Hector et al v. City of New York et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-03987
District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis
Last Updated September 19, 2016 at 10:16 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Cherilyn Hector, Plaintiff

Represented by Leventhal & Klein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Harris Klein +1 718 722 4100 +1 718 522 3225 bklein@levklein.com
No Logo Kareem Stanley, Plaintiff

Represented by Leventhal & Klein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brett Harris Klein +1 718 722 4100 +1 718 522 3225 bklein@levklein.com
v.
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Represented by Harvis Wright & Fett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Baree Nichole Fett +1 212 323 6880 +1 212 323 6881 bfett@hwf.nyc
No Logo John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, Defendant
No Logo John Nixon, Defendant

Represented by Harvis Wright & Fett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Baree Nichole Fett +1 212 323 6880 +1 212 323 6881 bfett@hwf.nyc
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
Stipulation of Settlement and Order of Dismissal: The action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs, expenses or attorneys' fees in excess of the specified amount. The City of New York agrees to pay plaintiff Cherilyn Hector the sum of $60,000.00 in full satisfaction of all claims, and plaintiff Kareem Stanley the sum of $28,000.00 in full satisfaction of all claims. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/30/2011. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/30/2011, Entered: None
STIPULATION of Dismissal and Settlement by City of New York, John Nixon (Fett, Baree) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER ORDER re 18 Stipulation of discontinuance to be filed within 30 days. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/31/2011. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT advising of settlement reached by City of New York, John Nixon (Fett, Baree) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
STATUS REPORT ORDER re 16 Request granted. (Status Report due by 8/19/2011) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 7/22/2011. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT by the parties by City of New York, John Nixon (Fett, Baree) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 7/8/2011. Defendant's need additional time to get settlement authority. Parties to report by letter on 7/20/11. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone \ Settlement Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 5/12/2011. Parties discussing settlement. Conference set for 6/30/11 @ 3:00 PM. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting 12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned to 5/11/11 @ 3:30 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 4/6/2011. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/6/2011, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Cherilyn Hector, Kareem Stanley. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 04/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/16/2011, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by John Nixon. (Fett, Baree) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
CORRECTED MINUTE ENTRY ORDER re 9 MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 2/22/2011. Plaintiff's time to amend Complaint is extended until after next conference. Defendant Nixon time to answer extended to 3/15/11. Conference set for 4/8/11 @ 2:30 PM. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 2/23/2011. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None
MINUTE ENTRY for Telephone Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 2/22/2011. Plaintiff to amend; defendant given until March 15 to answer for new defendant. Conference set for 4/8/11 @ 2:30 PM. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cherilyn Hector, Kareem Stanley. John Nixon served on 12/28/2010, answer due 1/18/2011. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
MINUTE ENTRY for Initial Conference proceeding held before MJ Pollak on 12/17/2010. Mandatory disclosure by 12/24/10. Document requests and interrogatories to be exchanged by 12/24/10 - responses due 1/24/10. Conference set for 2/22/11 @ 2:00 PM. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 12/17/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by City of New York. (Fett, Baree) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned case on DECEMBER 17, 2010 at 11:00 AM, before the Honorable Cheryl L. Pollak. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/1/2010. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER ORDER granting 3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due 12/3/2010. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 10/1/2010. (Caggiano, Diana) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/1/2010, Entered: None
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by City of New York. (Fett, Baree) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cherilyn Hector, Kareem Stanley. City of New York served on 9/13/2010, answer due 10/4/2010. (Klein, Brett) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/31/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against City of New York, John and Jane Doe 1 through 10, John Nixon Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Cherilyn Hector, Kareem Stanley. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 08/31/2010)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 144 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?