Clarent Corp. IPO, et al v. Clarent Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06322
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 18, 2016 at 1:03 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles W. Binford, Plaintiff
No Logo Ciarin MacNeill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Harvey Fleishman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Miriam Nadler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo Scott A. Starosta, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Steven E. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter George Safirstein +1 212 271 8205 +1 212 868 1229 psafirstein@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Clarent Corporation, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
Deutsche Bank AG Deutsche Bank AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Deutsche Bank Alex B"
Unknown Role, Nrp, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sherwood Group, Inc.,
Unknown Role, Briazz, Inc.
Unknown Role, Dsl.net, Inc.
Unknown Role, Blockbuster, Inc.
Unknown Role, Korea Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Brazil Fund Inc
Unknown Role, Solv Ex Corp
Unknown Role, Newmark Homes Corp
Unknown Role, Comple Tel Europe Nv
Unknown Role, Doblique Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
Unknown Role, Emerson Radio Corp
Unknown Role, Emachines Inc /de/
Unknown Role, Rreef America L.l.c.
Unknown Role, Id Arizona Corp.

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Hambrecht & Quist, Defendant
No Logo Jerry Shaw-Yau Chang, Defendant
No Logo Michael F. Vargo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael F. Vargo

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael F. Vargo +1 650 366 6536 +1 831 307 9298
No Logo Michael J. Heaps, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Heaps, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
No Logo Syaru Shirley Lin, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Weisel Partners, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenthal +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 jrosenthal@cgsh.com
U.S. Bancorp Corporation U.S. Bancorp Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
No Logo Wen Chang Ko, Defendant
No Logo Bill Jenkins, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull and Lifshitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter D.. Bull +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 pdb@nyclasslaw.com
No Logo Cynthia I. Jenkins, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jacqueline Sailer
No Logo Edward Cohill, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 Bruckner@whafh.com
No Logo Gregory T. Mercurio, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Harvey Fleishman, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Represented by Milberg LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld, Esq. +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@geller-rudman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Seeger Weiss LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Milton Pfeiffer, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo Wenjie Luo, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gottlieb, Rackman & Reisman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc. Deutsche Bank Securities, Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas W. Henkin +1 212 530 5000 dhenkin@milbank.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoeman, Updike & Kaufman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David B. Gordon +1 212 661 5030 dgordon@schoeman.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Consolidated Defendant
Officially listed as "J.P. Morgan Sec."

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, Settleing action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; The following related actions are dismissed without prejudice as to the individual defendants listed on Schedule 1, and dismissed pursuant to the Opinion and Order dated 2/19/03, as the individual defendants listed on Schedule 2. The dismissal of the related actions is without costs to the individual defendants listed on Schedules 1 and 2. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/22/09) This Document Relates to: 01cv2359, 01cv3225, 01cv3360, 01cv3910, 01cv5143, 01cv5644, 01cv5838, 01cv6000, 01cv6008, 01cv6120, 01cv6271, 01cv6277, 01cv6322, 01cv6747, 01cv6846, 01cv6870, 01cv7002, 01cv7046, 01cv7247, 01cv7344, 01cv9618, 01cv9651, 01cv9797, 01cv9799, 01cv9800, 01cv10040, 01cv10051, 01cv10075, 01cv10092, 01cv10108, 01cv10140, 01cv10161, 01cv10738, 01cv10753, 01cv10838, 01cv10867, 01cv10884, 01cv11230, 01cv11234.(sac) (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None
      ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 28 Amended Complaint filed by Ciarin MacNeill.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None
        ANSWER by U.S. Bancorp Piper to [28-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None
          ANSWER by Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank Alex B to [28-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
            ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [28-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:25 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
              ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [28-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:34 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None
                ANSWER by Thomas Weisel LLC to [28-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Jeffrey A. Rosenthal from the Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:45 p.m.). (sac) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Pendency of case under Chapter 11 of the Bankruptcy code and of automatic stay by Clarent Corp. (sac) (Entered: 03/14/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF JOINDER of plaintiffs Harvey Fleishman, Scott A. Starosta, Steven E. Smith, purs. to FRCP 20. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/31/02 at 11:32 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/24/2002, Entered: None
                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Clarent Corporation mailed on 2/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/26/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Richard J. Heaps by Richard J. Heaps, on 5/11/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Jerry Shaw-Yau Chang by Ariee Chang, wife, on 4/17/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Supplemental Summons & Amended Complaint as to Clarent Corporation by Tim Harris, managing agent, on 4/4/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to U.S. Bancorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser, managing agent, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Thomas Weisel LLC by Kathleen Romeo on 4/4/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Ciarin MacNeill amending [19-1] amended complaint, [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Credit Suisse First by Mary O'Riordan, Asst. V.P., on 4/1/02. (sac) Modified on 05/13/2002 (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Thomas Weisel LLC by Kathleen Romeo, managing agent, on 4/1/02. (sac) Modified on 05/13/2002 (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/22/2002, Entered: None
                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C as to Brendan J. Dowd returned executed mailed on 2/26/02 (sac) (Entered: 04/05/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/4/2002, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint returned executed as to Credit Suisse First mailed on 2/26/02. Answer due on 4/29/02 for Credit Suisse First. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 3/4/02 at 5:01 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Michael F. Vargo by Gina Krause, Corp. Service Supervisor, on 8/3/01. (sac) (Entered: 03/08/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel LLC. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 1/18/02 at 5:23 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None
                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/05/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None
                                                  REVISED LIST OF CASES BY COUNSEL; purs. to Item I(A) of this Court's Order dated 8/8/01, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP and Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to appear as counsel for Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                    AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Miriam Nadler, Scott A. Starosta, Charles W. Binford, Steven E. Smith (Answer due 12/19/01 for Clarent Corporation, for Credit Suisse First, for Bancboston Robertson, for Thomas Weisel LLC, for U.S. Bancorp Piper, for Jerry Shaw-Yau Chang, for Richard J. Heaps, for Michael F. Vargo) amending [1-1] complaint; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM by Ciarin MacNeill, Gregory T. Mercurio re: IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF [12-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead case) and member cases: 01-CV-6549; 01-CV-6699; 01-CV-6817; 01-CV-7317; 01-CV-7665; 01-CV-7782, [12-2] motion for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [12-3] motion for an order to approve Movant's selection of Lead Counsel (received in the night deposit box on 9/26/01 at 7:17 pm) (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/04/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 98 re: in FURTHER SUPPORT OF [9-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead Case) and member cases 01-CV-6549, 01-CV-6699, 01-CV-6817, 01-CV-7317, 01-CV-7665, [9-2] motion for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [9-3] motion for an Order, approving the selection of the Lead Counsel (received in the night deposit box on 9/27/01 at 5:26 pm) (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/04/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None
                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase & Co. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None
                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Egan, Esq. by Ciarin MacNeill, Gregory T. Mercurio in support of [12-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead case) and member cases: 01-CV-6549; 01-CV-6699; 01-CV-6817; 01-CV-7317; 01-CV-7665; 01-CV-7782, [12-2] motion for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [12-3] motion for an order to approve Movant's selection of Lead Counsel . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ciarin MacNeill, Gregory T. Mercurio in support of [12-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead case) and member cases: 01-CV-6549; 01-CV-6699; 01-CV-6817; 01-CV-7317; 01-CV-7665; 01-CV-7782, [12-2] motion for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [12-3] motion for an order to approve Movant's selection of Lead Counsel . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Ciarin MacNeill, Gregory T. Mercurio for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead case) and member cases: 01-CV-6549; 01-CV-6699; 01-CV-6817; 01-CV-7317; 01-CV-7665; 01-CV-7782 , for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 , for an order to approve Movant's selection of Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. (received in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 5:05 pm) (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/04/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                    DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 98 in support Re: [9-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead Case) and member cases 01-CV-6549, 01-CV-6699, 01-CV-6817, 01-CV-7317, 01-CV-7665, [9-2] motion for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [9-3] motion for an Order, approving the selection of the Lead Counsel . (received in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:31 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 98 in support of [9-1] motion for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead Case) and member cases 01-CV-6549, 01-CV-6699, 01-CV-6817, 01-CV-7317, 01-CV-7665, [9-2] motion for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [9-3] motion for an Order, approving the selection of the Lead Counsel . (received in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:31 PM) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers Local 98; for an order to consolidate cases 01-CV-6322 (Lead Case) and member cases 01-CV-6549, 01-CV-6699, 01-CV-6817, 01-CV-7317, 01-CV-7665 , for an Order for appointment as Lead Plaintiffs, pursuant to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D (a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995 , for an Order, approving the selection of the Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. (received in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:31 PM) (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/04/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None
                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Miriam Nadler . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Deutsche Banc Alex. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None
                                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel LLC . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER,... that all cases involving Clarent in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06549, 1:01-cv-06699, 1:01-cv-06817, 1:01-cv-07317, 1:01-cv-07665, 1:01-cv-07782 and 1:01-cv-07838), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6322. The Clerk of the Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6322 ,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06322 Document No. 5. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06549; 1:01-cv-06699; 1:01-cv-06817; 1:01-cv-07317; 1:01-cv-07665; 1:01-cv-07782; 1:01-cv-07838] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Clarent Corporation . (bai) (Entered: 09/19/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER; the time for defendants Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation and BancBoston Reobertson Stephens Inc., to answer, move otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended through and inlcuding the later of sixty days after (i) the assignment of lead plaintiff's counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action ; ( signed by Judge Richard C. Casey ) (djc) (Entered: 08/13/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411488. (db) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 294 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?