Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
12267 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.66601, Amount 20,843,820.00). To CFIP Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Randall L. Klein on behalf of CFIP Master Fund, Ltd..(Klein, Randall) (Entered: 10/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12266 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.66600, Amount 20,843,820.00). To CFIP Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Randall L. Klein on behalf of CFIP Master Fund, Ltd..(Klein, Randall) (Entered: 10/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12265 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Adam Brezine on behalf of Unknown. (Brezine, Adam) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12264 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solution, LLC (related document(s) 11654 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12263 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Sidney J. Garabato of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12177 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12262 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12145 , 12146 , 12147 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12261 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12220 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12260 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12109 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12259 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12114 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12165 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for John Polich filed by John Polich on behalf of County of Ventura. (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11308 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12255 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12254 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12253 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 18, 2010 2:04 PM RE: Hearing re: 60(b) Motions. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/18/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/26/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/9/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/19/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/18/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12252 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Debtor's Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claim (Late Filed Claims),, Declaration of Julian Iragorri In Response to Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late Filed Claims) filed by John Rose Jr. on behalf of Julian Iragorri. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julian# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12250 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11302 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12249 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11260 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12248 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Insufficient Documentation Claims) as to Certain Claimants (related document(s) 10282 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12247 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 12245 ) filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Caixa Geral de Depositos, S.A.. (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12246 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Twenty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 9983 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12245 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection Certificate Of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. § 1746 Regarding Motion Of Caixa Geral de Depsitos, S.A. Seeking Authority To Assign Its Interests As Lender In A Promissory Note Issued By Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., et al. filed by Eric Fisher on behalf of Caixa Geral de Depositos, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order)) (Fisher, Eric) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12244 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Objection to Dismiss Late Filed Claim filed by Paola Biraschi. (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12243 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims)Re: Claim number 34794 (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by John, Tan Lye Thiam. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12242 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims)and motion requesting an enlargement of time (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Nagy es Trocsanyi Ugyvedi Iroda (the "N&T"). (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Lehman Brothers Finance Asia Pte. Ltd. (in Creditors' Voluntary Liquidation) for Entry of an Order (i) that its Derivative and Guarantee Questionnaires be Deemed Timely Filed Proofs of Claim and (ii) Permitting a Late Claim Filing Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9006(b)(1) (related document(s) 11167 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12240 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Response to Motion for Debtors' Thirty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) (related document(s) 12051 ) filed by Jane M. Freeberg on behalf of Emad Morrar. (Freeberg, Jane) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12221 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing from 10/20/2010 (related document(s) 6386 ) filed by Brian D. Graifman on behalf of Mark Glasser. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12220 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response : Debtors' Omnibus Reply to Responses to Debtors' Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Blocking Number LPS Claims) (related document(s) 11905 , 10978 , 10280 , 10895 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TPG Credit Strategies Fund, L.P.(Claim No.59098, Amount 4,220,000). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12218 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TPG Credit Opportunities Fund, L.P.(Claim No.59098, Amount 1,699,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12217 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Authorizing the Debtors to Enter into Settlement with Suncal Trustee on Behalf of Suncal Involuntary Debtors. (Related Doc # 11688 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12216 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TPG Credit Opportunities Investors, L.P.(Claim No.59098, Amount 2,081,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12215 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response Requesting the Court Reconsider Re-instating my Claim filed by Sandra Hahn-Colbert. (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12214 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Closing Arguments on Rule 60(b) and Related Motions and Adversary Proceedings filed by William J. Hine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/21/2010 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Hine, William) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12213 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Requesting the Court to Repeal the Objection of Claim #36799 filed by Paul Zakian. (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12212 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12082 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12211 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12052 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12210 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Regarding Admission of Exhibits. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12209 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12042 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12208 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12041 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12207 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Regarding Admission of Exhibits. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12206 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 12048 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12205 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Request the Court to Allow Claims to be Paid filed by Evelyn I. Wheeler. (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12204 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of MMOR Consulting Inc., as Tax Services Provider, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2010. (related document(s) 11682 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12203 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Requesting the Court Consider not to Disallow Mr. Yuen's Claim filed by Ho Kam Yuen. (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12202 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Domenique Scalia (related document(s) 12074 , 12076 , 12078 , 12075 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Symphony Asset Management LLC. (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12201 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Granting Motion of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc. for Enforcement of the Automatic Stay and for Sanctions for Violation if the ADR Procedures Order. (Related Doc # 11756 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12200 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Authorizing and Approving the Global Settlement Among the Debtors and the AMBAC Settling Parties. (Related Doc # 11806 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12199 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Staying Avoidance Actions and Granting Certain Related Relief. (Related Doc # 11389 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12198 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to the Objection of Proof of Claim # 34542, 22122 filed by Karl Joseph Thoma. (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12197 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 12044 ) filed by Thomas H. Montgomery on behalf of AJF Holding B.V. and A.J. Friederich. (Montgomery, Thomas) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12196 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of why claim should not be disallowed, expunged, reduced or reclassified filed by Unknown. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12195 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion to Debtors Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Claim #35514 filed by Stephen Gaty. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12194 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection For Claim to be Disallowed & Expunged Claim #65858 filed by Tal Lev Ari. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12193 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Claim #35517 filed by Stephen Gaty. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12192 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Admitting David W. Parham to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 11987 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12191 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Claim #35844 filed by Stephen Gaty. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12190 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/20/2010 Admitting Thomas H. Montgomery to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 11940 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12189 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Domenique Scalia (related document(s) 12074 , 12076 , 12078 , 12075 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Symphony Asset Management LLC. (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12188 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Objection to Debtor's 42nd Omnibus Objections to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) re: Claim Number 64876 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Ann E. Stradmeijer. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12187 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Domenique Scalia (related document(s) 12074 , 12076 , 12078 , 12075 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Symphony Asset Management LLC. (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12186 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Domenique Scalia (related document(s) 12074 , 12076 , 12078 , 12075 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Symphony Asset Management LLC. (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12185 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Objection to Debtor's 43rd Omnibus Objections to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) re: Claim Number 64877 (related document(s) 11308 ) filed by Ann E. Stradmeijer. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12184 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Domenique Scalia (related document(s) 12074 , 12076 , 12078 , 12075 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Symphony Asset Management LLC. (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12183 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Credit Suisse Credit Strategies Master Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.66809, Amount 336,941.98). To Credit Suisse Credit Strategies Liquidating Trust.(related document(s) 12181 ) filed by Monique J. Mulcare on behalf of Credit Suisse Credit Strategies Liquidating Trust.(Mulcare, Monique) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12182 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Objection to Debtor's 43rd Omnibus Objections to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11308 ) filed by Caja De Credito De Los Ingenieros, SCC. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12181 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Credit Suisse Credit Strategies Master Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.66810, Amount 336,941.98). To Credit Suisse Credit Strategies Liquidating Trust. filed by Monique J. Mulcare on behalf of Credit Suisse Credit Strategies Liquidating Trust.(Mulcare, Monique) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12180 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of (i) Second Amended Verified Statement of Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP Pursuant to Rule 2019(A) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure; (ii) Response of High Lodge Capital LLC to Debtors Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims); and (iii) Response of Darren Davy to Debtors Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) filed by Patrick D. Oh on behalf of Davy Darren, Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP, HIgh Lodge. (Oh, Patrick) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12179 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Objection to Debtor's 46th Omnibus Objections to Claims re: Claim Number 5634 (related document(s) 11584 ) filed by Atlantic Forms and Systems Inc.. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12178 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Confederacion Espanola de Cajas de Ahorros(Claim No.28173, Amount 1,610,328.88). To Blue Angel Claims LLC. filed by Primeshares.(Wilson, Charmaine) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12177 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Claimants Palmyra Capital Fund, L.P., Palmyra Capital Institutional Fund, L.P., and Palmyra Capital Offshore Fund, L.P. to Permit Late Filing of their Guarantee Claims Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9006(b)(1) (related document(s) 10370 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/23/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12176 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 6, 2010 at 9.37 AM RE: Continued Evidentiary Hearing re Rule 60 (b). Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/6/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/15/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/8/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/6/2011. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12175 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to disallowance of claim number 64705 filed by Cleijpool, G.J. & Van der Sande, J.M.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12174 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Re:Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (late filed claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Julian Sutton. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12173 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Re: Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11308 ) filed by Drs Pieter de Haes LLM. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12172 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response to Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Heidi L Hamilton on behalf of Julian Iragorri. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Julian Iragorri# 2 Exhibits A - C) (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12171 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co International PLC(Claim No.58729, Amount 582,489.47). To AG Super Fund International Partners LP. filed by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(White, Greg) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12170 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co International PLC(Claim No.58729, Amount 3,987,812.53). To Botticelli, LLC. filed by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(White, Greg) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12169 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response to Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Raphael Shannon on behalf of California Winery Worker's Pension Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A - F) (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12168 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Third Supplemental and Amended Verified Statement of Clifford Chance US LLP Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019 filed by Jennifer C. DeMarco on behalf of Clifford Chance US LLP. (DeMarco, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12167 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 12043 ) filed by Andrea Pincus on behalf of Banco di Napoli S.p.A.. (Pincus, Andrea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12166 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Publication : Affidavits of Publication of Notice of Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019, for Approval of a Settlement Agreement Among LBSF, LBHI, and Societe Generale, New York Branch and Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 11488 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12165 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing : Amended Seventh Notice of Establishment of Omnibus Hearing Dates Pursuant to Second Amended Case Management Order Implementing Certain Notice and Case Management Procedures (related document(s) 11647 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12164 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Allianz Global Investors France SA. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12163 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11308 ) filed by Maritta Knoller, Peter Knoller. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits) (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12162 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 8, 2010 at 10:08 PM RE: Hearing re 60(b) Motions. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/10/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/18/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/12/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/10/2011. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12161 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by John Rose, Jr on behalf of Julian Iragorri. (Rose, Jr, John) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12160 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Heidi L Hamilton on behalf of Julian Iragorri. (Hamilton, Heidi) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12159 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service for Notice of Motion and Motion of Cascade Investment, L.L.C. for Leave to Conduct Discovery of (1) the Debtors, and (2) JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 (related document(s) 12120 ) filed by David B. Shemano on behalf of Cascade Investment, L.L.C.. (Shemano, David) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12158 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Debtor's Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims RE: Claim Number 64495 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Francisco Coca Vano. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12157 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Debtor's Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims RE: Claim Number 64858 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Gong Cheng Hsiung. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12156 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 64315 - Amount: $141,510.00; filed by EUROMIX SICAV, SA. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12155 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 34673 - Amount: $250,000.00; filed by Frank Smejkal. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12154 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 34672 - Amount: $78,000.00; filed by Frank Smejkal. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12153 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 34671 - Amount: $730.12; filed by Frank Smejkal. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12152 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 65508 - Amount: $12,960; filed by Robert Dimeglio. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12151 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response to Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by California Department of Water Resources. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12150 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Notice of Return Mail re: TIAA Structured Finance CDO I, LLC filed by CT. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
12149 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 6598; filed by William Skolnick. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12148 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter re: Telephonic Appearance filed by Arete Research, LLC. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12147 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Greg Vogel on behalf of Land Advisors Organization, LLC (related document(s) 12145 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12146 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Terry V. Ruckle on behalf of Park Place Partners, Inc. d/b/a Land Advisors Organization (related document(s) 12145 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12145 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Sixty-Third Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals (related document(s) 7822 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12144 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Longacre Opportunity Fund, L.P.(Claim No.33290, Amount 5,368,208.00). To Serengeti Rapax MM L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Rapax MM L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12143 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 65538; filed by R.F.P. Robijn B.V.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1 - Letter from Aagetekend etc# 2 Appendix 2 - Letter from epiq# 3 Appendix 3 - Letter from ING# 4 Appendix Notice re Claim) (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12142 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Longacre Opportunity Fund, L.P.(Claim No.33291, Amount 5,368,208.00). To Serengeti Rapax MM L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Rapax MM L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12141 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:MP Bank hf(Claim No.20170, Amount 3,296,432.54). To Serengeti Lycaon MM L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Lycaon MM L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12140 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:MP Bank hf(Claim No.20170, Amount 4,028,973.10). To Serengeti Overseas MM L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Overseas MM L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12139 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Longacre Master Fund II, L.P.(Claim No.66556, Amount 1,600,000.00). To Serengeti Partners L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Partners L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12138 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Longacre Master Fund II, L.P.(Claim No.66555, Amount 1,600,000.00). To Serengeti Partners L.P.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Serengeti Partners L.P..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12137 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims Re: Claim#64244 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Kari Meltzer. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12136 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) - Claim No: 40791; filed by Tulug Temel. (Gist, Marion) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12135 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims Re: Claim #34492 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Nestor De Jesus. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12134 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims Re: Claims 64387 & 64388) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Ignace Van Overbeke. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to debtors' forty-second omnibus objection to claims (late-filed securities claims) filed by Forest Holdings Inc. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to omnibus objection to claims filed by J. C. Spilt. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims Re: Claim#35437) (related document(s) 11307 , 11308 ) filed by Jiansheng Jensen Shen. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to debtors' forty-first omnibus objection to claims (late-filed claims) filed by James P. Quismorio. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to omnibus objection to claims (late-filed claims) filed by Web-Pro Technology Limited. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to omnibus objection to claims (late-filed claims) filed by Gilbert Amster. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by "Spanish Holders of Lehman Programs Securities". (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to debtors' forty-third omnibus objection to claims (late-filed securities claims) filed by Paul J. Bakker. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to debtors' forty-second omnibus objection to claims (late-filed claims) filed by Mohinani Hassomal Bulchand. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to debtors' forty-second omnibus objection to claims (late-filed claims) filed by Mohinani Hassomal Bulchand. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion /Debtors' forty-second omnibus objection to claims (late-filed claims) filed by Mohinani Hassomal Bulchand. (Gillies, Dexter) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DMR Structured Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd.(Claim No.15745, Amount 207,720.00). To Longacre Opportunity Fund, L.P.. filed by Longacre Opportunity Fund, L.P..(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DMR Structured Arbitrage Master Fund Ltd.(Claim No.15745, Amount 244,375.00). To Longacre Opportunity Fund, L.P.. filed by Longacre Opportunity Fund, L.P..(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Motion to Set Hearing Notice of Motion and Motion of Cascade Investment, L.L.C. for Leave to Conduct Discovery of (1) the Debtors, and (2)JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2004 filed by David B. Shemano on behalf of Cascade Investment, L.L.C.. (Shemano, David) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 11305 (related document(s) 11308 ) filed by Heinz Fiebiger. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 64589 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Wrenton Management Limited. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 64306 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Limtong Manuel Tan. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Ng Pui Shan Vinci. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Ding Xiafen, He Ping. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing : Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 65413 (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Allianz Global Investors France SA. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by So Wai Lan, Chan Sing Cheung. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12111 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Lee Ho Yi Linda, John Tsui. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12110 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Antonio Vilchez Moleon. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12109 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of F. Robert Brusco in Support of Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to Enter into Settlement with Suncal Trustee on Behalf of Suncal Involuntary Debtors (related document(s) 11688 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12108 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Gabriele Stahl. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12107 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Yu Chun Kwan. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Leung King Sang. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Louise Mattingly. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 12056 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12103 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors' Fifty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) (related document(s) 11608 ) filed by Seniors Civil Liberties Association, Inc.. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Amit K. Sarkar. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection to Debtors Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Ho Kam Yuen. (White, Greg) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 12081 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12099 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 35516 (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Garadex, Inc.. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12098 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 35518 (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Garadex, Inc.. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12097 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To Motion Regarding Claim No.: 35520 (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Garadex, Inc.. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12096 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition To (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Garadex, Inc.. (Suarez, Aurea) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11451 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 11334 ) filed by Brian W. Harvey on behalf of Clayton Services, Inc.. (Harvey, Brian) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11450 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 11437 ) filed by Dennis O'Donnell on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11449 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim # 21347, 21350 and 66398 to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11448 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim # 800002356 to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11447 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #21346 to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11446 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 11442 ) filed by Sophia Ree on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Ree, Sophia) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11445 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 10-03617. Complaint against Lake Forest Business Center . Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Filed by Shai Waisman, Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11444 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11443 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Notice of Change of Address of Day Pitney LLP filed by Scott A. Zuber on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C., SPCP Group L.L.C. as agent for Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd.. (Zuber, Scott) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11442 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion filed by Sophia Ree on behalf of Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Ree, Sophia) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11441 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Monthly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures to Terminate Unfunded Commitments and Restructure Corporate Loan Agreements (related document(s) 3753 ) filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11440 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 11338 ) filed by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11439 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response Response Of Wilmington Trust Company, As Indenture Trustee, To Updated Objection Of William Kuntz, III filed by Amanda Raboy on behalf of Wilmington Trust Company, as Indenture Trustee. (Raboy, Amanda) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11438 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Thomas John Wright on behalf of Giants Stadium LLC. (Wright, Thomas) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11437 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Nineteenth Notice Of Adjournment Of Hearing With Respect To Reconsideration Of Court's September 17, 2008 Interim Order (I) Authorizing Debtor To Obtain Postpetition Financing Pursuant To Sections 363 And 364 Of Bankruptcy Code And (II) Granting Liens And Superpriority Claims To Postpetition Lenders Pursuant To Section 364 Of Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 434 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 12/9/2010, (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11436 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 59331 in the amount of $555,362.00 filed by Pensionskasse Unilever Schweiz.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11435 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP - Partial Transfer - [See Claim for Transferor Name] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RIC III plc The U.S. Dollar Cash Plus Fund (by Rus(Claim No.32145, Amount 39,345,000.00). To Frank Russell Company. filed by RIC III plc The U.S. Dollar Cash Plus Fund (by Russell Investment Company III plc).(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11434 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Travis County's Motion For Late Filing and Allowance of Proof of Claim (related document(s) 10829 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/1/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11433 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Motion of Coscan Construction, LLC for Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 7226 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11432 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Continued Evidentiary Hearing on Rule 60(b) and Related Motions and Adversary Proceedings (related document(s) 5169 , 6814 , 5148 ) filed by William J. Hine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2010 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Hine, William) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11431 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 8425 ) filed by Robert C. Yan on behalf of Capital One, N.A.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/13/2010, (Yan, Robert) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11260 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) : Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 10/13/2010, (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11259 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Supplement to the Fifth Interim Application of Jones Day, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, Seeking Allowance and Payment of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses (related document(s) 10763 ) filed by Ross Barr on behalf of Jones Day. (Barr, Ross) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit / Declaration and Disclosure Statement of Vincent Reilly, on behalf of KPMG (related document(s) 11256 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Julia Hardinger, on behalf of Hardinger & Tanenholz LLP (related document(s) 11256 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Sixtieth Supplemental List of Ordinary Course Professionals (related document(s) 7822 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11255 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 9/10/2010 Among Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., Lehman ALI, Inc. and the Suncal Stipulating Debtors Valuing Certain Collateral and Preserving Certain Liens. (related document(s) 11063 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11254 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 9/10/2010 Granting Oasis Associates LLC Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 11009 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11253 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of Palmetto Health Alliance regarding proof of claim no. 12617 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11252 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 9/10/2010 Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and James W. Giddens, as Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Lehman Brothers Inc., with Respect to Joint Claims Asserted and Joint Adversary Proceedings Commenced Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 544, 547, 548 and 550. (related document(s) 11001 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Supplement to Motion for Authorization to Reject Certain Executory Contracts (related document(s) 11201 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11250 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim # 45213 to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11249 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim # 44991 to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11248 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim # 44990 to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11247 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim # 59758 to The Liverpool Limited Partnership filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of The Liverpool Limited Partnership.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11246 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim # 44990 to The Liverpool Limited Partnership filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of The Liverpool Limited Partnership.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11245 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from Service List (related document(s) 11236 ) filed by Stephanie Wickouski on behalf of Parsec Trading Corp.. (Wickouski, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11244 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on August 30, 2010 9:33 AM RE: Evidentiary Hearing Re: 60 (b) Motions. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/30/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/8/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/4/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/30/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11243 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on August 27, 2010 9:33 AM RE: Continued Evidentiary Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/29/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/7/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/21/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/1/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/29/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 7067 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7070 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 7062 ) filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7069 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Rescheduling the Hearing on Refco Group Ltd., LLC's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Rule 2004 Directing the Production of Documents by the IRS (related document(s) 7055 , 7056 ) filed by Arthur H. Ruegger on behalf of Refco Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2010 (check with court for location) (Ruegger, Arthur) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on June 16, 2010 at 11:25 AM RE: Motion For Objection to Claim(s) Number 14516/Plan Administrator's Objection to Claim No. 14516 of Mark H. Rhynes; Joint Motion of XL Specialty Insurance Company and Former Officers and Directors of Refco, Inc. for Approval of Settlement Agreement, etc.... Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/10/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: TypeWrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 7007 , 6985 , 7002 , 6989 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/19/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/12/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/10/2011. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7067 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Proposed Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For October 20, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7049 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Order In Respect Of Plan Administrator's Twenty-Seventh Omnibus Claims Motion As It Relates To Claim 145 Filed By SBC Global Services, Inc. (related document(s) 7046 , 6940 , 6896 , 6911 ) filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 9/29/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Objections due by 9/29/2010, (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7048 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Omni Management Group (related document(s) 7047 ) filed by Stephanie W. Mai on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Mai, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
7047 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of Omnibus Hearing Scheduled for September 15, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4408 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Filing of Plan Supplement [Docket No. 3766] (related document(s) 3766 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4407 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: First Supplement and Amendment to Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. [Docket No. 3985] (related document(s) 3985 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4406 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Filing of Addendum to Exhibit B List of Assumed Contracts and unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Claims of the Plan Supplement filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4405 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on or before October 27, 2010 [Docket No. 4345, 4349, 4359, 4360, 4365, 4366, 4367 and 4373] (related document(s) 4373 , 4349 , 4360 , 4359 , 4366 , 4367 , 4345 , 4365 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4404 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Servced on October 29, 2010 [Docket Nos. 4379, 4382, 4384 and 4387] (related document(s) 4379 , 4387 , 4382 , 4384 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4403 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Stipulation and Order Regarding Assumption of Contract with Cintas Corporation and SupplyForce and Payment of Cure Amount Related Thereto, and Other Related Relief [Docket No. 4377] (related document(s) 4377 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 11/02/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4348 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Bench Decision on Confirmation [Docket No. 4334] (related document(s) 4334 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4347 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Order Approving Stipulation Between Chemtura Corporation and Prudential Relocation, Inc. to Resolve Certain Claims [Docket No. 4317]; and 2) Notice of Withdrawal of the Debtors' Objection to Tricor Refining, LLC's Proof of Claim No. 9484 [Docket No. 4322] (related document(s) 4317 , 4322 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4346 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Omnibus Notice of Adjournment of Hearing and Response Deadlines with respect to Certain Proofs of Claim that are Subject to the Debtors' Fortieth, Forty-First and Forty-Second Tier I Omnibus Objections to Certain Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 3685 , 3686 , 3684 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4345 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BMR-Landmark at Eastview LLC(Claim No.1484, Amount 1436663.47). To Pioneer Funding Group, LLC. filed by Pioneer Funding Group, LLC.(Stein-Sapir, Adam) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4344 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Proposed Agenda of Matters Schedule for Hearing filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4343 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Paul E. Harner (Related Doc # 4332 ) signed on 10/22/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4342 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Robert N. Michaelson (Related Doc # 4313 ) signed on 10/22/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4341 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Omnibus Ojbection to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by Insurers in Connection With Obligations Under Insurance Policies with hearing to be held on 12/7/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 11/30/2010, filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation.(Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4329 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service re Joinder Of Pentair Water Pool And Spa Inc. In The Objection Of Kurt And Amy Stetler To The Debtors Motion To Establish Disputed Claims Reserve And Request For Rehearing Or Clarification Of Matters Pertaining Thereto (related document(s) 3779 ) filed by Austin K. Barron on behalf of Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc.. (Barron, Austin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4328 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Joinder Of Pentair Water Pool And Spa Inc. In The Objection Of Kurt And Amy Stetler To The Debtors Motion To Establish Disputed Claims Reserve And Request For Rehearing Or Clarification Of Matters Pertaining Thereto (related document(s) 3779 ) filed by Austin K. Barron on behalf of Pentair Water Pool and Spa, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2010 (check with court for location) (Barron, Austin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4327 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Order Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Objection and Temporarily Disallowing Certain Proofs of Claim (Pending Litigation Claims - Personal Injury) [Docket No. 3831] (related document(s) 3831 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4326 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: 1) Debtors' Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Disputed Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. [Docket No. 3985]; and 2) Debtors' Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Class 11 Environmental Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. [Docket No. 3782] (related document(s) 3782 , 3779 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4325 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: First Supplement and Amendment to Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. [Docket No. 3985] (related document(s) 3985 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4324 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Filing of Plan Supplement [Docket No. 3766] (related document(s) 3766 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4323 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of filing of Addendum to Exhibit B List of Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Claims of the Plan Supplement filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4322 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of the Debtors' Objection to Tricor Refining, LLC's Proof of Claim No. 9484 (related document(s) 2746 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4321 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on October 19, 2010 [Docket Nos. 4297, 4299, 4302, 4311 and 4312] (related document(s) 4299 , 4311 , 4297 , 4302 , 4312 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4320 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Reply to the Objection of the Stetlers to Debtors' Motion Seeking Establishment of a Disputed Claims Reserve and/or Joinder in Objection of Pentair [Docket No. 4298] (related document(s) 4298 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4319 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice Of Presentment Of Stipulation And Order Regarding Assumption Of Contract With Supplyforce.Com And Payment Of Cure Amount Related Thereto [Docket No. 4296] (related document(s) 4296 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4318 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:SPENCER HARRIS OF ARKANSAS(Claim No.9443, Amount 77,044.61). To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4317 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/20/2010 Between Chemtura Corporation and Prudential Relocation, Inc. to Resolve Certain Claims. (related document(s) 4215 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4316 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/20/2010 With Respect To Proofs Of Claim Filed By BNP Paribas. (related document(s) 4278 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4315 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/20/2010 Extending Time Under11 U.S.C. § 365(D)(4) For Biolab, Inc. To Assume Or Reject Lease Of Non-Residential Real Property With Lyondell Chemical Company. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4314 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Shield Packaging(Amount 114.68).. To Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4313 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Robert N. Michaelson on behalf of Marine Shale Processors Superfund Site Settling Defendants PRP Group. (Attachments: # 1 Order Granting Motion) (Michaelson, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4312 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing with Respect to Debtors Motion for an Order (A) Authorizing Chemtura Corporation to Enter into a Stipulation and Settlement Agreement with the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Pennsylvania Department of Environmental Protection and American Refining Group, Inc. Regarding Environmental Obligations at the Bradford Site and (B) Approving the Sale of Certain Equipment and Property Under the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement to American Refining Group, Inc. Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Other Interests (related document(s) 4085 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 12/7/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4311 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/19/2010 with Respect to Proof of Claim No. 787 Filed by Old Dominion Freight Line. (related document(s) 4235 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4310 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Dion International Trucks, LLC's Withdrawal of Limited Opposition And Reservation of Rights with Respect to Proposed Cure Amount (Dion) Filed by James P. Hill (Rodriguez, Maria). (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4309 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter To The Honorable Robert E. Gerber filed by Marvin H. Happel. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4308 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Corrected Edition Of Response to Denial of Petition For Collaboration in Finding a Fair And Constitutional Solution With Notice of Constitutional Challenge and Attached Constitutional Challenge. filed by Frank McKinnon. (related document(s) 4240 ) (Rodriguez, Maria). (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4307 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice: Filing of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 3001(e)(2) or (4) (related document(s) 4279 , 4274 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4306 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Solicitation Materials for the Revised Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization and Revised Disclosure Statement [Docket Nos. 3491, 3497, and 3503] (related document(s) 3497 , 3491 , 3503 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4305 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on October 15, 2010 [Docket Nos. 4282, 8283, 4285 and 4287] (related document(s) 4282 , 4287 , 4283 , 4285 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4304 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice Of Presentment Of Stipulation And Agreed Order With Respect To Proofs Of Claim Filed By BNP Paribas [Docket No. 4278] (related document(s) 4278 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4303 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4300 ) filed by Sergei Lemberg on behalf of John J. Prior. (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4302 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Revised Order Establishing A Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Class 11 Environmental Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. signed on 10/19/2010. (related document(s) 4277 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4301 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement The Official Committee of Equity Security Holders' (I) Joinder to the Debtors' Reply to the Objection of the Stetlers to Debtors' Motion Seeking Establishment of a Disputed Claims Reserve and/or Joinder in Objection of Pentair and (II) Limited Response to the Stetlers' Objection (related document(s) 4298 ) filed by Jay M. Goffman on behalf of Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Goffman, Jay) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4300 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Appoint Committee filed by Sergei Lemberg on behalf of John J. Prior. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 11/3/2010, (Lemberg, Sergei) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4299 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing with Respect to Debtors Objection to the Trustees of the Great Lakes Uk Limited Pension Plans Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 3146 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 4215 , 4216 ) filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4218 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses for Ohio Department of Job and Family Services, Other Professional, period: to, fee:$, expenses: $5,669.47. filed by Ohio Department of Job and Family Services. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4217 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s) 4214 ) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4216 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment REORGANIZED DEBTORS NINTH OMNIBUS APPLICATION SEEKING TO ALLOW PERMITTED SETTLEMENTS filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/1/2010, (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4215 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment REORGANIZED DEBTORS FIFTH OMNIBUS APPLICATION SEEKING TO ALLOW CLAIMS AS FILED BY THE HOLDERS THEREOF filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. with presentment to be held on 11/1/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/1/2010, (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4214 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s) 4204 ) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection to Debtor's Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Objecton to Claims filed by Steven L. Blakely on behalf of John Pasquale. (Blakely, Steven) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection to Debtor's Twenty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claim filed by Steven L. Blakely on behalf of John Pasquale. (Blakely, Steven) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Russell W. Savory on behalf of TC Air-T Industrial, LLC. (Savory, Russell) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 4085 ) filed by Russell W. Savory on behalf of TC Air-T Industrial, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Savory, Russell) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion to Debtor's Twenty-fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 4091 ) filed by Steven L. Blakely on behalf of John Pasquale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copies of Claims) (Blakely, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Debtor's Twenty-fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 4091 ) filed by Steven L. Blakely on behalf of John Pasquale. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Copies of Claims) (Blakely, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 9/13/2010 Admitting Steven L. Blakely to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 4118 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Steven L. Blakely on behalf of John Pasquale. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Blakely, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice filed by Steven L. Blakely on behalf of Steven L Blakely. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Blakely, Steven) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion / Response of Clyde McDaniel to the Debtors' Twenty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Seeking to Expunge Certain No Liability Claims and/or Insufficient Support Claims) (related document(s) 4087 ) filed by David C. McGrail on behalf of Clyde McDaniel. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (McGrail, David) (Entered: 09/11/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 4109 ) filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 4080 ) filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 4079 ) filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 9/10/2010 Admitting Christopher D. Moseng to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 4107 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 9/10/2010 Admitting Kara E. Casteel to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 4106 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4094 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Atlanta Coffee Time(Amount 116.93).. To Archon Bay Capital, LLC. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4093 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Vinyl Institute Inc(Claim No.1393, Amount 45,000.00). To Sonar Credit Partners, LLC. filed by SONAR CREDIT PARTNERS, LLC.(Goldberg, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4092 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal Of Plan Objections Of Occidental Chemical Corporation (related document(s) 3890 , 3945 ) filed by Matthew E. Russell on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation. (Russell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4091 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan / Fifth Supplement and Amendment to Plan Supplement to The Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4090 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Endorsed Order signed on 9/22/2010 re: Documents filed by Frank McKinnon Dated September 8, 2010 - Request Denied for Failure to Allege a Prima Facie Entitletment to Relief. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4089 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Alan S. Kopit (Related Doc # 4070 ) signed on 9/22/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4088 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/22/2010 Between All Parties with Respect to Certain Holders of Prepetition Claims on Account of Non-Qualified Pension Arrangements. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4087 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 9/22/2010 Approving the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors and the Georgia Department of Natural Resources Regarding Certain Environmental Obligations. (related document(s) 3883 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4063 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Hearing /Second Amended Proposed Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 21 and September 22, 2010 filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4062 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Notice of Filing of Updated Debtors' Omnibus Reply to Objections to Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3497 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4061 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Third Supplement and Amendment to Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3497 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4060 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Notice of Filing of Second Technical Amendments to Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3497 , 3984 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4059 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan Updated Debtors Omnibus Reply To Objections To Exhibit B Of The Plan Supplement To The Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Chemtura Corporation, et al. filed by Gerard Sylvester Catalanello on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Catalanello, Gerard) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4058 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Billie S. Flaherty in Support of the Debtors' Response in Support of Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with respect to Disputed Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 4043 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4057 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on September 17, 2010 (related document(s) 4031 , 4038 , 4032 , 4040 , 4030 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4056 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Debtors' Omnibus Reply to Objections to Exhibit B of the Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al; and 2) Second Supplement and Amendment to Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 4012 , 4013 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4055 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Order Granting Debtors Second Omnibus Objection and Temporarily Disallowing Certain Proofs of Claim (Pending Litigation Claims - Personal Injury); and 2) Order Granting Debtors' Thirty-Ninth Tier I Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Books & Records, Insufficient Documentation and No Liability) (related document(s) 3994 , 3962 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4054 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Drew & Napier LLC(Amount 2,559.60).. To Fair Harbor Capital, LLC. filed by Fair Harbor Capital, LLC.(Glass, Fredric) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4053 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:S & J(Claim No.31, Amount 6,057.84). To Argo Partners. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4052 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Fres-Co System USA, Inc.(Claim No.1608, Amount 36,205.00). To Argo Partners. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4051 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Fres-Co System USA, Inc.(Claim No.1615, Amount 20,798.52). To Argo Partners. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4050 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of SkillSoft Corporation's Objection to Proposed Cure (related document(s) 3893 ) filed by William J. Hanlon on behalf of SkillSoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hanlon, William) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4049 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nolan & Heller LLP(Claim No.1289, Amount 7320.00). To Creditor Liquidity, LP. filed by CREDITOR LIQUIDITY, LP.(Tannor, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4048 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal OF LIMITED OBJECTION OF THE DOW CHEMICAL COMPANY TO EXHIBIT B TO THE PLAN SUPPLEMENT (related document(s) 3933 ) filed by Scott J. Freedman on behalf of The Dow Chemical Company. (Freedman, Scott) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4047 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Application for Final Professional Compensation Supplement To The Application Of The Ad Hoc Committee Of Bondholders For Allowance Of Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses Pursuant To A Global Settlement And Bankruptcy Rule 9019 And Section 1129(A)(4) Of The Bankruptcy Code, Or, In The Alternative, Section 503(B) Of The Bankruptcy Code. filed by Richard L. Wynne. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4046 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement First Amended Verified Statement Of Jones Day Regarding Representation Of An Ad Hoc Committee Of Bondholders Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019 filed by Richard L. Wynne on behalf of Ad Hoc Committee of Bondholders. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4045 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Hearing / Updated Notice of Proposed Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing (related document(s) 4002 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4044 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Eagle One Protection(Amount 220.15).. To Archon Bay Capital, LLC. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 09/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4043 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Debtors' Response in Support of Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with respect to Disputed Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3887 , 3779 , 3894 , 3964 , 3941 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4042 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve CORRECTED IMAGE Reply Brief Of The Ad Hoc Bondholder Committee To The Objection Of The Official Committee Of Equity Security Holders To Confirmation Of The Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Chemtura Corporation, Et Al., Debtors filed by Richard L. Wynne on behalf of Ad Hoc Committee of Bondholders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX. 1-4# 2 Exhibit 5-25) (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4041 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Reply Brief Of The Ad Hoc Bondholder Committee To The Objection Of The Official Committee Of Equity Security Holders To Confirmation Of The Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Chemtura Corporation, Et Al., Debtors filed by Richard L. Wynne on behalf of Ad Hoc Committee of Bondholders. with hearing to be held on 9/16/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EX 1-4# 2 Exhibit 5-25) (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4040 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize /Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation to Enter Into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the State of New York and the New York State Department of Environmental Conservation (related document(s) 1909 , 4038 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 10/8/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/1/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4039 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on September 15, 2010 and September 17, 2010 (related document(s) 3983 , 3986 , 3982 , 3984 , 3985 , 4005 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
4038 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of the Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation to Enter Into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the State of New York and the New York State Department of Environmental Conservation (related document(s) 1909 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 10/8/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 10/1/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4037 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on or before September 17, 2010 filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4036 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Solicitation Materials for the Revised Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization and Revised Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 3497 , 3491 , 3503 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4035 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service /Supplemental Affidavit of Service re: Contract Interest Rate Procedure Notice filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4034 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on or before September 3, 2010 filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4033 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on or before September 9, 2010 filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4032 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Presentment of an Order Approving the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality Regarding Certain Environmental Obligations filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 9/27/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 9/24/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4031 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Presentment of an Order Approving the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement Among Chemtura and the Louisiana Department of Environmental Quality Regarding Certain Environmental Obligations filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 9/27/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 9/24/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4030 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response in Support of Debtors' Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Class 11 Environmental Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3782 , 3891 , 3935 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4029 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service re Creditor Oildale Energy LLC's Opposition to Chemtura Corporation's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Richard S Conn on behalf of Oildale Energy LLC. (Conn, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4028 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum of Law filed by Richard S Conn on behalf of Oildale Energy LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Creditor's Response to Debtor's Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Debtor's Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Certification of Richard S. Conn in Support of Creditor Oildale Energy LLC's Opposition to Debtor's Motion for Summary Judgment# 3 Exhibit 1 to Certification of Richard S. Conn in Support of Creditor Oildale Energy LLC's Opposition to Debtors' Motion for Summary Judgment# 4 Exhibit 2 to Certification of Richard S. Conn in Support of Creditor Oildale Energy LLC's Opposition to Debtors' Motion for Summary Judgment# 5 Declaration of Brian Daly in Support of Creditor Oildale's Oppositon to Motion for Summary Judgment) (Conn, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4027 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Martin James Weis (Related Doc # 3913 ) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4026 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing Certain Debtors to Enter a Settlement Agreement with the United States and the Connecticut Commissioner of Environmental Protection (Related Doc # 3689 ) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4025 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation to Enter Into a Settlement Agreement with United Steelworkers on Behalf of Certain United Steelworkers Retirees (Related Doc # 3762 ) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4024 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Final Order (A) Authorizing Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Continue Its Existing Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms, (B) Granting Postpetition Intercompany Claims Administrative Expense Priority and (C) Authorizing Continued Intercompany Arrangements (Related Doc # 3519 ) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4023 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joseph O. Larkin (Related Doc # 4008 ) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4022 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Thomas J. Allingham II (Related Doc # 4006 ) signed on 9/17/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3956 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certification of Ballots /Declaration of Stephenie Kjontvedt of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Regarding Voting on and Tabulation of Ballots Accepting and Rejecting the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al., with respect to Claims and Interests in Class 6, Class 7, Class 8 and Class 13A (related document(s) 3497 , 3491 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3955 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certification of Ballots /Declaration of Robert Q. Klamser Regarding Voting on and Tabulation of Ballots Accepting and Rejecting the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al., with respect to Claims in Class 1, Class 4A, Class 4B, Class 5, Class 10 and Class 11 (related document(s) 3497 , 3491 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3954 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 3894 , 3896 ) filed by Lauren M. McEvoy on behalf of Beacon Heights Coalition. (McEvoy, Lauren) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3953 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 3900 ) filed by Melissa A. Hager on behalf of L. Donald Simpson, Randall R. Simpson & Janell S. Deuel. (Hager, Melissa) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3952 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for Objection of Lion Copolymer Geismar LLC to Proposed Cure Amounts for Executory Contracts to be Assumed by the Debtors Pursuant to the Plan (related document(s) 3948 ) filed by Alexandra Kelly on behalf of Lion Copolymer Geismar LLC. (Kelly, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3951 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Proposed Cure Amount Contained in Debtors' Plan Supplement (related document(s) 3765 ) filed by Ben T. Caughey on behalf of Artistech Chemical Corporation, et al.. (Caughey, Ben) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3905 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Fizzarotti Instrumentation Services(Claim No.1511, Amount 876.00). To Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Objection Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(2))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 09/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3904 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service re Objection to the Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Disputed Claims in Connection with Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al (related document(s) 3887 ) filed by Paul W. Linehan on behalf of SPARTECH POLYCOM, INC.. (Linehan, Paul) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3903 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Addendum to Exhibit B List of Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Claims of the Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3785 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3902 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Notice of (A) Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Assumed by the Debtors Pursuant to the Plan; (B) Cure Amounts, if any, and (C) Related Procedures in Connection Therewith; and 2) Notice Regarding Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases to be Rejected Pursuant to the Plan filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3901 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize / Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation and Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Enter Into Settlement and Release Agreements with Jennifer Guild and the Andrews and Metzger Counsel on Behalf of Their Diacetyl Claimants (related document(s) 3899 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3900 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Request for Clarification by Policy Holders of the Plan and Exhibits B and C to the Plan Suplement (related document(s) 3497 , 3765 ) filed by Melissa A. Hager on behalf of L. Donald Simpson, Randall R. Simpson & Janell S. Deuel. (Hager, Melissa) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3899 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Presentment of Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation and Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Enter Into Settlement and Release Agreements with Jennifer Guild and the Andrews and Metzger Counsel on Behalf of Their Diacetyl Claimants filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 9/20/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 9/17/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3898 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed On 9/10/2010, Approving The Debtors' Entry Into A Class Action Settlement Agreement And (B) Preliminarily Approving Class Action Settlement, Certifying A Settlement Class, And Approving Notice To The Absent Class Members(Related Doc # 3688 ). (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3897 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Objection of Unsecured Creditor Oildale Energy LLC to Motion for Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Disputed Claims filed by Richard S Conn on behalf of Oildale Energy LLC. (Conn, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3896 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion JOINDER OF CERTAIN ENVIRONMENTAL CLAIMANTS TO THE LIMITED OBJECTION OF SPARTECH POLYCOM, INC. TO THE JOINT CHAPTER 11 PLAN filed by Lauren M. McEvoy on behalf of Beacon Heights Coalition. (McEvoy, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3895 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion for Order Establishing A Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Disputed Claims filed by Richard S Conn on behalf of Oildale Energy LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B and C to Objection of Unsecured Creditor Oildale Energy LLC to Motion for Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with Respect to Disputed Claims) (Conn, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3894 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion OBJECTION OF CERTAIN ENVIRONMENTAL CLAIMANTS TO THE DEBTORS' MOTION FOR AN ORDER ESTABLISHING A DISTRIBUTION RESERVE AMOUNT WITH RESPECT TO DISPUTED CLAIMS IN CONNECTION WITH THE CONFIRMATION OF THE JOINT CHAPTER 11 PLAN (related document(s) 3779 ) filed by Lauren M. McEvoy on behalf of Beacon Heights Coalition. (McEvoy, Lauren) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3893 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection of SkillSoft Corporation to Proposed Cure (related document(s) 3497 , 3765 ) filed by William J. Hanlon on behalf of SkillSoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Hanlon, William) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3892 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 3875 ) filed by Jamie B. Eichinger on behalf of Official Committee of Equity Security Holders. (Eichinger, Jamie) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3891 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection of California Department of Toxic Substances Control to Debtors' Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount with respect to Class 11 Environmental Claims (related document(s) 3782 ) filed by Thomas G. Heller on behalf of California Department of Toxic Substances Control. (Heller, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3890 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Plan / Limited Objection Of Occidental Chemical Corporation And Affiliates To (1) Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Chemtura Corporation, Et Al., And (2) Exhibit D To The Plan Supplement To The Joint Chapter 11 Plan Of Chemtura Corporation, Et Al. (related document(s) 3497 , 3765 ) filed by Matthew E. Russell on behalf of Occidental Chemical Corporation. with hearing to be held on 9/16/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Russell, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3889 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection of Centerpoint Energy Gas Transmission Company to The Debtors' List of Assumed Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Proposed Cure Claims Attached as Exhibit B to Plan Supplement to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. filed by Jil Mazer-Marino on behalf of CenterPoint Energy Gas Transmission Company. Objections due by 9/13/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Objection# 2 Exhibit B to Objection# 3 Certificate of Service) (Mazer-Marino, Jil) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3888 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service regarding Objection to Assumption of Executory Contracts with Venomix, Inc. (related document(s) 3886 ) filed by Judy B. Calton on behalf of Vestaron Corporation. (Calton, Judy) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3887 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion for an Order Establishing a Distribution Reserve Amount With Respect to Disputed Claims in Connection With Confirmation of the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Chemtura Corporation, et al. (related document(s) 3779 ) filed by Shawn M. Riley on behalf of SPARTECH POLYCOM, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Riley, Shawn) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3886 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Plan /Objection to Assumption of Executory Contacts with Venomix, Inc. in Exhibit B to the Plan Supplement filed by Judy B. Calton on behalf of Vestaron Corporation. (Calton, Judy) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3885 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Its Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs (Related Doc # []) signed on 9/10/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3884 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Docket No. 3882 (related document(s) 3882 ) filed by Richard L. Wynne on behalf of Ad Hoc Committee of Bondholders. (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3883 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Presentment of an Order Approving the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors and the Georgia Department of Natural Resources Regarding Certain Environmental Obligations filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 9/20/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 9/17/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3882 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Final Professional Compensation Application Of The Ad Hoc Committee Of Bondholders For Allowance Of Compensation And Reimbursement Of Expenses Pursuant To A Global Settlement And Bankruptcy Rule 9019 And Section 1129(a)(4) Of The Bankruptcy Code, Or, In The Alternative, Section 503(b) Of The Bankruptcy Code. filed by Ad Hoc Committee of Bondholders. with hearing to be held on 9/16/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I) (Wynne, Richard) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3881 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Agreed Order Extending Time for Biolab, Inc to Assume or Reject Lease of Non-Residential Real Property with Lyondell Chemical Company signed on 9/10/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3880 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 9/9/2010 Granting Debtors' Thirtieth Tier I Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Insufficient Documentation, Late-Filed, Books and Records and Wrong Debtor Claims) With Respect to Proof of Claim No. 1357 Filed by Vito S. Loiotile. (related document(s) 2955 ) (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3879 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum Endorsed Order; Motion Denied for Failure to Allege a Prima Facie Entitlement to Relief signed on 9/9/2010 (related document(s) 3772 ) (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3878 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 9/9/2010 Approving the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors and the Division of Waste Management of the North Carolina Department of Environmental and Natural Resources Regarding Certain Environmental Obligations. (related document(s) 3674 ) (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3877 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting the Official Committee of Equity Security Holders Motion for an Order Authorizing the Filing of its Objection to Confirmation Under Seal (Related Doc # 3875 ) signed on 9/10/2010 (White, Greg) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3675 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Stipulation And Order Regarding Assumption Of Contracts With Shell Chemical LP And Shell Chemicals Americas Inc. And Payment Of Amounts Owed Among The Parties filed by Gerard Sylvester Catalanello on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Catalanello, Gerard) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3674 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of an Order Approving the Stipulation and Settlement Agreement Among the Debtors and the Division of Waste Management of the North Carolina Department of Environmental and Natural Resources Regarding Certain Environmental Obligations filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 9/7/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 9/3/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3673 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to File Under Seal / Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal an Un-Redacted Version of the Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing (A) Chemtura Corporation and Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Enter Into a Settlement, Release, and Buyback Agreement With the Chartis Insurers and (B) the Sale of Interests in Certain Insurance Policies Related Thereto (related document(s) 3672 , 3670 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. Responses due by 8/30/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3672 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Under Seal an Un-Redacted Version of the Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing (A) Chemtura Corporation and Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Enter Into a Settlement, Release, and Buyback Agreement With the Chartis Insurers and (B) the Sale of Interests in Certain Insurance Policies Related Thereto (related document(s) 3670 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 8/30/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 8/30/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3671 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Shorten Time / Debtors' Motion to Shorten the Notice Period With Respect to the Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing (A) Chemtura Corporation and Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Enter Into a Settlement, Release, and Buyback Agreement With the Chartis Insurers and (B) the Sale of Interests in Certain Insurance Policies Related Thereto (related document(s) 3670 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3670 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion for an Order Authorizing (A) Chemtura Corporation and Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to Enter Into a Settlement, Release, and Buyback Agreement With the Chartis Insurers and (B) the Sale of Interests in Certain Insurance Policies Related Thereto (Redacted) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3669 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Chemtura Canada Co./Cie to File Under Seal Certain Portions of Its Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statements of Financial Affairs [Docket No. 3653] (related document(s) 3653 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3668 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Contract Interest Rate Procedure Notice (related document(s) 3638 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3667 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served on August 23, 2010 [Docket Nos. 3638, 3641, 3642, 3643, 3644, 3645, 3646, 3647, 3648, 3649, 3650, 3651 and 3652] (related document(s) 3648 , 3643 , 3646 , 3644 , 3641 , 3638 , 3647 , 3642 , 3651 , 3650 , 3649 , 3652 , 3645 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3666 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Notice of Presentment of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Amendments to the Rights Offering Procedures and Rights Offering Instructions [Docket No. 3628]; and 2) Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Approving Amendments to the Rights Offering Procedures and Rights Offering Instructions [Docket No. 3629] (related document(s) 3628 , 3629 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3665 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Solicitation Documents to Holders of Debt and Equity Securities (related document(s) 3503 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3664 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Bishop Machine Works Inc.(Amount 200.00).. To Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 08/25/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3062 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 19, 2010 10:09 AM RE: Trustee's Motion for an Order to Affirm Trustee's Determinations Denying Claims of Claimants without BLMIS Accounts in their names, namely investors in Feeder Funds. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/19/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/28/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/22/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/19/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3061 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/21/2010 10:22 AM. RE: Trustee's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Section 78fff(a) of the Securities Investor Protection Act and Section 363 and 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Sale of Certain Financial Assets. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/20/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/29/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/12/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/22/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/20/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3060 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/22/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Frederick W. Chockley III, Esq. (Related Doc # 383 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3059 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve /Trustee's Motion For an Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of The United States Bankruptcy Code and Rules 2002 and 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Establishing Procedures For Approval of Settlements filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/28/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3058 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve /Trustee's Motion For Entry of an Order (I) Approving Litigation Case Mangement Procedures For Avoidance Actions and (II) Amended Global Protective Order filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/28/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit 1: Notice of Applicability# 3 Exhibit 2: Case Management Notice# 4 Exhibit 3: Undertaking and Consent to Be Bound# 5 Exhibit 4: Mediator List# 6 Exhibit A: Proposed Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3057 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve /Trustee's Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures For the Assignment of Allowed Claims filed by Geraldine E. Ponto on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/28/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Exhibit A: Transfer of Allowed Claim and Assignment# 3 Exhibit B: Notice of Transfer of Allowed Claim# 4 Exhibit C: Proposed Order) (Ponto, Geraldine) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3056 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Edward Smith on behalf of Columbia University. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Smith, Edward) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3055 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/21/2010 Authorizing the Sale of Certain Financial Assets (Related Doc # 3009 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3054 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter /Notice of Law Firm Name Change filed by Carole Neville on behalf of Sonnenschein Investors. (Neville, Carole) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3053 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 21, 2010 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 3049 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3052 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice (related document(s) 3047 , 3046 , 3048 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3051 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Investment Determination of Claim filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Jeffrey H. Allen, Laurel Allen, Paul Allen, Robert J. Allen, Allen Family Trust, Cathy J. Meyer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3050 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 7, 2010 at 10:08 AM RE: Motion for Entry of Order Approving and Agreement by and Between the Trustee and HSBC Bank PLC to Effectuate Agreement with the Primeo Liquidators. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/6/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/15/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/29/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/8/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/6/2011. (Braithwaite, Kenishia) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3049 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 21, 2010 at 10:00 A.M. filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 10/21/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3048 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lauren M. Hilsheimer filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3047 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lindsey D'Andrea filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3046 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jennifer Vessells filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2997 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2993 ) filed by Josephine Wang on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Wang, Josephine) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2996 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration /Declaration of Seanna R. Brown in Support of Trustee's Reply in Support of Trustee's Motion to Affirm Trustee's Determinations Denying Claims of Claimants Without BLMIS Accounts in Their Names, Namely, Investors in Feeder Funds (related document(s) 2416 , 2995 , 2414 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2995 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response / Trustee's Reply in Support of Trustee's Motion to Affirm Trustee's Determinations Denying Claims of Claimants Without BLMIS Accounts in Their Names, Namely, Investors in Feeder Funds (related document(s) 2416 , 2414 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2994 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to trustee's determination of claim #009907 filed by Red Valley Partners. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2993 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion Reply of The Securities Investor Protection Corporation in Support of Trustee's Motion to Affirm Trustee's Determinations Denying Claims of Claimants Without BLMIS Accounts in Their Names, Namely, Investors in Feeder Funds (related document(s) 2416 ) filed by Josephine Wang on behalf of Securities Investor Protection Corporation. (Wang, Josephine) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2992 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter /Trustee's Letter Response to Frank H. Wolf Objection to Claims Determination (related document(s) 2974 ) filed by Bik Cheema on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Cheema, Bik) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2977 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Jason A. Nagi on behalf of Barbara and Mark Roth. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Nagi, Jason) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2976 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 14, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Trustee's Response to Objection to Fourth Application of Trustee and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred From February 1, 2010 Through May 31, 2010 (related document(s) 2943 , 2967 , 2883 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2974 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter dated August 31, 2010 and July 22, 2010 requesting a hearing date (related document(s) 1792 , 2758 ) filed by Frank H. Wolf & Roberta Wolf J/T WROS. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2973 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Order of Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute Bankruptcy Appeal of U.S. District Court Judge Laura Taylor Swain signed on 9/8/2010. The above-referenced case is forwarded to District Court for possible dismissal. Petitioner has failed to pay the filing fee and file Designation of Items to be included in the record as required by : FRBP 8006 and 28 U.S.C. 1930(9),(16). For the reason(s) set forth above, the appeal is deemed abandoned, and IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the appeal in the above-entitled action is hereby DISMISSED. (related document(s) 2790 ) (Rivera, Jazmin) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2972 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Letter to Hon. Judge Burton R. Lifland (related document(s) 2883 ) filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Maureen Ebel, Diane Peskin, Roger Peskin. (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2967 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion for Fourth Interim Fee Application filed by Peter W. Smith on behalf of Susanne Stone Marshall. (Smith, Peter) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 2084 ) filed by Philomena S. Ashdown on behalf of Hauck Holdings Alexandria/Hannibal. (Ashdown, Philomena) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2099 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter dated October 14, 2010 Re: assignment letter filed on 5/17/2010 in 08-12629 filed by Euler Hermes ACI. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2092 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Nicole Aliseo of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (related document(s) 2085 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2091 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Nicole Aliseo of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (related document(s) 2084 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
2090 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Nicole Aliseo of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (related document(s) 2083 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2089 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order Regarding the Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims Signed on 9/21/2010 (Duplicate Claims) (Related Doc # 1735 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2088 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 2032 )for Cooley Godward Kronish LLP, fees awarded: $107683.50, expense awarded: $748.55, Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 2046 )for Loughlin Meghji & Co., fees awarded: $110661.50, expense awarded: $290.20, Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 2056 )for Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, fees awarded: $843540.00, expense awarded: $14733.09, Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 2062 )for Clear Thinking Group LLC, fees awarded: $194335.00, expense awarded: $2038.13,Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 2066 )for Asset Disposition Advisors, LLC, fees awarded: $7907.50, expense awarded: $819.27, Granting Application for Final Professional Compensation (Related Doc # 2067 )for SilvermanAcampora LLP, fees awarded: $5293.05, expense awarded: $394.24, signed on 9/21/2010. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2087 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 9/21/2010 Granting Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (Books and Records, No Liability and incorrectly Classified Claims. (Balance of Motion Adjourned to 10/27/2010 @11:00 a.m.) (related document(s) 2057 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2086 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Order Signed on 9/21/2010 Regarding the Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied and Released Claims) (related document(s) 1736 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2085 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Twentieth Omnibus Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 10/27/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 10/21/2010, filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC.(Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2084 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims with hearing to be held on 10/27/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 10/20/2010, filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC.(Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2083 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 21, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2080 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response of the New York City Department of Finance to the Debtors' Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims (related document(s) 2057 ) filed by Gabriela P. Cacuci on behalf of New York City Department Of Finance. with hearing to be held on 9/21/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Objections due by 9/14/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Response of the New York City Department of Finance to Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims) (Cacuci, Gabriela) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2079 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to certain administrative and other claims Re: Claim No. 977 @$13927.08 (related document(s) 2068 ) filed by EMC Corporation. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of the New York State Department of Taxation and Finance regarding proof of claim no. 5681 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Malo, David) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1841 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Jeffrey Mitchell, Esq., filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1840 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/20/2010 Approving Settlement Agreement Between Fairpoint And Verizon Wireless Regarding E-911 Claims (Related Doc # 1774 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1839 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 11/11/2010, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1838 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Julie Jung (related document(s) 1834 , 1833 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1837 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled For Hearing On October 25, 2010 At 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1836 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of James H. Myers (related document(s) 1824 , 1820 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1835 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Operating Report Monthly Operating Report for September, 2010 filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1834 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Hearing on Second Application for Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred by Professionals filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1833 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/20/2010 Authorizing Discovery From Segnet Technologies, Inc. and Segtel, Inc. (Related Doc # 1789 [1803) . (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1832 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/20/2010 Regarding Claims Filed By One Communications (related document(s) 1480 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1831 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Agreed Order signed on 10/20/2010 Regarding Fairpoints Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims With Respect to Claims Filed By Ronco Communications & Electronics, Inc. (Related Doc # 1440 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1830 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/20/2010 Between Fairpoint and TD Bank N.A. (A) Resolving Proofs Of Claim Nos. 4817, 4818, And 4819 Filed By Td Bank; (B) Disputes Regarding Certain Early Termination Charges; and (C) Objections To Cure Amounts Proposed To Be Paid By Fairpoint To Assume Contracts With TD Bank (related document(s) 913 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1829 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Fourth Order signed on 10/20/2010 Granting Fairpoints Second Omnibus Motion To Estimate The Maximum Allowed Amount Of Proofs of Claim Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) And 502(c)(related document(s) 1479 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1828 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/20/2010 Authorizing Assumption of Agreement, as Amended, With Nitel, Inc. Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) And 365 and Bankruptcy Rule 6006 (Related Doc # 1788 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1827 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/20/2010 Further Extending Exclusivity Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 1121(d) (Related Doc # 1733 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1826 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Julie Jung (related document(s) 1816 , 1817 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1825 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of James H. Myers (related document(s) 1810 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1824 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Third Amended Agenda Of Matters Scheduled For Hearing On October 20, 2010 At 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1823 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion to Reconsider (related document(s) 1701 ) filed by Donald J. Kravet on behalf of City of Claremont, c/o Jane Taylor, City Attorney. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G) (Kravet, Donald) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1822 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/19/2010 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Scott H. Harris, Esq. (Related Doc # 1819 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1821 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum Endorsement signed on 10/19/2010. RE: Denying Rquest by Counsel for Izzy Flores for an Adjournment (related document(s) 1818 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1820 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Second Amended Agenda Of Matters Scheduled For Hearing On October 20, 2010 At 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1819 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission on behalf of Scott H. Harris, Esq. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1785 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Master Service List /Master Service List as of September 22, 2010 Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2002 filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1784 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Operating Report /Monthly Operating Report for August, 2010 filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1783 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of James H. Myers (related document(s) 1780 , 1781 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1782 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Notice of Change of Address of Day Pitney LLP filed by Scott A. Zuber on behalf of Synchronoss Technologies Inc.. (Zuber, Scott) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1781 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of all Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 29, 2010 filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1780 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Sixth Notice of Omnibus Hearing Dates filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1777 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of James H. Myers (related document(s) 1775 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1776 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third So Ordered Stipulation signed on 9/13/2010 Regarding Procedures for Compensation of Certain Ordinary Course Professionals (related document(s) 1384 , 1411 , 1754 , 1727 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1775 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Agreed Order Regarding Resolution Of Certain Claims Between FairPoint and Cobank, ACB filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 9/15/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1774 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize Settlement of Certain Estate Claims Against Verizon Wireless Regarding E-911 Service, filed by Susheel Kirpalani on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 9/22/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Settlement Agreement# 2 (Proposed Order)) (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1773 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on August 26, 2010 10:14 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/29/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/7/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/20/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/30/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/29/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1768 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Hearing Of Matters Scheduled For Hearing On September 8, 2010 At 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1767 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Second Order Granting FairPoint's First Omnibus Motion To Estimate The Maximum Allowed Amount of Proofs of Claim Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 502(c) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 9/10/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1766 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Of Hearing On FairPoint's Motion To Estimate The Maximum Allowed Amount Of Proofs Of Claim Filed By Universal Service Administrative Company Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 502(c) (related document(s) 1474 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1765 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing On (I) FairPoint's Third Omnibus Motion To Estimate The Maximum Allowed Amount Of Proofs Of Claim Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 502(c); and (II) Motion of Otel Telekom, Inc. For Partial Reconsideration Of Orders Granting First And Second Omnibus Objections To Claims (Duplicate Claims) (related document(s) 1671 , 1480 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1764 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize /Debtors' Motion for Order, Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 105(a) and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure Rule 9019, for an Order Authorizing Settlement of Certain Estate Claims Against Verizon Wireless Regarding E-911 Service filed by Susheel Kirpalani on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 9/22/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Kirpalani, Susheel) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1763 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /Notice Of Agenda Of Matters Scheduled For Hearing On September 8, 2010 At 10:00 A.M. filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
765 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Original Complaint against 360networks (USA) Inc. (related document(s) 764 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
725 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 10-03642. Complaint against Jana Partners LLC, Sheila M. Gowan . Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by Craig Carpenito, Paul Gardi, Alex Interactive Media, LLC on behalf of Paul Gardi, Alex Interactive Media, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G) (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
724 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Trustees' Joint Statement in Support of the Joinder of JANA Partners, LLC as a Party to the Contested Matter Concerning the Trustees' Objection to the Gardi Parties' Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 722 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
723 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 722 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
722 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
721 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Phillips de Pury & Company (Related Doc # 709 ) signed on 9/16/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
718 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on August 31, 2010 10:16 AM RE: Status Conference Re: 8/23/10 Letter. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/30/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/8/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/22/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/4/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/30/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
717 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1006738 (related document(s) 674 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
716 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1006737 (related document(s) 673 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
714 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 705 , 704 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 09/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
604 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Allou Trustee in Response to Trustee's Motion (1) to Remove Certain Committee Members and (2) to Determine that those Committee Members are not Holders of Class 6 Claims (related document(s) 592 ) filed by Edward M. Flint on behalf of SilvermanAcampora LLP, attorney's for Kenneth P. Silverman, Esq. Chapter 7 Trustee of Allou Distributors, Inc., et al.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Appendix Affidavit of Service) (Flint, Edward) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
603 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Declaration of Isaac Meir Unger (related document(s) 599 ) filed by Jeffrey Nagel on behalf of Actrade Liquidation Trust Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Nagel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
602 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Declaration of Batsheva Sherman-Shani (related document(s) 599 ) filed by Jeffrey Nagel on behalf of Actrade Liquidation Trust Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Nagel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
601 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Declaration of Yaron Levi (related document(s) 599 ) filed by Jeffrey Nagel on behalf of Actrade Liquidation Trust Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# (7) Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Nagel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
600 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Declaration Jeffrey L. Nagel (related document(s) 599 ) filed by Jeffrey Nagel on behalf of Actrade Liquidation Trust Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13# 14 Exhibit 14# 15 Exhibit 15# 16 Exhibit 16# 17 Exhibit 17# 18 Exhibit 18# 19 Exhibit 19# 20 Exhibit 20)(Nagel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
599 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion The Actrade Liquidation Trust Committee's Response To The Trustee's Motion (1) To Remove Certain Committee Members and (2) To Determine That Those Committee Members Are Not Holders of Class 6 Claims and Cross Motion for an Order: (1) Removing the Trustee for Breaching His Fiduciary Duties and Obligations Under the Trust Agreement, (2 Permitting the Committee to Select a New Trustee, (3) Compelling the Trustee to Comply with the Committee's Requests for Information Involving Trust Expenses, Professional Fees and Other Information, and (4) Directing the Trustee and His Retained Professionals to Comply with the Directives of the Committee's September 13, 2010 Resolutions (related document(s) 592 ) filed by Jeffrey Nagel on behalf of Actrade Liquidation Trust Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Nagel, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
590 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Notice of Withdrawal of Proof of Claim by Putative Class Action Plaintiffs filed by Patrick P. Salisbury on behalf of Actrade Financial Technologies Ltd.. (Salisbury, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 425 ) filed by Sandra E. Mayerson on behalf of Post-Confirmation Oversight Committee. (Mayerson, Sandra) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
425 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection /Joinder of the Post-Confirmation Oversight Committee in the Debtors' Objection to Motion for Abstention and Remand (related document(s) 424 ) filed by Sandra E. Mayerson on behalf of Post-Confirmation Oversight Committee. with hearing to be held on 10/28/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Mayerson, Sandra) (Entered: 10/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
424 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
423 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
422 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing of Stipulation Between Certain Subsidiaries of Chartis, Inc. and the Reorganized Debtors Regarding Certain Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 417 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
421 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Post-Confirmation Report / Reorganized Debtors' Second Post-Confirmation Status Report and 2) Operating Report / Reorganized Debtors' Quarterly Operating Report for the Period July 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 414 , 415 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
395 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery Schedule and 2) Notice of Hearing to Consider Applications for Allowances of Final Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period of March 10, 2010 through July 29, 2010 (related document(s) 391 , 392 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
394 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on (I) Certain Matters and (II) Resolved Matters (related document(s) 387 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Vandell, Travis) (Entered: 09/17/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
385 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
384 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
383 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
382 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Application for Final Professional Compensation [related to Entry No. 343] for Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 7/1/2010 to 7/29/2010, fee:$479,668.00, expenses: $11,925.07. filed by Willkie Farr & Gallagher LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3) (Longmire, John) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
381 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Recover to the Extent of the Insurance Policy (related document(s) 246 ) filed by Eric R. Perkins on behalf of John Austin. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Perkins, Eric) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
380 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Maureen T. Bass on behalf of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Bass, Maureen) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
379 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Final Professional Compensation for Global Tax Management, Inc., Accountant, period: 3/10/2010 to 7/29/2010, fee:$68,160.75, expenses: $1,725.02. filed by Global Tax Management, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Certification) (Longmire, John) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
378 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Shorten Time - Debtors' Ex Parte Motion For An Order Shortening Time And Scheduling Hearings With Respect To (A) Debtors' Motion For Entry Of An Order Authorizing Debtors To Commit To An Exclusivity And Stand-Still Provision Contained In Non-Binding Letter Of Intent Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §363(b)(1) And (B) Debtors' Motion To File Non-Binding Letter Of Intent Under Seal Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §107(b)(1) And Fed. R. Bank. P. 9018 (related document(s) 377 , 376 ) filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
377 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to File Under Seal Debtors' Motion to File Non-Binding Letter of Intent Under Seal Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. section 107(b)(1) and Fed. R. Bank. P. 9018 with Exhibit A (Proposed Order) filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
376 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Debtors to Commit to an Exclusivity and Stand-Still Provision Contained in Non-Binding Letter of Intent Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. section 363(b)(1) with Exhibit A (Proposed Order) filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
375 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Scheduling Order signed on 9/22/2010. (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
374 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Shorten Time Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for an Order Shortening Time and Scheduling Hearing with respect to Debtors' Motion for Approval of Stipulation by and Between Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc. and Richard I. Koral, Inc. d/b/a Jessica's, Settling All Claims Relating to Distribution Agreement with Exhibit A (Proposed Order Shortening Time and Scheduling Hearing) filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
373 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9019(a) and 11 U.S.C. Section 105(a) for Approval of Stipulation by and between Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc. and Richard I. Koral, Inc. d/b/a Jessica's, Settling All Claims Relating to Distribution Agreement with Exhibit A (Stipulation with exhibits) and Exhibit B (Proposed Order Approving Stipulation with exhibits) filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
372 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 9/22/2010 granting motion by Bank of America, N.A. for relief form stay (Related Doc # 307 ). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
371 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion for Admission to Practice, Pro Hac Vice for Bruce Armstrong of Coleman Frost LLP filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 proposed Order) (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
370 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Monthly Fee Statement of Arent Fox LLP for the month of August 2010 filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Arent Fox LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Carroll, Schuyler) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
369 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Monthly Fee Statement of Manderson Schafer & McKinley for August 2010 filed by Jill L. Makower on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Makower, Jill) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
368 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Defective Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s) 353 , 354 ) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
367 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s) 355 ) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
366 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Amended Notice fo Docket # 354) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:3S Corporation (aka System Supply Stationary Corp)(Claim No.11, Amount 7,476.53). To Fair Harbor Capital, LLC. filed by Fair Harbor Capital, LLC.(Glass, Fredric) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
365 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter to the Honorable Arthur J. Gonzalez enclosing Monthly Fee Statement for Coleman Frost LLP for August 2010 Pursuant to Court Order Dated April 29, 2010 filed by Alex Spizz on behalf of Rock & Republic Enterprises, Inc.. (Spizz, Alex) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
364 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:S & J(Claim No.31, Amount 6,057.84). To Argo Partners. filed by Matthew Alexander Gold on behalf of Argo Partners.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
363 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Fourth Statement Submitted by FTI Consulting, Inc. in Compliance with Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a) amd 331 Establishing Procedures for Interim Monthly Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals for the Period August 1, 2010 through August 31, 2010 filed by Schuyler G. Carroll on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Carroll, Schuyler) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
362 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 9/20/2010 admitting Derrick F. Coleman, Esq. to practice pro hac vice in this Court (Related Doc # 359 ). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|