Irving H. Picard, Esq., Trustee for the Substantively Consolidated SIPA Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC and the Estate of Bernard L. Madoff, Plaintiff
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Defendant Officially listed as "Credit Suisse Securities US, a/k/a Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC (as defined and named herein)"
Zenit SGR S.p.A, as successor by merger to Zenit Alternative Investment SGR S.p.A., acting in the name and on behalf of Zenit European Fund, formerly operating under the names of Zenit Advanced Strate, Defendant
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 08/31/2011 11:10AM RE: Notice of Hearing/Notice of Status Conference Scheduled for August 31, 2011 at 11:00 A.M.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 5/17/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 2). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 2/24/2012. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 3/9/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 3/19/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 5/17/2012. (Villegas, Carmen) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
(THIS TRANSCRIPT IS A DUPLICATE OF DOCUMENT #74)Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 10/06/2011 10:19AM RE: The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Innkeepers USA Trust, et al.'s Motion to Intervene in the Adversary Proceeding filed by Lorenzo Marinuzzi on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Innkeepers USA Trust, et al.. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/12/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 46). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/20/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/13/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/12/2012. (Villegas, Carmen) Modified on 3/12/2012 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 12/15/2011)
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on October 6, 2011 10:19 AM RE: Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Further Extending Time to File Notices of Removal of Actions filed by Jennifer Marines on behalf of Innkeepers USA Trust. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 3/12/2012. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Veritext Reporting Company.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 12/20/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 1/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 1/13/2012. Transcript access will be restricted through 3/12/2012. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 12/15/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20835 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20767 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20765 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Manners of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20891 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Granting Debtors' Motion for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Advancement of Defense Expenses Under the 2007-2008 Directors and Officers Insurance Policies by the Excess Policy Insurers. (Related Doc # 20323 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Granting the Debtors' Motion for Authorization to Implement 2012 Derivatives Incentive Program and Certain Related Relief. (Related Doc # 20370 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into Settlement with Bond Safeguard Insurance Company and Lexon Insurance Company. (Related Doc # 20355 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Approving the Termination of the Spruce CCS, Ltd. Securitization. (Related Doc # 20338 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Approving Settlement Agreement Among ESP Finding I Ltd., U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee, BNP Paribas, Natixis Financial Products LLC, Lehman Brothers Special Financing Inc., and Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Related Doc # 20356 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Granting Debtors' Motion for Authority to Enter Into Settlement with Arch Insurance Company. (Related Doc # 20369 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Authorizing Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. to Restructure Its Interests in Italian Real Estate Fund. (Related Doc # 20311 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Granting Debtors' Motion for Authorization to Grant Limited Releases to Certain Insurers Under the Directors and Officers Insurance Policies. (Related Doc # 20350 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Approving Settlement Agreement with Merrill Lynch International and Its Affiliates. (related document 20367 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Order Signed on 10/19/2011 Granting Insured Persons' Motion for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policy. (Related Doc # 19488 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Two Hundred Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Insufficient Documentation Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Compound Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing f Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Pension Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as an Equity Interest) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as an Equity Interest) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors One Hundred Thirty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as an Equity Interest) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as an Equity Interest) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as an Equity Interest) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20997 ) filed by Michael J. Venditto on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. (Venditto, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as an Equity Interest) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventeenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Eleventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Tenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Pension Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.11308, Amount 27,691,283.13). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.11308, Amount 2,775,480.91). To AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No.11307, Amount 133,771,696.30). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service Regarding Reponse Of Optique PTY LTD ATF Optique Super Pension Fund To Notice Of Proposed Claim Amount - Claim Number 5712 filed by Maria J. DiConza on behalf of Optique Pty Ltd ATF Optique Super Pension Fund. (DiConza, Maria) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No.11307, Amount 13,407,858.05). To AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No.11306, Amount 133,771,696.30). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley Capital Services LLC(Claim No.11306, Amount 13,407,858.05). To AG Super Fund International Partners, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.11305, Amount 27,691,283.13). To Botticelli, L.L.C.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC(Claim No.11305, Amount 2,775,480.91). To AG Super Fund International, L.P.. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citibank (Hong Kong) Limited(Claim No.55848, Amount 64,162.61). To J & A Co. Ltd.. filed by Douglas R. Davis on behalf of J & A Co. Ltd..(Davis, Douglas) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Response to Motion /Response of The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A., as Indenture Trustee, to Debtors One Hundred Ninety-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims filed by Michael J. Venditto on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, N.A.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 (check with court for location) (Venditto, Michael) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Response to Motion RESPONSE TO DEBTORS ONE HUNDRED NINETY FIRST OMNIBUS OBJECTION TO CLAIMS filed by Robert N. Michaelson on behalf of Washington State Tabacco Settlement Authority. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/19/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Michaelson, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 12548 on behalf of NTT Finance Corp., filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20854 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lee Wai Kin(Claim No.42105, Amount 200,000.00); Chan Kwok Woon Peter(Claim No.42109, Amount 100,000.00); Law Pui Yee(Claim No.42097, Amount 150,000.00). To Fubon Bank (Hong Kong) Limited. filed by Jeffrey D. Prol on behalf of Fubon Bank (Hong Kong) Limited.(Prol, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank Plc(Claim No.15804, Amount 19336363.56). To CVF Lux Master Sarl. filed by Carval Investors UK Limited.(Jacobsen, Annemarie) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Response of China Minsheng Banking Corp., Ltd. to Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) filed by Jonathan Chi-Shoong Cho on behalf of China Minsheng Banking Corp., Ltd.. (Chi-Shoong Cho, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20848 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20849 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Affidavit of Service of the Notice of Appearance and Request for Notices and Consent to Substitution of Counsel (Moses & Singer LLP for Bingham McCutcheon LLP) (related document(s) 20975 , 20968 ) filed by Alan Kolod on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG. (Kolod, Alan) (Entered: 10/19/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 30584 on behalf of U.S. Small Business Administration, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20825 ) filed by Mark A. Speiser on behalf of Mitsui Securities Co., Ltd.. (Speiser, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 22886, 23011, 23024 /Debtors' Objection to Claim Nos. 22886, 23011, 23024 (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claim) with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, filed by Lynn P. Harrison III on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc..(Harrison, Lynn) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and the Estate of Fannie Marie Gaines Providing for Limited Relief From the Automatic Stay filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 10/21/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/20/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Motion of Monti Family Holdings Company, Ltd for Leave to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery of Debtor Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc and Other Entities (related document(s) 16803 ) filed by Richard J. McCord on behalf of Monti Family Holding Company, Ltd. with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (McCord, Richard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20771 ) filed by Marilee P. Dahlman on behalf of GSO Special Situations Fund L.P. and GSO Special Situations Overseas Master Fund Ltd.. (Dahlman, Marilee) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Arab Banking Corporation (B.S.C.)(Claim No.14209, Amount 4297585). To The Royal Bank of Scotland plc. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of The Royal Bank of Scotland plc.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20749 ) filed by Marilee P. Dahlman on behalf of Stone Lion Portfolio L.P. and Permal Stone Lion Fund Ltd. (Dahlman, Marilee) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20748 ) filed by Marilee P. Dahlman on behalf of Stone Lion Portfolio L.P. and Permal Stone Lion Fund Ltd. (Dahlman, Marilee) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Arab Banking Corporation (B.S.C.)(Claim No.14208, Amount 4297585.00). To The Royal Bank of Scotland plc. filed by Paul N. Silverstein on behalf of The Royal Bank of Scotland plc.(Silverstein, Paul) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Connection With Debtors Motion For Approval of Settlement Agreements With (i) Bank of America, N.A. and (ii) Merrill Lynch International and Its Affiliates (related document(s) 20368 ) filed by James Tecce on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Tecce, James) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Certificate of Service of Ira M. Levee (related document(s) 20824 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. (Levee, Ira) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response to Motion and Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Ninty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims filed by Robert R. Rigolosi on behalf of Current Communications and Electric Corporation. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Affidavit of Service) (Rigolosi, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response to Motion Response of Mitsui Securities Co., Ltd. to Debtors' 188th Objection to Claims, with Respect to Claim No. 62852 (related document(s) 19871 ) filed by Mark A. Speiser on behalf of Mitsui Securities Co., Ltd.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/13/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Speiser, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response of Boilermakers-Blacksmith National Pension Trust Fund's Response to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability CNBS Claims) (related document(s) 19407 ) filed by Michael S. Etkin on behalf of Boilermaker-Blacksmith National Pension Trust. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Etkin, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Notice of Appearance filed by Robert R. Rigolosi on behalf of Current Communications and Electric Corporation. (Rigolosi, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response to Motion /Response of American Municipal Power, Inc. to the Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Michael G. Burke on behalf of American Municipal Power, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Derivative Questionnaire) (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response to Motion Response of Marquette Financial Companies to Debtors' One Hundred and Eighty Ninth Ominus Objection to Claims (No Liability Repo Claims) (related document(s) 19870 ) filed by Jessica Mikhailevich on behalf of Marquette Financial Companies. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Mikhailevich, Jessica) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS, AG(Claim No.59233, Amount 7,490,000.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response of Carol Bunevich to Debtors' One Hundred Ninety-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) and in Support of Order to Permit Late Filing of Her Proof of Claim Pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 9006(b)(1) filed by Sedgwick M. Jeanite on behalf of Carol Bunevich. (Jeanite, Sedgwick) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Lehman Brothers Japan Inc.(Claim No.62783, Amount 189,870.45). To Ibic Corporation. filed by Lorenzo Marinuzzi on behalf of Lehman Brothers Japan Inc..(Marinuzzi, Lorenzo) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Opposition to One Hundred Eighty Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) filed by Steve Jakubowski on behalf of Frank M. Paris. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Jakubowski, Steve) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred and Twentieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/16/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Opposition to One Hundred and Eighty Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) filed by Steve Jakubowski on behalf of Robert A. Schoellhorn Trust. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Jakubowski, Steve) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Opposition to One Hundred and Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Steve Jakubowski on behalf of Robert A. Schoellhorn Trust. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Jakubowski, Steve) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Bank Hapoalim (Switzerland) Ltd.(Claim No.55855, Amount 1,000,000). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:PNC Bank, National Association(Claim No.32088, Amount 3,622,608). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Opposition to Debtors Two Hundredth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s) 19921 ) filed by Buce J. Duke on behalf of Municipal Securities Rulemaking Board. (Duke, Buce) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Chenavari Financial Advisors Ltd.(Claim No.44553, Amount 8,934,554.39). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Iliquidix LLP(Claim No.44551, Amount 446,030.33). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Reply Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) Number: 17624 filed by Michael E. Grenert on behalf of James G. Lister. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1# 2 Errata Exhibit 2) (Grenert, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Illiquidix(Claim No.44504, Amount 354,775.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.66800, Amount 5,000,000.00). To MatlinPatterson Distressed Opportunities Master Ac. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of MatlinPatterson Distressed Opportunities Master Account, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.66799, Amount 5,000,000.00). To MatlinPatterson Distressed Opportunities Master Ac. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of MatlinPatterson Distressed Opportunities Master Account, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 20786 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Opposition Plaintiffs' Opposition to Debtor's Objection to Proofs of Claim (related document(s) 20100 , 20074 ) filed by Rene S. Roupinian on behalf of CYNTHIA SWABSIN. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Certificate of Service) (Roupinian, Rene) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Guernsey) Ltd.(Claim No.66572, Amount $100,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:The Orrington Plaus Fund SPC(Claim No.17167, Amount 1,281,895.69); The Orrington Plaus Fund SPC(Claim No.17168, Amount 1,281,895.69). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response of AllianceBernstein L.P. to Debtors' One Hudread Ninety-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) (related document(s) 19902 ) filed by Richard Steven Miller on behalf of AllianceBernstein L.P. as Investment Adviser to Philips Pension Trustees Limited. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/13/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C) (Miller, Richard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:ST. GALLER KANTONALBANK AG(Claim No. 39115). To BANK JULIUS BAER & CO. LTD.. filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of Bank Julius baer & Co. Ltd..(McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67586, Amount 333,774.76). To LMA SPC for and on behalf of MAP84 Segregated Port. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of LMA SPC for and on behalf of Map 84 Segregated Portfolio.(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Memorandum of Law /Memorandum of Law of Shell Trading (US) Company, Shell Trading International Limited and Shell International Eastern Trading Company in Opposition to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Sixth and One Hundred Eighty-Seventh Omnibus Objections to Claims (related document(s) 19816 , 19817 ) filed by Mark Sherrill on behalf of Shell International Eastern Trading Company, Shell Trading (US) Company, Shell Trading International Limited. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D) (Sherrill, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response to Motion /Response of Shell Trading (US) Company and Shell International Eastern Trading Company to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19817 ) filed by Mark Sherrill on behalf of Shell International Eastern Trading Company, Shell Trading (US) Company. (Sherrill, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response to Motion /Response of Shell Trading International Limited to Debtors' One Hundred Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Mark Sherrill on behalf of Shell Trading International Limited. (Sherrill, Mark) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Jamaica Money Market Brokers Limited(Claim No.47005, Amount 3,330,000). To J.P. Morgan Securities, Ltd.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities, Ltd..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:American National Insurance Company(Claim No.31991, Amount 2,350,000.00); American National Insurance Company(Claim No.32177, Amount 2,350,000.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Matrix : Notice of Filing of Updated Master Service List filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Response : Debtors' Objection to Plaintiffs' Motion for Relief From Stay (related document(s) 19591 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citibank, N.A.(Claim No.55393, Amount 500,000.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/13/2011)
Stipulation and Agreement Relating to the Classification of the Claim of OMX Timber Finance Investments II, LLC Under the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Motion for Omnibus Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Two Hundred Nineteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/11/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Statement of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors in Support of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 363(b)(1) of the Bankruptcy Code for Authorization to Implement 2012 Derivatives Incentive Program and Certain Related Relief (related document(s) 20371 , 20370 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Motion to Authorize / Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Pursuant to Section 365 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rules 6006 and 9014, for Authorization to Assume Amended Subordination, Non-Disturbance, and Attornment Agreement with the Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, L.L.C. filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 10/20/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #26689 from USB AG, Stamford Branch to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response to Motion / Response in Opposition to the Debtors One Hundred Eighty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Compound Claims) (related document(s) 19714 ) filed by Jason M. Karaffa on behalf of Scott Sheffer. (Karaffa, Jason) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Order signed on 10/12/2011 Authorizing Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. to File Exhibits to Motion of Assume Amended Subordination, Non-Disturbance and Attornment Agreement with the Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, L.L.C. Under Seal (Related Doc # 20773 ) . (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Notice of No Objection (related document(s) 19817 ) filed by David A. Rosenzweig on behalf of Federal Home Loan Bank of Dallas. (Rosenzweig, David) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Notice of Appearance and Demand for Service of Papers filed by Mark S. Lichtenstein on behalf of Ironbridge Property Owners Association. (Lichtenstein, Mark) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:HUIZINK, LIESBETH(Claim No.54541, Amount 307,076.70). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Incore Bank AG(Claim No.44889, Amount 269,299.82). To Liquidity Solutions Inc. filed by Liquidity Solutions, Inc..(DeYoung, Helena) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service by Alexa J. Loo (related document(s) 20738 , 20737 ) filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. (Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.54987, Amount 1,926,340.68). To Knighthead Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of Knighthead Master Fund, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Motion to File Under Seal / Motion Pursuant to Section 107 of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9018 for Authorization to File the Exhibits to Motion to Assume Amended Subordination, Non-Disturbance and Attornment Agreement with the Ritz-Carlton Hotel Company, L.L.C. Under Seal filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Constance Andonian (related document(s) 20762 ) filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Hunton & Williams LLP. (Rich, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Statement /Joinder to Motion of Deutsche Bank AG Pursuant to Section 105(A) and Rule 3013 to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Correct Misclassification of Claims (related document(s) 20321 ) filed by Marilee P. Dahlman on behalf of GSO Special Situations Fund L.P. and GSO Special Situations Overseas Master Fund Ltd.. (Dahlman, Marilee) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response to Motion Debtors One Hundred and Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Alexandra Kelly on behalf of AECO Gas Storage Partnership. (Kelly, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Statement /Joinder to Motion of Deutsche Bank AG Pursuant to Section 105(a) and Rule 3013 to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Correct Misclassification of Claims (related document(s) 20321 ) filed by Brent C. Strickland on behalf of Monarch Alternative Capital LP. (Strickland, Brent) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response to Motion / Debtors' Response and Objection to the Motion of Deutsche Bank AG Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 3013 of the Bankruptcy Rules to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Reclassify Claims (related document(s) 20321 ) filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) as to Certain Claimants (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response to Motion Reservation of Rights with respect to Debtors' One Hundred and Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Nava Hazan on behalf of Marie Papillon. (Hazan, Nava) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Opposition to Debtors' One Hundred and Seventieth Omnibus Objection filed on behalf of Jose I. Ildefonso and Mariana Aldaco Guerrero JTWROS (related document(s) 19388 ) filed by Joseph L. Fox on behalf of Jose Ildefonso. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service) (Fox, Joseph) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response to Motion /Hunton & Williams LLP's Response to Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Claims) (related document(s) 17478 ) filed by Robert A. Rich on behalf of Hunton & Williams LLP. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Rich, Robert) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Statement Joinder of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C. to Motion of Deutsche Bank AG Pursuant to Section 105(a) and Rule 3013 to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Correct Misclassification of Claim (related document(s) 20321 ) filed by Jessica Fainman on behalf of Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C.. (Fainman, Jessica) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Statement /Joinder of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC to the Motion of Deutsche Bank AG Pursuant to Section 105(A) and Rule 3013 to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Correct Misclassification of Claim (related document(s) 20321 ) filed by Philip Dublin on behalf of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Dublin, Philip) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC to Motion Pursuant to Sections 105 and 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Approval of the Termination of the Spruce CCS, Ltd. Securitization (related document(s) 20338 ) filed by Philip Dublin on behalf of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC. with hearing to be held on 10/19/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Dublin, Philip) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Objection to Motion LIMITED OBJECTION OF CREDITOR ESSEX EQUITY HOLDINGS USA, LLC TO THE DEBTORS MOTION, PURSUANT TO SECTIONS 105(a) AND 363(b) OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE, FOR AUTHORIZATION TO GRANT LIMITED RELEASES TO CERTAIN INSURERS UNDER THE DIRECTORS AND OFFICERS INSURANCE POLICIES (related document(s) 20350 ) filed by Todd E. Duffy on behalf of Essex Equity Holdings USA, LLC. (Duffy, Todd) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response to Motion Response of Roger Saks to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 19392 ) filed by Howard P. Magaliff on behalf of Roger Saks. (Magaliff, Howard) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Objection to Motion LIMITED OBJECTION OF CREDITOR ESSEX EQUITY HOLDINGS USA, LLC TO THE INSURED PERSONS MOTION, PURSUANT TO SECTION 362 OF THE BANKRUPTCY CODE, FOR AN ORDER MODIFYING THE AUTOMATIC STAY TO ALLOW SETTLEMENT PAYMENT UNDER DIRECTORS AND OFFICERS INSURANCE POLICY TO SETTLE THE CALIFORNIA MUNICIPALITIES ACTIONS (related document(s) 20310 ) filed by Todd E. Duffy on behalf of Essex Equity Holdings USA, LLC. (Duffy, Todd) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Numbers 29746 and 29747 Solely for Purposes of Voting on the Debtors' Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20747 ) filed by Seth H. Lieberman on behalf of Iberdrola Renewables Energies USA, Ltd., Iberdrola Renewables, Inc., fka PPM Energy, Inc.. (Lieberman, Seth) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG, Stamford Branch(Claim No. 21877). To Dylan Creek, L.L.C.. filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Dylan Creek, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Transfer of Claim Pursuant to Rule 3001(e)(2) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG, Stamford Branch(Claim No. 21875). To Dylan Creek, L.L.C.. filed by Anneliese H. Pak on behalf of Dylan Creek, L.L.C..(Pak, Anneliese) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Statement /Joinder to Motion of Deutsche AG Pursuant to Section 105(A) and Rule 3013 to Enforce Settlement Approval Order and to Correct Misclassification of Claims (related document(s) 20321 ) filed by Marilee P. Dahlman on behalf of Stone Lion Portfolio L.P. and Permal Stone Lion Fund Ltd. (Dahlman, Marilee) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Notice of Appearance filed by Marilee P. Dahlman on behalf of Stone Lion Portfolio L.P. and Permal Stone Lion Fund Ltd. (Dahlman, Marilee) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Response Response To Debtors' One Hundred And Eighty Seventh Omnibus Objection To Claims (Misclassified Claims) (related document(s) 19817 ) filed by Seth H. Lieberman on behalf of Iberdrola Renewables Energies USA, Ltd., Iberdrola Renewables, Inc., fka PPM Energy, Inc.. (Lieberman, Seth) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Letter to Honorable James M. Peck Regarding Twenty-Third ADR Status Report filed by Peter Gruenberger on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Gruenberger, Peter) (Entered: 10/12/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20708 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' Two Hundred Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Foreign Currency Claims) as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.15005, Amount 5,211,488.00); Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.15004, Amount 5,211,488.00). To HBK Master Fund L.P.. filed by John R. Smith Jr. on behalf of HBK Master Fund L.P..(Smith, John) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP 3001(e)(2) - Transfer of Claims Other Than for Security. To U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee. filed by Ann E. Acker on behalf of U.S. Bank National Association.(Acker, Ann) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Letter to Honorable James M. Peck re: Nomura's request for Pre-Motion Conference (related document(s) 20306 , 20380 , 20348 ) filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. (Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Notice of Proposed Order /Notice of Presentment of Stipulated Scheduling Order for Consolidated Actions filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. with presentment to be held on 10/19/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/19/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Scheduling Order for Consolidated Actions)(Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centerbridge Credit Partners, L.P.(Claim No.58980, Amount 4,084,954.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Centerbridge Credit Partners Master, L.P.(Claim No.58982, Amount 6,127,432.00). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Stipulation and Agreement for Provisional Allowance of Claim Numbers 28040, 28041, 28042, 28043, 28044, 28045, 28054, 28063, 28064, and 28065 Solely for Purposes of filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20687 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Status Report : Monthly Report of Assets Disposed of Pursuant to the De Minimis Asset Sale or Abandonment Procedures filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Letter of Giants Stadium LLC Concerning the Discovery Dispute between Debtors and Nomura filed by Theodore McCombs on behalf of Giants Stadium LLC. (McCombs, Theodore) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Response of Buckeye Tobacco Settlement Financing Authority with Respect to Claim Nos. 22666 and 22667 Opposing Debtors' One Hundred Ninety First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) (related document(s) 19888 ) filed by G. Christopher Meyer on behalf of The Buckeye Tobacco Settlement Financing Authority. (Meyer, G.) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Opposition of creditor Susan Stashower (related document(s) 19873 ) filed by Paul Milbauer on behalf of Susan Stashower. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/13/2011, (Milbauer, Paul) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Statement Verified Statement of Law Offices of Lisa M. Solomon Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Lisa M. Solomon on behalf of Riccardo Banchetti. (Solomon, Lisa) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20660 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20015 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20708 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Notice of Proposed Order /Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Objection to Portions of Proofs of Claim No. 66462 Against Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and No. 4939 Against Lehman Brothers Inc. of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Regarding Triparty Repo-Related Losses and Motion to Unseal Same filed by James Tecce on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Tecce, James) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Motion by Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc. for an Order (A) Compelling Immediate Payment of Post-Petition Administrative Expense Claims and (B) Compelling the Debtors to Assume or Reject Executory Contracts Or Alternatively Modifying the Automatic Stay to Permit Movants to Terminate the Executory Contracts (related document(s) 7102 ) filed by Ira M. Levee on behalf of Factiva, Inc., Factiva Limited and Dow Jones & Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/9/2011 at 04:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Levee, Ira) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28152, Amount 344,878.21). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28146, Amount 1,350,011.67). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Foncier De France(Claim No.17268, Amount $54,122,471.93); The Boeing Co. Employee Retirement Plans Master(Claim No.19832, Amount $2,032,320.72); The Boeing Co. Employee Retirement Plans Master(Claim No.33177, Amount $2,032,320.72); O'Connor Global Convertible Arbitrage Master Limit(Claim No.30586, Amount $12,090,934.00); O'Connor Global Convertible Arbitrage II Master(Claim No.33240, Amount $704,013.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28151, Amount 7,096,498.84). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28148, Amount 344,878.21). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28153, Amount 4,895,412.46). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28154, Amount 4,895,412.46). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28145, Amount 2,747,331.28). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28149, Amount 7,096,498.84). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28150, Amount 2,747,331.28). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Dexia Banque Internationale a Luxembourg S.A.(Claim No.15804, Amount 19,336,363.56). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bankinter Gestion De Activos, S.A. S.G.I.I.C.(Claim No.28147, Amount 1,350,011.67). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Thomas T. Janover on behalf of Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC.(Janover, Thomas) (Entered: 10/11/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative LPS Claims) as to Certain Claim (Claim No. 60870) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 67452 on behalf of Kleinwort Benson (Channel Islands) Limited, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 20670 ) filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of International Bank for Reconstruction and Development. (McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 20668 ) filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION. (McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 15928 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67586, Amount 337,774.76). To LMA SPC for and on behalf of the MAP84 Segregated. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of LMA SPC for and on behalf of Map 84 Segregated Portfolio.(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP partial Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.67586, Amount 7,581,455.18). To Knighthead Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of Knighthead Master Fund, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Letter of Adjournment (related document(s) 19014 ) filed by William B. Schiller on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, NA, d/b/a America's Servicing Company as servicer for U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee for the Structured Asset Investment Loan Trust, Series 2005-HE3. (Schiller, William) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 15950 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 15936 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 15935 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 15934 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 15927 on behalf of HSBC Bank USA, National Association, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.43813, Amount 535,848.48). To Mariner LDC. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Mariner LDC.(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.43813, Amount 214,339.39). To Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Statement Verified Statement of Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP Pursuant to Rule 2019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by William P. Weintraub on behalf of Boultbee (Helsinki) AB. (Weintraub, William) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.43813, Amount 1,714,715.12). To Caspian Capital Partners, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Capital Partners, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.43812, Amount 117,625.28). To Mariner LDC. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Mariner LDC.(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Affidavit / Second Supplemental Affidavit and Disclosure Statement of Andrew C. Coronios, on Behalf of Chadbourne & Parke LLP filed by Richard P. Krasnow on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Krasnow, Richard) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.43812, Amount 47,050.11). To Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.43812, Amount 376,400.88). To Caspian Capital Partners, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Capital Partners, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.55169, Amount 300,020.83). To Mariner LDC. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Mariner LDC.(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.55169, Amount 111,227.24). To Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Financial Products Inc.(Claim No.55169, Amount 907,380.08). To Caspian Capital Partners, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Capital Partners, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Global Markets Limited(Claim No.60596, Amount 308,161.67). To Mariner LDC. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Mariner LDC.(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Global Markets Limited(Claim No.60596, Amount 116,448.19). To Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citigroup Global Markets Limited(Claim No.60596, Amount 934,425.71). To Caspian Capital Partners, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Capital Partners, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/10/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20575 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankrupty Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20545 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-First Objection to Claims (Duplicative LPS Claims). (Related Doc # 19397 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Supplemental Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims). (related document(s) 16867 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Inconsistent Debtor Claims). (Related Doc # 19381 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims). (Related Doc # 19386 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims). (Related Doc # 19400 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Pension Claims). (Related Doc # 19391 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability 401(k) Claims). (Related Doc # 19377 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims). (Related Doc # 19398 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests). (Related Doc # 19390 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Eightieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims). (Related Doc # 19396 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims). (Related Doc # 19393 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims). (Related Doc # 19384 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Second Supplemental Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims). (related document(s) 17468 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Supplemental Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims). (related document(s) 18444 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Order Signed on 10/6/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Blocking Number LPS Claims). (Related Doc # 19388 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Adversary case 11-02764. Complaint against USREO/Rosslyn Investors, LLC . Nature(s) of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) Filed by William F. Dahill, Michael P. Burke, Randall Rainer, William A Maher, Paul R. DeFilippo, Rosslyn LB Syndication Partner LLC on behalf of Rosslyn LB Syndication Partner LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B) (Burke, Michael) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Notice of Appearance Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by William P. Weintraub on behalf of Boultbee (Helsinki) AB. (Weintraub, William) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20392 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on Motions of Jason T. Taylor and Philip Walsh for a Determination that the Automatic Stay Does Not Apply or, Alternatively, for Relief from Automatic Stay with hearing to be held on 11/16/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 11/9/2011,. (Paduano, Anthony) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50055, Amount 60,747.38). To Caspian Capital Partners, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Capital Partners, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.50055, Amount 8,114.27). To Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P.. filed by Timothy Bennett on behalf of Caspian Alpha Long Credit Fund, L.P..(Bennett, Timothy) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20582 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Response of Commerzbank AG, New York and Grand Cayman Branches, to Debtors' Two Hundred Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative Claims) (related document(s) 19928 ) filed by Abraham L. Zylberberg on behalf of Commerzbank AG, New York and Grand Cayman Branches. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/13/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Zylberberg, Abraham) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability CMBS Claims). (Related Doc # 19407 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests). (Related Doc # 19392 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims). (Related Doc # 19399 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Amended and Superseded Claims). (Related Doc # 19401 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests). (Related Doc # 19387 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Supporting Documentation Claims). (Related Doc # 19383 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Regarding the Debtors' Eighteenth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) with Respect to Certain Claims by Howard Terry and The Terry Foundatioin. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims). (Related Doc # 19378 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Seventh Supplemental Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims). (related document(s) 12533 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP - See Attachment for Amount - Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG(Claim No. 55829). To UBS AG. filed by Credit Suisse AG.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Clariden Lue Ltd.(Claim No. 55813). To UBS AG. filed by Clariden Leu Ltd..(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Esca Co., Ltd(Claim No.62783, Amount 3,873,356.00). To Merrill Lynch Japan Securities Co. Ltd. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Merrill Lynch Japan Securities Co. Ltd..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #58894 from Goldman Sachs & Co. to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #58894 from Goldman Sachs & Co. to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #29858 from Cantor Fitzgerald Securities to Elliott International, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott International L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim #29858 from Cantor Fitzgerald Securities to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Abbey Walsh on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Walsh, Abbey) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:UBS AG(Claim No. 59233). To BANK JULIUS BAER & CO. LTD.. filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of Bank Julius baer & Co. Ltd..(McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Motion to Allow Claims MOTION OF INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION PURSUANT TO RULE 3018(a) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE FOR TEMPORARY ALLOWANCE OF CLAIMS FOR VOTING PURPOSES filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of INTERNATIONAL FINANCE CORPORATION. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 10/14/2011, (McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Motion to Allow Claims MOTION OF INTERNATIONAL BANK FOR RECONSTRUCTION AND DEVELOPMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 3018(a) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE FOR TEMPORARY ALLOWANCE OF CLAIMS FOR VOTING PURPOSES filed by James I. McClammy on behalf of International Bank for Reconstruction and Development. with hearing to be held on 11/4/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 10/14/2011, (McClammy, James) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Jordan Connors on behalf of Mason Capital Management LLC. Filing fee collected, receipt #187800. (Porter, Minnie) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Justin A. Nelson on behalf of Mason Capital Management LLC. Filing fee collected, receipt #187800. (Porter, Minnie) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Letter from M. A. Paskin to Judge Peck re granting the relief sought by Nomura regarding discovery of the derivative counterparties' closeouts and valuations filed by Michael A. Paskin on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Cayman Islands Branch. (Paskin, Michael) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Granting Supplemental Application of the Debtors for Authorization to Modify the Terms of Compensating And Reimbursing Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher, LLP as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Effective as of March 1, 2011. (Related Doc # 19811 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Authorizing the Modification of the Procedures for Compensating and Reimbursing Fried, Frank, Harris, Shriver & Jacobson LLP, as Special Counsel to Debtors, Effective as of June 1, 2011. (related document(s) 20025 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG(Claim No.55829, Amount EUR 460,000). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Order Signed on 10/5/2011 Authorizing the Modification of the Procedures for Compensating and Reimbursing Hardinger & Tanenholz, as Special Counsel to the Debtors, Effective as of June 1, 2011. (related document(s) 19621 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/05/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Between Michael and Lenna Southland and Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Providing for Relief From the Automatic Stay with Regard to Certain Real Property Located in Puyallup, Washington filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 10/14/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/13/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.12146, Amount 3,385,905.49). To Lataj Group LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Lataj Group LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Letter Further Letter Regarding Discovery Dispute filed by Paul Vizcarrondo Jr. on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. (Vizcarrondo, Paul) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.58103, Amount 4,176,711.00). To Lataj Group LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Lataj Group LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.58104, Amount 4,176,711.00). To Lataj Group LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Lataj Group LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Alandsbanken Sverige AB (publ)(Claim No.62822, Amount 131,588.79). To RBS Securities Inc.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of RBS Securities Inc..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Alandsbanken Sverige AB (publ)(Claim No.62822, Amount 1,562,440.00). To RBS Securities Inc.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of RBS Securities Inc..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Claims Hearing on October 5, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/5/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Caja Espana de Inversiones, Salmanca Y Soria, Camp(Claim No.28155, Amount $3,600,000.00); Cerberus Series Four Holdings, LLC(Claim No.23859, Amount $23,400,000.00); Cerberus Series Four Holdings, LLC(Claim No.23860, Amount $23,400,000.00); MBIA, Inc.(Claim No.26906, Amount $9,980,000.00); MBIA, Inc.(Claim No.26905, Amount $9,980,000.00). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Chang Hwa Commercial Bank, Ltd.(Claim No.12146, Amount 3,385,905.49). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20360 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20510 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Capital Bank GRAWE Gruppe AG(Claim No.66384, Amount 425,250). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20507 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Capital Bank GRAWE Gruppe AG(Claim No.66384, Amount 992,250). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to TIAA Global Markets, Inc. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to Easton Investments II, a California L.P. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Notice of Presentment of Stipulation, Agreement and Order Among Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Thomas E. Pratt, BBP Partners, LLC and Schottenstein, Zox and Dunn Co., LPA Regarding Receivership Funds filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with presentment to be held on 10/12/2011 at 12:00 PM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 10/11/2011, (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20352 , 20354 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20356 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20362 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20322 , 20321 ) filed by Joshua Dorchak on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20369 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 10/3/2011 Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and HSBC Bank Plc Amending a Prior Stipulation Regarding Turnover of Funds. (related document(s) 20125 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
So Ordered Stipulation, Agreement and Order Signed on 10/3/2011 Between the Debtors and Danske Bank A/S London Branch Providing for Certain Extensions of Time. (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Misclassified Claims) as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20339 , 20338 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing / Notice of Adjournment of Caisse des Depots et Consignations' Motion for Entry of an Order to Permit a Late-Filed Claim Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9006(b)(1) (related document(s) 18039 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20543 ) filed by Concepcion A. Montoya on behalf of GMAC Mortgage, LLC. (Montoya, Concepcion) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Response of GMAC Mortgage, LLC to Debtors' Objection to Claims (186th Omnibus Objection) (related document(s) 19816 ) filed by Concepcion A. Montoya on behalf of GMAC Mortgage, LLC. (Montoya, Concepcion) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 20348 ) filed by William J. Hine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Hine, William) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Neue Aagauer Bank(Claim No.55814, Amount 20,000). To Credit Suisse. filed by Richard B. Levin on behalf of Credit Suisse.(Levin, Richard) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:D.E. Shaw Valence Portfolios, L.L.C.(Claim No.21877, Amount 42,183,888.06). To UBS AG, Stamford Branch. filed by Jay Heinrich on behalf of UBS AG, Stamford Branch.(Heinrich, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:D.E. Shaw Claims SPV, L.L.C.(Claim No.21875, Amount 323,661,328.48). To UBS AG, Stamford Branch. filed by Jay Heinrich on behalf of UBS AG, Stamford Branch.(Heinrich, Jay) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19621 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Aleppa Funding I LLC(Claim No.26546, Amount 210,821.00); Aleppa Funding I LLC(Claim No.26547, Amount 210,821.00). To JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Letter to the Honorable James M. Peck and Response to Debtors' Seventy-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests), In re: Claim No(s) 46343, 46344, 46345, 46346, 46348, 46349, 46350, 46351, 46352, 46353, 46354, 46355, 46356, 46357, 46358, 46359, 46360, 46361, and 46362 (related document(s) 13328 ) filed by Kazumichi Norimatsu. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Opposition to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 6325 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by Dennis E. Forster. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Motion to Withdraw Appearance filed by Heidi L Hamilton on behalf of Julian Iragorri. (Hamilton, Heidi) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Response to Debtors One Hundred Ninety-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Inferred Debtor Claims), In re: Claim No. 8085 with Attached Claim (related document(s) 19886 ) filed by The McGraw-Hill Companies. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP / Transfer Of Claim Other Than For Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.63595, Amount 7,319,910.16). To GSS Master SPC - Hayman Segregated Portfolio. filed by Jonathan Hook on behalf of GSS Master SPC - Hayman Segregated Portfolio.(Hook, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP [Note: See Doc. #20530 for First Transfer Agreement] Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:SCM Kompass AG(Claim No. 31638). To MPC Muenchmeyer Petersen Capital AG. filed by MPC Muenchmeyer Peterson Capital AG.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP (Note: Second Transfer Attached Will Be Docketed Separately) (Claim No. 31638). To SCM Kompass AG. filed by SCM Kornpass AG.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.66792, Amount 882,000.00). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.66792, Amount 2,058,000.00). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59833, Amount 129,000.00). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59833, Amount 301,000.00). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59739, Amount 19,800,000). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59739, Amount 46,200,000). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59738, Amount 15,000,000). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59738, Amount 35,000,000). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59725, Amount 2,000,000). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.59725, Amount 4,500,000). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.55829, Amount 6,378,000.00). To Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Notice of Partial Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.55829, Amount 14,882,000.00). To Silver Point Capital Offshore Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Eric Litman Ruiz on behalf of Silver Point Capital Fund, L.P. and Silver Point Capital Offshore Fund, Ltd..(Ruiz, Eric) (Entered: 10/01/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20312 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20311 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20323 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20357 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20355 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20371 , 20370 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20368 , 20367 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) / Debtors' Objection to the Claim of Wilmington Trust Company as Identure Trustee (Claim No. 10082) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Responses due by 11/14/2011, (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Neue Aargauer Bank AG(Claim No. 55829). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG(Claim No. 55829). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Amended Schedules filed:, Schedule F : Notice of Amendment to Schedule F of LBHI's Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Deadline to Object to Such Amendments Pursuant to Rule 1009(a) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG Hong Kong Branch(Claim No. 55828). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG, Singapore Branch(Claim No. 55825). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Deutschland) AG(Claim No. 55824). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Gibraltar) Limited(Claim No. 55822). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): dated 12/09/2010, relates to Claim No. 67290 ONLY filed by Department of Treasury, Internal Revenue Service.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) S.A.(Claim No. 55819). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to One Hundred Ninety-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims), In re: Claim Nos. 12697 and 12698 (related document(s) 19888 ) filed by Rubicon Fund Management LLC. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) S.A. Zweigniederlaussun(Claim No. 55818). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (UK) Limited(Claim No. 55816). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Neue Aargauer Bank AG(Claim No. 55814). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:J.P. Morgan Securities Limited(Claim No.67542, Amount 783,365.00). To Alden Global Distressed Opportunities Master Fund. filed by Alden Global Distressed Opportunities Master Fund, L.P..(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Clariden Leu Ltd.(Claim No. 55813). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Objection to ebtors' One Hundred Seventy-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 66003 (related document(s) 19393 ) filed by Natalie Riessen. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Clariden Leu Ltd.(Claim No. 55829). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 66004 (related document(s) 19393 ) filed by Natalie Riessen. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 39,000.00). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Withdrawal of Claim(s): 13808 on behalf of Andreas Wolf, filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 85,000.00). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 449,000.00). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 65,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Generali Vie(Claim No.64078, Amount 5,822,410.00). To Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Morgan Stanley & Co. International plc.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability 401(k) Claims), (related document(s) 19377 ) filed by Dorothea Douglas. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP dated September 30, 2011, Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Societe Generale(Claim No.28375, Amount 549,089). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC.(O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 482,000.00). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Non-Debtor Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 20289 (related document(s) 19393 ) filed by Geraldine D. Robson-Canty. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP dated September 30, 2011, Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Societe Generale(Claim No.28374, Amount 549,089). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Sean A. O'Neal on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC.(O'Neal, Sean) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 14,000.00). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(Claim No.55855, Amount 16,000.00). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Other Than For Security, Notice of Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Wells Fargo & Company (Successor to Wachovia Corp)(Claim No.29858, Amount 150,000,000). To Cantor Fitzgerald Securities. filed by James N. Truitt on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald.(Truitt, James) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 11388 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by Robert C. Mountford. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claim (related document(s) 18410 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 16114 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Eighty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (Hearings to be Adjourned to October 27, 2011, at 10:00 A.M. and December 21, 2011, at 10:00 A.M.) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Eighth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (Hearings to be Adjourned to October 27, 2011, at 10:00 A.M. and November 30, 2011, at 10:00 A.M.) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Twenty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Ninety-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Eighty-Fourth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests), In re: Claim No. 19255 (related document(s) 19392 ) filed by John W. Calhoun. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Seventy-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to New South Federal Savings Bank, F.S.B. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Sixty-Seventh Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Thirty-Fifth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) as to Investcorp Interlachen Multi-Strategy Master Fund Ltd. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55828, Amount 4,071.86). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55828, Amount 64,850.30). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55828, Amount 1,317.37). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55828, Amount 3,173.65). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55828, Amount 23,233.53). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55828, Amount 1,497.01). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55825, Amount 18,323.35). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: Claim No. 5570 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by William A. Wagner. (Attachments: # 1 2nd page of notice) (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55825, Amount 291,826.35). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55825, Amount 5,928.14). To The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P.(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55825, Amount 14,281.44). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55825, Amount 104,550.90). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by William C. Smith. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To The Varde Fund IX, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No.55825, Amount 6,736.53). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of The Varde Fund L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55829). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55814). To Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners (Offshore) Master, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55814). To Varde Investment Partners, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of Varde Investment Partners, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55814). To The Varde Fund X (Master), L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund X (Master) L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55814). To The Varde Fund VI-A. L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund VI-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55814). To The Varde Fund, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Barclays Bank PLC(Claim No. 55814). To The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P.. filed by Edward J. Leen on behalf of The Varde Fund IX-A, L.P..(Leen, Edward) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20304 , 20303 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 20361 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Malo, David) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Objection to Motion Preliminary Objection of Mason Capital Management, LLC, to Third Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 Of The Bankruptcy Code filed by Drew D. Hansen on behalf of Mason Capital Management LLC. (Hansen, Drew) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19825 , 19766 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC, (Claims and Noticing Agent).(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Stipulation and Agreement Regarding Solicitation of Customer Note Claims Among the Debtors and Lehman Brothers Japan Inc. filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG(Claim No.55829, Amount 70,332,798.15). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (UK) Limited(Claim No.55816, Amount 250,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.56186, Amount 267,707.98). To LMA SPC for and on behalf of Map 84 Segregated. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of LMA SPC for and on behalf of Map 84 Segregated Portfolio.(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch(Claim No.56186, Amount 5,809,099.02). To Knighthead Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Tara Hannon on behalf of Knighthead Master Fund, L.P..(Hannon, Tara) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Clariden Leu Ltd.(Claim No.55813, Amount 698,468.10). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG(Claim No.50103, Amount 52,172.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG Hong Kong Branch(Claim No.55828, Amount 600,000.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse AG, Singapore Branch(Claim No.55825, Amount 2,489,250.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service by Alexa J. Loo (related document(s) 20380 ) filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. (Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (France)(Claim No.55823, Amount 283,800.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests, In re: Claim No. 16329 (related document(s) 19392 ) filed by Lisa Marcus. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Gibralter) Ltd(Claim No.55822, Amount 123,453.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Notice of Withdrawal of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims) as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 18407 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Opposition to Debtor's Motion to Reclassify Creditor's Claims Against Debtor as Equity Interests or Equity Awards filed by Rodney A. Plaskett. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Settled Derivatives Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 18444 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Fifty-Ninth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Invalid Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims (related document(s) 18407 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 11/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Forty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (Late-Filed Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 12/21/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Opposition to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Employee Claims), In re: 28717 (related document(s) 19399 ) filed by Edmund Finder. (Lopez, Mary) Docket Text Modified on 9/29/2011 (Bush, Brent). (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Fortieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (Duplicative of Indenture Trustee Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Ninety-Second Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Blocking Number LPS Claims) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) S.A. Zw. Osterreich(Claim No.55819, Amount 78,045.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Objection to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests), In re: Claim No. 32257 (related document(s) 19392 ) filed by Laurent Tuil. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests), In re: Claim No. 34872 (related document(s) 19392 ) filed by Amit K. Sarkar. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) S.A. Zw. Osterreich(Claim No.55818, Amount 38,313.00). To Barclays Bank PLC. filed by Barclays Bank PLC.(Bulkley, Adam) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA(Claim No.55819, Amount $540,000.00); Credit Suisse (Gibraltar) Ltd.(Claim No. 55822); Credit Suisse (UK) Limited(Claim No.55816, Amount $199,000.00); Credit Suisse AG, Singapore Branch(Claim No. 55825); Neue Aargauer Bank AG(Claim No. 55814); Clariden Leu Ltd.(Claim No. 55813); Credit Suisse AG(Claim No. 55829). To Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch. filed by Jeffrey M. Olinsky on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, London Branch.(Olinsky, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Letter to Honorable James M. Peck re: Nomura's Request for Pre-Motion Conference (related document(s) 20306 , 20348 ) filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. (Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Response to Debtors' One Hundred Seventy-Sixth Omnibus Objection to Claims (To Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests), In re: Claim No. 34829 (related document(s) 19392 ) filed by Timothy B. Wilkinson. (Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Targobank AG & Co KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 15,621.10). To Christel Lang, Heiner Lang. filed by Heiner Lang, Christel Lang.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Affidavit of Service by Alexa J. Loo (related document(s) 20306 ) filed by Douglas P. Bartner on behalf of Nomura Global Financial Products Inc, Nomura International plc, Nomura Securities CO., LTD. (Bartner, Douglas) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Vienna Insurance Group Wiener Stadtische Versicher(Claim No.58894, Amount 16,011,856.50). To Goldman, Sachs & Co.. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman, Sachs & Co..(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Uta Knoerzer(Claim No.55404, Amount 7,100.50). To Targobank AG & Co. KGaA. filed by Targobank AG & Co KGaA.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:PGA Holdings, Inc.(Claim No.12957, Amount 667,000.00). To Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC. filed by Michael Friedman on behalf of Goldman Sachs Lending Partners LLC.(Friedman, Michael) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Luitgard Graul-Neumann(Claim No.55404, Amount 1,420.10). To Targobank AG & Co. KGaA. filed by Targobank AG & Co. KGaA.(Lopez, Mary) (Entered: 09/29/2011)