Terra Networks IPO, et al v. Terra Networks S.A., et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06288

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2017 at 11:27 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leon Adams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan & Morgan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com
No Logo Samuel Sinay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Alberto Cortina De Alcocer, Defendant
No Logo Alejandro Junco De La Vega, Defendant
No Logo Antonio De Esteban Quintana, Defendant
No Logo Carsareo Alierta Isuel, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Francisco Moreno De Alboran, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs & Co."

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gandolfo V. Diblasi +1 212 558 4992 +5583 558 558 3588 diblasig@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Louis Hardiman +1 212 558 4070 +1 212 558 3588 hardimanj@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Jose Maria Mas Millet, Defendant
No Logo Juan Parea Suaerizde Buruaga, Defendant
No Logo Juan Rovir De Osso, Defendant
No Logo Juan Villa Longa Navarro, Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lehman Brothers"
Unknown Role, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Mayer Brown, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 ATauber@mayerbrownrowe.com
No Logo Nelson P. Sirotsky, Defendant
No Logo Terra Networks, S.a., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Winston & Strawn, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas John Quigley +1 212 294 6700 +1 212 294 4700 tquigley@winston.com
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Juan Antonio Sanchez Garcia, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Donald E. Benjamin, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo george murphy, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Laurence Bezirdjian, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Richard Haas, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lifshitz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua M. Lifshitz +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 jml@jlclasslaw.com
No Logo Todd Berkley, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Mohsen Pourkaviani, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
No Logo Ross Harvey, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING REISSUE OF EXPIRED DISTRIBUTION DRAFTS AND AUTHORIZING DONATION TO CHARITY: It is hereby ORDERED that the claims administrator Garden City Group LLC shall reissue the thirty-nine (39) distribution drafts referenced in Stanley D. Bernstein's letter to the Court dated June 15, 2015; and it is further ORDERED that no claims or requests for reissues received after seven days after the date of this Order will be accepted or paid; and it is further ORDERED that whatever funds remain after authorized reissue distribution drafts are cashed or expire shall be donated to the following 501(c)(3) charities in the specified proportion: 1) New York Lawyers for the Public Interest (30%) 2) The Southern Poverty Law Center (10%) 3) MFY Legal Services (30%) 4) Sharsheret (30%). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ajs) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER RE: CLAIMANTS SEEKING COURT REVIEW OF THE REJECTION OF THEIR PROOFS OF CLAIM: The POCs submitted by the following claimants who have requested this Court's review, are hereby finally REJECTED: Joan Rodriguez, 5165197; Charles E. Herbert, P.E., 1765520; Sumana S. Rockich IRA, 30012298; Sumana S. Rockich & Michael Rockich, JT, 30012244. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DECLARATION of Stephen J Cirami in Opposition re: responses receied on plaintiffs' motion to approve rejection of certain claimants who have disputed the rejection of their claims. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DECLARATION of George A Bauer in Opposition to answering submission from Charles A Herbert, P.E. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: (58 in 1:01-cv-11249-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-10753-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-10988-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-09883-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-06873-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-12881-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10799-SAS, 97 in 1:01-cv-06001-SAS, 66 in 1:01-cv-08404-SAS, 45 in 1:01-cv-10901-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09190-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-10230-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-11219-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-10942-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-10838-SAS, 49 in 1:01-cv-10576-SAS, 43 in 1:01-cv-10683-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-10105-SAS, 28 in 1:01-cv-06780-SAS, 57 in 1:01-cv-09748-SAS, 74 in 1:01-cv-00242-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14202-SAS, 78 in 1:01-cv-03857-SAS, 33 in 1:01-cv-09619-SAS, 55 in 1:01-cv-02359-SAS, 54 in 1:01-cv-06288-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10800-SAS, 64 in 1:01-cv-07048-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06277-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-09417-SAS, 46 in 1:01-cv-10053-SAS, 48 in 1:01-cv-09504-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06820-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10108-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-09411-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09191-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10839-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-05258-SAS, 72 in 1:01-cv-02261-SAS, 68 in 1:01-cv-03020-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-11220-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 6319 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP, 37 in 1:01-cv-09741-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14286-SAS) MOTION iohkjm.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            JOINT DECLARATION of Stanley D. Bernstein and Ariana J. Tadler in Support re: (58 in 1:01-cv-11249-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-10753-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-10988-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-09883-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-06873-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-12881-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10799-SAS, 97 in 1:01-cv-06001-SAS, 66 in 1:01-cv-08404-SAS, 45 in 1:01-cv-10901-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09190-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-10230-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-11219-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-10942-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-10838-SAS, 49 in 1:01-cv-10576-SAS, 43 in 1:01-cv-10683-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-10105-SAS, 28 in 1:01-cv-06780-SAS, 57 in 1:01-cv-09748-SAS, 74 in 1:01-cv-00242-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14202-SAS, 78 in 1:01-cv-03857-SAS, 33 in 1:01-cv-09619-SAS, 55 in 1:01-cv-02359-SAS, 54 in 1:01-cv-06288-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10800-SAS, 64 in 1:01-cv-07048-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06277-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-09417-SAS, 46 in 1:01-cv-10053-SAS, 48 in 1:01-cv-09504-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06820-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10108-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-09411-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09191-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10839-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-05258-SAS, 72 in 1:01-cv-02261-SAS, 68 in 1:01-cv-03020-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-11220-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 6319 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP, 37 in 1:01-cv-09741-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14286-SAS) MOTION iohkjm.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Members of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: re: MOTION ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) Modified on 10/16/2012 (pl). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER BY Members of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) Modified on 10/16/2012 (pl). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support OF Charles A. Herbert, P.E. re: (25 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS) MOTION to Approve FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PROOF OF CLAIM WHERE THE CLAIMANT DISPUTES THE REJECTION AND HAS REQUESTED THE COURT'S REVIEW OF SUCH REJECTION.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PROOF OF CLAIM WHERE THE CLAIMANT DISPUTES THE REJECTION AND HAS REQUESTED THE COURT'S REVIEW OF SUCH REJECTION. Document filed by Stanley E. O'Neal.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO SUBMIT CD-ROM COPY OF EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF STEPHEN J. CIRAMI: It is hereby ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court is directed to accept for filing and docket a CD-ROM or other digital storage device that contains a digital copy of Exhibits B-1 (Authorized Claimants) and B-2 (Rejected Claimants) to the Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami, Senior Vice President, Operations, of The Garden City Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(lmb) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS POSTED TO SATISFY RULE 7 BOND TO SETTLING OBJECTIONS granting (6302) Motion for Release of Funds in case 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within ten (10) calendar days of this order the clerk shall release to Jeffrey Weinstein, on behalf of the Movants, the $25,000 deposited with the cashier's office under Objectors Receipt Number 909152. The clerk's check for $25,000 should be made payable to "Jeffrey Weinstein" and mailed to Jeffrey Weinstein, 518 East Tyler Street, Athens, Texas, 75751. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Movants are hereby relieved of their joint and several obligation to post a bond. Movants are to pay their own fees and costs in the action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 6302]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) Modified on 4/13/2012 (mro). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AUTHORIZING CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR TO PROCESS CLAIMS SUBMITTED PRIOR TO ENTRY OF THIS ORDER AND TO STOP PROCESSING ANY NEW PROOFS OF CLAIM: The Claims Administrator is authorized to process all Proofs of Claim it received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that any Proofs of Claim received by the Claims Administrator after entry of this Order shall not be processed, may not be accepted and shall be returned by the Claims Administrator to the sender together with a notice stating that "The Court has entered an Order providing that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date of entry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever" and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to include a notice on the www.iposecuritieslitigationsettlement.com website stating that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date ofentry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever; and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to promptly conclude the processing of all Proofs of Claim received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that, upon the Claims Administrator's conclusion of the processing of the Proofs of Claim submitted or before entry of this Order, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall move for the Class Distribution Order contemplated in paragraph 14 of the Stipulation; and it is further ORDERED, that this Court retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with the administration an Settlement of this litigation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES'S AUGUST 8, 2011 SUBMISSION. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/16/11 at 11:18 pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of Christian Siebott in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to this Court's July 20, 2011 Order addressing whether Pro Se objector James J. Hayes is a class member. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S JULY 20, 2011 ORDER ADDRESSING WHETHER PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES IS A CLASS MEMBER. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: If Hayes is directed to submit any further support he wishes to be considered on the question of whether he is a class member, i.e., a "person...[who] purchased or otherwise acquired the securities of [Specific Issuer] during the Class Period and [was] damaged thereby," by the close of business on July 29, 2011. If Hayes makes any further submissions he shall simultaneously serve Plaintiffs' Executive Committee by email or by overnight express mail. Any party who wises to respond to Hayes's submissions to date or in response to this Order shall do so by the close of business on August 5, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(tro) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    OPINION AND ORDER #100514. For the foregoing reasons, total fees shall be allocated according to the methodology described herein and in the amounts included in the attached Spreadsheet. Expenses and interest shall be allocated according to Exhibit A of the Proposal. The Objectors are directed to file their Objections and any responses thereto. The Clerk of the Court is then directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Plaintiffs' Executive Committee ("EC") is hereby ordered to prepare a spreadsheet showing the allocation of total fees of $170,084,950.00 based on the "revised adjusted lodestars" of both the EC and non-EC law firms. This spreadsheet must be submitted to the Court by close of business Monday, June 20, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/15/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: We respectfully request a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven, P.C. is directly seeking attorney's fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claim will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/2010 re: Requesting a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven P.C. is directly seeking attorneys fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claims will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arriving out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: Request for a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPQ Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm Brower Piven PC is directly seeking attorneys' fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such caim will be heard by Judge Sheindlin. But only disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Halderstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(db) Modified on 1/13/2011 (db). (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Baum.Document filed by Lester Baum.Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland L. Greene on behalf of Lester Baum Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name. As a result of a combination, the law firm of LeBoeuf, Lamb, Greene & MacRae LLP will now be known as Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP. All pleadings and correspondence should be directed to Dewey & LeBoeuf LLP. The office address, telephone numbers and facsimile numbers remain the same, as provided herein. Document filed by Terra Networks S.A. (djc) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name. The law firm of LeBoeuf, Lamb, Greene & MacRae LLP will now be known as Dewey & Leboeuf LLP. Document filed by Terra Networks S.A.. (djc) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER, Attorney Thomas John Quigley for Terra Networks, S.A. IPO Securities Litigation and Terra Networks S.A., Cesareo Alierta Izuel, Alberto Cortina de Alcocer, Juan Perea Saenz de Buruaga, Jose Maria Mas Millet, Antonio de Esteban Quintana, Jose Antonio Sanchez Garcia, Nelson Pacheco Sirotsky, Juan Rovira de Osso, Juan Villalonga, Francisco de Moreno de Alboran and Aljeandro Junco de la Vega added. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/21/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS, 1:01-cv-06288-SAS(sac) (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER granting [] Motion to Withdraw as lead plaintiff. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/31/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 13 Amended Complaint filed by Samuel Sinay.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                              ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. Related document: 13 Amended Complaint filed by Samuel Sinay.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
                                                                ANSWER by Goldman Sachs & Co. to [13-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                  ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [13-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:38 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/13/2003)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                    ANSWER by Lehman Brothers to [13-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                                                                      ANSWER by Bear, Stearns & Co. to [13-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Randy M. Mastro from the Firm: Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2003)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs & Co. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Alejandro Junco De La Vega by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Antonio De Esteban Quintana by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Nelson P. Sirotsky by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Juan Rovir De Osso by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Francisco Moreno De Alboran by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Jose Maria Mas Millet by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Carsareo Alierta Isuel by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (01 Civ. 6288) (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Alberto Cortina De Alcocer by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/19/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Juan Parea Suaerizde Buruaga by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/12/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Juan Villa Longa Navarro by John McMahon, Exec. V.P., on 8/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF JOINDER of plaintiff Leon Adams, purs. to FRCP 20. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/31/02 at 11:22 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                  CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Samuel Sinay amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                    ERRATA to consolidated amended class action complaint for violations of The Federal Securities Laws by Samuel Sinay replacing paragraph 113. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/10/02 at 9:21 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs & Co. by Norman Feit, managing agent, on 6/5/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs & Co. by Patricia A. McGraw, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/19/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Terra Networks S.A. c/o CT Corporation System by Connie Bertini, managing agent on 5/6/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/19/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Salomon Smith Barney by Fern Strauss, V.P. Litigations Paralegal, on 4/24/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/30/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs & Co. by Patricia A. McGraw, Associate, on 4/25/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT by Samuel Sinay amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  CORRECTED CONSOLIDATION ORDER,... that all cases involving Terra Networks, Inc., initial public offering in this IPO Securities Litigation, including case numbers 01-CV-6705, 01-CV-6994, 01-CV-7730, and 01-CV-8251, shall be consolidated into case number 01-CV-6288. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01-CV-6288... the Clerk of the Court is further Ordered to close all cases that have been so consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ..., this Order corrects and Supersedes the prior consolidation order dated September 10, 2001 issued in connection with the Terra Networks initial public offering in this IPO Securities Litigation and filed in the docket for case number 21mc92 ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original docketed in 1:01-cv-6288 Document No. 5. Also docketed in 1:01-cv-06705; 1:01-cv-06994; 1:01-cv-07730; 1:01-cv-08251] (dcap) Modified on 06/17/2002 (Entered: 06/17/2002)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. (moc) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      STIPULATION and ORDER; that the defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (i) the assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (kkc) Modified on 09/26/2001 (Entered: 08/14/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 09/26/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411400. (db) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 36 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?