Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
169 |
Filed: 12/3/2021, Entered: None |
? |
|
|
|
|
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20980 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Response of American Municipal Power, Inc. to the Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 20822 ) filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of American Municipal Power, Inc.. (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20979 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Adversary case 11-02779. Complaint against BNY Mellon Corporate Trustee Services Limited, Topaz Finance Limited as Issuer of Series 2005-2 . Nature(s) of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) Filed by Ralph I. Miller, Christopher J Cox, Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc. on behalf of Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc.. (Miller, Ralph) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20978 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:CItibank (Hong Kong) Limited(Claim No.55848, Amount 70,000). To Leo So Ping. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of CItibank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20977 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Two Hundred and Fourteenth Omnibus Objection to Disallow and Expunge Certain filed Proofs of Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20976 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration /Supplemental of Linda D. White Regarding Retention of SNR Denton US LLP as Special Counsel to The Debtors filed by Hugh M. McDonald on behalf of Special Counsel to the Debtors. (McDonald, Hugh) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20975 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Consent to Substitution of Counsel-Moses & Singer LLP for Bingham McCutcheon LLP filed by Alan Kolod on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Kolod, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20974 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Serengeti Opportunities MM L.P.(Claim No.66415, Amount 3,990,000.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20973 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security - (LBSF) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.18989, Amount 250,000.00). To GRF Master Fund II, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20972 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Serengeti Opportunities Partners LP(Claim No.66415, Amount 1,710,000.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20971 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security - (LBSF) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.18989, Amount 19,918,283.00). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20970 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.18986, Amount 250,000.00). To GRF Master Fund II, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20969 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Serengeti Opportunities MM L.P.(Claim No.66414, Amount 3,990,000.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20968 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices filed by Alan Kolod on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Kolod, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20967 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Serengeti Opportunities partners LP(Claim No.66414, Amount 1,710,000.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Ronald L. Cohen on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners, LLC.(Cohen, Ronald) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20966 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC(Claim No.18986, Amount 19,918,283.00). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20965 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security - (LCP) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67080, Amount 500,000.00). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20964 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security - (LCP) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67080, Amount 19,500,000.00). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20963 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67079, Amount 500,000.00). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20962 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/18/2011 Authorizing the Modification of the Procedures for Compensating and Reimbursing Krebsbach & Snyder, P.C. as Special Counsel, Effective as of July 1, 2011. (related document(s) 20312 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20961 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67079, Amount 19,500,000.00). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20960 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Preliminary Objection of Shinsei Bank, Limited to Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Lance Mulhern on behalf of Shinsei Bank, Limited. (Mulhern, Lance) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20959 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration : Notice of Fourteenth Supplemental Declaration of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC in Connection with Its Employment and Retention (related document(s) 2278 ) filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20958 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/18/2011 Admitting Mark S. Hersh to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 20955 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20957 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Allow Claims for Voting Purposes Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 3018 (Temporary) for Fontainebleau Las Vegas Holdings, LLC, Fontainebleau Las Vegas, LLC, Fontainebleau Las Vegas Capital Corp. Fontainebleau Las Vegas Retail Parent, LLC, and Fontainebleau Las Vegas Retail Mezzanine, LLC (related document(s) 20675 ) filed by Elena Paras Ketchum on behalf of Soneet R. Kapila. (Ketchum, Elena) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20956 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for the Forty Third Omnibus Hearing on October 19, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20955 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission : Motion Pursuant to Rule 2090-1(b) of the Local Rules of the United States Bankruptcy Court for the Southern District of New York for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Mark S. Hersh of Reed Smith LLP filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20954 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20953 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20952 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20951 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of the Reply of Deutsche Bank AG in Further Support of Motion Pursuant To Section 105(A) and Rule 3013 to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Correct Misclassification of Claims (related document(s) 20896 ) filed by Alan Kolod on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Kolod, Alan) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20950 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20949 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20948 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20947 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55817). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20946 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Status Report / Monthly Report Pursuant to Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 Authorizing the Establishment of Procedures to Terminate Unfunded Commitments and Restructure Corporate Loan Agreements filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20945 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 10/18/2011 Admitting Sunny J. Thompson to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. (Related Doc # 20357 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20944 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 26,000.00). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20943 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 31,000.00). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20942 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 83,000.00). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20941 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 1,174,000.00). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20940 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 154,000.00). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20939 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 469,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20938 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55817, Amount 63,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20937 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidix, LLP(Claim No.50357, Amount 4,664,116.50). To JPMChase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20936 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Second Revised Proposed Order Granting Insured Persons' Motion, Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code, for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policy (related document(s) 19488 ) filed by Brian E. Greer on behalf of Michael Ainslie, John F. Akers, Roger S. Berlind, Thomas H. Cruikshank, Marsha Johnson Evans, Sir Christopher Gent, Roland A. Hernandez, Henry Kaufman & John D. Macomber. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Revised Proposed Order - Clean# 2 Exhibit B - Marked Revised Proposed Order)(Greer, Brian) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20935 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Chase Lincoln First Commercial Corporation(Claim No. 67595). To Maximilian Partners, L.L.C.. filed by Philip Anthony Wells on behalf of Maximilian Partners, L.L.C..(Wells, Philip) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20934 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21557, Amount 627628.45). To CVI GVF (LUX) MASTER SARL. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Riehl, Abigail) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
20933 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21656, Amount 4419580.26); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21777, Amount 5661508.05); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21558, Amount 1026966.22); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21776, Amount 3779559.34); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21659, Amount 5650589.60); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21775, Amount 38562702.89); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21778, Amount 4194922.01); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21779, Amount 5830829.52); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21556, Amount 80798607.04); DEUTSCHE BANK AG, LONDON BRANCH(Claim No.21657, Amount 2883417.38). To CVI GVF (LUX) MASTER SARL. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Riehl, Abigail) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4462 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion For An Order To Schedule Hearing on "Customer" Issue As It Relates to ERISA (related document(s) 4432 ) filed by Marc J. Kurzman on behalf of Orthopaedic Specialty Group P.C. Plan Participants. Objections due by 10/19/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Plan Particpants# 2 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order (Blacklined)# 3 Exhibit Proposed Scheduling Order) (Kurzman, Marc) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4461 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 19, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 4458 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4460 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Deborah Rechler, Mitchell Rechler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4459 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Trustee's Determination of Claim filed by Helen Chaitman on behalf of Jacqueline Rechler, Mark Rechler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service) (Chaitman, Helen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4458 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda for Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 19, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (related document(s) 4376 , 4391 , 4389 , 4384 , 4381 , 4449 , 4386 , 4392 , 4451 , 4412 , 4385 , 4380 , 4387 , 4382 , 4388 , 4383 , 4450 , 4446 , 4379 , 4447 ) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4457 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/18/2011 Granting Trustees Motion to Retain Greenfield Stein & Senior, LLP as Special Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc as of 4/20/2011 (Related Doc # 4434 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2729 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Atif Khawaja in Support of the Debtors' Reply to the Objections of Partners Development, LLC (related document(s) 2727 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2728 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Craig H. Feldman in Support of the Debtors' Reply to the Objections of Partners Development, LLC (related document(s) 2727 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2727 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Opposition Brief /Debtors' Reply to Partners Development, LLC's (1) Objection to the Debtors' Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property; (2) Supplemental Objection to the Debtors' Third Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property; and (3) Second Supplemental Objection to the Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2528 , 2693 , 2066 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2726 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2725 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Craig H. Feldman in Support of the Debtors' Objection to the Motion of U.S. Bank, National Association for Allowance and Payment of Administrative Claim Pursuant to Secs. 365(d)(3) and 503 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2703 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2724 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Motion of Michaels Stores, Inc. for Order Directing Waldbaum, Inc. to Return Funds Improperly Paid to It (related document(s) 2723 ) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 11/7/2011, (Teele, Samuel) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2723 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Motion of Michaels Stores, Inc. for Order Directing Waldbaum, Inc. to Return Funds Improperly Paid to It filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 11/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 proposed Order) (Teele, Samuel) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2722 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Motion of Michaels Stores, Inc. for Order Directing Waldbaum, Inc. to Return Funds Improperly Paid Out (related document(s) 2721 ) filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Objections due by 11/7/2011, (Teele, Samuel) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2721 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Approve Motion of Michaels Stores, Inc. for Order Directing Waldbaum, Inc. to Return Funds Improperly Paid Out filed by Samuel Jason Teele on behalf of Michaels Stores, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Manhattan Courtroom 610 (RDD) Responses due by 11/7/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 proposed Order) (Teele, Samuel) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2720 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Amended Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Sweet Art Inc(Amount 2,314.93).. To Liquidity Solutions Inc.(related document(s) 1523 ) filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2719 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/18/2011 Granting Motion to (I) Shorten the Notice Period for the Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' (A) Issuance of a Replacement Letter of Credit and (B) Granting Related Related Relief and (II) Granting Related Relief. (Related Doc # 2713 ) (Webb, Lonnie) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2718 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration / Declaration of Frederic F. Brace in Support of Debtors' Fourth Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2656 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2717 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Scott C. Williams filed by Mark S. Gamell on behalf of Liberty Mutual Surety. (Gamell, Mark) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2716 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Dana S. Plon on behalf of Dana S. Plon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed order) (Plon, Dana) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2376 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Karotkin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2375 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/18/2011 Approving Consensual Extension of the Deadline Under section 365(d)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code. (Related Doc # 1596 1689 2070 ) (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2374 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Matthew G. Summers on behalf of Comcast Cable Communications Management, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement) (Summers, Matthew) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2373 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Nineteenth Omnibus Notice of Rejection of Executory Contracts (related document(s) 2363 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2372 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Debtors' (I) Objection to Motion of Credera Enterprises Company and Gencorp Technologies Inc. for Allowance and Payment of "Sale Period" Administrative Claim and (II) Cross-Motion for Reclassification of Amounts Asserted Therein (related document(s) 2355 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2371 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 10/18/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of of Anthony W. Clark, Esq. (Related Doc # 2357 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2370 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Debtors' Report on Chapter 11 Wind-Down Status filed by Stephen Karotkin on behalf of BB Liquidating Inc.. (Karotkin, Stephen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2206 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
So Ordered Stipulation and Agreed Order signed on 10/18/2011 Resolving Claims Filed by QWEST and Allowing Claims in an Agreed Upon Amount. (Philbert, Gemma) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1520 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Order Signed on 10/18/2011 Granting the Plan Administrator's and Plan Debtors' First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Further Adjourned Claims). (related document(s) 1407 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1519 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Agenda, Notice of Filing of Master Service List Dated October 17, 2011, Debtors' Post-Confirmation Quarterly Operating Report for the Period from 7/1/2011 to 9/30/2011 and Amended Agenda (related document(s) 1516 , 1515 , 1518 , 1514 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
340 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Fee Statement /Fourteenth Monthly Fee Statement Of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, Counsel For Debtors And Debtors In Possession, For Compensation For Services Rendered And For Reimbursement Of Expenses filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Greenberg Traurig, LLP. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
339 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Fee Statement /Fourteenth Statement Of Fees And Disbursements Of BDO Consulting Corporate Advisors, LLC For The Period September 1, 2011 Through September 30, 2011 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of BDO Consulting Corporate Advisors, LLC. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
240 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation / Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 107(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 Establishing Procedures for the Protection of Confidential Information (related document(s) 239 ) filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
239 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Presentment of Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 107(b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 Establishing Procedures for the Protection of Confidential Information filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. with presentment to be held on 10/21/2011 at 12:30 PM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) Objections due by 10/21/2011, (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
228 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter regarding the debtor's Distribution Plan filed by Dennis Fogarty. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
213 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by John Michael Register (Related Doc # 211 ) signed on 10/17/2011. (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
207 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Reject Lease or Executory Contract /Debtors Motion for an Order (A) Authorizing the Rejection of an Executory Contract with Ms. Catherine Schmidlein Pursuant to Sections 365 and 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 6006, and (B) Fixing a Bar Date for the Filing of Rejection Damages Claims filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Notice of Motion) (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 112 ) filed by Scott A Ziluck on behalf of Robert C Merton. (Ziluck, Scott) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Notice of Appearance Joint Verified Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019(a) filed by Joseph B. Koczko on behalf of Clodagh Blake, Francis Brennan, Brendan Butler, Bernadette Cavanagh, Charles Cavanagh, Damien Christie, Stephen Church, David Coen, Iain Craig, Gordon D'Arcy, Catherine Day, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Aine Meagher, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Carmel Kidney, Phil Dillon, Patrick Donovan, Aiden Gallagher, Gill Hess LTD. SSAP, Gill Hess Ltd.-Simon Hess SSAP, Dominick Glennane, Tom Hayes, John Hogan, Horan Developments Ltd, I.M. Ltd. Pension Scheme, Mary Judge, Paddy Judge, Albert Kidney, Carmel Kidney, Declan Kidney, Liam Kidney, Emma Loughnane, Stephen Mackey, Deirdre Madden, Paul Madden, Michael Mehigan, Ann Murphy, Frank Murphy, Gerardina Murphy, Joe Murphy, Sean Murphy, Frank Murray, Adrian O'Connor, Breda O'Kennedy, Brian O'Kennedy, Eamonn O'Kennedy, Maeve O'Kennedy, Annette O'Neill, Rita Fagan SSAP, Gregor Shanik, Amelia Smith, The Astech Pension Fund, Brian Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B - Part 1# 3 Exhibit B - Part 2# 4 Exhibit B - Part 3)(Koczko, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Notice of Appearance Joint Verified Statement Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019(a) filed by Joseph B. Koczko on behalf of Clodagh Blake, Francis Brennan, Brendan Butler, Bernadette Cavanagh, Charles Cavanagh, Damien Christie, Stephen Church, David Coen, Iain Craig, Gordon D'Arcy, Catherine Day, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Aine Meagher, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Carmel Kidney, Phil Dillon, Patrick Donovan, Aiden Gallagher, Gill Hess LTD. SSAP, Gill Hess Ltd.-Simon Hess SSAP, Dominick Glennane, Tom Hayes, John Hogan, Horan Developments Ltd, I.M. Ltd. Pension Scheme, Mary Judge, Paddy Judge, Albert Kidney, Carmel Kidney, Declan Kidney, Liam Kidney, Emma Loughnane, Stephen Mackey, Deirdre Madden, Paul Madden, Michael Mehigan, Ann Murphy, Frank Murphy, Gerardina Murphy, Joe Murphy, Sean Murphy, Frank Murray, Adrian O'Connor, Breda O'Kennedy, Brian O'Kennedy, Eamonn O'Kennedy, Maeve O'Kennedy, Annette O'Neill, Rita Fagan SSAP, Gregor Shanik, Amelia Smith, The Astech Pension Fund, Brian Walsh. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Main Document)(Koczko, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Amended Notice of Appearance filed by Joseph B. Koczko on behalf of Clodagh Blake, Francis Brennan, Brendan Butler, Bernadette Cavanagh, Charles Cavanagh, Damien Christie, Stephen Church, David Coen, Iain Craig, Gordon D'Arcy, Catherine Day, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Aine Meagher, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Carmel Kidney, Phil Dillon, Patrick Donovan, Fuerta Property Limited, Aiden Gallagher, Gill Hess LTD. SSAP, Gill Hess Ltd.-Simon Hess SSAP, Dominick Glennane, Tom Hayes, John Hogan, Horan Developments Ltd, I.M. Ltd. Pension Scheme, Mary Judge, Paddy Judge, Albert Kidney, Carmel Kidney, Declan Kidney, Liam Kidney, Emma Loughnane, Stephen Mackey, Deirdre Madden, Paul Madden. (Koczko, Joseph) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of David C. Cooper of the Debtor's (i) Objection to Motion of First Manhattan Developments REIT to Excuse Receiver from Requirements Imposed by Section 543(a) and (b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and (ii) Reply to Objection of First Manhattan Developments REIT to Debtor's Motion to Compel Receiver to Comply with Sections 543(a) and (b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Granting Related Relief and Approving Property Management Agreement (related document(s) 61 ) filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
61 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection : Debtor's (i) Objection to Motion of First Manhattan Developments REIT to Excuse Receiver from Requirements Imposed by Section 543(a) and (b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code and (ii) Reply to Objection of First Manhattan Developments REIT to Debtor's Motion to Compel Receiver to Comply with Sections 543(a) and (b) of the Bankruptcy Code and Granting Related Relief and Approving Property Management Agreement (related document(s) 7 , 42 , 54 ) filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to June 27, 2012 filed by Timothy S. Pfeifer on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Pfeifer, Timothy) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order signed on 10/18/2011. Case Management Conference Scheduled for 10/25/2011 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 501. (related document(s) 26 ) (Tetzlaff, Deanna) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation Adjourning Pre-Trial Conference and Extending Time to Respond filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC, and Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Andrew J. Ehrlich (related document(s) 11 ) filed by Andrew J. Ehrlich on behalf of Inter Investissements S.A. (f/k/a Inter Conseil S.A.). (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel filed by Andrew J. Ehrlich on behalf of Inter Investissements S.A. (f/k/a Inter Conseil S.A.). (Ehrlich, Andrew) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Upon Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Upon Inter Investissements S.A. (related document(s) 1 , 4 , 6 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: None |
|
|
Complaint against Oreades SICAV represented by its Liquidator Inter Investissements S.A., Inter Investissements S.A. (f/k/a Inter Conseil S.A.), BNP Paribas Investment Partners Luxembourg S.A. (f/k/a BNP Paribas Asset Management Luxembourg S.A., f/k/a Parvest Investment Management Company S.A.), BGL BNP Paribas S.A., BNP Paribas Securities Services S.A. . Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Deborah H. Renner, Deborah H. Renner on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Renner, Deborah) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |