Expedia, Inc. IPO, et al v. Expedia, Inc., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-04973
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David R.T. Long, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Louis Carola, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Marten Piccinini, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Mary Grace Dippolito, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Nirmal Saha, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
v.
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated"
Unknown Role, Cumulus Media Inc.
Unknown Role, Lodgian, Inc.
Unknown Role, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Unknown Role, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Unknown Role, Infospace.com, Inc.
Unknown Role, New BlackRock, Inc.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Unknown Role, Bank of America, NA
Unknown Role, Gabelli Utility Fund
Unknown Role, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Clifford Chance, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY MARK HOLLAND +1 212 878 8432 +1 212 878 8375 mark.holland@cliffordchance.com
Morgan Stanley & Company Inc. Morgan Stanley & Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Brian Clubok +1 202 879 5173 +1 202 879 5200 aclubok@kirkland.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

No Logo Dale K. Wilson, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Stuart Berman +1 610 667 7706

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Mark Drinkwater, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE Stuart Berman +1 610 667 7706

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 abarroway@sbtklaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com
No Logo Pattsy Messer, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
    ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. Related document: 24 Amended Complaint filed by Louis Carola, Michael Mangan, Dale K. Wilson, Mary Grace Dippolito, David R.T. Long, Marten Piccinini.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None
      ANSWER by Morgan Stanley Dean to [24-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Andrew B. Clubok from the Firm: Kirkland and Ellis, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
        ANSWER by Goldman Sachs Group to [24-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
          ANSWER by Merrill Lynch, Inc. to [24-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Clifford Chance US LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/27/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
            ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [24-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:27 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
              NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs Group. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dale K. Wilson, Michael Mangan, Mary Grace Dippolito, David R.T. Long, Louis Carola, Marten Piccinini amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/14/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None
                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group. (sac) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None
                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None
                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Morgan Stanley Dean by James F. Doyle, counsel on 7/6/01. Answer due on 7/26/01 for Morgan Stanley Dean. (db) Modified on 11/19/2001 (Entered: 09/26/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Merrill Lynch, Inc. by Janet Urena, receptionist on 7/9/01. Answer due on 7/30/01 for Merrill Lynch, Inc. (db) Modified on 11/19/2001 (Entered: 09/26/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Goldman Sachs Group by Patricia A. McGraw, Legal Assistant on 7/5/01. Answer due on 7/25/01 for Goldman Sachs Group. (db) Modified on 11/19/2001 (Entered: 09/26/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Dean. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 11/19/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by the Plffs. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 11/19/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Expedia, Inc. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 11/19/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER, that all cases against Expedia in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-5727, 1:01-cv-6101, 1:01-cv-6866, 1:01-cv-6867, 1:01-cv-7154) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 4973. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate any future cases filed against Expedia subsequent to the date of this Order into lead case number 01 Civ. 4973. The Clerk of the Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 09/25/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None
                                        RESPONSE by Dale K. Wilson, Mark Drinkwater to [6-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6106, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154, [6-2] motion appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs, [6-3] motion approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/21/01 at 6:42pm) [Original filed in 01cv04973(SAS) as Doc# 12 and docketed to 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/27/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dale K. Wilson, Mark Drinkwater in support of [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867, [9-2] motion to appoint the Proposed Lead Plaintiffs as Lead Plaintiffs in the related actions, [9-3] motion to approve the counsel selected and retained by the Proposed Lead Plaintiffs as Lead Counsel. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 10:41pm) [Original filed in 01cv4973(SAS) as Doc# 11 and docketed in 01cv5725, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/17/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None
                                            DECLARATION of Peter E. Seidman by Dale K. Wilson, Mark Drinkwater in support Re: [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867, [9-2] motion to appoint the Proposed Lead Plaintiffs as Lead Plaintiffs in the related actions, [9-3] motion to approve the counsel selected and retained by the Proposed Lead Plaintiffs as Lead Counsel. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 10:41pm) [Original filed in 01cv4973(SAS) as Doc# 10 and docketed in 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/17/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Dale K. Wilson, Mark Drinkwater to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867 , to appoint the Proposed Lead Plaintiffs as Lead Plaintiffs in the related actions and to approve the counsel selected and retained by the Proposed Lead Plaintiffs as Lead Counsel . No return date indicated. Proposed Order attached. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 10:40pm) [Original filed in 01cv4973(SAS) as Doc# 9 and docketed in 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv6867.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/17/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Michael Mangan, Pattsy Messer in support of [6-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6106, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154, [6-2] motion appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs, [6-3] motion approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 5:35pm) [Original filed in 01cv4973(SAS) as Doc# 8 and docketed in 01cv5727, 01cv6106, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/17/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr. by Michael Mangan, Pattsy Messer in support of [6-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6106, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154, [6-2] motion appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs, [6-3] motion approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 5:35pm) [Original filed in 01cv4973(SAS) as Doc# 7 and docketed in 01cv5727, 01cv6106, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/17/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Michael Mangan, Pattsy Messer to consolidate cases 01cv4973, 01cv5727, 01cv6106, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154 , appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs and approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class . No return date indicated. Proposed order attached. (Received in Night Box on 8/6/01 at 5:35pm) [Original filed in 01cv4973(SAS) as Doc# 6 and docketed in 01cv5727, 01cv6101, 01cv6866 and 01cv7154.] (dcap) Modified on 08/27/2001 (Entered: 08/17/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 11/13/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/17/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STIPULATION and ORDER, the time for defts Expedia, Stanger, Maffei, and Barton to answer to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (i) the assignment of lead plntfs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna ) (cd) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          STIPULATION and ORDER; that the Dft's time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) the assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Lawrence M. McKenna ) (pl) Modified on 07/18/2001 (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/14/2001, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Fleetboston, Inc. by Andrew J. Frackman on 6/8/01. Answer due on 6/28/01 for Fleetboston, Inc. (djc) (Entered: 06/19/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                              CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 407807. (db) (Entered: 06/07/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?