Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.
Page 1 Page 2
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
527 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
189 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14867 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14866 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14865 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14864 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14863 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14862 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14861 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14860 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14859 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14858 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14857 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14856 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14855 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14854 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14853 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14852 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14851 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14656 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Eurobank EFG Private Bank Luxembourg S.A.(Claim No.62748, Amount 11,886,840.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14655 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Monarch Master Funding Ltd.(Claim No.63750, Amount 1,868,337.18). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14654 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Order Granting Supplemental Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure to Amend the Engagement Letter between the Debtors and Lazard Freres & Co. LLC as Investment Banker to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2010 (related document(s) 14653 , 14652 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14653 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration / Fourth Supplemental Declaration of Barry W. Ridings in Connection with the Employment and Retention of Lazard Freres & Co. LLC as Investment Banker to the Debtors (related document(s) 14652 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14652 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Amendment to the Supplemental Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 327(a) and 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Amend the Engagement Letter between the Debtors and Lazard Freres & Co. LLC as Investment Banker to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to June 1, 2010 (related document(s) 12041 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 3/10/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 3/10/2011, (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14651 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Cassa Depositi e Prestiti S.p.A.(Claim No.18219, Amount 133,495,911.35). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC.(Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14650 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14649 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14648 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Seventieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14647 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Fifty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14646 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Debtor Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14645 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14644 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Lehman Programs Securities Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14643 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Forty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14642 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14641 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Thirty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14640 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14639 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) Solely as to Certain Responses filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14638 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims) Solely as to Certain Responses filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 3/31/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14637 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sunset Partners(Claim No.67314, Amount 740,000.00). To Restoration Holdings LTD. filed by Restoration Holdings LTD. (Attachments: # 1 Objection Notice FRBP Rule 3001 (e)(2))(Tonner, David) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14432 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14294 , 14359 , 7934 , 14272 , 14274 , 14293 , 14301 , 14290 , 10109 , 14298 , 14269 , 14281 , 14268 , 14277 , 14360 , 14282 , 14285 , 14273 , 14289 , 14265 , 14295 , 14297 , 10110 , 14288 , 14305 , 14302 , 14267 , 14287 , 14276 , 14303 , 14283 , 14300 , 14280 , 14271 , 14296 , 14278 , 10108 , 14270 , 14275 , 14266 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14431 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14144 , 14279 , 14284 , 14286 , 14304 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14430 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14394 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14429 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14398 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14428 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Samuel Garcia of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14335 ) filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14427 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Konstantina Haidopoulos of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 14331 , 14332 , 14318 , 14330 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Secrities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49981, Amount 3,975,160.00). To Cyrus Select Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Cyrus Select Opportunities Master Fund Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14425 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CONECTIV ENERGY SUPPLY INC(Claim No.4515, Amount 114,702.50); CONECTIV ENERGY SUPPLY INC(Claim No.4516, Amount 114,702.50). To LIQUIDITY SOLUTIONS, INC.. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14424 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49983, Amount 508,252.60). To Cyrus Select Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Cyrus Select Opportunities Master Fund Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14423 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lloyds TSB Bank plc (Geneva Branch),(Claim No.55501, Amount 110,719.44). To Contrarian Funds, LLC. filed by Alisa Mumola on behalf of Contrarian Funds, LLC.(Mumola, Alisa) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14422 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49983, Amount 508,252.60). To Cyrus Opportunities Master Fund II, Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Cyrus Opportunities Master Fund II, Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14421 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49983, Amount 508,252.60). To Crescent I, LP. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Crescent I, LP.(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14420 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49983, Amount 508,252.60). To CRS Fund Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of CRS Fund Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14419 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49982, Amount 2,299,914.00). To Cyrus Select Opportunities Master Fund, Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Cyrus Select Opportunities Master Fund Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14418 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49982, Amount 2,299,914.00). To Cyrus Opportunities Master Fund II, LP. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Cyrus Opportunities Master Fund II, Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14417 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49982, Amount 2,299,914.00). To Crescent I, LP. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Crescent I, LP.(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14416 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49982, Amount 2,299,914.00). To CRS Fund Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of CRS Fund Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14415 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Claim No.49981, Amount 3,975,160.00). To Cyrus Opportunities Master Fund II, Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Cyrus Opportunities Master Fund II, Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14414 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49981, Amount 3,975,160.00). To Crescent I, LP. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Crescent I, LP.(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14413 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Tejas Securities Group, Inc.(Claim No.49981, Amount 3,975,160.00). To CRS Fund Ltd.. filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of CRS Fund Ltd..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14412 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Quarterly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures for the Debtors to Compromise and Settle Claims in Respect of the Origination or Purchase of Residential Mortgage Loans filed by Shai Waisman on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Waisman, Shai) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14411 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 11-01455. Complaint against Lehman Brothers Special Financing, Inc. . Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by Maria J. DiConza, Tempe Life Care Village, Inc., d/b/a, Friendship Village of Tempe, Lehman Brothers Special Financing, Inc. on behalf of Tempe Life Care Village, Inc., d/b/a, Friendship Village of Tempe. (DiConza, Maria) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14410 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 8066 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14409 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Owens & Minor, Inc.(Claim No.15318, Amount 1,250,000.00). To Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P.. filed by Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P..(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14408 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Owens & Minor, Inc.(Claim No.15318, Amount 1,296,479.00). To Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P.. filed by Longacre Institutional Opportunity Fund, L.P..(Skowronski, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14407 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement (Claim No. 67178). To Acta Asset Management ASA. filed by Andrew T. Solomon on behalf of Acta Asset Management ASA.(Solomon, Andrew) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14406 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP - Transfer of Claim (s) Other Than for Security - Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Nomura International PLC(Claim No.58993, Amount 7,287,392.11); Nomura International PLC(Claim No.58999, Amount 15,753,997.46). To Lambda Asset Management Ltd. filed by Nomura International plc.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14405 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP - Agreement and Evidence of Transfer of Claim Lehman Program Security - (Claim No. 55816). To Guy Butler Limited. filed by Credit Suisse (UK) Limited.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4963 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Notice of Filing Debtor's Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from November 1, 2010 to December 31, 2010 (re: Docket No. 4871) (related document(s) 4871 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4962 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Order Approving a Stipulation and Settlement Agreement with the State of New Jersey and Highview Properties-One, L.L.C. Resolving Certain Environmental Obligations Concerning the KEM Site, and Granting Related Relief [Docket No. 4874] (related document(s) 4874 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4961 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Documents Served on February 1, 2011 [Docket Nos. 4881, 4883, 4884, 4885, 4886, 4887, 4888, 4890 and 4891] (related document(s) 4887 , 4888 , 4886 , 4882 , 4885 , 4881 , 4884 , 4890 , 4889 , 4891 , 4883 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4960 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by the Law Office of F. Gerald Maples, P.A. [Docket No. 4845] (related document(s) 4845 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4959 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Notice of Hearing on the Reorganized Debtors' Fifty-First Tier I Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim (Books and Records, Duplicate and Insufficient Documentation) [Docket No. 4949]; 2) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing with Respect to the Uniroyal Retirees' Memorandum of Law Regarding the Legal Issue [Docket No. 4952]; and 3) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing with Respect to Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by Lemberg & Associates, LLC for Cancellation of Post-Employment Benefits [Docket No. 4953] (related document(s) 4949 , 4952 , 4953 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4958 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Order Approving the Settlement and Release Agreement Among Chemtura Corporation, Chemtura Canada Co./CIE, and Givaudan Flavors Corporation Regarding Certain Claims Asserted in Proof of Claim No. 11249 [Docket No. 4942]; 2) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing with Respect to Debtors' Objection to Certain Proofs of Claims Filed by the Internal Revenue Service (Claim Nos. 1648, 1199, 15334 and 15364) [Docket No. 4945]; and 3) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Resolving the Debtors' Objection to Proof of Claim Number 700 Filed by Sedgwick Detert Moran & Arnold LLP [Docket No. 4947] (related document(s) 4942 , 4945 , 4947 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4957 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: 1) Notice of Withdrawal of the Debtors' Objection with Respect to Proofs of Claim Nos. 10849 and 10852 Filed by Highview Properties One LLC [Docket No. 4938]; 2) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order with Respect to Proofs of Claim Numbered 9536 and 9542 Filed by SABIC Innovative Plastics US LLC [Docket No. 4939]; and 3) Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Certain Proofs of Claim Filed by the Law Office of F. Gerald Maples, P.A. [Docket No. 4941] (related document(s) 4938 , 4939 , 4941 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4956 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal Regarding Debtors' Thirty-Seventh Tier I Objections (related document(s) 3744 ) filed by Bruce S. Levine on behalf of International Union, United Automotive, Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America. (Levine, Bruce) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4955 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 4946 ) filed by Mark A. Speiser on behalf of Hess Corporation. (Speiser, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4954 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 2/10/2011 Scheduling Hearing And Setting Certain Deadlines Relating To Matters Between Reorganized Debtors And Lyondell Chemical Company. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3903 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Time / Trustee's Motion for an Order Pursuant to Rule 4(M) of The Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Extending the Time to Effect Service of Process [Presentment Date: March 16, 2011 at 12:00 P.M. with Objections Due March 16, 2011 by 11:00 A.M.] filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Motion# 2 Exhibit B Proposed Order# 3 Notice of Presentment) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3902 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance in Adversary Proceeding filed by Richard C. Yeskoo on behalf of Joan L. Fisher. (Yeskoo, Richard) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3901 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter dated January 31, 2011 Re: Letters of Rogatory, returned for the recipient is in Germany (related document(s) 3318 , 3321 , 3319 , 3320 , 3681 , 3317 ) filed by Department of Justice, Vienna, Austria. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 03/08/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3873 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel for United States Government Attorney (related document(s) 32 ) filed by Brad Rogers on behalf of PENSION BENEFIT GUARANTY CORP.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rogers, Brad) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3872 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 3871 ) filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Marsha Peshkin. (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3871 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Date (related document(s) 3860 ) filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Marsha Peshkin. with hearing to be held on 3/30/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 3/4/2011, (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3870 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 2/23/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice for Certain Attorneys listed on Schedule A of the Order (Related Doc # 3867 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3869 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Trustee's Motion for an Order Establishing Procedures for an Electronic Data Room filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. with hearing to be held on 3/10/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 3/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion# 2 Proposed Order# 3 Exhibit 1 to [Proposed] Order) (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3844 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service on Irving H. Picard, Trustee (related document(s) 3841 , 3843 , 3842 ) filed by Dennis C. Quinn on behalf of Jewish Community Foundation of the Jewish Federation Council of Greater Los Angeles. (Quinn, Dennis) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3843 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration OF MICHAEL J. JANUZIK, Exhibits A, B and C filed by Dennis C. Quinn on behalf of Jewish Community Foundation of the Jewish Federation Council of Greater Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. B (part 1)# 2 Exhibit Exh. B (part 2)# 3 Exhibit Exh. C) (Quinn, Dennis) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3842 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration OF MICHAEL J. JANUZIK IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTIONS TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINATIONS OF THE CLAIMS OF CLAIMANTS WHOSE FUNDS WERE INVESTED WITH BLMIS THROUGH AN INVESTMENT POOL MAINTAINED AND ADMINISTERED BY THE JEWISH COMMUNITY FOUNDATION OF THE JEWISH FEDERATION COUNCIL OF GREATER LOS ANGELES filed by Dennis C. Quinn on behalf of Jewish Community Foundation of the Jewish Federation Council of Greater Los Angeles. (Quinn, Dennis) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3841 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion TO THE TRUSTEES DETERMINATIONS OF THE CLAIMS OF CLAIMANTS WHOSE FUNDS WERE INVESTED WITH BLMIS THROUGH AN INVESTMENT POOL MAINTAINED AND ADMINISTERED BY THE JEWISH COMMUNITY FOUNDATION OF THE JEWISH FEDERATION COUNCIL OF GREATER LOS ANGELES filed by Dennis C. Quinn on behalf of Jewish Community Foundation of the Jewish Federation Council of Greater Los Angeles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A# 2 Exhibit Exh. B (part 1)# 3 Exhibit Exh. B (part 2)# 4 Exhibit Exh. C# 5 Exhibit Exh. D) (Quinn, Dennis) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3840 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Agenda For The Avoidance Action Omnibus Hearing Scheduled For February 16, 2011 (related document(s) 3839 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
987 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
986 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
985 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
984 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
983 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
982 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
981 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
980 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
979 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
978 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
977 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
976 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
974 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
973 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
972 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
971 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
970 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
969 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
968 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
760 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice filed by Kenneth A. Reynolds on behalf of Nissin Foods (U.S.A.) Company, Inc.. (Reynolds, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
759 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Re: letter addressed to all drivers from Grocery Haulers filed by Local Union No. 863. (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
758 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for All Notices filed by Terrence L. Tarver on behalf of Olive Cunningham. (Tarver, Terrence) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
757 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance (Saul Ewing LLP for CVS Pharmacy, Inc.) filed by Mark Minuti on behalf of CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Minuti, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
756 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Re: Request for Lump Sum Retirement Fund Payment filed by Albert Bennett. Modified on 2/10/2011 (Correa, Mimi). (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
755 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by Martha B. Chovanes on behalf of Plainfield Tobacco and Candy, Inc. t/a Resnick Distributors. (Chovanes, Martha) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
754 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Edward J. Fallman on behalf of Springfield Realty Associates, Allegheny Plaza Associates I LP. Filing fee collected, receipt #44602. (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
753 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Master Service List as of February 9, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
752 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 2/10/2011 Granting Application for admission Pro Hac Vice of Chrisandrea L. Turner (Related Doc # 748 ) . (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
715 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 714 , 713 ) filed by James S. Carr on behalf of Grocery Haulers, Inc.. (Carr, James) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
714 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Emergency Motion for Stay Pending Appeal Emergency Motion of Grocery Haulers, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8002, 8005 and 8011 For Stay Pending Appeal of the Order Granting the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Rejection of the Trucking Agreement with Grocery Haulers, Inc. (related document(s) 713 ) filed by James S. Carr on behalf of Grocery Haulers, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Declaration)(Carr, James) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
713 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appeal (related document(s) 545 ) filed by James S. Carr on behalf of Grocery Haulers, Inc.. (Carr, James) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
712 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Motion for Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Services and Continuation of Service; 2) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases; and 3) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services (related document(s) 503 , 135 , 11 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
711 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Motion for Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Services and Continuation of Service; 2) Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases; and 3) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services (related document(s) 503 , 135 , 11 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
710 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for the Period December 5, 2010 to January 1, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
709 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 2/3/2011 Granting Application for admission Pro Hac Vice of Hillary C. Coleman (Related Doc # 697 ) . (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
608 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Hearing / Notice of Rescheduled Omnibus Hearing filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/2/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
607 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Documents filed by Patrick Howell on behalf of Roundy's Supermarkets, Inc.. (Howell, Patrick) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
606 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Jan I. Berlage on behalf of c/o Jan I. Berlage M.O.R. Crestwood Limited Partnership, c/o Jan I. Berlage M.O.R. Mt. Airy Limited Partnership. (Berlage, Jan) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
605 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 547 ) filed by Michael H. Landis on behalf of Grays Ferry Partners, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Landis, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
604 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 546 ) filed by Michael H. Landis on behalf of Grays Ferry Partners, LP. with hearing to be held on 2/1/2011 (check with court for location) Objections due by 1/25/2011, (Landis, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
603 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey Bernstein on behalf of Construction Maintenance Plus, Inc.. (Bernstein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
602 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 543 , 525 , 544 , 528 ) filed by Michael Earl Comerford on behalf of Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Comerford, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
565 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases (related document(s) 135 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
564 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing Notice of Establishment of Omnibus Hearing Dates Pursuant to Case Management Order (related document(s) 522 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
563 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Transfers of, or Claims of Worthless Stock Deductions with respect to, Certain Equity Securities, and Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 502 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
562 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Transfers of, or Claims of Worthless Stock Deductions with respect to, Certain Equity Securities, and Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 502 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
561 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Hearing / Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Cases (related document(s) 135 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
560 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing the Debtors' Employment and Retention of Huron Consulting Services LLC as Financial Advisor Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date; 2) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing the Debtors' Employment and Retention of Lazard Freres & Co. LLC as Investment Banker Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date; 3) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Kirkland & Ellis LLP as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession Effective Nunc Pro Tunc to the Commencement Date; 4) Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 1/12/2011 regarding extension of time to file schedules and statements; 5) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing, but Not Directing, Debtors to (A) Pay Certain Prepetition Wages and Reimbursable Employee Expenses, (B) Pay and Honor Employee Medical and Other Benefits and (C) Continue Employee Benefits Programs; 6) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to Maintain and Administer Customer Programs and Practices and Honor Related Prepetition Obligations; 7) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to Pay Certain Taxes and Fees; 8) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 (A) Authorizing Debtors to Pay Prepetition Claims of Warehousemen and Miscellaneous Lien Claimants, (B) Authorizing the Debtors to Grant Administrative Expense Priority to All Undisputed Obligations for Merchandise Ordered Prepetition and Delivered Postpetition and Satisfy Such Obligations in the Ordinary Course of Business and (C) Approving the PACA Procedures and Authorizing the Payment of Allowed PACA Claims; 9) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing Debtors to Release Certain Funds Held in Trust and to Continue Performance of and Honor Obligations Under Consignment Arrangements and Deposit Arrangements; 10) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Establishing Notification and Hearing Procedures for Transfers of, or Claims of Worthless Stock Deductions with respect to, Certain Equity Securities, and Granting Related Relief; 11) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; 12) Final Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Claims of Critical Vendors and Section 503(b)(9) Claims, Approving Related Procedures, and Granting Related Relief; 13) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Establishing Procedures for Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Professionals; 14) Order signed on 1/12/2011 Authorizing the Debtors' Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business; 15) Order signed on 1/12/2011 (Re: Second Omnibus Lease Rejection Motion) Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases and Related Subleases; and 16) Amended Order signed on 1/12/2011 (Re: First Omnibus Rejection Motion) Authorizing Rejection of Certain Unexpired Nonresidential Real Property Leases (related document(s) 496 , 503 , 486 , 499 , 501 , 497 , 488 , 506 , 505 , 502 , 507 , 498 , 504 , 500 , 508 , 487 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
559 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Final Order signed on 1/11/2011 (I) Authorizing the Debtors (A) to Obtain Post-Petition Financing Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 364(c)(1), 364(c)(2), 364(c)(3), 364(d)(1) and 364(e) and (B) to Utilize Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363; and (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Pre-Petition Secured Parties Pursuant to 11 U.S.C §§ 361, 362, 363 and 364 (related document(s) 479 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
558 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Notice of Demand for Administrative Claim Pursuant to Section 503(b)(9) filed by James A. Beldner on behalf of Iberia Foods Corp. and North Shore Bottling Co.. (Beldner, James) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
557 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim (related document(s) 556 ) filed by Rick A. Steinberg on behalf of Ivie & Associates, Inc.. (Steinberg, Rick) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
556 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim (related document(s) 534 ) filed by Rick A. Steinberg on behalf of Ivie & Associates, Inc.. (Steinberg, Rick) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
555 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 517 , 518 , 515 , 513 , 519 , 516 , 514 , 512 ) filed by Richard B. Levin on behalf of Emil Capital Partners, LLC, Christian Haub, Erivan Karl Haub, Georg Rudolf Otto Haub, Helga Haub, Karl-Erivan Warder Haub, Liliane Annelise Haub, Tengelmann Warenhandelsgesellschaft KG. (Levin, Richard) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
554 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Joint Motion for Relief from Stay filed by Joseph D'Ambrosio on behalf of Pine Plaza Associates, LLC. with hearing to be held on 2/1/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 1/25/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Joinder Certification# 2 Exhibit Underlying Complaint# 3 Exhibit Underlying Answer w/Cross-Claim# 4 Exhibit Pathmark Lease# 5 Exhibit Police Report# 6 Exhibit Certificate of Insurance# 7 Exhibit Superior Court Order) (D'Ambrosio, Joseph) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
553 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion for a Stay or, in the Alternative, Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief Halting Prosecution of the Officemax V. Martin, et al., Complaint filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/1/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Objections due by 1/24/2011, (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
552 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Deanne M. Caputo on behalf of Olive Cunningham. (Caputo, Deanne) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
551 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers filed by Jeffrey A. Wurst on behalf of Gould Shirley Real Estate, Gould Long Island City Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Wurst, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
550 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/19/2011 Granting Application for for admission Pro Hac Vice of Douglas L. Lutz (Related Doc # 464 ). (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
549 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/19/2011 Granting Application for admission Pro Hac Vice of F. Mark Bromley (Related Doc # 483 ). (Andino, Eddie) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
469 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
468 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
467 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
466 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
465 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
464 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
463 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
462 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
461 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
460 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
459 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
458 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
457 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
456 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
455 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
451 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
450 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
449 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
448 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
447 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
446 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
445 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
444 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
443 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
442 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
441 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
440 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
439 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
438 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
437 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
436 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
435 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
434 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
433 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
428 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Supplement to Exhibit J to the Plan Supplement: Identity of Additional Members of New Board (related document(s) 353 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
427 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Case Management Order #2 signed on 2/24/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
426 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Further Extending Time to Perform Under Pre-Petition Lease and License Financing and Purchase Option Agreement with Loehmann's Capital Corp. (Related Doc # 412 ) signed on 2/24/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
425 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter of Change of Address filed by BDO USA, LLP. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
424 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses . filed by 211 Sutter Street Partners, L.P.. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
423 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
422 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
421 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
420 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
419 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
418 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
417 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
416 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
415 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
414 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
413 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
412 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
411 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
410 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
409 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
408 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
407 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
406 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
405 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
404 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code and Post-Confirmation Order and Notice (related document(s) 398 , 400 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
403 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
402 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
401 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
400 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
399 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
398 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
397 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
396 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
395 |
Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal (related document(s) 336 ) filed by Ilan Markus on behalf of Westfield, LLC. (Markus, Ilan) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
394 |
Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Blacklined Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 393 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
393 |
Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan (Hearing Date: 2/7/11 @ 3:00 P.M.) Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 380 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
392 |
Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Plan Supplements (related document(s) 388 , 390 , 387 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
391 |
Filed: 2/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda /(Hearing Date: 2/7/11 at 3:00 PM) Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for February 7, 2011 at 3:00 P.M. (related document(s) 298 , 388 , 268 , 330 , 331 , 323 , 386 , 327 , 312 , 328 , 380 , 372 , 345 , 322 , 285 , 271 , 351 , 338 , 342 , 216 , 367 , 347 , 334 , 329 , 297 , 310 , 281 , 390 , 314 , 325 , 305 , 387 , 333 , 336 , 379 , 289 , 377 , 337 , 378 , 332 , 376 , 353 , 381 , 352 , 299 , 373 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
390 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to the Plan Supplement: Amended and Restated Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
389 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT # 390 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to the Plan Supplement: Amended and Restated Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) Modified on 2/7/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
388 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing Exhibit C to the Plan Supplement: Amended and Restated Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
387 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit C to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 3 to the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
386 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to the Notice of Filing of Exhibit C to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 2 to the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 351 ) filed by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of 1528 Chestnut LLC. (Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
385 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(CONFIRMATION HEARING: 2/7/2011 at 3:00 p.m.) Notice of Change in Time from 9:45 a.m. to 3:00 p.m. of Confirmation Hearing With Respect to the Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
384 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice to File Schedules. (related document(s) 351 ) filed by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of 1528 Chestnut LLC. (Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
383 |
Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Memorandum of Law: (A) In Support of Confirmation of the Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (B) In Response to Objections and Supporting Declarations (related document(s) 379 , 377 , 378 , 376 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
382 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Path Interactive, Inc.. To Tannor Partners Credit Fund II, LP. filed by Tannor Partners Credit Fund II, LP.(Tannor, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
381 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Blacklined Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 380 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
380 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /(HEARING DATE: 2/7/2011 at 9:45 a.m.) Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 376 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
379 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Richard J. Shinder In Support of Confirmation of Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 376 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
378 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Joseph Melvin In Support of Confirmation of Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 376 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
377 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Lee Diercks In Support of Confirmation of Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 376 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
376 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum of Law /(HEARING DATE: 2/7/2011 at 9:45 a.m.) Debtors' Memorandum of Law: (A) In Support of Confirmation of the Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (B) In Response to Objections Thereto (related document(s) 285 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
375 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Martin A. Mooney on behalf of Mercedes-Benz Financial Services USA LLC formerly known as DCFS USA LLC servicer for Daimler Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Mooney, Martin) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
374 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Central Shipee Inc(Claim No.126, Amount 8,327.00). To Liquidity Solutions,Inc. filed by Norman David Schoenfeld on behalf of Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(Schoenfeld, Norman) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
373 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certification of Ballots /Certification of Karen M. Wagner with Respect to the Tabulation of Votes on the Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 372 , 248 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
372 |
Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certification of Ballots /Certification of Peter Walsh with Respect to the Tabulation of Votes on the Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 248 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
371 |
Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplemental Distribution of Solicitation Materials (related document(s) 268 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
370 |
Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplemental Mailing of Notice of Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 298 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
369 |
Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Limited Objection to Notice of Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule of the Plan Supplement and Amendment No. 1 to the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 361 ) filed by Shawn Randall Fox on behalf of ADT Security Services, Inc.. (Fox, Shawn) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
368 |
Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing Plan Supplement Exhibits (related document(s) 351 , 353 , 352 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
367 |
Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection filed by TJ Unlimited Landscape & Development. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
366 |
Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:SCALA EVENINGWEAR INC(Amount 47,929.96).. To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
365 |
Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:LOVE & HAPPINESS LLC(Amount 72,000.38).. To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
364 |
Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:LOVE & HAPPINESS LLC(Claim No.66, Amount 72,000). To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
363 |
Filed: 2/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Streambank, LLC as Intellectual Property Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to January 18, 2011(Related Doc # 321 ) signed on 2/1/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 02/01/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
362 |
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Amro Carting Corp. To Tannor Partners Credit Fund II, LP. filed by Tannor Partners Credit Fund II, LP.(Tannor, Robert) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
361 |
Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection - Limited Objection of ADT Security Services, Inc. to Notice of Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule of the Plan Supplement [Docket No. 299] and to Amendment No. 1 to the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule [Docket No. 331] (related document(s) 331 , 299 ) filed by Shawn Randall Fox on behalf of ADT Security Services, Inc.. (Fox, Shawn) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
360 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served January 19, 2011 (related document(s) 149 , 151 , 154 , 153 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
359 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Distribution of Solicitation Materials Served January 28, 2011 (related document(s) 268 , 280 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
358 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served January 28, 2011 (related document(s) 50 , 9 , 13 , 40 , 48 , 30 , 47 , 19 , 36 , 29 , 51 , 46 , 45 , 35 , 28 , 31 , 33 , 32 , 11 , 34 , 4 , 22 , 6 , 44 , 5 , 49 , 8 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
357 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing on Motion for Approval of Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
356 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Omnibus Motion for an Order Authorizing Rejection Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property (related document(s) 175 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
355 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Motion to Extend Period Within Which Debtors May Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property (related document(s) 88 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
354 |
Filed: 1/30/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing of The Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 299 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/30/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
353 |
Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibits B, E, F, G, H, I and J to the Plan Supplement: Employee Related Programs, Compensation and Benefits Program to be Rejected, Amended and Restated Certificate of Incorporation, Amended and Restated Bylaws, Schedule of Debtor Causes of Action to be Retained by the Reorganized Debtors, Indentity of Officers of the Reorganized Debtors' and Indentity of Members of New Board (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
352 |
Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 2 to the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
351 |
Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit C to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 2 to the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
350 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
349 |
Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Owen M. Sonik on behalf of Spring Branch Independent School District. (Sonik, Owen) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
348 |
Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 344 ) filed by Kevin J. Nash on behalf of Tulepan Management LLC. (Nash, Kevin) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
347 |
Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Debtor's Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Owen M. Sonik on behalf of Spring Branch Independent School District. (Sonik, Owen) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
346 |
Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplemental Distribution of Solicitation Materials (related document(s) 268 , 280 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
345 |
Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan (related document(s) 248 ) filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Harris, Juandisha) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
344 |
Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Kevin J. Nash on behalf of Tulepan Management LLC. (Nash, Kevin) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
343 |
Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 1 to the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 331 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
342 |
Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Debtors' Cure Schedule for Assumed Unexpired Leases filed by David L. Pollack on behalf of FR Crow Creek LLC, Federal Realty Investment Trust, HRI/Lutherville Station, LLC, Levin Management Corporation, Street Retail Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E) (Pollack, David) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
341 |
Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing of Exhibit C to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 1 to the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule and Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 1 to the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 330 , 331 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
340 |
Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing of Exhibit K to the Plan Supplement: Certificate of Designation for the New Convertible Preferred Stock and Notice of Filing of Exhibit L to the Plan Supplement: New Shareholders' Agreement (related document(s) 327 , 328 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/26/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
339 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Isidro N. Panizales re: Notice of Filing of Exhibit K to the Plan Supplement: Certificate of Designation for the New Convertible Preferred Stock; and Notice of Filing of Exhibit L to the Plan Supplement: New Shareholders' Agreement (related document(s) 327 , 328 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
338 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection and Reservation of Rights of Conrans VF LLC to Proposed Cure Amounts with respect to the East Hanover, New Jersey Store Lease (No. 145) (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Boris I. Mankovetskiy on behalf of Conrans VF LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service) (Mankovetskiy, Boris) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
337 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Plan Limited Objection to Assumption of Unexpired Lease (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Nancy Hotchkiss on behalf of Peter P. Bollinger Investment Company. (Hotchkiss, Nancy) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
336 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection (Cure Objection) (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Ilan Markus on behalf of Westfield, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Markus, Ilan) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
335 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 334 ) filed by Adrienne Woods Blankley on behalf of Caruso Affiliated. (Blankley, Adrienne) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
334 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection COMBINED LIMITED OBJECTION OF CARUSO AFFILIATED AND THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA TO THE NOTICE OF FILING OF THE ASSUMED EXECUTORY CONTRACT AND UNEXPIRED LEASE SCHEDULE OF THE PLAN SUPPLEMENT AND DEBTORS SECOND AMENDED JOINT PLAN OF REORGANIZATION UNDER CHAPTER 11 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE (related document(s) 248 ) filed by Adrienne Woods Blankley on behalf of Caruso Affiliated. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 1/25/2011, (Blankley, Adrienne) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
333 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection of Developers Diversified Realty Corp. to Debtors' Proposed Cure Amount (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Robert L. LeHane on behalf of Developers Diversified Realty Corporation. (LeHane, Robert) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
332 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection of Regency Centers, LP to Debtors' Proposed Cure Amounts (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Robert L. LeHane on behalf of Regency Centers L.P.. (LeHane, Robert) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
331 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit D to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 1 to the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
330 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit C to the Plan Supplement: Amendment No. 1 to the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
329 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection by Landlord to Cure Amounts and Lease Assumption in Connection Therewith filed by Mark A. Frankel on behalf of Treger Realty Co.. (Frankel, Mark) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
328 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit L to the Plan Supplement: New Shareholders' Agreement (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
327 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Exhibit K to the Plan Supplement: Certificate of Designation for the New Convertible Preferred Stock (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 (check with court for location) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
326 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ DJM Asset Management, LLC as Real Estate Consultant to the Debtors (Related Doc # 218 ) signed on 1/24/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
325 |
Filed: 1/24/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion of Debtors to Assume Unexpired Lease with LPE Partners without Paying any Cure Amount filed by Richard L. Zucker on behalf of LPE Partners. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Objection to Cure Amount) (Zucker, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
324 |
Filed: 1/22/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Application to Employ Streambank, LLC (related document(s) 321 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/22/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
323 |
Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Distribution of Solicitation Materials (related document(s) 268 , 280 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
322 |
Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection - LIMITED OBJECTION AND RESERVATION OF RIGHTS OF WHITE PLAINS SHOPPING CENTER ASSOCIATES, LLC TO PROPOSED CURE AMOUNTS WITH RESPECT TO THE WHITE PLAINS STORE LEASE (NO. 33) and Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 299 ) filed by Lawrence R. Reich on behalf of White Plains Shopping Center Assoc. LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Reich, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
321 |
Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ Streambank, LLC as Intellectual Property Advisor /(PRESENTMENT DATE: 1/28/2011 at 12:00 p.m.; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 1/28/2011 at 11:00 a.m.) Notice of Presentment and Debtors' Application for Entry of An Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a), Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Streambank, LLC as Intellectual Property Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to January 18, 2011 filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 1/28/2011, with presentment to be held on 1/28/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration# 2 Exhibit B-Engagement Letter# 3 Exhibit C-Proposed Order# 4 Pleading Notice of Presentmet) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
320 |
Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 308 ) filed by Harold Olsen on behalf of Philip Kaplan. (Olsen, Harold) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
319 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Sheldon Eisenberger on behalf of Croton Watch Co., Inc.. (Eisenberger, Sheldon) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
318 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplemental Distribution of Solicitation Materials (related document(s) 268 , 280 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
317 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notices of Rejected and Assumed Contracts and Leases (related document(s) 298 , 299 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
316 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Deadline Requiring filing of Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 199 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
315 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:ADINA(Amount 52,882.00).. To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
314 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection Limited Objection to Assumption of Unexpired Lease (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Michael D. Brofman on behalf of Lake Success Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Affidavit of Service) (Brofman, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
313 |
Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Extending Time to Perform Under Pre-Petition Lease and License Financing and Purchase Option Agreement With Loehmann's Capital Corp.(Related Doc # 272 ) signed on 1/20/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
312 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Plan Supplement for Debtors Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code; Notice of Filing of the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule of the Plan Supplement; and Notice of Filing of the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule of the Plan Supplement (related document(s) 298 , 297 , 299 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
311 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Champion Packaging Products, LLC(Amount 14,403.35).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
310 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Distribution of Solicitation Materials (related document(s) 268 , 280 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
309 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:O Olive Oil, Inc.(Amount 11,053.35).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
308 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Documents filed by Harold Olsen on behalf of Philip Kaplan. (Olsen, Harold) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
307 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 11-01458. Complaint against Arden Endowment Advisers Limited, Arden Asset Management Inc., Beneficial Owners of Accounts Held in the Name of Arden Endowment Advisers 1-1000 . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by David Molton, May Orenstein on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation) and Kenneth Krys and Joanna Lau, solely in their capacities as Foreign Representatives and Liquidators. (Orenstein, May) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
306 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Christopher Michael Lau Kamg of Brown Rudnick LLP (related document(s) 305 ) filed by David Molton on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. (Molton, David) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
305 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Proposed Amended Preliminary Scheduling Order (related document(s) 212 , 257 , 115 , 256 ) filed by David Molton on behalf of Fairfield Sentry Limited. with presentment to be held on 3/9/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 2/25/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Motion# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C)(Molton, David) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing on Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
303 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ, Inc. as Financial Advisors to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Related Doc # 221 ) signed on 1/19/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
302 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Hahn & Hessen LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors(Related Doc # 219 ) signed on 1/19/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
301 |
Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Monthly Operating Reports for November and December 2010 (related document(s) 291 , 292 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
300 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Distribution of Solicitation Materials (related document(s) 268 , 280 , 285 , 248 , 246 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
299 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of the Assumed Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule of the Plan Supplement (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
298 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of the Rejected Executory Contract and Unexpired Lease Schedule of the Plan Supplement (related document(s) 297 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
297 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Plan Supplement for Debtors Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 281 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
296 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey G. Tinkham on behalf of Beechnut Street, Inc.. (Tinkham, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
295 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Jeffrey G. Tinkham on behalf of Beechnut Street, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed order) (Tinkham, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
294 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Franshaw, Inc.(Claim No.???, Amount 9,552.00). To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
293 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Franshaw, Inc.(Amount 18,883.57).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
292 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report /Loehmann's Holdings Corporate Monthly Operating Report for December 2010 filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
291 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report /Loehmann's Holdings Corporate Monthly Operating Report for November 2010 filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
290 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Payment of Administrative Expenses for Toys R Us, Inc., Other Professional, period: 11/15/2010 to 12/13/2010, fee:$0, expenses: $110449.13. filed by Karen L. Gilman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Gilman, Karen) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
289 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Publication /(Hearing Date: 2/7/11 at 9:45 AM) Certification of Publication of Notice of (A) The Solicitation and Voting Procedures and (B) The Objection Deadline and Confirmation Hearing with Respect to the Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 268 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
288 |
Filed: 1/18/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:COCONUT GROVE PADS INC(Amount 14682.50).. To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
287 |
Filed: 1/14/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 1/14/2011 Between the Debtors and Marissa Tait to Lift the Automatic Stay. (related document(s) 227 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/14/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
286 |
Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance of CSG Enterprises filed by Joel M. Shafferman on behalf of CSG Enterprises. (Shafferman, Joel) (Entered: 01/12/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
285 |
Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /(CONFIRMATION HEARING DATE: 2/7/2011 at 9:45 a.m.) Notice of Confirmation Hearing (related document(s) 281 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 2/7/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
284 |
Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:GORJANA(Amount 11,084).. To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
283 |
Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Tedd S. Levine on behalf of Tri-Coastal Design Group, Inc.. (Levine, Tedd) (Entered: 01/11/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
282 |
Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Franshaw, Inc.(Amount 9,456.00).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
281 |
Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Notice of Filing of Amended Disclosure Statement for Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 268 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Solicitation Version of Disclosure Statement) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
280 |
Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of the Debtors Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
279 |
Filed: 1/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Motion of Loehmanns Operating Co. for Order Pursuant to § 365(d)(5) Extending Time to Perform Under Pre-Petition Lease and License Financing and Purchase Option Agreement with Loehmanns Capital Corp. and Amended Order (related document(s) 275 , 272 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
278 |
Filed: 1/9/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Deadline to File Proofs of Claim on or Before January 21, 2010 (related document(s) 199 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
277 |
Filed: 1/9/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing re: Debtors Motion For Entry of an Order: (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement; (B) Approving Certain Dates Related to Confirmation of the Plan; (C) Approving Certain Voting Procedures and the Form of Certain Documents to be Distributed in Connection with Solicitation of the Plan; (D) Approving Proposed Voting and General Tabulation Procedures; and (E) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Subscription Form (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
276 |
Filed: 1/9/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 147 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
275 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Order Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 9007 Scheduling A Hearing, Approving Form And Manner Of Notice And Establishing ADeadline For Objections To Debtors Motion To ExtendTime To Perform Under Pre-Petition Personal Property Lease signed on 1/7/2011. (related document(s) 274 , 273 ) with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
274 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Ex Parte Motion of the Debtors For Entry of an Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9007 Scheduling a Hearing, Approving Form and Manner of Notice and Establishing a Deadline for Objections to Debtors' Motion to Extend Time to Perform Under Pre-Petition Personal Property Lease(Related Doc # 273 ) signed on 1/7/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
273 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve / Ex Parte Motion of the Debtors For Entry of an Order Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9007 Scheduling a Hearing, Approving Form and Manner of Notice and Establishing a Deadline for Objections to Debtors' Motion to Extend Time to Perform Under Pre-Petition Personal Property Lease filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
272 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Time /(PROPOSED HEARING DATE: 1/20/2011 at 2:00 p.m.; OBJECTION DEADLINE 1/18/2011) Motion of Loehmann's Operating Co. For Order Pursuant to Section 365(d)(5) Extending Time to Perform Under Pre-Petition Lease and License Financing and Purchase Option Agreement With Loehmann's Capital Corp. filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/20/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 1/18/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
271 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan (related document(s) 246 ) filed by Mark Edwin Browning on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Browning, Mark) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
270 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
269 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT # 271 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan (related document(s) 246 ) filed by Mark Edwin Browning on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts. (Browning, Mark) Modified on 1/7/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
268 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Corrected Order Approving Disclosure Statement signed on 1/7/2011 with Confirmation Hearing to Take Place on 2/7/2011 at 9:45 AM. (related document(s) 246 ) (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
267 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:BABY STEPS INC(Amount 19,274.97).. To TRC OPTIMUM FUND LLC. filed by TR CAPITAL MANAGEMENT, LLC.(Ross, Terrel) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
266 |
Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED, SEE DOCUMENT # 268 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Order Approving Disclosure Statement signed on 1/7/2011 with Confirmation Hearing to Take Place on 2/7/2011 at 9:45 AM. (related document(s) 246 ) (Blum, Helene) Modified on 1/7/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 01/07/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
265 |
Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Fresh Laundry(Amount 6,373.72).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
264 |
Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing Debtors to Maintain Existing Insurance Policies and Pay All Policy Premiums and Broker's Fees Arising Thereunder or in Connection Therewith (Related Doc # 9 ) signed on 1/6/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
263 |
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Shawn M. Christianson on behalf of Oracle America, Inc.. (Christianson, Shawn) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
262 |
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:The Sak(Amount 20,103.50).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
261 |
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:World Publications Group(Amount 8,874.90).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
260 |
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365(a) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6006, Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property and Notice Of Deadline Requiring Filing Of Proofs of Claim On or Before January 21, 2011 (related document(s) 255 , 199 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
259 |
Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Juandisha Harris on behalf of State Of Michigan, Department Of Treasury. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Harris, Juandisha) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
258 |
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Style Bilt Jewelry Case(Amount 5,010.01).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
257 |
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Publication /Certification of Publication of Notice of Deadline Requiring Filing of Proofs of Claim on or Before January 21, 2011 at 5:00 PM (related document(s) 199 , 165 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
256 |
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Solicitation and Subscription Agent for the Debtors (Related Doc # 176 ) signed on 1/4/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
255 |
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing The Debtors To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases Of Nonresidential Real Property (Related Doc # 175 ) signed on 1/4/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
254 |
Filed: 1/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter for the change of address for the law firm of Proskauer Rose LLP filed by Richard J. Corbi on behalf of Crystal Financial, LLC. (Corbi, Richard) (Entered: 01/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
253 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda /Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for January 5, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
252 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /REDLINED Order: (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement; (B) Approving Certain Dates Related to Confirmation of Plan; (C) Approving Certain Voting Procedures and the Form of Certain Documents to be Distributed In Connection With the Solicitation of the Plan; (D) Approving Proposed Voting and General Tabulation Procedures; and (E) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Subscription Form (related document(s) 251 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
251 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Order: (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement; (B) Approving Certain Dates Related to Confirmation of Plan; (C) Approving Certain Voting Procedures and the Form of Certain Documents to be Distributed In Connection With the Solicitation of the Plan; (D) Approving Proposed Voting and General Tabulation Procedures; and (E) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Subscription Form filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
250 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 237 ) filed by Mark T. Power on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Service List))(Power, Mark) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
249 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /REDLINED Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 248 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
248 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan /Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
247 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement /REDLINED Disclosure Statement for Debtors' Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
246 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement For Debtors Second Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
245 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /Debtors' Omnibus Reply To Objections to Disclosure Statement For the Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization, Dated December 1, 2010 (related document(s) 216 , 237 , 113 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
244 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice William J. Levant (Related Doc # 232 ) signed on 1/3/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
243 |
Filed: 1/3/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DIPRI LLC(Claim No.100, Amount 25,942.50). To Pioneer Credit Opportunities Fund, LP. filed by Pioneer Funding Group, LLC.(Stein-Sapir, Adam) (Entered: 01/03/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
242 |
Filed: 12/31/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice Of Deadline Requiring Filing Of Proofs of Claim On or Before January 21, 2011 (related document(s) 199 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/31/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
241 |
Filed: 12/31/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order: (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement; (B) Approving Certain Dates Related to Confirmation of the Plan; (C) Approving Certain Voting Procedures and the Form of Certain Documents to be Distributed in Connection with Solicitation of the Plan; (D) Approving Proposed Voting and General Tabulation Procedures; and (E) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Subscription Form (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/31/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
240 |
Filed: 12/31/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 147 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/31/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served On or Before December 27, 2010 filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
238 |
Filed: 12/30/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Eligibility Certification filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/30/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
237 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Limited Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement; (B) Approving Certain Dates Related to Confirmation of the Plan; (C) Approving Certain Voting Procedures and the Form of Certain Documents to be Distributed in Connection with Solicitation of the Plan; (D) Approving Proposed Voting and General Tabulation Procedures; and (E) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Subscription Form (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
236 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Scalito Imports(Amount 4,110.00).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
235 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 234 ) filed by Arthur E. Rosenberg on behalf of WRC Properties, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Arthur) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
234 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Arthur E. Rosenberg on behalf of WRC Properties, Inc.. (Rosenberg, Arthur) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
233 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Between The Debtors and Marissa Tait to Lift the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 227 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
232 |
Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by William J. Levant on behalf of Fashion Center, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Levant, William) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
231 |
Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Stanrik Corporation(Amount 36,735.65).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
230 |
Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Rago Foundations, LLC(Claim No.58, Amount 880.00). To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
229 |
Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Rago Foundations, LLC(Amount 872.00).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Coralia Leets Design(Amount 28,509.00).. To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
227 |
Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment /(Presentment Date: 1/11/11 at 12:00 Noon Objection Deadline 1/11/11 at 11:00 A.M.) Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Between the Debtors and Marissa Tait to Lift the Automatic Stay filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with presentment to be held on 1/11/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 1/11/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Proposed Stipulation and Order)(Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
226 |
Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 219 , 221 , 220 , 222 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Service List)(Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
225 |
Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Stanrik Corporation(Claim No.38, Amount 48,790.00). To Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC. filed by Sierra Liquidity Fund, LLC.(Riley, James) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
224 |
Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit /Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Catherine A. Conway, on Behalf of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP (related document(s) 140 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Retention Questionaire)(Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
223 |
Filed: 12/24/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Presentment of Application Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(A) and 328(A) and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014 For An Order Authorizing The Debtors To Retain And Employ DJM Asset Management, LLC As Real Estate Consultant To The Debtors Effective As Of The Date Of The Services Agreement (related document(s) 218 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/24/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
222 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Application for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 327(A), 328(A) And 330, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(A) And 2016, and Local Bankr. Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 Authorizing the Retention of CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ, Inc. as Financial Advisors to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 221 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 1/19/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 1/12/2011, (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
221 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ / Application for an Order Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Section 327(A), 328(A) And 330, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(A) And 2016, and Local Bankr. Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 Authorizing the Retention of CBIZ Accounting, Tax & Advisory of New York, LLC and CBIZ, Inc. as Financial Advisors to the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. Responses due by 1/12/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Charles M. Berk# 2 Proposed Order) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
220 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Application for an Order Authorizing the Retention of Hahn & Hessen LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (related document(s) 219 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 1/19/2011 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 1/12/2011, (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
219 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ / Application for an Order Authorizing the Retention of Hahn & Hessen LLP as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. Responses due by 1/12/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mark T. Power# 2 Proposed Order) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
218 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ DJM Asset Management, LLC as Real Estate Consultant to the Debtors Effective as of the Date of the Services Agreement filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 1/6/2011, with presentment to be held on 1/6/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: DJM Agreement# 2 Exhibit B: Zimmer Affidavit# 3 Exhibit C: Proposed Order# 4 Pleading Notice of Presentment) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
217 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice Of Deadline Requiring Filing Of Proofs of Claim On or Before January 21, 2011 (related document(s) 199 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
216 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Regarding Disclosure Statement with Respect to The Joint Plan of Reorganization Dated December 1, 2010 (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Brian Shoichi Masumoto on behalf of United States Trustee. (Masumoto, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
215 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by William J. Robb on behalf of PRIMA III LLC. (Robb, William) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
214 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 209 ) filed by Lawrence R. Reich on behalf of White Plains Shopping Center Assoc. LLC. (Reich, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served December 20, 2010 (related document(s) 9 , 149 , 78 , 33 , 151 , 88 , 154 , 153 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
212 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order: (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement; (B) Approving Certain Dates Related to Confirmation of the Plan; (C) Approving Certain Voting Procedures and the Form of Certain Documents to be Distributed in Connection with Solicitation of the Plan; (D) Approving Proposed Voting and General Tabulation Procedures; and (E) Approving the Rights Offering Procedures and Subscription Form (related document(s) 189 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
211 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 147 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
210 |
Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing to Consider Approval of the Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
209 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 9010 filed by Lawrence R. Reich on behalf of Robert Orlofsky Realty Inc.. (Reich, Lawrence) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
208 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /REDLINED Debtors' First Amended Joint Plan Of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 206 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
207 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /REDLINED Disclosure Statement for Debtors' First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 205 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
206 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Proposed Chapter 11 Plan /Debtors' First Amended Joint Plan Of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 114 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/23/2010, (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
205 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement For Debtors' First Amended Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/23/2010, (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
204 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6006 Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts (related document(s) 198 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
203 |
Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6006 Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts (related document(s) 198 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
194 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
188 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 12/15/2010 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a)and 328(a), FED. R. BANKR. P. 2014(a), Authorizing The Debtors' Employment and Retention of Perella Weingberg Partners LP as Investment Bank and FinancialAdvisor to the Debtors NUNC PRO TUNC to the Petition Date.(Related Doc # 51 ) (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
187 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 12/15/2010 (I)Approving and Authorizing Assumption of Investment Agreement;(II)Approving the Transactions Contemplated Therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee and Expense Reimbursement, as Administrative Expense; and (III) Approving Debtors Entry Into Amended and Restated Restructuring Support Agreement. (Related Doc # 77 ) (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
186 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplemental Declaration of Lee Diercks Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746 and Bankruptcy Code Sections 327(a), 328(a) and 330, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a) and 2016 and Local Bankr. Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 In Support of Retention and Employment of Clear Thinking Group, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s) 181 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
185 |
Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 147 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
184 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Disclosure Statement for Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
183 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 365(d)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code to Extend the Period Within which the Debtors May Assume or Reject Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property (related document(s) 88 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
182 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 105 and 366 for an Order (A) Prohibiting Utilities from Alternating, Refusing or Discontinuing Service, (B) Deeming Utilities Adequately Assure of Future Performance, and (C) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment (related document(s) 47 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
181 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration /Supplemental Declaration of Lee Diercks Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1746 and Bankruptcy Code Sections 327(a), 328(a) and 330, Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a) and 2016 and Local Bankr. Rules 2014-1 and 2016-1 In Support of Retention and Employment of Clear Thinking Group, LLC as Financial Advisor to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s) 136 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
180 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Final Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363 And 364 and Rules 2002, 4001 And 9014 Of The Federal Rules Of BankruptcyProcedure (I) Authorizing Incurrence By The Debtors OfPostpetition Secured Indebtedness With Priority Over AllSecured Indebtedness And With Administrative Superpriority,(Ii) Granting Liens, (Iii) Authorizing Use Of Cash Collateral ByThe Debtors Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. § 363 And Providing ForAdequate Protection, And (Iv) Modifying The Automatic Stay signed on 12/14/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
179 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Michael D. Brofman on behalf of Lake Success Shopping Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Brofman, Michael) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
178 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Omnibus Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 and Fed R. Bankr. P. 6006 Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property and Application of the Debtors for an Order Authorizing and Approving the Retention of Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Solicitation and Subscription Agent for the Debtors (related document(s) 175 , 176 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
177 |
Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Final DIP Budget (related document(s) 149 ) filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Magaliff, Howard) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
176 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application to Employ Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC as Solicitation and Subscription Agent for the Debtors (Presentment Date: 12/27/10 at 12 Noon/Objetions Due: 12/27/10 at 11:00 AM) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. Responses due by 12/27/2010, with presentment to be held on 12/27/2010 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: KCC Solicitation Agreement# 2 Exhibit B: Kass Affidavit# 3 Exhibit C: Proposed Order# 4 Pleading Notice of Presentment) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
175 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize /(PRESEENTMENT DATE: 12/27/2010 at 12:00 Noon; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/27/2010 at 11:00 a.m.) Debtors' Omnibus Motion For An Order Pursuant To 11 U.S.C. Section 365 And Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6006 Authorizing The Debtors To Reject Certain Unexpired Leases Of Nonresidential Real Property filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Schedule# 2 Exhibit B-Melvin Declaration# 3 Exhibit C-Proposed Order# 4 Pleading Notice of Presentment) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
174 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers and Reservation of Rights filed by Neil E. Herman on behalf of Kimco Realty Corporation. (Herman, Neil) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
173 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Special Notice and Service of Papers filed by Karen L. Gilman on behalf of Toys "R" Us, Inc.. (Gilman, Karen) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
172 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for December 14, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
171 |
Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /(HEARING DATE: 12/14/2010 at 2:00 p.m.) Debtors' Response to Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors' Objection to Debtors' Application For Entry of an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 327(a) and 328(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a), Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Perella Weinberg Partners LP as Investment Bank and Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s) 51 , 168 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
170 |
Filed: 12/12/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Response /(Adjourned Hearing Date: 12/14/10 at 2:00 PM) Debtors' Response to Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Objection to Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving and Authorizing Assumption of Investment Agreement; (II) Approving the Transactions Contemplated therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee and Expense Reimbursement, as Administrative Expense; and (III) Approving Debtors' Entry Into Amended and Restated Restructuring Support Agreement (related document(s) 77 , 155 , 164 , 124 , 154 , 153 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/6/2010, (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/12/2010)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
169 |
Filed: 12/11/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Adjournment of Hearing to Consider Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving and Authorizing Assumption of Investment Agreement, (II) Approving the Transactions Contemplated Therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee and Expense Reimbursement, as Administrative Expense and (III) Approving Debtors' Entry Into Amended and Restated Restructuring Support Agreement; Debtors' Application for Order Pursuant to Section 502(b)(9) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3003(c)(3) Establishing the Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving the Form and Manner of Notice Thereof; and Notice of Adjournment of Hearing to Consider Debtors' Motion for a Final Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a), 363(b) and 503(b)(9) Requesting Authority to Honor Certain Undisputed Prepetition Obligations of Certain Essential Vendors Suppliers and Service Providers (related document(s) 166 , 164 , 165 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/11/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
168 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Limited Objection of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Debtors Application Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 327(a) And 328(a), Fed. R. Bankr. P. 2014(a), Authorizing The Employment And Retention Of Perella Weinberg Partners LP as Investment Bank and Financial Advisor to the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (related document(s) 51 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
167 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection / Limited Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Debtors Amended Motion for Entry of Final Order Approving Debtor-In-Possession Financing (related document(s) 149 , 20 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
166 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(ADJOURNED HEARING DATE: To Be Determined) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing to Consider Debtors' Motion for a Final Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105(a), 363(b) and 503(b)(9) Requesting Authority to Honor Certain Undisputed Prepetition Obligations of Certain Essential Vendors Suppliers and Service Providers (related document(s) 10 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
165 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Set Last Day to File Proofs of Claim /(PRESENTMENT DATE: 12/17/2010 at 12:00 Noon; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/17/2010 at 11:00 a.m.) Debtors' Application For Order Pursuant To Section 502(b)(9) Of The Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 3003(c)(3) Establishing The Deadline For Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving The Form and Manner of Notice Thereof filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Order# 2 Exhibit A-1# 3 Exhibit A-11# 4 Pleading Notice Of Presentment) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
164 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /(ADJOURNED HEARING DATE: 12/14/2010 at 2:00 p.m.) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing to Consider Debtors' Motion For An Order (I) Approving and Authorizing Assumption Of Investment Agreement, (II) Approving The Transactions Contemplated Therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee and Expense Reimbursement, As Administrative Expense and (III) Approving Debtors' Entry Into Amended And Restated Restructuring Support Agreement (related document(s) 77 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
163 |
Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 155 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
162 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Isidro N. Panizales re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 147 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Verified Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019 filed by Dustin Parker Branch on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America, Caruso Affiliated. (Branch, Dustin) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
160 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay (related document(s) 147 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
159 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission with Certificate of Service filed by James F. Coffey on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Coffey, James) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
158 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices Pursant to Bankruptcy Rule 202/Certificate of Service filed by James F. Coffey on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Coffey, James) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
157 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Re: Stacia A. Neeley (Related Doc # 146 ) signed on 12/9/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Documents Served December 8, 2010 (related document(s) 149 , 151 , 154 , 153 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: 12/9/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion For an Order (I) Approving and Authorizing Assumption of Investment Agreement; (II) Approving the Transactions Contemplated Therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee and Expense Reimbursement, as Administrative Expense; and (III) Approving Debtors Entry into Amended and Restated Restructuring Support Agreement (related document(s) 77 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 12/13/2010 at 08:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/09/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Joseph Melvin In Support of Debtors' Motion to Approve and Authorize Assumption of the Investment Agreement (related document(s) 77 , 124 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Richard J. Shinder In Support of Debtors' Motion To Approve and Authorize Assumption of the Investment Agreement (related document(s) 77 , 124 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices (related document(s) 148 ) filed by Frederick E. Schmidt on behalf of Scents of Worth, LLC. (Schmidt, Frederick) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
151 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing /(HEARING DATE: 12/14/2010 at 2:00 p.m.; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/10/2010 at 4:00 p.m.) Notice of Filing of Amendment to Debtors' Motion For Authority To Incure Postpetition Secured Indebtedness, To Approve Amended And Restated DIP Credit Agreement To Provide, Inter Alia, For A Junior Tranche Of Revolving Credit And Of Hearing (related document(s) 149 , 20 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/10/2010, (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
150 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Harlan Mitchell Lazarus on behalf of 1528 Chestnut LLC. (Lazarus, Harlan) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
149 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Motion to Authorize /(HEARING DATE: 12/14/2010 at 2:00 p.m.; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/10/2010 at 4:00 p.m.) Amendment to Debtors' Motion for Authority to Incur Postpetition Secured Indebtedness, To Approve Amended and Restated DIP Credit Agreement to Provide, Inter Alia, For A Junior Tranche of Revolving Credit filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Responses due by 12/10/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Amended and Restated DIP Credit Agreement# 2 Exhibit 2-Redlined Amended & Restated DIP Credit Agreement) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
- Attachment 1 Exhibit 1-Amended and Restated DIP Credit Agreement
- Attachment 2 Exhibit 2-Redlined Amended & Restated DIP Credit Agreement
|
|
|
 |
|
|
148 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance /Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by Frederick E. Schmidt on behalf of Scents of Worth, LLC. (Schmidt, Frederick) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
147 |
Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Meeting of Creditors / Notice of (i) Commencement of Chapter 11 Case; (ii) Meeting of Creditors Pursuant to Section 341 of the Bankruptcy Code; and (iii) Applicability of the Automatic Stay filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 1/10/2011 at 01:00 PM at 80 Broad St., 4th Floor, USTM. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Stacia A. Neeley filed by Robert L. LeHane on behalf of Developers Diversified Realty Corporation, General Growth Properties, Inc., Regency Centers L.P.. (LeHane, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
145 |
Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Verified Statement of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Robert L. LeHane on behalf of Developers Diversified Realty Corporation, General Growth Properties, Inc., Regency Centers L.P.. (LeHane, Robert) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
144 |
Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Orders Served December 6, 2010 (Docket Nos. 131, 132, 139 and 141) (related document(s) 132 , 141 , 139 , 131 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
143 |
Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Amended and Restated Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 365 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6006 Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property (related document(s) 78 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
142 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplement to Debtors' Motion for an Order (I) Approving and Authorizing Assumption of Investment Agreement; (II) Approving the Transactions Contemplated Therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee and Expense Reimbursement, as Administrative Expense; and (III) Approving Debtors' Entry Into Amended and Restated Restructuring Support Agreement and Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for December 6, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s) 126 , 124 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
141 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing (A) Continued Maintenance Of Existing Bank Accounts, (B) Continued Use Of Existing Business Forms, (C) Continued Use Of Existing Cash Management System, And (D) Administrative Expense Priority For Postpetition Intercompany Claim Pursuant To Section 364, 503(B)(1) And 507(A)(2) Of The Bankruptcy Code(Related Doc # 6 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
140 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing The Debtors To Employ Professionals Utilized In The Ordinary Course Of Business Nunc Pro Tunc To The Petition Date (Related Doc # 45 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
139 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Establishing Procedures For Interim Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Professionals(Related Doc # 44 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
138 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Togut, Segal & Segal LLP as Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors In Possession Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc # 48 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
137 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Troutman Sanders LLP As Special Counsel for the Debtors Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc # 49 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
136 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application to Employ Clear Thinking Group, LLC as Financial Advisors to the Debtors, Nunc Pro Tunc to the Petition Date (Related Doc # 50 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
135 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Authorizing Payment of Certain Customs Duties, Broker's Fees, Prepetition Shipping, Warehousing, and Delivery Charges (Related Doc # 8 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
134 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Authorizing, But Not Directing, the Debtors to Pay Certain Prepetition Taxes and Related Obligations (Related Doc # 22 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
133 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Authorizing Debtors to Return Goods; and (II) Establishing Procedures For Addressing Reclamation Demands (Related Doc # 46 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
132 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Motion Prohibiting Utilities From Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service, (B) Deeming Utilities Adequately Assured of Future Performance, and (C) Establishing Procedures For Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment (Related Doc # 47 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
131 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Debtors' Amended and Restated Motion for an Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 365 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 6006 Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property(Related Doc # 78 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
130 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Debtors' Motion Pursuant To Section 365(d)(4) Of The Bankruptcy Code To Extend The Period Within Which The Debtors May Assume Or Reject Unexpired Leases On Nonresidental Real Property(Related Doc # 88 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
129 |
Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Authorizing, But Not Directing, Debtors Inter Alia to Pay Prepetition Wages, Compensation, and Employee Benefits (Related Doc # 5 ) signed on 12/6/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
128 |
Filed: 12/5/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
(INCORRECT PDF FILE SUBMITTED) Affidavit of Service re: Supplement to Exhibit "E"--Liquidation Analysis re: Disclosure Statement for Debtors' Joint Plan of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code [Docket No. 113] and Proposed Agenda for Hearing Scheduled for December 6, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. (related document(s) 126 , 125 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) Modified on 12/6/2010 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 12/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
127 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing to Consider Approval of the Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
126 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda For Hearing Scheduled For December 6, 2010 at 9:45 a.m. filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/6/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
125 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /(Hearing Date: 1/5/11 at 2:00 PM/Objections Due: 12/23/10 at 4:00 PM) Supplement to Exhibit "E"--Liquidation Analysis (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/23/2010, (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
124 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /(HEARING DATE: 12/13/2010 8:45 a.m.; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/6/2010 at 4:00 p.m.) Supplement to Debtors' Motion For An Order (I) Approving And Authorizing Assumption Of Investment Agreement; (II) Approving The Transactions Contemplated Therein, Including Payment of Commitment Fee And Expense Reimbursement, As Administrative Expense; And (III) Approving Debtors' Entry Into Amended And Restated Restructuring Support Agreement (related document(s) 77 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/13/2010 at 08:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/6/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Amended & Restated Restructuring Support Agmt# 2 Exhibit 2-Redlined Amended & Restated Restructuring Support Agmt# 3 Exhibit 3-Amended & Restated Investment Commitment Ltr# 4 Exhibit 4-Redlined Amended & Restated Investment Commitment Ltr# 5 Exhibit 5-Proposed Order) (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
123 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Objection of Certain Utility Companies to the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105(a) and 366 for an Order (A) Prohibiting Utilities from Altering, Refusing or Discontinuing Service, (B) Deeming Utilities Adequately Assured of Future Performance, and (C) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment (related document(s) 99 ) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Commonwealth Edison Company, Connecticut Light and Power Company, Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Georgia Power Company, Jersey Central Power & Light Company, PECO Energy Company, Public Service Electric & Gas Company, Salt River Project, San Diego Gas & Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power, Yankee Gas Services Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Berman, Jessica) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion (related document(s) 88 ) filed by Mark A. Frankel on behalf of Treger Realty Co.. with hearing to be held on 12/6/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Frankel, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Order Signed on 12/3/2010 Extending Interim Financing Order and Adjourning Final Hearing. (related document(s) 76 ) Final Hearing to be held on 12/14/2010 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621. (REG) (Epps, Juanita) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
120 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 117 ) filed by Mark T. Power on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. (Power, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
119 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 97 ) filed by Mark T. Power on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. (Power, Mark) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
118 |
Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Hearing to Consider Approval of the Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
117 |
Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Limited Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to Debtors Motion for Entry of Final Order Approving Debtor-In-Possession Financing and Request for Adjournment of Final Hearing (related document(s) 20 ) filed by Mark S. Indelicato on behalf of The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc., et al.,. with hearing to be held on 12/6/2010 at 09:45 AM at Courtroom 621 (REG) (Indelicato, Mark) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
116 |
Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for Notice of Apperance on Behalf of Commerce-Halsey, LLC (related document(s) 111 ) filed by James B. Glucksman on behalf of Commerce-Halsey, LLC. (Glucksman, James) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
115 |
Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter Request for Special Notice filed by Ernie Zachary Park on behalf of The Irvine Company LLC. (White, Greg) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
114 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Proposed Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s) 113 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
113 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement /(HEARING DATE: 1/5/2011 at 2:00 p.m.; OBJECTION DEADLINE: 12/23/2010 at 4:00 p.m.) Disclosure Statement for Debtors' Joint Plan Of Reorganization Under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 1/5/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 621 (REG) Objections due by 12/23/2010, (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Notice of Disclosure Statement Hearing)(Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Proposed Order on Motion to Dismiss Briefing: filed by Philip D. Anker on behalf of Amalgamated Bank, BMO Nesbitt Burns, BMO Nesbitt Burns SA, BNP Paribas SEC Corp., Bank of Tokyo Mitsubishi, Barclays Capital Inc., Brown Brothers Harriman, Credit Suisse Securities US, Custodial Trust Company, DOFT & CO., Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities, Elisabeth H. Doft, Ferris, Baker Watts, JP Morgan Chase BK/IA, JP Morgan Securities, JPM BNK/CORR CL SVCS, Edward D. Jones, MJR Partners, Morgan Stanley & Co., Incorporated, National Financial Services, PNC BANK, N.A., RBC Dominion Securities, Scotia Capital, State Street Bank & Trust, Swiss American Securities, TD Waterhouse Canada, Union Bank of California NA. (Anker, Philip) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
111 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal re: Defendant Regions Bank filed by Sigmund S. Wissner-Gross on behalf of Edward S. Weisfelner, as Trustee of the LB Creditor Trust. (Wissner-Gross, Sigmund) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
110 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Case Management Order #1 signed on 12/1/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
109 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings on behalf of Andrew J. Annes (related document(s) 91 ) filed by Robert D. Tepper on behalf of Smithfield Properties XLIV, LLC by Mid-America Asset Management, Inc.. (Tepper, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
108 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Pleadings (related document(s) 90 ) filed by Robert D. Tepper on behalf of Smithfield Properties XLIV, LLC by Mid-America Asset Management, Inc.. (Tepper, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
107 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of William D. Freedman Under Rule 2016(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Section 329 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Troutman Sanders LLP. (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
106 |
Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re: Supplement to Debtors' Motion, Inter Alia, in Support of Entry of Final Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 105, 361, 362, 363 and 364 and Rules 2002, 4001 and 9014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Incur Postpetition Secured Indebtedness with Priority Over All Secured Indebtedness and with Administrative Superpriority, (II) Granting Liens, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 363 and Providing for Adequate Protection, and (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay (related document(s) 104 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Claims Agent.(Schepper, Christopher) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice re: Russell R. Johnson III (Related Doc # 98 ) signed on 11/30/2010. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
104 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Supplement to Debtors' Motion, Inter Alia, In Support of Entry of Final Order Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sections 105, 361, 362, 363 and 364 and Rules 2002, 4001 and 9014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure (i) Authorizing the Debtors to Incur Postpetition Secured Indebtedness with Priority Over All Secured Indebtedness and with Administrative Superpriority, (II) Granting Liens, (III) Authorizing the Debtors to Use Cash Collateral Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Section 363 and Providing for Adequate Protection, and (IV) Modifying Automatic Stay (related document(s) 20 ) filed by Frank A. Oswald on behalf of Loehmann's Holdings, Inc.. (Oswald, Frank) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
103 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance (Notice of Appearance and Request For Service of Notices And Papers together with Certificate Of Service) filed by Lawrence J. Kotler on behalf of Ansonia Commercial LLC. (Kotler, Lawrence) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Steven Taitz on behalf of KIR Torrance, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Taitz, Steven) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 98 , 100 , 99 ) filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Commonwealth Edison Company, Connecticut Light and Power Company, Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Georgia Power Company, Jersey Central Power & Light Company, PECO Energy Company, Public Service Electric & Gas Company, Salt River Project, San Diego Gas & Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power, Yankee Gas Services Company. (Berman, Jessica) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
100 |
Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement Verified Statement Pursuant to Rule 2019(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Jessica G. Berman on behalf of Commonwealth Edison Company, Connecticut Light and Power Company, Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Georgia Power Company, Jersey Central Power & Light Company, PECO Energy Company, Public Service Electric & Gas Company, Salt River Project, San Diego Gas & Electric Company, Southern California Edison Company, Virginia Electric and Power Company d/b/a Dominion Virginia Power, Yankee Gas Services Company. (Berman, Jessica) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|