Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
19547 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutshce Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.22898, Amount 10,918,494.96). To CCP Credit Acquisition Holdings Luxco, SARL. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of CCP Credit Acquisition Holdings Luxco, SARL.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19546 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.22898, Amount 4,260,477.26). To CSCP Credit Acquisition Holdings Luxco, SARL. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of CSCP Credit Acquisition Holdings Luxco, SARL.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19545 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Carlyle Loan Investment Ltd.(Claim No.27573, Amount 104,735.60); Carlyle High Yield Partners IX, Ltd.(Claim No.27574, Amount 45,375.00); Carlyle High Yield Partners, IX, Ltd.(Claim No.27575, Amount 4,500,000.00); Carlyle High Yield Partners IX, Ltd.(Claim No.27576, Amount 4,500,000.00); Carlyle Credit Partners Master Fund(Claim No.27578, Amount 1,338,704.00); Carlyle Credit Partners Master Fund(Claim No.27587, Amount 1,338,704.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19544 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Lindsey N. Godfrey on behalf of UK Administration Companies. Filing fee collected, receipt #187530. (Hibbert, Stacey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19543 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Edgar Sargent on behalf of UK Administration Companies. Filing fee collected, receipt #187529. (Hibbert, Stacey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13573 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures for the Debtors to Compromise Claims of the Debtors in Respect of Real Estate Loans (related document(s) 5187 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13572 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims of Aozora Bank Ltd. (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/3/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13571 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims of EnergyCo Marketing and Trading, LLC N/K/A Optim Energy Marketing LLC (related document(s) 11978 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13570 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13569 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims of Investcorp Interlachen Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd (related document(s) 9983 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13568 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of November 2010 filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13567 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13495 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13566 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 13458 , 13494 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13565 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion of Citibank, N.A. in its Capacity as Trustee Pursuant to Various Trust Agreements, to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 12533 ) filed by Michael A. Fagone on behalf of Citibank, N.A., In Its Capacity As Trustee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Fagone, Michael) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13564 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Establishing Procedures for the Debtors to Transfer their Interests in Respect of Residential and Commercial Loans Subject to Foreclosure to Wholly-Owned Non-Debtor Subsidiaries (related document(s) 5272 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13563 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of William Brackett to Debtors' Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) (related document(s) 12851 , 11968 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13562 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of Evelyn Wheeler to Debtors' Fifty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) (related document(s) 12205 , 11610 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13561 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security; Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:MTS Incoming and Touristic Services S.I.(Claim No.62962, Amount 4,252,484.00). To Illiquidx Ltd.. filed by Jeff J. Friedman on behalf of Illiquidx Ltd..(Friedman, Jeff) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13560 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Fourth Amended Verified Statement of Bingham McCutchen LLP Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019 filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Bank Of America, N.A., Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Harbinger Capital Partners Master Fund I, Ltd., Harbinger Capital Partners Special Situations Fund L.P., ICM Business Trust, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Putnam Investments, State Street Bank and Trust Company, UBS AG, UBS Financial Services Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10651 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors: Juan Antonio Terrasa Pou(Claim No. 44780). To Banco Banif S.A. filed by Daniel Egan on behalf of Banco Banif, SA, et al..(Egan, Daniel) Modified on 8/6/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10650 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 10627 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10649 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 10632 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10648 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Granting Debtors' Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivative Claims). (Related Doc # 9325 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10647 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Momo-O, Matsuo & Namba, as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to February 1, 2010. (related document(s) 10374 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10646 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 10616 ) filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Investcorp Interlachen Multi-Strategy Master Fund Limited. (Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10645 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Johnathan Keeney Providing for Relief from the Automatic Stay with Regard to Real Property Located in Baltimore, Maryland. (related document(s) 10337 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10644 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60718, Amount 7,047,457.28). To Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10643 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.60718, Amount 13,088,134.96). To Stonehill Master Fund Limited. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Master Fund Ltd..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10642 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Correcting Allowed Claim Amount Between the Debtors and Dr. Michael C. Frege in His Capacity as Insolvency Administrator (Insolvenzverwalter) Over the Assets of Lehman Brothers Bankhaus AG (in Insolvenz). (related document(s) 10389 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10641 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citibank Europe plc, Hungarian Branch Office(Claim No.55403, Amount 32,308,503). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10640 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion by Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc. for an Order (A) Compelling Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims and (B) Compelling the Debtors to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts or Alternatively Modifying the Automatic Stay to Permit Movants to Terminate the Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/22/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 9/15/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10639 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on behalf of Fabio Liotti regarding proof of claim no. 15119 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC Claims Agent.(Malo, David) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10638 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Notice of Subpoena Issued Pursuant to Order Granting the Debtors Authority to Issue Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Authorizing the Examination of Persons and Entities (KeyCorp.) (related document(s) 5910 ) filed by Peter Gruenberger on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Gruenberger, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10637 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement : Notice of Subpoena Issued Pursuant to Order Granting the Debtors Authority to Issue Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Authorizing the Examination of Persons and Entities (KeyBank National Association) (related document(s) 5910 ) filed by Peter Gruenberger on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Gruenberger, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10636 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Steven J. Reisman filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Reisman, Steven) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7093 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/14/2011 Granting Refco Plan Administrator's Twenty-Eighth Omnibus Motion For Entry Of An Order (I) Amending Doc. No. 5524; (II) Allowing Claims 199 And 13288; (III) Disallowing Old Equity Interest 4232; (IV) Conditionally Allowing Claim 632 In A Reduced Amount; And (V) Extending Claims Objection Deadline With Respect To Claim 632 (Related Doc # 7082 ) . (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4406 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on December 21, 2010 10:04 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/22/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/29/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/24/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/22/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4361 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement AGENDA FOR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR DECEMBER 21, 2010 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4360 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion of Debtors' Thirty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 4283 ) filed by Ulyssus Libern Rudd Jr.. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4359 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of the Reply of Athens Paper Company, Inc. to Debtors' Objection to Motion of Athens Paper Company, Inc.'s for Order Deeming 503(b)(9) Claims Timely Filed (related document(s) 4357 ) filed by Alan E. Gamza on behalf of Athens Paper Company, Inc.. (Gamza, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4358 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration in Opposition to Motion of Debtors' Thirty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 4275 ) filed by John Simoni Jr. on behalf of Les Constructions Beauce-Atlas, Inc.. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4357 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response Reply of Athens Paper Company, Inc. to Debtors' Objection to Motion of Athens Paper Company, Inc.s for Order Deeming 503(b)(9) Claims Timely Filed (related document(s) 4348 ) filed by Alan E. Gamza on behalf of Athens Paper Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2010 (check with court for location) (Gamza, Alan) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4356 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion For Relief From Stay and Withdrawal of Response to Reorganized Debtors' Thirty Eighth Omnibus Objection To Claims filed by Robert S. Ovoian on behalf of Lucky Addeh. (Ovoian, Robert) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4355 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Rohdes Inc(Claim No.821, Amount 7,925.51). To Liquidity Solutions, Inc.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4319 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request For All Documents filed by Neal S. Mann on behalf of New York State Education Department. (Mann, Neal) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4074 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Consent Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Between the Debtors and the New York State Department of Taxation and Finance Regarding Debtors' Prepetition and Postpetition Sales Tax Liability and Resolution of Claims Pursuant to Amended Order Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Implement Procedures to Determine Prepetition and Postpetition Sale Tax Liabilities of Certain Debtors Pursuant to State and Local Voluntary Disclosure Procedures and (B) Determine the Amount of Prepetition and Postpetition Sales Tax Liability of Certain Debtors.. (related document(s) 4052 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4073 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Consent Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Between the Debtors and the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania Regarding Debtors' Prepetition Sales Tax Liability and Resolution of Claims Pursuant to Amended Order Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Implement Procedures to Determine Prepetition and Postpetition Sale Tax Liabilities of Certain Debtors Pursuant to State and Local Voluntary Disclosure Procedures and (B) Determine the Amount of Prepetition and Postpetition Sales Tax Liability of Certain Debtors. (related document(s) 4050 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4072 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Consent Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Between the Reorganized Debtors and Myllykoski North America, Madison Paper Industries, Madison Paper Company (Alsip Location) and Myllykoski Sales GMBH. . (related document(s) 4051 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4071 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Approving the Reorganized Debtors' Seventh Omnibus Application Seeking to Allow Permitted Settlements (Resolving Certain Claims Held by Riverside Claims LLC). (related document(s) 4057 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4070 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Approving the Reorganized Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Application Seeking to Allow Permitted Settlements (Resolving Certain Claims Held by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC). (related document(s) 4056 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4069 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Approving the Reorganized Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Application Seeking to Allow Permitted Settlements. (related document(s) 4055 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4068 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Approving the Reorganized Debtors' Third Omnibus Application Seeking to Allow Claims as Filed by the Holders Thereof. (related document(s) 4054 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2844 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Withdrawing Appeal (related document(s) 2106 ) filed by Just Empire, LLC, Josef Mittlemann. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2843 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to trustee's determination of claim Re: Trust#6U/A 12/23/88 filed by Kathleen Giamo. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2429 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 8/26/2011 Denying Motion of Paula McCoy-Franklin for Extension of Time to File Proof of Claim (Related Doc # 2214 ) . (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2428 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (Telephonic) - Previously Scheduled for August 29, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. (prevailing Eastern Time) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/31/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2427 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Order signed on 8/22/2011 Authorizing Assumption and Assignment of the Unexpired Non-Operating Sublease of 7931 Baltimore Annapolis Road, glen Burnie, MD 21060-8143; 2) Order signed on 8/22/2011 (I) Shortening the Notice Period for the Debtors' Motion for Approval of Stipulation and Agreed Order (A) Approving Interim Shipping Agreement (B) Granting Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay to Excercise Setoff Rights and (C) Granting Related Relief and (II) Granting Related Relief; and 3) Order signed on 8/22/2011 Granting Motion Authorizing the Debtors to File Interim Shipping Agreement UNDER SEAL (related document(s) 2401 , 2400 , 2398 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Stipulation and Scheduling Order signed on 8/18/2011 Between Debtors and West Milford Shopping Plaza, LLC Setting Discovery Deadlines; 2) Order signed on 8/18/2011 Denying Motion of India Consaway to Permit Her to File Late Claim; 3) Order signed on 8/18/2011 (I) Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' (A) Assumption of Certain Insurance-Related Agreements and (B) Entry Into Certain Renewal Insurance Agreements (II) Granting Related Relief; 4) Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Filing of Proposed Uncontested Order Authorizing the Assumption and Assignment of the Unexpired Non-Operating Lease and Sublease of 7931 Baltimore Annapolis Road, Glen Burnie, MD 21060-8143; 5) Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Approval of Stipulation and Agreed Order (A) Approving Interim Shipping Agreement (B) Granting Limited Relief From the Automatic Stay to Exercise Setoff Rights and (C) Granting Related Relief; 6) Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Shortening the Notice Period for the Debtors' Motion for Approval of Stipulation and Agreed Order (A) Approving Interim Shipping Agreement (B) Granting Limited Relief From the Automatic Stay to Exercise Setoff Rights and (C) Granting Related Relief; and 7) Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Interim Shipping Agreement Under Seal (related document(s) 2395 , 2374 , 2366 , 2394 , 2369 , 2393 , 2396 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2052 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Debtors' First and Final Report of Settled Claims Pursuant to the Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 3007 and 9019(b) (I) Authorizing the Debtors to File Omnibus Claims Objections and (II) Approving Procedures for Settling Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2051 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on 5/4/2009 in the amount of $150958.34 Re: 08-12632 filed by State of Ohio Bureau of Workers' Compensation.(Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2050 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Regarding the Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied and Released Claims) (Claim Objections Regarding Ohio and N.J. adj. to 9/21/2010 @11:00 a.m.) (related document(s) 1736 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2049 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(The wrong PDF File was entered, see document no. 2050 ) Second Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Regarding the Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Satisfied and Released Claims) (Claims Objection Regarding Ohio and New Jersey Adjourned to 9/21/2010 @11:00 a.m.(related document(s) 1736 ) (Porter, Marguerite) Modified on 8/5/2010 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2048 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/5/2010 Granting the Debtors' Sixteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims, Untimely Filed Claims, Duplicate Claim and Insufficient Documentation Claim) (Related Doc # 2013 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1996 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing On The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors' Motion To Compel Verizon Communications, Inc. And Its Subsidiaries To Comply With Terms Of The May 18, 2010 Letter Agreement Relating To The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Rule 2004 Motion (related document(s) 1920 ) filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1712 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1711 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1710 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1709 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1708 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1475 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Litigation Trustee's Second Motion for Entry of an Order Further Extending the Deadline for Litigation Trustee to File Certain Claims Objections filed by Elyssa Suzanne Kates on behalf of Litigation Trustee. (Kates, Elyssa) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1441 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration / Declaration of Todd Brents in Support of FairPoint's Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 1429 , 1430 , 1439 , 1435 , 1428 , 1427 , 1436 , 1434 , 1438 , 1426 , 1432 , 1440 , 1431 , 1437 , 1425 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1440 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Claims Filed in Wrong Case - Duplicate Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1439 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1438 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1437 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Sixty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis - Noncompliant Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1436 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis - Noncompliant Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1435 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis - Noncompliant Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1434 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis - Noncompliant Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1433 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:AAA Pump Services Inc(Amount 817.00).. To US Debt Recovery IV, LLC. filed by Nathan E. Jones on behalf of US Debt Recovery IV, LLC.(Jones, Nathan) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1432 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1431 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1430 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1429 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1428 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1427 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fifty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1425 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / FairPoint's Fiftieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1424 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauri Shippers re Notice of Transfer (related document(s) 1421 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1423 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration /First Supplemental Declaration Of Daniel T. Gary In Support Of FairPoint's Application For Order Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Section 327(A) Authorizing Retention Of KPMG LLP To Perform Fresh Start Accounting Services filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1361 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Mabel Soto (related document(s) 1347 ) filed by BMC Group, Inc.(Myers, James) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1360 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Altiplano Publishing LLC(Amount 758.00).. To Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. filed by Blue Heron Micro Opportunities Fund, LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement - Notice of Reclassification of Claim No. 559 of City Place Limited Partnership filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
657 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan / Notice of Filing of Revised Third Amended Schedule of Executory Contracts to be Rejected Pursuant to the Third Amended Proposed Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 652 , 310 ) filed by Nicole Greenblatt on behalf of The Reader's Digest Association, Inc.. (Greenblatt, Nicole) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
656 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Gianfranco Finizio (related document(s) 654 , 655 ) filed by Scott L. Hazan on behalf of BDO (U.K.) LLP. (Hazan, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
655 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ BDO (U.K.), LLP as Special UK Pension Advisor / Notice of Application For Order Pursuant To, Inter Alia, Sections 328(a), 330 And 1103(a) Of The Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rule 2014(a), And Local Bankruptcy Rule 2014-1 Authorizing Employment And Retention Of BDO (U.K.), LLP Effective As Of September 14, 2009, As Special UK Pension Advisor For The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors filed by Scott L. Hazan on behalf of BDO (U.K.) LLP. (Hazan, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
654 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Final Professional Compensation / First And Final Fee Application Of Stuart U. Goldfarb For Compensation For Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Expenses As Special Industry Expert For The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors For The Period October 29,2009 Through November 30, 2009 for Stuart U. Goldfarb, Other Professional, period: 10/29/2009 to 11/30/2009, fee:$30,000.00, expenses: $0. filed by Stuart U. Goldfarb. with hearing to be held on 3/8/2010 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 3/3/2010, (Hazan, Scott) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
653 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection of the United States Trustee Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s) 585 , 581 , 592 , 586 , 590 , 583 , 589 , 591 , 588 ) filed by Andrea B. Schwartz on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schwartz, Andrea) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
451 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So-Ordered Stipulation and Order signed on 1/18/2011 Regarding Discovery Schedule. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
338 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Abandonment of the Estate's Interest in and to Certain Books and Records of the Law Firm Dreier Stein Kahan Browne Woods George, LLP by the Chapter 7 Trustee. The Order to be Presented for Signature on September 19, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. with Objections Due on September 12, 2011 by 5:00 p.m. filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
336 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
335 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
334 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
333 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
332 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
331 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
330 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
329 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
328 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
327 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
326 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
325 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
324 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
323 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
320 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
319 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
318 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
317 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
316 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
315 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
314 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
313 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
312 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
311 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
310 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
309 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
308 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
307 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
306 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
305 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
303 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
302 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
301 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
300 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
299 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
298 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
297 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
296 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
295 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
294 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
293 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
292 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
291 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
289 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
287 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
286 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
283 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents by Amianna Stovall, Esq., Armando Ruiz and Armando Partners by a Member or Officer (Related Doc # 282 ) signed on 1/18/2011. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
282 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
281 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
280 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
279 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): filed on 6/29/2010 in the amount of $39037.30 Re: 10-11729 filed by State Board of Equalization of the State of California.(Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
278 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
277 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
276 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
275 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
274 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
273 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
272 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
271 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
270 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
269 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
268 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
267 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
266 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
265 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
264 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
263 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
262 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
260 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
259 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
253 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
252 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
251 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
247 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
244 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
243 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
242 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
240 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
236 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
235 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
234 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
232 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
231 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
230 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
229 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
227 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
226 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
225 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
223 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
222 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
221 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 216 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
220 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 215 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
219 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Relief from Stay Motion of Elisa P. Dreier for entry of an order (i) finding the automatic stay does not apply to the Accelerated DSO Obligation, or, in the alternative, (ii) granting relief from the automatic stay for cause if the automatic stay does apply, and (iii) abstaining from a determination of the Accelerated DSO Obligation filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Elisa Dreier. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 9/7/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit A to the Motion# 4 Certificate of Service) (Fleischer, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
218 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulated Order On Motion of PNC Bank, National Association for Allowance anf Payment of Administrative Expense Claim (Related Doc # 147 ) signed on 5/27/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
217 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC as Information Agent for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Envirosolutions of New York, LLC et al., Nunc Pro Tunc to May 26, 2010 (Related Doc # 187 ) signed on 5/27/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
216 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion to Approve (A) Authorizing EnviroSolutions Logistics, LLC to Reject Certain Lease Agreement with ALF P-II, Inc., (B) Approving a New Lease Agreement Between EnviroSolutions Logistics, LLC and ALF P-II, Inc. and Authorizing Performance thereunder, and (C) Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 175 ) signed on 5/27/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
215 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
214 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
212 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
211 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
210 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
209 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
208 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
207 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of GSO Capital Partners LP to Paul Gardi's and Alex Interactive Media, LLC's Emergency Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Order Granting the Trustees' Renewed Motions Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of Agreements (related document(s) 199 ) filed by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of GSO Capital Partners LP. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Shore, J.) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
206 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 205 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion and Opposition of Chapter 7 Trustee of the Estate of Marc S. Dreier (related document(s) 199 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
204 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 201 , 197 , 199 , 200 ) filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 06/29/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
203 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
202 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
201 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order to Show Cause signed on 6/23/2010 with hearing to be held on 6/30/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/24/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Alexander S. Lorenzo in Support of Emergency Consideration Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8011(d) of the Gardi Parties' Emergency Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal of the Order Granting the Trustees' Renewed Motions Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Fed. R. Bankr. P. for Approval of Agreements (related document(s) 199 ) filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
199 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal of the Order Granting the Trustees' Renewed Motions Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of Agreements (related document(s) 197 , 198 ) filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
198 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order /Order to Show Cause filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
197 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 191 ) filed by Alexander S. Lorenzo on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lorenzo, Alexander) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
196 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1004759 (related document(s) 170 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
195 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/14/2010 Granting Application for Allowance of Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Salvatore LaMonica, Esq., Chapter 7 Trustee, fees awarded: $218,584.94, expense awarded: $3,732.24. (Related Doc # 164 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 06/14/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
194 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 193 , 192 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 06/10/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
193 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 178 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D) (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
192 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 172 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
191 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/8/2010 Granting Trustee's Renewed Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of Agreements. (related document(s) 171 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/09/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
190 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents by the Debtor (Related Doc # 184 ) signed on 6/7/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/07/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
189 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on May 27, 2010 10:16 AM RE: Chapter 11 Trustee's Motion to Approve Compromise (Renewed) Pursuant to Section 105 (a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, for Approval of Certain Agreements. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/26/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 6/4/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 6/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/28/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/26/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 06/03/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
188 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Opposition Brief (In Letter Form) (related document(s) 164 ) filed by Robert M. Fleischer on behalf of Elisa Dreier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Divorce Agreement)# 2 Exhibit B (Proof of Claim)# 3 Exhibit C (Transcript)# 4 Exhibit D (Default Notice)) (Fleischer, Robert) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
187 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of the Chapter 7 Trustee's Response to the Objection of Elisa Dreier and Supplemental Brief in Support of the Trustee's Application for a First Interim Allowance of Commissions and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s) 186 ) filed by Salvatore LaMonica on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (LaMonica, Salvatore) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
186 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response of Chapter 7 Trustee to the Objection of Elisa Dreier and Supplemental Brief in Support of Trustee's Application for a First Interim Allowance of Commissions and the Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Adam P. Wofse on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Transcript of First Interim Fee Application) (Wofse, Adam) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
185 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of the Notice of the Third Motion, Third Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4004(b) and 11 U.S.C. §105(a) Extending the Date for the Chapter 7 Trustee and the Office of the United States Trustee to File a Complaint Objecting to the Debtor's Discharge and Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4004(b) and 11 U.S.C. § 105(a), Extending the Date for the Chapter 7 Trustee and the Office of the United States Trustee to File a Complaint Objecting to the Debtor's Discharge (related document(s) 183 ) filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
184 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents by the Debtor filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit B-Subpoena) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
183 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge of the Debtor on behalf of the Chapter 7 Trustee and the United States Trustee filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 6/29/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 6/22/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
182 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 180 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 05/27/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
181 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Response of GSO Capital Partners LP to Paul Gardi's and Alex Interactive Media, LLC's Objection to the Renewed Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of Agreements filed by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of GSO Capital Partners LP. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
180 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Designation of Contents (appellant). filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 April 12, 2010 Transcript)(Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 05/26/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
179 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 177 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
178 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve - Trustees' Joint Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of Trustees' Agreement filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/9/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit The Trustees' Agreement# 2 Exhibit Proposed Order# 3 Affidavit of Service) (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 05/21/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
177 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed On 8/26/2011, Approving The TSC Debtors' Management Compensation Program. (Related Doc # 155 ) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
176 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed On 8/26/2011, Granting The Debtor's First Omnibus Objection To Certain Proofs Of Claim (Equity Interests). (Related Doc # 142 ) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
175 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Fourth Monthly Fee Statement of Deloitte Tax LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Tax Services Provider to the TSC Debtors for the Period from July 1, 2011 through July 31, 2011 filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
174 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 170 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
173 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Motion to Approve Compromise , Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, for Approval of Agreement (related document(s) 172 ) filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/9/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Affidavit of Service) (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
172 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Compromise , Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 o the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, For Approval of Agreement filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 6/9/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Amended Notice of Motion# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Affidavit of Service) (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
171 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Compromise (Renewed), Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, for Approval of Certain Agreements (related document(s) 169 , 163 , 121 ) filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 5/27/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Responses due by 5/20/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
170 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 169 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Order being appealed.)(Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
169 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 5/12/2010 (1) Denying without Prejudice the Trustees' Motions for Approval of GSO Settlement Agreement and Coordination Agreement, and (2) Denying without Prejudice the Gardi Motion for an Order Granting Relief from the Stay. (related document(s) 167 ) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
168 |
Filed: 5/5/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 167 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
167 |
Filed: 5/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Settlement of an Order (1) Denying Without Prejudice the Trustees' Motions Pursuant to Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of GSO Settlement Agreement and Coordination Agreement, and (2) Denying Without Prejudice the Gardi Motion for an Order Granting Relief from Stay filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 5/11/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 5/11/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 05/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
166 |
Filed: 4/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 165 , 164 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 04/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
165 |
Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing Served on All Interested Parties on April 23, 2010 (related document(s) 164 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing)(Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
164 |
Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Interim Professional Compensation /Commissions and the Reimbursement of Expenses for Salvatore LaMonica, Trustee Chapter 7, period: 3/1/2009 to 4/20/2010, fee:$273,231.18, expenses: $3,732.24. filed by Holly R. Holecek. with hearing to be held on 5/18/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Certification# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
163 |
Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum Decision signed on 4/28/2010 Denying Motions to Approve Settlements and Lift the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 121 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
162 |
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 157 ) signed on 4/23/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 156 ) signed on 4/23/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
160 |
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 154 ) signed on 4/23/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
159 |
Filed: 4/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination (Related Doc # 155 ) signed on 4/23/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 04/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
158 |
Filed: 4/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): No. 5 filed by Lost Angeles County Treasury & Tax Collector.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
157 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by the Former Employees From Pitta & Dreier LLP and/or Pitta Bishop Del Giorno & Dreier LLP filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Directing the Production of Documents from JP Morgan Chase, Morgan Stanley, Pall Capital, Wachovia, A Wells Fargo Company, Citibank and Wells Fargo Bank Where the Debtor Maintained Bank Accounts for Wholly or Partially Owned Businesses filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Directing the Production of Documents by Wachovia, A Wells Fargo Company, Signature Bank, Citi National Bank, Morgan Stanley and 1st Century Bank Where the Debtor Maintained Bank Accounts For Pitta & Dreier LLP, Pitta Bishop Del Giorno & Dreier LLP, Dreier Stein Kahan Browne Woods George, LLP, and Dreier Stein Kahan LLP filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: 4/20/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination Directing the Production of Documents by Wachovia, A Wells Fargo Company, JP Morgan CHase, Citi National Bank, Bear Sterns, Morgan Stanley and Pall Capital Where the Debtor Maintained Personal Bank Accounts filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Advising all Creditors and Parties in Interest of Section 341 Meeting of Creditors filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: 3/30/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge through and including June 1, 2010 (Related Doc # 144 ) signed on 3/30/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 03/30/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
151 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Robert M. Abrahams on behalf of Meyer Venture Partners, L.P.. (Abrahams, Robert) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
150 |
Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Authorizing the Trustee, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, To Pay the Monthly Amount Owed to Cogent Communications, Inc. for One Year (Related Doc # 146 ) signed on 3/3/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
149 |
Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection The United States of America's Statement of No Objection to Application in Support of an Order, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105, Authorizing the Trustee to Pay the Monthly Amount Owed to Cogent Communications, Inc. For One Year (related document(s) 146 ) filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
148 |
Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) of Notice to Creditors and Other Parties in Interest of Trustee's Intended Sale (related document(s) 143 ) filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
147 |
Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice to Creditors and Other Parties in Interest of Trustee's Intended Sale (related document(s) 143 ) filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize the Trustee, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105, To Pay the Monthly Amount Owed to Cogent Communications, Inc. for One Year filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Cogent Bill# 2 Pleading Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
145 |
Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Auctioneer Bond for Marc Drier from Ostrin and Ostrin Co. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
144 |
Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge through and including June 1, 2010 filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Order) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
143 |
Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Sale of the Furniture and Equipment of Dreier Stein Kahan Browne Woods George, LLP and Entertainment Sports Group, LLC and the furniture and Personal Effects from the Debtor's Apartment located in Santa Monica, CA and the Debtor's 2007 Aston Martin DB9 Volante filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
142 |
Filed: 2/25/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Ostrin & Ostrin Co., as Auctioneers to the Trustee (Related Doc # 141 ) signed on 2/24/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 02/25/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
141 |
Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ Ostrin & Ostrin Co., as Auctioneers to the Trustee to Sell Certain of the Debtor's Personal Property Located in California and Affidavit in Support of the Trustee's Application to Employ. filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
140 |
Filed: 2/8/2010, Entered: None |
 |
|
Memorandum Order signed on 2/5/2010 by the Honorable Jed S. Rakoff, United States District Judge. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 02/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
139 |
Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 2/2/10 10:24 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/5/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/11/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 2/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/8/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/5/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 02/04/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
138 |
Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lyudmyla Polyova (related document(s) 136 ) filed by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of GSO Capital Partners LP. (Shore, J.) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
137 |
Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Statement of the United States of America in Support of Trustees Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Approval of Agreements filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
136 |
Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of GSO Capital Partners LP in Support of Trustees' Motions to Approve Agreements (related document(s) 121 ) filed by J. Christopher Shore on behalf of GSO Capital Partners LP. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Shore, J.) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
135 |
Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Reply of Chapter 7 Trustee in Further Support of Trustee's Motion (related document(s) 131 , 128 , 127 , 122 , 132 , 129 , 121 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
134 |
Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice to John E. Stephenson (Related Doc # 124 ) signed on 1/28/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
133 |
Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 131 , 132 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
132 |
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Paul Gardi in Opposition to Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee to Apporve Stipulation between Chapter 7 Trustee, Sheila M. Gowan, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP and GSO Capital Partners LP on behalf of itself and the GSO Parties (related document(s) 121 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
131 |
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee to Approve Stipulation Between Chapter 7 Trustee, Sheila M. Gowan, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP and GSO Capital Partners LP on behalf of itself and the GSO Parties (related document(s) 121 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
130 |
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 127 ) filed by Eamonn O'Hagan on behalf of Perella Weinberg Partners Xerion Master Fund Ltd.. (O'Hagan, Eamonn) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
129 |
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Maureen A. Fitzgerald In Support of Eton Park Fortress and Concordia Funds' Objection to Trustees' Motion For Approval of Agreements filed by Bruce E. Clark on behalf of Eton Park Capital Management LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Clark, Bruce) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
128 |
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion by Trustee For Approval of Agreements filed by Bruce E. Clark on behalf of Eton Park Capital Management LP. (Clark, Bruce) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
127 |
Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Limited Objection of Perella Weinberg Partners Xerion Master Fund Ltd. to Motion of Chapter 7 Trustee to Approve Stipulation Between Chapter 7 Trustee, Sheila M. Gowan, Solely in Her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP and GSO Capital Partners LP on Behalf of Itself and the GSO Parties (related document(s) 121 ) filed by Eamonn O'Hagan on behalf of Perella Weinberg Partners Xerion Master Fund Ltd.. (O'Hagan, Eamonn) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
126 |
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 125 ) filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
125 |
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Notice and Papers filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
124 |
Filed: 1/26/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Craig Carpenito on behalf of Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Paul Gardi. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Carpenito, Craig) (Entered: 01/26/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
123 |
Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 1/22/2010 Providing for Payment of a Certain Claim Entitled to Priority. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: 1/11/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Statement in Support of Trustee's Motion (related document(s) 121 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 01/11/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Compromise between the Chapter 7 Trustee, Sheila M. Gowan, Solely in her Capacity as the Chapter 11 Trustee for Dreier LLP, and GSO Capital Partners LP on behalf of Itself and the GSO Parties filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) Responses due by 1/27/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Stipulation# 2 Exhibit B -- Proposed Order# 3 Affidavit of Service) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
120 |
Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Compromise between Chapter 7 Trustee and Elisa P. Dreier, Providing for the Payment of a Certain Claim Entitled to Priority under 11 U.S.C. 507 (a)(1)(A) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Service) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
119 |
Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum Decision signed on 12/22/2009 Granting Motion to Dismiss Guaranty Claim. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
118 |
Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 12/15/2009 Extending The Date For the Chapter 7 Trustee and the Office of the United States Trustee to File A Complaint Objecting To The Debtor's Discharge. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 3/1/2010. (related document(s) 110 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
117 |
Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
Order of U.S. District Court Judge Jed S. Rakoff (on behalf of all three Judges) signed on 12/4/2009. At the joint hearing in these matters on April 22, 2009, the Government indicated that it would attempt to arrive at a global resolution of outstanding bankruptcy and forfeiture issues within a period of weeks. By letter dated May 1, the Government indicated that "additional information" was needed before a final resolution was possible. By Order dated May 4, the undersigned expressed their concern with this pace and directed the parties to submit letters indicating what additional information was necessary and why it could not be provided more promptly. On May 7, the parties submitted a joint letter referencing certain outstanding issues and promising to update the Courts on progress toward a global resolution. By letter dated July 31, the parties reported pending settlement negotiations and expressed hope that a resolution would be reached within 60 days. It has become apparent to all three Judges presiding over these related cases that these matters need to be addressed much more expeditiously. Accordingly, all affected parties are directed to attend an in-court hearing on January 12, 2010 at 4:00 p.m. in Courtroom 14B at 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY. The Clerk of the District Court and the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court are each directed to docket this Order, and the Government is directed to send a copy of the same to all parties that may be affected. (Cheng, Ka Kin) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
116 |
Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 112 ) filed by Gregory A. Blue on behalf of Saleh Holdings Group, Inc.. (Blue, Gregory) (Entered: 12/02/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
115 |
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 09-01901. Complaint against Marc S. Dreier . Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) Filed by Steven J. Reisman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Bregman, Jerrold) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
114 |
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 09-01900. Complaint against Marc S Dreier . Nature(s) of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) Filed by Heathfield Capital Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Kay, Eric) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
113 |
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 11/30/2009 Awarding Allowance of Compensation, Commissions and Reimbursement of Expenses of All Professionals (Related Doc # 87 )for David R. Maltz & Co., Inc., fees awarded: $394,500.00, expense awarded: $47,309.28, (Related Doc # 89 ) for LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP, fees awarded: $451,939.00, expense awarded: $16,373.28, (Related Doc # 86 ) for CBIZ Mahoney Cohen, fees awarded: $64,306.10, expense awarded: $82.40. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge filed by Gregory A. Blue on behalf of Saleh Holdings Group, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Blue, Gregory) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
111 |
Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 4004(b) and 11 U.s.c. §105(a) Extending the Date for the Chapter 7 Trustee and the Office of the United States Trustee to File a Complaint Objecting to the Debtor's Discharge with Exhibit "A" (related document(s) 110 ) filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Time to Object to Discharge for the Chapter 7 Trustee and for the Office of the United States Trustee filed by Melanie A. Fitzgerald on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. with hearing to be held on 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order) (Fitzgerald, Melanie) (Entered: 11/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
109 |
Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/20/2009 Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination and Directing the Examination of and Production of Documents From Michael Braverman Design, Inc. by its Officer Michael Braverman. (Related Doc # 106 ) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
108 |
Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 11/20/2009 Granting Application for FRBP 2004 and Directing the Examination of and Production of Documents by the Former Attorneys at Dreier Stein Kahan Brown Woods George, LLP. (Related Doc # 105 ) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
107 |
Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 11/17/09 10:36 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 2/16/2010. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/25/2009. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 12/9/2009. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 12/21/2009. Transcript access will be restricted through 2/16/2010. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 11/19/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
106 |
Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents from Michael Braverman Design, Inc. By Its Officer, Michael Braverman filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit B-Subpoena) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: 11/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by the Former Attorneys of Dreier Stein Kahan Brown Woods George, LLP Under Rule 2004 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-pOroposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 11/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
104 |
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 100 ) filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Elisa Dreier. (Stevens, Fred) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
103 |
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Statement /Supplemental Application of David R. Maltz & Co., in Support of its Final Application for Compensation (related document(s) 87 ) filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of David R. Maltz & Co., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Supplemental Statement in Support of the First Interim Application of LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP For Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s) 89 ) filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit "A") (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Dreier LLP Chapter 11 Trustee's Reservation of Rights Concerning Pending Applications for Interim Allowance of Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s) 99 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
100 |
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement - Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of Elisa P. Dreier Regarding the First Interim Applications for Compensation of the Chapter 7 Trustee and his Professionals (related document(s) 86 , 89 , 87 ) filed by Fred Stevens on behalf of Elisa Dreier. (Stevens, Fred) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
99 |
Filed: 11/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Dreier LLP Chapter 11 Trustee's Reservation of Rights Concerning Pending Applications for Interim Allowance of Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses (related document(s) 86 , 89 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 11/12/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
98 |
Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Of The United States Trustee To Order Allowing Compensation To Auctioneer (related document(s) 87 ) filed by Paul Kenan Schwartzberg on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schwartzberg, Paul) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
97 |
Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Of The United States Trustee To Applications For Interim Compensation And Expenses (related document(s) 86 , 89 ) filed by Paul Kenan Schwartzberg on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schwartzberg, Paul) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
96 |
Filed: 10/31/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Mailing Re: Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (related document(s) (Related Doc # 95 )) . Service Date 10/31/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 11/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
95 |
Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Request for Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 10/29/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
94 |
Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Status Conferences (related document(s) 92 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
93 |
Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize , Pursuant to 11 USC 105, The Trustee to Pay the Monthly Amount Owed to Cogent Communications, Inc. For One Year filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-The Bill# 2 Pleading Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
92 |
Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Status Conferences filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Certification of First Interim Fee Application of LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP, Counsel to the Chapter 7 Trustee (related document(s) 89 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Ex Parte Motion to Authorize , Pursuant to 11 U.S.C 105, the Chapter 7 Trustee to Pay the Monthly Amount Owed To Cogent Communications, Inc. For One Year filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
89 |
Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP, Trustee's Attorney, period: 3/9/2009 to 8/31/2009, fee:$454,439.00, expenses: $17,361.99.(related document(s) 79 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: 10/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Employ David R. Maltz & Co., Inc as Auctioneer (Related Doc # 85 ) signed on 10/27/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 10/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Final Professional Compensation for David R. Maltz & Co., Inc., Auctioneer, period: 5/14/2009 to 8/3/2009, fee:$394,500.00, expenses: $47,309.28.(related document(s) 79 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Order Approving Auctioneer's Retention# 2 Auctioneer's Report) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: 10/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation for CBIZ Accounting Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ Inc., Accountant, period: 4/1/2009 to 8/31/2009, fee:$64,306.10, expenses: $82.40.(related document(s) 79 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
85 |
Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ David R. Maltz & Co., Inc as Auctioneer to the Trustee and Affidavit in Support of the Trustee's Application to Employ filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Possible Dividend with Certificate of Mailing (related document(s) (Related Doc # 81 )) . Service Date 10/22/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Memorandum of Law in Support (related document(s) 82 ) filed by Jordan M. Kam on behalf of Elisa Dreier. (Kam, Jordan) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding as against Elisa Dreier filed by Jordan M. Kam on behalf of Elisa Dreier. with hearing to be held on 11/10/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Kam, Jordan) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Request for Notice of Possible Dividends. Proof of Claims due by 1/19/2010. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum Endorsed Order signed on 10/20/2009. The Court treats this application as the Trustee's notice pursuant to Federal Bankruptcy Rule 3002(c)(5), and directs the Clerk to comply with his duties under that Rule. So Ordered. (related document(s) 78 ) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of the within Notice of Hearing on Applications for Allowance of Compensation ahnd Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim against the Debtor filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Order with Bar Date Notice) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice to Creditors and Other Parties in Interest of Trustee's Intended Sale (related document(s) 76 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Sale to Creditors and Other Parties in Interest of Trustee's Intended Sale of the Debtor's personal property consisting of Baccarat crystal drinkware and tableware to be conducted on October 27, 2009 at 11:00 am filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 09-01477. Copy of Certified Order Transferring Case No. 09CV6269 from the U.S. District Court, S.D.N.Y. to the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y.. Nature(s) of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Filed by Gregory A. Blue on behalf of Saleh Holdings Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 ntc rem# 2 rule 7# 3 order) (Aquino, Lourdes) (Entered: 09/18/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 8/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by Max Weiss, CPA and Weiss Financial Companies, LLC (Related Doc # 73 ) signed on 8/17/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by Max Weiss, CPA and Weiss Financial Companies, LLC filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
72 |
Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination and Document Production Max Weiss, CPA and Weiss Financial Solutions, LLC filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 08/12/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 8/5/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Freedman & Taitelman, LLP as Special Litigation Counsel to the Trustee (Related Doc # 66 ) signed on 8/5/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 08/05/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 7/29/2009 Confirming the Sale, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Security Interests, of the Debtor's Real Property Located at 151 East 58th Street,Unit 34C, New York, New York 10022 to Ajit Jain and Indrima Jain. (related document(s) 53 , 57 , 41 , 68 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Abandonment of Property known as, and located at, 27 Meadow Lane, Westhampton Beach, New York 11798 filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. Objections due by 8/14/2009, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affirmation in Support of Order Confirming the Sale, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Security Interests, of the Debtor's Real Property Located at 151 E. 58th Street, Unit 34C, New York, NY 10022 to Ajit Jain and Indrima Jain (related document(s) 57 , 41 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit "A" to Proposed Order) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 07/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 7/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 65 )) . Service Date 07/25/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ Freedman & Taitelman, LLP as Special Litigation Counsel to the Trustee and Affidavit in Support of the Trustee's Application to Employ filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Request for 341(a) Notice with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/29/2009 at 11:00 AM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. Financial Management Course Due: 11/13/2009. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 11/30/2009. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/30/2009 Confirming the Sale, Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, of the Debtor's Real Property Located at 111 Dune Road, East Qougue, New York 11942 to 111 East Quogue LLC. (related document(s) 25 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/30/2009 Confirming Sale, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, of the Debtor's Real Property Located at 109 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York 11942 to Dune Road 109 EQ, LLC. (related document(s) 25 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affirmation in Support of Order Confirming the Sale, Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Security Interests, of the Debtor's Real Property Located at 111 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York 11942 to 111 East Quogue LLC (related document(s) 36 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affirmation in Support of Order Confirming the Sale, Free and Clear of all Liens, Claims, Encumbrances and Security Interests, of the Debtor's Real Property Located at 109 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York 11942 to Dune Road 109 EQ, LLC (related document(s) 36 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H, Schedule I, Schedule J , Summary of Schedules , Statement of Financial Affairs , and Verification of Creditor Matrix filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Marc S. Dreier. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit to Schedule B: Inventory Lists for 109 and 111 Dune Road Properties# 2 Exhibit to Schedule B: Inventory of Artwork)(Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination by John C. Kirkland, Esq. (Related Doc # 55 ) signed on 6/16/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/17/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Amended Order (I) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Real Property Known as Unit 34c at the Beacon Court Condominium, 151 East 58th Street, New York, New York, Subject to Higher or Better Offers and Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, with Such Liens, Claims and Encumbrances to Attach to the Net Proceeds of Sale; and (II) Approving the Bidding Procedures with Exhibits (related document(s) 57 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Order signed on 6/16/2009 (I) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Real Property known as Unit 34C at the Beacon Court Condominium, 151 East 58th Street, New York, New York, Subject to Higher or Better Offers and Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, With Such Liens, Claims and Encumbrances to Attach to the Net Proceeds of Sale; and (II) Approving the Bidding Procedures. (related document(s) 53 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/16/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against. Interpleader Summons Filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Campbell, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by John Kirkland, Esq. filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Order) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by Catherine Derby (Related Doc # 52 ) signed on 6/15/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 6/15/2009 (i) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Debtor's interest in the real property known as Unit 34C at the Beacon Court Condominium, 151 East 58th Street, New York, New York, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (ii) Approving the Bidding Procedures. (related document(s) 44 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by Catherine Derby filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed# 2 Exhibit Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by Christopher Pak (Related Doc # 48 ) signed on 6/9/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of John Garfield, Cheif Financial Officer of Clearant, Inc. (Related Doc # 47 ) signed on 6/8/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 6/5/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion of Trustee for an Order (i) authorizing and scheduling a public-auction sale of certain real property, and (ii) approving bidding procedures, only to the extent that it may seek to preclude Wachovia from exercising its right to credit bid at the sale of the property (related document(s) 41 ) filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wachovia Bank NA. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Production of Documents by Christopher Pak filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 06/04/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 45 , 44 , 43 ) filed by Benjamin S. Kaminetzky on behalf of J.P. Morgan Clearing Corp. and Merrill Lynch & Co.. (Kaminetzky, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 44 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Bidding Procedures)(Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 41 , 44 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Scheduling Order signed on 5/27/2009 (related document(s) 41 ) with hearing to be held on 6/9/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) seeking entry of an order to (i) Authorize and Schedule a Public Auction Sale of the Debtor's interest in the real property known as Unit 34C at the Beacon Court Condominium, 151 East 58th Street, New York, New York, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (ii) Approve the Bidding Procedures (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of Snell Wilmer, L.L.P. by its Managing Partner (Related Doc # 40 ) signed on 5/26/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Document Production by Jason Kim, Esq.(Related Doc # 39 ) signed on 5/26/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) on Shortened Notice and for the entry of an Order (i) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Debtor's interest in the real property known as Unit 34C at the Beacon Court Condominium, 151 East 58th Street, New York, New York, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (ii) Approving the Bidding Procedures filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 9077-1 Affidavit# 2 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Order# 3 Exhibit B - Bidding Procedures) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of Snell Wilmer, L.L.P. by its Managing Partner filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Document Production by Jason Kim, Esq. filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Document Production by Peter Rho, Esq. (Related Doc # 37 ) signed on 5/20/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/21/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 5/19/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and Document Production by Peter Rho, Esq. filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Proposed Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 05/19/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion for Order (i) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Debtor's Real Properties Located at 109 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York and 111 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York, Subject to Higher or Better Offers, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (ii) Approving the Bidding Procedures (Related Doc # 25 ) signed on 5/14/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ CBIZ Accounting Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ Inc., as Accountants (Related Doc # 20 ) signed on 5/14/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ David R. Maltz & Co., Inc. as Auctioneer (Related Doc # 22 ) signed on 5/14/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/14/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents by John C. Kirkland, Esq. (Related Doc # 30 ) signed on 5/12/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 5/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of Luce Forward Hamilton & Scripps, LLP (Related Doc # 31 ) signed on 5/12/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
31 |
Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of Luce Forward Hamilton & Scripps, LLP filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for FRBP 2004 Examination of and the Production of Documents by John C. Kirkland, Esq. filed by Joseph S. Maniscalco on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Subpoena) (Maniscalco, Joseph) (Entered: 05/11/2009)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Joint Letter in Response to Joint Order Dated May 4, 2009 filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 26 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Bidding Procedures)(Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 25 , 26 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 5/7/2009 (I) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Debtor's Real Properties Located at 109 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York and 111 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (II) Approving the Bidding Procedures (related document(s) 25 ) with hearing to be held on 5/14/2009 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723(SMB) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Sale of Property under Section 363(b) on Shortened Notice and for the entry of an Order (i) Authorizing and Scheduling a Public Auction Sale of the Debtor's Real Properties Located at 109 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York and 111 Dune Road, East Quogue, New York, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances; and (ii) Approving the Bidding Procedures filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Pursuant to Local Bankruptcy Rule 9077-1(a)# 2 Exhibit A - Stipulation and Order re: 109 Property# 3 Exhibit B - Stipulation and Order re 111 Property# 4 Exhibit C - Bidding Procedures# 5 Exhibit D - Proposed Notice of Hearing) (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 05/07/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 5/4/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint Order signed on 5/4/2009. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 05/04/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Gregory A. Blue on behalf of Saleh Holdings Group, Inc.. (Blue, Gregory) (Entered: 05/01/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ David R. Maltz & Co., Inc. as Auctioneer for the Trustee to Sell the Debtor's Real Properties and Affidavit in Support of the Trustee's Application to Employ filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 04/29/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter in Advance of Joint Hearing filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. with hearing to be held on 4/22/2009 (check with court for location) (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 4/14/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ CBIZ Accounting Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ Inc., as Accountants for the Trustee and Affidavit in Support of the Trustee's Application to Employ filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 04/14/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Joint Hearing, originally scheduled for April 6, 2009, to April 22, 2009 filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. with hearing to be held on 4/22/2009 (check with court for location) (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter in re: Request for adjournment of 4/6/09 hearing filed by Stephen J. Shimshak on behalf of Court-Appointed Receiver for Marc S. Dreier. (Shimshak, Stephen) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 3/25/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Stipulation)(Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 03/25/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Joint Hearing (related document(s) 14 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 14 ) filed by Holly R. Holecek on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Holecek, Holly) (Entered: 03/24/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 3/24/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Notice of Joint Hearing filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, with hearing to be held on 4/6/2009 at 2:30 pm, Location: Courtroom 14B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 (White, Greg) Modified on 4/8/2009 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 03/24/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 3/13/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP as Attorneys for the Trustee (Related Doc # 12 ) signed on 3/13/2009. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 03/13/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP as Attorneys for the Trustee and Affidavit in Support of the Trustee's Application to Employ filed by Gary Frederick Herbst on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Herbst, Gary) (Entered: 03/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appointment of Trustee Salvatore LaMonica filed by Paul Kenan Schwartzberg on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schwartzberg, Paul) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Order for Relief And Order To File Schedules And Other Documents Signed on 2/27/2009. Statement of Current Monthly Income and Means Test Form 22A Due: 3/16/2009. Missing Schedules due by 3/16/2009, (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew L. Schwartz on behalf of United States of America. (Schwartz, Matthew) (Entered: 02/19/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 1/30/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of the Summons to Debtor in Involuntary Case and Involuntary Petition (related document(s) 6 , 1 ) filed by Howard D. Ressler on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Mailing Re: Case Reassignment Notice. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 3 )) . Service Date 01/29/2009. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Summons against Marc S. Dreier in an involuntary case filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Leggett, Venice) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Alan Jay Lipkin on behalf of 360networks (USA) inc.. (Lipkin, Alan) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Wachovia Bank NA. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 1/27/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
Request For Notice Of Case Reassignment Pursuant to General Order M-306. Judge Robert D. Drain Terminated from the case. Judge Stuart M. Bernstein added to the case. (Porter, Minnie). (Entered: 01/27/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Tracy L. Klestadt on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP. (Klestadt, Tracy) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
Involuntary Petition (Chapter 7) Against: Marc S. Dreier. Filed by Petitioning Creditor(s): Sheila M. Gowan (attorney Howard D. Ressler), Wachovia Bank NA (attorneys Joseph Lubertazzi Jr., Joseph Lubertazzi, Joseph Lubertazi), Steven J. Reisman (attorney Lynn P Harrison 3rd). (Ressler, Howard) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |