Notice of Withdrawal of Objections to Trustee's Determinations of Claims (related document(s) 3177 , 3160 , 2903 , 3172 , 3158 , 2908 , 3171 , 3161 , 3156 , 3162 , 3180 , 3541 , 3173 , 2907 , 2905 , 3179 , 3178 , 2909 , 2225 , 3169 , 3540 , 3174 , 3163 , 3166 , 3542 , 3538 , 3539 , 2904 , 3153 , 3154 , 3537 , 3175 , 3157 , 2764 , 3155 , 3167 , 3176 ) filed by Stephen Fishbein on behalf of Andrew N. Jaffe Trust U/D/T DTD 5/12/75 As Amended, Carl Shapiro & Ruth Shapiro Family Foundation, Carl Shapiro Trust U/D/T 4/9/03, Ellen Jaffe Trust U/D/T DTD 5/8/2003 As Amended, Jennifer Segal Herman 1985 Trust Dated 4/16/85, Jennifer Segal Herman Trust U/D/T DTD 5/1/67 As Amended, Jonathan M. Segal Trust U/D/T DTD 12/1/70, LSW 2006 Irrevocable Trust, Linda Shapiro Family Trust Dated 12/08/76, Linda Shapiro Waintrup 1992 Trust U/D/T DTD 3/11/92 As Amended, Michael Jaffe 1989 Trust U/D/T DTD 8/24/89 As Amended, Michael S. Jaffe Trust U/D/T 9/25/71 As Amended, Rhonda Shapiro Zinner 1993 Trust U/D/T DTD 7/7/93 As Amended, Ruth Shapiro Trust U/D/T 4/9/03, Steven C. Jaffe Trust U/D/T DTD 9/25/71 As Amended, Steven Jaffe 1989 Trust U/D/T DTD 8/24/89 As Amended, The Andrew N. Jaffe 1993 Irrev. Trust U/D/T DTD 6/11/93 As Amended, The Jaffe Family 2004 Irrevocable Trust, The Jonathan M. Segal 1989 Trust U/D/T DTD 3/8/89 As Amended, The Kimberly L. Strauss 1988 Trust, The Kimberly Strauss 2006 Irrevocable Trust, The Samantha L. Strauss 1985 Trust, The Samantha L. Strauss 2003 Irrevocable Trust, Daniel I. Waintrup, Wellesley Capital Management. (Fishbein, Stephen) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
Opposition Trustees Opposition to Motion of Lawrence R. Velvel for (1) Judicial Approval of a Notice of Appeal - from Certain Avoidance Procedures - that was filed on December 20, 2010, Three Days after the Avoidance Procedures became Applicable to Him, or (2) in the alternative, for a Brief Extension of Time, until December 1, 2010, for the filing of a Prior Notice of Appeal that was Submitted on that Date (related document(s) 3544 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Jonathan M. Landers on behalf of John Malkovich. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Determination Letter# 2 Exhibit B - Customer Claim# 3 Exhibit C - New Times Transcript# 4 Exhibit - Certificate of Service) (Landers, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Objection to determination of claim filed by Jeffrey L. Bernfeld on behalf of Alan J. Winters Profit Sharing Trust. (Bernfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Scheduling Order signed on 12/29/2010 With Respect To Pending Motions Involving The Actrade Liquidation Trust (related document(s) 599 ), with hearing to be held on 1/19/2011 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 617 (ALG). (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 287 , 288 ) filed by William Heuer on behalf of Compania Mexicana de Aviacion, S.A. de C.V.. (Heuer, William) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served On or Before December 27, 2010 filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
Third Order Signed On 5/19/2011, (I) Authorizing The Use Of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying The Automatic Stay (IV) Granting Related Relief. (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtor's Second Motion for an Order Extending its Exclusive Periods Within Which to File and Solicit Acceptances of its Chapter 11 Plan, as Amended (related document(s) 107 ) filed by Sharon J. Richardson on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Richardson, Sharon) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtor's Second Motion for an Order Extending its Exclusive Periods Within Which to File and Solicit Acceptances of its Chapter 11 Plan, as Amended (related document(s) 55 ) filed by Sharon J. Richardson on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/17/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 6/10/2011, (Richardson, Sharon) (Entered: 05/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC for an Order Granting Relief From the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(D)(1) and Bankruptcy Rule 4001 (related document(s) 73 ) filed by Carol Weiner Levy on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/17/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Levy, Carol) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
Notice of Hearing on First Interim Application of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, For Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from November 8, 2010 through February 28, 2011 filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 6/6/2011, (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation /Notice of Hearing of Second Interim and Final Application of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Former Counsel for the Debtor, for (I) Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from March 1, 2011 through May 3, 2011 and (II) Final Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from November 8, 2010 through May 3, 2011 for Richard F. Casher, Debtor's Attorney, period: 3/1/2011 to 5/3/2011, fee:$176,999.50, expenses: $1,362.30. filed by Richard F. Casher. with hearing to be held on 6/16/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 6/6/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 100 , 99 , 101 ) filed by Peter M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 05/13/2011)
Affidavit /Supplemental Affidavit of Keith A. Brenan in Support of Application of the Debtor For Authorization to Employ and Retain The Weitzman Group, Inc. as Appraiser (related document(s) 100 ) filed by Peter M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Debtor's Application For Authorization to Employ and Retain The Weitzman Group, Inc., as Appraiser filed by Peter M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/26/2011 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 701 (PCB) Objections due by 5/19/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
Second Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement /Second Amendment to Debtor's Second Motion for an Order Extending its Exclusive Periods Within Which to File and Solicit Acceptances of its Chapter 11 Plan filed by Peter M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/26/2011 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 5/19/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing) (Friedman, Peter) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment by Debtor of Revised Proposed Third Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 97 ) filed by Sharon J. Richardson on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Richardson, Sharon) (Entered: 05/11/2011)
Notice of Presentment by Debtor of Revised Proposed Third Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Sharon J. Richardson on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/17/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 5/16/2011, (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Third Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief)(Richardson, Sharon) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT # 97 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Notice of Presentment by Debtor of Revised Proposed Third Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Sharon J. Richardson on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with presentment to be held on 5/17/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 5/16/2011, (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Third Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief)(Richardson, Sharon) Modified on 5/11/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Notice of Appearance /Amended Notice of Appearance and Demand For Notice and Service of Papers filed by Carol Weiner Levy on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Levy, Carol) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Application of Debtor for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328(a), FED.R.BANKR. 2014, and Local BANKR.R. 2014-1 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to April 19, 2011 (related document(s) 92 ) filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Application of Debtor for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328(a), FED.R.BANKR. 2014, and Local BANKR.R. 2014-1 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to April 19, 2011 (related document(s) 92 ) filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
Application to Employ Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession /Application of Debtor for Entry of an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328(a), FED.R.BANKR. 2014, and Local BANKR.R. 2014-1 Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, Nunc Pro Tunc to April 19, 2011; Hearing Date and Time: May 26, 2011, at 2:30 p.m.; Objection Deadline: May 19, 2011 at 4:00 p.m. filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Hearing) (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
Notice of Hearing (related document(s) 73 ) filed by Carol Weiner Levy on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/26/2011 at 02:30 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Levy, Carol) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Affidavit of Service of [Amended] Debtor's Objection to Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 88 ) filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
Objection [Amended] Debtor's Objection to Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 82 , 87 , 86 ) filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Debtor's Objection to Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 86 ) filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Objection to Motion / Debtor's Objection to Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 82 ) filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 84 ) filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 05/03/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Motion of Road Bay Investments, LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 362(D)(1) filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
Motion to Join Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC for an Order Granting Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuahnt to 11 U.S.C. § 362(D)(1) and Bankruptcy Code Rule 4001 (related document(s) 73 ) filed by Margaret M. Anderson on behalf of Jewel Food Stores. with hearing to be held on 5/2/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 4/26/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Anderson, Margaret) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Scheduled for April 27, 2011, to a date to be determined. (related document(s) 64 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Peter M. Friedman, Esq. of Cadwalader Wickersham & Taft LLP; [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by John J. Rapisardi on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Rapisardi, John) (Entered: 04/22/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 04/08/11 RE: Case Management Status Conference; Application to Employ D.E. Shaw Real Estate Advisers, LLC as Financial Advisors to the Debtor; et al.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 7/14/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 55 , 67 , 52 , 51 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/22/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 5/6/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 5/16/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 7/14/2011. (Acosta, Annya) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 75 , 74 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Order Signed On 4/8/2011, Authorizing The Withdrawal Of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP As Counsel To The Debtor. (Related Doc # 67 ) . (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 73 ) filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 04/08/2011)
Statement / Amendment to Debtor's Second Motion for an Order Extending its Exclusive Periods Within Which to File and Solicit Acceptances of its Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s) 55 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Application to Employ of the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain the Weitzman Group, Inc., as Appraiser filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Motion for Relief from Stay /Motion of Road Bay Investments LLC For An Order Granting Relief From The Automatic Stay Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 362(D)(1) And Bankruptcy Rule 4001 filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. with hearing to be held on 5/2/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 4/26/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Proposed Order# 7 Notice of Hearing) (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 04/07/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Motion of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP to (I) Withdraw as Counsel to the Debtor, (II) Expedite Hearing and (III) Continue Hearing on Second Exclusivity Motion (related document(s) 67 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 4/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 4/7/2011, (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Order Signed On 4/5/2011, Expediting Hearing On Motion Of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres, & Friedman LLP To (I) Withdraw As Counsel To The Debtor, (II) Expedite Hearing And (III) Continue Hearing On Second Exclusivity Motion. With hearing to be held on 4/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Location to be announced (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 69 ) filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
Objection to Motion /Limited Objection of Road Bay Investments LLC to Motion of Kasowtiz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP to Withdraw as Counsel and to Continue Hearing on Second Exclusivity Motion (related document(s) 67 ) filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
Notice of Presentment by Debtor of Third Order (I) Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection (III) Modifying The Automatic Stay, And (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with presentment to be held on 4/4/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 4/4/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP to (I) Withdraw as Counsel to the Debtor, (II) Expedite Hearing and (III) Continue Hearing on Second Exclusivity Motion filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferor: CHERRY LOGISTICS CORPORATION (Claim No. 2) To Road Bay Investments LLC. To Road Bay Investments LLC. filed by Carol Weiner Levy on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC.(Levy, Carol) (Entered: 04/01/2011)
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation /Notice of Hearing of First Interim Application of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from November 8, 2010 Through February 28, 2011 for Richard F. Casher, Debtor's Attorney, period: 11/8/2010 to 2/28/2011, fee:$268,778.50, expenses: $2,366.29. filed by Richard F. Casher. with hearing to be held on 4/27/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 4/20/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 03/28/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 55 , 52 , 51 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 4/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
Certificate of Publication of Bar Date Notice (related document(s) 56 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Casher, Richard) (Entered: 03/16/2011)
Objection to Motion /Objection of Road Bay Investments LLC to Debtor's Second Motion For An Order Extending Exclusivity Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1121(D) (related document(s) 55 ) filed by Carol Weiner Levy on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Levy, Carol) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
(CORRUPTED PDF FILE, SEE DOCUMENT # 60 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Objection to Motion /Objection of Road Bay Investments LLC to Debtor's Second Motion For An Order Extending Exclusivity Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 1121(D) (related document(s) 55 ) filed by Carol Weiner Levy on behalf of Road Bay Investments, LLC. (Levy, Carol) Modified on 3/10/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 03/10/2011)
Bridge Order Signed On 3/9/2011, Extending Debtors' Exclusive Periods Within Which To File And Solicit Acceptances Of Its Chapter 11 Plan. (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 52 , 51 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
Order Signed On 3/1/2011, Establishing Deadline And Procedures For Filing Proofs Of Claim And Approving The Form And Manner Of Notice Thereof. (Related Doc # 50 ) . Proof of Claims due by 4/5/2011, (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement / Notice of Debtor's Second Motion for an Order Extending its Exclusive Periods Within Which to File and Solicit Acceptances of its Chapter 11 Plan filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 3/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 3/10/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Debtor's Second Motion for an Order Extending its Exclusive Periods Within Which to File and Solicit Acceptances of its Chapter 11 Plan# 2 Exhibit A - Form of Proposed Exclusivity Order# 3 Exhibit B - Form of Proposed Bridge Order) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Second Order Signed On 2/28/2011, (I) Authorizing The Use Of Cash Collateral (II) Granting Adequate Protection (III) Modifying The Automatic Stay And (IV) Granting Related Relief. (related document(s) 41 , 33 ) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
Notice of Presentment by Debtor of Second Order (I) Authorizing The Use of Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with presentment to be held on 2/28/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 2/28/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Casher, Richard) (Entered: 02/25/2011)
Application to Employ D.E. Shaw Real Estate Advisers, L.L.C. as Financial Advisor / Notice of Application of the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain D.E. Shaw Real Estate Advisers, L.L.C. as Financial Advisor to the Debtor filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2011, with presentment to be held on 3/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Attachments: # 1 Application of the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain D.E. Shaw Real Estate Advisers, L.L.C. as Financial Advisor# 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Matthew Coleman# 4 Exhibit C - Affidavit of John Coleman) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Application to Employ the Reznick Group, PC as Accountant / Notice of Application of the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain the Reznick Group, PC as Accountant filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. Responses due by 3/10/2011, with presentment to be held on 3/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Attachments: # 1 Application of the Debtor Pursuant to Sections 327(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain the Reznick Group, PC as Accountant# 2 Exhibit A - Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Jonette Hahn) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim / Debtor's Motion for Order Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 1001(B) and Federal Bankruptcy Rule 3003(c)(3) (I) Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim, (II) Approving Proof of Claim Forms, (III) Approving Notice Procedures, and (IV) Granting Other Related Relief filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Bar Date Order) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of January 2011. filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 02/17/2011)
Order Signed On 2/1/2011, Extending Debtor's Exclusive Periods Within Which To File And Solicit Acceptances Of Its Chapter 11 Plan. (Related Doc # 37 ) . (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
Amended Operating Report Amended December Monthly Operating Report filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
Operating Report Debtor's Monthly Operating Report For December 2010 filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
Order Signed On 1/19/2011, (I) Authorizing The Use Of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date, (II)Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying The Automatic Stay, (IV) Granting Relief Under Section 543(d) Of The Bankruptcy Code Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date And (V)Granting Related Relief (Related Doc # 33 ) . (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
Statement / Supplemental Filing in Support of Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Granting Relief Under Section 543(d) of the Bankruptcy Code Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 33 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A and B# 2 Exhibits C thru G) (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Debtor's Motion for an Order (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Granting Relief Under Section 543(d) of the Bankruptcy Code Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and (IV) Granting Related Relief and the Case Status Conference with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL). (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
Bridge Order Signed On 1/7/2011, Extending Debtor's Exclusive Periods Within Which To File And Solicit Acceptances Of Its Chapter 11 Plan. (related document(s) 37 ) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
Motion to Extend Time Notice Of Debtor's Motion For An Order Extending Its Exclusive Periods Within Which To File And Solicit Acceptances Of Its Chapter 11 Plan filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 1/25/2011, (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
Certificate of Service of Debtor's Motion to (I) Authorize the Use of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Granting Relief Under Section 543(d) of the Bankruptcy Code and (V) Granting Related Relief; Affidavit of C. Michelle Panovich in Support of Debtor's Motion to (I) Authorize the Use of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, (IV) Granting Relief Under Section 543(d) of the Bankruptcy Code and (V) Granting Related Relief; and Notice of Adjournment. (related document(s) 33 ) filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of the Status Conference Scheduled for January 4, 2011 with hearing to be held on 1/12/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL). (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Affidavit of C. Michelle Panovich, as Receiver, in Support of Debtor's Motion for an Order Authorizing the use of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Granting Relief Under Section 543 (d) of the Bankruptcy Code Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and (IV) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 33 ) filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Motion to Authorize the use of Cash Collateral Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date, (II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Granting Relief Under Section 543 (d) of the Bankruptcy Code Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Richard F. Casher on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 1/12/2011 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Responses due by 1/10/2011, (Casher, Richard) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
Order Signed On 12/14/2010, Authorizing The Retention And Employment Of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP As Attorneys For The Debtor And Debtor In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc To November 8, 2010. (related document(s) 24 ) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 9, 2010 At 10:00 A.M., (related document(s) 24 ) filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
Affidavit of John B. Coleman Relating to Payment of Third-Party Retainer (related document(s) 24 ) filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
Declaration /Supplemental Declaration of David M. Friedman in Support of Application for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor-In-Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to November 8, 2010, (related document(s) 24 ) filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Friedman, David) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing - 11/22/2010 Status Conference filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/9/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Friedman, David) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Adjourned (related document(s) 22 ) filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with meeting to be held on 11/24/2010 (check with U.S. Trustee for location). (Friedman, David) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Notice of Hearing On Debtor's Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor-In-Possesion Nunc Pro Tunc to November 8, 2010 filed by David M. Friedman on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 12/9/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 12/6/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Debtor's Application for the Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres and Friedman LLP as Attorneys for the Debtor and Debtor-In-Possesion Nunc Pro Tunc to November 8, 2010# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B)(Friedman, David) (Entered: 11/12/2010)
Application to Employ D.E. SHAW REAL ESTATE ADVISERS, LLC as FINANCIAL ADVISER TO THE DEBTOR filed by Lawrence F. Morrison on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 21 )) . Service Date 10/20/2010. (Admin.) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
Request for 341(a) Notice with creditors meeting to be held on 11/17/2010 at 02:30 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 10/18/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of adjournment of Initial Case Conference filed by Lawrence F. Morrison on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/22/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (PCB) (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Request for Case Reassignment Notice. Judge Allan L. Gropper terminated from the case. Judge Sean H. Lane added to the case. (Gomez, Jessica). (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Schedules filed: Schedule A, Schedule B, Schedule C, Schedule D, Schedule E, Schedule F, Schedule G, Schedule H ,statement of financial affairs,list of security holders,corporate ownership statement(Rule 7007.1) and Rule 2016 Statement filed by Lawrence F. Morrison on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Demand For Notice and Service of Papers filed by Ronald J. Silverman on behalf of Allstate Life Insurance Company. (Silverman, Ronald) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings filed by Robert D. Tepper on behalf of C. Michelle Panovich. (Tepper, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11). Order for Relief Entered.List of Creditors Holding 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Rule 1007 affidavit Filed by Lawrence F. Morrison on behalf of Acorn Elston, LLC. (Morrison, Lawrence) (Entered: 09/11/2010)