Arar v. Ashcroft et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-00249
District Judge David G. Trager, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 28, 2017 at 5:09 PM EDT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Maher Arar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria C. LaHood +1 212 614 6430 +1 212 614 6499 mlahood@ccrjustice.org

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert F. Fink +1 212 835 6000 +1 212 835 6001 robert.fink@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zazy Ivonne Lopez +1 212 896 2933 +1 212 884 8713
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Samuel Sohn +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joshua.sohn@dlapiper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Jayne Sterken +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501
v.
No Logo Edward J McElroy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowrie, Lando & Anastasi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/06/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas M. Sullivan +1 617 395 7036 +1 617 395 7070 tsullivan@ll-a.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Shaw Bransford and Roth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra L Roth +1 202 463 8400 droth@shawbransford.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
No Logo J Scott Blackman, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
No Logo James W. Ziglar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF WILLIAM ALDEN MCDANIEL, JR

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bassel Bakhos +1 410 685 3810 +1 410 685 0203 bb@wamcd.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Alden McDaniel, Jr. +1 410 685 3810 +1 410 685 0203 wam@wamcd.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
No Logo John Ashcroft, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Brumbelow +1 202 616 4330 +1 202 616 4314 jeremy.brumbelow@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Lee Gregg +1 703 299 3700 +1 703 299 3983 Larry.Gregg@usdoj.gov
No Logo Larry D. Thompson, Defendant

Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
No Logo Paula Corrigan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Brumbelow +1 202 616 4330 +1 202 616 4314 jeremy.brumbelow@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy Maltby +1 213 430 8373 +1 213 430 6407 jmaltby@omm.com
TERMINATED: 04/14/2006 Ira H. Raphaelson +1 202 383 5359 +1 202 383 5414 iraphaelson@omm.com
TERMINATED: 04/16/2006 Jim Walden , +1 212 326 2064 +1 212 326 2061 jwalden@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Brumbelow +1 202 616 4330 +1 202 616 4314 jeremy.brumbelow@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
No Logo Tom Ridge, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Brumbelow +1 202 616 4330 +1 202 616 4314 jeremy.brumbelow@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Dunn +1 718 254 6029 +1 718 254 6081 Scott.Dunn@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeremy S Brumbelow +1 202 616 4330 +1 202 616 4314 jeremy.brumbelow@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mary H Mason +1 202 616 4123 +1 202 616 4314 mary.mason@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (119) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 119 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None
USCA JUDGMENT as to 115 Notice of Appeal filed by Maher Arar. It is Ordered that after in banc rehearing, the panel opinion is vacated and the judgment of the District Court is affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 1/15/10. USCA#06-4216-cv. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
    LREF
    Blank 118 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER granting 117 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Thomas M. Sullivan terminated. Ordered by Senior Judge David G. Trager on 1/6/2009. (Siegfried, Evan) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
      LREF
      Blank 117 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None
      Letter MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Edward J McElroy. (Sullivan, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
        LREF
        Blank 116 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None
        The First Supplemental(INDEX) Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 115 Notice of Appeal. Please Note: This INDEX contains only the following documents #'s 2-21 &25. (Gonzalez, Mary) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
          LREF
          Blank 115 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Maher Arar. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 1994097. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            JUDGMENT that pltf. take nothing of the defts; and that pltfs. claims for declaratory relief against defts. in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice; and that pltfs. claims against John Ashcroft, Larry D. Thompson, James W. Ziglar, J. Scott Blackman, Edward J. McElroy, and Robert Mueller in individual capacities are dismissed with prejudice; and the pltfs claims against all ten Johnn Doe defts. are dismissed wothout prejudice. Ordered by Judge Clerk of Court on 8/17/06. (Greene, Donna)c/m (Entered: 08/17/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER endorsed on letter dated 8/7/06 from Maria C. LaHood to Judge Trager. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter an amended judgment incorporating the paragraph below that the parties have agreed upon. Ordered by Judge David G. Trager on 8/7/06. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 08/10/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                JUDGMENT that pltf. take nothing of the defts.; and that pltfs. claims for declaratory relief against defts. in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice; and that pltfs. claims against all ten defts. are dismissed without prejudice . Ordered by Judge Clerk of Court on 7/25/06. (Greene, Donna)c/m (Entered: 07/28/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                  NOTICE by Maher Arar of intent not to replead (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER Attached: Telephone Conference set for 7/10/2006 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate-Judge Steven M. Gold.(Vasquez, Lea) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                      See attached order. Ordered by Judge David G. Trager on 07/05/2006. (Trager, David) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                        REPLY to Response to Motion re 100 Notice of MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Plaintiff's Reply in Further Support of Plaintiff's Motion under Rule 54(b)) filed by Maher Arar. (Rekuc, Maryann) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 Notice of MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) (Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion) filed by Maher Arar. (Rekuc, Maryann) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 100 Notice of MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) filed by all defendants. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/25/2006, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Maltby on behalf of Robert Mueller (Maltby, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/25/2006)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER endorsing parties' joint briefing schedule filed as 103 Letter filed by United States. The Defendants' response to Plaintiff's Rule 54(b) motion shall be filed on or before May 4, 2006; and the Plaintiff's reply, if any shall be filed on or before May 18, 2006. Ordered by Judge David G. Trager on 04/21/2006. (Trager, David) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/20/2006, Entered: None
                                  Letter Regarding Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Rule 54(b) Motion by United States. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                    Letter from Joshua S. Sohn to The Honorable David G. Trager in response to Defendants' letter dated April 11, 2006, by Maher Arar. (Sohn, Joshua) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/11/2006, Entered: None
                                      Letter Requesting Pre-Motion Conference by Robert Mueller, United States, John Ashcroft, James W. Ziglar, Larry D. Thompson, Tom Ridge, J Scott Blackman, Paula Corrigan, Edward J McElroy. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/4/2006, Entered: None
                                        Notice of MOTION for Entry of Judgment under Rule 54(b) by Maher Arar. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law# 2 Certificate of Service)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 04/04/2006)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Memorandum and order issued. Ordered by Judge David G. Trager on 02/16/2006. (Trager, David) (Entered: 02/16/2006)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Letter from Maria LaHood, Plaintiff's counsel to Judge Trager Regarding Motions to Dismiss, Elmaghraby opinion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Elmaghraby Opinion)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Letter from Maria LaHood on behalf of Plaintiff Arar to Judge Trager Regarding State Secrets Assertion. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Letter from Maria LaHood on behalf of Plaintiff Arar to Judge Trager Regarding Motions to Dismiss; response to 9/7/05 Letter from Government. (LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 09/09/2005)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                  Letter from Mary Hampton Mason to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding Plaintiff's Notice of Supp. Auth. Dated August 8, 2005,. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before David G. Trager : Motion hearing held on 8/9/2005. (Court Reporter Henry Shaprio.) (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 08/22/2005)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Letter from Plaintiff's counsel to Judge Trager Regarding errors in oral argument. (LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 08/18/2005)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THE UNITED STATES' ASSERTION OF STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Support DECLARATION OF JAMES B. COMEY by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE by John Ashcroft NOTICE OF FILING (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                              Letter from Scott Dunn, AUSA to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding United States' determination to assert state secrets privilege over the information at the core of Counts I, II, and III of plaintiff's complaint. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                MEMORANDUM of questions to be considered by both parties in preparation for oral argument. Ordered by Judge David G. Trager on 08/05/05. (Trager, David) (Entered: 08/10/2005)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE by Maher Arar of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 8/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                    Letter from AUSA Dennis C. Barghaan, Jr. to Hon. David G. Trager Regarding REAL ID Act?s Application to Issues in Arar v. Ashcroft, et al.. (Sponseller, Richard) (Entered: 08/05/2005)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Letter from Maria LaHood, for Plaintiff Arar to Judge Trager Regarding Supplemental Information for State Secrets Opposition. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 07/27/2005)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting 83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 7/12/05. (Greene, Donna) Receipt: 312446 Fee: $25.00 (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Bassel Bakhos by James W. Ziglar. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 07/19/2005)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                            Letter from Thomas G. Roth, Esq. to Barbara J. Olshansky, Esq., With Attached letter to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding the Government's Dismissal Motion Based Upon its Assertion of the State Secrets Privilege. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY in Support (REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT JOHN ASHCROFT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS ENCOMPASSED BY THE CLAIMS OF STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE) by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                Letter from Ira H. Raphaelson, Esq. to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding the United States' Assertion of the State Secrets Privilege and its Corresponding Request for the Dismissal of Counts I-III. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE by John Ashcroft (NOTICE OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT JAMES ZIGLAR TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BASED ON STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE) (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support (NOTICE OF MOTION) and (MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT JAMES ZIGLAR TO DISMISS COMPLAINT BASED ON STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE) by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE by John Ashcroft (NOTICE OF PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS THE CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT JOHN ASHCROFT IN HIS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY ENCOMPASSED BY THE CLAIMS OF STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE) (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support OF DEFENDANT JOHN ASHCROFT'S PARTIAL MOTION TO DISMISS CLAIMS ENCOMPASSED BY THE CLAIMS OF STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in Opposition (DECLARATION OF MARIA C. LAHOOD IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' INVOCATION OF THE STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE) by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT in Support DECLARATION OF JOSHUA S. SOHN by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition PLAINTIFF MAHER ARAR'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' INVOCATION OF THE STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY in Opposition REPLY OF UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO UNITED STATES' INVOCATION OF THE STATE SECRETS PRIVILEGE by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/12/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter from Scott Dunn, AUSA to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding The Filing of Documents Relating to the Assertion of the State Secrets Privilege in this Case. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/12/2005)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Letter from Scott Dunn, AUSA to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding Documents filed Relating to the Assertion of the state Secrets Privilege in this Case. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 04/08/2005)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 67 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment , with Supporting Memorandum of Law to be filed separately below, MOTION for Summary Judgment , with Supporting Memorandum of Law to be filed separately below, filed by J Scott Blackman. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 67 MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment , with Supporting Memorandum of Law to be filed separately below, MOTION for Summary Judgment , with Supporting Memorandum of Law to be filed separately below, by J Scott Blackman. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss , or in the alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment , with Supporting Memorandum of Law to be filed separately below, by J Scott Blackman. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Defendant Blackman# 2 Statement of Facts# 3 Certificate of Service)(Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to Motion re 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims filed by Robert Mueller. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by James W. Ziglar. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims filed by Edward J McElroy. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims filed by Larry D. Thompson. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY to Response to Motion re 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims, and Supporting Memorandum, filed by John Ashcroft. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Official-Capacity Claims filed by Robert Mueller, United States, John Ashcroft, Tom Ridge, Paula Corrigan. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 58 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims, 57 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims, 59 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims, 55 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Official-Capacity Claims, 28 First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, 56 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims, and Supporting Memorandum, filed by Maher Arar. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims by Robert Mueller. (Attachments: # 1)(Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims by Edward J McElroy. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims by Larry D. Thompson. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum of Law)(Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Individual-Capacity Claims, and Supporting Memorandum, by John Ashcroft. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/23/2005, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Official-Capacity Claims by Robert Mueller, United States, John Ashcroft, Tom Ridge, Paula Corrigan. (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Memorandum)(Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER endorsed on [53 letter granting requests by both parties for page extensions. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 03/11/05. (Trager, David) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Letter MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for State Secrets Response by Maher Arar. (Attachments: # 1)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER endorsed on letter granting extension of time to file response/reply regarding State Secrets privilege and approving briefing schedule set forth in the letter. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 02/03/05. (Trager, David) (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply regarding State Secrets by Maher Arar. (Attachments: # 1)(LaHood, Maria) (Entered: 03/02/2005)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Maher Arar OF APPEARANCE; that DLA Piper Rudnick Gary Cary US LLP hereby enters its appearance on behalf of plaintiff Maher Arar as co-counsel in this action (Sterken, Sarah) (Entered: 02/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER endorsed on 47 letter granting plaintiff's request for extension of time. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 02/10/2005. Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2005 (Greene, Donna). (Entered: 02/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER endorsed on 46 consent motion granting defendants' requests for extension of time. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 02/10/2005. (Trager, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/22/2005 (Greene, Donna). (Entered: 02/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/9/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Maher Arar. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Certificate of Service)(Olshansky, Barbara) (Entered: 02/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 30 Order by all defendants. (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy S Brumbelow on behalf of United States, Robert Mueller, John Ashcroft, Tom Ridge, Paula Corrigan (Brumbelow, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 43 Motion for Limited Admission. Fee: $25.00 Receipt 304528. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 1/18/05. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission by Larry D. Thompson. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 41 Motion for Limited Admission. Fee: $25.00 Receipt 304529. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 1/18/05. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission by Larry D. Thompson. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 39 Motion for Limited Admission. Fee: $25.00 Receipt 304530. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 1/18/05. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission by Larry D. Thompson. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 37 Motion for Limited Admission. Fee $25.00 Receipt 304527. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 1/18/05. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission by Larry D. Thompson. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 01/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER setting forth briefing schedule for submission of briefs in response to United States' assetion of state-secrets privilege. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 01/25/2005. (Trager, David) (Entered: 01/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Scott Dunn, AUSA to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding The United States Determination in Follow-up to the September 17, 2004 letter to the Court and Parties. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE by John Ashcroft (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by John Ashcroft. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 31 motion for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Maria LaHood. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 01/06/2005. (Trager, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2005 (Greene, Donna). (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Limited Admission Pro Hac Vice for Maria LaHood by Maher Arar. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Maria LaHood# 2 Text of Proposed Order # 3 Affidavit Certificate of Service)(Olshansky, Barbara) (Entered: 01/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting plaintiff's proposed briefing schedule. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 12/20/2004. (Trager, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2004 (Chee, Alvin). (Entered: 12/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting parties' joint proposal to extend briefing schedule. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 11/29/04. (Trager, David) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2004 (Greene, Donna). (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        First MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by James W. Ziglar. (McDaniel, William) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter from Mary Hampton Mason to Barbara J. Olshansky, Esq. dted 9/17/04 enclosing copies of the United States Notice of Motion and the Memorandum of Law in support. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Larry L Gregg on behalf of John Ashcroft (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 09/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 24 parties' jointly submitted briefing schedule. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 8/26/04. (Trager, David) (Entered: 09/07/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from AUSA Scott Dunn to Judge David Trager Regarding Briefing schedule in Arar v. Ashcroft, et al along with an ORDER. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 08/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/20/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter dtd 7/9/04 to Judge David G. Trager from Barbara Olshansky, responding to Defendant's Meuller's and Thompson's contention that the Court lacks personal jurisdiction over them for purposes of the claims brought against them in their individual capacity. Plaintiff's request the opportunity to undertake discovery. (Schillat, Louise) (Entered: 08/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter from Scott Dunn to Honorable David G. Trager Regarding Order Dated May 10th 2004. (Dunn, Scott) (Entered: 07/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER endorsed on letter dated July 1, 2004 from Barbara Olshansky. Plaintiff's time to file a response to defendants' pre-motion conference letters is extended to July 8, and permission to file a responsive letter of not more than 10 pages is granted.. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 7/1/04. (Trager, David) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 19 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 6/4/04. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission by James W. Ziglar. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Sullivan on behalf of Edward J McElroy (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 14 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 6/1/04. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Service by Thomas M. Sullivan of the Notice of appearance, motion to admit, affidavit of Debra L. Roth in support of motion and Order granting admission upon counsel. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Debra L. Roth in support of motion to admit counsel Pro Hac Vice. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission of Debra L. Roth by Edward J McElroy. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 06/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 11 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by JudgeDavid G. Trager on 5/12/04. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Limited Admission of Ira H. Raphaelson by Robert Mueller. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Jim Walden on behalf of Robert Mueller. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 4/27/04 from Barbara Olshansky, Esq. to Hon. David G. Trager in response to the govt's 4/19/04 letter requesting a pre-motion conference. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter dated 5/6/04 from AUSA Scott Dunn to USDJ David G. Trager requesting that the court issue an order approving the schedule for pre-motion letters. (Noh, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER approving the following motion schedule: 6/21/04 each individual Federal dfts will serve his pre-motion letter on the US Attorney's Office. 7/6/04 plt will serve any and all responses to those letters and file them with the court on 7/7/04. Signed by Judge David G. Trager on 5/10/04. (Noh, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter dated 5/7/04 from Jim Walden & Ira H. Raphaelson to USDJ David G. Trager that the complaint shoudl be dismissed for lack of personal jurisdiction. (Noh, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/11/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter dated 4/19/04 from AUSA Scott Dunn to Hon. David G. Trager requesting a pre-motion conference for govt defts to file a motion to dismiss. (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on James W. Ziglar on 3/15/04, filed by Maher Arar. (Noh, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Service for summons & complaint served on Larry Thompson on 3/15/04, filed by Maher Arar. (Noh, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed John Ashcroft served on 3/15/2004, answer due 4/5/2004; J Scott Blackman served on 3/15/2004, answer due 4/5/2004; Edward J McElroy served on 3/15/2004, answer due 4/5/2004; Robert Mueller served on 3/15/2004, answer due 4/5/2004. (Greene, Donna) (Entered: 04/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT Summons Issued against John Ashcroft, J Scott Blackman, Paula Corrigan, John Does 1-10, Edward J McElroy, Robert Mueller, Tom Ridge, Larry D. Thompson, James W. Ziglar filing fee $ 150, receipt number 288647, filed by Maher Arar. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Joe, Victor) (Entered: 01/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 125 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?