Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Access Management Luxembourg SA , Defendant Officially listed as "Access Management Luxembourg SA (f/k/a Access International Advisors Luxembourg) SA) as represented by its Liquidator Maitre Ferdinand Entringer"
Claudine Magon de la Villehuchet , Defendant Officially listed as "Claudine Magon de la Villehuchet (a/k/a Claudine de la Villehuchet) individually as the sole beneficiary under the Will of Thierry Magon de la Villehuchet (a/k/a Rene Thierry de la Villehuchet)"
So Ordered Order Signed On 12/10/2014, Re: Concerning Further Proceedings On Extraterritoriality Motion And Trustees Omnibus Motion For Leave To Replead And For Limited Discovery (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 12/18/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)94) Filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery and Opportunity for Hearing (related document(s)85) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with presentment to be held on 12/10/2014 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) Objections due by 12/5/2014, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A # 2 Exhibit B)(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)92) filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
Statement /Trustee's Statement Regarding Amendments to Exhibits to Proposed Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery (related document(s)85) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/18/2014)
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Response to Limited Objections to Proposed Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery (related document(s)90) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
Response - Trustee's Response to Limited Objections to Proposed Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery (related document(s)85) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 11/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)88) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/10/2014)
Notice of Hearing on Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery and Opportunity for Hearing (related document(s)85) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 11/19/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/07/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to December 19, 2014 and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to April 29, 2015 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)85) filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/24/2014)
Notice of Presentment of Order Concerning Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion and Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery and Opportunity for Hearing filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/23/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)83) filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and for Limited Discovery filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 10/21/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)81) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/08/2014)
Letter /October 2, 2014 Letter to Judge Bernstein regarding Trustee's Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead and Defendants' Request for Further Proceedings on Extraterritoriality Motion (related document(s)77) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 10/02/2014)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)79, 78, 77) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/02/2014)
Declaration of Regina Griffin in Support of the Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and Court Order Authorizing Limited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) (related document(s)78, 77) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. with hearing to be held on 10/22/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit A # 3 Exhibit B # 4 Exhibit C # 5 Exhibit D # 6 Exhibit E) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Memorandum of Law /Trustee's Memorandum of Law in Support of Omnibus Motion for Leave to Replead Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and Court Order Authorizing Limited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) (related document(s)77) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Motion to Allow/Notice of Motion for Leave to Replead Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a) and Court Order Authorizing Limited Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff with hearing to be held on 10/22/2014 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to October 30, 2014 and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to March 25, 2015 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to December 17, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 06/27/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to November 19, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference to October 29, 2014 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss to March 26, 2014 (related document(s)67) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/11/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss to March 26, 2014 filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/09/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference Rescheduled to December 18, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 06/19/2013)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)63) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)59) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/16/2012 RE: Order to Show Cause whu defendatns should not be required to make expedited limited initial disclosures or to provide immediate notice of certain adversary proceedings. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 12/11/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/19/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 10/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/15/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 12/11/2012. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
Stipulation Extending Time to Respond and Adjourning the Pre-Trial Conference filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 05/30/2012 10:06AM RE: Order to show cause why defendants should not be required to make expedited limited initial disclosures or to provide immediate notice of certain adversary proceedings. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/27/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 41). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/5/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 9/19/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 10/1/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/27/2012. (Ortiz, Carmen) (Entered: 08/29/2012)
Stipulation filed by Regina Griffin on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Griffin, Regina) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
Affidavit of Service of Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustee's Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)53) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
Notice of Withdrawal / Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustee's Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)47) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)51) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Notice of Hearing / Notice of Continued Hearing for Matters Scheduled to be Heard on May 30, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)49) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Notice of Hearing /Notice of Continued Hearing filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/17/2012)
Affidavit of Service of Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)47) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
Notice of Withdrawal / Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)41) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)43) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Certificate of Service (related document(s)44) filed by Joanna Shally on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Shally, Joanna) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Objection to Motion /JOINDER BY SPANISH BANK DEFENDANTS IN OPPOSITION TO THE TRUSTEES APPLICATION TO REQUIRE DEFENDANTS TO MAKE EXPEDITED DISCLOSURE OF THE IDENTITY AND ADDRESSES OF CUSTOMERS AND FORMER CUSTOMERS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, TO PROVIDE CERTAIN NOTICES TO THOSE CUSTOMERS AND FORMER CUSTOMERS (related document(s)37) filed by Joanna Shally on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. with hearing to be held on 5/16/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 5/14/2012, (Shally, Joanna) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
Notice of Withdrawal /Limited Notice of Withdrawal of Trustees Application Seeking Entry of Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures or Provide Immediate Notice (related document(s)40) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/11/2012)
Affidavit of Service Order To Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Required To Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures Or To Provide Immediate Notice Of Certain Adversary Proceedings entered by the Court on May 8, 2012 (related document(s)38, 37, 41, 39, 40) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Order signed on 5/8/2012 to show cause why defendants should not be required to make expedited limited initial disclosures or to provide immediate notice of certain adversary proceedings with hearing to be held on 5/16/2012 at 10:00AM in courtroom 623. (BRL) (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Notice of Proposed Order /[Proposed] Order To Show Cause Why Defendants Should Not Be Required To Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures Or To Provide Immediate Notice Of Certain Adversary Proceedings (related document(s)37) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
Affidavit /Affidavit of Torello H. Calvani in Support of the Trustees Application by Way of Order to Show Cause Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures, Or to Provide Immediate Notice of Certain Adversary Proceedings (related document(s)37) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Memorandum of Law /Memorandum of Law in Support of Trustees Application by Way of Order to Show Cause Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures, Or to Provide Immediate Notice of Certain Adversary Proceedings (related document(s)37) filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit C# 3 Exhibit D) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Motion to Approve /Application by Way of Order to Show Cause Seeking Entry of an Order Directing Defendants to Make Expedited Limited Initial Disclosures, Or to Provide Immediate Notice of Certain Adversary Proceedings filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Proposed Order to Show Cause) (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 05/07/2012)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)35) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motion to Dismiss filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Murphy, Keith) (Entered: 02/07/2012)
Stipulation filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
Stipulation / Stipulation with BBVA Setting Briefing Schedule and Adjourning Pretrial Conference to June 27, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1107100 (related document(s)28) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Memorandum of Law /Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Reference (related document(s)28) filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Declaration /Declaration of Joanna Shally In Support of Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Reference (related document(s)28) filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Exhibit E6 Exhibit F) (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Motion to Withdraw the Reference /Notice of Defendant's Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 10/07/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s)22, 23, 21) filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
Memorandum of Law In Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)21) filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Declaration of Joanna Shally in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (related document(s)21) filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. with hearing to be held on 2/15/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Attachments: 1 Exhibit A2 Exhibit B3 Exhibit C4 Exhibit D5 Exhibit E6 Exhibit F7 Exhibit G8 Exhibit H9 Exhibit I10 Exhibit J11 Exhibit K12 Exhibit L13 Exhibit M14 Exhibit N15 Exhibit O16 Exhibit P17 Exhibit Q18 Exhibit R19 Exhibit S) (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (related document(s)1) filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. with hearing to be held on 2/15/2012 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) (Kafele, Heather) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference Rescheduled to January 25, 2012 at 10:00 a.m. filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
Corporate Ownership Statement . Corporate parents added to case: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. filed by Sean G. Arthurs on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. (Arthurs, Sean) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Stipulation / Stipulation filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 06/21/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint Upon Banco Bilboa Vizcaya Argentaria, SA c/o Mr. Adolfo Fraguas Bachiller (related document(s)7, 1, 10) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 05/25/2011)
Affidavit of Service Amended Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2, 7, 10) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint upon Banco Bilboa Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. (related document(s)7, 1, 10) filed by Geraldine E. Ponto on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Ponto, Geraldine) (Entered: 04/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to September 27, 2011 (related document(s)13) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of the Pre-Trial Conference to September 27, 2011 filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation signed on 4/4/2011 Between Trustee Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff and Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. RE: Extending Defendant's Time to Answer and Waiving Service of the Summons. (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s)2, 10) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. Answer Due: 4/8/2011. Filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. with Pre-Trial Conference set for 4/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 623 (BRL), (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 03/09/2011)
Order signed on 3/4/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Sean G. Arthurs, Esq. (Related Doc # 6). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Order signed on 3/4/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Heather Lamberg Kafele, Esq. (Related Doc # 5). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
Order Extending The Time For Proper Service Of A Summons And The Time For A Defendant To Serve An Answer Under Rules 7004(E) And 7012(A) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure (Related Doc # 4) signed on 3/3/2011. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Sean G. Arthurs on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. Filing fee collected, receipt #185940. (Cappiello, Karen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Heather Lamberg Kafele on behalf of Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A.. Filing fee collected, receipt #185941. (Cappiello, Karen) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
Notice of Presentment Of Trustee's Motion For An Order Extending The Time For Proper Service Of A Summons And The Time For Defendant To Serve An Answer Under Rules 7004(E) And 7012(A) Of The Federal Rules Of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. with presentment to be held on 3/2/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 623 (BRL) Objections due by 3/2/2011, (Attachments: 1 Motion to Extend2 Proposed Order)(Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
Statement with Complaint( Filed Under Seal) (related document(s)1) filed by Keith R. Murphy on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Chou, Rosalyn) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
(This document is unsealed pursuant to an order signed on 02/22/2011 and is now available for view, see document no. 3) Complaint against Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A. Nature(s) of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and Bernard L. Madoff. (Murphy, Keith) Modified on 2/22/2011 (Bush, Brent) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19187 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19189 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 19194 ) filed by Aaron M. Klein on behalf of CarVal Investors UK Limited. (Klein, Aaron) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19036 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19119 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19097 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
First Application for Interim Professional Compensation / First Interim Application for the Eighth Interim Application Period of Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for Locke Lord Bissel & Liddell LLP, Special Counsel, period: 7/1/2010 to 5/31/2011, fee:$1,242,675.11, expenses: $106,574.87. filed by Locke Lord Bissel & Liddell LLP. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Section 327(e) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Expand the Scope of Their Retention of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP as Special Counsel, Nunc Pro Tunc to September 18, 2009 filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Application of the Debtors Pursuant to Sections 327(e) And 328(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 2014(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure for Authorization to Employ and Retain Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP, as Special Counsel to the Debtors in Connection with Certain Tax Related Matters filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidx Limited(Claim No.47110, Amount 589,341.50). To Dungan Partners, LP. filed by Dungan Partners, LP.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Omnibus Transfer of Claim Other Than For Securit (Claim No's.: 57621, 57624, 57625, 57626, 57629, 57632, 57668, 57670, 57671, 57673, 57674, 57677, 57678, 57680, 57681, 57683, 57684, 57686, 57688, 57690, 57691, and 57693) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:BPI Vida e Pensoes(Amount 2,220,000.00).. To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Societe Generale Bank & Trust, Singapore Branch(Claim No.62901, Amount 2,300,000.00). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Statement of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors In Support of the Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 6004 for Authorization to (i) Enter into an Asset Management Agreement for the Management of the Debtors Commercial Loan Portfolio and (ii) Sell Commercial Loans to Special Purpose Entities in Connection with the Issuance of Collateralized Loan Obligations (related document(s) 18810 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citibank International PLC Greece Branch(Claim No.55396, Amount 4,924,041.40). To Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing (related document(s) 11513 ) filed by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Third Application for Interim Professional Compensation for MMOR Consulting Inc., Other Professional, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$215,242.50, expenses: $2,860.27. filed by MMOR Consulting Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Statement Joint Statement in Support of Approval of Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors (related document(s) 18205 ) filed by Steven B. Levine on behalf of Various LBT Noteholders. (Levine, Steven) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Eighth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Ernst & Young LLP, Auditor, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$3,875.00, expenses: $0.00. filed by Ernst & Young LLP. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Fourth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Dechert LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$1,548,892.25, expenses: $37,766.05. filed by Dechert LLP. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Eighth Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Reilly Pozner LLP, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$1,171,284.50, expenses: $88,819.63. filed by Reilly Pozner LLP. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 19162 ) filed by Joshua W. Cohen on behalf of Fidelity National Title Insurance Company. (Cohen, Joshua) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Fifth Application for Interim Professional Compensation / Fifth Interim Application of Kleyr Grasso Associes, Special Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession, for Allowance of Compensation for services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses for the Period from February 1, 2011 Through May 31, 2011 for Kleyr Grasso Associes, Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 5/31/2011, fee:$250,153.93, expenses: $2,087.87. filed by Kleyr Grasso Associes. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Response to Motion /Response Of QVT Fund LP & Quintessence Fund LP To Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Valued Derivative Claims- Claim Nos. 20421, 21138, 21139, 21140, 21144, 21145, 21146, 21202, 21205, 21217, 21222 and 21225) (related document(s) 17468 ) filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of Quintessence Fund L.P.. (Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Response to Motion /Response Of QVT Fund LP & Quintessence Fund LP To Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection To Claims (Valued Derivative Claims- Claim Nos. 20421, 21138, 21139, 21140, 21144, 21145, 21146, 21202, 21205, 21217, 21222 and 21225) (related document(s) 17468 ) filed by Christopher R. Donoho III on behalf of QVT Fund LP. (Donoho, Christopher) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Letter to Honorable James M. Peck Regarding Twenty-First ADR Status Report filed by Peter Gruenberger on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Gruenberger, Peter) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation and Order Regarding Withdrawal of: (I) Claims Filed By Thomas H. Lee and its Affiliates; and (II) Plan Administrator's Objection Thereto filed by Steven Wilamowsky on behalf of Plan Administrator, Plan Administrator of Refco Capital Markets, Ltd.. with presentment to be held on 8/19/2011 (check with court for location) (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation and Proposed Order)(Wilamowsky, Steven) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1100277 (related document(s) 4203 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1100265 (related document(s) 4169 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Ex Parte Motion to Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Settlement Agreement With OfficeMax, Inc. Under Seal (related document(s) 2332 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement With OfficeMax, Inc. filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 8/22/2011, (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Proposed Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 16, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. prevailing Eastern Time filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Statement / Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit to the Proposed Order Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Authorizing and Approving the Debtors (A) Assumption of Certain Insurance-Related Agreements and (B) Entry into Certain Renewal Insurance Agreements (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 2272 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Monthly Operating Report for the Period June 19, 2011 to July 16, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Statement Notice of Filing of Revised Exhibit to the Proposed Order Pursuant to Sections 105(A), 363(B) and 365(A) of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' (A) Assumption of Certain Insurance-Related Agreements and (B) Entry Into Certain Renewal Insurance Agreements (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 2272 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit B) (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by John M. Brickman on behalf of Cross-Path Realty LLC. (Brickman, John) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Certain Matters Previously Scheduled for Hearing on August 16, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. Prevailing Eastern Time filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Letter Re: Change Of Address for Technology Resource Center of America, LLC (TRCA), telephone Data Systems, L.P. (TDS), and Telecom Remarketing of America, L.P. filed by David Hager. (Greene, Chantel) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing filed by Kenneth B. Robinson on behalf of Atkinson, Diner, Stone, Mankuta & Ploucha, P,A.. with hearing to be held on 9/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) (Robinson, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Order signed on 8/10/2011 granting Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.'s motion seeking approval of the settlement agreement bretween Enron Creditors Recovery Corp. and Linda P. Lay (Related Doc # 79 ). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
Stipulation Setting a Briefing Schedule filed by David J. Sheehan on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Sheehan, David) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 09/07/2011)