion filed. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Memorandum In Support
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, John Doe. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, John Doe. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, John Doe. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support re [166] MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, John Doe. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4) # (5) # (6) # (7) # (8) # (9) # (10) # (11) # (12) # (13) # (14) # (15) # (16) # (17))(Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 56.1 STATEMENT by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, John Doe. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/18/2006, Entered: 9/18/2006, Terminated: 9/27/2007 Motion for summary judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, John Doe. Responses due by 10/16/2006 (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Order Setting Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER Defendants' motion for summary judgment with respect to plaintiffs' claims shall be filed on or before September 18, 2006; plaintiff's response papers shall be filed on or before October 16, 2006; defendants' reply papers, if any, shall be filed on or before October 26, 2006. Oral argument on the motion will be held on November 8, 2006 at 4:30 P.M. in Courtroom 6A, United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 08/02/06. (Sifton, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: 8/2/2006 Memorandum and OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND OPINIONFor the reasons set forth in the attached memorandum opinion and order the infant compromise order approving settlement of the claims is denied. Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 08/02/2006. (Sifton, Charles)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006, Terminated: 10/11/2006 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgment Motion by City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 161 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 17,2006 before Judge Sifton. Court Reporter: Fiore Transcription. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Concerning Settlement by Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: 5/30/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter in response to opposition to settlement by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 6/13/2006 Motion Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry: for proceedings held before Charles P. Sifton : Civil Cause for Motion. Case called. All parties present. Deft may submit a response to Sonny Southerland's latest submission by 5/31/06. Decision reserved on motion for issuance of the infant compromise order opposing the settlement. Court Reporter: Sheldon Silverman. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 5/25/2006, Entered: 6/1/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter dated 5/24/2006 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton, in opposition to the settlement agreement submitted by Mr. O'Neill and endorsed by the guardian ad litem Ms. Rose Weber. (Barrett, C.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Declaration regarding attendance of children by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Supplement Affidavit of Guardian ad Litem by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Settlement Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Affidavit in Support of Compromise Order by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: 5/23/2006 Show Cause Hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Charles P. Sifton : Set hearing for infant compeomise order 5/25/06 @ 4:30 Show Cause Hearing held on 5/17/2006. (Court Reporter Loan Hong.) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: 4/28/2006 Order to Show CauseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, the parties are directed to show cause in Courtroom #6A on 5/17/06 at 4:30 p.m., why the infant compromise order should not be granted. In the event that defts wish to move for summary judgment with respect to any remaining claims, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: defts' motion papers shall be filed on or before 6/16/06; pltff's response papers shall be filed on or before 7/21/06; defts' reply papers, if any, shall be filed on or before 8/7/06. Defts shall make the motion returnable on 8/24/06. (Ordered by Judge Charles P. Sifton on 4/24/06) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dtd. 4/13/06 from Sonny B. Southerland request hearing be set. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/24/2006, Entered: 4/24/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, I instruct the parties to request a pre-motion conference with the Hon. Charles P. Sifton if no settlement is reached. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 4/19/06) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 148 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 18,2006 before Judge Bloom. Court Reporter: Fiore Transcription. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: 4/20/2006 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Civil Cause for Status Conference held on 4/18/2006 before Judge Lois Bloom. Electronic Sound Recording: Fiore Transcription Service, Inc. (27 pages) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/25/2006 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: before USMJ Bloom-Status Conference held on 4/18/2006. Tick #(s) 4:05:00-4:37:00. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: 4/21/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 4/18/06 from Sonny B. Southerland to USDJ Sifton, in response to Mr. G. O' Neill's letter dated 4/13/06. (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: 4/17/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to Hon. Lois Bloom to provide Sonny Southerland's most recent letter by Elizabeth F.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Sonny Southerland's April 13, 2006 letter to Hon. Charles P. Sifton)(Stark, Corey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: 4/13/2006 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter To Judge Sifton by Venus S., Sonny B. S. Jr., Nathaniel S., Emmanuel F., Kiam F., Elizabeth F.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit February 6, 2006 letter to Sonny Southerland)(O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: 3/30/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, counsel's request is granted. The Court shall hold a conference in this matter on 4/18/06 at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom #4C. Pltffs shall timely appear, including Mr. Southerland, the Southerland children, their law guardian, their counsel and defts' counsel. The parties shall bring the settlement documents to the conference. If Mr. Southerland does not want to sign the settlement agreement and counsel misunderstood him, no conference shall be required provided that the stipulation of discontinuance is filed with the Court before 4/18. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 3/30/06) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter to Hon. Lois Bloom joining in the request for a settlement conference by Elizabeth F.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit February 6, 2006 letter to Sonny B. Southerland confirming the settlement# (2) Exhibit March 3, 2006 letter to Sonny B. Southerland confiming the settlement.)(Stark, Corey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: 3/27/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter requesting settlement conference by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED ORDER on doc. #140, the application is granted. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 2/22/06) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: 2/21/2006 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter requesting deferment of motion calendar by Timothy Woo, City Of New York, Administration for Children Services. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Terminate Motions (DEACTIVATED EVENT - DO NOT USE)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Motions terminated, [118] Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (w/Certificate of Mailing; *Forwarded to Judge Bloom); dated 8/3/2005, filed filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr.. see document # 126 (Jackson, Ramona) Modified on 2/1/2006 (Jackson, Ramona).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED ORDER on doc. #139, the Court sets the following revised schedule for defts' motion for summary judgment, on the consent of all parties: defts shall serve their motions to dismiss on pltffs by 2/23/06; pltffs shall serve their oppositions to the motions on defts by 3/29/06; and defts shall serve their replies and file the fully briefed motions with the Court by 4/12/06. Defts shall give pltff Sonny Southerland the requisite notice under Local Rule 56.2 Pltff Southerland may contact the Pro Se Office for instructions on how to oppose a motion. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 1/20/06) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: 1/19/2006 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Scheduling Order for Summary Judgment Motion by City Of New York. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/12/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, the Court hereby orders pltffs Sonny B. S., Jr. and Nathaniel S. to appear on 12/13/05 at 3:00 p.m. in room #342. Pltff Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. shall insure that Sonny B. S., Jr. and Nathaniel S. are in the courthouse as directed by this order. Pltffs are warned that they may be sanctioned pursuant to Rule 37(b) of the FRCP if they fail to appear as ordered by the court. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 12/07/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 12/7/2005, Entered: 12/12/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry: before USMJ Bloom-Status Conference held on 12/7/2005. Tape #05/218; 05/219. Tick #(s) 6420-end; 0-144. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 12/6/2005, Entered: 12/6/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, pltff Southerland shall immediately contact the children's counsel to schedule a time on either December 5, 7 or 9 for this meeting. The Court hereby warns pltff Sonny Southerland, Sr., that if he fails to contact the Court and the children's pro bono counsel to provide his contact information immediately upon receipt of this order, the Court shall find that he has willfully violated the Court's order to facilitate a metting between his children and their counsel and the Court shall recommend that pltff's action against all defts should be dismissed. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 12/02/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 12/5/2005, Entered: 12/5/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Corey Stark to Hon. Lois Bloom Regarding settlement discussions scheduled for 12/7/05.. (Stark, Corey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Corey Stark to Hon. Lois Bloom Regarding efforts to comply with the November 16, 2005 Order. (Stark, Corey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/28/2005, Entered: 11/28/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, the parties shall agree upon a date for all the minor children pltffs to meet with their court-appointed attorney, their guardian ad litem and defts' attorney to discuss settlement. The parties shall notify the Court in writing of the date and time agreed upon on or before 11/28/05. This meeting shall occur on or before 12/9/05, and shall take place after the school day in room 342 of the U.S. Courthouse. Pltff Sonny Southerland shall assure the presence of the children who live with him, and Ms. Silverberg and Mr. Stark shall make every effort to produce the children in foster care. Pltff Sonny Southerland is warned that the Court may impose sanctions against him pursuant to Rule 37(b) of the FRCP if he fails to comply with this order. Discovery in this matter is now closed. The Court granted defts' request to move for summary judgment in the event that a settlement cannot be reached, and set the following schedule: defts shall serve their motions to dismiss on pltffs by 1/26/06; pltffs shall serve their opposition to the motions on defts by 3/1/06; and defts shall serve their replies and file the fully briefed motions with the Court by 3/13/06. Defts shall give pltff Sonny Southerland the requisite notice under Local Rule 56.2. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 11/22/05) c/m(Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/16/2005, Entered: 11/29/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry: before USMJ Bloom-Status Conference held on 11/16/2005. Tape #05/211; 05/212. Tick #(s) 5332-end; 0-326. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 11/15/2005, Entered: 11/15/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Michael O'Neill to M.J. Bloom Regarding Southerland's lack of cooperation. (O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 11/9/2005, Entered: 11/9/2005 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Sonny B. Southerland to Judge Sifton dtd. 11/3/05 Regarding request for this court to enforce the law.. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/8/2005, Entered: 11/8/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER, construed as pltff's request for reconsideration of the Court's Order dated 9/23/05, the instant request is denied. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 11/07/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/27/2005, Entered: 9/27/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, the outstanding discovery discussed at the conference shall be exchanged by 10/24/05. Discovery in this matter has otherwise closed. Pltff Sonny Southerland declined to sign a protective order after the reasons for a protective order were discussed at length. If pltff reconsiders his position, he must sign the protective order before 10/24/05. This case must now move forward. The deadline for completion of outstanding discovery is 10/24/05. No further requests for extensions shall be considered. Counsel for the pltff children was granted 60 days to explore the possibility of settlement on the children's behalf. Pltff Southerland shall cooperate as agreed in arranging for the children residing with him to meet with their guardian ad litem and court-appointed attorney to facilitate these discussions, and shall provide contact information for the children living in foster placement. The next conference in this matter shall be held on 11/16/05 at 2:00 p.m., in courtroom #373. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 9/23/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: 9/26/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 9/19/05 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton and USMJ Bloom, enclosing copies of a document entitled "Waiver of Immunity". (w/enc.) Fwd. to USMJ Bloom. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 10/19/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry: before USMJ Bloom-Status Conference held on 9/22/2005. Tape #05/175; 05/176. Tick #(s) 3367-end; 0-240. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry: for proceedings held before USMJ Lois Bloom : Status Conference held on 9/22/2005. Tape #05/175; 05/176. Tick #(s) 3367-end; 0-240. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/22/2005, Entered: 9/23/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 9/22/05 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USDJ Sifton, re: Judicial Notice and Opposition to Protective Order. (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER endorsed on doc.# [123]: The application is denied. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 8/24/2005) C/M (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER endorsed on doc.# [122]: The Court's Order [121] dated August 19, 2005 addresses some of the issues raised in plaintiff's instant letter. Discovery remains closed, except two of defendant's witnesses shall be deposed. The Court shall hold a conference in this matter on September 22, 2005 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 373. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 8/24/2005) C/M (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER endorsed on doc.# [120]: The application is granted. The Conference scheduled for September 8, 2005 is rescheduled to September 22, 2005 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 373. So Ordered. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 8/23/2005) C/M (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/22/2005, Entered: 8/22/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, pltff shall be prepared to sign the protective order at the next status conference before this Court on 9/8/05. The City Deft's counsel shall bring a copy of the protective order and the discovery material produced to pltff's former attorney (Bates numbered 0000001 through 0001654). Pltff's request to reopen discovery is otherwise denied. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 8/19/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 8/18/05 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USMJ Bloom, serving this Court with a copy of a "Waiver of Immunity" for all attorneys and their respective clients to sign. (w/enc.) Fwd. to USMJ Bloom. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Corey Stark to Hon. Lois Bloom Regarding scheduling depositions and adjourning the September 8, 2005 conference. (Stark, Corey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: 8/18/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ira L. Eras (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/16/2005, Entered: 8/23/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 8/16/05 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to USMJ Bloom, acknowledging receipt of the Court's order allowing Mr. O' Neill to proceed with discovery and requesting that this Court amend this order; and direct the defts to comply with petitioner's discovery demands. Petitioner further request a hearing/conference on the protection order and pltff's right to full discovery disclosure, or in the alternative, this court instruct defts to comply to the signing of "Waiver of Immunity". (Fwd. to USMJ Bloom) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, in the interest of justice, the Court grants O'Neill's request to depose these defts over defts' opposition. The parties shall arrange to complete these depositions before the next conference in this matter on 9/8/05. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 8/5/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 117 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/10/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ira L. Eras, 189 Montague Street, Suite 700, Brooklyn, NY 11201 returned as not deliverable as addressed unable to forward. (Black, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: 8/5/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter from Janice Casey Silverberg to Hon. Lois Bloom Regarding plaintiff's request for extension of discovery. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/12/2005 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete DiscoveryCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (w/Certificate of Mailing; *Forwarded to Judge Bloom); dated 8/3/2005, filed by Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/3/2005, Entered: 8/3/2005 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Janice Casey Silverberg to Judge Lois Bloom Regarding opposition to plaintiff's request to re-open discovery. (Silverberg, Janice)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/2/2005, Entered: 8/2/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Michael O'Neill to M.J. Bloom Regarding Depositions of Defendants. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Notices of Deposition)(O'Neill, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 8/1/2005, Entered: 8/1/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, discovery in this matter has closed. The Court shall hold a status conference on 9/8/05 at 10:30 a.m., in Courtroom #373. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 7/28/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/7/2005, Entered: 7/7/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph H. Farrell (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 110 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: 7/6/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Mail Returned as Undeliverable, "Return to Sender, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable to Forward." Mail previously sent to Ira L. Eras. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED ORDER on doc. #109, the parties contacted the Court for a discovery ruling, whether deft's counsel can be accompanied at the deposition by a student intern. The Court ruled the intern could attend and the parties were directed to proceed. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 6/15/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 6/24/2005, Entered: 6/24/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Joseph H Farrell (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 109 Filed: 6/15/2005, Entered: 6/27/2005 discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry: before USMJ Bloom-Discovery Hearing held on 6/15/2005. Tape #05/119. Tick #(s) 2400-2880. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Docketed in Error
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 6/13/2005, Entered: 6/13/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ira L.Eras document # 105 (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: 5/31/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER, deft's request is granted. Pltff shall appear for his deposition at the 4th floor reception desk at 100 Church Street, New York, N.Y., at 10 a.m. on 6/10/05. Pltff is hereby warned that if he fails to timely appear for his deposition on 6/10/05, I shall recommend that this case should be dismissed. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 5/31/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: 5/27/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Mail Returned as Undeliverable-"RTS, Not Deliverable As Addressed, Unable To Foward." Document #100 previously sent to Joseph H. Farrell. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: 5/26/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dtd. 5/23/05 from ACC Donna Kasbohm to MJ Bloom, requesting Your Honor so order pltff Southerland to appear on 6/10/05 at respondent's offices for deposition. (Fwd. to MJ Bloom). (Layne, Monique)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/24/2005 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Madonna Marie Kasbohn on behalf of City Of New York (Kasbohn, Madonna)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 101 Filed: 5/10/2005, Entered: 5/11/2005 Mail returned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Ira Eras. Not deliverable as addressed unable to forward. (Black, Amanda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, the application is granted. (Ordered by Judge Lois Bloom on 5/3/05) c/m (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/4/2005, Entered: 5/4/2005 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 4/22/05 from Theresa Crotty, ACC to USMJ Gold, requesting that the Court grant defts until 6/15/05 to complete depositions in this case, adjourn conference scheduled for 5/10/05 until some time after the new discovery deadline, requesting that the Court order that pltff appear for his deposition either 5/25/05; 6/2/05; or 6/7/05, and that pltff notify defts which date he will appear on or before 5/15/05. (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Email Test
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Email Notification Test - DO NOT REPLY. (Lee, Tiffeny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Add and Terminate Judges
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Per MJ Bloom and Gold: Mag. Judge Lois Bloom added. Mag. Judge A. Simon Chrein no longer assigned to case. (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/9/2004, Entered: 12/9/2004 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Application GRANTED. On ltr. dtd. 11/17/04 fr o m Theresa Crotty stip. & Protectiove order to the court for endorsement.. Signed by Judge A. Simon Chrein on 11/22/04. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 96 Filed: 11/8/2004, Entered: 11/8/2004 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter dated 10/28/04 from Kristin Shea, counsel for St. Joseph's, stating that St. Joseph's was dismissed from this action and further ECF e'mails should not be forwarded to counsel for St. Joseph's. (Vaughn, Terry)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/29/2004, Entered: 11/15/2004 Docket Call
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before A. Simon Chrein :Civil Conf. held on 10/29/2004. Next conf. 5/10/05 @ 10:00. (see document) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 Notice of hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 10/29/2004 11:00 AM before Magistrate-Judge A. Simon Chrein. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Michael G O'Neill to Judge Sifton dtd. 9/23/04 Regarding regarding request for documents. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/15/2004, Entered: 10/15/2004 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Sonny B. Southerland to Judge Sifton dtd. 9/16/04 Regarding regarding notice of motion.. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dated 9/29/04 from Sonny B. Southerland to USDJ Sifton, re: pltff's previous letter filed on 9/20/04 requesting that pltff's prior counsel turn over case files and requesting that this Court locate pltff's previous letter filed on 9/20/04; and that the request therein be granted. (fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 9/20/2004, Entered: 10/6/2004 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 9/16/04 from Sonny B. Southerland to USDJ Sifton, requesting that Mr. Michael O'Neill relieve himself as counsel in this case, seeking that this Court strike line #5 of paragraph 7 of Mr. O' Neill's "Notice of Motion" dated 3/18/04 d and further requesting a conference to discuss discovery and Ms. Rose M. Weber's qualifications. (Fwd. to USDJ Sifton) (Galeano, Sonia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 90 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: 4/22/2004 Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Charles P. Sifton : Status Conference held on 4/20/2004. GRANT Application to be relieved of obligation to represent Sonny Southerland. Permit Mr. Southerland to proceed pro se. GRANT Mr. O'Neill to have Guardian Ad Litem appt. to represent Minor Children Rose Webber. Note appearance as O'Neil as counsel for children & Guardian Ad. Litem. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 89 Filed: 3/31/2004, Entered: 3/31/2004, Terminated: 7/28/2004 Motion to Appoint Custodian
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Appoint Custodian /Guardian Ad Litem on behalf of the minor pltff. Returnable April 20,2004 @ 4:30 by Sonny B. Southerland Sr.. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 88 Filed: 1/15/2004, Entered: 1/26/2004 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter dated 1/13/04 from Michael G. O'Neill, Esq. to USMJ Chrein advising that Mr. Southerland has requested that Mr. O'Neill be relieved as his attorney and that he be permitted to proceed pro se, while Mr. O'Neill remain counsel for his children. (Nieves, Adrian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED ORDER: Judge Chrein directs that a formal motion to be relieved, etc; be made to USDJ Sifton. Re: [88] letter. Signed by F. Alan Pastore Secretary USMJ Chrein on 1/15/04. (Nieves, Adrian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 86 Filed: 12/4/2003, Entered: 12/4/2003 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter from Theresa Crotty to Mag. Chrein Regarding response to letter dtd. 11/13/03. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 87 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: 12/15/2003 discovery hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before A. Simon Chrein : Telephone Conf. Discovery Hearing held on 12/2/2003. Status report by 1/9/04 at which time a discovery schedule will be finalized. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 85 Filed: 11/20/2003, Entered: 11/20/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER Depositions stayed pending telephone conf. to be held instead of conf. scheduled for 12/2/03. On ltr. dtd. 11/13/03 from Michael G O'Neill.. Signed by Judge A. Simon Chrein on 12/13/03. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 84 Filed: 9/23/2003, Entered: 9/23/2003 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from A Pastore dtd. 9/15/03 to Counsles Regarding Conf. for 12/2/03 @ 2:30.. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 83 Filed: 9/18/2003, Entered: 9/18/2003 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Discovery extended to 11/28/03 On ltr. dtd. 9/8/03 from Theresa Crotty.. Signed by Judge A. Simon Chrein on 9/9/03. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 82 Filed: 6/30/2003, Entered: 6/30/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by Timothy Woo.(Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 81 Filed: 3/10/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, for protective order ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , on 3/7/03) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 80 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: 3/10/2003 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Calendar entry:,Before Mag Chrein Civil Conf. Stip. of Confidentiality signed. Mr. Woo to be served. This will not effect the statute of limitations. set discovery due for 9/12/03 , set scheduling conference for 2:30 9/12/03 before Magistrate A. S. Chrein (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 79 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address of MICHAEL G. O'NEILL for Sonny B. Southerland Sr. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 78 Filed: 2/19/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER I will conduct the conf. as scheduled on 3/7/03. I will discuss scheduling at that time. On ltr. dtd. 2/10/03 from Theresa Crotty. ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , on 2/12/03) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 77 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 1/29/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by City Of New York to amended complaint (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 76 Filed: 12/18/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 12/17/02 from Mag. Chrein to Counselors advising of the reassignment of the case and the short period of time elapsed nce his telephone conference with the assistant corp. counsel, I urge Mr. O'Neill to contact chambers again in two weeks. (with attachments) (Sica, Michele) Modified on 12/18/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 75 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEMAND for jury trial by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 75 Filed: 11/22/2002, Entered: 11/22/2002 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for jury trial by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 74 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: 10/8/2002 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Counsel are to arrange a telephone conf. at the schedule. On ltr. dtd. 9/27/02 from Michael G O'Neil. ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , on 9/27/02) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 73 Filed: 10/1/2002, Entered: 10/3/2002 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Calendar entry:,Before Mag Chrein Civil Cause for phone conf. Discussions held. set scheduling order deadlines: Extended Discovery deadline on 2/28/03 Status conference by 11:00 3/7/03 , terminated past due deadlines (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 72 Filed: 10/18/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER, set scheduling order deadlines: joining of parties, amended pleadings on 11/30/01 Discovery deadline on 9/30/02 Pretrial conference by 10:00 10/1/02 , terminated past due deadlines ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , ) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 71 Filed: 10/5/2001, Entered: 10/18/2001 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Calendar entry:,Before Mag Chrein Civil Conf. Scheduling order entered set scheduling order deadlines: Discovery deadline on 9/30/02 Status conference by 10:00 10/1/02 , terminated past due deadlines (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 70 Filed: 9/19/2001, Entered: 9/19/2001 Notice of hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: set scheduling conference for 2:30 10/5/01 before Magistrate A. S. Chrein , On ltr. dtd. 9/14/01 from F.Alan Pastore terminated past due deadlines (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 69 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/18/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Discovery has been stayed to next conf. On ltr. dtd. 7/10/01 from Michael G.O'Neill ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , on 9/12/01) (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 68 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: 7/17/2001 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Sonny B. Southerland Sr. by Michael G. O'Neill (Jackson, Ramona)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 65 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        "Violation Warning; Denial of Rights Under Color of Law," filed by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 67 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of a conference before Magistrate Chrein on 5/24/01. Pltff Pro Se present; Assist. Corp. Counsel Antoinette Blanchette present. (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 66 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: 7/10/2001 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Calendar entry: Before Magistrate Judge Chrein - Cpnf. held. Next conference set for 2:30 on 9/12/01 . Pro se is attempting to obtain counsel. (DiLorenzo, Krista)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: 6/25/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER (w/out enc.) dated 6/23/01 from Deborah Martin to Sonny Southerland enclosing a copy of the 5/24/01 conference transcript. (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: 6/20/2001, Terminated: 3/1/2002 [[ITALIC]]Description not available[[/ITALIC]]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. "for free transcript and affidavit" . No Motion hearing set . Motion file stamped: 6.20.01. *Document forwarded to USDJ Sifton. (Barrett, Charryse)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 6/11/2001, Entered: 6/11/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER pltff's [57-1] motion for appointment of pro bono counsel is denied subject to renewal upon a showing sufficient to permit the determination required by Hendericks v. Coughlin, 114 F.3d 390 (2d Cri. 1997), and Cooper v. A. Sargenti Co., Inc., 877 F.2d 170 (2d. Cir. 1989), concerning the merits of the case. ( signed by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton , on 06.06.01) c/m Galeano, Sonia
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 61 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: 6/7/2001 Miscellaneous Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of conference before Mag. Chrein on 5/24/01. Pltff pro se Sonny Southerland present and Antoinette Blanchette present for deft. (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 59 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, the Clerk of the Court is hereby directed to appoint an atty on the basis of random selection from the Pro Bono Panel to represent the pltff. The assigned atty is directed to file a notice of appearance or to file an apllication for relief from appointment within 30 days of receipt of the notice of appoinment. (So Ordered Magistrate Judge A. Simon Chrein, on 5/30/01) (Forwarded to Pro Se) (Frullo, Veronica)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 58 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: 5/31/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, The Clerk of the Court is directed to appoint an attorney on the basis of random selection from the Pro Bono Panel to represent pltff. The assigned attorney is directed to file a notice of appearance or to file an application for relief from appointment within 30 days of receipt of the notice of appointment. ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , on 5/30/01) (copy sent to pro se) (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 57 Filed: 5/29/2001, Entered: 5/30/2001 Motion to Appoint CounselCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. for appointment of counsel . No Motion hearing set . Motion file stamped: 5.29.01. w/attached Affidaivt in support. (Document forwarded to Judge Sifton). (Barrett, Charryse)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 60 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: 6/5/2001 minutes - miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Calendar entry: Conference held before Magistrate Chrein on 5/24/01. Proceedings electronically recorded. Transcript to be provided free of charge to plaintiff. Pro se will attempt to provide counsel. Next conference is set for 7/6/01 at 2:30. (Rodriguez,Angela)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 56 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: 5/14/2001 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, The case is scheduled for a conference on 5/24/01 at 4:30 before Mag. Chrein. ( signed by Magistrate A. S. Chrein , on 5/10/01) c/m (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 54 Filed: 4/16/2001, Entered: 4/18/2001 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 4.16.01 from Sonny Sutherland to Judge Sifton stating on or about 2.14.01, the Second the US Court of Appeals 2nd Circuit remanded the above case back to this Court. Also, requesting a conference and/or Status Hearing, so the case can proceed. w/exhibit A attached. (Document forwarded to Judge Sifton). (Barrett, Charryse)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 55 Filed: 4/9/2001, Entered: 4/20/2001 Appeal - MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy). Upon due consideration, it is hereby ordered, adjudged and decreed that the judgment of the district court be, and it hereby is Affirmed in part, Vacated in part, and Remanded. Issued as Mandate: 3/8/01. Judge Notified. Ackn. mailed. USCA# 00-7410. (Vasquez, Liz)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 53 Filed: 3/22/2001, Entered: 3/22/2001, Terminated: 5/25/2012 Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appeal returned from U.S. Court of Appeals containing documents numbered 1-23, 26-38,41, 42-49. (Copy of this form returned to Fred Nunnery c/o Court of Appeals.) (Drayton, Lorraine) Modified on 03/22/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 52 Filed: 4/13/2000, Entered: 4/18/2000 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript filed for a motion hearing held before Senior Judge Sifton on 11.17.99. Court Transcriber: Shari Riemer, TypeWrite Word Processing Service, 356 Eltingville Blvd., Staten Island, NY 10312. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Duplicate copy of document #49 faxed to Sam McLamore - Intake USCA. (McGee, Maryann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 51 Filed: 4/6/2000, Entered: 4/6/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, that the Court Reporters Office and the Electronic Sound Recording Division of the Clerk's Office are directed to prepare and file the transcript of the proceedings held in the above case on 11.17.99, and to provide a copy of the transcript of the Pltff. (Signed by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton , on 4.6.00). C/M (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certified and transmitted record on appeal to U.S. Court of Appeals: [49-1] appeal. Documents: 1-49. Missing documents: 24, 25, 40 and 46. Acknowledgment requested. (McGee, Maryann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Appeal - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Certified copy of docket sheet sent to USCA. [49-1] appeal (McGee, Maryann)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 50 Filed: 3/9/2000, Entered: 4/5/2000 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 49 Filed: 3/3/2000, Entered: 3/21/2000 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. [44-1] judgment order, [43-1] order. No fee paid. IFP granted. Service made by Clerk. Acknowledgment requested. (McGee, Maryann) Modified on 04/03/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 48 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 10.25.00 from Gregg Weinstock to Chief Judge Sifton requesting that the Court not consider the ex parte submissions of Mr. Southerland and in the alternative direct him to serve them with copies and provide them with sufficient time to respond. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 47 Filed: 2/7/2000, Entered: 2/7/2000 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 10.4.99 from Carolyn Olson to Chief Judge Sifton writing in opposition to the Pltff's 9.27.99 letter, which demanded that the Court impose sanctions against the State Defts. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 44 Filed: 2/4/2000, Entered: 2/4/2000 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT, pltff's motions for preliminary injunction in 99 cv 6159 is denied; dft's motions to dismiss are granted in their entirety and the judgment is entered in favor of the dfts in either 99 cv 3329 and 99 cv 6159 (Signed by Robert C. Heineman on 2/3/00) c/m (appeals package mailed) , (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 43 Filed: 2/2/2000, Entered: 2/2/2000 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM and ORDER, that the Pltff's motion for a preliminary injunction in 99cv6159 is denied. Also for reasons set forth above, Defts' motions to dismiss are granted in their entirety. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in both cv993329 and cv99-6159 in favor of the Defts. (Signed by Chief Judge Charles P. Sifton , on 2.1.00). C/M Forwarded to Pro Se for a judgment. (Hunter, Tara) Modified on 02/02/2000
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case closed; as per document #43. Magistrate Chrein notified. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 42 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: 1/12/2000 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Change of Address/Telephone to Margaret from Ralph Vega, Jr. advising her of the Pro Se Pltff's new telephone number. Docket sheet updated. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 46 Filed: 12/31/1999, Entered: 2/7/2000 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 12.31.99 from Sonny B. Southerland, Sr. to Chief Judge Sifton writing regarding his children. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 41 Filed: 12/9/1999, Entered: 12/14/1999 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Calendar entry: Civil Hearing held before Judge Sifton on 12/9/99. No appearances. Decision reserved on the motion of defendant Neff for dismissal. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 40 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: 12/3/1999 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Administration for Children 11/1/99 Answer due on 11/21/99 for Administration for Children (Drayton, Lorraine) Modified on 12/03/1999
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 11/24/1999, Entered: 11/30/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER dated 11.24.99 from Sonny Southerland to Chief Judge Sifton requesting that "this Court grant the injunctive relief indicated in the 2241 application (the immediate return of (his) six children to the Pltff's custody), and the additional injunctive relief described therein be granted (under 99 CV 6159), and any other relief this Court may deem just and proper". (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 36 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Alana Kay Gore, Corlora Turnquest, Cadija R. Tibbs, Ted Marrinaro, Arthur Zanko, Edwin Gould For Chil support of [35-1] motion to dismiss (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 35 Filed: 11/19/1999, Entered: 11/22/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Alana Kay Gore, Corlora Turnquest, Cadija R. Tibbs, Ted Marrinaro, Arthur Zanko, Edwin Gould For Chil to dismiss , Motion hearing [35-1] motion 12/9/99 at 4:30 . (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 34 Filed: 11/18/1999, Entered: 11/19/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION (with Exhibit A attached) by Kristin Shea, on the behalf of the "St. Joseph Defts", the Catholic Childcare Society of the Diocese of Brooklyn, Inc. Benedict Peirce and Saint Joseph For Children and Families Services. to dismiss the complaint in its entirety and all cross-claims, with prejudice . Motion hearing set for 12.9.99 @ 4:30 . (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 39 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 12/2/1999 minutes - miscellaneousCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Calendar entry: Civil Motion hearing held before Judge Sifton on 11/17/99. Parties present. All motions for dismissal argued. Decision reserved. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 33 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: 11/18/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Gregg D. Weinstock Re: In response to pltf's reply motion in opposition of motion to dismiss by dfts dated 9/3/99. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 45 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: 2/7/2000 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 11.16.99 from Sonny B. Southerland to Chief Judge Sifton writing in opposition to Deft. Richard Colondy's declaration submitted by his attorney Ira L. Eras. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 37 Filed: 11/16/1999, Entered: 11/29/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 11.16.99 from Sonny B. Southerland to Chief Judge Sifton writing in opposition to the Deft. Richard Colondy's declaration submitted by his attorney Ira L. Eras. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 11/15/1999, Entered: 11/16/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Declaration of Ira L. Eras Re: In reply to the "Reply Motion in Opposition of Motion to Dismiss by dfts" (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 31 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/9/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. to dismiss the Defts' motions to dismiss . No motion hearing set . (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 30 Filed: 11/8/1999, Entered: 11/8/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER dated 10/15/99 from Joseph Farrell, counsel for defendants, St. Joseph's Services for Children and Families and Benedict Peirce, to Judge Sifton, requesting an extension of time to the defendants to answer and/or join in the motion of the other defendants requesting the dismissal of this action until 11/5/99. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Endorsed order on page 2 of document #30 GRANTING the request for an extension of time until 11/5/99 for the defendants to answer or join in the motion of the other defendants requesting dismissal of this action.( Signed by Chief Judge Charles P. Sifton , on 11/3/99) c/m. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 11/5/1999, Entered: 11/5/1999, Terminated: 2/2/2000 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by Marc Berk to dismiss the complaint . Motion hearing [29-1] motion 11/17/99 (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 28 Filed: 10/18/1999, Entered: 10/20/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER dated 10/18/99 from Sonny B. Southerland, to Judge Sifton, advising that he opposes St. Joseph and Ms. B. Pierce's motion to dismiss. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 27 Filed: 10/15/1999, Entered: 10/18/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER dated 10/14/99 from Sonny B. Southerland, to Judge Sifton, requesting direction from this court on how to proceed with this case. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 26 Filed: 10/12/1999, Entered: 10/13/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Richard Colodny Re: in further Support of the [19-1] motion to dismiss the complaint. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 25 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Joseph H. Farrell Re: In support of [23-1] motion extending time for dfts to answer the complaint or to dismiss the complaint time (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 24 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Benedict Peirce, Saint Joseph For Chi in support of [23-1] motion extending time for dfts to answer the complaint or to dismiss the complaint time (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 23 Filed: 10/8/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 motion for extension of time to file answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Benedict Peirce, Saint Joseph For Chi extending time for dfts to answer the complaint or to dismiss the complaint time . Motion hearing set for 10/15/99 [23-1] motion . (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 22 Filed: 9/29/1999, Entered: 9/29/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 21 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              "Reply, Motion by Sonny B. Southerland in opposition of motion(s) ([19-1], [16-1], [10-1], and [11-1]) to dismiss by Defts". (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 20 Filed: 9/7/1999, Entered: 9/8/1999 Utility - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                "Evidence" submitted by the Pltff. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 19 Filed: 9/3/1999, Entered: 9/7/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Richard Colodny to dismiss the complaint . Motion hearing set for 9/24/99 at 4:30 [19-1] motion (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 18 Filed: 8/25/1999, Entered: 8/25/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER dated 8/20/99 from Gregg D. Weinstock to Judge Sifton, requesting that the court schedule oral argument on the motions to dismiss on 9/24/99 at 4:30. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Endorsed order. Oral argument will be heard on dft's motion to dismiss on 9/24/99 at 4:30. ( Signed by Chief Judge Charles P. Sifton , on 8/24/99) (endorsed on letter, document #18) (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 17 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Susan Jalowski, Gerald Harris, Michael Hess, Viviane Demilly, Hattie L. Lucas, Nicholas Scoppetta, Administration for Children Services, City Of New York and Rudolph W. Giuliani in Support of the [16-1] motion to dismiss. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 16 Filed: 8/20/1999, Entered: 8/23/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Susan Jalowski, Gerald Harris, Michael Hess, Viviane Demilly, Hattie L. Lucas, Nicholas Scoppetta, Administration for Children Services, City Of New York and Rudolph W. Giuliani to dismiss . Exhibit A attached. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 15 Filed: 8/19/1999, Entered: 8/20/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LETTER dated 8/19/99 from Sonny Southerland, to Judge Sifton, asking that the court resend its order for extension of time for decedents "City of New York," and for sanctions. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/17/1999, Entered: 8/17/1999 Miscellaneous DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER dated 8/12/99 from Sonny B. Southerland to Judge Sifton advising that he has not received certain documents from defendants, requesting a hearing be hald before the Court makes issues any orders in this matter, and that this letter be made a part of the Court record. (Permaul, Jenny)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 14 Filed: 8/13/1999, Entered: 8/18/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by Marc Berk. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 8/3/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDERED, that the City Deft's have an extension of time until 8.25.99 to respond to the complaint. (Signed by Chief Judge Charles P. Sifton, on 8.2.99). C/M See letter dtd. 7.26.99 to Chief Judge Sifton from Antoinette W. Blanchette. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 7/29/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Estajo Koslow and Molly Dieterich to dismiss plaintiff's complaint . AFFIDAVIT of Gregg D. Weinstock in Support attached. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Response - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Philip C. Segal, Joseph Lauria, Michael A. Ambrosio, Daniel Turbow and Fred Levitan in Support of the [11-1] motion to dismiss the complaint against the State. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 8/5/1999 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Philip C. Segal, Joseph Lauria, Michael A. Ambrosio, Daniel Turbow and Fred Levitan to dismiss the complaint against the State Defendants . (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Richard Colodny (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint by Carolyn Lumpkin. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/22/1999, Entered: 7/23/1999 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Regina Davis. (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Fred Levitan, Cyprian Belle, Giakas, Duran, Akhazeti, Teressa Hardgrove, F. Balon, Timothy Woo, Cyril E. Jermin, Richard Colodny, Marc Berk, Joyce Baldwin, Regina Davis, Shakima Canty, Carolyn Lumpkin on 7/7/99. Answer due on 7/27/99. Shakima Canty, for Regina Davis, for Joyce Baldwin, for Marc Berk, for Richard Colodny, for Cyril E. Jermin, for Timothy Woo, for F. Balon, for Teressa Hardgrove, for Akhazeti, for Duran, for Giakas, for Cyprian Belle, for Fred Levitan (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/8/1999, Entered: 7/13/1999 Service - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Rudolph W. Giuliani, Nicholas Scoppetta, Hattie L. Lucas, Viviane Demilly, Ronald Bateau, John and Jane Doe, Arnold Elman, Daniel Turbow, Michael A. Ambrosio, Joseph Lauria, Philip C. Segal, Corporation Counsel, Gerald Harris, Jennifer Jones Austin, Susan Jalowski, Estajo Koslow, Molly Dieterich, Saint Joseph For Chi, Benedict Peirce, Edwin Gould For Chil, Arthur Zanko, Ted Marrinaro, Cadija R. Tibbs, Corlora Turnquest, Alana Kay Gore on 7/6/99. (Murphy, Margaret)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 6/29/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDERED, that the Pltff's [1-1] application is granted only with respect to Defts. City of New York and Administration for Children Services. This order is issued without prejudice to further consideration of the application to proceed in forma pauperis as to the other Defts. and without prejudice to dismissal of the complaint once issue has been joined. (Signed by Chief Judge Charles P. Sifton, on 6.29.99). C/M (Hunter, Tara)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 6/10/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Sonny B. Southerland Sr. to proceed in forma pauperis , (Chin, Felix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/9/1999, Entered: 6/15/1999 Complaint - Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed and no summons(es) issued for City Of New York, Rudolph W. Giuliani, Fred Levitan, Administration for, Nicholas Scoppetta, Hattie L. Lucas, Viviane Demilly, Cyprian Belle, Giakas, Duran, Akhazeti, Teressa Hardgrove, F. Balon, Timothy Woo, Ronald Bateau, John and Jane Doe, Arnold Elman, Cyril E. Jermin, Daniel Turbow, Michael A. Ambrosio, Joseph Lauria, Philip C. Segal, Corporation Counsel, Michael Hess, Gerald Harris, Jennifer Jones Austin, Susan Jalowski, Estajo Koslow, Molly Dieterich, Richard Colodny, Marc Berk, Saint Joseph For Chi, Benedict Peirce, Joyce Baldwin, Edwin Gould For Chil, Arthur Zanko, Ted Marrinaro, Cadija R. Tibbs, Corlora Turnquest, Alana Kay Gore, Regina Davis, Shakima Canty, Carolyn Lumpkin, John Doe (Chin, Felix)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 209 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?