Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
19488 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize / Insured Persons Motion, Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code, for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policy to Settle the Equity/Debt Class Action filed by Brian E. Greer on behalf of Richard S. Fuld, Jr.; Christopher M. O'Meara; Joseph M. Gregory; Erin Callan; Ian T. Lowitt; David Goldfarb; Herbert H. McDade, III; Thomas Russo; Mark Walsh; Michael Ainslie; John F. Akers; et a. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 9/7/2011, (Greer, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19487 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response / Debtors' Amended Response to Objections to Approval of Proposed Disclosure Statement filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19486 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Proposed Order / Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order (i) Approving the Proposed Disclosure Statement and the Form and Manner of Notice of the Disclosure Statement Hearing, (ii) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (iii) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing, and (iv) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19485 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement / Blackline: Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Revised Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19484 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Disclosure Statement / Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Revised Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19483 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan / Blackline: Revised Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19482 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Chapter 11 Plan / Revised Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors filed by Lori R. Fife on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Fife, Lori) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19481 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Lauren Rodriguez of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 18984 , 19281 , 19363 , 19282 , 19365 , 19093 , 19057 , 19056 , 19364 , 19048 , 19367 , 19020 , 19343 , 19086 , 19087 , 19222 , 19366 , 19223 , 19050 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19480 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Authorize / Insured Persons Motion, Pursuant to Section 362 of the Bankruptcy Code, for an Order Modifying the Automatic Stay to Allow Settlement Payment Under Directors and Officers Insurance Policy to Settle the New Jersey Action filed by Brian E. Greer on behalf of Richard S. Fuld, Jr.; Christopher M. O'Meara; Joseph M. Gregory; Erin Callan; Ian T. Lowitt; David Goldfarb; Herbert H. McDade, III; Thomas Russo; Mark Walsh; Michael Ainslie; John F. Akers; et a. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 9/7/2011, (Greer, Brian) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19479 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 19459 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19478 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19380 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19477 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19376 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19476 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19372 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19475 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19360 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19474 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' Objection to Certain Claims (Valued Derivative Claims) Solely as to the Owl Creek Entities filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/5/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19473 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter to the Court filed by Gavin Aslett. (Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19472 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim other than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:TARGOBANK AG & Co. KGaA(Claim No.55404, Amount 71,005.00). To Edith Welter. filed by Edith Welter.(Cantrell, Deirdra) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19471 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 1 Transferors:Citibank, N.A.(Claim No.55393, Amount 3,000,000). To J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC.(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19470 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19352 , 19348 , 19350 , 19351 , 19354 , 19344 , 19353 , 19347 , 19349 , 19345 , 19346 , 19355 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19469 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19370 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19468 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): Filed on behalf of Federal Home Loan Bank of Pittsburgh, Claim No. 18992 filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Malo, David) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19467 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Panagiota Manatakis of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutionsk, LLC (related document(s) 19314 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19466 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankrupty Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19294 , 19293 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19465 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Claims Hearing on August 25, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19464 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19288 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19463 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN REFILED, SEE DOCUMENT 19464 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19288 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) Modified on 8/24/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19462 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19287 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19307 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 19273 , 19266 , 19267 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19306 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. § 1746 Regarding Motion for Authorization to Reject Certain Executory Contracts Solely as to Certain Contracts (related document(s) 19000 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19305 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for the Forty First Omnibus Hearing on August 17, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19304 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service of Christopher Clark (related document(s) 19277 ) filed by Robert K. Dakis on behalf of Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP. (Dakis, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19303 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of No Objection / Certificate of No Objection Under 28 U.S.C. § 1746 Regarding Joint Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure to Approve Settlement Agreement Between Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., and James W. Giddens, as Trustee for Lehman Brothers Inc., Regarding Lehman Brothers Unclaimed Funds in Court Registry and Related Relief (related document(s) 18792 ) filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19302 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Dagmara Krasa-Berstell (related document(s) 19261 , 19262 , 19254 ) filed by Philip Dublin on behalf of Centerbridge Credit Advisors LLC. (Dublin, Philip) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19301 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Gregory H. Chastain in Support of Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Section 105(a) of the Bankruptcy Code and Bankruptcy Rule 9019 for Approval of a Settlement and Compromise Among Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., and State Street Bank and Trust Company (related document(s) 18542 ) filed by Jacqueline Marcus on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Marcus, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19300 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Pete Caris of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19203 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19299 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Sixth Amended /Verified Statement of Bingham McCutchen LLP Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019/ filed by Michael J. Reilly on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., as Indenture Trustee. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19298 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Verified Statement of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A. in its Capacity as Indenture Trustee Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 2019/ filed by Michael J. Reilly on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., as Indenture Trustee. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19297 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion OMX Timber Finance Investments II, LLC's Joinder in Objection of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., As Indenture Trustee, to Debtors' Amended Motion for (I) Approval of the Disclosure Statement and The Form and Manner of Notice of the Disclosure Statement Hearing, (II) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (III) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing, and (IV) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s) 18126 ) filed by John E. Jureller Jr. on behalf of OMX Timber Finance Investments II, L.L.C.. with hearing to be held on 8/30/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Jureller, John) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19296 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., by Bingham McCutchen LLP filed by Michael J. Reilly on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., as Indenture Trustee. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19295 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Objection of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., as Indenture Trustee to Debtors' Amended Motion for Approval of the Disclosure Statement/ (related document(s) 18126 ) filed by Michael J. Reilly on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank Northwest, N.A., as Indenture Trustee. (Reilly, Michael) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19294 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirty-First Omnibus Objection to Claims (to Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19293 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing of Debtors' One Hundred Thirtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (to Reclassify Proofs of Claim as Equity Interests) Solely as to Certain Claims filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19292 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JP Morgan Chase Bank NA(Claim No.67333, Amount 499,298.38). To Avenue TC Fund, LP. filed by David S. Leinwand on behalf of Avenue TC Fund, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Evidence of Transfer)(Leinwand, David) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19291 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JP Morgan Chase Bank NA(Claim No.67332, Amount 2,379,442.75). To Avenue TC Fund, LP. filed by David S. Leinwand on behalf of Avenue TC Fund, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Evidence of Transfer)(Leinwand, David) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19290 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JP Morgan Chase NA(Claim No.67335, Amount 499,298.38). To Avenue TC Fund, LP. filed by David S. Leinwand on behalf of Avenue TC Fund, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Evidence of Transfer)(Leinwand, David) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19289 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA(Claim No.67330, Amount 2,379,442.75). To Avenue TC Fund, LP. filed by David S. Leinwand on behalf of Avenue TC Fund, LP. (Attachments: # 1 Evidence of Transfer)(Leinwand, David) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19288 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for the Forty First Omnibus Hearing on August 17, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. filed by Harvey R. Miller on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Miller, Harvey) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19287 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration of Ashish Gupta in Support of Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authority to Sell Interest in Rosslyn Syndication Partners JV LP (related document(s) 18794 ) filed by Alfredo R. Perez on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Perez, Alfredo) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19286 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service related to service of Mason Capital Management, LLC's Objection to the Debtors' Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code and Response to the Amended Motion (1) for Approval of the Disclosure Statement and the Form and Manner of Notice of the Disclosure Statement Hearing, (2) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (3) Scheduling a Confirmation Hearing, and (4) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of the Debtors' Joint Chapter 11 Plan (related document(s) 19151 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19285 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Georgia Faust for Curtis' Eighth Interim Fee Application (related document(s) 19268 ) filed by Steven J. Reisman on behalf of Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle LLP. (Reisman, Steven) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19284 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 19270 ) filed by Dennis F. Dunne on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (Dunne, Dennis) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19283 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Michael J. Lonie (related document(s) 19198 , 19196 ) filed by Gerard Uzzi on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors. (Uzzi, Gerard) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19282 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of Scotland PLC(Claim No.17720, Amount 90,965,574.96). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19281 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of Scotland PLC(Claim No.17718, Amount 90,965,574.96). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19280 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Seventh Interim Application of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP for Compensation for Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Special Counsel to the Debtors for the Period from February 1, 2011 through May 31, 2011 (related document(s) 19276 ) filed by Maria A. Bove on behalf of Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP. (Bove, Maria) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19142 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19077 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19141 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19080 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19140 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19078 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19139 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Eleni Kossivas of Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC (related document(s) 19073 ) filed by Epiq Bankruptcy Solutions, LLC.(Baer, Herbert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19138 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #17719 from Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19137 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Acknowledgment of transfer FRBP 3001(e)1 Notice of Transfer of Claim #17724 from Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC to Elliott Associates, L.P. filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliott Associates, L.P..(Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19136 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Subpoena Issued Pursuant to Order Granting the Debtors Authority to Issue Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Authorizing the Examination of Persons and Entities (related document(s) 5910 ) filed by Richard W. Slack on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Slack, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19135 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 19123 ) filed by Jennifer A. Christian on behalf of Barton Creek Senior Living Center, Inc.. (Christian, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19134 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (GRF c/o Anchorage Capital Group, L.L.C.) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.14416, Amount 1,725,763.82). To GRF Master Fund, L.P.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of GRF Master Fund, L.P..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19133 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Notice of Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.10117, Amount 9,704.048.58). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19132 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Subpoena Issued Pursuant to Order Granting the Debtors Authority to Issue Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Authorizing the Examination of Persons and Entities (related document(s) 5910 ) filed by Richard W. Slack on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Slack, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19131 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Deutsche Bank AG, London(Claim No.14416, Amount 38,542,058.65). To Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Anchorage Capital Master Offshore, Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19130 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (RWE f/k/a Essent Energy Trading B.V.) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RWE Supply & Trading Netherlands B.V.(Claim No.15059, Amount 5,067,944.00). To Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19129 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (LBSC - 08-13885)(RWE f/k/a Essent Trading International S.A.) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RWE Supply & Trading Switzerland S.A.(Claim No.15062, Amount 6,194,742.00). To Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19128 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (RWE f/k/a Essent Trading International S.A.) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RWE Supply & Trading Switzerland S.A.(Claim No.14056, Amount 6,188,589.00). To Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19127 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP /Transfer of Claim Other Than for Security (In re LBCS - 08-13885)(RWE f/k/a Essent Energy Trading B.V.) Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:RWE Supply and Trading Netherlands B.V.(Claim No.15060, Amount 9,079,414.00). To Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Fund Ltd.. filed by Alex R. Rovira on behalf of Paulson Credit Opportunities Master Ltd..(Rovira, Alex) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing / Second Amended Second Notice of Establishment of Hearing Dates for Claims Matters Pursuant to Second Amended Case Management Order Implementing Certain Notice and Case Management Procedures filed by Robert J. Lemons on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Lemons, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19125 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of the Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors in Support of the Motion of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and Lehman Commercial Paper Inc. Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code for Authority to Sell Interest in Rosslyn Syndication Partners JV LP (related document(s) 18794 ) filed by Gerard Uzzi on behalf of Ad Hoc Group of Lehman Brothers Creditors. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (Uzzi, Gerard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19124 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion Objection of Thomas Cook AG to Debtors' One Hundred Sixty-Third Omnibus Objection to Claims (No Liability Derivatives Claims) and Notice of Applicability of Foreign Law Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 44.1 (related document(s) 18409 ) filed by Walter H. Curchack on behalf of Thomas Cook AG. (Curchack, Walter) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19123 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion Limited Response to Debtors One Hundred Sixtieth Omnibus Objection to Claims (related document(s) 18444 ) filed by Jennifer A. Christian on behalf of Barton Creek Senior Living Center, Inc.. (Christian, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 18205 ) filed by Gary A. Cutler. (White, Greg) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Disclosure Statement (related document(s) 18205 ) filed by Tommy Tewalt. (White, Greg) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19120 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/10/2011 Approving Procedures for Determining the Allowed Amount of Claims Filed Based on Structured Securities Issued or Guaranteed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. (Related Doc # 16294 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19119 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement / Notice of Subpoena Issued Pursuant to Order Granting the Debtors Authority to Issue Subpoenas for the Production of Documents and Authorizing the Examination of Persons and Entities (related document(s) 5910 ) filed by Richard L. Levine on behalf of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc.. (Levine, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19118 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of Scotland PLC(Claim No.17724, Amount 2,013,953.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19117 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement of Elliott Management Corp. in Support of the Debtors Disclosure Statement for Second Amended Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc. and its Affiliated Debtors Pursuant to Section 1125 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 18126 ) filed by Matthew J. Gold on behalf of Elliot Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Pleading Certificate of Service) (Gold, Matthew) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19116 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Citibank, N.A.(Claim No.55393, Amount 2,650,000.00). To J.P. Morgan Securities LLC. filed by Howard J. Grossman on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities Inc..(Grossman, Howard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19115 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Transfer Agreement FRBP Transfer of Claim Transfer Agreement 3001 (e) 2 Transferors:Bank of Scotland PLC(Claim No.17719, Amount 339,574,244.00). To Merrill Lynch Credit Products, LLC. filed by Nickolas Karavolas on behalf of Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP.(Karavolas, Nickolas) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19114 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Adjournment of Hearing on the Motion of Monti Family Holdings Company, Ltd for Leave to Conduct Rule 2004 Discovery of Debtor Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc and Other Entities (related document(s) 16803 ) filed by Richard J. McCord on behalf of Monti Family Holding Company, Ltd. with hearing to be held on 9/14/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) (McCord, Richard) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19113 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 19069 ) filed by Steven B. Levine on behalf of Various LBT Noteholders. (Levine, Steven) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
19112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Response to Motion (related document(s) 18409 ) filed by David M. Capriotti on behalf of Frederick Ferris Thompson Hospital, F.F. Thompson Foundation, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/25/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 601 (JMP) Objections due by 8/10/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B# 3 Pleading Christopher J. Everett Affidavit# 4 Affidavit of Mailing) (Capriotti, David) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
7126 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Order signed on 8/24/2011 Regarding Withdrawal of: (I) Claims Filed by Thomas H. Lee and Its Affiliates; and (II) Plan Administrators' Objection Thereto. (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4692 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Withdrawal of Claim(s): #1132 ($9,171.35) THE TEXAS WORKFORCE COMMISSION submitted by Erin Reid, Account Examiner filed by Donlin & Recano Claims Agent.(Jordan, Lillian) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4691 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Appearance filed by Paul M. Freeman on behalf of General Roll Leaf Mfg., Co., Inc.. (Freeman, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4314 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service / Supplemental Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report And Recommendation To The District Court For The Appointment Of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures For Electronic Data Rooms; And (III) An Order Modifying The June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order (related document(s) 4290 , 4306 , 4291 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
4298 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Trustee's Motion For (I) A Report and Recommendation to the District Court for the Appointment of Special Discovery Masters; (II) An Order Establishing Procedures for Electronic Data Rooms; and (III) An Order Modifying the June 6, 2011 Litigation Protective Order; and Affidavit of Edward J. Jacobs, Esq., in Support of Trustee's Motion (related document(s) 4290 , 4291 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2419 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Stipulation and Order signed on 8/18/2011 Authorizing Debtors to Reject the Unexpired Lease of Non-residential Real Property Between A&P and 380 Downing Drive, LLC; 2) Order signed on 8/18/2011 Extending Debtors' Exclusive Periods to File and Solicit Votes for a Chapter 11 Plan; 3) Order signed on 8/18/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into Facilities Management Agreement Between the Debtors and USM, Inc.; 4) Order signed on 8/18/2011 Granting Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property; 5) Order signed on 8/18/2011 (I) Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' (A) Assumption of Certain Insurance-Related Agreements and (B) Entry Into Certain Renewal Insurance Agreements (II) Granting Related Relief; and 6) Order signed on 8/18/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Lease Amendment with M Plaza L.P. (related document(s) 2370 , 2372 , 2374 , 2367 , 2371 , 2375 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2418 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Motion to Impose Automatic Stay /Debtors' Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and for Sanctions Against Grocery Haulers, Inc. Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 362 of the Bankruptcy Code (related document(s) 2347 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2417 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Fee Statement of Kirkland & Ellis LLP for Compensation for Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred as Attorneys for the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the Period from July 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2416 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Ex Parte Motion to Shorten Time / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion to Shorten the Notice Period for Hearing on Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Sections 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Authorizing the Assumption of the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Property Between Pathmark Stores, Inc. and South-Whit Shopping Center Associates and (II) Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 2415 ) filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2415 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Assume Leases or Executory Contracts / Notice of Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Sections 363 and 365 of the Bankruptcy Code (I) Authorizing the Assumption of the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Property Between Pathmark Stores, Inc. and South-Whit Shopping Center Associates and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 8/29/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Responses due by 8/26/2011, (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2414 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Stipulation and Scheduling Order signed on 8/24/2011 setting discovery deadlines and evidentiary hearing to be held on September 26, 2011 (related document(s) 2066 , 1959 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2413 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection by UB Ironbound, LP to "Cure Amount" Provided for in Debtor's Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 1959 ) filed by Douglas M. Evans on behalf of UB Ironbound, LP. (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2412 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Fee Statement of PricewaterhouseCoopers LLP, Independent Auditor and Tax Advisor for the Debtors, for Compensation for Services Rendered and for Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for the Period From July 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of PricewaterhouseCoopers, LLC. (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2411 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection by Urstadt Biddle Properties Inc. to "Cure Amount" Provided for in Debtor's Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 1959 ) filed by Douglas M. Evans on behalf of Urstadt Biddle Properties Inc.. (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
2410 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection by Urstadt Biddle Properties Inc. to "Cure Amount" Provided for in Debtor's Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 1959 ) filed by Douglas M. Evans on behalf of Urstadt Biddle Properties Inc.. (Evans, Douglas) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2347 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Impose Automatic Stay /Debtors' Motion to Enforce the Automatic Stay and for Sanctions Against Grocery Haulers, Inc. Pursuant to Sections 105(a) and 362 of the Bankruptcy Code filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc.. with hearing to be held on 9/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom TBA, White Plains Office Objections due by 9/19/2011, (Basta, Paul) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2346 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Customized Notice of Rejection of Nonresidential Unexpired Real Property Leas of 25 Greentree Drive, Dover, Delaware Pursuant to Section 365(d)(4) of the Bankruptcy Code an Rejection Claims Bar Date filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2345 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Motion to File Under Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Facilities Maintenance Agreement Under Seal; 2) Order signed on 8/9/2011 Authorizing the Debtors to File the Facilities Maintenance Agreement UNDER SEAL; 3) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing Notice of Adjournment of Certain Matters Previously Scheduled for Hearing on August 16, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. Prevailing Eastern Time; 4) Monthly Operating Report for the Period June 19, 2011 to July 16, 2011; 5) Proposed Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 16, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. prevailing Eastern Time; 6) Motion to Approve / Debtors' Motion for Approval of Settlement Agreement With OfficeMax, Inc.; and 7) Ex Parte Motion to Seal / Debtors' Ex Parte Motion for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Debtors to File Settlement Agreement With OfficeMax, Inc. Under Seal (related document(s) 2299 , 2329 , 2332 , 2331 , 2326 , 2333 , 2310 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2344 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Objection Debtors' Omnibus Objection to Motions for Extension of Time to File Late Proofs of Claim; and 2) Declaration Declaration of Frederic F. Brace in Support of Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property (related document(s) 2308 , 2307 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2343 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Master Service List filed by Paul M. Basta on behalf of The Great Atlantic & Pacific Tea Company, Inc (related document(s) 2295 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2342 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Monthly Operating Report for June 2011; and 2) Notice of Hearing on Stipulation and Order Authorizing Debtors to Reject the Unexpired Lease of Non-Residential Real Property Between A&P and 380 Downing Drive, LLC (related document(s) 2286 , 2285 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2341 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re 1) Notice of Adjournment of Hearing /Notice of Adjournment of Matters Previously Scheduled for Hearing on August 2, 2011 at 10:00 a.m. Prevailing Eastern Time; 2) Motion to Authorize /Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Facilities Maintenance Agreement Between the Debtors and USM, Inc.; 3) Second Motion to Extend Exclusivity Period for Filing a Chapter 11 Plan and Disclosure Statement /Debtors' Second Motion for Entry of an Order Extending Their Exclusive Periods to File and Solicit Votes for a Chapter 11 Plan Pursuant to Section 1121(d) of the Bankruptcy Code; 4) Statement /Seventh Notice of Consensual Agreements Extending the 365(d)(4) Deadline to Assume/Reject Unexpired Leases of Nonresidential Real Property ; 5) Motion to Assume Leases or Executory Contracts /Debtors' Second Omnibus Motion Pursuant to Sections 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Assume Certain Unexpired Leases and Related Subleases of Non-Residential Real Property ; 6) Motion to Assume /Debtors' Motion Pursuant to Sections 105(a), 363(b) and 365(a) of the Bankruptcy Code for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing and Approving the Debtors' (A) Assumption of Certain Insurance-Related Agreements and (B) Entry Into Certain Renewal Insurance Agreements and (II) Granting Related Relief; and 7) Motion to Authorize /Debtors' Motion for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 363 of the Bankruptcy Code Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into a Lease Amendment with M Plaza L.P. (related document(s) 2272 , 2271 , 2269 , 2267 , 2273 , 2268 , 2270 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants LLC.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2340 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 8/16/2011 Granting Ex Parte Motion To File Settlement With OfficeMax, Inc. UNDER SEAL (Related Doc # 2333 ). (Correa, Mimi) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2321 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2320 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2319 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2318 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2317 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2316 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2315 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2314 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2313 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2312 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2311 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2310 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2231 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Notice of Change of Case Caption (related document(s) 2228 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2208 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 8/16/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice of Bradley S. Shraiberg, Esq. (Related Doc # 2189 ). (Saenz De Viteri, Monica) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2202 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2198 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service re Second Interim Application of Ray & Glick, Ltd. as Special Counsel to the Debtors for Compensation of Professional Services Rendered for the Period February 1, 2011 Through June 30, 2011 (related document(s) 2185 ) filed by Kurtzman Carson Consultants.(Scott, Jason) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
2197 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Second Application for Interim Professional Compensation for Chaiken Legal Group, P.C., Special Counsel, period: 2/1/2011 to 6/30/2011, fee:$320,305.00, expenses: $0. filed by Chaiken Legal Group, P.C.. (Sosland, Martin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1474 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Bridge Order Signed on 8/24/2011 Extending the Litigation Trustee's Time to Object to Certain Claims. (related document(s) 1473 ) (Nulty, Lynda) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
1465 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
971 |
Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance of Sarna & Associates, PC on behalf of 45220, Inc. filed by James A. Sarna on behalf of 45220, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(Sarna, James) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
970 |
Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Affidavit of Service regarding Docket Entries 968 and 969 filed by Peter C. Moskowitz on behalf of BH S&B Holdings LLC. (Moskowitz, Peter) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
969 |
Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Application for Final Professional Compensation Amended Third Interim/Final Application of Jackson Lewis LLP For Allowance of Compensation For Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred for Peter C. Moskowitz, Special Counsel, period: 9/1/2009 to 11/15/2010, fee:$44121.00, expenses: $291.99. filed by Peter C. Moskowitz. with hearing to be held on 9/13/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 501 (MG) Responses due by 9/6/2011, (Moskowitz, Peter) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
968 |
Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing to Consider Amended Third Interim/Final Application of Jackson Lewis LLP For Allowance of Compensation For Professional Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses Incurred filed by Peter C. Moskowitz on behalf of BH S&B Holdings LLC. (Moskowitz, Peter) (Entered: 08/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
967 |
Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Abandonment of Property - Trustee's Notice of Intent to Abandon Property filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
966 |
Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 964 ) filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
965 |
Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on July 20, 2011 RE: Motion to Approve Compormise - Revised Second Notice of Motion; Holding Date Re: 2004 Exam Dispute. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 11/8/2011. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerks Office. [Transcription Service Agency: Typewrite Word Processing Service.]. (See the Courts Website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency.) (RE: related document(s) 524 , 956 , 936 ). Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 8/17/2011. Statement of Redaction Request Due By 8/31/2011. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 9/12/2011. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/8/2011. (Richards, Beverly) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
964 |
Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement - Notice Regarding Settlement of WARN Act Litigation Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 filed by Robert A. Wolf on behalf of Robert L. Geltzer. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
963 |
Filed: 8/8/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 8/8/2011 Granting Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Carl E. Reynolds III (Related Doc # 962 ). (Tetzlaff, Deanna) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
962 |
Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission filed by Carl E. Reynolds III on behalf of Patrick Henry. Filing fee collected, receipt #187389. (Cappiello, Karen) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
961 |
Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Matrix // NOTICE OF CHANGE TO DEADLINE TO OBJECT TO APPLICATION OF CAHILL GORDON & REINDEL LLP FOR ALLOWANCE OF COMPENSATION FOR PROFESSIONAL SERVICES RENDERED AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES INCURRED filed by Richard A. Stieglitz Jr. on behalf of BH S&B Holdings LLC. (Stieglitz, Richard) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
534 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 531 ) filed by Mark T. Power on behalf of Liquidation Trustee of C-BASS Liquidation Trust. (Power, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
533 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 530 ) filed by Mark T. Power on behalf of Liquidation Trustee of C-BASS Liquidation Trust. (Power, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
532 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 529 ) filed by Mark T. Power on behalf of Liquidation Trustee of C-BASS Liquidation Trust. (Power, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
305 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Monthly Operating Report For Period July 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 (Bozel S.A.) and Monthly Operating Report For Period July 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 (Bozel, LLC) (related document(s) 303 , 304 ) filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
304 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for Period July 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 (Bozel, LLC) filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
303 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Monthly Operating Report for Period July 1, 2011 Through July 31, 2011 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
301 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service Regarding Certification Of Andrew D. Bickerton Regarding Services Rendered In July, 2011 (related document(s) 300 ) filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
300 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement /Certification Of Andrew D. Bickerton Regarding Services Rendered In July, 2011 filed by Allen G. Kadish on behalf of Bozel S.A.. (Kadish, Allen) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
200 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Third Interim Order Nunc Pro Tunc to August 1, 2011 (I) Authorizing the Use of Cash Collateral,(II) Granting Adequate Protection, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief, signed on 8/9/2011 (related document(s) 156 ) with a final hearing to be held on 9/8/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 723 (SMB) (Parks, Maria) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
173 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Daniella S. Golshani - Notice of Certification of Publication of Disclosure Statement Hearing Notice Pursuant to the Motion for Entry of An Order (A) Approving the Disclosure Statement for the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of the TSC Debtors and (B) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures With Respect to the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of the TSC Debtors (related document(s) 171 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
172 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on August 26, 2011 at 10:00 A.M. (Prevailing Eastern Time) (related document(s) 130 , 155 , 129 , 142 , 128 ) filed by Ira S. Dizengoff on behalf of TerreStar Corporation. with hearing to be held on 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 701 (SHL) (Dizengoff, Ira) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
164 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service for Notice of Hearing to Consider the Disclosure Statement for the Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Terrestar Corporation, Motient Communications Inc., Motient Holdings Inc., Motient License Inc., Motient Services Inc., Motient Ventures Holdings Inc., MVH Holdings Inc., Terrestar Holdings Inc. and Terrestar New York Inc (related document(s) 149 ) filed by Jeffrey S. Stein on behalf of The Garden City Group, Inc.. (Stein, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
163 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Signed on 8/24/2011 Authorizing and Approving Settlement Among Ian Matheson and Sean Gallagher, on Behalf of Themselves and Others Similarly Situated, T-Bone Restaurant, LLC and Certain of the Debtor's Employees. (Related Doc # 147 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
162 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Notice of Presentment of Stipulation Lifting the Automatic Stay to Permit Continuation of a New York State Court Personal Injury Action to the Extent of Applicable Insurance Proceeds (related document(s) 160 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
161 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Objection of the Glazier Group, Inc. Seeking an Order Reducing Claim No. 28 Filed by General Electric Capital Corp. and Granting Related Relief (related document(s) 158 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
158 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 28 /Objection of the Glazier Group, Inc. Seeking an Order Reducing Claim No. 28 Filed by General Electric Capital Corp. and Granting Related Relief with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 (check with court for location) Responses due by 9/13/2011, filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order# 2 Notice of Hearing)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
157 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter asking that an independent auditor be appointed in this case filed by Aldo I. Perez. (Gadson, Carol) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
156 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Objection to Claims (related document(s) 153 , 152 , 154 , 155 ) filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
155 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 11 filed by V. Suarez & Co., Inc. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 9/13/2011, filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit PR Credit Agreement# 3 Exhibit SJ Credit Agreement)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
154 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 34 filed by Barnacle Seafood, Inc. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 9/13/2011, filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Credit Application# 3 Exhibit Barnacle Complaint)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
153 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 18 filed by Niche Media Holdings LLC with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 9/13/2011, filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Contract)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
152 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion for Objection to Claim(s) Number: 3 filed by Dowtown at the Gardens Associates, LTD. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 617 (ALG) Responses due by 9/13/2011, filed by Justin B. Singer on behalf of The Glazier Group, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order# 2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement)(Singer, Justin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
151 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
(Written Opinion) Memorandum and Order Expunging Claim of Premium Supply Co., Inc., So Ordered on 8/10/2011. (related document(s) 114 ) (Porter, Marguerite) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
147 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 143 ) filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Waterscape Resort LLC. (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
146 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 145 ) filed by Lee William Stremba on behalf of Waterscape Resort LLC. (Stremba, Lee) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
122 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
121 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
112 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order Granting Trustee's Application for an Order Approving the Sale of the Debtor's Domain Name to Third Party Alexander Pali for $30,000, in "As Is" and "Where Is" Condition, Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances, and Subject to Higher or Better Offers (Related Doc # 103 ) signed on 8/24/2011. (Blum, Helene) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
106 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 8/24/2011 concerning interpleader plaintiff's motion for fees and costs (Related Doc # 94 ). (DePierola, Jacqueline) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
105 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service by First-Class Mail (related document(s) 104 ) filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
104 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Reply to Motion (related document(s) 94 ) filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
103 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
102 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Charmaine Thomas (related document(s) 100 ) filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
101 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Kimberley R. Cameron of Brown Rudnick LLP (related document(s) 99 ) filed by Martin S. Siegel on behalf of Linda P. Lay, individually and as executrix of The Estate of Kenneth L. Lay. (Siegel, Martin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
100 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement in Response to Interpleader Plaintiff John Hancock's Motion for Fees and Costs (related document(s) 94 ) filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
99 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion /Objection of Linda P. Lay, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, to the Motion of John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.) for Fees and Costs (related document(s) 94 ) filed by Martin S. Siegel on behalf of Linda P. Lay, individually and as executrix of The Estate of Kenneth L. Lay. with hearing to be held on 8/17/2011 (check with court for location) (Siegel, Martin) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
97 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
96 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
95 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
94 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
93 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
92 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
91 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Statement in Compliance with Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7012(b) (related document(s) 77 ) filed by Michael E. Wiles on behalf of Eugene Shanks, Jr.. (Wiles, Michael) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
90 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
89 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
88 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
87 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
86 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
85 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
84 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
83 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Amended Complaint against Marianne T. O'Toole Filed by Simon I. Allentuch on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. (Allentuch, Simon) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
82 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter (related document(s) 53 ) filed by Simon I. Allentuch on behalf of Marianne T. O'Toole. with hearing to be held on 9/7/2011 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Allentuch, Simon) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
81 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
80 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
79 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
78 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
77 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
76 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
75 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
74 |
Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Jason Hsu (related document(s) 71 , 70 ) filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
73 |
Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Kimberley R. Cameron of Brown Rudnick LLP (related document(s) 72 ) filed by Martin S. Siegel on behalf of Linda P. Lay, individually and as executrix of The Estate of Kenneth L. Lay. (Siegel, Martin) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
72 |
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Blackstone Defendants' Motion to Consolidate (related document(s) 61 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Hobart Truesdell, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration Of Aaron L. Renenger filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 4/28/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Objection to Motion / Objection To Motion To Amend Interpleader Complaint (related document(s) 65 ) filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 04/28/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None |
 |
|
Civil Cover Sheet from U.S. District Court, Case Number: 1102592 Judge Leonard B. Sand (related document(s) 66 ) filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 04/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Withdraw the Reference (related document(s) 66 ) filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Blackstone Defendants' Motion to Consolidate (related document(s) 44 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Hobart Truesdell, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Withdraw the Reference filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None |
Motion to Amend/Correct |
|
Motion to Amend Interpleader Complaint filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). with hearing to be held on 5/5/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) Responses due by 4/28/2011, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Certificate of Service (related document(s) 63 ) filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
(THIS PDF FILE IS CORRUPTED, SEE DOCUMENT # 65 FOR CORRECT ENTRY) Motion to Amend Interpleader Complaint filed by James V. O'Gara on behalf of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A.). with hearing to be held on 5/5/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (O'Gara, James) Modified on 4/18/2011 (Richards, Beverly). (Entered: 04/14/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Rena K. Ceron (related document(s) 60 ) filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 3/1/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Letter to Honorable Shelley C. Chapman to confirm continued hearing regarding the Motion of Karl Terry Seeking Restraining Orders, Sanctions and Other Relief filed by Jordan C. Pilevsky on behalf of Gregory M. Messer. with hearing to be held on 9/20/2011 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 610 (SCC) (Pilevsky, Jordan) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
|
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 2/23/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Answer to Intervenors Complaint (Related Doc # 52 ) filed by Lena Mandel on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Notice)(Mandel, Lena) (Entered: 02/23/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Amy J. Cunningham of Brown Rudnick LLP (related document(s) 58 ) filed by Martin S. Siegel on behalf of Linda P, Lay, Linda P. Lay, individually and as executrix of The Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, Linda P. Lay as Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay. (Siegel, Martin) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None |
|
|
Answer to Interpleader Complaint and Demand for a Jury Trial(related document(s) 52 ) filed by Martin S. Siegel on behalf of Linda P, Lay, Linda P. Lay, individually and as executrix of The Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, Linda P. Lay as Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay. (Siegel, Martin) Modified on 1/25/2011 (Philbert, Gemma). (Entered: 01/25/2011)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference against Enron Creditors Recovery Corp. Answer Due: 2/23/2011; Linda P. Lay, individually and as executrix of The Estate of Kenneth L. Lay Answer Due: 2/23/2011; The Commissioner of the Internal Revenue Service Answer Due: 2/23/2011. (AMENDED Interpleader Summons) Filed by Clerk's Office of the U.S. Bankruptcy Court. with Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/10/2011 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 523 (AJG), (Gomez, Jessica) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
 |
|
Order of U.S. District Court Judge signed on 8/12/2011. ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion for leave to appeal the Bankruptcy Court's August 4, 2010 order (Dkt. No. 36) is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Kenneth M. Karas on 8/12/2011) (Keegan, Fiona) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Withdraw the Reference, Second Amended Summons, First Amended Complaint and Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion of the Lightstone Defendants and the Arbor Defendants to Consolidate (related document(s) 28 , 16 , 30 , 26 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of Hobart Truesdell, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust, The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Second Amended Summons, First Amended Complaint and Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion of the Lightstone Defendants and the Arbor Defendants to Consolidate (related document(s) 31 , 28 , 30 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of Hobart Truesdell, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust, The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Withdraw the Reference and Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion of the Lightstone Defendants and the Arbor Defendants to Consolidate (related document(s) 31 , 16 , 18 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of Hobart Truesdell, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust, The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service of Plaintiffs' Opposition to the Motion of the Lightstone Defendants and the Arbor Defendants to Consolidate (related document(s) 31 ) filed by Marc D. Powers on behalf of Hobart Truesdell, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust, The Extended Stay Litigation Trust, Walker, Truesdell, Roth & Associates, as Trustee for and on behalf of the Extended Stay Litigation Trust. (Powers, Marc) (Entered: 08/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Order signed on 1/24/2011 Granting Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue of Adversary Proceeding (Related Doc # 22 ) . (Rouzeau, Anatin) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information : Motion of Debtor for an Order Granting an Extension of Time to File Schedules of Assets and Liabilities, Statements of Financial Affairs and Lists of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases nunc pro tunc to August 17, 2011 filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Declaration Pursuant to Local Rule 9077-1(a) in Support of Order Scheduling Expedited Hearing on Motion filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice of Proskauer Rose LLP as Proposed Counsel to the Debtor filed by Sheldon Ira Hirshon on behalf of 785 Partners LLC. (Hirshon, Sheldon) (Entered: 08/16/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 2 , 10 , 12 ) filed by Marc E. Hirschfield on behalf of Irving H. Picard, Trustee for the Liquidation of Bernard L. Madoff Investment Securities LLC. (Hirschfield, Marc) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of 341(a) Meeting of Creditors with Certificate of Mailing. (related document(s) (Related Doc # 4 )) . Service Date 08/10/2011. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance filed by Stephen Hogan on behalf of Fuerta Property Limited. (Hogan, Stephen) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers filed by Joseph B. Koczko on behalf of Gill Hess LTD. SSAP, Clodagh Blake, The Astech Pension Fund, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Carmel Kidney, Gill Hess Ltd.-Simon Hess SSAP, David Coen, Frank Murphy, Adrian O'Connor, Denross Ltd. SSAP-Aine Meagher, I.M. Ltd. Pension Scheme, Sean Murphy, Ann Murphy, Breda O'Kennedy, Stephen Church, Rita Fagan SSAP, Gregor Shanik, Patrick Donovan, Dominick Glennane, Phil Dillon, Catherine Day, Iain Craig, Gerardina Murphy, Joe Murphy, Stephen Mackey, Maeve O'Kennedy, Brian O'Kennedy, John Hogan, Gordon D'Arcy. (Koczko, Joseph) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: None, Entered: None |
|
|
Affidavit of Service (related document(s) 7 ) filed by Adam L. Rosen on behalf of First Manhattan Developments REIT. (Rosen, Adam) (Entered: 08/10/2011)
|
|
Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply) |
 |