Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 11861 , 11816 ) filed by Howard S. Beltzer on behalf of BNP Paribas. (Beltzer, Howard) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 11734 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Objection to Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims), In re: Claim No. 64617 (related document(s) 11307 ) filed by Ivy Shuk Yi Liu, Hing Lin Chan. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Response to Debtors' Forty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Debtor Claims), In re: Claim No. 6262 (related document(s) 11584 ) filed by Arete Research, LLC. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion By Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc. for an Order (A) Compelling Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims and (B) Compelling the Debtors to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts or Alternatively Modifying the Automatic Stay to Permit Movants to Terminate the Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factivia, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion of Lawrence Fogarazzo, et al., Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code for Relief from the Automatic Stay to Allow Advancement Under Insurance Policy Issued by Lloyd's of London (related document(s) 10279 ) filed by Curtis V. Trinko on behalf of Don Engel, Carolyn Fogarazzo, Lawrence Fogarazzo, Stephen L. Hopkins. with hearing to be held on 11/17/2010 (check with court for location) (Trinko, Curtis) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG, Singapore Branch(Claim No.55825, Amount see attached). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Instituto Bancario Sammarinese S.p.A.(Claim No.55149, Amount $2,940,000); Instituto Bancario Sammarinese S.p.A.(Claim No.66792, Amount $2,940,000). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Statement of No Objection re: Debtors' Application to Employ and Retain Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP as Special Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to September 9, 2010 (Docket No. 11761), filed by Andrew D. Velez-Rivera on behalf of United States Trustee. (Velez-Rivera, Andrew) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Application for Final Professional Compensation / Application of Blake Dawson for an Award of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period August 1, 2010 to August 30, 2010 for Blake Dawson, Other Professional, period: 8/1/2010 to 8/30/2010, fee:$271,297.26, expenses: $4,371.48. filed by Blake Dawson. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 4, 2010 9:34 AM RE: Continued Evidentiary Hearing Re: Rule 60(b) and Related Motions. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/3/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/12/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/5/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/3/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on September 30, 2010 9:35 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/3/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/12/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/25/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/4/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/3/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Notice of Distribution / RCM Plan Administrator's Notice of Eighth Interim Distribution of Assets in Place and Tenth Interim Distribution of Additional Property filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of RCM Plan Administrator. (Attachments: # 1 Annex 1# 2 Annex 2# 3 Annex 3)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Gary S. Lee on behalf of Joint Official Liquidators of Sphinx Funds. (Lee, Gary) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Notice of Distribution /RCM Plan Administrator's Notice of Ninth Interim Distribution of Additional Property And Treatment Of Undeliverable Distributions filed by Anna Boelitz on behalf of Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. (Boelitz, Anna) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Motion to Compel the Reorganized Debtor to Establish Class 3 Distribution Reserve (related document(s) 4354 ) filed by Frederick E. Schmidt on behalf of Riverside Claims LLC. (Schmidt, Frederick) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Affidavit of Service by Brooke Filler (related document(s) 4350 ) filed by Alan W. Kornberg on behalf of The Joint Claims Oversight Committee. (Kornberg, Alan) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Notice to Transferor and Transferee Regarding Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(1) and/or (e)(2) (related document(s) 4339 , 4340 ) filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Response / Joinder of The Joint Claims Oversight Committee to the Reorganized Debtors' Objection to Motion of Athens Paper Company, Inc. for Order Determining 503(b)(9) Claims Timely Filed (related document(s) 4348 ) filed by Alan W. Kornberg on behalf of The Joint Claims Oversight Committee. (Kornberg, Alan) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PRINTMARK INDUSTRIES INC(Claim No.3874, Amount 22,343.29). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Notice of Hearing on Applications of Professionals for Allowance of Fourth Interim Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses (related document(s) 4186 , 4190 , 4208 , 4187 , 4202 , 4192 , 4199 , 4206 , 4209 , 4196 , 4207 , 4189 , 4191 , 4185 , 4200 , 4203 , 4198 , 4197 , 4204 , 4188 , 4194 , 4201 , 4195 , 4213 , 4193 , 4211 , 4205 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with hearing to be held on 10/25/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 10/18/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Declaration of Disinterestedness of Nakamura & Partners in Support of Retention as Ordinary Course Professional filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Nakamura & Partners. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Fortieth Tier I Omnibus Objection as it Relates to Proof of Claim No. 15334 (related document(s) 3684 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Supplemental Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 11186 / Debtors' Supplemental Objection to Spartan Chemical Company's Proof of Claim No. 11186 (related document(s) 2967 ) with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/22/2010, filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation.(Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Supplemental Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 13952 / Debtors' Supplemental Declaration to Flavor Concepts, Inc.'s Proof of Claim No. 13952 (related document(s) 2964 ) with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/22/2010, filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation.(Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Supplemental Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 11249 / Debtors' Supplemental Objection to Givaudan Flavors Corporation's Proof of Claim No. 11249 with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/22/2010, filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation.(Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Supplemental Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 9448 / Debtors' Supplemental Objection to Polarome International Inc.'s Proof of Claim No. 9448 (related document(s) 2965 ) with hearing to be held on 11/10/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 10/22/2010, filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation.(Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Presentment of Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation to Enter Into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the State of New Jersey and the Dial Corporation Resolving Certain Environmental Obligations (related document(s) 4250 ) filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. with presentment to be held on 10/22/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 10/15/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Motion to Approve / Debtors Motion for an Order Authorizing Chemtura Corporation to Enter Into, and Approving, a Settlement Agreement with the State of New Jersey and the Dial Corporation Resolving Certain Environmental Obligations filed by M. Natasha Labovitz on behalf of Chemtura Corporation. Responses due by 10/15/2010, (Labovitz, M.) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Affidavit of Service re: Order Relating to Proofs of Claim of Fletcher-Lippencott Neighborhood Association (Claim Numbers 11803, 11811, and 11814) [Docket No. 4238] (related document(s) 4238 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order with Respect to Proof of Claim No. 787 Filed by Old Dominion Freight Line [Docket No. 4235] (related document(s) 4235 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BGR, INC.(Claim No.2533, Amount 14,875.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BLUESTAR INDUSTRIES LLC(Claim No.2705, Amount 3,290.00). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC..(related document(s) 4194 ) filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BLUESTAR INDUSTRIES LLC(Claim No.2889, Amount 1,307.84). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BLUESTAR INDUSTRIES LLC(Claim No.2703, Amount 3,790.99). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BLUESTAR INDUSTRIES INC(Claim No.2704, Amount 12,177.81). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.(Claim No.2705, Amount 3,290.00). To BLUESTAR INDUSTRIES LLC. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Order Granting Trustee's motion to Retain Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP As Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc As Of November 29, 2010 (Related Doc # 3322 ) signed on 12/21/2010. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Objection To Trustee's Determination Of Claim filed by Elliot G. Sagor on behalf of Elliot G. Sagor. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Sagor, Elliot) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Reply to Motion Reply of Lawrence R. Velvel to Trustee's Memorandum Opposing Leave To Appeal filed by Lawrence R. Velvel on behalf of Lawrence R. Velvel. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to the Clerk# 2 Certificate of Service) (Velvel, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Order signed on 12/21/2010 Approving an Agreement by and between The Trustee and The Shapiro Family (Related Doc # 3310 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Objection to revised determination of claim filed by Jeffrey L. Bernfeld on behalf of John Maccabee & Sherry Morse Maccabee Living Trust Dated 1/24/97. (Bernfeld, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Objection Withdrawal of Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Savest LTD, and each of its members. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Objection to Trustee's Determinations of Claims filed by Elise Scherr Frejka on behalf of Tate Horowitz Trust, Tate Horowitz, Samantha Fisher Trust, Paul Horowitz, Lauren Fisher Trust, Jodi B. Fisher Family Trust, Jodi Horowitz, Jared Horowitz Trust, Jared Horowitz, Harrison B. Fisher Trust, Elizabeth Horowitz, Elizabeth Horowitz Trust, Elizabeth Horowitz, Amanda Fisher Trust, Alexandra Fisher Trust, Adam Fisher Trust. (Frejka, Elise) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on December 21, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Motion For Entry of Order Pursuant To Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rules 2002 and 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Approving an Agreement by and Between the Trustee and the Shapiro Family (related document(s) 3310 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Notice of Appeal filed by Lawrence R. Velvel on behalf of Lawrence R. Velvel. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk# 2 Certificate of Service)(Velvel, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Motion to Approve (1)Judicial Approval of a Notice of Appeal From Certain Avoidance Procedures That Was Filed on December 20, 2010, Three Days After The Avoidance Procedures Became Applicable To Him, Or (2) In The Alternative, For A Brief Extension Of Time, Until December 1, 2010, For The Filing Of A Prior Notice Of Appeal That Was Submitted On That Date filed by Lawrence R. Velvel on behalf of Lawrence R. Velvel. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk# 2 Certificate of Service) (Velvel, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
Notice of Objection to Claims Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Norman A. Kaplan on behalf of Gloria Konigsberg. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Trustee's Determination of Claim# 2 Exhibit Customer Claim# 3 Exhibit New Times Transcript redacted)(Kaplan, Norman) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Motion for Order Establishing Procedures for Approval of Settlements and Trustee's Motion for an Order (i) Approving Litigation Case Management Procedures for Avoidance Actions and (ii) Amending Global Protective Order (related document(s) 3066 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 27, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Stone Barn Manhattan, LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2010 at 11:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Notice of Withdrawal Response to Debtors' Tenth Omnibus Objection to Certain Administrative and Other Claims, filed May 12, 2010 (related document(s) 1967 ) filed by LeGrand L. Clark III on behalf of Indiana Department of Revenue. (Clark, LeGrand) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
Post-Confirmation Report. of the Plan Administrator for Stone Barn Manhattan LLC f/k/a Steve and Barry's Manhattan LLC et al,. Dated As of October 12, 2010 filed by Cathy Hershcopf on behalf of Plan Administrator- Clear Thinking Group LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hershcopf, Cathy) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 1981 ) filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting FairPoint's Motion for Order Deeming Certain Scheduled Amounts Superseded by Related Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 1889 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting Fairpoint's Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicate Claims) (Related Doc # 1899 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting Fairpoint's Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis In Books and Records) (Related Doc # 1903 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting FairPoint's Second Motion For Order Deeming Certain Scheduled Amounts Superseded by Related Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 1928 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting Fairpoint's Seventieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) (related document(s) 1898 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting Fairpoint's Sixty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late Filed Claims) (related document(s) 1897 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 12/15/2010 Between Fairpoint and The Internal Revenue Service Resolving Fairpoint's Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis in Books and Records) with Respect to Proofs of Claim Numbers 8034, 8035 and 8036 (related document(s) 1473 ) (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Motion to Assume / FairPoint Communications' Motion for Authorization to Assume Agreement, as Amended, with Communications Data Group, Inc. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 105(a) and 365 and Bankruptcy Rule 6006 filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 12/27/2010, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting FairPoint's Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Shareholder Claims) (Related Doc # 1902 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting Fairpoint's Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Negative Dollar Claims) (Related Doc # 1901 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Granting Fairpoint's Seventy-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Basis - Noncompliant Claims) (Related Doc # 1900 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing On The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Motion To Compel Verizon Communications, Inc. And Its Subsidiaries To Comply With Terms Of The May 18, 2010 Letter Agreement Relating To Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors' Rule 2004 (related document(s) 1920 ) filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Agreed Order signed on 12/14/2010 Resolving the Objection of Perceptive Software, Inc. to Proposed Cure Amount (related document(s) 1237 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Objection to Motion / FairPoint's Objection to Segtel, Inc. and Segnet Technologies, Inc.'s Bankruptcy Rule 2004 Motion (related document(s) 1940 ) filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. (Grogan, James) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2010 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Motion to Assume Leases or Executory Contracts /Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/7/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 6/30/2011, (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Second Motion to Extend Time / Debtors' Second Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Time to File Notices of Removal of Actions filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 7/7/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 6/30/2011, (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Ammirati Inc(Claim No.8263, Amount 18,361.58). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Response of Cooley LLP to the U.S. Trustee's Objection to Its First Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from October 1, 2010 Through January 31, 2011 (related document(s) 1890 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Memorandum of Law (related document(s) 1893 ) filed by David G. Johnson on behalf of Steven P. Meyer. Reply due by 7/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,: Summons, Compllaint and Aff. of Service# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B: Answer and Counter Claim# 3 Exhibit Exhibit C: Insurance certificate) (Johnson, David) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Motion for Relief from Stay filed by David G. Johnson on behalf of Steven P. Meyer. with hearing to be held on 7/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 7/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Unsworn Certificate of Service# 2 Pleading Notice of Association of Counsel) (Johnson, David) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Notice of Agenda filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. with hearing to be held on 6/23/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Objection of e-Rewards, Inc. to Debtors' Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contract and Motion for Relief from the Automatic Stay Nunc Pro Tunc to April 1, 2011 [D.E. #1379] filed by Ashleigh Blaylock on behalf of e-Rewards, Inc.. (Blaylock, Ashleigh) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Response of Cooley LLP to the U.S. Trustee's Objection to Its First Interim Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period From October 1, 2010 Through January 13, 2011 (related document(s) 1133 , 1870 ) filed by Cathy Hershcopf on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. with hearing to be held on 6/23/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Hershcopf, Cathy) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Affidavit of Service by United States First Class Mail (related document(s) 1888 ) filed by Jeffrey C. Chancas on behalf of 3101 Ditmars Boulevard LLC c/o Borah, Goldstein, et al.. (Chancas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Demand For Service of Papers filed by Jeffrey C. Chancas on behalf of 3101 Ditmars Boulevard LLC c/o Borah, Goldstein, et al.. (Chancas, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Affidavit of Service re Certificate of No Objection re: Debtors' Motion, Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b), and 503(c), for Authority to Pay Certain Limited Incentive Compensation to Remaining Employee (related document(s) 1875 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Response / PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP's Response to United States Trustee Response Regarding Applications for Interim Compensation (related document(s) 1194 , 1870 ) filed by Martin Sosland on behalf of PriceWaterhouseCoopers LLP. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Response of Weil, Gotshal & Manges LLP to the U.S. Trustee's Objection to its First Interim Application, as Attorneys for the Debtors, for Interim Allowance of Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Actual and Necessary Expenses Incurred from Septemeber 23, 2010 Through January 31, 2011 (related document(s) 1870 , 1210 ) filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of Blockbuster Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Objection to FairPoint's Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2004 Authorizing Discovery from segTEL, Inc. and segNET Technologies, Inc. and Request for Appointment of Mediator (ref doc 1789) filed by Jeanette L. Thomas on behalf of segNET Technologies, Inc., segTEL, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeremy L. Katz in Support of Objection to 2004 Motion# 2 Declaraton of Jeanette L. Thomas in Support of Objection to 2004 Motion) (Thomas, Jeanette) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Adversary case 10-05456. Complaint against HSBC MORTGAGE CORPORATION (USA), Mortgage Service Center, Prudential Douglas Elliman, The Corcoran Group Eastside, Inc., First American Title Insurance Company, First American Title Agency, Inc., Ka Wing Yuen, Jeannie Yuen, Michael Braverman Design, NY Landmark Construction Corp. Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05455. Complaint against East 57th Street LLC Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Transfers) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05454. Complaint against Weiss Financial - Tax Solutions LLC Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Transfers) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05453. Complaint against ETECO, Elisa Dreier Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Transfers) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05452. Complaint against Armada Partners LP, Armada Management LLC, Armando Ruiz Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Transfers to Armada Partners# 2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Transfers to Ruiz) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05451. Complaint against Steven Ehielich Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05450. Complaint against Cenlar FSB, Cenlar Home Funding, Inc., Mark Roter, Jaye Roter, First American Title Insurance Company, First American Title Agency, Inc., Resort Properties International Corp. Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05449. Complaint against Mitchell R. Dreier Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Schedule of Transfers) (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05448. Complaint against Richard P. Durham, Christena Karen H. Durham, Richard P. Durham Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Adversary case 10-05447. Complaint against Westford Asset Management LLC, SGS Asset Management, Stafford Towne, Ltd., Bennington International Holdings Ltd., Westford Special Situations Master Fund L.P., Adams International Trading, Ltd., Carston Spires, Ltd., Westford Global Asset Management Ltd., Epsilon Global Master Fund, LP, Epsilon Global Master Fund II, LP, Westford Special Situations Fund, Ltd., Epsilon Distressed Strategies Master Fund, LP Original Complaint. Nature(s) of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) Filed by Stephen T. Loden, Howard D. Ressler, Sheila M. Gowan on behalf of Sheila M. Gowan. (Loden, Stephen) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Motion to Allow Claims /Motion for Order Allowing Class Proof of Claim and Certifying the Proposed Classes filed by Heather Dolan McArn on behalf of Cohen Class Plaintiffs. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 1/12/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Declaration in Support of Motion# 3 Exhibit A# 4 Exhibit B# 5 Exhibit C# 6 Exhibit D# 7 Proposed Order# 8 Certificate of Service) (McArn, Heather) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Adversary case 11-02336. Complaint against Naidot & Co., Bessemer Trust Company, Beneficial Owners of Accounts Held In The Name of Naidot & Co. 1-1000 . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by David Molton, Fairfield Sentry Limited ( In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys, Joanna Lau on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited ( In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys, Joanna Lau. (Molton, David) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Letter / Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 14, 2010 filed by John Longmire on behalf of EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/14/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Longmire, John) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Transfer Agreement FRBP -- Assignment of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Harold Martin, Sr.(Claim No.196, Amount 5166931). To Investcorp, S.A.. filed by Michael A. Rosenthal on behalf of Investcorp S.A..(Rosenthal, Michael) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Answer to Complaint (Related Doc # 1 ), Answer to Amended Complaint (Related Doc # 264 ) filed by Daniel S. Van Riper. (Rodriguez, Maria) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 6/22/2011 Between Attorney for the Plaintiff and Attorney for Defendant Bank 8 and Bank 9 Extending Time to Answer. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Joinder in Motion to Dismiss of Defendant Pension Fund 1 (related document(s) 303 , 163 , 158 ) filed by Daniel R. Swetnam on behalf of Pension Fund 1. (Swetnam, Daniel) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 6/22/2011 Between Attorney for the Plaintiff and Attorney for Defendant Mutual Fund 4 Extending Time to Answer. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Order signed on 6/22/2011 expanding the scope of the retention of BDO Consulting Corporate Advisors, LLC as financial advisor to the Debtors (Related Doc # 263 ). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation for CBIZ Accounting Tax and Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ Inc., Accountant, period: 9/1/2009 to 11/30/2010, fee:$169,880.90, expenses: $267.80.(related document(s) 270 ) filed by Holly Rai. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Rai, Holly) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation for LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco LLP, Trustee's Attorney, period: 9/1/2009 to 11/30/2010, fee:$495,740.00, expenses: $30,401.05.(related document(s) 270 ) filed by Holly Rai. with hearing to be held on 1/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Second Interim Application# 2 Exhibits A through C) (Rai, Holly) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Affidavit of Gary Ostrin in Support of the Application Seeking the Entry of an Order Awarding the Allowance of Commission and Reimbursement of Expenses to Ostrin & Ostrin Company (related document(s) 233 ) filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Ostrin & Ostrin Company. (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Certificate of Service to Declaration of Selinda A. Melnik In Support of the Motion of the Consortium of Airports for an Order: (1) Enforcing the Courts Bench Order Respecting Airport Protections; (2) Enforcing, and Ordering the Debtor to Perform, the Debtors Airport Protections Agreement; (3) Ordering the Debtor to Compensate the Airports for Reliance Costs; and (4) Granting the Airports Other Necessary and Appropriate Relief (related document(s) 229 ) filed by Selinda A. Melnik on behalf of Consortium of Airport Authorities. (Melnik, Selinda) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
Affidavit Declaration In Support of Motion of Consortium of Airports for an Order: (1) Enforcing the Court's Bench Order Respecting Airport Protections; (2) Enforcing, and Ordering the Debtor to Perform, the Debtor's Airport Protections Agreement; (3) Ordering the Debtor to Compensate the Airports for Reliance Costs; and (4) Granting the Airports Other Necessary and Appropriate Relief (related document(s) 223 ) filed by Selinda A. Melnik on behalf of Consortium of Airport Authorities. (Melnik, Selinda) (Entered: 10/10/2010)
Adversary case 10-03873. Complaint against Bordier & Cie . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03872. Complaint against Banque Safra Luxembourg SA . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03871. Complaint against Caceis Bank EX-IXIS IS . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03870. Complaint against Arden International Capital Limited . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03869. Complaint against Six Sis AG/CH104026 . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03868. Complaint against Kredietbank SA Luxembourgeoise AC Sigma Fund Valencia . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03867. Complaint against FS Stichting Stroeve Global Custody . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03866. Complaint against Kay Torshen . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03865. Complaint against Celfin International Limited . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03864. Complaint against Natixis Private Banking International SA - Client Account . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sigma Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sigma Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Adversary case 10-03863. Complaint against Sumitomo Trust & Bank Co., LTD - Alternative Investing Unit Global Markets . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Kerry L. Quinn, Fairfield Sentry Limited on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Quinn, Kerry) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Affidavit of Service re Statement /Amended Consolidated List of the Holders of the 43 Largest Unsecured Claims Against the Debtors (related document(s) 109 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Affidavit of Service re Order signed on 12/14/2010 Granting Debtors' First Omnibus Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases (related document(s) 81 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Service of Papers filed by Lynn Poss on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. (Poss, Lynn) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers filed by John P. DiIorio on behalf of Warren 2001, LLC and Pheasant Run 2001 (SPE), LLC. (DiIorio, John) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Greg T. Kupniewski, Esquire filed by Greg T. Kupniewski on behalf of Haddon House Food Products, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Kupniewski, Greg) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Leslie S. Barr on behalf of Riveroak/Cofinance-Carteret, Inc.. (Barr, Leslie) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Amended Voluntary Petition. / Notice of Amended Voluntary Petition for Clay-Park Realty Corp. filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Leslie S. Barr on behalf of Woodbridge Realty Associates, LLC. (Barr, Leslie) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Appointment of Official Creditors' Committee filed by Richard C. Morrissey on behalf of United States Trustee. (Morrissey, Richard) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Kenneth A. Philbin on behalf of ACP Cumberland Associates, LLC. (Philbin, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Taitz on behalf of Huntington-Grocery, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Taitz, Steven) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Notice of Appearance filed by Gary John Robbins on behalf of Lane Valente Refrigeration, Inc., Lane-Valente Industries, Inc.. (Robbins, Gary) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Order signed on 12/20/2010 Granting Application for admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Blau, Esq. (Related Doc # 46 ) . (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Daniella Golshani - Operating Report for the Period from May 1, 2011 to May 31, 2011 and Fourth Monthly Fee Statement of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP for Interim Allowance of Compensation and for Reimbursement of Expenses for Services Rendered During the Period from May 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 (related document(s) 116 , 117 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Monthly Operating Report from 10/26/2010 to 11/25/2010 filed by Wayne M. Greenwald on behalf of Gary B Schaeffer. (Greenwald, Wayne) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Response to Motion Response of Pavarini McGovern LLC to MOL of Waterscape Resort LLC in Support of Confirmation of the Debtor's Plan of Reorganization and to Limited Reply of U.S. Bank National Association and USB Capital Resources, Inc. to Pavarini's Objections to the Adequacy of Debtor's Disclosure Statement and Confirmation of filed by Eric W. Sleeper on behalf of Pavarini McGovern LLC. with hearing to be held on 6/23/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sleeper, Eric) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 97 , 98 , 96 ) filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Waterscape Resort LLC. (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Letter to Vito Genna, Clerk of Court advising of Change of Address for Proskauer Rose LLP, Eleven Times Square, New York, NY 10036-8299, effective 1/18/11. filed by Julie McCane on behalf of H. M.. (McCane, Julie) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Second Amended Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference in an Adversary Proceeding and Amended Complaint on Defendant Irongate Global Strategy Fund Limited (related document(s) 23 , 26 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/26/2010)
So Ordered Final Judgment Signed on 6/21/2011 Re:the Amended Complaints filed by Paul Gardi and Alex are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and the declaring that the JANA Version of Settlement Agreement dated October 14, 2008 is binding on the enforceable against the parties. (related document(s) 28 , 27 )(Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: The Toronto-Dominian Bank. filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of TD Waterhouse Canada. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
So Ordered Final Judgment Signed on 6/21/2011 Re: the Amended Complaints filed by Paul Gardi and Alex are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and the declaring that the JANA Version of Settlement Agreement dated October 14, 2008 is binding on the enforceable against the parties. (related document(s) 20 ) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: Canadian Imperial Bank of Commerce. filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of CIBC World Markets. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Notice of Appearance and Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Pulse Trading Inc.. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
Stipulation and [Proposed} Order, Extending the time for defendants to move or otherwise respond to the complaint to January 11, 2011 filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, BMO Nesbitt Burns SA, BNP Paribas SEC Corp., Bank of Tokyo Mitsubishi, Barclays Capital Inc., Bear Stern Securities Corp., Brown Brothers Harriman, Credit Suisse Securities US, Credit Suisse Securities/IA, DOFT & CO., Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Elisabeth H. Doft, Ferris, Baker Watts, JP Morgan Securities, JPM Chase Bank, N.A., Edward D. Jones, MTBJ PT 13, MUGC MTBJ PT33, Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated, Morgan Stanley/ Retail, National City Bank, National Financial Services, PNC BANK, N.A., RBC Dominion Securities, SG Americas SEC, LLC, Scotia Capital, State Street Bank & Trust, SunTrust Bank, TD Ameritrade Clear, Track Data Corporation, Union Bank of California NA. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 12/15/2010)