Ziemak v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-07820
District Judge Gerard E. Lynch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2017 at 4:34 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Richard A. Ziemak, Plaintiff

Represented by Milberg LLP

Represented by Spector Roseman Kodroff & Willis, PC

v.
No Logo Don M. Thomas, Defendant

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Represented by Dechert LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg & Allen, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay K. Goldberg +1 212 766 3366 +1 212 221 6867 jkgoldberg@goldbergandallen.com
No Logo Nicholas A. Ribis, Defendant

Represented by Dechert LLP

No Logo Peter M. Ryan, Defendant

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

No Logo Salomon Brothers Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY RORY O. MILLSON +1 212 474 1000
No Logo TC/GP, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

No Logo Trump Casino, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump's Castle Associates"

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc. Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

No Logo Wallace B. Askins, Defendant

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Trump Hotels and Casino Resorts Holdings, LP Trump Hotels and Casino Resorts Holdings, LP, Nominal Defendant
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc. Trump Hotels & Casino Resorts, Inc., Nominal Defendant
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp

Represented by Willkie Farr & Gallagher, LLP

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Gerard E. Lynch for the date(s) of 12/10/01. (yv) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT:The action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Counsel for pltffs are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $3,000,000 and reimbursement of expenses in the amount of $150,000 which sum the Court finds to be fair and reasonable, to be paid in accordance with the terms of the Settlement. ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 12/19/01. (kg) (Entered: 12/19/2001)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
      fld Compendium of Unreported Opinions Cited in Plntfs' Memo in Support of Joint Application for an award of atty fees (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
        COPENDIUM OF AFFIDAVITS by Richard A. Ziemak in support of [65-1] support memorandum . (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Richard A. Ziemak in support of Joint Application for Atty Fees (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT of Steven Schulman by Richard A. Ziemak in support of [62-1] support memorandum . (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT of Wilbur L. Ross, Jr. by Richard A. Ziemak in support of [62-1] support memorandum . (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Richard A. Ziemak in support of the Proposed Settlement (cd) (Entered: 12/10/2001)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Settlement as to registered owners of the Shares, brokers, dealers, voting trustees, banks, associations and other entities that exercise fiduciary powers in the nominee name or otherwise on behalf of beneficial owners of the Shares by U.S. Mail and hand delivery on 10/26/01 . . (yv) (Entered: 12/07/2001)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: a hearing shall be held on 12/10/01, at 10:00 am in this Court at the US Courthouse, Room 518, 40 Center St., NY NY to determine the fairness, reasonableness and adequacy of the Stipulation and the Settlement, whether the Stipulation and the Settlement should be finally approved by the Court and judgment entered thereon, and to hear and determine any objections to the Settlement, as further set forth in this document ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER; regarding procedures that will govern the handling of "Confidential Information." ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (sac) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/15/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                        STIPULATION and ORDER; that the firm of Jay Goldberg, P.C. , 250 Park Avenue, N.Y.C., 10177 is substituted as counsel of record for dft. Donald J. Trump, in this action in place of Swidler, Berlin, Shereff, Friedman, LLP. . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (pl) (Entered: 03/16/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMO-ENDORSEMENT on Discovery Plan purs. to F.R.C.P. 26(f); approving the parties' proposed discovery plan purs. to F.R.C.P. 26(f) as set forth herein . ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 01/26/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to Fourth Consolidated Amended Shareholders' Derivative Complaint by Salomon Brothers Inc (Attorney Rory O. Millson from the Firm: Cravath, Swaine & Moore). (sn) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None
                              ANSWER to Fourth Consolidated Amended Shareholders' Derivative Complaint by Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis (Attorney Andrew J. Levander, David S. Hoffner from the Firm: Swidler Berlin Shereff Friedman, LLP). (sn) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/20/2000, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Fourth Consolidated Amended Shareholders' Derivative Complaint by Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas., Trump's Castle Hotel (Attorney Richard L. Posen, Thomas H. Golden from the Firm: Willkie Farr & Gallagher). (sn) (Entered: 11/22/2000)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  STIPULATION and ORDER; reset answer to the Fourth Consolidated Amended Stockholders' Derivative Complt. due for 11/17/00 for Salomon Brothers Inc, for Peter M. Ryan, for Don M. Thomas, for Wallace B. Askins, for Nicholas A. Ribis, for Trump Casino, Inc., for Trump's Castle Hotel, for TC/GP, Inc., Trump's Castle Assoc, for Donald J. Trump ; ( signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch ) (lf) (Entered: 11/08/2000)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/11/2000, Entered: None
                                    FOURTH CONSOLIDATED AMENDED STOCKHOLDERS' DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT by Richard A. Ziemak amending [14-1] third amended complaint; Summons issued. (lam) (Entered: 10/12/2000)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/22/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      Notice of reassignment to Judge Gerard E. Lynch . Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Richard L. Posen, David S. Hoffner, Eugene A. Spector, Jeffrey S. Abraham, Steven G. Schulman, Melvyn I. Weiss . (jp) (Entered: 09/25/2000)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/21/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        OPINION & ORDER #84569, granting in part, denying in part [40-1] motion pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 23.1 of the FRCP, dismissing the Third Consolidated Amended Stockholders' Derivative Complaint, granting in part, denying in part [31-1] motion purs. to Rule 12(b) of the F.R.C.P., dismissing the Third Consolidated Amended Stockholder's Derivative Complt. herein in its entirety: granting plntfs' motion for leave to file their Fourth Amended Complaint in accordance with this Opinion within 20 days of the date of this order. Defts shall answer the complaint within 20 days of service ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 09/22/2000)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/3/1999, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of change of counsel's address by Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis (ri) (Entered: 12/07/1999)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            Letter filed by Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump's Castle Hotel, Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan addressed to Judge Batts from Richard L. Posen, dated 4/9/99; Re: counsel for defts' respectfully request that the Court denied pltffs' application to amend further their Third Amended Complaint. (sac) (Entered: 10/25/1999)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              Letter filed by Salomon Brothers Inc addressed to Judge Batts from Frederick A.O. Schwarz, Jr., dated 4/6/99; Re: counsel for deft Salomon Bros. Inc., responds to pltffs' April 2nd letter to this Court. (sac) (Entered: 10/25/1999)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Letter filed by Richard A. Ziemak addressed to Judge Batts from Steven G. Schulman, Robert I. Harwood and Jules Brody, dated 4/2/99; Re: counsel for pltff writes to request leave to amend pltffs' Third Consolidated Amended Stockholders' Derivative Complaint solely to add two demand-related sub-paragraphs, as stated on Exhibit A. hereto. (sac) (Entered: 10/25/1999)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/22/1998, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE OF ADDRESS CHANGE of the firm of Spector & Roseman by Richard A. Ziemak. (kg) (Entered: 12/28/1998)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/4/1998, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of by Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis (sac) (Entered: 08/05/1998)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/15/1998, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address For Willkie Farr & Gallagher, by Donald J. Trump, Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump's Castle Hotel, Trump Casino, Inc. (indicated on the system) (cd) (Entered: 05/18/1998)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: None
                                                        Supplemental Rule 26 & 34 Requests (ae) (Entered: 12/24/1997)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Salomon Brothers Inc in reply and in further support of [40-1] motion pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 23.1 of the FRCP, dismissing the Third Consolidated Amended Stockholders' Derivative Complaint (ae) (Entered: 12/24/1997)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/1997, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Salomon Brothers Inc; pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) and 23.1 of the FRCP, dismissing the Third Consolidated Amended Stockholders' Derivative Complaint (ae) (Entered: 12/24/1997)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/15/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter to Judge Batts from Steven G. Schulman dated 12/3/97; pltffs request permission to file a surreply brief should Salomon attempt -- improperly -- to include any new arguments in such a brief that it could and should have advanced in its opening on its motion to dismiss and/or exceed the issues as framed by pltffs in their opposition brief. Application denied ; ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (ls) Modified on 12/18/1997 (Entered: 12/17/1997)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis, Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. in support of their motion to dismiss the complt. (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                  Rule 1.9 certificate filed by Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump Casino, Inc., Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis, Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. in support of their motion to dismiss the complt. (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT in support of Richard L. Posen by Trump's Castle Hotel, TC/GP, Inc., Trump Casino, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis, Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. Re: [31-1] motion purs. to Rule 12(b) of the F.R.C.P., dismissing the Third Cponsolidated Amended Stockholder's Derivative Complt. herein in its entirety (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Justin J. Daniels by Salomon Brothers Inc Re: Salomon Brothers Inc's motion to dismiss the third consolidated amended stockholders' derivative complt. purs. to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) and 23.1 (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM by Richard A. Ziemak in opposition to defts' motions to dismiss (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM by Salomon Brothers Inc in support of deft Salomon Brothers Inc's motion to dismiss the third consolidated amended stockholders' derivative complt (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION by Trump's Castle Hotel, TC/GP, Inc., Trump Casino, Inc., Donald J. Trump, Nicholas A. Ribis, Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas.; purs. to Rule 12(b) of the F.R.C.P., dismissing the Third Cponsolidated Amended Stockholder's Derivative Complt. herein in its entirety ; affdvt. in support of motion attached; return date not entered on motion (ls) (Entered: 12/16/1997)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/10/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Filed Memo Endorsement on letter to Judge Batts from Richard Posen, dated 12/2/97, granting defts' request for leave to file an oversized joint reply memorandum of law in further support of defts' motion to dismiss the Stockholders' Third Amended Consolidated Complaint ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (cd) (Entered: 12/15/1997)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/9/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter by Frederick A. O. Schwarz, Jr. to Judge Batts dated 12/1/97, granting Salomon's request for leave to file an oversized reply brief on the present motion to dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Complaint ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (ae) (Entered: 12/10/1997)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/14/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER; defts shall have until 12/9/97, to serve any reply brief(s) in further support of their motions to dismiss the Third Amended Consolidated Derivative Complaint ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (sac) (Entered: 11/17/1997)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/22/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter to Judge Batts from Steven G. Schulman dated 10/20/97, granting plaintiffs' request to file an oversized brief in opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss (signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts) (djc) (Entered: 10/23/1997)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/9/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER, plaintiffs shall have until 10/24/97 to file and serve any brief(s) in opposition to defendants' motions to dismiss the amended complaint; defendants shall have until 11/17/97 to file and serve their reply(s) on any motions to dismiss ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (kw) (Entered: 09/10/1997)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/6/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Filed Memo-Endorsement on letter dated 8/4/97 from Richard L. Posen, granting defendants' request to file a memorandum of law in excess of the usual page limit; if necessary, plaintiffs will have permission for an oversized brief in response. The Court deems it appropriate to note at this time that I have worked professionally in the past both with Fritz Schwarz of Cravath, where I was an associate (1973-79) and Andy Levander when we were both AUSA's in the SDNY (I was there 1979-84) ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (kw) Modified on 08/11/1997 (Entered: 08/07/1997)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                            Letter filed by Richard L. Posen, atty for Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump's Castle Hotel, Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. dated 7/8/97. Also writing for counsel for Donald Trump and Nicholas Ribis. Writing in response to Mr. Schulman's 7/2 and 7/7/97 letters. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                              Letter filed by Steven G. Schulman, atty for pltffs dated 7/7/97 re pltffs believe that Colony Capital's 7/3/97 letter and opposition should by disregarded. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                Letter filed by Martin L. Seidel, atty for non-party Colony Capital In. dated 7/3/97 re writing to oppose pltffs' request for permission to file a motion to compel in connection with their subpoena of Colony in the litigation. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Letter filed by Steven G. Schulman, atty for pltffs dated 7/2/97 re pltffs' limited 3rd party discovery request and defts' effort to quash such discovery. It is important to point out that each of the cases relied upon by defts involved a situation where a stay was sought under the PSLRA in light of a pending motion to dismiss, as contemplated by the statute, and unlike the situation here. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Letter filed by Richard L. Posen, atty for Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump's Castle Hotel, Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. dated 7/1/97 . Also writing on behalf of counsel for Donald J. Trump and Nicholas A. Ribis. Writing in response to Mr. Schulman's 6/25/97 letter concerning pltffs' efforts to obtain discovery from Colony Capital, Inc. in advance of defts' filing a motion to dismiss pltff's 3rd Consolidated Amended Stockholders' Derivative Complaint. We believe such discovery would be inappropriate at this time. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Letter filed by Steven G. Schulman, Robert I. Harwood and Jules Brody, atty for pltffs dated 6/25/97 re in response to the 6/16/97 letter by defts in opposition to pltffs' 6/10/97 letter request for a pre-motion conference with respect to pltffs' effor to obtain production of relevant documents form non-party Colony Capital, Inc. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Letter filed by Richard L. Posen, atty for Trump's Castle Assoc, TC/GP, Inc., Trump's Castle Hotel, Trump Casino, Inc., Wallace B. Askins, Don M. Thomas, Peter M. Ryan, Trump Hotels & Casin, Trump Hotels & Cas. dated 6/16/97 re writing in response to Mr. Schulman's 6/10/97 letter requesting a pre-motion conference or, in the alternative, permission to file a motion to compel discovery from a non-party. We submit that pltffs are not entitled to the discovery they seek. (lam) (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          OPINION AND ORDER #79037, plaintiffs' motion to compel document discovery from 3rd party Colonial Capital is denied ; discovery is stayed pending the resolution of the dismissal motion to be filed by defendants on 8/11/97 ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman ); Copies mailed.(pl) Modified on 08/12/1997 (Entered: 08/06/1997)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Letter filed by Richard A. Ziemak, dated 6/10/97 re pre-motion conference (cd) (Entered: 08/05/1997)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/10/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for discovery motion ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman (cd) (Entered: 07/10/1997)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                THIRD CONSOLIDATED AMENDED STOCKHOLDERS' DERIVATIVE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Richard A. Ziemak, (Answer due 7/9/97 for Salomon Brothers Inc, for Peter M. Ryan, for Don M. Thomas, for Wallace B. Askins, for Nicholas A. Ribis, for Trump Casino, Inc., for Trump's Castle Hotel, for TC/GP, Inc., for Trump's Castle Assoc, for Donald J. Trump ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (pl) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntary dismissal as to Colony Capital Inc., w/out prejudice and w/out costs, as a defendant in the above-referenced litigation. ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (ae) (Entered: 06/02/1997)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/30/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER, plaintiff shall serve and file a Third Amended Consolidated Derivative Complaint 30 days from the date of this Order , defendants shall have 45 days from service of the Third Amended Consolidated Derivative Complaint to answer or otherwise move against it; plaintiffs shall have 45 days from service of any motion to dismiss to oppose any such motion; defendants shall have 15 days from the service of plaintiffs' brief in opposition to any such motion to serve theri reply; and defendants shall have until 45 days after the service to plaintiffs' Third Amended Consolidated Derivative Complaint. ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (ae) (Entered: 06/02/1997)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      fld Verification of Stockholders' Second Amended Complaint (cd) (Entered: 04/03/1997)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Affidavit of service of the Second Consolidated Amended Derivative Complaint as to Colony Capital Inc. by personal service, leaving with Grett Dill, managing agent on 3/25/97. (lam) (Entered: 03/28/1997)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          STOCKHOLDERS' SECOND CONSOLIDATED AMENDED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT amending [7-1] amended complaint ; Summons issued. (lam) (Entered: 03/25/1997)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/7/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER, plaintiffs shall have until Marech 24, 1997 tofile an amended complaint; 2 defendants shall continue to have 45 days from service of the amended complaint to answer or otherwise move agianst the amended complaint; plaintiffs shall continue to have 45 days from the service of any motion to dismiss plaintiffs' amended complaint to oppose any such motion; defendants shall continue to have 15 days from the service of plaintiffs' brief in opposition to any such motion to file and serve their reply on any motion to dismiss; defendants shall have until 45 days after the service of plaintiffs' amended complaint to respond to object to plaintiffs' first reuqest for production of documents; and nothing herein shall affect the defendants' right to assert that the complaint contemplated by paragraph 1 herein may not be filed without prior court approval pursuant to Rule 15(d) of the FRCP. ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (djc) (Entered: 03/11/1997)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              STOCKHOLDERS' CONSOLIDATED AMENDED DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT, W/ JURY DEMAND amending [1-1] complaint ; (ls) (Entered: 01/22/1997)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/6/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL ORDER filed re consolidation and amending the caption ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (cd) Modified on 01/09/1997 (Entered: 01/07/1997)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER, extending Salmon's time to answer to the complaint shall be extended to 12/5/96 , reset answer due for 12/5/96 for Salomon Brothers Inc ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (kg) (Entered: 11/13/1996)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER, extending time for the defts to answer to the complaint is extended to 12/5/96 , reset answer due for 12/5/96 for Salomon Brothers Inc, for Peter M. Ryan, for Don M. Thomas, for Wallace B. Askins, for Nicholas A. Ribis, for Trump Casino, Inc., for Trump's Castle Hotel, for TC/GP, Inc., for Trump's Castle Assoc, for Donald J. Trump ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ). (kg) (Entered: 11/13/1996)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Summons with Affidavit of service of summons & complaint as to Trump's Castle Associates by personally delivering to deft on 10/18/96 Answer due on 11/7/96 for Trump's Castle Associates. (kg) (Entered: 11/12/1996)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Rule 9 certificate filed by Richard A. Ziemak (ba) (Entered: 10/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/16/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 272509 (ba) (Entered: 10/21/1996)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 451 times.

                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?