J&J Sports Productions, Inc. v. Lopez
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-06080

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 7:38 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 47 U.S.C. § 605
Nature of Suit Cable/Satellite TV
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that judgment is entered in favor of plaintiff, and against defendants in the amount of $7,761.50, reflecting $1,099.00 in statutory damages, $5,000.00 for willful violation of the statute, and $1662.50 in attorneys' fees and costs; and that plaintiff's request for a permanent injunction is denied. c/m. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 6/29/06. (Williams-Jackson, Sandy)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS -- No objections were filed to the Report and Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack dated June 9, 2006. Upon consideration, the Report and Recommendation is hereby ADOPTED in full. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for entry of a default judgment against defendants is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court ENTER JUDGMENT against the defendants, jointly and severally, in the total amount of & #036;7,761.50. SEE ATTACHED WRITTEN ORDER FOR DETAILS. ORDERED that service of a copy of this Order shall be made by the Clerk of this Court by forwarding a copy hereof to the parties. SO ORDERED by Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 06/29/06. (Irizarry, Dora)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 3 Filed: 1/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER: An initial conference will be held on April 21, 2006 at 11am, before the Honorable Joan M. Azrack, United States Magistrate Judge in Room 1210S. c/m by chambers. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 1/12/06. (Williams-Jackson, Sandy)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 0 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?