Redford et al v. Chicago Title Insurance et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00434
District Judge Carol B. Amon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 27, 2017 at 12:49 AM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DANIELLE BITON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space DANIELLE BITON +1 347 325 2885
No Logo SAPHYRE REDFORD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 302

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Saphyre Redford +1 646 299 7435
v.
No Logo "Baby Doe", Defendant
No Logo Danielle Bitton, Defendant
No Logo "Heaven Group", Defendant
No Logo "IRA" The Clerk, Defendant
No Logo Joseph, Defendant
No Logo "Katrina of Louisiana of NYC Taking place at the building that has never been officiated by the state attorney of New York for zoning, abandoned building that everyone came to attack and hurt Cha, Defendant
No Logo "Mignon", Defendant
No Logo "Ron" Owner of Bubby's Restaurant, Defendant
No Logo 275 Greenwich Street Condominium Board, Defendant
No Logo 9/11 Trust Fund, Defendant
No Logo A Certain photocopying machine worth one million dollars from Farmingham, Massachusetts, that came from a fake rubbish UUC that belongs one of many to Maria Gordian, Expert of prescriptions and who ha, Defendant
No Logo Aaron Anderson, Defendant
No Logo Adrienne Maidenbaum, Defendant
Aetna, Inc. Aetna, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "AETNA"
No Logo Aetna Life Casualty and Surety Company of Illinois, Defendant
Aetna Life Insurance Company Aetna Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo AFA, Defendant
No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Allstate"
No Logo Aloft Construction, Defendant
No Logo Andrew M. Cuomo, Defendant
No Logo Anthony D. Grande, Defendant
No Logo Apple Bank, Defendant
No Logo Archives Commercial Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Archives LLC, Defendant
No Logo Archives Residential Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Archives Tenants Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Arco Construction, Defendant
No Logo Argo Construction, Defendant
No Logo Assistant Comptroller for Real Estate Investments, Defendant
No Logo At&t, Defendant
No Logo Atalanta Building, Defendant
No Logo Atkinson et al LLP, Defendant
No Logo Banco Populaire, Defendant
No Logo Bank of Bermuda, Defendant
No Logo Bank of Brazil, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of California, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of California"
No Logo Bank of Israel, Defendant
No Logo Bay Habor International Realty Century 21, Defendant
No Logo Bay Harbor International Realty, Defendant
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bernanke"
No Logo Bitton Realty, Defendant
No Logo Black Rock Group, Defendant
No Logo Blue Cross and Blue Shield Association, Defendant
Officially listed as "Blue Cross/Blue Shield"
No Logo Bogliono Trust Fund, Defendant
No Logo Bond Plumbing, Defendant
No Logo Boston Logan Int'l Airport, Defendant
No Logo Bronx Supply Store, Defendant
No Logo Bubby's Restaurant, Defendant
No Logo Capital Management, Defendant
No Logo Capital Management Trust, Defendant
No Logo Caren Matyckas, Defendant
No Logo Case Management of the State of New York Unified Court System Supreme Court, Defendant
No Logo Cayman Islands Bank, Defendant
No Logo CB Board One, Defendant
No Logo Charles Harris, Defendant
No Logo Charles Rangel, Defendant
No Logo CHASE HOME FINANCE LLC, Defendant
No Logo Chemical Bank Successor by Merger to the Chase Manhanttan Bank (National Association), Defendant
No Logo Chevy Chase Bank, Defendant
No Logo Chicago O'Hare International Airport, Defendant
No Logo Chicago Title Insurance, Defendant
No Logo Chin Yu, Defendant
No Logo Circle Rouge Restaurant, Defendant
No Logo City Council Finance for the City of New York, Defendant
No Logo New York City Office Of The Comptroller, Defendant
Officially listed as "Comptroller of New York City"
No Logo Continental Abstract Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cotton and Wood, Defendant
No Logo Countrywide Home Mortgages, Defendant
No Logo D'agostino, Defendant
No Logo Dan Feldman, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Hoelter, Defendant
No Logo Dankberg, Defendant
No Logo Darlingon's, Defendant
No Logo Darnay Hoffman, Defendant
No Logo David Glaser, Defendant
No Logo David J. Koehl, Defendant
No Logo David N. Murad, Defendant
No Logo DEA, Defendant
No Logo Deandrea Chapman, Defendant
No Logo Debra Daniels, Defendant
No Logo Department Of Buildings, Defendant
United States Department of Education United States Department of Education, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Education"
No Logo Department of Environment, Defendant
No Logo Department Of Social Services, Defendant
No Logo California Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Transportation"
No Logo Deutsch Bank, Defendant
DLA Piper (US) LLP DLA Piper (US) LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary US LLP"
No Logo Douglas Elliman Pridential Real Estate Realty, Defendant
No Logo Douglas Graham Grant, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Beraka and Son, Defendant
No Logo Dr. G. Degeronimo, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Ira Feingold, Defendant
No Logo Dr. X who operated to remove Charlene's Implants and Saistcally Left her scared and was in coohoot on how to destroy her, Defendant
No Logo Dru Witacke, Defendant
No Logo Duane Reade Pharmaceuticals Stores, Defendant
No Logo EAP, Defendant
No Logo East Bank, Defendant
No Logo Ed Berian, Defendant
No Logo Einholtz, Defendant
No Logo Eliezar Cohen, Defendant
No Logo Eliott Sutton, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Harris, Defendant
No Logo Envy Publications, Defendant
No Logo Eric and Carlin Rothstein, Defendant
No Logo Esquires, Defendant
No Logo Eugene Keilin, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FBI"
No Logo FDA, Defendant
No Logo FDCA, Defendant
No Logo FDIC, Defendant
No Logo FEC, Defendant
No Logo Federal Savings Bank, Defendant
No Logo Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo Felix Ngati, Defendant
No Logo Felix Rohatyn, Defendant
No Logo FEMA, Defendant
No Logo Fema of Katrina of Louisiana, Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Insurance, Defendant
No Logo Financial Aid Services, Defendant
No Logo First Responders Mortgage, Defendant
No Logo Frank Composto, Defendant
No Logo Frome, Defendant
No Logo Gallagher Basset, Defendant
No Logo Gallagher Construction, Defendant
No Logo Geroge Tserkis, Defendant
No Logo Getnick, Defendant
No Logo Goldberg, Weprin, & Ustin, Esqs, Defendant
No Logo Graham Associates, Defendant
No Logo Graham Consulting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Greenpoint Mortage Funding, Inc., Defendant
H&R Block, Inc. H&R Block, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "H&R Block"
No Logo Health and Hospitals Workers Union, Defendant
No Logo Health Hospital Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Herbert Berman, Defendant
No Logo Hillary Rodham Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Hillary Rodman-Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Hippa, Defendant
No Logo Hizoner, Defendant
No Logo Houlihan-Parnes, Defendant
No Logo HSBC Operations in America and Europe, Defendant
No Logo HUD, Defendant
No Logo Hustler's Gentleman's Club, Defendant
No Logo Ireaeli Construction Group of Gangsters , who forge signatures, money launders, and force young girls into prostitutuion, and when they cry they b eat the shit out of them, Defendant
No Logo JAMES FERRARA, Defendant
No Logo James Mullen, Defendant
No Logo James Rumpza, Defendant
No Logo Jason Daniels, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Lee Hubbard, Defendant
No Logo JFK/LGA/EWR International Airport, Defendant
No Logo Joan Xie, Defendant
No Logo Joe Turco, Defendant
No Logo John Peachy, Defendant
No Logo John Xie Al Esquires, Defendant
No Logo Jordan Wills, Defendant
No Logo JP Morgan Chase, Defendant
No Logo Julian Barnes Law Group, Defendant
No Logo Karen Smith, Defendant
No Logo Karla Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Keith Halperin, Esquire, Defendant
No Logo Kevin McKirgan, Defendant
FedEx Corporation FedEx Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kinkos"
No Logo Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, Defendant
No Logo Leland D. Grasse, Defendant
No Logo Leon Ruchelsman, Defendant
No Logo Levy and Halperin, LLP, Defendant
No Logo Liberty Title Agency, Defendant
No Logo Lindsay Freitfertig, Defendant
No Logo Liquor Licence Board, Defendant
No Logo Livington, Defendant
No Logo Local 74 Service Employees International Union AFL-CIO, Defendant
No Logo Los Angeles Int'l Airport, Defendant
No Logo Lubavitch Jewish Organization, Defendant
No Logo M.G. Title Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Madame X, Defendant
No Logo Madison Abstract, Defendant
No Logo Maidenbaum, Defendant
No Logo Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Marc Seitlement, Defendant
No Logo Maria Gordian, Defendant
No Logo Mario Cuomo, Defendant
No Logo Marjorie Tsang, Defendant
No Logo Mark Chapman, Defendant
No Logo Martin Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Marty Markowitz, Defendant
No Logo Marvin Turkel, Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Aboulafia, Defendant
No Logo Matthew Mansfield, Defendant
No Logo Maurice Reichsman, Defendant
No Logo McKinsey & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "McKinsey and Company"
No Logo Medicaid, Defendant
No Logo Medicare, Defendant
No Logo Merchants Bank, Defendant
No Logo Meril Lynch, Defendant
No Logo MERS, Defendant
No Logo Metro Tech Fire Department, Defendant
No Logo Michael Berman's Construction Company, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Michael Falabella, Defendant
No Logo Michael Lippert, Defendant
No Logo Michael Rublowsky, Defendant
No Logo Miramax, Defendant
No Logo Mishkin & Tully LLP, Defendant
No Logo MOHR, Defendant
No Logo Mount Batten, Defendant
No Logo Mr. and Mrs. Freitgertig, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Mohammed Najem, Defendant
No Logo Mr. White, Defendant
No Logo Ms. Micheal Berman, Defendant
No Logo Municipal Assistance Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Municipal Credit Union, Defendant
No Logo Municipalities Unions, Defendant
No Logo National City Bank, Defendant
No Logo National Health Insurance(United Kingdom), Defendant
No Logo Nationwide Title Clearing, Defendant
No Logo New Hampshire Insurance, Defendant
No Logo New York County Commissioner of Deeds, Defendant
No Logo New York Housing Department, Defendant
No Logo New York Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo New York Sanitation Department, Defendant
No Logo New York State Department of Taxation, Defendant
No Logo New York State Guardian, Defendant
No Logo New York State Health and Hospital Corporation, Defendant
No Logo New York State Higher Education Corporation Services, Defendant
No Logo New York State Keeper of the Files Accountability, Defendant
No Logo New York State Mental Health Department, Defendant
No Logo New York Teachers's Pension Fund Retirement, Defendant
No Logo Norman Tingling, Defendant
No Logo North Fork Bank, Defendant
No Logo North Moore Condominium OP, Defendant
No Logo North Moore Enterprises LTD., Defendant
No Logo North Moore Land Co. Inc., Defendant
No Logo North Moore Parking Corporation, Defendant
No Logo North Moore Tower Realty Corp., Defendant
No Logo North Moore Ventures, Defendant
No Logo NYPD, Defendant
No Logo Olsham Grundman, Defendant
No Logo Olson, Defendant
No Logo Patrick Leung Consulting, Defendant
No Logo Paul Donovan, Defendant
No Logo PC22678, as agent for Fidelity National Title Insurance, Defendant
No Logo Police Commissioner of NYPD, Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York/New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Precise/Ceres Abstract Corp., Defendant
No Logo Purvi Harendra Sevak, Defendant
No Logo Queens Heathrow International Airport, Defendant
No Logo Raluca V. Oncioiu, Defendant
No Logo Rappaport, Feinstein, and Deutsch, Defendant
No Logo Ray, Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Real Estate Vice President for New York Life Insurance Company, Defendant
No Logo RG Brenner Tax Services Preparer, Defendant
No Logo Richard A, Brancato, Defendant
No Logo Robert De Nero, Defendant
No Logo Robert Segal, Defendant
No Logo Rockrose Development Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Rockrose General Equities LLC, Defendant
No Logo Rockrose Master LLC, Defendant
No Logo Rockrose Properties L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Rosen & Livingston, Defendant
No Logo Rosenzweig & Wolosky LLP, Defendant
No Logo Saphyire Adult Entertainment Gentlemans's Club, Defendant
No Logo Scores Entertainment, Defendant
No Logo Sean Serpe, Defendant
No Logo SEC, Defendant
No Logo Senator Barney Frank, Defendant
No Logo Senator Kerry, Defendant
No Logo Seyfarth Shaw LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Seyfarth and Shaw"
No Logo Shaw & Associates, Defendant
No Logo Shawn Donovan, Defendant
No Logo Sheldon Silver, Defendant
No Logo Sid Miller, Defendant
No Logo Signature Bank, Defendant
No Logo Simon Tan, Defendant
No Logo Social Security for the United States of America, Defendant
No Logo Soho Equities, Defendant
No Logo Soho House, Defendant
No Logo Spar & Bernstein, Defendant
No Logo Spearmint's Gentleman's Strip Club, Defendant
No Logo Stanley Stairs, Defendant
No Logo Office of the New York Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "State Attorney General for the State of New York"
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "State Farm Insurance"
No Logo State of California, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of Massachusetts, Defendant
Officially listed as "State of Massachusetts"
No Logo State of New York State Board of Real Property Services, Defendant
No Logo State Secretary of Corporation for the State of Delaware, Defendant
No Logo State Secretary of Corporations for the State of New York, Defendant
No Logo State Street Bank of Boston, Defendant
No Logo Steve "Pimp", Defendant
No Logo Steven Eckerberg, Defendant
No Logo Steven J. Hughes, Defendant
No Logo Steven Lebouef, Defendant
No Logo Susan Straatmann, Defendant
No Logo Teacher's Federation Union, Defendant
No Logo Teh Comptroller of The State of New York, as trustee of the Common Retirement Fund, Defendant
No Logo Teitelbaum Group, Defendant
No Logo The Comptroller of the State of New York, Defendant
No Logo The Comptroller of the State of New York as Trustee of the common retirement fund, Defendant
No Logo Thomas J. Fleming, Esq., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Spier Group, Defendant
No Logo Travelers Insurance, Defendant
No Logo Tribeca Pharmacy, Defendant
No Logo Tribeca Tavern, Defendant
No Logo Tribeca Towers, Defendant
No Logo Tribeca Tribe Network, Defendant
No Logo Trudy Craney, Defendant
No Logo Trudy German Carmen, Defendant
No Logo Turnberry International Realty, Defendant
No Logo Turnberry Isle Association, Defendant
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant
No Logo UCC Direct Services, Defendant
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "United Airlines"
No Logo United Airlines Credit Union, Defendant
No Logo United Kingdom Pension Fund, Defendant
United States Department of the Treasury United States Department of the Treasury, Defendant
Officially listed as "United States Treasury Department"
No Logo Valerie Marsh, Defendant
No Logo Vanguard, Defendant
Verizon Communications, Inc. Verizon Communications, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Verizon"
No Logo Vice President, Defendant
No Logo Vice President JP Morgan Chase Bank, Defendant
No Logo Vintage Abstract Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Walter B. Tolub, Defendant
No Logo Washington Dulles International Airport, Defendant
Washington Mutual Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Defendant
No Logo Weinstein Brothers, Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
No Logo Wilmer Grier, Defendant
No Logo Wilmer Hill Grier, Defendant
No Logo Workers Compensation Board, Defendant
No Logo World Savings, Defendant
No Logo Wouter Germans, Defendant
No Logo Zaransky, Esquires, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Letter
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Reopen Case
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None USCA Mandate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None Mail Returned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Judgment*Court Filing
                        CIVIL JUDGMENT: ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the complaint is hereby dismissed. For purpose of any appeal, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. (Ordered by Judge Carol B. Amon, on 3/5/2010) C/mailed w/appeals package. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/5/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisCourt Filing
                          OPINION AND ORDER: Plaintiffs' requests ( 2 , 3 ) to proceed in forma pauperis are granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 solely for the purpose of this Order. Plaintiffs' complaint is dismissed as frivolous. Furthermore, the Court must warn plaintiffs that it will not toleratefrivolous litigation. The Court may enter an Order barring the acceptance of any future in forma pauperis complaints for filing without first obtaining leave of the Court to do so. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. SO ORDERED. (Ordered by Judge Carol B. Amon, on 3/5/2010) C/mailed. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danielle Biton. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                              MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Saphyre Redford. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 2/4/2010 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against A Certain photocopying machine worth one million dollars from Farmingham, Massachusetts, that came from a fake rubbish UUC that belongs one of many to Maria Gordian, Expert of prescriptions and who ha, AETNA, AFA, AFL-CIO, Matthew Aboulafia, Aetna Life Casualty and Surety Company of Illinois, Aetna Life Insurance Company, Karla Alexander, Allstate, Aloft Construction, Aaron Anderson, Apple Bank, Archives Commercial Partnership, Archives LLC, Archives Residential Partnership, Archives Tenants Corporation, Arco Construction, Argo Construction, Assistant Comptroller for Real Estate Investments, At&t, Atalanta Building, Atkinson et al LLP, Banco Populaire, Bank of Bermuda, Bank of Brazil, Bank of California, Bank of Israel, Bay Habor International Realty Century 21, Bay Harbor International Realty, Herbert Berman, Bernanke, Bitton Realty, Black Rock Group, Michael Bloomberg, Blue Cross/Blue Shield, Bogliono Trust Fund, Bond Plumbing, Boston Logan Int'l Airport, Bronx Supply Store, Bubby's Restaurant, CB Board One, Capital Management, Capital Management Trust, Caren Matyckas, Case Management of the State of New York Unified Court System Supreme Court, Cayman Islands Bank, Mark Chapman, Chase Home Finance LLC, Chemical Bank Successor by Merger to the Chase Manhanttan Bank (National Association), Chevy Chase Bank, Chicago O'Hare International Airport, Chicago Title Insurance, Circle Rouge Restaurant, City Council Finance for the City of New York, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Eliezar Cohen, Frank Composto, Comptroller of New York City, Continental Abstract Corporation, Cotton and Wood, Countrywide Home Mortgages, Andrew M. Cuomo, Mario Cuomo, D'Agostino, DEA, DLA Piper Rudnick Gray Cary US LLP, Daniel Hoelter, Debra Daniels, Jason Daniels, Dankberg, Darlingon's, David J. Koehl, Robert De Nero, Deandrea Chapman, Department of Buildings, Department of Education, Department of Environment, Department of Social Services, Department of Transportation, Deutsch Bank, Douglas Elliman Pridential Real Estate Realty, Dr. Beraka and Son, Dr. G. Degeronimo, Dr. Ira Feingold, Dr. X who operated to remove Charlene's Implants and Saistcally Left her scared and was in coohoot on how to destroy her, Duane Reade Pharmaceuticals Stores, EAP, East Bank, Ed Berian, Einholtz, Envy Publications, Eric and Carlin Rothstein, Esquires, FBI, FDA, FDCA, FDIC, FEC, FEMA, Federal Savings Bank, Feinberg, Dan Feldman, Fema of Katrina of Louisiana, James Ferrara, Fidelity Insurance, Financial Aid Services, First Responders Mortgage, Thomas J. Fleming, Esq., Lindsay Freitfertig, Frome, Gallagher Basset, Gallagher Construction, Geroge Tserkis, Getnick, David Glaser, Goldberg, Weprin, & Ustin, Esqs, Maria Gordian, Graham Associates, Graham Consulting Corporation, Anthony D. Grande, Douglas Graham Grant, Leland D. Grasse, Greenpoint Mortage Funding, Inc., Wilmer Grier, Olsham Grundman, H&R Block, HSBC Operations in America and Europe, HUD, Charles Harris, Elizabeth Harris, Health Hospital Corporation, Health and Hospitals Workers Union, Hippa, Hizoner, Darnay Hoffman, Houlihan-Parnes, Steven J. Hughes, Hustler's Gentleman's Club, Ireaeli Construction Group of Gangsters, who forge signatures, money launders, and force young girls into prostitutuion, and when they cry they b eat the shit out of them, JFK/LGA/EWR International Airport, JP Morgan Chase, Jeffrey Lee Hubbard, Joe Turco, John Xie Al Esquires, Jordan Wills, Julian Barnes Law Group, Eugene Keilin, Keith Halperin, Esquire, Ray Kelly, Kinkos, Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP, Steven Lebouef, Levy and Halperin, LLP, Liberty Title Agency, Liquor Licence Board, Livington, Los Angeles Int'l Airport, Lubavitch Jewish Organization, M.G. Title Services, Inc., MERS, MOHR, Madame X, Madison Abstract, Maidenbaum, Matthew Mansfield, Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company, Marjorie Tsang, Marty Markowitz, Massachusetts, McKinsey and Company, Kevin McKirgan, Medicaid, Medicare, Merchant's Bank, Meril Lynch, Metro Tech Fire Department, Michael Berman's Construction Company, Michael Falabella, Michael Lippert, Sid Miller, Miramax, Mishkin & Tully LLP, Mount Batten, Mr. Mohammed Najem, Mr. White, Mr. and Mrs. Freitgertig, Ms. Micheal Berman, James Mullen, Municipal Assistance Corporation, Municipal Credit Union, Municipalities Unions, David N. Murad, NYPD, National City Bank, National Health Insurance(United Kingdom), Nationwide Title Clearing, New Hampshire Insurance, New York County Commissioner of Deeds, New York Housing Department, New York Life Insurance Company, New York Sanitation Department, New York State Department of Taxation, New York State Guardian, New York State Health and Hospital Corporation, New York State Higher Education Corporation Services, New York State Keeper of the Files Accountability, New York State Mental Health Department, New York Teachers's Pension Fund Retirement, Felix Ngati, North Fork Bank, North Moore Condominium OP, North Moore Enterprises LTD., North Moore Land Co. Inc., North Moore Parking Corporation, North Moore Tower Realty Corp., North Moore Ventures, Olson, PC22678, as agent for Fidelity National Title Insurance, Patrick Leung Consulting, Paul Donovan, John Peachy, Police Commissioner of NYPD, Port Authority of New York/New Jersey, Precise/Ceres Abstract Corp., Purvi Harendra Sevak, Queens Heathrow International Airport, RG Brenner Tax Services Preparer, Raluca V. Oncioiu, Charles Rangel, Rappaport, Feinstein, and Deutsch, Real Estate Vice President for New York Life Insurance Company, Maurice Reichsman, Richard A, Brancato, Rockrose Development Corporation, Rockrose General Equities LLC, Rockrose Master LLC, Rockrose Properties L.L.C., Hillary Rodman-Clinton, Felix Rohatyn, Rosen and Livingston, Rosenzweig & Wolosky LLP, Michael Rublowsky, Leon Ruchelsman, James Rumpza, SEC, Saphyire Adult Entertainment Gentlemans's Club, Scores Entertainment, Robert Segal, Marc Seitlement, Senator Barney Frank, Senator Kerry, Sean Serpe, Seyfarth and Shaw, Martin Shaw, Shaw and Associates, Shawn Donovan, Signature Bank, Sheldon Silver, Simon Tan, Karen Smith, Social Security for the United States of America, Soho Equities, Soho House, Spar and Bernstein, Spearmint's Gentleman's Strip Club, Stanley Stairs, State Attorney General for the State of New York, State Farm Insurance, State Secretary of Corporation for the State of Delaware, State Secretary of Corporations for the State of New York, State Street Bank of Boston, State of California, State of Massachusetts, State of New York State Board of Real Property Services, Steve "Pimp", Steven Eckerberg, Susan Straatmann, Eliott Sutton, Teacher's Federation Union, Teh Comptroller of The State of New York, as trustee of the Common Retirement Fund, Teitelbaum Group, The Comptroller of the State of New York, The Comptroller of the State of New York as Trustee of the common retirement fund, Norman Tingling, Tishman Spier Group, Walter B. Tolub, Traveler's Insurance, Tribeca Pharmacy, Tribeca Tavern, Tribeca Towers, Tribeca Tribe Network, Trudy Craney, Trudy German Carmen, Marvin Turkel, Turnberry International Realty, Turnberry Isle Association, UAL Corporation, UCC Direct Services, United Airlines, United Airlines Credit Union, United Kingdom Pension Fund, United States Treasury Department, Valerie Marsh, Vanguard, Verizon, Vice President, Vice President JP Morgan Chase Bank, Vintage Abstract Corporation, Washington Dulles International Airport, Washington Mutual Bank, Weinstein Brothers, Wells Fargo Bank NA, Wilmer Hill Grier, Dru Witacke, Workers Compensation Board, World Savings, Wouter Germans, Joan Xie, Chin Yu, Zaransky, Esquires, "Baby Doe", "Danielle Bitton", "Heaven Group", "IRA" The Clerk, "Joseph", "Katrina of Louisiana of NYC Taking place at the building that has never been officiated by the state attorney of New York for zoning, abandoned building that everyone came to attack and hurt Cha, "Mignon", "Ron" Owner of Bubby's Restaurant, 275 Greenwich Street Condominium Board, 9/11 Trust Fund, filed by Danielle Biton, Saphyre Redford. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Davis, Kimberly) . (Entered: 02/04/2010)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 187 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?