Daniels, et al v. City of New York, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:99-cv-01695
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 28, 2017 at 11:16 PM EDT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Bryan Stair, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Djibril Toure, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Hector Rivera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Kahil Shkymba, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Kelvin Daniels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo National Congress for Puerto Rican Rights, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
TERMINATED: 10/20/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Joseph Myers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/20/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Poseidon Baskin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Raymond Ramirez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Robert Roe, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/14/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
TERMINATED: 05/14/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net
No Logo Tiara Bonner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Karl Ferdinand Franklin +1 917 535 3041 karlfranklin@hotmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/14/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Victor Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Board Of Trustees Of The Leland Stanford Junior University

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara J. Olshansky +1 650 736 2312 +1 650 725 8509 bolshansky@law.stanford.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by Center for Constitutional Rights

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Nancy Chang +1 212 614 6420 +1 212 614 6499 nancyc@ccr-ny.org

Represented by Debevoise & Plimpton LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Jack Mikels & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY William Harry Goodman +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 bgoodman@gis.net
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan C Moore +1 212 353 9587 +1 212 674 4614 jmoore@gis.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/16/1999, LEAD ATTORNEY Natalie Renee Williams +1 212 416 6401 +1 212 416 8074 natalie.williams@oag.state.ny.us
v.
No Logo Anthony Curtin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Howard Safir, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Lisa S.J. Yee +1 212 788 0823
No Logo Mayor Rudolph Guiliani, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Lisa S.J. Yee +1 212 788 0823
No Logo New York City Police Officers John Does ## 1-500, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Peter Mante, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter J. Blessinger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Blessinger , +1 212 349 5494 +1 212 349 6369
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY Lisa S.J. Yee +1 212 788 0823
No Logo Walter Doyle, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heidi Grossman +1 212 788 0792 +1 212 788 0367 hgrossma@law.nyc.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter J. Blessinger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Blessinger , +1 212 349 5494 +1 212 349 6369
No Logo Peter Mante, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter J. Blessinger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Blessinger , +1 212 349 5494 +1 212 349 6369
No Logo Walter Doyle, Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Peter J. Blessinger

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter J. Blessinger , +1 212 349 5494 +1 212 349 6369
City of New York City of New York, Cross-Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Lisa S.J. Yee +1 212 788 0823
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (179) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER # 94913 for the foregoing reasons, the April 16 Order is hereby vacated. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close defendants re: 173 MOTION to Vacate. filed by The City of New York, Peter Mante, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin, New York City Police Officers John Does ## 1-500, Rudolph Guiliani, Walter Doyle. Plaintiffs are directed to notify this Court of any noncompliance on defendants' part as soon as reasonably practicable. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/16/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Support re: 173 MOTION to Vacate. Document filed by The City of New York. (djc) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Heidi Grossman dated 5/31/07 re: dft's requests a one week extension until 6/12/07 for dft's to serve and file reply submissions with respect to their motion to vacate the Courts Order extending the term of the Stipulation of Settlement. So Ordered. Requests granted. Dfts' may have until 6/12/07 to file their reply. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/1/07) (pl) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Vanessa De Simone in Opposition re: 173 MOTION to Vacate. Document filed by Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner, Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin. (tro) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 173 MOTION to Vacate.. Document filed by Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner, Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin. (tro) (Entered: 05/24/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 173 MOTION to Vacate the Order Extending the term of the Stipulation of Settlement.. Document filed by Anthony Curtin, Peter Mante, Walter Doyle, The City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, New York City Police Officers John Does ## 1-500. (jpo) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None
              MOTION for an Order, pursuant to rules 59 and 60 of F.R.C.P and Local Rule 6.3, granting defendant's motion to vacate the April 16,2007 oral order of the Court, extending the term of the Stipulation of Settlement. Declaration of Heidi Grossman is attached. Document filed by Anthony Curtin, Peter Mante, Walter Doyle, The City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, New York City Police Officers John Does ## 1-500.(jpo) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/16/2007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (jp) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Karl Franklin, Andrea Hope Costello on behalf of Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner, Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin (cd) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT: defendant City of New York hereby agrees to pay the following sums in full satisfaction of any and all Plaintiff's Class Counsel's claims for attorney's fees and costs and disbursements against it: (payment recipients and amounts) Debevoise & Plimpton, LLP-$1,759,038.29; Center for Constitutional Rights-$707,454.38; Moore & Goodman, LLP-$925,258.00; Van Lierop Burns & Associates, PLLC-$132,968.25. In consideration, all claims against defendants are released. All other details are as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/5/05) (db, ) (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER that the Clerk is directed to close the motion for attorneys' fees and costs (doc #159) and this case. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/31/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:99-cv-01695-SAS-HBP,1:00-cv-03210-SAS-HBP(cd, ) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS; For all the reasons set forth in this r&r, the court recommends that plaintiffs' counsel be awarded attorney's fees in the total amount of $3,624,718.92 and costs and disbursements in the total amount of $223,664.04. Specifically, I recommend that CCR be awarded $705,993.00 in attorney's fees and $1,461.38 in costs and disbursements; D& P be awarded $1,636,835.63 in attorney's fees and $222,202.66 in costs and disbursements; M&G be awarded $925,258.00 in attorney's fees and no award for costs and disbursements and Van Lierop be awarded $132,968.25 in attorney's fees and no award for costs and disbursements. The calculations underlying these figures are contained in Exhibit A. Objections to R&R due by 5/20/2005 (Signed by Judge Henry B. Pitman on 5/5/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:99-cv-01695-SAS-HBP,1:00-cv-03210-SAS-HBP Copies mailed by chambers.(dle, ) (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Specific Non-Dispositive Motion/Dispute:* Attorney Fees. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/2004) (jmi, ) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER This case is reopended for the sole purpose of awarding attorneys' fees. The Clerk of the Court is directed to reopen this case. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/28/04) (jco, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira Scheindlin from William Goodman dated 9/1/04; re: Plaintiff's request is hereby granted. Plaintiff's time to file their reply brief in support of plaintiffs' attorney fee petition is extended to 9/17/2004. No further adjournments will be granted. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/10/04) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:99-cv-01695-SAS-HBP,1:00-cv-03210-SAS-HBP(sac, ) (Entered: 09/10/2004)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Heidi Grossman dated 8/12/2004 re: defendants opposition papers due 8/20/2004 and plaintiffs' reply papers due on 9/3/2004. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/12/2004) (jsa, ) (Entered: 08/16/2004)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 159 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Kelvin Daniels et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of Jason Abel in Support re: 159 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Kelvin Daniels. (cd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Jonathan Moore in Support re: 159 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Kelvin Daniels et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Joseph Moodhe in Support re: 159 MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Kelvin Daniels et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 7/6/2004, Entered: None
                                          MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) for Attorney Fees and expenses. Document filed by Kelvin Daniels et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 07/08/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Jason R.Abel dated 7/2/2004: Re: The plaintiffs' request is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' request for additional page for two of their declarations and additional exhibits is granted. Plaintiffs' request for a page extension for their joint memorandum of law is denied. The memorandum must not excedd 25 double-spaced pages, with the text and footnotes no smaller than 12-point font. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/2/2004) (jsa, ) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Heidi Grossman dated 04/06/04 re: the parties' request is hereby grnated. The briefing schedule is as follows: plaintiff's moving papers are due on 05/27/04; defendants' opposition papers are due on 07/19/04; and plaintiffs' reply papers are due on 07/23/04. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/27/04) (djc, ) (Entered: 04/29/2004)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Jason Abel dated 3/5/04; re plntf's motion for atty fees: plntfs' moving papers will be due on 4/27/04. Defts' response due 6/9/04 and plntf's reply is due 6/23/04. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/5/04) (cd, ) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Jonathan C. Moore dated 2/5/04 re: Would like to proposed the following revised schedule for the fee motion. Plaintiff's initial papers will be filed on 3/8/04. Defendants response would be due on 4/23/04. Plaintiffs would then have until 5/7/04 to file their reply, at which time the motion will be fully briefed. Granted. The schedule for the plaintiffs' motion for attorneys' fees follows: Moving papers: 3/8/04, Response: 4/23/04, Reply: 5/7/04. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/6/04) Associated Cases: 1:99-cv-01695-SAS-HBP,1:00-cv-03210-SAS-HBP(dfe, ) (Entered: 02/13/2004)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 1/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/12/03 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin.(rg, ) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/9/04) (ml, ) (Entered: 01/20/2004)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT regarding the unconstitutional stops and frisks of NYC residents by the Street Crime Unit of the NYC Police Department. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/9/04) (kw, ) (Entered: 01/19/2004)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 1/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT: the individual damages claims asserted by Plaintiffs are dismissed with prejudice and settled for the amounts specified in paragraphs 4 and 5 of this document. Defendant Doyle voluntarily dismisses with prejudice his cross claims against defendant City of NY set forth in his answer dated 11/2/00. Defendant Mante voluntarily dismisses with prejudice his cross claims against defendant City of NY set forth in his answer dated 10/27/00. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/9/04) (kw, ) (Entered: 01/19/2004)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 12/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                            Letter addressed to Clerk of Court from Heidi Grossman dated 12/12/03 re: affidavit of publication of the notice of settlement. (jco, ) (Entered: 01/06/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Heidi Grossman in Support of the parties' request for this Court's approval of the proposed Stipulation of Settlement of this Action. Document filed by Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, The City of New York. (tp, ) (Entered: 12/12/2003)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                DECLARATION of Adam D. Gale in Support of Approval of Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Poseidon Baskin, Tiara Bonner, Kelvin Daniels, Raymond Ramirez, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Bryan Stair, Djibril Toure. Received in night deposit box on 11/25/03 at 8:52 p.m. (db, ) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Approval of Class Action Settlement. Document filed by Poseidon Baskin, Tiara Bonner, Kelvin Daniels, Raymond Ramirez, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Bryan Stair, Djibril Toure. Received in night deposit box on 11/25/03 at 8:51 p.m. (db, ) (Entered: 12/08/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/25/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re Class Action Settlement. Document filed by The City of New York et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 12/05/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 9/18/03. (tr) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/14/03. (tr) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from William Goodman, dated 8/28/03; granting requests for an extension to file proposed Stipulation and Order on 9/5/03 , reset status conference for 11:00 9/18/03 . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); (pl) (Entered: 09/04/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 7/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            Memorandum to Docket Clerk: Settlement conference held on 7/8/03 before Mag. Judge Pitman. (sb) (Entered: 07/10/2003)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of April 15, 2003. (dt) (Entered: 06/17/2003)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/12/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (kw) (Entered: 06/13/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/27/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Honorable Shira Scheindlin from William Goodman, dated 5/21/03. counsel for the plaintiff request a postponement of the status conference. Plaintiffs' request is hereby granted and the 5/22/03 conference is adjourned to 4:30 p.m. on 6/12/03 . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); (yv) (Entered: 05/28/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Adam D. Gale, dated 4/3/03. The parties request that the 4/3/03 status conference be postponed. Today's conference adjourned to 4/15/03 at 11:00 a.m. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies faxed by Chambers. (sb) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Letter filed addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Heidi Grossman, dated 3/4/03, re: Declaration of Philip G. McGuire, dated 3/3/3 regarding missing pages. (pl) (Entered: 03/27/2003)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/7/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                        DECLARATION of Philip G. McGuire by City of New York in support Re: [135-1] affidavit . (pl) (Entered: 03/27/2003)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Philip G. McGuire in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for the production of documents withheld by defendants on the ground of deliverative process privilege and identified on defendants' privilege logs dated 10/10/02 and 2/4/03. (jco) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in support of their motion for protective Order and in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for production of documents withheld on deliberative process privilege grounds. (jco) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (wv) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in opposition to motion for Protective Order based upon deliberate process privilege. (tp) (Entered: 02/24/2003)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from William Goodman, dated 1/28/03; this case, which is now alomost four years old, cannot continue to lurckin perpetiuty from adjournment to adjournment. Someday discovery must end. Nonetheless, at the request of both parties the discovery cutoff is extended one final time to 3/14/03. Any party faily to complete its discovery obligations by that date will be subject to file consention of sanctions. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); (sac) (Entered: 02/05/2003)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 12/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 10/11/02. (ja) (Entered: 12/10/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 11/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from William Goodman, dated 11/14/02. Re: counsel for all parties request an adjournment for discovery. application granted. Fact discovery is hereby extended to 2/14/03 , the parties are directed to contact Chambers in early January and inform the Court as to the status of discovery . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies Faxed by Chambers. (db) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/13/02 at 5:10 p.m. (gf) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/14/02 at 5:20 p.m. (gf) (Entered: 10/08/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/3/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of July 1, 2001. (jw) (Entered: 09/03/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 5/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 3/25/02. (tr) (Entered: 05/02/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/5/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 2/25/02. (moc) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/2/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER; that discovery cutoff 10/1/02. There shall be no adjournment of the discovery closing date; a pretrial conference at 4:30 p.m. on 10/15/02; the case is referred to Mag. Judge Pitman for settlement discussions under such terms and conditions as he sees fit . ( by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 04/04/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 3/29/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 04/01/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 3/11/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 1/24/02. (df) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/14/01. (moc) (Entered: 11/05/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ORDER, that the portion of my order of 7/31/01 directing pltffs to reimburse the Court in the amount of $242.82 is hereby vacated . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman ); Copies mailed. (kg) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 6/29/01 @ 11:30 a.m. (rmo) (Entered: 08/03/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER, that no later than 10 days from the date of this Order, counsel for plaintiffs shal remit a check to the Clerk of the Court in the amount of $242.82 to reimburse the Court for the postage expenses incurred; no later than 10 days from from the date of this Order, plaintiffs' counsel shall advise whether they want these postcards returned so that they may seek a refund of the postage affixed thereto . ( signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman ); Copies mailed. (ae) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/9/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: It is hereby ordered, adjudged, and decreed that the order, granting defendants' petition for leave to appeal and staying discovery, is vacated; the present appeal is therefore dismissed. Issued as Mandate: 7/5/01, 01-7469 Roseann B. MacKechnie, Clerk, U.S.C.A. (sb) (Entered: 07/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner. (sac) (Entered: 06/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 4/16/01. (gmo) (Entered: 05/31/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Notice that the record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (dt) (Entered: 05/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER; that Adam Gale's letter to the District Court, dated 1/26/01, a copy of which (without the enclosure) is attached hereto, shall be placed on the docket of the S.D.N.Y. in this case . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (pl) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Letter filed by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Victor Rodriguez, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Adam D. Gale, dated 1/26/01, re: Attorney General's Report, of 12/1/99 (cd) (Entered: 05/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER PLACING DOCUMENT ON THE DISTRICT COURT DOCKET, Adam Gale's letter to the District Court, dated 1/26/01, a copy of which (without the enclosure) is attached hereto, shall be placed on the docket of the SDNY (entry 111) ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (cd) (Entered: 05/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER, in view of the stay of discovery ordered by the Court of Appeals on 5/1/01, the status conference currently scheduled for 5/9/01 is adjourned without date ; set Status report due on 6/15/01 ( signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 05/09/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 3/21/01. (jco) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: Defendant's petition for leave to appeal class certification is GRANTED, and defendants' motion for stay of discovery pending resolution of defendants' petition for leave to appeal class certification is DENIED AS MOOT. Discovery is STAYED until further notice by this Court. Both parties shall file briefs with the Clerk of the Court, no later than 5/15/01, regarding the merits of the appeal. This appeal will be sent to the first available panel after 5/16/01. 01-8010, Roseann B. Mackechnie, Clerk. (sg) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 3/7/01. (tp) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 3/30/01. (tp) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED True Copy of Order from the USCA as to Kelvin Daniels RE: It is Ordered that the stay of discovery previously entered be extended until the matter can be heard by 3 judge panel of this Court. The hearing shall be held on 5/1/01 at 10:00 AM. Opposition to this motion shall be served and filed not later than 4/23/01, and andy reply shall be served and filed by 4/25/01. 01-8010, Roseann B. Mackechnie, Clerk (sl) (Entered: 04/25/2001)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #85453, the City's motion for a stay pending appeal is denied ; a conference is scheduled for 4/16/01 at 3:00 p.m. to discuss class member determinations and related questions of privilege . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 04/16/2001)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/12/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            OPINION & ORDER #85454, denying [93-1] motion to intervene in this action purs. to Rule 24(b) of the FRCP for the limited purpose of seeking a modification of the protective order issued by the Court in this action on 1/31/00 (signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (lam) (Entered: 04/13/2001)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 2/8/01. (moc) (Entered: 04/05/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/2/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman . Copies mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Lisa S.J. Yee, Peter J. Blessinger, Natalie Renee Williams, Jonathan C. Moore, Nancy Chang, Jennifer Cowan, Jonathan C. Moore, William H. Goodman, Barbara J. Olshansky, William H. Goodman. (tp) (Entered: 04/03/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for discovery motion or other motion which does not require a report and recommendation (class action mailings); Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman; ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (lf) (Entered: 03/30/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/29/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION OF A CIVIL CASE TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Lisa S.J. Yee, Peter J. Blessinger, Natalie Renee Williams, Jonathan C. Moore, Nancy Chang, Jennifer Cowan, Jonathan C. Moore, William H. Goodman, Barbara J. Olshansky, William H. Goodman . (bm) (Entered: 03/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM in further support of [93-1] motion for an order, to intervene in this action purs. to Rule 24(b) of the FRCP for the limited purpose of seeking a modification of the protective order issued by the Court in this action on 1/31/00. (sac) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Heidi Grossman by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in opposition Re: [93-1] motion for an order, to intervene in this action purs. to Rule 24(b) of the FRCP for the limited purpose of seeking a modification of the protective order issued by the Court in this action on 1/31/00. (sac) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in opposition to [93-1] motion for an order, to intervene in this action purs. to Rule 24(b) of the FRCP for the limited purpose of seeking a modification of the protective order issued by the Court in this action on 1/31/00. (sac) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/16/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [93-1] motion for an order, to intervene in this action purs. to Rule 24(b) of the FRCP for the limited purpose of seeking a modification of the protective order issued by the Court in this action on 1/31/00. (sac) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/1/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (Filed on Service Date) by the United States or the Government, for an order, to intervene in this action purs. to Rule 24(b) of the FRCP for the limited purpose of seeking a modification of the protective order issued by the Court in this action on 1/31/00 ; Return date not indicated. Declaration of Sara L. Shudofsky w/exhibits attached. (sac) (Entered: 03/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 3/19/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                OPINION & ORDER #85308, denying [85-1] motion pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Eastern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1] order the class proposed by the pltffs is hereby certified under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2); [75-2] order a conference scheduled for 2/2/01 @3:00pm; [75-3] order; the class remains certified ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (lam) Modified on 03/20/2001 (Entered: 03/19/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 3/8/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION and ORDER #85262; a dispute has arisen over the extent of disclosure civilian information contained in the UF-250 database. Plaintiffs would like to use any such information directly in their efforts in soliciting witnesses and class members. Defendants would like to have an intermediary, such as a magistrage judge, oversee the initial mailing to all civilians except arrested adults and juveniles for whom they oppose any disclosure whatsoever. Only after the civilians express a willingness to participate in this lawsuit would the magistrate judge forward the contact information to plaintiffs' counsel ; For the reasons as set forth in this opinion and order, I am bifurcating the procedures to be used ; ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Heidi Grossman by City of New York, N.Y.C. Police Dept., Rudolph Guiliani, Anthony Curtin, Police Commissioner Bernard B. Kerik in further support of Re: [85-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Estern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1] order the class proposed by the pltffs is hereby certified under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2); [75-2] order a conference scheduled for 2/2/01 @3:00pm; [75-3] order . (pl) Modified on 03/19/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Bernard B. Kerik, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500, Peter Mante, Walter Doyle in support of [85-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Estern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1] order the class proposed by the pltffs is hereby certified under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2); [75-2] order a conference scheduled for 2/2/01 @3:00pm; [75-3] order . (pl) Modified on 03/19/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in opposition to [85-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Eastern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1,2&3] (pl) Modified on 03/09/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIRMATION of Jennifer R. Cowan by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in opposition to [85-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Eastern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1] class certification. (pl) Modified on 03/09/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in support of [85-1] motion for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Eastern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1] order the class proposed by the pltffs is hereby certified under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2); [75-2] order a conference scheduled for 2/2/01 @3:00pm; [75-3] order . (pl) Modified on 03/09/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Bernard B. Kerik, Anthony Curtin; for an order pursuant to Rule 6.3 of the U.S.D.C. for the Southern and Estern Districts of N.Y. and Rule 23 of the F.R.C.P. for reconsideration of [75-1] order the class proposed by the pltffs is hereby certified under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2); [75-2] order a conference scheduled for 2/2/01 @3:00pm; [75-3] order ; Return date 03/09/01. (pl) Modified on 03/19/2001 (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/7/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Neil M. Corwin, dated 3/6/01. Re: US requests an extension until 3/9/01 to file reply in support of its motion to intervene. Request granted. Reply papers due at noon on 3/9/01 . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (kw) (Entered: 03/08/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in support of motion for class certification. (sn) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REDACTED AFFIRMATION of Adam D. Gale by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner Re: proposed class definition. (sn) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in opposition to pltffs' motion for class certification. (sn) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Lisa S.J. Lee by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in opposition to pltffs' motion for class certification. (sn) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REDACTED DECLARATION of Ingrid U. Box by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, Anthony Curtin in opposition to pltffs' motion for class certification. (sn) Modified on 02/01/2001 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            REDACTED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in support of motion for class certification. (sn) Modified on 02/01/2001 (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Alison L. LaCroix by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in support of pltffs' motion for class certification. (sn) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 1/30/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED AFFIRMATION of Charles P. Reichmann by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner Re: Photographic arrays prepared by defts. (sn) (Entered: 02/01/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 1/26/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION & ORDER #85100, the class proposed by the pltffs is hereby certified under Rules 23(a) and 23(b)(2) ; a conference is scheduled for 2/2/01 @3:00pm ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (lam) Modified on 01/30/2001 (Entered: 01/29/2001)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 10/02/00. (db) (Entered: 12/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 10/11/00. (db) (Entered: 12/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (af) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (af) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/27/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (af) (Entered: 11/29/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/22/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Adam D. Gale, dated 11/20/00. Re: Counsel for pltffs requests an extension of the page limit for pltffs' reply brief in support of their motion for class certification. Pltffs may have an additional 5 pages in which to reply. The reply brief therefore should be no longer then 15 pages, double-spaced, and in the same font used in their moving papers . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 11/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by City of New York to Peter Mante's [64-1] cross claim; from the Office of the Corp Counsel by attorney Lisa S.J. Yee for cross-defendant City of New York (lam) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by City of New York to Walter Doyle's [66-2] cross claim; from the Office of the Corp Counsel by attorney Lisa S.J. Yee for cross-defendant City of New York (lam) (Entered: 11/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Complaint and CROSSCLAIM by Walter Doyle (Attorney, Peter Blessinger, Firm of: Cerrone And Geoghan ) against City of New York (lf) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/3/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of attorney appearance for Walter Doyle by Peter J. Blessinger. (lf) (Entered: 11/06/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/30/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSSCLAIM by Peter Mante against City of New York. (kw) (Entered: 10/31/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/23/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Protectivce Order Re Profiled Officer Reports; regarding procedures that will govern the handling of confidential materials ; ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (lf) (Entered: 10/23/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/18/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Peter Mante by Peter J. Blessinger. (djc) (Entered: 10/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/15/00 2:35 PM. (sn) (Entered: 10/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/14/00 2:35 PM. (sn) (Entered: 10/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/13/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 8/8/00 at 3:30 PM. (sn) (Entered: 10/16/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/14/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PHOTOGRAPHIC ARRAYS FOR THE 1/16/98 INCIDENT; the Protective Order regarding photographic arrays signed by the Court on 6/15/00, shall be extended to include photographic arrays produced to pltffs for the fifth incident date of 1/16/98. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 09/15/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/17/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER; that the Protective Order dated 1/31/00 (" Protective Order"), pertaining to the treatment of confidential documents in this action, is hereby modified as set forth in this Order . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 08/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 5/30/00. (cd) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 5/25/00. (cd) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/10/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 5/10/00. (cd) (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order admitting Ingrid U. Box pro hac vice, to argue and try this case in whole or in part as an attorney in the office of Michael D. Hess, Corporation Counsel of the City of NY, counsel for defts, purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (Forwarded to Attorney Admissions Clerk) (sn) Modified on 07/10/2000 (Entered: 07/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/27/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order admitting attorney pro hac vice; that William Goodman is admitted in this matter Pro Hac Vice purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c) of the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, and is permitted to argue and try this case in whole and in part as one of the counsel for pltffs. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) ; Copies mailed. Original document sent to Attorney Admissions Clerk. Received $25.00 in Cashiers Office on 6/21/00, Receipt #377018. (jp) (Entered: 06/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; by 6/2/00, defts will submit to the Court for in camera review unredacted CCRB files of the complaint filed by pltffs and the two individuals whose names have been redacted by defts from the CCRB complaint files produced to pltffs relating to complaints filed by pltffs. By 6/6/00, defts will produce to pltffs the following information as set forth in this document. By 6/15/00, defts will produce to pltffs: the following information as set forth in this document. The depositions of Sgt. Gloffke, Sgt. Lombardi, Lt. McClellan and Sgt. Pollack will take place on June 8,12,16 and 19, 2000 subject to any reasonable modifications in this schedule necessitated by the schedules of the deponents, and with the order of such depositions to be determined and notified in advance to pltffs by defts. On every Friday from 6/2 to 6/30/00, defts will submit to the Court for in camera review the documents on their privilege log that defts believe are privileged in light of the Court's 4/7 and 5/5/00 decisions. By 7/14/00, defts will produce to the Court for in camera review the documents on the their privilege log that defts believe may be redacted on the basis of privilege. Defts will confirm, produce and inform the Court of the following information as set forth in this Order. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 06/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/19/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Photographic Arrays; that defendants shall produce the photograph of each officer whose name appears on roll calls produced to to plaintiffs for the three incident dates of 6/26/98, 10/31/98 and 2/2/99 and on roll calls that will be produced to plaintiffs in response to their document request served on 4/14/00 for the fourth incident of 12/28/97 as set forth in this Order ; The photographic arrays shall be treated as Confidential Material in accordance with the terms of the Protective Order, dated 1/31/00, except to the extent that those terms are inconsistent with the terms set forth herein, in which case the provisions of this order shall prevail as set forth herein ; Plaintiff's counsel shall advise defendants' counsel by letter within fourteen days of the production of the photographic arrays whether the individual plaintiffs have identified any photograph as that of an officer allegedly involved in one of the four incidents described in paragraph 1. The letter shall list by subject plaintiff the position of the individual so identified inn the photographic array and the code assigned to the particular photographic array. Within seven days of receipt of that letter, the Police Department shall provide plaintiffs' counsel with the names of individuals so identified by the subject plaintiffs, execpt for individuals who are not subject officers . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (ri) (Entered: 06/20/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, the caption of this action will henceforth appear in the form that appears above, as per the Third Amended Complaint ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 06/14/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/24/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER by Anthony Curtin; (Attorney Corporation Counsel for the City of N.Y.); to [36-1] third amended complaint. Firm of Corporation Counsel of City of N.Y. (pl) (Entered: 05/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir (Attorney Lisa S.J. Yee from the Firm: Corporation Counsel, City of NY). (sn) Modified on 05/17/2000 (Entered: 05/17/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Affidavit of service as to Walter Doyle by Sergent Harp on 4/17/00; Answer due on 5/8/00 for Walter Doyle. (ri) (Entered: 05/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Affidavit of service as to Anthony Curtin by Ron Mercandent on 5/2/00; Answer due on 5/22/00 for Anthony Curtin. (ri) (Entered: 05/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Affidavit of service of Summons, Third Amended Class Action Complt. For Declaratory And Injunctive Relief And Indivudual Damages, Individual Rules And Procedures Of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, Pltff's Third Request For the Production Of Documents From The City, Guiliani And Safir And Pltff's First Request For Production Of Documents From Curtin Mante And Doyle, Letter Dated 4/13/00 To The Civilian Complaint Review Board, as to Peter Mante by Joe Delgado, (Authorized) on 4/21/00 and by mail on 4/24/00. Answer due on 5/11/00 for Peter Mante. (ls) (Entered: 05/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/8/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #83921; denying [38-1] motion for a protective order purs. to Rules 26(b)(3) and 26(c) of the FRCP that discovery not be had of certain documents by defts on the grounds that they are protected from disclosure under the attorney-client and work product privileges; consistent with the rulings set forth in the Memorandum Opinion, defendants shall produce the documents corresponding to privilege log entries 46,68,69,79, and 83 forthwith ; a conference to discuss the status of this case and the issues raised in Ms. Yee's letter to the court dated 5/1/00 is scheduled for Wednesday, 5/20/00 at 11:30 a.m. . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (pl) (Entered: 05/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/3/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 03/24/00. (djc) (Entered: 05/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Lisa S.J. Yee, dated 4/21/00, reset answer to the Third Amended Complaint due for 5/15/00 for Walter Doyle, for Peter Mante, for Anthony Curtin, for N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500, for Howard Safir, for Rudolph Guiliani, for N.Y.C. Police Dept., for City of New York ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (cd) (Entered: 04/26/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner in opposition to [38-1] motion for a protective order purs. to Rules 26(b)(3) and 26(c) of the FRCP that discovery not be had of certain documents withheld by defts on the grounds that they are protected from disclosure under the attorney-client and work product privileges (jp) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir in support of [38-1] motion for a protective order purs. to Rules 26(b)(3) and 26(c) of the FRCP that discovery not be had of certain documents withheld by defts on the grounds that they are protected from disclosure under the attorney-client and work product privileges (jp) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/22/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir; for a protective order purs. to Rules 26(b)(3) and 26(c) of the FRCP that discovery not be had of certain documents withheld by defts on the grounds that they are protected from disclosure under the attorney-client and work product privileges ; Return date 4/19/00. Declaration of Lisa Yee in support of motion attached. (jp) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/17/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500, Anthony Curtin, Peter Mante, Walter Doyle re: [28-1] motion for protective order (jp) (Entered: 04/18/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/12/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner (Answer due 4/25/00 for N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500, for Howard Safir, for Rudolph Guiliani, for City of New York ) amending [24-1] amended complaint against Anthony Curtin, Peter Mante, Walter Doyle; Summons issued. (jp) (Entered: 04/13/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION AND ORDER #83782, granting in part, denying in part [28-1] motion for protective order. Consistent with the rulings set forth herein, defts shall produce the documents, in redacted form where appropriate, corresponding to privilege log entries 6, 7, 11, 13, 46, 57, 60, 61, 62, 68, 69, 70, 76, 83 and 86, unless otherwise exempted from disclosure . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sn) (Entered: 04/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/24/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner addressed to Judge Scheindlin from William Goodman, dated 3/22/00, re: the Center for Constitutional Rights decided to withdraw as counsel to the named plaintiffs and puntative class in Latino Officers Association V. City of New York, 99 Cv 9568 LAK. I write to advise the Court that by order dated 3/17/00, judge Kaplan has granted the Center's motion for leave to withdraw as counsel in that lawsuit. (ri) (Entered: 03/27/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 1/31/00. (pl) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 1/27/00. (pl) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 re: [28-1] motion for protective order (cd) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 in opposition to [28-1] motion for protective order (cd) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 in support of [28-1] motion for protective order (cd) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/16/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION (Filed on Service Date) by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 for protective order ; Return date 3/3/00; attached are papers in support (cd) (Entered: 03/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 12/13/99. (jp) (Entered: 02/09/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/1/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Protective ORDER; regarding procedures that will govern the handling of confidential material during the course of this action ; (signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (djc) (Entered: 02/01/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/19/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER RESPONSE by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner Re: dft's counsel letter of Lisa Yee dated 1/10/00. (pl) (Entered: 01/21/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DEMAND for jury trial by Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Kahil Shkymba, Raymond Ramirez, Bryan Stair, Tiara Bonner (cd) (Entered: 01/10/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/6/2000, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of November 1, 1999. (djc) (Entered: 01/07/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order of dismissal of Victor Rodriguez as a named pltff purs. to Rule 41(a)(2) of the F.R.C.P. and w/o prejudice to any claims Mr. Rodriguez may have as a member of the purported pltff class. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption to reflect the dismissals of Victor Rodriguez and National Congress for Puerto Rican Rights as named pltffs. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/14/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OPINION # 83218, pltffs are seeking reconsideration of an 10/20/99 Opinion and Order dismissing their Equal Protection claim for failure to identify similarly situated non-minority individuals who were not stopped and frisked by the SCU. For the following reasons, pltff' motion is granted and their Equal Protection claim is reinstated . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Lisa S.J. Yee, dated 11/22/99. Re: defts request an extension of time to respond to pltffs' request for documents concerning Street Crime Unit which were provided to the United States Commission on Civil Rights is granted until 12/8/99 . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 9/24/99 at 3:45pm. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/20/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION # 83007, granting in part, denying in part [13-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) of the F.C.R.P. to dismiss, granting in part, denying in part [13-2] motion to stay the claims for declaratory and injunctive relief, granting in part, denying in part [13-3] motion to dismiss the claim brought under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. For the reasons set forth, pltffs' claims for declaratory and injunctive relief will neither be dismissed nor stayed. National Congress, however, is dismissed as a pltff to this action. In addition, pltffs' Equal Protection and conspiracy claims are likewise dismissed, the former subject to leave to amend within 20 days of this Opinion and Order. A conference is scheduled for 11/1/99 at 4:30pm. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Transcript of record of proceedings before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for the date(s) of 6/21/99 at 5:00pm. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 in further support re: [13-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) of the F.C.R.P. to dismiss, [13-2] motion to stay the claims for declaratory and injunctive relief, [13-3] motion to dismiss the claim brought under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by National Congress, Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Victor Rodriguez, Kahil Shkymba in opposition to [13-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) of the F.C.R.P. to dismiss, [13-2] motion to stay the claims for declaratory and injunctive relief, [13-3] motion to dismiss the claim brought under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 in support of [13-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) of the F.C.R.P. to dismiss, [13-2] motion to stay the claims for declaratory and injunctive relief, [13-3] motion to dismiss the claim brought under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/9/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF MOTION by City of New York, Rudolph Guiliani, Howard Safir, N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500 for an order purs. to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6) of the F.C.R.P. to dismiss or, alternatively, to stay the claims for declaratory and injunctive relief and to dismiss the claim brought under the Equal Protection Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment . Return date 7/7/99. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Nancy Chang, dated 7/15/99. Re: Request granted. The memorandum in response to defts' motion to dismiss is not to exceed 35 pages. The reply brief may be up to 15 pages in length . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: pltffs response to defts' motion to dismiss deadline 7/19/99; defts reply to response to motion deadline 8/6/99; parties shall serve document requests by 7/6/99 and responses by 8/6/99; depositions of pltffs and witnesses shall commence after 8/6/99 and Status conference by 4:30 on 9/22/99 at 500 Pearl Street Courtroom 12C. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter filed by National Congress, Kelvin Daniels, Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Victor Rodriguez, Kahil Shkymba addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Nancy Chang, dated 6/30/99, re: request that the Court adopt the provisions set forth in Paragraphs 3 and 4 of pltff's proposed Initial Scheduling Order. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/17/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER of voluntarily dismissing all claims against deft New York City Police Department with prejudice purs to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the F.R.C.P.i and the caption shall be amended to reflect this dismissal. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/14/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by National Congress, Kelvin Daniels (Answer due 6/14/99 for N.Y.C. P.O.'s 1-500, for Howard Safir, for Rudolph Guiliani, for N.Y.C. Police Dept., for City of New York) amending [1-1] complaint against Poseidon Baskin, Djibril Toure, Hector Rivera, Victor Rodriguez, Kahil Shkymba; Summons issued. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Scheindlin from Nancy Chang, dated 4/21/99. Re: Pltff is intended to submit a First Amended Complaint by 5/14/99 and Defts must respond to the First Amended Complaint by 6/14/99 for City of New York, for N.Y.C. Police Dept., for Rudolph Guiliani, for Howard Safir . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/31/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Memo-Endorsement on letter addressed to Judge Mukasey from Lisa S.J. Yee, dated 3/25/99. Re: reset answer due for 4/29/99 for City of New York, for N.Y.C. Police Dept., for Rudolph Guiliani, for Howard Safir . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/23/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Jonathan C. Moore, William H. Goodman, Barbara J. Olshansky, Nancy Chang. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Rudolph Guiliani, City of New York by the Corporate Counsel on 3/8/99. Answer due on 3/29/99 for Rudolph Guiliani, for City of New York. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to Howard Safir, N.Y.C. Police Dept. by the One Police Plaza Legal Unit on 3/8/99. Answer due on 3/29/99 for Howard Safir, for N.Y.C. Police Dept. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by National Congress, Kelvin Daniels, Robert Roe. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/1999, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 339400. (dcap) (Entered: 01/03/2000)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?