Unknown Bankruptcy Case Title

Bankruptcy Case New York Southern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 10-13164
District Judge Burton R. Lifland, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Burton R. Lifland
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Alex Interactive Media, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Craig Carpenito +1 212 210 9582 +1 212 210 3882 craig.carpenito@alston.com
Space Alexander S. Lorenzo +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 alexander.lorenzo@alston.com
No Logo Fairfield Sentry Limited, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Fairfield Sentry Limited ( In Liquidation)"

Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY May Orenstein +1 212 209 4800 +1 212 209 4801 morenstein@brownrudnick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Kerry L. Quinn +1 212 209 4819 +1 212 209 4801 kquinn@brownrudnick.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Joseph SAval +1 212 209 4905 +1 212 938 2893 dsaval@brownrudnick.com
No Logo Paul Gardi, Plaintiff

Represented by Alston & Bird, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Craig Carpenito +1 212 210 9582 +1 212 210 3882 craig.carpenito@alston.com
Space Alexander S. Lorenzo +1 212 210 9400 +1 212 210 9444 alexander.lorenzo@alston.com
Securities Investor Protection Corporation Securities Investor Protection Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Securities Investor Protection Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kevin H. Bell +1 202 371 8300 +1 202 371 6728 kbell@sipc.org
Space Josephine Wang +1 202 371 8300 +1 202 371 6728 jwang@sipc.org
v.
No Logo Beneficial Owners of the Accounts held in the Name of State Street Bank Luxembourg SA 1-1000, Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Beneficial Owners of the Accounts Held in the Name of Theodoor GGC Amsterdam 1-1000
No Logo Jana Partners Llc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Maximus, Inc.
Officer/Director, Copart, Inc.
Officer/Director, Coleman Cable, Inc.
Officer/Director, F.y.i. Inc.
Officer/Director, Computer Products, Inc.
Officer/Director, TIERCO GROUP INC/DE/
Officer/Director, Quadra Logic Tech. Inc.
Officer/Director, Novoste Corp \fl\
Officer/Director, Houston Exploration Co
Officer/Director, C Net Inc /de
Officer/Director, American Italian Pasta Co
Officer/Director, Mdc Communications Corp
Officer/Director, Mojave Southern Inc
Officer/Director, Oxford Ventures Inc
Officer/Director, Rosenstein Barry S
Officer/Director, Haynes International Inc.
Officer/Director, Convergys Corp
Officer/Director, Barnes & Noble, Inc.
Officer/Director, Coinstar, Inc.
Officer/Director, Walgreen Co
Officer/Director, Supervalu Inc.
Officer/Director, Team Health Holdings LLC
Officer/Director, HD Supply Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, CONAGRA INC /DE/
Officer/Director, Sitel Corp
Officer/Director, Treehouse Foods, Inc.
Officer/Director, New Relic, Inc.

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jana Partners LLC
No Logo Salvatore LaMonica, Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Salvatore LaMonica +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222 sl@lhmlawfirm.com
No Logo Sheila M. Gowan, Defendant

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sheila Marie Gowan +1 202 416 6800
No Logo State Street Bank Luxembourg SA, Defendant

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeremy S. Winer +1 212 474 1844 +1 212 474 3700 jeremy.winer@wilmerhale.com
Other Parties
No Logo Actrade Financial Technologies Ltd, Debtor

Represented by 420 Lexington Ave.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph M. Vann +1 212 586 5800 +1 212 586 5095 jvann@ctswlaw.com

Represented by Park Avenue Tower

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrea Fischer +1 212 421 2300 +1 212 735 8708

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey D. Saferstein +1 212 373 3347 +1 212 373 2053 jsaferstein@paulweiss.com

Represented by Salisbury & Ryan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick P. Salisbury +1 212 977 4660 +1 212 977 4668 ps@salisburyryan.com

Represented by Tashjian, Simsarian & Wickstrom

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ira Richard Abel +1 212 586 5800 +1 212 586 5095 iabel@ctswlaw.com
No Logo Daniel Gordon, Debtor

Represented by Pullman & Comley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith N. Costa +1 914 682 6894 +1 914 682 6894 kcosta@pullcom.com

Represented by Todtman, Nachamie, Spizz & Johns, P.C.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jill L. Makower +1 212 754 9400 +1 212 754 6262 jmakower@tnsj-law.com
No Logo Dreier LLP, Debtor

Represented by Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen J. Shimshak +1 212 373 3133 +1 212 757 3990 sshimshak@paulweiss.com
No Logo Duane Street Design Studio, LLC, Debtor

Represented by Rattet Pasternak & Gordon Oliver, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan S Pasternak +1 914 381 7400 +1 914 381 7406 jsp@rattetlaw.com
No Logo EnviroSolutions of New York, LLC, Debtor

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John C. Longmire +1 212 728 8000 +1 212 728 8111 jlongmire@willkie.com
No Logo FairPoint Communications, Inc., Debtor

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Luc A. Despins +1 212 318 6001 +1 212 230 7771

Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susheel Kirpalani +1 212 530 5234 +1 212 822 5234 skirpalani@milbank.com
Space Robert E. Winter +1 212 530 5241 +1 212 822 5241 rwinter@milbank.com

Represented by Sutherland Asbill & Brennan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric S. Tresh +1 404 853 8579 +1 404 853 8806 eric.tresh@sutherland.com

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James T. Grogan +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511
No Logo HRH Construction LLC, Debtor

Represented by Todtman, Nachamie, Spizz & Johns, P.C.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Arthur Goldstein +1 212 754 9400 +1 212 754 6262 agoldstein@tnsj-law.com
Space Jill L. Makower +1 212 754 9400 +1 212 754 6262 jmakower@tnsj-law.com
Space Alex Spizz +1 212 754 9400 +1 212 754 6262 aspizz@tnsj-law.com
No Logo Marc S. Dreier, Debtor

Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Stuart Dreier +1 212 328 6111 +1 212 328 6101 MDreier@DreierLLP.com
No Logo Nigel Pearce, Debtor
No Logo Quebecor World (usa) Inc., Debtor

Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Represented by Giordano, Halleran & Ciesla PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL J. CANNING +1 732 741 3900

Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Represented by RICHARDS KIBBE & ORBE LLP

No Logo Angela G. Tese-Milner, Trustee

Represented by 730 17th St.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Angela G. Tese-Milner +1 212 475 3673 +1 212 598 5844 a.tese-milner@epitrustee.com

Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Yann Geron +1 212 878 7900 +1 212 692 0940 ygeron@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Eugene I. Davis, Trustee

Represented by ASK Finaancial, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Karen M. Scheibe +1 651 406 9665 +1 651 406 9676 kscheibe@askfinancial.com

Represented by ASK LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph L. Steinfeld, Jr. +1 651 406 9665 +1 651 406 9676
No Logo Gregory M. Messer, Trustee

Represented by LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Shannon Anne Scott +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222 sas@lhmlawfirm.com
No Logo Irving H. Picard, Trustee

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Joseph Sheehan 1 +14 +14 1444 +1 212 589 4201

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Represented by braunerbaron.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Regina Griffin +1 212 797 9100 +1 212 797 9161 rgriffin@braunerbaron.com

Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Bernard +1 212 338 3586 +1 212 687 2329 rbernard@foley.com
Space Alissa M. Nann +1 212 682 7474 +1 212 687 2329 anann@foley.com

Represented by Kaye Scholer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Keith R. Murphy +1 212 836 8000 +1 212 836 8689 kmurphy@kayescholer.com

Represented by onslaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Irving H. Picard +1 212 613 2011 +1 212 554 9652 ipicard@gibbonslaw.com
Space Oren J. Warshavsky +1 212 649 4700

Represented by Town Of Brookhaven

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John J. Burke +1 631 680 1140 +1 516 746 6330 johnburke18@gmail.com

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan R. Barr +1 202 514 9620 +1 202 307 2304 jonathan.barr2@usdoj.gov
No Logo Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, Trustee

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc E. Hirschfield +1 212 589 4200 +1 212 589 4201 mhirschfield@bakerlaw.com
No Logo Salvatore LaMonica, Trustee

Represented by LaMonica Herbst & Maniscalco, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gary Frederick Herbst +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222 gfh@lhmlawfirm.com
Space Holly Rai +1 516 826 6500 +1 516 826 0222 hrai@lhmlawfirm.com
No Logo Sheila M. Gowan, Trustee

Represented by Diamond McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard I. Janvey +1 212 986 1200 +1 212 983 0772 rjanvey@janveygordon.com
Space Howard D. Ressler +1 212 430 5400 +1 212 430 5499 hressler@diamondmccarthy.com

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen T. Loden +1 713 546 5000 +1 713 224 9511 steve.loden@weil.com
No Logo Compania Mexicana de Aviacion, S.A. de C.V., Maru E. Johansen, as Foreign Representative, Foreign Representative

Represented by Duane Morris LLP

Represented by Meyer, Suozzi, English & Klein, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward J. LoBello +1 516 741 6565 +1 516 741 6706 elobello@msek.com
No Logo Fairfield Sentry Limited, Fairfield Sentry Limited, Foreign Representative
No Logo Creditors Committee, Creditor Committee
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra E. Mayerson +1 212 872 9800 +1 212 872 9815 smayerson@ssd.com

Represented by Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen D. Lerner +1 513 381 2838
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Dreier LLP, Creditor Committee
No Logo Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al., Creditor Committee

Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jonathan Levine +1 212 850 2816 +1 212 850 2929 jlevine@andrewskurth.com
Space Abhishek Mathur +1 212 850 2800 +1 212 850 2929 abhishekmathur@andrewskurth.com

Represented by Law Offices of Andrews and Kurth

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul N. Silverstein +1 212 850 2800 +1 212 850 2929
No Logo Post-Confirmation Oversight Committee, Creditor Committee

Represented by Squire Sanders (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra E. Mayerson +1 212 872 9800 +1 212 872 9815 smayerson@ssd.com
No Logo Sheila M. Gowan, Trustee for Chapter 11 Estate of Dreier LLP, Petitioning Creditor

Represented by Diamond McCarthy, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Howard D. Ressler +1 212 430 5400 +1 212 430 5499 hressler@diamondmccarthy.com
No Logo Steven J. Reisman, Postconfirmation Representative of the Bankruptcy Estates of 360networks (USA) inc., Petitioning Creditor

Represented by Colt & Mosle, LLP

No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Petitioning Creditor

Represented by McCarter & English LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Lubertazi
Space JOSEPH E. LUBERTAZZI, JR. +1 973 622 4444 +1 973 624 7070 jlubertazzi@mccarter.com
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "United States Trustee"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard C. Morrissey +1 212 510 0500 +1 212 668 2255 richard.morrissey@usdoj.gov
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3078 Filed: None, Entered: None
Objection to Motion Limited Objection of ASM Capital to Trustee's Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for the Assignment of Allowed Claims filed by Kirk L. Brett on behalf of ASM Capital, L.P.. (Brett, Kirk) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3077 Filed: None, Entered: None
Response to trustee's determination of claim dated October 18, 2010 (related document(s) 3070 , 3071 ) filed by David Gross. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1856 Filed: None, Entered: None Motion to Compel
Motion to Compel The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 For An Order Directing The Expeditious Production of Certain Documents By Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1855 Filed: None, Entered: None Motion to Compel
Motion to Compel The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 For An Order Directing The Expeditious Production of Certain Documents By Houlihan Lokey, Inc. filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1854 Filed: None, Entered: None Motion to Compel
Motion to Compel The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 For An Order Directing The Expeditious Production of Certain Documents By Morgan Stanley filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1853 Filed: None, Entered: None Motion to Compel
Motion to Compel The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Motion Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2004 For An Order Directing The Expeditious Production of Certain Documents By Deutsche Bank AG filed by Abhishek Mathur on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of FairPoint Communications, Inc., et al.. (Mathur, Abhishek) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1852 Filed: None, Entered: None
Motion to Authorize /FairPoint Communications' Motion For Authority Pursuant To Bankruptcy Code Section 365(a) and Bankruptcy Rules 6006 and 9014 To Reject A Contract With Advantage IQ, Inc., filed by James T. Grogan on behalf of FairPoint Communications, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/18/2010 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Responses due by 11/11/2010, (Grogan, James) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1851 Filed: None, Entered: None
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 20, 2010 10:22 AM (AMENDED) Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/26/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 1846 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/4/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/18/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/29/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/26/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1850 Filed: None, Entered: None
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 25, 2010 10:30 AM Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/24/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext, LLC.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 11/2/2010. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 11/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/29/2010. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/24/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 534 Filed: None, Entered: None
Objection to Motion Remus HRH LLC's Objection to Ad Hoc Labor Committee's Amended Application Pursuant to Rule 2004, Fed. R. Bankr. PR., to Take Examination of Debtors and Affiliated Entities (related document(s) 527 ) filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of Remus HRH, LLC. (Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 532 Filed: None, Entered: None
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 531 ) filed by Gregory J. Spaun on behalf of Fresh Meadow Mechanical Corp.. (Spaun, Gregory) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 531 Filed: None, Entered: None
Opposition to Debtor's Motion Objecting to Claim of Creditor (related document(s) 501 ) filed by Gregory J. Spaun on behalf of Fresh Meadow Mechanical Corp.. (Spaun, Gregory) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 530 Filed: None, Entered: None
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 529 ) filed by Gregory J. Spaun on behalf of Fresh Meadow Mechanical Corp.. (Spaun, Gregory) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 529 Filed: None, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Gregory J. Spaun on behalf of Fresh Meadow Mechanical Corp.. (Spaun, Gregory) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: None, Entered: None
Order Denying Motion for Abstention Under Section 305 (Related Doc # 359 ) signed on 10/29/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: None, Entered: None
So Ordered Stipulation and Order Regarding Discovery Schedule signed on 10/28/2010 with pre-trial conference to be held on 4/5/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: None, Entered: None
First Supplemental Order signed on 10/28/2010 Granting Reorganized Debtors' (I) Omnibus Objection to the Allowance of (A) Claims not Consistent with the Reorganized Debtors Books and Records, and (B) Duplicate Claims (Third Omnibus Claims Objection); and (II) Request for Certain Related Relief, Including the Allowance of Certain Claims. (related document(s) 377 ) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: None, Entered: None
Letter To Honorable Burton R. Lifland Dated November 24, 2010 filed by Ronald D. Lefton on behalf of EFG Bank, Banco Altantico Gibraltar n/k/a EFG Bank (Gibraltar) Ltd., and European Financial Group EFG (Luxembourg) S.A.. (Lefton, Ronald) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: None, Entered: None
Affidavit of Service of Christopher Michael Lau Kamg of Brown Rudnick LLP (related document(s) 264 ) filed by David Molton on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Molton, David) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: None, Entered: None
Notice of Entry of Judgment Denying Motions To Withdraw The Reference filed by David Molton on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Molton, David) (Entered: 11/22/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: None, Entered: None
Motion to Authorize , Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 105 & 363, the Chapter 7 Trustee to Pay the Outstanding Fees Owed to Precision Packing & Installation, Inc., Penn Corporate Relocation Services and the Asset Forfeiture Division of the United States Marshal Services from the Sale Proceeds from the Auction of the Debtor's Property. The Order to be Presented for Signature and Approval on November 22, 2010 at 12:00 p.m. with Objections Due by November 15, 2010. filed by Jacqulyn S. Giunta on behalf of Salvatore LaMonica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Penn Bill# 2 Exhibit B-Precision Bill# 3 Pleading Proposed Order) (Giunta, Jacqulyn) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: None, Entered: None Court Filing
Order of U.S. District Court Judge signed by Deborah A. Batts on 9/10/2010. The orders of the Bankruptcy Court dated May 12, 2010 and June 9, 2010 are hereby affirmed. (related document(s) 197 appeal) (Aquino, Lourdes) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: None, Entered: None Court Filing
Order of U.S. District Court Judge Deboarh A. Batts signed on 9/10/2010. The orders of the Bankruptcy Court dated May 12, 2010 and June 9, 2010 are hereby affirmed. (related document(s) 170 appeal) (Aquino, Lourdes) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: None, Entered: None
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 244 , 245 ) filed by William Heuer on behalf of Compania Mexicana de Aviacion, S.A. de C.V.. (Heuer, William) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: None, Entered: None
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Martha Rodriguez-Lopez filed by Eric T. Moser on behalf of Andorra Banc Agricol Reig, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Moser, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: None, Entered: None
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of William Shaw McDermott filed by Eric T. Moser on behalf of Andorra Banc Agricol Reig, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Moser, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: None, Entered: None
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Richard A. Kirby filed by Eric T. Moser on behalf of Andorra Banc Agricol Reig, S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Moser, Eric) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: None, Entered: None
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 10/28/2010 extending creditors' time to object to discharge to December 31, 2010. (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: None, Entered: None
Monthly Operating Report for the period September 1, 2010 through September 30, 2010 filed by Erica R. Feynman on behalf of Duane Street Design Studio, LLC. (Feynman, Erica) (Entered: 10/28/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: None, Entered: None
Conditional Order re: Motion for Relief from Stay (Related Doc # 45 ) signed on 11/1/2010. (Li, Dorothy) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: None, Entered: None
Letter marking the motion as settled (related document(s) 45 ) filed by Deborah Kall Schaal on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.. (Schaal, Deborah) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: None, Entered: None
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: None, Entered: None
So Ordered Stipulation Regarding Scheduling signed on 11/1/2010. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 11/01/2010)
Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 451 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?