Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. et al v. American Airlines, Inc. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:04-cv-07318

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 2:11 PM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Candice Toll Aaron
Space Mia Mary Meloni

Toggle Switch Represented by BGC PARTNERS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL A. LAMPERT +1 646 346 7207 mlampert@bgcpartners.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Saul Ewing LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer L. Beidel +1 215 972 7850 jbeidel@saul.com
Space Timothy W. Callahan, II +1 215 972 1081 +1 215 972 1828 tcallahan@saul.com
Space Charles Neilson Curlett, Jr. +1 410 332 8600 +1 410 332 8109 ccurlett@saul.com
Space JENNIFER L. FARER +1 215 972 7745 jfarer@saul.com
Space patrick M Hromisin +1 215 972 8396 +1 215 972 2280 phromisin@saul.com
Space Jonathan Leonard Marshfield +1 609 452 3155 +1 609 919 3589 jmarshfield@saul.com
Space John F. Stoviak +1 215 972 1095 +1 215 972 1921 jstoviak@saul.com
Space Shiloh D. Theberge +1 215 972 8382 +1 215 972 1921 stheberge@saul.com
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, LP, Plaintiff
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Plaintiff
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Plaintiff
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald International, Plaintiff
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Plaintiff
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Plaintiff
No Logo Cantor Fitzgerald, LP, Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Espeed, Inc.
Unknown Role, Newmark Group, Inc.
Unknown Role, Lutnick, Howard W.
No Logo Cantor Index Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Cantor Index Limited"
No Logo Co2e.com, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Espeed Government Securities, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo eSpeed Securities, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Espeed, Inc., Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Newmark Group, Inc.
No Logo TradeSpark, L.P., Plaintiff
v.
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Condon & Forsyth LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Desmond Thomas Barry, Jr +1 212 894 6700 +1 212 894 6771 dbarry@condonlaw.com
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Riggs Bank, NA, Defendant
No Logo Riggs National Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
  Entries (147) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 148
    LREF
    Blank 146
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (142 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1847 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION For a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P (Part 1 of 2), # 19 Exhibit P (Part 2 of 2), # 20 Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit X, # 28 Exhibit Y, # 29 Exhibit Z, # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit BB, # 32 Exhibit CC, # 33 Exhibit DD, # 34 Exhibit EE, # 35 Exhibit FF, # 36 Exhibit GG, # 37 Exhibit HH, # 38 Exhibit II, # 39 Exhibit JJ, # 40 Exhibit KK, # 41 Exhibit LL, # 42 Exhibit MM, # 43 Exhibit NN, # 44 Exhibit OO, # 45 Exhibit PP)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/06/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #145) - DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (142 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1847 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION For a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 3), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 3), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 3), # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O, # 18 Exhibit P, # 19 Exhibit Q, # 20 Exhibit R, # 21 Exhibit S, # 22 Exhibit T, # 23 Exhibit U, # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z (Part 1 of 2), # 29 Exhibit Z (Part 2 of 2), # 30 Exhibit AA, # 31 Exhibit BB, # 32 Exhibit CC, # 33 Exhibit DD, # 34 Exhibit EE, # 35 Exhibit FF, # 36 Exhibit GG, # 37 Exhibit HH, # 38 Exhibit II, # 39 Exhibit JJ, # 40 Exhibit KK, # 41 Exhibit LL, # 42 Exhibit MM, # 43 Exhibit NN, # 44 Exhibit OO, # 45 Exhibit PP)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) Modified on 11/6/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 11/05/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 143 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (142 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1847 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION For a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
            MOTION For a Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1842 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 137 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Certain of Plaintiffs' Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (Part 1 of 2), # 6 Exhibit E (Part 2 of 2), # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U (Part 1 of 2), # 23 Exhibit U (Part 2 of 2), # 24 Exhibit V, # 25 Exhibit W, # 26 Exhibit X, # 27 Exhibit Y, # 28 Exhibit Z, # 29 Exhibit AA, # 30 Exhibit BB, # 31 Exhibit CC, # 32 Exhibit DD, # 33 Exhibit EE, # 34 Exhibit FF, # 35 Exhibit GG, # 36 Exhibit HH, # 37 Exhibit II, # 38 Exhibit JJ, # 39 Exhibit KK)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Martha Crenshaw in Support re: (1842 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 137 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Certain of Plaintiffs' Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1842 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 137 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Certain of Plaintiffs' Claims.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Dismissing Certain of Plaintiffs' Claims. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                        RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (132 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1837 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All of Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Duty and Proximate Cause.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Martha Crenshaw in Support re: (132 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1837 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All of Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Duty and Proximate Cause.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (132 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1837 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All of Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Duty and Proximate Cause.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All of Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Duty and Proximate Cause. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the conference regarding proposed jury instructions in this case scheduled for November 4, 2013 shall instead be held on December 3, 2013 at 10am. The deadline for special verdict sheets, general verdict sheets and interrogatories to the jury shall be moved to December 9, 2013. Status Conference set for 12/3/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(ft) Modified on 10/29/2013 (ft). (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 10/25/2013 re: Counsel requests the Court's permission to file under seal the following motions that the parties will be filing today. ENDORSEMENT: Permission denied. The parties should submit to me marked copies of the motions, marked to show the sections as to which sealing is sought, for rulings regarding public filing. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/28/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(ft) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/10/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/10/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/18/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/2/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Sarah S. Normand dated 10/17/13 re: Counsel writes to request an adjournment of the upcoming briefing deadlines and the conference scheduled for 10/28/13. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/18/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(mro) (Entered: 10/21/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 10/3/13 re: Cantor and American propose that trial proceed in the sequence listed herein. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/10/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(mro) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 9/30/2013 re: Accordingly, Cantor and American jointly request that the deadline for filing substantive and dispositive motions be extended until October 25, 2013 from the September 30, 2013 deadline set forth in the Joint Amended Case Management Plan and Order of May 22, 2013 ("CMO"). ENDORSEMENT: The schedule is approved. Adjournments beyond that, or because of implications from the government's appropriations issues, will not be approved. Any necessary orders should now be proposed.". SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/30/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(ama) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 9/5/13 re: Counsel requests the Courts permission to file under seal American's Motion to exclude certain options of the damages experts retained by Plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., et al. ENDORSEMENT: I approve a protocol consistent with my Individual Rule 4B. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/30/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(mro) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER granting (1791) Motion for Nicholas J. Nastasi to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Nicholas J. Nastasi, Esq. is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., et al. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(mro) Modified on 9/26/2013 (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 9/10/13 re: Counsel requests (1) an adjournment of the September 18, 2013 conference until either October 7, 2013 or October 10, 2013, or at the Court's earliest convenience thereafter; (2) an extension to submit their Joint letter until one week in advance of the rescheduled conference; (3) an adjournment of the October 10, 2013 hearing until October 24, 2013, or at the Court's earliest convenience thereafter; and (4) an extension of time for the parties and the Government to brief the Court regarding SSI trial designations and counter-designations in dispute. ENDORSEMENT: The extensions are granted. The Sept. 18 conference is adjourned to October 10, 2013, 2:30 p.m. The October 10 conference is adjourned to October 28, 2013, at 10:30 a.m. The filing dates for submissions are adjusted accordingly. The parties shall propose a briefing schedule, as promptly as possible, for SSI issues. ( Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein., Status Conference set for 10/28/2013 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/12/2013) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(mro) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      JOINT AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER. It is hereby ORDERED, in connection with the firm trial date of January 6, 2014, that the following Joint Amended Case Management Plan regarding remaining discovery, motion practice, pre-trial reparations and trial is established for the Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs and American Airlines in In Re September 11 Litigation. Motions in limine due by 11/20/2013. Responses due by 12/9/2013. Expert Discovery due by 9/13/2013. Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2013 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Status Conference set for 10/10/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2013. Ready for Trial by 1/6/2014. Status Conference set for 11/20/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Status Conference set for 12/5/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/22/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH. (rjm) (Entered: 05/22/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING ACCESS TO, HANDLING AND USE OF SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION AT TRIAL... regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/7/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH. (rjm) (Entered: 05/08/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND ORDER: Motions in limine due by 11/20/2013. Responses due by 12/9/2013. Deposition due by 11/27/2013. Expert Discovery due by 9/13/2013. Hearing on any issues requiring rulings regarding the proposed statement of introductory facts regarding the events of September 11, 2001 as further specified herein set for 11/20/2013 at 02:30 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Final Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2013. Ready for Trial by 1/6/2014, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/17/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER ON CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. I have read the parties' Joint Case Management Plan. Although I approve of most of the dates set out in the proposal, the plan should be revised to reflect the following points: 1) The trial date is firm. Whatever the problems or time delays in dealing with SSI materials and witnesses, or other issues of discovery, there will be no adjournments of the trial, or of any hearings of issues involved in the trial. 2) The dates for the Touhy expert reports and for all experts relating to SSI should be compressed and accelerated to avoid the danger of slippages. 3) The parties should include relevant provisions from orders in the case of Bavis v. UAL Corp., 02 Civ. 7154, including dates for submitting a short, agreed-upon summary of the events of Sept. 11 to be read to the jury, summaries of each witness's expected testimony, proposals for instructions to the jury, criteria for judging fault of airport screening procedures, and other issues to be the subject of jury instructions. I attach the relevant orders in that case for the convenience of the parties. Those orders are: a) Order Regulating Procedure on Defendants' Motion, December 16, 2010; b) Order to Regulate Pretrial Process, February 24, 2011; c) Endorsement of Submission of Facts, March 15, 2011, and d) Order and Opinion Regulating Burdens of Proof and Issues for Jury Instructions, September 7, 2011. Issues on these matters that require rulings will be heard November 13, 2013, at 2:30 p.m. 4) The parties shall propose an agreed-upon length of trial, assuming a 5-hour trial day and having in mind that a trial that exceeds three-to-four weeks may present undue hardship to jurors. The case management plan shall provide a date for the parties' submission as to the length of trial. 5) The parties shall provide a revised Joint Case Management Plan for my signature, by noon, April 16, 2013. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/8/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) Modified on 4/10/2013 (rjm). (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 3/14/2013 re: The parties request that the Court adjourn the March 21, 2013 status conference until after the parties submit their agreed CMO to the Court, and as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Adjourned. The status conference is adjourned to April 17, 2013, 3:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 4/17/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/14/2013). Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH. (rjm) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Leonard Marshfield on behalf of CO2e.com, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Index Limited, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Marshfield, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER SUMMARIZING STATUS CONFERENCE: On January 23, 2013, I held a status conference in the above-captioned matter at which I scheduled a liability and damages jury trial of the Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs' claims against American Airlines to begin on January 6, 2014 and directed counsel to submit a joint case management plan regarding remaining discovery, motion practice, pretrial preparations and trial for my consideration. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/1/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 02/01/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER: 12/17/2012 Status Conference reset for 1/23/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, for the Cantor claims and at 3:15 for the Silverstein claims. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER: Cantor will serve its damages expert report(s) on or before January 21, 2013. Defendants American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corp. will serve their damages expert report(s) on or before March 4, 2013. Expert damages depositions will be completed on or before April 15, 2013. Either party may depose any fact witness not previously deposed that the opposing party hereafter identifies as a witness it intends to call at trial subject to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30. SO ORDERED.( Deposition due by 4/15/2013.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/19/2012) (ama) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: 1. Cantor will serve its damages expert report(s) on or before November 30, 2012. 2. American will serve its damages expert report(s) on or before January 25, 2013. 3. Expert damages depositions will be completed on or before March 15, 2013. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. ( Deposition due by 3/15/2013.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER: Cantor will serve its damages expert report(s) on or before October 23, 2012. American will serve its damages expert report(s) on or before December 4, 2012. Rebuttal reports are not necessary. Expert damages depositions will be completed on or before Feb. 15, 2013. The case mgmt. conf. set for 8/21/12 is adjourned to 2/26/13 at 4:00 p.m. Either party may depose any fact witness not previously deposed that the opposing party hereafter identifies as a witness it intends to call at trial subject to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30. The parties shall identify and depose, to the extent possible, by 9/30/12., ( Case Management Conference set for 2/26/2013 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(lmb) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 6/06/2012 re: Based on the foregoing, American and Cantor respectfully request that the June 20 status conference be adjourned, at the convenience of the Court, to sometime after the completion of fact discovery on August 10. ENDORSEMENT: The Status Conference is adjourned to August 21, 2012 at 4:00 p.m., ( Status Conference set for 8/21/2012 at 04:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/12/2012) (ama) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry dated 6/6/2012 re: Based on the foregoing, American and Cantor respectfully request that the June 20 status conference be adjourned, at the convenience of the Court, to sometime after the completion of fact discovery on August 10. ENDORSEMENT: The conference is adjourned to August 14, 2012 at 2:30 p.m. Courtroom 14D. So Ordered. ( Status Conference set for 8/14/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/8/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(js) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. and John F. Stoviak dated 5/18/2012 re: Counsel writes pursuant to the Court's Individual Rule 2(E) to seek your assistance in resolving a dispute between American Airlines, In.c and AMR Corporation and Cantor Fitzegerald, L.P. and its affiliates. ENDORSEMENT: Cantor's objections are denied. The parties shall agree to a fair sampling of identities to be disclosed, sufficient in American's view to allow a fair sampling to test Cantor's theory, at least initially. Interviews, to the extent witnesses consent, may be conducted by American's counsel, without advising, or the attendance of, Cantor's counsel. See Niesig v. Team I, 76 N.Y. 2d 363 (1990). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/22/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 5/14/2012 re: Request for adjournment of fact discovery deadline. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Fact Discovery due by 8/10/2012.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/22/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 05/22/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 5/14/2012 re: Based on the foregoing, American and Cantor respectfully request that the June 8, 2012 deadline to complete liability and damages fact discovery be extended by 60 days to August 10, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(djc) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER: It is hereby Ordered that Timothy W. Callahan, II is admitted to practice pro hac vice. in case 1:04-cv-07318-AKH; granting (1620) Motion for Timothy W. Callahan, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/25/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 04/25/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER: in case 1:04-cv-07318-AKH; granting (1617) Motion for Patrick M. Hromisin to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. That upon the motion of Saul Ewing LLP, attorneys for Plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., that Patrick M. Hromisin, Esq. is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/17/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(pl) Modified on 4/19/2012 (pl). (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Desmond T. Barry, Jr. dated 4/3/2012 re: Counsel writes in response to Mr. Stoviak's letter to inform the Court that Cantors DDF does not sufficiently describe Cantor's methodology for calculating how its alleged damages are attributable to the property damage it sustained on September 11, 2001. ENDORSEMENT: Cantor's obligation is to file its amended claim for damages, showing compliance with the Court's opinion and order of Jan. 19, 2011. It does not have to file proofs, not to expert's report. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(ft) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER: Patrick M. Hromisin. Esq. is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, C02e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., and TradeSpark, L.P in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(ft) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER REGULATING DISCOVERY (CMO 2012 #1): By March 31, 2012 Cantor Fitzgerald shall produce to American Airlines all books and records relating to damages naturally and probably flowing from the destruction of Cantor Fitzgerald's property in the terrorist attacks of September 11, 2001. Cantor Fitzgerald may proceed to take the depositions of those American Airlines employees and former employees specified during the status conference, limited to the matters specified in the conference. It may also take the deposition of the one FAA employee specified during the conference, and must comply with the rule established by United States ex reL. Touhy v. Ragen, 340 U.S. 462 (1951). Fact Discovery due by 6/8/2012. Status Conference set for 6/20/2012 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/21/2012) (ft) (Entered: 03/22/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 3/9/2012 re: Counsel for the plaintiffs request that the Court grant Cantor's application to file this confidential exhibit under seal. ENDORSEMENT: Denied, with leave to re-apply showing that the exhibit, and all parts thereof, are "narrowly tailored" and that "higher values" than suppression are affected. AKH Individual Rules 4A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(ft) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 1/31/2012 re: Counsel for the Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs requests that the Court permit Cantor to continue to pursue its claims in this litigation and schedule a status conference to establish a pre-trial and trial schedule. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel for all parties shall attend a conference on March 2, 2012, 10:30 a.m. (Status Conference set for 3/2/2012 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/21/2012) (ft) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (MISSING A PAGE)- NOTICE of Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Barry, Desmond) Modified on 12/1/2011 (lb). (Entered: 11/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Curlett is discharged as counsel. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/8/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 11/08/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/1/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Douglas M. Pravda hereby withdraws as counsel of record for defendant The Boeing Company in the above-captioned actions. Robert A. Atkins and H. Christopher Boehning of the law firm Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Ganison LLP have entered notices of appearance in this matter and together with Perkins Coie LLP and Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, will continue to represent The Boeing Company. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 2/3/2011 re: Cantor asks that the Court approve an extension to the deadline for submission of an amended expert report on damages. Counsel for Cantor have conferred with counsel for Defendant American Airlines, and the parties agree that Cantor may have a deadline of March 24, 2011, provided that Cantor produces a complete report and damages model at that time. Cantor respectfully requests that the Court approve this deadline. No further extensions will be requested. In addition, the parties respectfully request that if the deadline is altered, the Court reschedule the status conference in this case. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/10/2011) (jmi) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from John F. Stoviak dated 2/4/2011 re: the report and deposition testimony of Gregory S. Thaler, Cantor's expert on damages, "were identified as 'confidential' and filed under seal," but that in view of the Court's "Order and Opinion [dated January 19, 2011], it appears inappropriate to keep these materials sealed any longer." The Court cited The Hartford Courant Co. v. Pellegrino, 380 F.3d 83, 96 (2d Cir. 2004), where the Second Circuit affirmed a presumptive right of access in docket sheets created by the clerk of court. ENDORSEMENT: The motion to maintain confidentiality will be granted upon the submission of redacted papers. That which is to be maintained as confidential should be limited to the extent possible. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/10/2011) (jmi) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER REGULATING PROCEEDINGS: My Order and Opinion granting partial summary judgment to Defendants, In re Sept. 11 Litig., 04 Civ. 7138 (21 MC 101),2011 WL 149518 (S.D.N.Y. Jan. 19,2011), discussed the report and deposition testimony of Gregory S. Thaler, an expert retained by Plaintiffs to analyze and quantify their damages as a consequence of the events of September 11, 2001. From the discovery exhibits, it appears those materials were identified as "confidential" and filed under seal. In view of my Order and Opinion, it appears inappropriate to keep these materials sealed any longer. This Court presumes that materials presented for review enjoy a presumption of openness to public inspection, rebuttable only "upon demonstration that suppression is essential to preserve higher values and is narrowly tailored to serve that interest." The Hartford Courant Co. v. Pellegrino, 380 F.3d 83, 96 (2d Cir. 2004) (internal quotation and citation omitted). If any party wishes that any information filed in connection with this case remain sealed, it shall set forth its reasons and justifications. Any such submission must be submitted to the Court by letter, and must be filed by February 4, 2011, at noon. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/28/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(db) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER AND OPINION GRANTING PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT TO LIMIT PLAINTIFFS' DAMAGES: #99867 No one can deny the emotional and financial hurt suffered by Cantor Fitzgerald's, and the families of its officers and employees. But as a matter of law, Cantor Fitzgerald's claim for damages, however theorized, may not include claims for lost profits resulting from the deaths of, and injuries to, its officers and employees on September 11. Cantor Fitzgerald must eliminate the impermissible aspect of its damages claim. It has leave to file amended claims by February 28, 2011. I will meet with the parties on March 7, 2011, at 2:30 p.m., to discuss the status of any remaining pretrial issues, and to set a trial date. In the meantime, if the parties wish to return to mediation before Judge Martin after Cantor Fitzgerald restates its claim, they shall so advise me by joint letter, and ask for the cancellation of the status conference. The Clerk shall terminate the motion (Doc. No. 1234). So Ordered (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/19/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(js) Modified on 1/21/2011 (ajc). (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING MOTION IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EXPERT REPORT in case 1:04-cv-07318-AKH; denying (1238) Motion in Limine in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. For this reason, American's motion in limine is denied. The Clerk shall mark the present motion (Doc. No. 1238) terminated. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/13/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(jmi) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion for an Order Requiring WTCP to Post an Appeal Bond. Document filed by Industrial Risk Insurers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Clifford, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 8/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lauren E. Chwastyk dated 8/5/10 re: I enclose a courtesy copy of Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs' Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance for Jennifer L. Farer, Esq., along with a Certificate of Service, which were electronically filed today. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., Attorney Jennifer L. Farer terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/6/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 08/09/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT Re: NOTICE OF CANTOR FITZGERALD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SHORTEN THE TIME PERIOD FOR DEFENDANTS AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. AND AMR CORPORATIONS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' JULY 26, 2010 MOTION FOR LIMITED RELIEF AND FOR SANCTIONS. ENDORSEMENT: The Motion for Limited Relief and for Sanctions is denied since the issue raised is one that the Court has to decide, and the other issues have been resolved in mutually satisfactory fashion. Document 1214 is terminated. Motions terminated: (1214 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION Shorten time to respond re: (1210) FIRST MOTION for Sanctions and to Strike American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporations July 26, 2010 Motion for Limited Relief. MOTION Shorten time to respond re: (1210) FIRST MOTION for Sanctions and to Strike American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporations July 26, 2010 Motion for Limited Relief. MOTION Shorten time to respond re: (1210) FIRST MOTION for Sanctions and to Strike American Airlines, Inc. and AMR Corporations July 26, 2010 Motion for Limited Relief. filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P., CO2e.com, LLC, Espeed, Inc., Cantor Index Limited, eSpeed Securities, Inc., eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/30/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF CANTOR FITZGERALD CLAIM AGAINST MASSACHUSETTS PORT AUTHORITY: Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), that all claims against Massport asserted in the Cantor Fitzgerald action and the Master Complaint as to Cantor Fitzgerald are hereby dismissed on the merits with prejudice and without costs or attorneys' fees to any party. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(db) Modified on 5/18/2010 (db). (Entered: 05/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DOCUMENT FILED IN CLOSED CASE - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, With prejudice against the defendant(s) Massachusetts Port Authority, Massachusetts Port Authority and Without costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Beidel, Jennifer) Modified on 5/18/2010 (dt). (Entered: 05/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/10/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting (74) Motion for Jennifer L. Farer to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07318-AKH; granting (1152) Motion for Jennifer L. Farer to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH for Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, C02e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., and TradeSpark, L.P. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/7/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(jmi) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Jennifer L. Farer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 05/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Notice of Change of Attorney. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Crowley, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Intent to Object re: (1083 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Declaration in Support of Motion, (1084 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Affidavit of Service Other, (1081 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, (1080 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Approve. Notice Of Motion Of The Aviation Defendants And The Settling Plaintiffs For Orders Approving The Settlement Agreement Among The Aviation Defendants And The Settling Plaintiffs., (1082 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Beidel, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer L. Beidel on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Beidel, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/27/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER. On December 23, 2009, Defendants American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, and Massachusetts Port Authority moved for an order under Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure striking a portion of the amended damages disclosure form that Plaintiffs submitted on September 29, 2009. The motion is not ripe for decision on the limited record currently available and the parties withdraw the motion on consent without prejudice to renewal. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc # 1017) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/27/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 01/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Motion to Strike Certain Damages from Cantor's Amended Damages Disclosure Form served on All Counsel on 1/25/10. Document filed by CO2e.com, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P., Cantor Index Limited, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of John F. Stoviak in Opposition re: (1017 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 62 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Strike The Portion Of Cantor Fitzgerald's September 29, 2009 Amended Damages Disclosure Form Adding More Than $1 Billion In Alleged Business Interruption Damages And Attendant Interest.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20a, # 21 Exhibit 20b, # 22 Exhibit 20c, # 23 Exhibit 20d, # 24 Exhibit 20e)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1017 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 62 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Strike The Portion Of Cantor Fitzgerald's September 29, 2009 Amended Damages Disclosure Form Adding More Than $1 Billion In Alleged Business Interruption Damages And Attendant Interest.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER. ORDER granting (61) Motion for Jennifer L. Beidel to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07318-AKH; granting (1016) Motion for Jennifer L. Beidel to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH for Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(db) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by AMR Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Support re: (1017 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 62 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Strike The Portion Of Cantor Fitzgerald's September 29, 2009 Amended Damages Disclosure Form Adding More Than $1 Billion In Alleged Business Interruption Damages And Attendant Interest.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority, AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1017 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 62 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Strike The Portion Of Cantor Fitzgerald's September 29, 2009 Amended Damages Disclosure Form Adding More Than $1 Billion In Alleged Business Interruption Damages And Attendant Interest.. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority, AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike The Portion Of Cantor Fitzgerald's September 29, 2009 Amended Damages Disclosure Form Adding More Than $1 Billion In Alleged Business Interruption Damages And Attendant Interest. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, Massachusetts Port Authority, AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Jennifer L. Beidel to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lauren E. Chwastyk dated 12/3/09 re: I enclose a courtesy copy of Cantor Fitzgerald Plaintiffs' Withdrawal of Appearance for Candice Toll Aaron which was electronically filed today. ENDORSEMENT: The attorney, Candice Toll Aaron is hereby discharged., Attorney Candice Toll Aaron terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/4/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Candice Toll Aaron to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Shiloh D. Theberge to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Theberge, Shiloh) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/28/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      OPINION AND ORDER NO. - - - - - GRANTING MOTION TO DROP PARTIES AND DENYING MOTION TO ADD PARTIES. For the reasons stated, I deny Cantor's motion to add claims against Globe and grant its motion to dismiss claims against Riggs National Corp., Riggs Bank, N.A., and Silverstein Properties Inc. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. #942) as terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/28/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 10/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (942 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 50 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          JOINDER to join re: (959 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion,, Burns Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Cantor Fitzgerald's Motion for Leave to Amend (Joinder with Opposition to Motion for Leave to Amend). Document filed by Burns International Services Corp., Burns International Security Services Corp..Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Otero, Brian) (Entered: 10/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (Joinder) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (942 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 50 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. / Burns Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Cantor Fitzgerald's Motion for Leave to Amend. Document filed by Burns International Services Corp., Burns International Security Services Corp.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Otero, Brian) Modified on 10/20/2009 (jar). (Entered: 10/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 53 Filed: 10/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (50 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Amend/Correct.. Document filed by Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Globe Aviation Services Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service, # 2 Declaration of Gary Westerberg, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Gary Westerberg, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Gary Westerberg, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Declaration of Gary Westerberg, # 6 Exhibit 4 (Part 1) to Declaration of Gary Westerberg, # 7 Exhibit 4 (Part 2) to Declaration of Gary Westerberg, # 8 Errata 4 (Part 3) to Declaration of Gary Westerberg)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Westerberg, Gary) (Entered: 10/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of John F. Stoviak in Support re: (50 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Amend/Correct.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Errata E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Errata K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Errata M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 51 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (50 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Amend/Correct. Complaint. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Proof of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 09/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF DAMAGES. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of John F. Stoviak in Support re: (47 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH) MOTION to Amend/Correct.. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) Modified on 9/30/2009 (jar). (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Proof of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Stoviak, John) Modified on 9/30/2009 (jar). (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Shiloh D. Theberge, Esq. is admitted to practice pro hac vice as counsel for Plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, C02e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., and TradeSpark, L.P in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. If this action is assigned to the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) system, counsel shall immediately apply for an ECF password at nysd.uscourts.gov. Counsel shall forward the pro hac vice fee to the Clerk of the Court. granting (45) Motion for Shiloh D. Theberge to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:04-cv-07318-AKH; granting (907) Motion for Shiloh D. Theberge to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/9/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 09/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Shiloh D. Theberge to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH (rjm) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. The undersigned hereby consent to substitution of Candice Toll Aaron, Esq., of Saul Ewing LLP, a Delaware LLP, 222 Delaware Ave., Wilmington, Delaware 19899, as attorney for Plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates. L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, C02e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., and TradeSpark., L.P. (collectively, "Cantor") in the above-captioned action. Attorney Candice Toll Aaron for Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, CO2e.com, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P., Cantor Index Limited, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., eSpeed Government Securities, Inc. and eSpeed Securities, Inc. added. Attorney Jonathan Leonard Marshfield terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/21/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Jonathan L. Marshfield, New Attorney: Candice Toll Aaron, Address: Saul Ewing LLP, 222 Delaware Ave., P.O. Box 1266, Wilmington, Delaware, USA 19899, (302) 421-6800. Document filed by Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Marshfield, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney John F. Stoviak for Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., Espeed, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, CO2e.com, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Index Limited, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., eSpeed Government Securities, Inc. and eSpeed Securities, Inc. admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/28/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Leonard Marshfield on behalf of Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, CO2e.com, LLC, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald L.P. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Marshfield, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Cathi A. Hession in Support re: (41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH, 63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 1 0f 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hession Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hession Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 4, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 3 of 4, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 4 of 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Hession Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Hession Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Hession Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Hession Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Hession Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Hession Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Hession Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 2, # 17 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 18 Exhibit 13 to Hession Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit 14 to Hession Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit 15 to Hession Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit 16 to Hession Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit 17 to Hession Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit 18 to Hession Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit 19 to Hession Affidavit, # 25 Exhibit 20 to Hession Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 21 to Hession Affidavit, # 27 Exhibit 22 to Hession Affidavit, # 28 Exhibit 23 to Hession Affidavit, # 29 Exhibit 24 to Hession Affidavit, # 30 Exhibit 25 to Hession Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Subrogation Claims. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2009Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of James E. Goodwin, United's Former Chairman and CEO. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail LLC and the Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Complaint(08cv3701 and dated 4/16/08) against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC and 4 World Trade Center LLC against Defendant(s) Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rjm). (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims By The Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiff's Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey and additional cross-claim plaintiffs, WTC Retail LLC and The Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. i/s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/19/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of of Adoption. Document filed by American Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Adoption. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Wood, Willard) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey contained in the Cross-Claims by the Port Authority Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant Midwest, against Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/24/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, and 4 World Trade Center LLC, contained in the Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint against defendant Midwest, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC, and 7 World Trade Company, L.P. contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and Cross-Claims by the WTCP Entities Against Certain Defendants In Plaintiffs Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant America West, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC101, 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by and between the undersigned attorneys of record... that the Cross-Claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiff The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey (PANYNJ), contained in the Amended Flight 11 Master Liability Complaint and 175 Master Liability Complaint, against defendant AirTran, are hereby dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of dismissal. This Document relates to 21MC97 as well as All Cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/6/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (252 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PRIVACY ACT ORDER. To the extent that the Government objects to providing the parties with the requested information on the ground that such production is prohibited by the Privacy Act, the objection is overruled and the US shall produce the Requested Information to the parties purs. to 5 U.S.C. 552a(b)(11). This Document relates to 21MC97. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/5/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (224 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Judgment of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (252 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (226 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (239 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Robert A. Clifford, Gregory P. Joseph, Marc S. Moller, Ronald L. Motley, Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (224 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Judgment of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (252 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery., (226 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law Regarding the Standard of Care., (239 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION Determination of Applicable Law.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (252 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., Plaintiffs. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (252 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Determination of Applicable Law, Dismissal of Punitive Damage Claims and for Certain Government Discovery.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (22 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 274 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 39 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 27 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 44 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 26 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 272 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 55 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 88 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 35 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 19 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 22 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 35 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 33 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 18 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 28 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 32 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 23 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 36 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 14 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 39 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 23 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 22 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 22 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 27 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Wolfgang A. Dase, Esq. in Support re: (22 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 274 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 39 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 27 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 44 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 26 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 272 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 55 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 88 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 35 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 19 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 22 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 35 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 33 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 18 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 28 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 32 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 23 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 36 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 14 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 39 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 23 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 34 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 22 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 22 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 27 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH) MOTION to Sever.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSS MOTION to Sever and Stay Claims for Punitive Damages. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Cohen, Jason) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL without prejudice (This document relates to All Cases); the Cross-Claims by Cross-claim pltffs World Trade Center Properties LLC, 1 World Trace Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trace Center LLC, 5 World Trade Center LLC and 7 World Trade Company, L.P., contained in the Amended Cross-Claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended Flight 11 Master Liability complaint and Cross-claims by WTCP Entities Against Certain Defts in Pltffs' Amended 175 Master Liability Complaint, against deft AirTran, are dismissed without prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/11/07) (Entered: 05/11/2007) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al. (Original document filed under 1:21-mc-97, as Doc. #1052(sn) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NON-WAIVER AGREEMENT... It is hereby agreed, by and between the undersigned counsel that any disclosure of a document or information by the Government shall not constitute a waiver by the Government of any privilege or other protection that may be applicable or information not disclosed. This Non-Waiver Agreement does not constitute and agreement by the Government to produce any particular document or information in the litigation, and is without prejudice to any objections the Government may have to any party's discovery requests. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/1/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al. This Document also relates to 21MC97.(rjm) (Entered: 05/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Scholz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Keith Harris in Opposition re: (158 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (208 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP on Flight 175 Only.. Document filed by The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Scholz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Richard A. Williamson in Opposition re: (158 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment., (208 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment on WTCP on Flight 175 Only.. Document filed by 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Scholz, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss the Third-party Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12 (b) (6). Document filed by Syska & Hennessy Group, Inc., Irwin G. Cantor, PC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH,1:02-cv-02987-AKH,1:02-cv-07188-AKH,1:02-cv-07198-AKH,1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 1:03-cv-00131-AKH,1:03-cv-06925-AKH,1:04-cv-04577-AKH,1:04-cv-05020-AKH,1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 1:04-cv-05022-AKH,1:04-cv-05023-AKH,1:04-cv-05024-AKH,1:04-cv-05025-AKH,1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 1:04-cv-07136-AKH,1:04-cv-07199-AKH,1:04-cv-07225-AKH,1:04-cv-07231-AKH,1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 1:04-cv-07238-AKH,1:04-cv-07240-AKH,1:04-cv-07241-AKH,1:04-cv-07244-AKH,1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 1:04-cv-07248-AKH,1:04-cv-07272-AKH,1:04-cv-07294-AKH,1:04-cv-07299-AKH,1:04-cv-07318-AKH(Jacob, Beth) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH,1:02-cv-02987-AKH,1:02-cv-07188-AKH,1:02-cv-07198-AKH,1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 1:03-cv-00131-AKH,1:03-cv-06925-AKH,1:04-cv-04577-AKH,1:04-cv-05020-AKH,1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 1:04-cv-05022-AKH,1:04-cv-05023-AKH,1:04-cv-05024-AKH,1:04-cv-05025-AKH,1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 1:04-cv-07136-AKH,1:04-cv-07199-AKH,1:04-cv-07225-AKH,1:04-cv-07231-AKH,1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 1:04-cv-07238-AKH,1:04-cv-07240-AKH,1:04-cv-07241-AKH,1:04-cv-07244-AKH,1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 1:04-cv-07248-AKH,1:04-cv-07272-AKH,1:04-cv-07294-AKH,1:04-cv-07299-AKH,1:04-cv-07318-AKH(mj, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION TO PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Dennis M. O'Hara, Robert C. Bauroth, and Jason A. Glusman are admitted pro hac vice to the Bar of this Court for the purpose of representing non-party subpoena recipient United States Aviation Underwriters, Inc. in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/18/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. This document relates to: 03 cv 131; 04 cv 7244; 04 cv 7294; 04 cv 7240; 04 cv 7241; 04 cv 6848; 04 cv 7246; 04 cv 7299; 04 cv 7248; 04 cv 7234; 04 cv 7231; 04 cv 7199; 04 cv 7238; 04 cv 7272; 04 cv 7318; 04 cv 7225; 04 cv 7136; 04 cv 2987; 04 cv 4577. (Original document filed under 21 mc 101 as Doc. #144)(sn) (Entered: 08/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: The undersigned hereby consent to the substitution of Saul Ewing LLP as the attorneys for plaintiffs Cantor Fitzgerald & Co. et al (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/5/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 01/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice and without costs.... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/31/05) (jf, ) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (gf, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by CO2e.com, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc..(gf, ) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Massachusetts Port Authority, Riggs Bank, N.A., Riggs National Corporation, Silverstein Properties, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 150.00, Receipt Number 519530)Document filed by CO2e.com, LLC, Cantor Fitzgerald & Co., Cantor Fitzgerald Associates, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Brokerage, L.P., Cantor Fitzgerald Europe, Cantor Fitzgerald International, Cantor Fitzgerald Partners, Cantor Fitzgerald Securities, Cantor Fitzgerald, L.P., Cantor Index Limited, Espeed, Inc., TradeSpark, L.P., eSpeed Government Securities, Inc., eSpeed Securities, Inc..(gf, ) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 196 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?