Intuit Inc. v. Intuit Beauty, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-03613-CRB
District Judge Charles R. Breyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Extra Space Storage Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodger R. Cole +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 rcole@fenwick.com
Space Mary Elizabeth Milionis +1 415 875 2313 +1 415 281 1350 MMilionis@Fenwick.com
Space Rachael Gayza Samberg +1 415 875 2330 +1 415 281 1350 rsamberg@fenwick.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officially listed as "Intuit Beauty, Inc."
Officer/Director, Extra Space Storage Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Campbell Guthry and Alliston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tiffany P. Scarborough +1 916 484 3501 +1 916 484 3511 tscarborough@murphycampbell.com
v.
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Intuit Beauty, Inc."
Officer/Director, Extra Space Storage Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Murphy Campbell Guthry and Alliston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tiffany P. Scarborough +1 916 484 3501 +1 916 484 3511 tscarborough@murphycampbell.com
Intuit, Inc. Intuit, Inc., Counter-Defendant
Officer/Director, Extra Space Storage Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Fenwick & West LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodger R. Cole +1 650 988 8500 +1 650 938 5200 rcole@fenwick.com
Space Mary Elizabeth Milionis +1 415 875 2313 +1 415 281 1350 MMilionis@Fenwick.com
Space Rachael Gayza Samberg +1 415 875 2330 +1 415 281 1350 rsamberg@fenwick.com
Office San Francisco
Filed 7/12/2007
Jury Demand Defendant
Demand
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Cause Section 15 U.S.C. § 1051 Trademark Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Santa Clara
Terminated 1/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ADRMOP, AO279, CLOSED, E-Filing, REFSET-JCS
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 29 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1/10/08 before Judge Joseph C. Spero. Court Reporter: Debra L. Pas. *** FILED UNDER SEAL *** . (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2008)
    LREF
    Legal Document 28 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Patent/Trademark Copy
    REPORT on the termination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2008)
      LREF
      Legal Document 27 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL re [26] Stipulation filed by Intuit Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/20/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/21/2008)
        LREF
        Legal Document 26 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Stipulation
        STIPULATION AND (PROPOSED) ORDER FOR DISMISSAL by Intuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Samberg, Rachael) (Filed on 2/19/2008)
          LREF
          Legal Document 25 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
          ORDER DISMISSING CASE (30 days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/11/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/11/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document 24 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Settlement ConferenceCourt Filing
            Minute Entry: Settlement Conference held on Jan. 10, 2008 before Mag. Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case settled. (Court Reporter Debra Pas.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/11/2008)
              LREF
              Legal Document 23 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice of Change of Address
              NOTICE of Change of Address by Tiffany Powers Scarborough (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
                LREF
                Legal Document 22 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Clerks Notice
                CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE from 11/19/2007, at 9:30 a.m., until 1/10/2008, at 9:30 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 12/27/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2007)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                  ORDER re [19] Stipulation filed by Intuit Inc. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/1/2008 08:30 AM.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 11/05/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2007)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 20 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007 Letter
                    Letter from Both Parties Regarding Settlement Conference Scheduling. (Attachments: # (1) Filed Stipulation)(Samberg, Rachael) (Filed on 11/5/2007)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 19 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION (Joint) Extending Case Management Conference and Time For Settlement Conference by Intuit Inc.. (Samberg, Rachael) (Filed on 11/2/2007)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                        NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. A Settlement Conference is set for 11/19/2007, at 9:30 a.m. Settlement Conference Statements shall be LODGED with Chambers (NOT electronically filed) no later than 11/5/2007. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/29/2007. (jcssec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2007)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Case Management Conference - InitialCourt Filing
                          Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 10/26/2007 before Charles R. Breyer (Date Filed: 10/26/2007), CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement Conference. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/7/2007 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter - Not Reported.) (be, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/26/2007)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Joint Case Management Statement
                            JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Intuit Inc.. (Samberg, Rachael) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                              ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 10/5/2007)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b)of discussion of
                                ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options Plaintiff's ADR Certification by Party and Counsel (Milionis, Mary) (Filed on 10/5/2007)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 13 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Answer
                                  FIRST AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint with Demand for Jury Trial byIntuit Beauty, Inc.. (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 9/18/2007)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                    ORDER re [11] Stipulation filed by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/14/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2007)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Stipulation
                                      STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIM by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 9/13/2007)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Stipulation
                                        *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COUNTERCLAIMS by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 9/12/2007) Modified on 9/13/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                          Civil Cover Sheet to ANSWER to Complaint [8] by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Modified on 8/21/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 8 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/20/2007 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand [1], First COUNTERCLAIM against Intuit Inc. by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 8/20/2007) Modified on 8/21/2007 (sv, COURT STAFF).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER re [6] Stipulation filed by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/03/07. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Stipulation
                                                STIPULATION of the Parties to Extend Time for Defendant Intuit Beauty, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff Intuit Inc.'s Complaint by Intuit Beauty, Inc.. (Scarborough, Tiffany) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                  *** DUPLICATE ENTRY *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Proof of Service of Summons upon Intuit Beauty on 07 12 2007)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/19/2007) Modified on 7/20/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007 Summons Returned Executed
                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Intuit Inc.. Intuit Beauty, Inc. served on 7/12/2007, answer due 8/1/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations) Proof of Service of Summons on 7/12/07 upon Intuit Beauty, Inc.)(Cole, Rodger) (Filed on 7/19/2007)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Patent/Trademark Copy
                                                      REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Trademark Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 ADR Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                        ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 10/19/2007. Case Management Conference set for 10/26/2007 08:30 AM. (Attachments: # (1) Order setting CMC# (2) Standing Order# (3) CM Standing Order for All Judges)(mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against Intuit Beauty, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611001335.). Filed byIntuit Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/18/2007 (mcl, COURT STAFF).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Summons Issued
                                                        Summons Issued as to Intuit Beauty, Inc. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank -- Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Case Referred to ECF
                                                          CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 160 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?