Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Walker Truesdell Roth & Associates, Plaintiff Officially listed as "Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust"
Access Management Luxembourg SA , Defendant Officially listed as "Access Management Luxembourg SA (f/k/a Access International Advisors Luxembourg) SA) as represented by its Liquidator Maitre Ferdinand Entringer"
Claudine Magon de la Villehuchet , Defendant Officially listed as "Claudine Magon de la Villehuchet (a/k/a Claudine de la Villehuchet) individually as the sole beneficiary under the Will of Thierry Magon de la Villehuchet (a/k/a Rene Thierry de la Villehuchet)"
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Zenit SGR S.p.A, as successor by merger to Zenit Alternative Investment SGR S.p.A., acting in the name and on behalf of Zenit European Fund, formerly operating under the names of Zenit Advanced Strate, Defendant
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of Delphi Financial Group, Inc.. (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers upon Paul A. Patterson, Esq., Michael J. Cordone, Esq., and Mark J. Dorval, Esq., of Stradley Ronon Stevens & Young, LLP w/Rule 7007.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mark J. Dorval on behalf of Delaware Investment Advisers, a series of Delaware Management Business Trust, Delaware Management Business Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Rule 7007.1 Corporate Disclosure)(Dorval, Mark) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Delaware Investment Advisors Inc. (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Beneficial Life Insurance Co., BlackRock, Inc., Citigroup Alternative Investments LLC, Delaware Management Business Trust, Delphi Financial Group, Inc., Edison International, Garland Investment Management Inc., MKP Capital Management LLC, PB Capital Corporation, Princeton Advisory Group, Inc., RGA LLC, Sentinel Management Group Inc., Southern Missouri Bancorp, Inc., ZAIS Group, LLC, and Susquehanna Bank (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement Rule 7007.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Corporate parents added to case: Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Taunus Corporation. filed by David H. Lee on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lee, David) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by David H. Lee on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas. (Lee, David) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for 801 Grand CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, 801 Grand CDO Series 2006-2 LLC, ALTA CDO LLC, for Series 2007-1, ALTA CDO LLC, for Series 2007-2, Barton Springs CDO Series 2005-1 LLC, Barton Springs CDO Series 2005-2 LLC, Blue Point CDO Series 2005-1 LLC, Blue Point CDO Series 2005-2 LLC, Cherry Hill CDO LLC for Series 2007-1, Cherry Hill CDO LLC for Series 2007-2, Copper Creek CDO LLC, Crown City CDO 2005-1 LLC, Crown City CDO 2005-2 LLC, Freedom Park CDO Series 2005-1 LLC, Fullerton Drive CDO LLC, Greystone CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, Greystone CDO Series 2006-2 LLC, Greystone CDO Series 2006-2 LLC, Jefferson Valley CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, Kings River LLC, Lakeview CDO LLC Series 2007-1, Lakeview CDO LLC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2, Lakeview CDO LLC, f/a/o the Series 2007-3, Pantera Vive CDO LLC, Pebble Creek LCDO 2007-2, LLC, Penns Landing CDO LLC, Phoenix 2002-1 LLC, Pyxis ABS CDO 2007-1 LLC, Solar V CDO LLC, Stowe CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, Stowe CDO LLC, Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-5 LLC, Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-6 LLC, Series 2007-1 TABXSPOKE (07-140-100) LLC, Taylor Creek LLC, Tavares Square CDO LLC, Vox Place CDO LLC, and Vox Place CDO LLC (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement of Defendant Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Robinson B. Lacy on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC. (Lacy, Robinson) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Order Signed on 12/16/2010 Admitting John C. Weitnauer to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 44 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 44 , 43 ) filed by Michael E. Johnson on behalf of Bank of America National Association. (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1107330 (related document(s) 41 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, S.D.N.Y.. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/21/2011)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding and Request for Service of Papers filed by Michael E. Johnson on behalf of Bank of America National Association. (Johnson, Michael) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Wells Fargo Bank National Association (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for U.S. Bank Trust National Association (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Citibank, N.A. (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Affidavit of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for Bank of America, National Association (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Certificate of Service of First Amended Summons and First Amended Complaint for The Bank of New York Mellon (related document(s) 35 , 8 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
Supplemental Declaration of S. Benjamin Rozwood in Support of Supplemental Objections to Motion for Entry of Order Approving Proposed Settlement filed by Kevin M. Harr on behalf of 2005 Tomchin Family Charitable Trust, Rigdon Dees, Lakeview Investment, LP, Phoenix Lake Partners, Inc., Edward White. (Attachments: # 1 TABLE 1) (Harr, Kevin) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Supplemental Objection to Motion for Entry of Order to Approve Proposed Settlement (related document(s) 17 ) filed by Kevin M. Harr on behalf of 2005 Tomchin Family Charitable Trust, Rigdon Dees, Lakeview Investment, LP, Phoenix Lake Partners, Inc., Edward White. (Harr, Kevin) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Trustee Irving H. Picard's Response to the Objections to the Settlement Between the Trustee and Tremont Group Holdings, Inc., Tremont Partners, Inc., Tremont (Bermuda) Limited, Rye Select Broad Market Fund, LP, Rye Select Broad Market Prime Fund, L.P., Rye Select Broad Market Portfolio Limited, Rye Select Broad Market Insurance Fund, L.P., Rye Select Broad Market XL Fund, L.P., Tremont Arbitrage Fund, L.P., Tremont Arbitrage Fund Ireland, Tremont Emerging Markets Fund Ireland, Tremont Equity Fund Ireland, Tremont International Insurance Fund, L.P., Tremont Long/Short Equity Fund, L.P., Tremont Market Neutral Fund, L.P., Tremont Market Neutral Fund II, L.P., Tremont Market Neutral Fund Limited, Tremont Opportunity Fund Limited, Tremont Opportunity Fund II, L.P., Tremont Opportunity Fund III, L.P., Rye Select Equities Fund, Tremont Multi Manager Fund, and LifeInvest Opportunity Fund LDC, Oppenheimer Acquisition Corp., MassMutual Holdings LLC, Massachusetts Mutual Life Insurance Company, Robert I. Schulman, and Rye Select Broad Market Insurance Portfolio LDC (related document(s) 31 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Order signed on 9/21/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Kevin M. Harr, Esq. (Related Doc # 28 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Papers on Behalf of Citibank, N.A., as Trustee filed by Stephen J. Shimshak on behalf of Citibank, N.A.. (Shimshak, Stephen) (Entered: 11/16/2010)
Certificate of Service to Notice of Entry of Order Staying Avoidance Actions and Granting Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 31 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 11/10/2010)
Notice of Settlement of an Order - Notice of Entry of Order Staying Avoidance Actions and Granting Certain Related Relief filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 11/05/2010)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 29 , 28 ) filed by Eric A Schaffer on behalf of BNY Corporate Trustee Services, Ltd., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Schaffer, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Corporate Ownership Statement . filed by Eric A Schaffer on behalf of BNY Corporate Trustee Services, Ltd., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Schaffer, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Notice of Appearance filed by Eric A Schaffer on behalf of BNY Corporate Trustee Services, Ltd., The Bank of New York Mellon. (Schaffer, Eric) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
Order Signed on 10/25/2010 Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery and Establishing a Protocol Governing the Confidentiality Of and Access to Certain Discovery Material. (Related Doc # 2 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
Certificate of Service Letter to Judge Peck With Final Proposed Order (related document(s) 25 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Maher, William) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Statement Letter to Judge Peck With Final Proposed Order (related document(s) 2 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7026 and 9014 and Establishing a Protocol Governing the Confidentiality of and Access to Certain Discovery Material# 2 Errata B - Redline Version of Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7026 and 9014 and Establishing a Protocol Governing the Confidentiality of and Access to Certain Discovery Material) (Maher, William) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Certificate of Service of Corrected Reply to Objections to Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Rules 7026 and 9014 Docket Nos. 16 and 18 (related document(s) 23 ) filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Maher, William) (Entered: 10/19/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference Rescheduled to January 25, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to January 25, 2012 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference Rescheduled to January 25, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Notice of Appearance and request for service of papers filed by Jantra Van Roy on behalf of Rabobank Group, Rabobank International New York Branch. (Van Roy, Jantra) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
Objection to Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Rules 7026 and 9014 filed by James M. Heiser on behalf of US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Certificate of Service) (Heiser, James) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by James M. Heiser on behalf of US Bank National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Heiser, James) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Objection to Motion Limited Objection of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, as Indenture Trustee, to Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7026 and 9014 (related document(s) 2 ) filed by Christopher M. Desiderio on behalf of Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, As Indenture Trustee. (Desiderio, Christopher) (Entered: 10/13/2010)
Objection to Motion MERRILL LYNCH INTERNATIONALS AND MERRILL LYNCH, PIERCE, FENNER & SMITHS OBJECTIONS AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS WITH RESPECT TO TRUSTEES MOTION FOR (I) A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION TO THE DISTRICT COURT FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF SPECIAL DISCOVERY MASTERS; (II) AN ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR ELECTRONIC DATA ROOMS; AND (III) AN ORDER MODIFYING THE JUNE 6, 2011 LITIGATION PROTECTIVE ORDER filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Merrill Lynch International. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to January 25, 2012 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Mark B. Blocker (related document(s) 5 ) filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of Principal Global Investors, Principal Global Investors, (Europe) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Statement : Schedules to First Amended Complaint filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Upon Pictet Et Cie filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Amended Complaint against all defendants Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Maher, William) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Simone R. Cruickshank filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of Principal Global Investors, Principal Global Investors, (Europe) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Joel S. Feldman filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of Principal Global Investors, Principal Global Investors, (Europe) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
(The wrong PDF File was entered, see document no. 11 ) Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Mark B. Blocker filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of Principal Global Investors, Principal Global Investors, (Europe) Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Burke, Michael) Modified on 10/7/2010 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for Expedited Discovery Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rules 7026 and 9014 filed by Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (DeFilippo, Paul) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against 801 Grand CDO SPC f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; 801 Grand CDO SPC f/a/o the Series 2006-2 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; 801 Grand CDO Series 2006-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; 801 Grand CDO Series 2006-2 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; AC Capital Partners Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ACA Financial Guaranty Corporation Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ALTA CDO LLC, for Series 2007-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ALTA CDO LLC, for Series 2007-2 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ALTA CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ALTA CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Asteri Group Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Babson Capital Management Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Bank of America National Association Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Bank of China Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Bank of New York Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Bank of New York Corporate Trustee Services Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Barclays Bank PLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Barton Springs CDO SPC, f/a/o Series 2005-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Barton Springs CDO SPC, f/a/o Series 2005-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Barton Springs CDO Series 2005-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Barton Springs CDO Series 2005-2 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Basis Capital Pty Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Basis Yield Alpha Capital Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Bear Stearns Asset Management Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Beneficial Life Insurance Co. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; BlackRock, Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Blue Cross Blue Shield Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Blue Point CDO SPC, f/a/o the 2005-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Blue Point CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2005-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Blue Point CDO Seriers 2005-2 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Blue Point CDO Series 2005-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; CSFB Alternative Capital I Answer Due: 10/21/2010; CSFB CDO-CITI Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Calyon New York Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Central Reinsurance Corp. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Cherry Hill CDO LLC for Series 2007-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Cherry Hill CDO LLC for Series 2007-2 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Cherry Hill CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Cherry Hill CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Cheyne Capital Management (UK) LLP Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Citibank, N.A. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Citigroup Alternative Investments LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Copper Creek CDO LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Copper Creek CDO SPC, f/a/o Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Crown City CDO 2005-2 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Crown City CDO 2005-2 Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Delaware Investment Advisors Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Delaware Management Business Trust Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Delphi Financial Group, Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Dexia Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Edison International Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Equity Group, Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Ethias SA Answer Due: 10/21/2010; FAXTOR Securities BV Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Freedom Park CDO Series 2005-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Freedom Park CDO Series 2005-1 Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Fullerton Drive CDO LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Fullerton Drive CDO Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Garadex Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Garland Investment Management Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Gatex Properties Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Goldman Sachs US Mortgages SAI Fund Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Gordon Rausser (Defined Benefit Pension Plan) Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Gordon Rausser (IRA) Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Greystone CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Greystone CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series2006-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Greystone CDO Series 2006-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Greystone CDO Series 2006-2 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; IKB Deutsche Industriebank Answer Due: 10/21/2010; IRON Financial Answer Due: 10/21/2010; International Bank of Taipei Answer Due: 10/21/2010; JA Hokkaido Shinren Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Jefferson Valley CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Jefferson Valley CDO Series 2006-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Korea's National Agricultural Cooperative Federation Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Kuo Hua Life Insurance, Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Lakeview CDO LLC Series 2007-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Lakeview CDO LLC, f/a/o the Series 2007-3 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Lakeview CDO LLC, f/a/o the Series2007-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Lakeview CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Lakeview CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Lakeview CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series2007-3 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; MBIA Capital Management Corporation Answer Due: 10/21/2010; MKP Capital Management LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Magnetar Capital Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Modern Woodmen Answer Due: 10/21/2010; MoneyGram USA Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Ohio Public Employee Retirement System Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Omicron Investment Management GmbH (f/k/a UNIQUA Alternative Investments GmbH) Answer Due: 10/21/2010; PB Capital Corporation Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Pantera Vive CDO LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Pantera Vive CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Pebble Creek LCDO 2007-2, LLC, as Co-Issuer Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Pebble Creek LCDO 2007-2, Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Penn's Landing CDO LLC, as Co-Issuer Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Penn's Landing CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, as Issuer Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Phoenix 2002-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Phoenix 2002-1 Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Phoenix 2002-2 Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Princeton Advisory Group, Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Principal Global Investors Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Principal Global Investors, (Europe) Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Pyxis ABD CDO 2007-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Pyxis ABS CDO 2007-1 Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; RAACLC Trust, Series 2003-A Answer Due: 10/21/2010; RGA LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Rabobank Group Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Rabobank International New York Branch Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Gordon Rausser Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2005-19-C Trust Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2005-21-C Trust Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2006-1-C Trust Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2007-4-C Trust Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Rothschild Asset Management Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Ruby Finance PLC, f/a/o the Series 2005-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Ruby Finance PLC, f/a/o the Series 2006-4 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Ruby Finance PLC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Securitized Product of Restructured Collateral Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Federation A-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Securitized Product of Restructured Collateral Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Federation A-2 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Securitized Product of Restructured Collateral Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 TABXSPOKE (07-140-100) Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Seneca Capital Management LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Sentinel Management Group Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Series 2007-1 TABXSPOKE (07-140-100) LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Shield Securities Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Shinhan Bank Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Societe Generale Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Solar V CDO LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Solar V CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Southern Missouri Bancorp. Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Stone Tower Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Stowe CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Stowe CDO Series 2006-1 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Sunset Park CDO Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2005-5 Segregated Portfolio Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-5 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-6 LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-6 Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Susquahana Bank Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Swiss Life Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Taiwan Life Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Tavares Square CDO LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Tavares Square CDO Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; The Daegu Bank, Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; The Oceanic Hedge Fund Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Tom Depping Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Travelers Expres Company Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Trust Co. of the West Inc. Answer Due: 10/21/2010; UNIQA Alternative Investments Answer Due: 10/21/2010; US Bank National Association Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Union Investment Group Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Vanderbilt Capital Advisors Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Veritas Capital Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Vox Place CDO LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Vox Place CDO Limited Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Wells Fargo Bank, National Association Answer Due: 10/21/2010; Wells Fargo, National Association Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ZAIS Group, LLC Answer Due: 10/21/2010; ZAIS Investment Grade Ltd. Answer Due: 10/21/2010. (Please note that the Debtors have filed a motion seeking stay this proceeding until further notice. As such, no motion or answer is required from you at this time. The Debtors or the Court will issue a notice to you of the date such motion or answer is due on not less than 30 days notice.) (related document(s) 1 ) Filed by William A Maher on behalf of Clerk's Office of the United States Bankruptcy Court. (Cockerham, Kevin) (Entered: 09/21/2010)
Motion to Join filed by Paul R. DeFilippo on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 10/13/2010, (DeFilippo, Paul) (Entered: 09/16/2010)
Adversary case 10-03547. Complaint against Bank of America National Association, Bank of New York, Bank of New York Corporate Trustee Services Ltd., Citibank, N.A., US Bank National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, 801 Grand CDO SPC f/a/o the Series 2006-1, 801 Grand CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, 801 Grand CDO SPC f/a/o the Series 2006-2, 801 Grand CDO Series 2006-2 LLC, ALTA CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, ALTA CDO LLC, for Series 2007-1, ALTA CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2 Segregated Portfolio, ALTA CDO LLC, for Series 2007-2, Barton Springs CDO SPC, f/a/o Series 2005-1 Segregated Portfolio, Barton Springs CDO Series 2005-1 LLC, Barton Springs CDO SPC, f/a/o Series 2005-2 Segregated Portfolio, Barton Springs CDO Series 2005-2 LLC, Blue Point CDO SPC, f/a/o the 2005-1 Segregated Portfolio, Blue Point CDO Series 2005-1 LLC, Blue Point CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2005-2 Segregated Portfolio, Blue Point CDO Seriers 2005-2 LLC, Cherry Hill CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, Cherry Hill CDO LLC for Series 2007-1, Cherry Hill CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2 Segregated Portfolio, Cherry Hill CDO LLC for Series 2007-2, Copper Creek CDO SPC, f/a/o Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, Copper Creek CDO LLC, Crown City CDO 2005-2 Limited, Crown City CDO 2005-2 LLC, Freedom Park CDO Series 2005-1 Limited, Freedom Park CDO Series 2005-1 LLC, Fullerton Drive CDO Limited, Fullerton Drive CDO LLC, Greystone CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Segregated Portfolio, Greystone CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, Greystone CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series2006-2 Segregated Portfolio, Greystone CDO Series 2006-2 LLC, Jefferson Valley CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Segregated Portfolio, Jefferson Valley CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, Lakeview CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, Lakeview CDO LLC Series 2007-1, Lakeview CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-2 Segregated Portfolio, Lakeview CDO LLC, f/a/o the Series2007-2 Segregated Portfolio, Lakeview CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series2007-3 Segregated Portfolio, Lakeview CDO LLC, f/a/o the Series 2007-3 Segregated Portfolio, Pantera Vive CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1, Pantera Vive CDO LLC, Pebble Creek LCDO 2007-2, Ltd., Pebble Creek LCDO 2007-2, LLC, as Co-Issuer, Penn's Landing CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, as Issuer, Penn's Landing CDO LLC, as Co-Issuer, Phoenix 2002-1 Limited, Phoenix 2002-1 LLC, Phoenix 2002-2 Limited, Pyxis ABS CDO 2007-1 Ltd., Pyxis ABD CDO 2007-1 LLC, Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2005-19-C Trust, Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2005-21-C Trust, Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2006-1-C Trust, Restructured Asset Certificates with Enhanced Returns, Series 2007-4-C Trust, RAACLC Trust, Series 2003-A, Ruby Finance PLC, f/a/o the Series 2005-1, Ruby Finance PLC, f/a/o the Series 2006-4, Ruby Finance PLC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1, Securitized Product of Restructured Collateral Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Federation A-1 Segregated Portfolio, Securitized Product of Restructured Collateral Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Federation A-2 Segregated Portfolio, Solar V CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 Segregated Portfolio, Solar V CDO LLC, Stowe CDO SPC, f/a/o the Series 2006-1 Segregated Portfolio, Stowe CDO Series 2006-1 LLC, Sunset Park CDO Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2005-5 Segregated Portfolio, Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-5 LLC, Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-6 Limited, Sunset Park CDO Series 2005-6 LLC, Securitized Product of Restructured Collateral Limited SPC, f/a/o the Series 2007-1 TABXSPOKE (07-140-100) Segregated Portfolio, Series 2007-1 TABXSPOKE (07-140-100) LLC, Tavares Square CDO Limited, Tavares Square CDO LLC, Vox Place CDO Limited, Vox Place CDO LLC, AC Capital Partners Ltd., ACA Financial Guaranty Corporation, Asteri Group Ltd., Babson Capital Management, Bank of China, Barclays Bank PLC, Basis Yield Alpha Capital, Basis Capital Pty Limited, Blue Cross Blue Shield, Bear Stearns Asset Management, Beneficial Life Insurance Co., BlackRock, Inc., Calyon New York, Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce, Central Reinsurance Corp., Cheyne Capital Management (UK) LLP, Citigroup Alternative Investments LLC, CSFB Alternative Capital I, CSFB CDO-CITI, The Daegu Bank, Ltd., Delaware Investment Advisors Inc., Delaware Management Business Trust, Delphi Financial Group, Inc., Dexia, Edison International, Equity Group, Inc., Ethias SA, FAXTOR Securities BV, Garadex Inc., Garland Investment Management Inc., Gatex Properties Inc., Goldman Sachs US Mortgages SAI Fund, Gordon Rausser, Gordon Rausser (Defined Benefit Pension Plan), Gordon Rausser (IRA), Kuo Hua Life Insurance, Ltd., IKB Deutsche Industriebank, International Bank of Taipei, IRON Financial, JA Hokkaido Shinren, Korea's National Agricultural Cooperative Federation, Magnetar Capital, MBIA Capital Management Corporation, MKP Capital Management LLC, Modern Woodmen, MoneyGram USA, The Oceanic Hedge Fund, Ohio Public Employee Retirement System, Omicron Investment Management GmbH (f/k/a UNIQUA Alternative Investments GmbH), PB Capital Corporation, Princeton Advisory Group, Inc., Principal Global Investors, (Europe) Limited, Principal Global Investors, Rabobank International New York Branch, Rabobank Group, RGA LLC, Rothschild Asset Management Inc., Seneca Capital Management LLC, Sentinel Management Group Inc., Shield Securities, Shinhan Bank, Southern Missouri Bancorp. Inc., Societe Generale, Stone Tower, Susquahana Bank, Swiss Life Ltd., Taiwan Life, Tom Depping, Travelers Expres Company Inc., Trust Co. of the West Inc., Union Investment Group, UNIQA Alternative Investments, Vanderbilt Capital Advisors, Veritas Capital, Wells Fargo, National Association, ZAIS Group, LLC, ZAIS Investment Grade Ltd. . Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)), (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Michael Ledley, Paul R. DeFilippo, Randall Rainer, William A Maher, Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc. on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (DeFilippo, Paul) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
Response to Motion /Response of Boultbee (Helsinki) AB in Opposition to the Debtors One Hundred Seventy-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 19378 ) filed by Andrea Pincus on behalf of Boultbee (Helsinki) AB. with hearing to be held on 10/5/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 9/23/2011, (Pincus, Andrea) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Stipulation Reclassifying Certain Claims of Lehman Hong Kong Entities in Liquidation Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) as to Certain Claimants filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:VR Global Partners, LP(Claim No.55247, Amount 1,974,280). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:VR Global Partners, LP(Claim No.55247, Amount 600,000). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG(Claim No.59694, Amount 3,320,000.00). To Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Jonathan Hook on behalf of Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P..(Hook, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:VR Global Partners, LP(Claim No.55247, Amount 1,400,000). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG(Claim No.59710, Amount 5,000,000.00). To Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Jonathan Hook on behalf of Hayman Capital Master Fund, L.P..(Hook, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20101 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20100 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Daerden, J.H.J.(Claim No.55104, Amount 276,314.20). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20087 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20098 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:STOKKERMANS, KFE(Claim No.54479, Amount 9,905.70). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:STOKKERMANS, KFE(Claim No.54656, Amount 11,320.80). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:T.C.A. STOKKERMANS(Claim No.54491, Amount 11,320.80). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:T.C.A. STOKKERMANS(Claim No.54646, Amount 24,056.70). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:M.G.M. STOKKERMANS(Claim No.54493, Amount 11,320.80). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:M.G.M. STOKKERMANS(Claim No.54649, Amount 11,320.80). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:WAAGE, KNUT(Claim No.46743, Amount 34,557.00). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:WAELKENS, V.K.M.F.(Claim No.53598, Amount 4,562.72). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for the Period of August 2011 filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 22939 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by Robert Forfia. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 18145 (related document(s) 19393 ) filed by Theresa J. Carpenter. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 7716 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by Robert D. Morrison. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Pension Claims), In re: Claim No. 2543 (related document(s) 19391 ) filed by Nao Takano. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Pension Claims), In re: Claim No. 2542 (related document(s) 19391 ) filed by Nao Takano. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Svenska Handelsbanken AB (PUBL)(Claim No.4919, Amount $1,740,001.35); Svenska Handelsbanken AB (PUBL)(Claim No.4922, Amount $1,740,001.35); Svenska Handelsbanken AB (PUBL)(Claim No.4921, Amount $2,948,807.16); Svenska Handelsbanken AB (PUBL)(Claim No.4922, Amount $2,948,807.16). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Opposition to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 32259 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by John A. Whalen. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Response to Notice of Allowed Amount, and Request for Clarification of Notice in Appendix filed by Thomas Danielle. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Quarterly Status Report / Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures for the Debtors to Compromise and Settle Claims in Respect of the Origination or Purchase of Residential Mortgage Loans filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Monthly Status Report / Monthly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures to Terminate Unfunded Commitments and Restructure Corporate Loan Agreements filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Hank's Living Trust(Claim No.15127, Amount $23,262,750.00); Hank's Living Trust(Claim No.15128, Amount $23,262,750.00); Kilroy Realty, L.P.(Claim No.12597, Amount $2,400,000.00); Kilroy Realty, L.P.(Claim No.12598, Amount $2,400,000.00). To Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20083 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lehman Brothers Japan Inc.(Claim No.62783, Amount 189,870.45). To Meiho Chemical Industry Co., Ltd.. filed by Lorenzo Marinuzzi on behalf of Lehman Brothers Japan Inc..(Marinuzzi, Lorenzo) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20076 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.60657, Amount 424,530.00). To Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.44275, Amount 283,020.00). To Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20075 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.44273, Amount 424,530.00). To Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Response to Motion 196th Omnibus Objection filed by Joshua D. Rievman on behalf of RGM Trading International Limited. (Rievman, Joshua) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca di Credito Cooperative di Alba, Langhe(Claim No.48659, Amount 56,604.00). To Cassa di Risparmio di Bra S.p.A.. filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal / Ex Parte Motion Pursuant to Section 107 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 for Authorization to File Under Seal Portions of the Motion to Compel Production of Documents Improperly Withheld as Privileged by Giants Stadium LLC, and Exhibits Attached to the Accompanying Declaration of Michael J. Firestone filed by Richard W. Slack on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Slack, Richard) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Statement -- Notice of Withdrawal of Objection to Disclosure Statement and Solicitation Procedures Motion (related document(s) 19172 ) filed by Michael A. Rosenthal on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers AG, Zurich. (Rosenthal, Michael) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19525 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19451 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19450 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19448 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 30, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. (related document(s) 18126 ) filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19446 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19445 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC(Claim No.59098, Amount 12,608,615.75). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund, Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67079, Amount 4,450,000.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67080, Amount 4,450,000.00). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund, Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.26907, Amount 4,086,900.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.26908, Amount 4,086,900.00). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund, Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19433 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC(Claim No.59098, Amount 12,843,625.25). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced) Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced), Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67079, Amount 5,550,000.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67080, Amount 5,550,000.00). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced) Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced), Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.26907, Amount 5,013,100.00); Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.26908, Amount 5,013,100.00). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced) Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced), Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.58080, Amount 14,058,000.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66654, Amount 4,480,480.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66652, Amount 4,480,480.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66655, Amount 1,120,120.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66653, Amount 1,120,120.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67347, Amount 2,137,000.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67348, Amount 2,137,000.00). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced) Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund (Enhanced), Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.58080, Amount 8,885,128.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66654, Amount 3,519,520.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66652, Amount 3,519,520.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66655, Amount 879,880.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.66653, Amount 879,880.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67347, Amount 1,713,000.00); JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.67348, Amount 1,713,000.00). To Gruss Global Investors Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Max Polonsky on behalf of Gruss Global Investors Master Fund, Ltd..(Polonsky, Max) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Stipulation Between Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP and the Fee Committee Regarding the Second Interim Application of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 13469 ) filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Stipulation Between Jones Day and the Fee Committee Regarding the Sixth Interim Application of Jones Day, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 13455 ) filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Stipulation Between McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP and the Fee Committee Regarding the Sixth Interim Application of McKenna Long & Aldridge LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 13449 ) filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Stipulation Between Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP and the Fee Committee Regarding the Third Interim Application and Supplemental Second Fee Application of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Expenses for the Periods June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 and February 1, 2010 through May 31, 2010, Respectively (related document(s) 15219 , 13465 ) filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Stipulation Between Bortstein Legal LLC and the Fee Committee Regarding the Sixth Interim Application of Bortstein Legal LLC, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 13451 ) filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Stipulation between Bingham McCutchen LLP and the Fee Committee Regarding the Sixth Interim Application of Bingham McCutchen LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors, for Compensation and Expenses for the Period June 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 (related document(s) 13447 ) filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No. 59724). To Altuned Holdings LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Altuned Holdings LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities Ltd.(Claim No.58575, Amount 2,609,617.50). To Lataj Group LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Lataj Group LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities Ltd.(Claim No.58574, Amount 4,957,564.50). To Lataj Group LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Lataj Group LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.50307, Amount 5,000,000.00). To Austarity Group LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Austarity Group LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63605, Amount 2,915,478.12). To Thoroughbred Fund L.P.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Fund L.P..(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx LLP(Claim No.55175, Amount 7,278,027.53). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63598, Amount 2,183,121.78). To Thoroughbred Fund L.P.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Fund L.P..(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63597, Amount 582,165.81). To Thoroughbred Fund L.P.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Fund L.P..(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63595, Amount 8,746,434.35). To Thoroughbred Fund L.P.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Fund L.P..(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nomura International plc(Claim No.55175, Amount 7,278,027.53). To Illiquidx LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Illiquidx LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63605, Amount 5,101,854.25). To Palomino Fund Limited. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Palomino Fund Limited.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63598, Amount 4,075,160.68). To Palomino Fund Limited. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Palomino Fund Limited.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63597, Amount 1,018,790.17). To Palomino Fund Limited. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Palomino Fund Limited.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63595, Amount 15,452,034.01). To Palomino Fund Limited. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Palomino Fund Limited.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63605, Amount 3,061,484.47). To Thoroughbred Master Ltd.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Master Ltd.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63598, Amount 2,474,204.70). To Thoroughbred Master Ltd.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Master Ltd.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63597, Amount 582,165.81). To Thoroughbred Master Ltd.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Master Ltd.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63595, Amount 8,891,975.80). To Thoroughbred Master Ltd.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Master Ltd.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG, Stamford Branch(Claim No.67589, Amount 19,428,411.00). To Dolphinsu Capital LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Dolphinsu Capital LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No.63605, Amount 3,498,573.74). To Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63598, Amount 2,910,829.06). To Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63597, Amount 727,707.26). To Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.63595, Amount 10,641,727.57). To Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (superseding Transfer Agreement filed under Docket No. 18876) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50862, Amount 30,920.24). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merck & Co., Inc.(Claim No.200006, Amount 3,154,902.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merck & Co., Inc.(Claim No.200005, Amount 3,154,902.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF TRANSFER OF CLAIM #28170 FROM YORVIK PARTNERS LLP TO ELLIOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #44577 FROM BARCLAYS BANK PLC TO ELLIOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Partial Transfer in CHF Currency) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS SG(Claim No. 59233). To Zurcher Kantonalbank. filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #44577 FROM BARCLAYS BANK PLC TO ELLIOTT INTERNATIONAL, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #44557 FROM BARCLAYS BANK PLC TO ELLIOTT ASSOCIATES, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #44557 FROM BARCLAYS BANK PLC TO ELLIOTT INTERNATIONAL, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Agreement and Evidence of Transfer of Claim Lehman Program Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:VR-LIW GmbH(Claim No. 55175). To Nomura International plc. filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura International plc.(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #62822 FROM BARCLAYS BANK PLC TO ELLIOTT INTERNATIONAL, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #62822 FROM BARCLAYS BANK PLC TO THE LIVERPOOL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of The Liverpool Limited Partnership.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sutton Brook Capital Portfoilio, L.P.(Claim No.67589, Amount 19,428,411.00). To UBS AG, Stamford Branch. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of UBS AG, Stamford Branch.(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Telefonica, S.A.(Claim No.21678, Amount 67,551,407.80). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #63595 FROM GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. TO THE LIVERPOOL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of The Liverpool Limited Partnership.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #63595 FROM GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. TO ELLIOTT INTERNATIONAL, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #63595 FROM GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. TO THE LIVERPOOL LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of The Liverpool Limited Partnership.(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 NOTICE OF PARTIAL TRANSFER OF CLAIM #63595 FROM GOLDMAN, SACHS & CO. TO ELLIOTT INTERNATIONAL, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55829, Amount 2,421,310.00). To Stonehill Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Master Fund Ltd..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55829, Amount 2,082,623.89). To Stonehill Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Master Fund Ltd..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55829, Amount 1,545,837.44). To Stonehill Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Master Fund Ltd..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55829, Amount 1,299,399.59). To Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55829, Amount 1,070,884.49). To Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Stonehill Institutional Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Caja de Ahorros y Monte de Piedad de Zaragoza(Claim No.28170, Amount 3,919,017.69). To Yorvik Partners LLP. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Yorvik Partners LLP.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions (related document(s) 18812 , 18811 , 18810 , 18808 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18792 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Serengeti RAPAX MM L.P.(Claim No.33290, Amount 2,400,000.00); Serengeti RAPAX MM L.P.(Claim No.33291, Amount 2,400,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions (related document(s) 18789 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions (related document(s) 18815 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.65891, Amount $55,000,000.00). To Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Putnam Asset Allocation Funds - Growth Portfolio(Claim No.66709, Amount $121,553.86); Putnam Global Income Trust(Claim No.66710, Amount $77,025.72); Putnam Global Income Trust(Claim No.66711, Amount $77,025.72). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions (related document(s) 18844 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Putnam PSVF Liability Funding Portfolio(Claim No.66723, Amount $14,862,909.91); Putnam Retirement Advantage GAA Equity Portfolio(Claim No.66738, Amount $23,208.00); Putnam Retirement Advantage GAA Equity Portfolio(Claim No.66737, Amount $23,028.00); Putnam Absolute Return Fixed Income Fund(Claim No.66721, Amount $4,983,915.11); Putnam Absolute Return Fixed Income Fund(Claim No.66720, Amount $4,983,915.11); Putnam Total Return Trust(Claim No.66717, Amount $570,812.36); Putnam Total Return Trust(Claim No.66751, Amount $570,812.36); Putnam Canadian Global Trust - Putnam Canadian Fix(Claim No.66727, Amount $148,312.69); Putnam Canadian Global Trust - Putnam Canadian Fix(Claim No.66726, Amount $148,312.69); Putnam High Yield Fixed Income Fund, LLC(Claim No.66740, Amount $34,108.37). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Putnam World Trust - Putnam Global Fixed Income(Claim No.66839, Amount $2,214,125.33); Putnam World Trust - Putnam Global Fixed Income(Claim No.66838, Amount $2,214,125.33); Putnam World Trust - Putnam Global Fixed Income(Claim No.66837, Amount $1,315.28); Putnam World Trust - Putnam Global Fixed Income(Claim No.66836, Amount $1,315.28); Putnam World Trust - Putnam Global High Yield Bond(Claim No.66849, Amount $916.40); Putnam World Trust - Putnam Global High Yield Bond(Claim No.66848, Amount $916.40); Putnam New Flag Euro High Yield Fund Plc(Claim No.66845, Amount $29,194.67); Putnam New Flag Euro High Yield Fund Plc(Claim No.66844, Amount $29,194.67); Putnam Retirement Advantage GAA Conservative Portf(Claim No.66750, Amount $247,491.01); Putnam Retirement Advantage GAA Conservative Portf(Claim No.66749, Amount $247,491.01). To Deutsche Bank Ag, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Stipulation dismissing Notice of Appeal filed July 20, 2011 by The State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury, Division of Investment, (related document(s) 18676 ) filed by Lisa Laukitis on behalf of Joseph Arena, Roland Hansalik, George Barclay Perry, State of New Jersey, Department of Treasury. (Laukitis, Lisa) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities, Ltd.(Claim No.47006, Amount 4,146,285.56). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities, Ltd.(Claim No.47006, Amount 1,309,353.33). To AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Union Bancaire Privee(Claim No.47110, Amount 788,155.50). To Illiquidx LTD. filed by Illiquidx, Ltd.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 21,301.50). To Jingchuan Huang. filed by Jingchuan Huang.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 14,201.00). To Hannelore Stolley. filed by Hannelore Stolley.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 327(e) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain Dechert LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 21, 2011 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 8/12/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 8/12/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance filed by Marc Abrams on behalf of AIG CDS, Inc., AIG Financial Products Corporation, AIG Global Investment Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company, SunAmerica Life Insurance Company. (Abrams, Marc) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.17728, Amount 50,000,000.00). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Amended Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 15329). To Lagan Partners, L.L.C..(related document(s) 18795 ) filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Lagan Partners, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice Of Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security, Pursuant To Fed. R. Bankr. P. 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.17727, Amount 50,000,000.00). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Nestle in the USA Pension Trust(Claim No.15173, Amount 7,485,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.63595, Amount 1,084,643.65). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.63595, Amount 8,022,826.11). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.63595, Amount 4,972,265.85). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.63595, Amount 657,270.47). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50861, Amount 154,601.22). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50861, Amount 312,973.20). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50861, Amount 1,166,422.20). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50861, Amount 253,897.94). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50861, Amount 1,882,866.87). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50862, Amount 30,920.24). To Varde Investment Partners(Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50862, Amount 62,594.64). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50862, Amount 233,284.44). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50862, Amount 50,779.59). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50862, Amount 376,573.38). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lloyds TSB Bank PLC(Claim No.17728, Amount 50,000,000.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lloyds TSB Bank PLC(Claim No.17727, Amount 50,000,000.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.49737, Amount 5,572,160.65). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Clam Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.49737, Amount 1,759,629.68). To AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.49737, Amount 8,184,309.47). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.49737, Amount 2,776,819.28). To AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.58895, Amount 1,944,825.02). To Palomino Fund Limited. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Palomino Fund Limited.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.58893, Amount 6,482,741.48). To Palomino Fund Limited. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Palomino Fund Limited.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.58895, Amount 1,093,087.54). To Thoroughbred Fund L.P.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Fund L.P..(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.10117, Amount 800,423.92). To SPCP Group, LLC. filed by Tina N. Moss on behalf of SPCP Group L.L.C..(Moss, Tina) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.58893, Amount 3,643,627.58). To Thoroughbred Fund L.P.. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Thoroughbred Fund L.P..(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.58895, Amount 1,341,227.44). To Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman, Sachs & Co.(Claim No.58893, Amount 4,470,760.61). To Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Appaloosa Investment L.P. 1.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Jamaica Money Market Brokers Limited(Claim No.47006, Amount 5,455,638.89). To J.P. Morgan Securities Ltd.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities Ltd..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banco Mercantil Del Norte, SA,(Claim No.27812, Amount 18,000,000.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banco Mercantil Del Norte, SA,(Claim No.27811, Amount 18,000,000.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 14201.00). To Gisela Conrad. filed by Gisela Conrad.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): nos. 27731 & 27732 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.59483, Amount 10,370.37). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.59480, Amount 56,296.30). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:CVI GVF (LUX) Master S.A.R.L.(Claim No.59098, Amount 3,509,264.46). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management(Claim No.56953, Amount 15,598.05). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.56552, Amount 29,577.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:EFG Bank AG(Claim No.55837, Amount 569,720.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:VR-LIW GMBH(Claim No.55174, Amount 1,455,023.50). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.41170, Amount 15,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.40796, Amount 22,191.50). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.37541, Amount 7,520.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.35450, Amount 45,747.80). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.34981, Amount 15,551.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Notice of Presentment / Notice of Presentment of Supplemental Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Expand the Scope of Retention of CB Richard Ellis, Inc. as a Real Estate Consultant filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 8/10/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 8/10/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Letter to the Court. (The sum of $1.00 cash was included with this letter and received by the Court on July 25, 2011. The money is being held by the Clerk of Court) filed by Unknown Filer. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Declaration / Declaration of David Descoteaux in Support of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 for Authorization to (i) Enter into an Asset Management Agreement for the Management of the Debtors Commercial Loan Portfolio and (ii) Sell Commercial Loans to Special Purpose Entities in Connection with the Issuance of Collateralized Loan Obligations (related document(s) 18810 ) filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Declaration / Declaration of Douglas Lambert in Support of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 for Authorization to (i) Enter into an Asset Management Agreement for the Management of the Debtors Commercial Loan Portfolio and (ii) Sell Commercial Loans to Special Purpose Entities in Connection with the Issuance of Collateralized Loan Obligations (related document(s) 18810 ) filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Motion to Authorize / Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 for Authorization to (i) Enter into an Asset Management Agreement for the Management of the Debtors Commercial Loan Portfolio and (ii) Sell Commercial Loans to Special Purpose Entities in Connection with the Issuance of Collateralized Loan Obligations filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 8/10/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Order Signed on 7/27/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to File the List of Managed Assets on Schedule A to the Asset Management Agreement Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and WCAS|Fraser Sullivan Investment Management, LLC Under Seal. (Related Doc # 18808 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Ex Parte Motion to Authorize / Ex Parte Motion Pursuant to Section 107 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 for Authorization to File the List of Managed Assets on Schedule A to the Asset Management Agreement Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and WCAS|Fraser Sullivan Investment Management, LLC Under Seal filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 7/27/2011 Between Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. Regarding the Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims with Respect to the Claim of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America. (related document(s) 17941 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Order Signed on 7/27/2011 Denying Motion of Merrill Lynch Portfolio Management Inc. and Merrill Lynch Capital Services, Inc. for Entry of an Order Compelling Specific Performance of Subordination Agreement Terms. (Related Doc # 18033 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Hyposwiss Private Bank Geneve SA(Claim No.44504, Amount 354,775.00). To Illiquidx Ltd.. filed by James N. Truitt on behalf of Illiquidx Ltd..(Truitt, James) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Banca Popolare Dell' Emilia Romagna Soc. Coop.(Claim No.49737, Amount 7,331,790.33). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 7/27/2011 Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and First National Bank. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of America, N.A.(Claim No. 64070). To Goal Line Partners, L.L.C.. filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Goal Line Partners, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 2001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of America, N.A.(Claim No. 64071). To Goal Line Partners, L.L.C.. filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Goal Line Partners, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Banca Popolare Dell'Emilia Romagna Soc. Coop.(Claim No.49737, Amount 10,961,128.75) To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Docket Text Modified on 7/27/2011) (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RBS Securities Inc.(Claim No.67476, Amount 1,438,229.84). To Onex Debt Opportunity Fund, Ltd.. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Onex Debt Opportunity Fund, Ltd..(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RBS Securities Inc.(Claim No.67476, Amount 4,613,493.36). To OCP Investment Trust. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of OCP Investment Trust.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 43877). To Lagan Partners, L.L.C.. filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Lagan Partners, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 15329). To Lagan Partners, L.L.C.. filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Lagan Partners, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Between BNC Mortgage LLC and U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, Providing for Relief from the Automatic Stay with Regard to Certain Real Property Located in Honolulu, Hawaii filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 7/27/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/26/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Debtors' One Hundred Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Ninety-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Declaration / Supplemental Declaration of Alfredo R. Perez in Connection with Debtors Motion Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 for Authority to (I) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Creditors and the Suncal Trustee on Behalf of the Suncal Involuntary Debtors in Eight of the Involuntary Debtors Cases; (II) Enter into the Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan Proposed by the Lehman Lenders in Eleven of the Suncal Voluntary Debtors Cases; and (III) Participate in Any Auction of the Suncal Debtors Assets (related document(s) 18122 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) (related document(s) 13328 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Ninety-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Statement Fee Committee's Summary Report -- Fifth and Sixth Interim Period Applications for Fees and Expense Reimbursement filed by Katherine Stadler on behalf of Fee Committee. (Stadler, Katherine) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Dakota Blake (related document(s) 18570 , 18573 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11306 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) as to Certain Claimants (related document(s) 11305 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/28/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Hearing on Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s) 16046 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Claim of Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB (Claim No. 16070) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Response : Debtors' Omnibus Reply to Certain Responses to Debtors Fortieth and Forty-First (related document(s) 11305 , 11306 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Dennis J. Shaffer filed by Brent C. Strickland on behalf of Monarch Alternative Capital LP. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Strickland, Brent) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ESAF(Claim No.63572, Amount 5,660,400.00). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Affidavit of Service Regarding Fourth Amended Verified Statement Of Greenberg Traurig, LLP Pursuant To Bankruptcy Rule 2019 (related document(s) 18513 ) filed by Maria J. DiConza on behalf of Greenberg Traurig LLP. (DiConza, Maria) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors In Support of Debtors' Motion for (I) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (II) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Affidavit of Service Regarding Response Of Optique PTY LTD ATF Optique Super Pension Fund (Claim Number 5712) To Debtors' One Hundred Twentieth Omnibus Objection To Claims (No Blocking Numbers LPS Claims) (related document(s) 18322 ) filed by Maria J. DiConza on behalf of Optique Pty Ltd ATF Optique Super Pension Fund. (DiConza, Maria) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Response : Reply to Responses to Debtors' Motion for (i) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (ii) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:Acta Asset Management ASA(Claim No.59482, Amount 7,407.41). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 3 Transferors:VR-LIW GMBH(Claim No.55179, Amount 7,193,060.26). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Statement of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors in Support of Debtors' Motion for (I) Approval of Stipulation and Order Regarding Chapter 11 Plans and (II) Stay of Related Discovery (related document(s) 18306 ) filed by Gerard Uzzi on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors. with hearing to be held on 7/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Uzzi, Gerard) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Reply to Motion in Support of Motion of Roland Hansalik, George Barclay Perry and Joseph Arena for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Payment of a Judgment under the Directors and Officers Insurance Policies Issued to the Debtors filed by Evan Glassman on behalf of US Airways, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Glassman, Evan) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Response /Reply to Objection to Insured Persons' Motion for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Payment of a Judgment Under the Debtors' Directors and Officers Insurance Policies Issued to the Debtors (related document(s) 18467 , 18157 ) filed by Lisa Laukitis on behalf of Joseph Arena, Roland Hansalik, George Barclay Perry. (Laukitis, Lisa) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Objection to Motion Objection of Och-Ziff Capital Management Group LLC to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) And 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Kenneth S Ziman on behalf of Och-Ziff Capital Management Group LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Ziman, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection / Limited Objection of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Status Report : Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures for the Debtors to Compromise and Settle Claims in Respect of the Origination or Purchase of Residential Mortgage Loans filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion /Objection of Lehman Brothers Equity/Debt Securities Litigation Lead Plaintiffs to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Paul Kizel on behalf of Lehman Brothers Equity/Debt Securities Litigation Lead Plaintiffs. (Kizel, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion /Objection of Lehman Brothers Mortgage Backed Securities Litigation Lead Plaintiff to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Paul Kizel on behalf of Lehman Brothers Mortgage Backed Securities Litigation Lead Plaintiff. (Kizel, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion /Objection of Libertyview Capital Management LLC and Certain Affiliated Funds to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Paul Kizel on behalf of Libertyview Capital Management LLC and Certain Affiliated Funds. (Kizel, Paul) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nexen Marketing Singapore Pte Ltd(Claim No.17153, Amount 1,601,164.20). To Nexen Marketing. filed by Peter D'Apice on behalf of Nexen Marketing.(D'Apice, Peter) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nexen Marketing Singapore Pte Ltd(Claim No.27641, Amount 1,601,164.20). To Nexen Marketing. filed by Peter D'Apice on behalf of Nexen Marketing.(D'Apice, Peter) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nexen Energy Marketing Europe Limited(Claim No.17154, Amount 20,589,383.00); Nexen Energy Marketing Europe Limited(Claim No.18830, Amount 20,589,383.00). To Nexen Martketing. filed by Peter D'Apice on behalf of Nexen Marketing.(D'Apice, Peter) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Donna Angiulo of Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP (related document(s) 17503 ) filed by Lawrence V. Gelber on behalf of King Street Capital Management, L.P.. (Gelber, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17345 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17237 , 17222 , 17220 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17347 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Lori Seavey of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP (related document(s) 17128 , 17127 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17225 , 17223 , 17227 , 17229 , 17226 , 17230 , 17228 , 17224 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17346 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17399 , 17388 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17262 , 17264 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion / Limited Objection of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors to the Debtors' Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement Relating to 1107 Broadway (related document(s) 17129 ) filed by Andrew Hammond on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors. (Hammond, Andrew) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Certificate of Service of Richard V. Conza, dated June 8, 2011 (related document(s) 17493 ) filed by Lindsee Paige Granfield on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Granfield, Lindsee) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion / Limited Objection Of The Ad Hoc Group Of Lehman Brothers Creditors To Debtors' Motion To Amend The Order Pursuant To Sections 105(A) And 363(B) Of The Bankruptcy Code And Rule 9019(A) Establishing Procedures To (I) Restructure, (II) Make New Or Additional Debt Or Equity Investments In, And/Or (III) Enter Into Settlements And Compromises In Connection With Existing Real Estate Investments (related document(s) 17282 ) filed by Gerard Uzzi on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors. (Uzzi, Gerard) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection / Varde Partners, L.P.'s Objection to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Varde Partners, L.P.. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 6/8/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection - CarVal Investors UK Limited's Limited Objection To Motion of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant To Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of Bankruptcy Code And Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Luc A. Despins on behalf of CarVal Investors UK Limited. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Despins, Luc) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection /Limited Objection of the Liquidators of Lehman Brothers Australia Limited to Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a)(1), to Extend Stay of Avoidance Actions and Grant Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 17195 ) filed by James H.M. Sprayregen on behalf of Liquidators of Lehman Brothers Australia Limited. (Sprayregen, James) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion /JOINDER OF NOMURA INTERNATIONAL PLC, NOMURA SECURITIES CO., LTD. AND NOMURA GLOBAL FINANCIAL PRODUCTS, INC. TO THE OBJECTION OF BARCLAYS BANK PLC, BARCLAYS CAPITAL INC. AND THEIR AFFILIATES TO THE MOTION OF THE AD HOC GROUP OF LEHMAN BROTHERS CREDITORS PURSUANT TO SECTION 105(a) AND 1109(b) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE AND BANKRUPTCY RULES 2019 AND 7026 TO ESTABLISH DISCLOSURE PROCEDURES (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Fredric Sosnick on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., Merrill Lynch International. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Sosnick, Fredric) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion \Objection Of Davidson Kempner Capital Management LLC To Motion of The Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant To Sections 105(a) And 1109(b) Of The Bankruptcy Code And Bankruptcy Rules 2019 And 7026 To Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Adam Craig Harris on behalf of Davidson Kempner Capital Management LLC and certain managed funds and accounts. (Harris, Adam) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion : Limited Objection of DZ Bank AG Deutsche Zentral-Genossenschaftsbank, Mizuho Corporate Bank, Ltd., Mizuho Capital Markets Corporation, Nordea Bank AB (publ) (f/k/a Nordbanken AB (publ)) and Nordea Bank Finland Plc (f/k/a Merita Bank Ltd) to the Motion of the So Called Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Claude Szyfer on behalf of Nordea Bank Finland Plc, Nordea Bank AB (publ), Mizuho Capital Markets Corporation, Mizuho Corporate Bank, Ltd., DZ Bank AG Deutsche Zentral-Genossenschaftsbank. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Szyfer, Claude) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion Objection Of The Baupost Group, L.L.C. To Motion Of The Ad Hoc Group Of Lehman Brothers Creditors To Establish Disclosure Procedures [Docket 17014] (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Isaac M. Pachulski on behalf of The Baupost Group, L.L.C.. (Pachulski, Isaac) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Matrix : Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Response to Motion - Response Of The King Street Parties To The Motion Of The Ad Hoc Group Of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant To Sections 105(a) And 1109(b) Of The Bankruptcy Code And Bankruptcy Rules 2019 And 7026 To Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Lawrence V. Gelber on behalf of King Street Capital Management, L.P.. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Gelber, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection : Debtors' Objection to Motion of Monti Family Holding Company Ltd. for Rule 2004 Examination (related docket no. 16803) filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion Objection of U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee to Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a)(1), to Extend Stay of Avoidance Actions and Grant Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 17195 ) filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Acker, Ann) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Opposition to Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Management Corp.. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Certificates of Service) (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion Objection of Certain Holders of Notes Issued by Lehman Brothers Treasury Company B.V. and Guaranteed by Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Steven B. Levine on behalf of Various LBT Noteholders. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Levine, Steven) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection to Motion (Deutsche Bundesbank's Limited Objection to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures) (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Patrick D. Oh on behalf of Deutsche Bundesbank. (Oh, Patrick) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Declaration of Sean A. O'Keefe in Support of SunCal Parties' Opposition to Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code for Enforcement of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 17061 ) filed by Sean A. Okeefe on behalf of SunCal Debtors. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits 1-7# 2 Exhibit 8, Part 1# 3 Exhibit 8, Part 2# 4 Exhibits 9-15) (Okeefe, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No.19173, Amount 20,000,000.00); Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No.19174, Amount 20,000,000.00); Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No.66799, Amount 15,000,000.00); Sabretooth Master Fund, LP(Claim No.66800, Amount 15,000,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Opposition SunCal Parties' Opposition to Motion of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 362(a) of the Bankruptcy Code for Enforcement of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 17061 ) filed by Sean A. Okeefe on behalf of SunCal Debtors. with hearing to be held on 6/15/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Okeefe, Sean) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Certain Proofs of Claim filed by J. Gregory Milmoe on behalf of BlackRock Advisors, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Milmoe, J.) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Objection of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc. and Their Affiliates to the Motion of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 1109(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 2019 and 7026 to Establish Disclosure Procedures, dated June 8, 2011 (related document(s) 17014 ) filed by Lindsee Paige Granfield on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital, Inc.. (Granfield, Lindsee) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Notice of Withdrawal of Claim Number 17462 filed by Michael J. Venditto on behalf of BNY Mellon Corporate Trustee Services Limited.(Venditto, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Georgia Faust (related document(s) 17342 ) filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP. (Reisman, Steven) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Seventh Application of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, as Attorneys for the Debtors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from October 1, 2010 through January 31, 2011 for Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP, Debtor's Attorney, period: 10/1/2010 to 1/31/2011, fee:$37008258.50, expenses: $1063670.14. filed by Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP. (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Third Interim Application of Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors In Possession, For Interim Allowance of Compensation For Professional Services Rendered and For Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred From October 1, 2010 Through January 31, 2011 for Robert M. Novick, Debtor's Attorney, period: 10/1/2010 to 1/31/2011, fee:$175,910.50, expenses: $61,991.94. filed by Robert M. Novick. (Novick, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Seventh Application Of Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, Counsel To Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, For Interim Approval And Allowance Of Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses During Period From October 1, 2010 Through And Including January 31, 2011 for Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Comm. Aty, period: 10/1/2010 to 1/31/2011, fee:$14,180,784.7, expenses: $633,261.80. filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Second Interim Application of Reed Smith LLP, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period December 1, 2010 through February 28, 2011 for Reed Smith LLP, Other Professional, period: 12/1/2010 to 2/28/2011, fee:$237,869.50, expenses: $5,517.90. filed by Reed Smith LLP. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:GoldenTree Master Fund Ltd(Claim No.5883, Amount 205,000). To GoldenTree High Yield Val. Fund Off. (Str.), Ltd.. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Master Fund, LTD.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:GoldenTree Master Fund Ltd(Claim No.58883, Amount 2,580,000). To GoldenTree High Yield Value Master Unit Trust. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Master Fund, LTD.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd(Claim No.60715, Amount 85,477.59). To GoldenTree Entrust Master Fund o/b/o Portfolio 1. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Master Fund, LTD.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:GoldenTree Master Fund II, Ltd(Claim No.60715, Amount 42,508.92). To GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Master Fund, LTD.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:GoldenTree Master Fund II, Ltd(Claim No.60699, Amount 47,342.82). To GoldenTree Master Fund, Ltd. filed by Jason Sanjana on behalf of GoldenTree Master Fund, LTD.(Sanjana, Jason) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Claim No. 4920 filed on behalf of SVENSKA HANDELSBANKEN AB (PUBL) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Seventh Interim Application Of Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc., Investment Banker To The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors, For Interim Allowance Of Compensation For Professional Services Rendered And Reimbursement Of Actual And Necessary Expenses Incurred From October 1, 2010 Through January 31, 2011 for Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc., Other Professional, period: 10/1/2010 to 1/31/2011, fee:$1,600,000.00, expenses: $35,936.59. filed by Houlihan Lokey Howard & Zukin Capital, Inc.. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC re: Letter Regarding Group Requests, Group APP Requests, and Group Participant Requests, dated May 26, 2011 filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 17151 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.67462, Amount 18,293,845.00). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.28820, Amount 18,293,845.00). To OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of OCM Opportunities Fund VIIb Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.67462, Amount 9,513,000.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.28820, Amount 9,513,000.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII Delaware, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.28820, Amount 366,000.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.67462, Amount 366,000.00). To Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Opportunities Fund VIII (Parallel 2), L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Lehman Program Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RUBY FINANCE PLC SERIES 2004-2(Claim No.57936, Amount 2383750.00). To Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.67462, Amount 2,317,000.00). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC(Claim No.28820, Amount 2,317,000.00). To Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Oaktree Huntington Investment Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Goldman Sachs LIP Credit Opportunities 2008 Fund,(Claim No.15887, Amount 1,764,647.00); Goldman Sachs LIP Credit Opportunities 2008 Fund,(Claim No.15888, Amount 1,764,647.00). To LMA SPC for and on Behalf of M89 Segregated Portfo. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of LMA SPC for and on Behalf of MAP 89 Segregated Portfolio.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Of Hearing Of Motion By Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited And Dow Jones & Company, Inc. For An Order (A) Compelling Immediate Payment Of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims And (B) Compelling The Debtors To Assume Or Reject Executory Contracts Or Alternatively Modifying The Automatic Stay To Permit Movants To Terminate The Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factivia, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 7/13/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centerbridge Special Credit Partners, L.P.(Claim No.67079, Amount $1,222,053.81); CCP Credit Acquisition Holdings, LLC(Claim No.67080, Amount $1,222,053.81). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Declaration (related document(s) 17317 ) filed by Brian D. Graifman on behalf of Mark Glasser. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 6/23/2011, Reply due by 6/28/2011, (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Brian D. Graifman on behalf of Mark Glasser. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 6/23/2011, (Graifman, Brian) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 17203 ) filed by Jeffrey D. Vanacore on behalf of Perkins Coie LLP. (Vanacore, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Diane Streany re Notice of Transfer (related document(s) 17113 , 17083 , 17096 , 17115 , 17082 , 17124 , 17111 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 331,221.87); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 89,516.78); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 155,197.44); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 21,504.55); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 75,138.72). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 1,871,905.43); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 506,780.47); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 879,177.01); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 120,919.02); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 428,568.99). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 250,089.24); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 67,859.49); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 118,049.12); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 16,216.55); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 57,513.59). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 554,545.71); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 150,157.18); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 260,038.27); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 35,605.89); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 127,086.48). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 700,919.01); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 189,862.20); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 328,556.29); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 45,124.30); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 160,481.46). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 2,366,228.99); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 640,333.73); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 1,111,973.18); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 152,647.05); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.48734, Amount 541,740.89). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 1,306,278.37); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 490,129.73); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 633,229.49); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 366,175.28); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 227,517.21); The Varde Fund IX, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 315,262.20). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 174,520.66); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 65,629.91); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 85,025.18); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 49,108.05); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 30,532.61); The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 42,603.00). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 386,980.59); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 145,223.62); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 187,293.23); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 107,824.21); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 67,467.22); The Varde Fund, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 93,726.60). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Seventh Interim Application of Lazard Freres & Co. LLC, Debtors' Investment Banker for Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expense Incurred for the Period from October 1, 2010 through January 31, 2011 for Lazard Freres & Co. LLC, Other Professional, period: 10/1/2010 to 1/31/2011, fee:$1,700,000.00, expenses: $5,600.58. filed by Lazard Freres & Co. LLC. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 489,124.79); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 183,624.10); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 236,643.51); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 136,648.50); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 85,195.84); The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 117,868.30). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Pursuit Capital Partners Master (Cayman) Ltd.(Claim No.28371, Amount 14,292,493.41). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 1,651,233.91); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 619,294.97); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 800,901.52); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 462,256.25); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 287,597.51); The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.(Claim No.45214, Amount 397,628.00). To Sea Port Group Securities, LLC. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Sea Port Group Securities, LLC.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd.(Claim No.58792, Amount 4,620,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Fondazione Enpaia(Claim No.35552, Amount 22,645,399.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.(Claim No.58781, Amount 3,080,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 384,560.82); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 672,998.63). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 32,758.88); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 57,254.45). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 253,525.28); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 444,720.57). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 216,493.50); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 378,885.36). To The Varde Fund VIII, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VIII, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 4,272.90); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 6,657.49). To The Varde Fund VII-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VII-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 14,242.99); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 25,150.53). To The Varde Fund IV-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 8,545.80); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 14,350.60). To The Varde Fund V-B, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund V-B, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 21,364.49); Varde Investment Partners, L.P.(Claim No.55837, Amount 37,281.96). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
Second Notice of Distribution from Refco Litigation Trust and Refco Private Actions Trust filed by Dennis O'Donnell on behalf of Refco Litigation Trust and Refco Private Actions Trust. (O'Donnell, Dennis) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on September 23, 2011 at 9:45 A.M.; (related document(s) 6886 ) filed by Christopher Mirick on behalf of Lyondell Chemical Company. (Mirick, Christopher) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 06/28/2011 10:16AM RE: Status Conference. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 10/24/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/2/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/16/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 8/26/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/24/2011. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
Supplemental Order Signed On 7/29/2011, Establishing Streamlined Procedures Governing Adversary Proceedings Brought By Eugene I. Davis, As Litigation Trustee For The Quebecor World Litigation Trust. (related document(s) 4619 ) (Ebanks, Liza) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centro Inc(Claim No.1853, Amount 7,879.29). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centro Inc(Claim No.1849, Amount 70.97). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centro Inc(Claim No.1848, Amount 2,603.73). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centro Inc(Claim No.1847, Amount 1,603.80). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 4648 ) filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
Statement AGENDA FOR HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JULY 19, 2011 filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): #9229 RETIREMENT INCOME PLAN FOR EMPLOYEES OF INTERSTATE BOOK MANUFACTURERS, INC. filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Response / Joinder of the Joint Claims Oversight Committee to the Reorganized Debtors' Response to ACTEGA Kelstar Inc.'s Objection to Reorganized Debtors' Eleventh Omnibus Claims Motion (Seeking to Allow Certain Elected Convenience Claims) (related document(s) 4649 , 4637 ) filed by Elizabeth McColm on behalf of Joint Claims Oversight Committee. with hearing to be held on 7/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (McColm, Elizabeth) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Reply to Motion REORGANIZED DEBTORS RESPONSE TO THE OBJECTION OF ACTEGA KELSTAR, INC. TO THE REORGANIZED DEBTORS ELEVENTH OMNIBUS CONVENIENCE CLASS MOTION (SEEKING TO ALLOW CERTAIN ELECTED CONVENIENCE CLAIMS) (related document(s) 4560 ) filed by Anthony D. Boccanfuso on behalf of Quebecor World (USA) Inc.. (Boccanfuso, Anthony) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
Response to Motion for (I) A Report and Recommendation to the District Court for the Appointment of Special Discovery Masters; (II) an Order Establishing Procedures for Electronic Data Rooms; and (III) an Order Modifying the June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order (related document(s) 3869 ) filed by Daniel B. Besikof on behalf of Evenstad Family Defendants. (Besikof, Daniel) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Objection to Motion /Bank of America's Objection and Reservation of Rights Regarding The Trustee's Motion for (I) A Report and Recommendation to the District Court for the Appointment of Special Discovery Masters; (II) an Order Establishing Procedures for Electronic Data Rooms; and (III) an Order Modifying the June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order filed by Scott I. Davidson on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA. (Davidson, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Hearing on Seventh Applications for Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred by Applicants from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 (related document(s) 4376 , 4391 , 4389 , 4384 , 4381 , 4386 , 4385 , 4380 , 4387 , 4382 , 4388 , 4383 , 4379 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation /Sixth Application of Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$2,987,422.80, expenses: $39,630.76. filed by Windels Marx Lane & Mittendorf, LLP. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D) (Simon, Howard) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 4290 ) filed by Anthony L. Paccione on behalf of Royal Bank Of Canada. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2) (Paccione, Anthony) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Schiltz & Schiltz as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Schiltz & Schiltz, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$60220.27, expenses: $9248.79. filed by Schiltz & Schiltz. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Graf & Pitkowitz Rechtsanwalte GmbH as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Graf & Pitkowitz Rechtsanwalte GmbH, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$970376.3, expenses: $32139.63. filed by Graf & Pitkowitz Rechtsanwalte GmbH. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Williams, Barristers & Attorneys as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Williams, Barristers & Attorneys, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$282089.89, expenses: $2673.5. filed by Williams, Barristers & Attorneys. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of SCA Creque as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for SCA Creque, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$159031.51, expenses: $1174. filed by SCA Creque. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Osborne & Osborne, P.A. as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from March 8, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Osborne & Osborne, P.A., Special Counsel, period: 3/8/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$1301.85, expenses: $35.21. filed by Osborne & Osborne, P.A.. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$49484.70, expenses: $840.62. filed by Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Kugler Kandestin, L.L.P., as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Kugler Kandestin, L.L.P., Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$6462.53, expenses: $724.25. filed by Kugler Kandestin, L.L.P.. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of UGGC & Associes as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 14, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for UGGC & Associes, Special Counsel, period: 2/14/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$70603.45, expenses: $8262.14. filed by UGGC & Associes. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Taylor Wessing as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 9, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Taylor Wessing, Special Counsel, period: 2/9/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$1434276.9, expenses: $249075.7. filed by Taylor Wessing. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Higgs & Johnson (formerly Higgs Johnson Truman Bodden & Co.) as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Higgs & Johnson, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$41721.75, expenses: $2794.43. filed by Higgs & Johnson. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Application of Eugene F. Collins as Special Counsel to the Trustee for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Eugene F. Collins, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$9616.37, expenses: $176.12. filed by Eugene F. Collins. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Notice of Agenda For Matters Scheduled For Hearing On September 22, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Notice of Sale [of Aston Martin Vehicle] (related document(s) 4069 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Seventh Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Seventh Application of Trustee and Baker & Hostetler LLP for Allowance of Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 for Baker & Hostetler, L.L.P., Trustee's Attorney, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$44727586.65, expenses: $1270956.31, for Irving H. Picard, Other Professional, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$599301, expenses: $479.80. filed by Baker & Hostetler, L.L.P.. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 10/5/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Order signed on 7/29/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Joshua Fowes, Esq. (Related Doc # 4280 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Order signed on 7/29/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Earl Colson, Esq. (Related Doc # 4279 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Joshua Fowes on behalf of Estate Of K. Thalberg & B. Anderson. Filing fee collected, receipt #187310. (Hibbert, Stacey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Earl Colson on behalf of Estate Of K. Thalberg & B. Anderson. Filing fee collected, receipt #187311. (Hibbert, Stacey) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
Motion to Amend Motion for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice (related document(s) 1391 ) filed by William L. Chapman on behalf of C.Thomas & Margaret H. Brown, Charles F. Rolecek, Donald H. Hangen, Harvey A. Taylor, Henry T. DeNero and Nancy S. DeNero, James L. Kruse, James P. Dulany, Jan Feldman, Lee R. Wood, Markian D. Stecyk, Marshall G. Rowe, Martha L. Wood, Robert H. Scott & Molly NcNaughton, Robert H. Scott and Molly MacNaughton, Sally S. Beaudette. (Chapman, William) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Stipulation / Stipulation Further Extending the Tolling of the Statute of Limitations (related document(s) 3314 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 06/08/2011)
Affidavit of Service re 1) Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Portions of the Debtors' Objection to the Motion of Rebecca Philbert for Allowance and Immediate Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to Section 503(b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code Under Seal; 2) Objection to Motion / Debtors' Objection to the Motion of Rebecca Philbert for Allowance and Immediate Payment of an Administrative Expense Claim Pursuant to Section 503(b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code; 3) Opposition /Debtors' Opposition to the Motion of RD Branch Associates, L.P. for an Order (I) Enforcing the Lease Rejection Order and Compelling Debtors and Subtenant to Vacate the Premises, and (II) Allowing and Directing Payment of Administrative Expense Claims; and 4) Declaration of Frederic F. Brace in Support of Debtors' Third Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2533 , 2537 , 2536 , 2538 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 09/22/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 2574 ) filed by Karen L. Gilman on behalf of Partners Development LLC. (Gilman, Karen) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Ex Parte Motion to File Under Seal / Ex Parte Motion for Authority to File Under Seal Certain Portions of the Supplemental Objection of Partners Development LLC to the Debtors' Third Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2530 ) filed by Karen L. Gilman on behalf of Partners Development LLC. (Gilman, Karen) (Entered: 09/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 2548 ) filed by Michael Earl Comerford on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Comerford, Michael) (Entered: 09/21/2011)