Initial Public Offer, et al v. , et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-02014
District Judge William H. Pauley, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Glen Billing, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston Corp."
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Edward Seltzer, Defendant
JPMorgan Securities, Inc. JPMorgan Securities, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, CHEMICAL BANKING CORP
Officer/Director, Goodrich Petroleum Corp
Officer/Director, Peloton Resources Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David W. Ichel +1 212 455 2000 +1 212 455 2502 dichel@stblaw.com
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp
No Logo Louis Capolino, Defendant
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Merrill Lynch International Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch International
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, Infospace.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fund Asset Management Lp
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Princeton Administrators Lp
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Officer/Director, Bank of America, NA
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Koll Real Estate Group Inc
Officer/Director, Uslife Income Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund II Inc
No Logo Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Bradbury +1 202 879 5000
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

No Logo Anita S. Budich, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Anthony Voto, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Anupkumar Bhasin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo BERT ZAUDERER, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Binh Nguyen, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Brad Harrison, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Lite DePalma Greenberg & Rivas, LLC

No Logo Bruce J. Jiorle, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Buddy Dukeman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Carlos Reeberg, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David Federico, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo David Pazarella, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo Demetrios Petratos, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Deming Zhous, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Don K. Burris, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Dr. Bajrang Agarwal, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jonathan K. Lagemann, Esq.,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Kord Lagemann +1 212 599 0990
No Logo Efriam Simcha, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Beatie & Osborn LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Russel H. Beatie, Jr. +1 212 888 9000 +1 212 888 9664 bhunter@bandolaw.com
No Logo Estelle L. Augustine, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Farideh Sigari, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Glenn Kerr, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo H. Wayne Jones, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Starr & Holman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Zachary Alan Starr +1 212 684 6442
No Logo Hans Reihl, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Heinz Wahl, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Henry Sklanowsky, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo JERRY COBB, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Joe Braswell, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Joe Goldgrab, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth Shives, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Lennard Steinberg, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Sculnick, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Matthew Weiner, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Michael S Weiss, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Milton Pfeiffer, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Mita Aggarwal, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Louis F. Burke PC

No Logo Philip Warner, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Rachel Schwartz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Raymond Lance Huffman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Raymond Litwin, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Robert Grovich, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Robert H Thomas, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Roderick Lau, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Ross Wiczer, Consolidated Plaintiff

Represented by Louis F. Burke PC

No Logo Susan Katz, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Tom Barnett, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mary Jane Fait +1 312 984 0000 +1 312 984 0001 fait@whafh.com
No Logo Troy Brooks, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Bill Lucia, Appellant
No Logo Bob Harper, Appellant
No Logo David Federico, Appellant
No Logo David Hoffman, Appellant
No Logo Don K. Burris, Appellant
No Logo Eileen Dukeman, Appellant
No Logo Elizabeth Bates Lester, Appellant
No Logo Enrico Tavani, Appellant
No Logo Irving Lassoff, Appellant
No Logo James W. Lester, Appellant
No Logo Joyce Dunn, Appellant
No Logo Max Cohen, Appellant
No Logo Michele Lucia, Appellant
No Logo Norman Ross, Appellant
No Logo Ray L. Cox, Appellant
No Logo Robert Malafronte, Appellant
No Logo Robert Tarantino, Appellant
No Logo Solomon Lissanu, Appellant
No Logo Binh Nguyen, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Michael G. Weiss, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Robert Grovich, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Robert H Thomas, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Comerica, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston LLC Credit Suisse First Boston LLC, Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse First Boston, Inc."
Officer/Director, Expressjet Holdings Inc
No Logo Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Distributors Corporation, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Co., Consolidated Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morgan & Co."
No Logo Janus Capital Corporation, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Shaphard Goldfein +2 127 352 0000
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc."
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated"
Director, Toy Biz, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pagemart Wireless, Inc.
Officer/Director, Vital Images, Inc.
Officer/Director, Xcyte Therapies, Inc.
Officer/Director, Websense, Inc.
Officer/Director, Silgan Holdings Inc.
Officer/Director, Msci Inc.
Officer/Director, Allegiance Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Wci Communities, Inc.
Officer/Director, Gramercy Capital Corp.
Officer/Director, Discover Financial Services
Officer/Director, Cadiz Land Co Inc
Officer/Director, Ivf America Inc /de
Officer/Director, Jefferson Smurfit Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Imre Corp
Officer/Director, Uniholding Corp
Officer/Director, Cardiac Pathways Corp
Officer/Director, Impsat Corp
Officer/Director, Allscripts Inc /il
Officer/Director, Allscripts Holding Inc
Officer/Director, Psf Group Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Acquicor Technology Inc
Officer/Director, Constant Contact, Inc.
Officer/Director, Big Entertainment, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Digitalglobe, Inc.
Officer/Director, Remec, Inc.
Officer/Director, Golden Tan, Inc
Officer/Director, Ms Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, NB Telecom, Inc.
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Lazarus Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Texas Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Innocoll Holdings plc
Officer/Director, Visions In Glass Inc
Officer/Director, Bloom Energy Corp
Officer/Director, Leisure Acquisition Corp.
Officer/Director, Rps Realty Trust
Officer/Director, Symix Systems, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cfw Communications Co
Officer/Director, Saratogo Holdings I Inc
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Bradbury +1 202 879 5000
No Logo Van Wagoner Capital Management, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Van Wagoner Funds, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1
Nature of Suit 410 - Anti-Trust
  Entries (172) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 154 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, Lennard Steinberg, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Philip Warner, Raymond Lance Huffman, Glen Billing, Bajrang Agarwal, Anupkumar Bhasin, Hans Reihl, Henry Sklanowsky, Brad Harrison, Buddy Dukeman, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Mita Aggarwal, Joe Braswell, David Pazarella, Heinz Wahl, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Roderick Lau, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Milton Pfeiffer, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Glenn Kerr, 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Milton Pfeiffer USCA Case Number 03-9284-cv(L); 03-9288-cv(CON). It is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of this Court be, and it hereby is VACATED, and judgment of the District Court is AFFIRMED in accordance with the opinion of the United States Supreme Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 8/14/07. (tp) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
    TRUE COPY ORDER of USCA as to 158 Amended Notice of Appeal,,,,, filed by Enrico Tavani, Robert Tarantino, Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, David Hoffman, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Ray L. Cox, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Bill Lucia, Solomon Lissanu, Bob Harper, Philip Warner, Glen Billing, Anupkumar Bhasin, Hans Reihl, Irving Lassoff, Henry Sklanowsky, Buddy Dukeman, James W. Lester, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Mita Aggarwal, Joe Braswell, Eileen Dukeman, David Pazarella, Heinz Wahl, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Edward Seltzer, Elizabeth Bates Lester, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Max Cohen, Robert Malafronte, Roderick Lau, Michele Lucia, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, Norman Ross, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Don K. Burris, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Louis Capolino, Joyce Dunn, Glenn Kerr, 154 Notice of Appeal,,,,, filed by Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, Lennard Steinberg, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Philip Warner, Raymond Lance Huffman, Glen Billing, Anupkumar Bhasin, Bajrang Agarwal, Hans Reihl, Henry Sklanowsky, Brad Harrison, Buddy Dukeman, Joe Braswell, Mita Aggarwal, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Heinz Wahl, David Pazarella, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Roderick Lau, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Milton Pfeiffer, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Glenn Kerr, 153 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Milton Pfeiffer USCA Case Number 03-9284-cv(L), 03-9288-cv(CON). The United States Supreme Court having granted Certiorari in the above-entitled case, and the Supreme having reversed the judgment of this Court and remanded the matter for further proceedings consistent with the opinion of the Supreme Court, upon consideration thereof, it is ORDERED that the judgment of this Court be, and it hereby is vacated, and the judgment of the District Court is affirmed in accordance with the opinion of the United States Supreme Court. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 8/14/2007. (nd) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Change of Party Name. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (cd) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
        Appeal Record Sent to Supreme Court of the United States (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 158 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Enrico Tavani, Robert Tarantino, Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, David Hoffman, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Ray L. Cox, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Bill Lucia, Solomon Lissanu, Bob Harper, Philip Warner, Glen Billing, Anupkumar Bhasin, Hans Reihl, Irving Lassoff, Henry Sklanowsky, Buddy Dukeman, James W. Lester, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Mita Aggarwal, Joe Braswell, Eileen Dukeman, David Pazarella, Heinz Wahl, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Edward Seltzer, Elizabeth Bates Lester, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Max Cohen, Robert Malafronte, Roderick Lau, Michele Lucia, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, Norman Ross, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Don K. Burris, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Louis Capolino, Joyce Dunn, Glenn Kerr, 154 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, Lennard Steinberg, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Philip Warner, Raymond Lance Huffman, Glen Billing, Anupkumar Bhasin, Bajrang Agarwal, Hans Reihl, Henry Sklanowsky, Brad Harrison, Buddy Dukeman, Joe Braswell, Mita Aggarwal, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Heinz Wahl, David Pazarella, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Roderick Lau, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Milton Pfeiffer, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Glenn Kerr, 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Milton Pfeiffer, USCA Case Number 03-9284(L); 03-9288(CON), Supreme Court of the United States 05-1157, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the Supreme Court of the United States. (tp) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2007 (Thomas, Dave). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
          First Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Supplemental Index to the record on Appeal for 158 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Enrico Tavani, Robert Tarantino, Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, David Hoffman, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Ray L. Cox, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Bill Lucia, Solomon Lissanu, Bob Harper, Philip Warner, Glen Billing, Anupkumar Bhasin, Hans Reihl, Irving Lassoff, Henry Sklanowsky, Buddy Dukeman, James W. Lester, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Mita Aggarwal, Joe Braswell, Eileen Dukeman, David Pazarella, Heinz Wahl, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Edward Seltzer, Elizabeth Bates Lester, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Max Cohen, Robert Malafronte, Roderick Lau, Michele Lucia, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, Norman Ross, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Don K. Burris, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Louis Capolino, Joyce Dunn, Glenn Kerr, 154 Notice of Appeal,,,,, filed by Jerry Cobb, Matthew Weiner, H. Wayne Jones, Tom Barnett, Lennard Steinberg, Joe Goldgrab, Kenneth Shives, Robert Grovich, Demetrios Petratos, Mark Sculnick, Ross Wiczer, Binh Nguyen, Rachel Schwartz, Efriam Simcha, Philip Warner, Raymond Lance Huffman, Glen Billing, Anupkumar Bhasin, Bajrang Agarwal, Hans Reihl, Henry Sklanowsky, Brad Harrison, Buddy Dukeman, Joe Braswell, Mita Aggarwal, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Heinz Wahl, David Pazarella, Carlos Reeberg, Michael S. Weiss, Deming Zhous, Bruce J. Jiorle, Roderick Lau, Anita S. Budich, Bert Zauderer, Raymond Litwin, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Anthony Voto, Milton Pfeiffer, Troy Brooks, Estelle L. Augustine, Robert H. Thomas, Susan Katz, Glenn Kerr, 153 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Milton Pfeiffer USCA Case Number 03-9284-cv(L); 03-9288-cv(CON), 3 Copies of the index, Certified Supplemental Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (tp) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2007 (Thomas, Dave). (Entered: 02/09/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER: Accordingly, Plaintiffs' application for a modification of the order staying discovery is denied. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 6/26/06) (js, ) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Russell Beatie dated 5/9/06 re: plantiffs request that the court modify the order staying discovery. Document filed by Efriam Simcha, Milton Pfeiffer.(dle, ) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Robert McCaw dated 5/15/06 re: response to letter dated 5/9/06 from Russel Beatie. Document filed by Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated, Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., The Goldman, Sachs Group, Inc., Lehman Brothers, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Edward Seltzer, Louis Capolino, Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston, Inc., Fidelity Distributors Corporation, Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Co., Janus Capital Corporation, Comerica, Inc., Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Van Wagoner Capital Management, Inc., Van Wagoner Funds, Inc., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., BancBoston Robertson, Stephens, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc..(dle, ) (Entered: 05/22/2006)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None
                  ORDER of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Milton Pfeiffer. It is hereby Ordered that the motion to stay the mandate pending determination of petition for a writ of certiorari is GRANTED. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 3/9/06. (tp, ) (Entered: 03/21/2006)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT of Shepard Goldfein in support of substitution of counsel for Janus Capital Corporation. Document filed by Janus Capital Corporation. (dle, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER; the firm Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP is substituted as counsel of record for the defendant, Janus Capital Corporation in place of the firm of Pollack & Kaminsky. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 2/28/2006) (kco, ) (Entered: 03/03/2006)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 10/21/2005, Entered: None
                        MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 158 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Edward Seltzer, Max Cohen, Susan Katz, Michael S. Weiss, David Hoffman, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Anita S. Budich, Glen Billing, Mita Aggarwal, Bert Zauderer, Buddy Dukeman, Eileen Dukeman, Kenneth Shives, Anupkumar Bhasin, Raymond Litwin, Roderick Lau, Tom Barnett, David Pazarella, Henry Sklanowsky, Demetrios Petratos, Rachel Schwartz, Anthony Voto, Ross Wiczer, Deming Zhous, Mark Sculnick, H. Wayne Jones, Don K. Burris, Glenn Kerr, Robert Grovich, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl, Bruce J. Jiorle, Estelle L. Augustine, Joe Braswell, Efriam Simcha, Farideh Sigari, Matthew Weiner, David Federico, Philip Warner, Jerry Cobb, Troy Brooks, Carlos Reeberg, Joe Goldgrab, Robert H. Thomas, Binh Nguyen, Robert Malafronte, Joyce Dunn, Louis Capolino, Ray L. Cox, Bob Harper, Irving Lassoff, Elizabeth Bates Lester, James W. Lester, Solomon Lissanu, Michele Lucia, Bill Lucia, Norman Ross, Robert Tarantino, Enrico Tavani, 153 Notice of Appeal, filed by Milton Pfeiffer, 154 Notice of Appeal, filed by Susan Katz, Michael S. Weiss, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Anita S. Budich, Glen Billing, Mita Aggarwal, Bajrang Agarwal, Bert Zauderer, Buddy Dukeman, Kenneth Shives, Anupkumar Bhasin, Raymond Litwin, Roderick Lau, Tom Barnett, David Pazarella, Henry Sklanowsky, Demetrios Petratos, Rachel Schwartz, Anthony Voto, Ross Wiczer, Deming Zhous, Raymond Lance Huffman, Mark Sculnick, H. Wayne Jones, Glenn Kerr, Robert Grovich, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl, Bruce J. Jiorle, Estelle L. Augustine, Joe Braswell, Efriam Simcha, Farideh Sigari, Matthew Weiner, David Federico, Philip Warner, Jerry Cobb, Troy Brooks, Carlos Reeberg, Joe Goldgrab, Brad Harrison, Robert H. Thomas, Binh Nguyen, Milton Pfeiffer, Lennard Steinberg, USCA Case Number 03-9284(L); 03-9288(CON). It is hereby Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court be and it hereby is VACATED and REMANDED in accordance with the opinion of this court. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Issued As Mandate: 10/20/05. (tp, ) (Entered: 10/25/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Mary Jane Fait on behalf of Tom Barnett. New Address: Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC, 55 West Monroe Street, Suite 1111, Chicago, Illinois, 60603, (312) 984-0000, (312) 984-0001, URL: http://www.whafh.com (ae, ) (Entered: 03/15/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 5/27/2004, Entered: None
                            Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 158 Amended Notice of Appeal,,,,, filed by Edward Seltzer, Max Cohen, Susan Katz, Michael S. Weiss, David Hoffman, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Anita S. Budich, Glen Billing, Mita Aggarwal, Bert Zauderer, Buddy Dukeman, Eileen Dukeman, Kenneth Shives, Anupkumar Bhasin, Raymond Litwin, Roderick Lau, Tom Barnett, David Pazarella, Henry Sklanowsky, Demetrios Petratos, Rachel Schwartz, Anthony Voto, Ross Wiczer, Deming Zhous, Mark Sculnick, H. Wayne Jones, Don K. Burris, Glenn Kerr, Robert Grovich, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl, Bruce J. Jiorle, Estelle L. Augustine, Joe Braswell, Efriam Simcha, Farideh Sigari, Matthew Weiner, David Federico, Philip Warner, Jerry Cobb, Troy Brooks, Carlos Reeberg, Joe Goldgrab, Robert H. Thomas, Binh Nguyen, Robert Malafronte, Joyce Dunn, Louis Capolino, Ray L. Cox, Bob Harper, Irving Lassoff, Elizabeth Bates Lester, James W. Lester, Solomon Lissanu, Michele Lucia, Bill Lucia, Norman Ross, Robert Tarantino, Enrico Tavani, 154 Notice of Appeal,,,,, filed by Susan Katz, Michael S. Weiss, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Anita S. Budich, Glen Billing, Mita Aggarwal, Bajrang Agarwal, Bert Zauderer, Buddy Dukeman, Kenneth Shives, Anupkumar Bhasin, Raymond Litwin, Roderick Lau, Tom Barnett, David Pazarella, Henry Sklanowsky, Demetrios Petratos, Rachel Schwartz, Anthony Voto, Ross Wiczer, Deming Zhous, Raymond Lance Huffman, Mark Sculnick, H. Wayne Jones, Glenn Kerr, Robert Grovich, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl, Bruce J. Jiorle, Estelle L. Augustine, Joe Braswell, Efriam Simcha, Farideh Sigari, Matthew Weiner, David Federico, Philip Warner, Jerry Cobb, Troy Brooks, Carlos Reeberg, Joe Goldgrab, Brad Harrison, Robert H. Thomas, Binh Nguyen, Milton Pfeiffer, Lennard Steinberg, 153 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by Milton Pfeiffer USCA Case Number 03-9284-cv(L), 03-9288-cv(CON), 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (pr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/20/2007 (Thomas, Dave). (Entered: 05/27/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                              AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL re: 154 Notice of Appeal, 156 Order. Document filed by Enrico Tavani, Robert Tarantino, Edward Seltzer, Norman Ross, Robert Malafronte, Bill Lucia, Michele Lucia, Solomon Lissanu, James W. Lester, Elizabeth Bates Lester, Irving Lassoff, David Hoffman, Bob Harper, David Federico, Joyce Dunn, Eileen Dukeman, Ray L. Cox, Max Cohen, Louis Capolino, Don K. Burris, Mita Aggarwal, Estelle L. Augustine, Tom Barnett, Anupkumar Bhasin, Glen Billing, Joe Braswell, Troy Brooks, Anita S. Budich, Jerry Cobb, Buddy Dukeman, Joe Goldgrab, Robert Grovich, Bruce J. Jiorle, H. Wayne Jones, Susan Katz, Glenn Kerr, Roderick Lau, Raymond Litwin, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Binh Nguyen, David Pazarella, Demetrios Petratos, Carlos Reeberg, Hans Reihl, Rachel Schwartz, Mark Sculnick, Kenneth Shives, Farideh Sigari, Efriam Simcha, Henry Sklanowsky, Robert H. Thomas, Anthony Voto, Heinz Wahl, Philip Warner, Matthew Weiner, Michael S. Weiss, Ross Wiczer, Bert Zauderer, Deming Zhous. Copies of Amended Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Russel H. Beatie, Richard A. Cirillo, Gandolfo V. DiBlasi, Silverman Moses, James Benedict, Steven G. Bradbury, Andrew J. Frackman, Robert B. McCaw, Barry R. Ostrager, Randy M. Mastro, Joel M. Mitnick, John D. Donovan, W. Hans Koblet, Scott E. Mortman, Kevin C. Logue, S.E.C., U.S.D.O.J., Attorney General, NYS. (tp, ) (Entered: 05/14/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/22/2004, Entered: None
                                MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) USCA Case Number 03-9284-cv. Parties are advised that appellate review of the lower court's disposition regarding any such motion requires a timely filed amended notice of appeal. Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk USCA. Certified: 4/5/04. (tp, ) (Entered: 04/22/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 4/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER re: 151 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Glen Billing. The Sherman Act Plaintiffs' motion for partial reconsideration of this Court's 11/3/03 Memorandum and Order is denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley III on 4/13/04) (jco, ) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: 151 Motion for Reconsideration. Document filed by BancBoston Robertson, Stephens, Inc., Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Comerica, Inc., Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Credit Suisse First Boston, Inc., Fidelity Brokerage Services LLC, Fidelity Distributors Corporation, Fidelity Investments Institutional Services Co., J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Janus Capital Corporation, Lehman Brothers, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated, The Goldman, Sachs Group, Inc., Van Wagoner Capital Management, Inc., Van Wagoner Funds, Inc.. (db, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL from 150 Judgment,,, 149 Order,,. Document filed by Plaintiffs, Bajrang Agarwal, Mita Aggarwal, Estelle L. Augustine, Tom Barnett, Anupkumar Bhasin, Glen Billing, Joe Braswell, Troy Brooks, Anita S. Budich, Jerry Cobb, Buddy Dukeman, David Federico, Joe Goldgrab, Robert Grovich, Brad Harrison, Raymond Lance Huffman, Bruce J. Jiorle, H. Wayne Jones, Susan Katz, Glenn Kerr, Roderick Lau, Raymond Litwin, Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund, Binh Nguyen, David Pazarella, Demetrios Petratos, Milton Pfeiffer, Carlos Reeberg, Hans Reihl, Rachel Schwartz, Mark Sculnick, Kenneth Shives, Farideh Sigari, Efriam Simcha, Henry Sklanowsky, Lennard Steinberg, Robert H. Thomas, Anthony Voto, Heinz Wahl, Philip Warner, Matthew Weiner, Michael S. Weiss, Ross Wiczer, Bert Zauderer, Deming Zhous. Filing fee $ 255, receipt number E492576. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Russell H. Beatie, Esq., Richard A. Cirillo, Gandolfo V. DiBlasi, Moses Silverman, James Benedict, Steven G. Bradbury, Andrew J. frackman, Robert B. McCaw, Barry R. Ostrager, Randy M. Mastro, Joel M. Mitnick, John D. Donovan, W. Hans Kobelt, Scott E. Mortman, Kevin C. Logue, Mark Pennington, Robert B. Nicholason and Jay L. Himes.. (dt, ) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/3/2003, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL from 150 Judgment. Document filed by Milton Pfeiffer, on behalf of himself and the members of the proposed class. Filing fee $ 255.00, paid on 12/3/03, receipt number E 492659. Copies of Notice of Appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Christopher Lovell, Melvyn Weiss, Richard S. Schiffrin, Howard B. Sirota, Fred Taylor Isquith, Richard A. Cirillo, Gandolofo V. DiBlasi, John L. Harriman, David H. Braff, Moses Silverman, Philip G. Barber, Andrew Tauber, James N. Benedict, Kenneth A. Gallo, Jon R. Roellke, Steven G. Bradbury, Andrew B. Clubok, Brant W. Bishop, Andrew J. Frackman, Richard G. Parker, Robert M. Stern, Robert B. McCaw, Ali Stoeppelwerth, Fraiser L. Hunter, Jr., Barry R. Ostrager, David W. Ichel, Randy M. Masstro, John A. Herford, Joel M. Mitnick, Robert G.Jones, Daniel A. Pollack, Edward T. McDermott, Steven Wolowitz, Gerald J. Fields, Mark Pennington, Robert B.Nicholson, Jay L. Himes,. (pr, ) (Entered: 12/04/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Glen Billing in support of [151-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the Local Rules to reconsider dismissal of State Antitrust Claims upon the grounds of implied immunity . (db) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/18/2003, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Glen Billing for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the Local Rules to reconsider dismissal of State Antitrust Claims upon the grounds of implied immunity . No Return Date indicated. (db) (Entered: 11/20/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/5/2003, Entered: None
                                              JUDGMENT, that for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated November 3, 2003, the Underwriter Defendants' motion to dismiss this action on the grounds of implied immunity is granted, and both the Sherman Act Complaint and the Robinson-Patman Act Complaint are dismissed with prejudice as against all defendants; accordingly, the case is closed. ( signed by J. Michael McMahon, Clerk of Court ); Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. Entered On Docket: 11/6/03. (tp) (Entered: 11/06/2003)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; granting [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint. For the reasons set forth on this order, the Underwriter defendants' motion to dismiss this action on the grounds of implied immunity is granted, and both the Sherman Act Complaint and the Robinson-Patman Act Complaint are dismissed with prejudice as against all defendants. The Clerk of Court is directed to mark this case closed. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed by Chambers. Document sent to Judgment Clerk. (sb) (Entered: 11/04/2003)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 9/22/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER; granting [132-1] motion for leave to submit, for the convenience of the Court, a "Table of Authorities" to their Letter Brief and to file a "corrected copy" of the Letter, addressing these erata (all citations are to the January 2003 letter submitted yesterday) . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); copies mailed by chambers (pl) (Entered: 09/23/2003)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER, that the Court is granting the [146-1] motion for an order substituting Randy M. Mastro and John A. Herfort of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, L.L.P. for Arthur D. Felsenfeld and Stewart L. Klein of Andrews & Kurth, L.L.P. as counsel of record for Bear Stearns in this matter. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ). (tp) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 7/29/2003
                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Bear, Stearns & Co. for an order substituting Randy Mastro and John Herfort of Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, L.L.P. for Arthur Felsenfeld and Stewart L. Klein of Andrews & Kurth LLP as counsel of record for Bear Stearns in this matter . Return Date 8/6/03 at 9:00. (dle) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 7/24/2003, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of Randy M. Mastro by Dft Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. in support of their motion to substitute counsel of record. (dle) (Entered: 07/28/2003)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Letter filed by S.E.C. addressed to Judge Pauley from Mark Pennington, dated 1/13/03, re: Memorandum Amicus Curiae. (sb) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM AMICUS CURIAE of the Securities and Exchange Commission, submitted at the request of the Court. (sb) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW, by Amicus Curiae SEC re: implied imunity and regulation should be handled by the SEC (cd) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of change of party name by Salomon Smith Barney . (yv) (Entered: 06/05/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of January 17, 2003. (dt) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    Letter filed by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney, Morgan Stanley Dean, Merrill Lynch & Co., Credit Suisse First, Fidelity Distributor, Fidelity Brokerage, Fidelity Investments, Janus Capital Corp., Comerica, Inc., Van Wagoner Capital, Van Wagoner Funds, J.P. Morgan Inc. addressed to Judge Pauley from Robert B. McCaw, dated 2/12/03, re: Response to submission from NY Atty. Gen. on the implied immunity issue. (sb) (Entered: 02/28/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Letter filed by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney, Morgan Stanley Dean, Merrill Lynch & Co., Credit Suisse First, Fidelity Distributor, Fidelity Brokerage, Fidelity Investments, Janus Capital Corp., Comerica, Inc., Van Wagoner Capital, Van Wagoner Funds, J.P. Morgan Inc. addressed to Judge Pauley from Robert B. McCaw, dated 2/3/03, re: Immunity argument. (sb) (Entered: 02/28/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Letter filed by State of NY, as amicus curiae, addressed to Judge Pauley from Jay L. Himes, dated 2/5/03, re: Antitrust Immunity Issue. (sb) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Letter filed by Plaintiffs addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 1/28/03, re: Implied Immunity in light of the two recent second circuit decisions. (sb) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Letter filed by plaintiffs addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 1/28/03, re: Leave to submit a Table of Authorities and a corrected copy of the letter brief. (sb) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/5/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Letter filed by Milton Pfeiffer addressed to Judge Pauley from Russel H. Beatie, dated 1/28/03, re: Application of the recent decisions in Friedman V. Soloman/Smith Barney and In re Stock Exchanges Options Trading Antitrust Litigation. (sb) (Entered: 02/07/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Plaintiffs' Executive Committee's (Corrected Copy) Letter filed addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 01/28/03; re: addressing implied immunity in light of the two recent Second Circuit decisions. (djc) (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: None, Terminated: 9/22/2003
                                                                                  Plaintiffs' Notice of Letter MOTION for leave to submit, for the convenience of the Court, a "Table of Authorities" to their Letter Brief and to file a "corrected copy" of the Letter, addressing these erata (all citations are to the January 2003 letter submitted yesterday) ; Return Date not indicated; (djc) Modified on 02/04/2003 (Entered: 02/04/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Jay L. Himes, dated 1/27/03. Granting The State of New York's request as follows: The State of New York may submit a memoranda no longer than fifteen pages by 2/5/03 at 5:00 p.m. Defendants may submit a reply to the State of New York's memoranda by 2/12/03 at 5:00 p.m., not to exceed ten pages . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies faxed by chambers. (kw) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Letter filed by Glen Billing addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 01/27/03; re: addresses implied immunity in light of the two recent Second Circuit decisions; (djc) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        Letter filed addressed to Judge Pauley from Mark Pennington, dated 1/13/03, re: Second Circuit decisions that support the Commission's legal arguments and recent enforcement action filed by the Commission to remedy the conduct similar to some of that alleged in plaintiffs' complaint. (yv) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/24/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          Letter filed by Glen Billing addressed to Judge Pauley from Christoher Lovell, dated 1/13/03, re: new authorities handed down since the parties' briefs were fully submitted. (yv) (Entered: 01/30/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 8: that plaintiffs and defendants shall file and serve the papers described herein and not exceeding the page limits further set forth herein . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed by Chambers. (tp) (Entered: 01/29/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER; Plaintiffs' counsel are permitted to bring into the United States Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street on Thursday, January 16, 2003 the electronic and oversized equipment as stated in this Order ; ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); (djc) (Entered: 01/28/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Name Change of Sullivan & Cromwell to Sullivan & Cromwell LLP, by Goldman, Sachs Group (indicated on the system) (cd) (Entered: 01/21/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF THE UNITED STATES AS AMICUS CURIAE. (sb) (Entered: 12/31/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge William H. Pauley from Russel H. Beatie, dated 12/18/02. Re:, counsel for Pfeiffer plaintiffs request a brief adjournment of the argument now scheduled for 1/16/03 on the motions to dismiss. Application denied. The oral argument shall be heard on January 16,2003 at 2:00 p.m.. Counsel for the Pfeiffer plaintiffs has nearly a month to prepare his partner to argue one of the two arguments scheduled for that day . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies faxed by chambers. (dle) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER, granting joint application of the SEC and the Dept of Justice, Antitrust Division to extend the date for submissions from 12/9/02 to 12/20/02 ; reset oral argument for 2:00 1/16/03, on defts' motion to dismiss ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); (cd) Modified on 12/19/2002 (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Plaintiffs' Corrected Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Federal Antitrust Claims (djc) (Entered: 10/24/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 10/17/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Nancy C. Garrison, dated 10/2/02, granting DOJ and SEC's request for an additional 60 days to respond to the Court's 8/8/02 order: The DOJ and SEC shall advise this Court of their respective views regading deft's implied immunity argument by 12/9/02. Oral argument is rescheduled for 12/17/02, at 2:00 pm ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); copies faxed by Chambers (cd) (Entered: 10/21/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER; reset oral argument for 2:00 10/17/02 on defendants motion to dismiss . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 08/15/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER; Counsel for the parties are directed to provide forthwith copies of their submissions on the motion to dismiss, including documents as set forth in this Order ; If either or both the SEC or the Dept. of Justice, Antitrust Div. responds to this court's request, then they should file their memorandum by 10/10/02 and simultaneously furnish two courtesy copies to this Court's Chambers, Room 2210, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, NY, NY 10007 ; ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 08/14/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Plaintiffs' CORRECTED response to defendants' motion to dismiss the Federal Antitrust Claims. (tp) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/25/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Errata to plaintiffs' response to defendants' motion to dismiss the Federal Antitrust Claims as further set forth herein. (tp) (Entered: 08/12/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert B. McCaw by Salomon Smith Barney in support of [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (sb) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney, J.P. Morgan & Co., Bear Stearns, and Deutsche Bank in support of [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (sb) (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        JOINT REPLY MEMORANDUM by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney, J.P. Morgan & Co., Bear Stearns, Deutsche Bank in support [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (sb) Modified on 08/09/2002 (Entered: 08/09/2002)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE of CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Salomon Smith Barney for attorneys Wilmer Cutler & Pickering. New Address: 399 Park Avenue, New York, NY 10022. Received in the night deposit box on 7/16/02 at 4:49 p.m. (sb) Modified on 07/31/2002 (Entered: 07/31/2002)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE of change of firm address by Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. (yv) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Milton Pfeiffer in opposition to [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (sb) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Janus Capital Corp. by Charles Fleming on 6/3/02 . Answer due on 6/24/02 for Janus Capital Corp. . (sb) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as to Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney, Fidelity Distributor, Fidelity Brokerage, Fidelity Investments, Capital Corp., Comerica, Inc., Van Wagoner Capital, Van Wagoner Funds, J.P. Morgan Inc. by U.S. Mail and faxing on 7/8/02. (sb) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Cole Clayton. Received in night deposit box on 7/8/02 at 10:47 p.m. (db) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Glen Billing to defendant's [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint. Received in night deposit box on 7/8/02 at 10:47 p.m. (db) Modified on 07/11/2002 (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of J. Douglas Richards by Glen Billing. Received in night deposit box on 7/8/02 at 5:02 p.m. (db) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Plaintiff's compendium of unreported authorities in opposition to motion to dismiss State Law claims by Glen Billing. Received in night deposit box on 7/8/02 at 5:02 p.m. (db) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Glen Billing in opposition to [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint. Received in night deposit box on 7/8/02 at 5:02 p.m. (db) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 5/16/02 @ 2:30pm. (laq) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Russel H. Beatie, dated 6/20/02: Granting plaintiffs request. Plaintiff Pfeiffeer may file an opposition brief not to exceed fifteen (15) pages . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (tp) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; granting [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c), granting [71-2] motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request; Plaintiff Pfeiffer need not re-file the Robinson-Patman Act complaint; and prior service in Case No. 01cv11420 (S.D.N.Y.) (WHP) shall be deemed applicable to the action authorized by this order ; The Pfeiffer action is stayed pending determination of the Defendants' onmibus motion to dismiss the Consolidated Amended Complaint filed by the Executive Committee . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (jco) (Entered: 06/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Fraser L. Hunter, Jr. by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney in support Re: [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (db) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney in support of [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (db) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jon R. Roellke by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney in support Re: [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (db) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney in support of [95-1] joint motion for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . (db) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF JOINT MOTION by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney for an order to dismiss consolidated amended complaint . Return Date 9/4/02 at 2:00. (db) (Entered: 05/31/2002)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER No. 7; defendants shall serve and file their motion to dismiss and supporting papers by 5/24/02; Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall serve and file its opposition papers by 7/8/02; the law firm of Beatie & Osborn LLP may file submission not to exceed five pages by 7/8/02, so long as that submission complies with this Court's instructions on 5/16/02; defendants shall serve and file their reply brief, if any, by 8/7/02; oral argument set for 2:00 9/4/02, in Courtroom 11D; counsel are directed to provide two courtesy copies of all motions papers to Chambers at the time said papers are filed with the Clerk. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 05/29/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; granting [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c); the parties are directed to submit a joint proposed order implementing this ruling by 5/31/02 ; granting [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc. (moc) (Entered: 05/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/21/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Oral argument begun and concluded on May 16, 2002 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (yv) (Entered: 05/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 5/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER; on 3/21/02, this Court indicated that it would refrain from entering any further orders in this action until the issue of judicial qualification was resolved; subsequently, the parties submitted letters advising that there are no grounds for recusal; this Court concurs; after conducting an independent analysis, this Court determines that its continued assignment to the IPO Antitrust Litigation is required ; since the briefing is complete on the Robinson-Patman claim issue, this Court will hear oral argument on 5/16/02 at 2:30 p.m.; at that time, this Court will also re-establish a briefing schedule for the submission of defendants' motion to dismiss . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (kkc) (Entered: 05/09/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 5/1/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 3/21/02. (moc) (Entered: 05/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter filed by Fidelity Distributor addressed to Judge Pauley from John D. Donovan, Jr., dated 04/04/02; re: letter on behalf of "Fidelity" and Wagoner defendants in response to the Court's request that the parties state their views regarding whether [the Court's] recusal is warranted" in the Pfeiffer action. (djc) (Entered: 04/23/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Letter filed addressed to Judge Pauley from Steven G. Bradbury, dated 4/4/02, re: in response to the Court's request for the views of the parties. (jco) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Letter filed addressed to Judge Pauley from Russel H. Beatie, dated 3/15/02, re: complying with Court's Instructions during the recent telephone conference on Thursday, March 21. (jco) (Entered: 04/15/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter filed by Goldman, Sachs Group addressed to Judge Pauley from Gandolfo V. DiBlasi, dated 4/3/02, re: response to Judge's request. (db) (Entered: 04/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 2/14/02. (moc) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum to Docket Clerk: RE: the 3/21/02 telephone conference that was held and concluded before Judge Pauley III. (bai) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum to Docket Clerk: RE: 2/14/02 premotion conference that was held and concluded before Judge Pauley III. (bai) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum to Docket Clerk: RE: 1/17/02 premotion conference that was held and concluded before Judge Pauley III. (bai) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. (kkc) (Entered: 03/22/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter filed by Robertson Stephens, Inc., Bear, Stearns & Co., Inc., Deutsche Banc Alex.Brown, Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., Salomon Smith Barney, J.P. Morgan Inc. addressed to Honorable William H. Pauley from Andrew J. Frackman, dated 3/15/02, re: response to Pfeiffer's motion for permission to assert the proposed Robinson-Patman claim and to the Court's concern that it may have "extinguished" a substantive right of Pfeiffer by denying his counsel's application to bring his purported class action claim seperate from the plaintiffs' Executive Committee. (yv) (Entered: 03/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/15/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Milton Pfeiffer in further support of: [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c), [71-2] motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request. (kkc) (Entered: 03/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/8/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Mita Aggarwal, Morgan Stanley Dean, Bajrang Agarwal, Tom Barnett, David Pazarella, Henry Sklanowsky, Ross Wiczer, H. Wayne Jones, Efriam Simcha, Brad Harrison, Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, Michael S. Weiss, Kenneth Shives, Demetrios Petratos, Deming Zhous, Bert Zauderer, Glenn Kerr, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl, Bruce J. Jiorle, Mark Sculnick, Susan Katz, Anthony Voto, Estelle L. Augustine, Don K. Burris, Rachel Schwartz, Roderick Lau, Raymond Litwin, Joe Braswell, Buddy Dukeman, Anupkumar Bhasin, Raymond Lance Huffman, Anita S. Budich, Troy Brooks, Philip Warner, Carlos Reeberg, Jerry Cobb, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Matthew Weiner, Joe Goldgrab, Local 144 Nursing, J.P. Morgan & Co., Lennard Steinberg, Merrill Lynch & Co., Credit Suisse First, Fidelity Distributor, Fidelity Brokerage, Fidelity Investments, Janus Capital Corp., Comerica, Inc., Van Wagoner Capital, Van Wagoner Funds in opposition to [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c), [71-2] motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request . (pl) (Entered: 03/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 1/17/02. (yv) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/27/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of attorney appearance for Lehman Brothers Inc. by Paul, Weiss, Rifkin, Wharton & Garrison. (db) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Milton Pfeiffer in support of [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c), [71-2] motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request . (yv) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Daniel A. Osborn by Milton Pfeiffer in support of [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c), [71-2] motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request . (yv) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Russell H. Beatie by Milton Pfeiffer in support of [71-1] motion for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c), [71-2] motion pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request . (yv) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/23/2002
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Milton Pfeiffer for an Order permitting plaintiff Pfeiffer to assert a claim under Section 2(c) of the Robinson-Patman Act, 15 U.S.C. Section 13(c) or, pursuant to FRCP Rule 54(b), certifying for immediate appeal the denial of the request . Return date 3/26/02. (yv) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER, that the parties agree that J.P Morgan Securities Inc. shall be substituted as a defendant in place and in stead of J.P Morgan Chase & Co. which is hereby dismissed as a defendant without prejudice. In the Amended Consolidated Complaint, all references to J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. shall be read as J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. In particular, paragraph 18 shall be read to substitute J.P. Morgan Securities Inc. for J.P. Morgan Chase & Co . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ) (tp) (Entered: 02/27/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/22/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Salomon Smith Barney . (yv) (Entered: 02/25/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. (jco) (Entered: 02/21/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 6: Beatie and Osborn shall serve and file their motion and supporting papers with respect to the application to prosecute a Robinson-Patman Act claim on behalf of pltff Pfeiffer by 2/22/02. Pltffs' executive committee, along with any other interested party except defts, shall serve and file their opposition papers by 3/8/02. Beatie and Osborn shall serve and file their reply brief, if any, by 3/15/02. Defts shall serve and file their submission on 3/15/02 as well. Oral argument on this matter is set for 3:00 PM on 3/26/02, in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl St. Because this Court has determined to reconsider its Order dated 1/18/02 denying Beatie and Osborn's application on behalf of pltff Pfeiffer to bring a Robinson-Patman claim, the effect of that Order is held in abeyance. The time for defts to serve and file their motion to dismiss the consolidated amended class action complaint, as contemplated by the case management order, is suspended pending further order of this Court . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 02/20/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 5:; in response to the 1/30/02 letter from the firm of Beatie & Osborn LLP, a pre-motion conference is scheduled for 2/14/02 at 12:15 p.m. in ctrm 318 of the US Courthouse, Foley Square. Messrs. Christopher Lovell and Melvin Weiss are directed to attended in person . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 02/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/6/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 12/12/01. (yv) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Co. (sac) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Co. (sac) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER, the application of Beatie and Osborn LLP on behalf of plaintiff Pfeiffer to bring, on a coordinated basis, an action asserting a claim under the Robinson-Patman Act is denied . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/23/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Summons and Complaint as to Bear Sterns & Co. c/o Stuart Klein on 1/9/02. (tp) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Russell H. Beatie, dated 01/14/02; Re: Counsel to plaintiff requests the the conference be rescheduled for as late as possible in the day on Friday, January 18 or any of the following dates as stated in this letter; Application denied. If Mr. Beatie cannot attend, another member of his firm may do so in his place ; ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 4: that in response to the 1/7/02 letter from the firm of Beatie & Osborn LLP, a pre-motion conference is scheduled for 1/17/02 @4:30 p.m. in Courtroom 318, Foley Square. Counsel for Plaintiffs' Executive Committee and for defendants shall submit letters to the Court concerning plaintiff Pfeiffer's request to assert a Robinson-Patman Act by Tuesday, 1/15/02 @ 5:00 p.m. . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 01/16/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 11/30/01. (cd) (Entered: 01/08/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Glen Billing, Bajrang Agarwal, Tom Barnett, David Pazarella, Henry Sklanowsky, Ross Wiczer, Efriam Simcha, Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, Michael S. Weiss, Kenneth Shives, Demetrios Petratos, Deming Zhous, Bert Zauderer, Glenn Kerr, Hans Reihl, Heinz Wahl, Bruce J. Jiorle, Mark Sculnick, Susan Katz, Anthony Voto, Estelle L. Augustine, Don K. Burris, Rachel Schwartz, Roderick Lau, Raymond Litwin, Joe Braswell, Buddy Dukeman, Anupkumar Bhasin, Raymond Lance Huffman, Anita S. Budich, Troy Brooks, Philip Warner, Carlos Reeberg, Jerry Cobb, David Federico, Farideh Sigari, Matthew Weiner, Joe Goldgrab, Local 144 Nursing, Lennard Steinberg (Answer due 1/15/02 for Credit Suisse First, for Merrill Lynch & Co., for J.P. Morgan & Co., for Morgan Stanley Dean, for Salomon Smith Barney, for BancBoston Robertson, for Morgan Stanley Co., for Merrill Lynch, Inc., for Lehman Brothers Inc., for Goldman, Sachs Group, for Credit Suisse Corp. ) amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. Received in night deposit box on 1/2/02 at 10:11 p.m. (yv) (Entered: 01/04/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 12/14/01; Re: counsel requests clarification from the Court regarding service and filing of the consolidated amended complaint; Upon review of the docket sheet, this Court concurs in plaintiffs' calculation of time by which to file the consolidated amended complaint - which is January 2, 2002 ; ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 12/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Atty by Steven G. Bradbury for Morgan Stanley Co., Morgan Stanley Dean. (sac) Modified on 12/18/2001 (Entered: 12/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter filed addressed to Judge Pauley from Andrew Frackman, dated 12/6/01, . (jp) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Russel Beatie by Efriam Simcha. (jp) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter filed addressed to Judge Pauley from Russel H. Beatie, dated 12/4/01, . (jp) (Entered: 12/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF DOCKETING; the Clerk of the Court is directed to docket this Notice along with the attached letter and mail said documents to each of the counsel of record listed below. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 12/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III on 10/4/01. (kw) (Entered: 12/06/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Robert B. McCaw by Salomon Smith Barney Re: support of [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. . (bai) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney re: support of [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. (bai) (Entered: 11/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Lovell by Glen Billing in opposition to [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. . (moc) (Entered: 11/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Glen Billing in opposition to [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. . (moc) (Entered: 11/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 9/10/01 @10:35 a.m. (kg) (Entered: 11/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER No. 1, the actions 01 civ. 2014, 01 civ. 2999, 01 civ. 3106, 01 civ. 3951, 01 civ. 4300, 01 civ. 4673, 01 civ. 5036, 01 civ. 5812, 01 civ. 5919, and 01 civ. 8668 are consolidated for all purposes pursuant to the provisions of Rule 42 of the FRCP. The consolidated proceedings shall be referred to as "In re Initial Public Offering Antitrust Litigation," and shall bear index number 01 civ. 2014. A copy of this order shall be filed in the docket of each case comprising the Initial Public Offering Antitrust Litigation . All other cases referred to in the captions, bearing index number 01 civ. 2999, 01 civ. 3106, 01 civ. 3951, 01 civ. 4300, 01 civ. 4673, 01 civ. 5036, 01 civ. 5812, 01 civ. 5919, and 01 civ. 8668 shall be administratively closed and all papers in these cases shall be filed in docket 01 civ. 2014. This Court hereby designates the following firms to serve as the Plaintiffs' Executive Committee in the litigation: Lovell & Stewart LLP; Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP; Sirota & Sirota LLP; Schiffrin & Barroway LLP; and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP. The Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall specifically assume the following duties and responsibilities on behalf of plaintiffs with respect to the IPO Antitrust Litigation as set forth in this document . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (kw) Modified on 11/01/2001 (Entered: 11/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Fraser L. Hunter, Jr. by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney in support Re: [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. (db) (Entered: 10/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney in support of [41-1] motion to stay all discovery in this action. (db) (Entered: 10/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., Morgan Stanley Co., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney to stay all discovery in this action. . Return date 11/30/01. (db) (Entered: 10/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Melvyn I. Weiss, dated 09/20/01 Re: the proposed briefing schedule is accepted by this Court with the exception as noted concerning oral argument: Defendants' motion and Opening Brief with respect to Discovery set for 10/19/01; Plaintiffs' Brief in Opposition due 11/02/01; Defendants' Reply Brief due 11/09/01 ; Oral argument will be held on 11/30/01 at 11:30 a.m. ; ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 09/28/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER NO. 3: Defts shall serve and file their motion to stay discovery by 9/21/01; Pltffs shall serve and file their opposition papers by 10/5/01; Reply papers shall be served and filed by 10/12/01; Oral Argument set for 10:00 a.m. on 10/26/01. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (kg) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III for the date(s) of 7/30/01 @2:30 p.m. (kg) (Entered: 08/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/30/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge William H. Pauley III on 6/22/01. (kw) (Entered: 07/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Brian S. Cohen, Esq. by Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, Michael G. Weiss in further support of [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [19-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [19-3] motion for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919. [Original filed in case 01cv2014(WHP) as Doc# 36 and docketed in 01cv2999, 01cv3106, 01cv3951, 01cv4300, 01cv4673, 01cv5812 and 01cv5919.] (dcap) (Entered: 07/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLTFF'S CONSOLIDATED REPLY MEMORANDUM by Glen Billing regarding lead counsel issues. (sn) (Entered: 07/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 07/20/01; granting counsel to plaintiff's request for leave to file a consolidated reply of twenty pages on the co-lead counsels' issues ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 07/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER #2: Oral Argument relating to the motions for appointment of lead counsel, in 01cv2014, 01cv2999, 01cv3106, 01cv3951, 01cv4300, 01cv4673, 01cv5036, 01cv5812 and 01cv5919 is reset for 10:30 9/10/01. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (pl) Modified on 07/25/2001 (Entered: 07/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by Glen Billing. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/20/01 at 12:12 a.m.) (kw) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Reply AFFIDAVIT of Howard B. Sirota, Stuart D. Wechsler and Abraham S. Kassin by Glen Billing in further support of the appointment of Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as co-lead counsel. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/19/01 at 11:51 p.m.) (kw) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reply AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Lovell by Glen Billing in further support of the appointment of Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as co-lead counsel. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/19/01 at 11:51 p.m.) (kw) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM in further support of re: [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/19/01 at 11:26 p.m.). (kw) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply AFFIDAVIT of Steven G. Schulman in further support of Re: [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations. (Received in the night deposit box on 7/19/01 at 11:26 p.m.) (kw) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM by Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, and Michael Weiss in further support of re: [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [19-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [19-3] motion for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919; and in further opposition to the motion of the Law Firms of Sirota & Sirota LLP and Lovell & Stewart, LLP to be appointed co-counsel. (pl) (Entered: 07/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply in further support affidavit of Brian Cohen in support of [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs (cd) (Entered: 07/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM, in further support re: [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs (cd) (Entered: 07/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Robert W. Rodriguez by Glen Billing in opposition to [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [19-3] motion for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919, [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations. Received in night deposit on 7/12/01 at 11:53 p.m. (kkc) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Glen Billing in opposition to [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [19-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [19-3] motion for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919, [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations. Received in night deposit on 7/12/01 at 11:53 p.m. (kkc) Modified on 07/13/2001 (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE of Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund in Further Support of [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations; (docmt received in nighd dep. on 07/12/01 at 11:37 p.m.) (djc) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Gregory M. Nespole by Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, and Michael Weiss in support Re: [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [19-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [19-3] motion for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919. (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, and Michael Weiss in support of [19-1] motion for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs, [19-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel, [19-3] motion for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919. (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen, and Michael Weiss for an order, appointing Robert H. Thomas, Robert Grovich, Binh Nguyen and Michael Weiss as Lead Pltffs ; for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Co-Lead Counsel ; and for an order, consolidating 01 Civ. 2014 (Lead Case) with the following (Mem. Cases): 01 Civ. 2999; 01 Civ. 3106; 01 Civ. 3951; 01 Civ. 4300; 01 Civ. 4673; 01 Civ. 5812; 01 Civ. 5919 ; Return date 7/26/01. (sac) Modified on 07/05/2001 (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Lovell by Glen Billing in support of the motion for the selection of Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota, LLP as Lead-Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/29/01 at 9:23 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Glen Billing in support of the appointment of Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota LLP as Co-Lead Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/29/01 at 9:23 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Steven G. Schulman in support of [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/29/01 at 9:58 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Local 144 in support of [14-1] motion for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/29/01 at 9:58 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION by Local 144 Nursing Home Pension Fund for an order, appointing the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Co-Lead Counsel with responsibility for claims by indirect purchasers under state antitrust laws and othe related regulations ; Return date not indicated. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 6/29/01 at 9:58 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER No. 1: motions for the appointment of lead counsel shall served and filed by 6/29/01; opposition papers shall be served and filed by 7/12/01; Reply papers, if any, shall be filed and served by 7/19/01; Oral Argument set for 3:00, on 7/26/01. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/21/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Melvyn I. Weiss, dated 6/20/01 Re: Counsel's request that an opportunity to be heard at the 6/22/01 pre-trial conference to be heard at the 6/22/01 ptc: counsel may attend the 6/22/01 conference ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 06/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Co. (kkc) (Entered: 06/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 5/24/01, re: in resonse to Mr. Isquith's letter to the Corut dated 5/16/01, to Mr. Schiffrin's letter to the Court dated 5/17/01, and to the defts' 5/22/01 letter signed by Andrew J. Frackman on behlaf of the defts herein. (lam) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter addressed to Judge Pauley from Andrew J. Frackman, atty for Roberson Stephens, Inc. and on behalf of counsel for the other underwriter defts, dated 5/22/01, re: resonding to the recent letters addresssed to the Court by pltffs' counsel. (lam) (Entered: 05/24/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter filed by Glen Billing addressed to Judge Pauley from Christopher Lovell, dated 5/10/01, re: proposed order to consolidate actions #01cv2014, 01cv2999, and 01cv3106. (lam) (Entered: 05/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/3/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Order Granting Admission Pro hac Vice as to Glen Billing, Credit Suisse Corp., Goldman, Sachs Group, Lehman Brothers Inc., Merrill Lynch, Inc., BancBoston Robertson, Salomon Smith Barney by mail on 5/3/01. (djc) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order admitting attorney pro hac vice; granting [5-1] motion for an order admitting Steven G. Bradbury to appear pro hac vice; granting [5-2] motion for an order admitting Andrew B. Clubok to appear pro hac vice; granting [5-3] motion for an order admitting Brant W. Bishop to appear pro hac vice; granting [5-4] motion for an order admitting Elizabeth L. Deeley to appear pro hac vice. The admitted attorneys aer directed to serve a copy of this Order on all other counsel appearing in this action . ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ); Copies mailed (Forwarded to Attorney Admissions Clerk) (sn) (Entered: 05/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/30/2001, Entered: None, Terminated: 5/1/2001
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Morgan Stanley Co., for an order admitting Steven G. Bradbury to appear pro hac vice ; for an order admitting Andrew B. Clubok to appear pro hac vice ; for an order admitting Brant W. Bishop to appear pro hac vice ; for an order admitting Elizabeth L. Deeley to appear pro hac vice . Affidavit of Howard Fetner in support is attached. No return date. (kw) (Entered: 05/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER, reset answer due for 6/4/01 for Salomon Smith Barney, for BancBoston Robertson, for Morgan Stanley Co., for Merrill Lynch, Inc., for Lehman Brothers Inc., for Goldman, Sachs Group, for Credit Suisse Corp. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ) (cd) (Entered: 04/23/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/20/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 618 at the United States Courthouse, Foley Square, 40 Centre Street on June 22, 2001 at 10:45 a.m. ( signed by Judge William H. Pauley III ) (djc) (Entered: 04/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Credit Suisse Corp. by Grace Y. Shentwu on 3/15/01. Answer due on 4/4/01 for Credit Suisse Corp. (db) (Entered: 03/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 399483. (kkc) (Entered: 03/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 370 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?