In Re: Nortel Networks Corp. Securities Litigation
Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-md-01659

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2021 at 4:04 PM ST (4.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Newman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Evan Tullman +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jtullman@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Bernard Lubinsky, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marc Ian Gross +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 migross@pomlaw.com
No Logo Bobby D. Torres, Plaintiff
No Logo Cary Savitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
Space Samuel Kenneth Rosen +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 srosen@whesq.com
No Logo Daniels/Nader Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis Victor Trinko +1 212 490 9550 +1 212 986 0158 ctrinko@gmail.com
No Logo David George Parkinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee Scott Shalov +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 lshalov@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo Dennis E. Arneson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230
No Logo Dong, Wen, Plaintiff
No Logo Douglas Powell, Plaintiff
No Logo Eric D. Bell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger & Montague PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space GLEN L. ABRAMSON +1 215 875 4683 +1 215 875 4636 gabramson@bm.net
Space Phyllis M Parker +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 pparker@bm.net
Space Sherrie R. Savett +1 215 875 3000 +1 215 875 4604 ssavett@bm.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Berger Montague, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Fantini +1 215 875 3000 mfantini@bm.net
No Logo Gary Malunis, Plaintiff
No Logo Ilene Armour, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederic S. Fox +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 ffox@kaplanfox.com
Space Hae Sung Nam +1 212 687 1980 +1 212 687 7714 hnam@kaplanfox.com
No Logo Indiana Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund IBEW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Susan V. Tipograph

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth A. Elan +1 212 619 0261 +1 212 385 2707 elanfirm@yahoo.com
No Logo John Campagnuola, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Avi Rosenfeld, Esq. +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@geller-rudman.com
No Logo Jose I. Galindez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
Space Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carol V. Gilden +1 312 357 0370 +1 312 357 0369 cgilden@cohenmilstein.com
Space Catherine A. Torell +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 ctorell@cohenmilstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Conor R Crowley +1 212 907 0883 +1 212 883 7083

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jayne Arnold Goldstein +1 954 315 3454 +1 954 315 3455 jagoldstein@pomlaw.com
No Logo Julie Kapsch, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas James McKenna +1 212 983 1300 +1 212 983 0383 tjmlaw2001@yahoo.com
No Logo Kamran Mirza, Plaintiff
No Logo Kent Wayne Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Leonard Semerad, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Craig Finkel +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rfinkel@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark D. Cornfield, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chitwood Harley Harnes LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lauren S Antonino +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 LAntonino@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Martin D. Chitwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Martin D Chitwood , +1 404 873 3900 +1 404 876 4476 MChitwood@chitwoodlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rigrodsky & Long PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott J. Farrell +1 516 683 3516 +1 302 654 7530 sjf@rigrodskylong.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence Paul Kolker +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4677 kolker@whafh.com
No Logo Mary Urlrick, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Michael F. Walsh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gradstein & Luskin

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Henry D Gradstein +1 310 571 1700 +1 310 571 1717 hgradstein@gradstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GRADSTEIN LUSKIN & VAN DALSEM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David A. Sergenian +1 310 571 1700

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bruce E Van Dalsem +1 213 443 3218 +1 213 443 3100 brucevandalsem@quinnemanuel.com
No Logo Milton Pfeiffer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Berman DeValerio, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael T. Matraia +1 617 542 8300
Space Nicole R. Starr +1 617 542 8300 +1 617 542 1194 nstarr@bermanesq.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Block & Leviton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Craig Block +1 617 398 5600 +1 617 507 6020 jeff@blockleviton.com
No Logo Peter Springer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brodsky & Smith LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Evan Jason Smith +1 610 667 6200 +1 610 667 9029 esmith@brodsky-smith.com
No Logo Pierre A. Nader, Plaintiff
No Logo Robert H. Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edwin J Mills +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 emills@ssbny.com
No Logo Rolland Schach, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by J.E. Losavio, Jr., Law Office of

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Laurence Paskowitz +1 212 685 0969 +1 212 685 2306 classattorney@aol.com
No Logo Stacey X. Cox, Plaintiff
No Logo Stanley Olejnik, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eduard Korsinsky +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 ek@zlk.com
No Logo Steel Workers' Pension Trust, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Abram Harrod, III +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 jharrod@wolfpopper.com
Space Robert M. Kornreich +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rkornreich@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Stichting Pensioenfonds ABP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Montgomery McCracken Walker & Rhoads, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sidney Stephen Liebesman +1 302 798 1000 +1 610 558 1566 sliebesman@mmwr.com
No Logo Susan Daniels, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alfred G. Yates Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alfred Glenn Yates, Jr. +1 412 391 5164 +1 412 471 1033 yateslaw@aol.com
No Logo The Neuhauser Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo The Trustees of The Ontario Public Service Employees' Union Pension Plan Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dreier LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Bernard Scotti +1 212 725 1290 +1 212 868 1229 dscotti@dreierllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lieff Cabraser Heimann & Bernstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 pmclean@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Thomas Rotchford, Plaintiff
No Logo William Berger, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Allen K. Stout, Defendant
No Logo Brian W. McFadden, Defendant
No Logo Chahram Bolouri, Defendant
No Logo Clarence J. Chandran, Defendant
No Logo Craig A. Johnson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Petrillo Klein LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Guy T. Petrillo +1 212 370 0330 +1 212 609 6921 gpetrillo@pkbllp.com
No Logo Doug Hamilton, Defendant
No Logo Douglas C. Beatty, Defendant
No Logo Frank A. Dunn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morvillo, Abramowitz, Grand, Iason, Anello & Bohrer, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Franklin Albert +1 212 880 9560 +1 212 856 9494 ralbert@maglaw.com
No Logo Frank C. Carlucci, Defendant
No Logo Frank Plastina, Defendant
No Logo Gary R. Donahee, Defendant
No Logo Gaylaine Saucier, Defendant
No Logo James J. Blanchard, Defendant
No Logo James Kinney, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Autumn J Hwang +1 202 783 5070 +1 202 783 2331 hwang@fr.com
Space Matthew Lore Levine +1 212 765 5070 +1 212 258 2291 levine@fr.com
No Logo Jean C. Monty, Defendant
No Logo John Andrew Roth, Defendant
No Logo John Edward Cleghorn, Defendant
No Logo Ken Taylor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by D.F. Mcguire & Asscciates, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold F. McGuire, Jr. +1 914 368 0016 +1 914 368 0017 hmcguire@dfmcguire.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Entwistle and Cappucci LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William W. Wickersham +1 212 894 7232 +1 212 894 7272 wwickersham@entwistle-law.com
No Logo Lynton R. Wilson, Defendant
No Logo Malcom K. Collins, Defendant
No Logo Mary M. Cross, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Gollogly, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by RICHARDS KIBBE & ORBE LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lee S. Richards, III +1 212 530 1840 +5301 530 530 1801 lrichards@rkollp.com
No Logo Nicholas J. DeRoma, Defendant
No Logo Nortel Networks Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shearman & Sterling LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tai Hyun Park +1 646 200 6310 +1 646 200 6311 tpark@parkjensen.com
Space Elizabeth Robin Weiss +1 212 848 5086 +1 646 848 5086 elizabeth.weiss@shearman.com
No Logo Pascal Debon, Defendant
No Logo Richard J. Currie, Defendant
No Logo Robert Alexander Ingram, Defendant
No Logo Robert Ellis Brown, Defendant
No Logo Sherwood Hubbard Smith, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Susan Spadley, Defendant
No Logo Yves Fortier, Defendant
No Logo Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Patrick Coffey +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 sean@blbglaw.com
Space Jennifer Lee Edlind +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444
Space Wendy Kay Erdly +1 212 554 1456 +1 212 554 1444 Wendy@blbglaw.com
Space Hannah Greenwald +1 212 554 1411 +1 212 554 1444 hannah@blbglaw.com
Space Edward Alexander Grossmann +1 212 554 1404 +1 212 554 1444 EAG@blbglaw.com
Space Rochelle Feder Hansen +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 rochelle@blbglaw.com
Space Eitan Misulovin +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444 eitan@blbglaw.com
Space John Erik Sandstedt +1 212 554 1400 +1 212 554 1444
Space Gerald Harlan Silk +1 212 554 1282 +1 212 554 1444 jerry@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Girard Gibbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Anthony Kehoe +1 212 867 1721 +1 212 867 1767 jak@girardgibbs.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Lawrence Berger +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 dberger@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lowenstein Sandler, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MICHAEL B. HIMMEL +1 973 597 6172 +1 973 597 6173 mhimmel@lowenstein.com
Space ROBERT J. KIPNEES +1 973 597 6220 +1 973 597 2400 rkipnees@lowenstein.com
Space Christopher Steven Porrino +1 973 597 6314 +1 973 597 6315 cporrino@lowenstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mark Lebovitch +1 212 735 2645 +1 917 777 2645 mlebovit@skadden.com
No Logo Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Lead Plaintiff
Unknown Role, Samsonite Corp/fl
Unknown Role, Wolverine Tube, Inc.
Unknown Role, Athene Holding Ltd.
Unknown Role, Aircastle LTD
Unknown Role, 1700480 Ontario Inc
Unknown Role, Macerich Co
Unknown Role, CPG Newco LLC
Unknown Role, XTRA CORP /DE/
Unknown Role, 1397225 Ontario Ltd
No Logo Filipe & Paulino Yap, Movant
No Logo Henry & Patricia Kolokowsky, Movant
No Logo Jeff Nourse, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Mario Alba, Jr. +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 malba@csgrr.com
No Logo Kyung-Yeop Hong & Martin Lantaigne, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joel Carl Feffer +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 jcfeffer@whesq.com
No Logo Paul Krsek, Movant
No Logo Ralph Favilla, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Stone Bonner & Rocco LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas George Ciarlone, Jr. +1 212 239 4340 +1 212 239 4310 tciarlone@lawssb.com
No Logo Tom Cosgrove, Movant
No Logo Nortel Networks Corp. Securities Litigation, In Re:
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/5/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lee S Richards, III on behalf of Michael J. Gollogly. New Address: Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, 200 Liberty Street, New York, NY, USA 10281, 212-530-1800. (Richards, Lee) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/20/2012, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT. The Distribution Agent's Fourth Progress Report Document filed by GCG, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-02058-LAP, 1:05-md-01659-LAP(Hanshe, Gerard) (Entered: 07/20/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES TO CANADIAN COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Lead Counsel is authorized to direct payment to Rochon Genova LLP the sum of $51,292.52 Canadian Dollars and to Rueter Scargall Bennett the sum of $6,757.97 Canadian Dollars without further delay from the Nortel II Settlement Fund. 2. This Court retains jurisdiction to consider any further applications concerning the administration of the settlement and such other and further relief as this Court deems appropriate. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/2/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/02/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER APPROVING FINAL DISTRIBUTION TO LEAD COUNSEL IN CONNECTION WITH RETENTION OF CANADIAN COUNSEL: Having considered Lead Counsel's letter to the Court dated October 28, 2011, attached, together with its submission of the contemporaneous Fraser Milner Casgrain LLP time records, the Court orders such distribution to proceed. This Court retains jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with the Settlement. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(pl) (Main Document 123 replaced on 11/9/2011) (jar). (Entered: 11/08/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/3/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES TO CANADIAN CLASS COUNSEL: Lead Counsel is authorized to direct payment to Quebec Class Counsel Trudel & Johnston the sum of $107,414.83 Canadian Dollars without further delay from the Nortel II Settlement Fund. This Court retains jurisdiction to consider any further applications concerning the administration of the settlement and such other and further relief as this Court deems appropriate. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/3/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al. (ab) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 121 Filed: 10/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER APPROVING FINAL DISTRIBUTION PLAN: Lead Plaintiffs' plan for final distribution of the Net Settlement Fund to Accepted Claimants is APPROVED as set forth herein. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/5/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al. Copies Faxed by Chambers.(djc) (Entered: 10/06/2011)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Edward Grossman dated 12/10/10 re: Request that the Reply Declaration of Barbara Grossman, filed on 11/19/10 (docket No. 117) be removed from the docket. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/13/10) (cd) (Entered: 12/13/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: None
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re: 112 MOTION to Approve Final Distribution Plan. REVISED REPLY DECLARATION OF BARBARA GROSSMAN IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR REIMBURSEMENT TO LEAD COUNSEL OF FEES AND EXPENSES PAID TO FRASER MILNER CASGRAIN LLP. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1 (Tabs 1-50), # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2 (Tabs 51-94), # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re: 112 MOTION to Approve Final Distribution Plan. REPLY DECLARATION OF STEPHEN J. CIRAMI IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF LEAD PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION PLAN. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF LATE CLAIMS AND ADJUSTED CLAIMS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: This Order incorporates by reference the definitions in the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement (Nortel II) dated June 20, 2006 (the "Stipulation") and the Cirami Declaration. This Court has jurisdiction over the subject matter of the Action and over all parties to the Action, including all Class Members. Lead Plaintiffs' request for approval of payment to Late Claims and Adjusted Claims is APPROVED. Accordingly, The Claims Administrator's administrative recommendations concerning Late Claims and Adjusted Claims, each as set forth in the Cirami Declaration, are adopted. The Claims Administrator shall pay all Accepted Claimants who were not included in the Initial Distribution (accepted Late Claims and Adjusted Claims) their pro rata shares of the Initial Distribution amount. By receiving these payments (the "Catch-Up Payments") now, those Accepted Claimants shall reach a state of parity with the Accepted Claimants that were paid in the Initial Distribution. Each such Catch-Up Payment shall consist solely of payment from the Net Cash Settlement Fund, including the Distribution Amount for any Net Settlement Shares such Accepted Claimants would have been entitled to have received in the Initial Distribution. This Court retains jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with the Settlement. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/25/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(jfe) (Entered: 10/25/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Barbara Grossman in Support re: 112 MOTION to Approve Final Distribution Plan.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: 112 MOTION to Approve Final Distribution Plan.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1A, # 2 Exhibit 1B, # 3 Exhibit 1C, # 4 Exhibit 2A, # 5 Exhibit 2B, # 6 Exhibit 2C, # 7 Exhibit 3A, # 8 Exhibit 3B, # 9 Exhibit 4, # 10 Exhibit 5, # 11 Compendium Vol. 1 - Disputed Claims Tabs 1 - 5, # 12 Tab 6, # 13 Tab 7, # 14 Tab 8, # 15 Tab 9, # 16 Tab 10, # 17 Tab 11, # 18 Tab 12, # 19 Tab 13, # 20 Tab 14, # 21 Tab 15, # 22 Tab 16, # 23 Tab 17, # 24 Tab 18, # 25 Tab 19, # 26 Tab 20, # 27 Compendium Vol. 2 - Disputed Claims Tab 21, # 28 Tab 22, # 29 Tabs 23 - 24, # 30 Tabs 25 - 27, # 31 Tab 28, # 32 Tab 29, # 33 Tab 30, # 34 Tab 31, # 35 Tabs 32 - 33, # 36 Tab 34, # 37 Tab 35, # 38 Tab 36, # 39 Compendium Vol. 3 - Disputed Claims Tab 37 Part 1, # 40 Tab 37 Part 2, # 41 Tab 38, # 42 Tab 39, # 43 Tab 40, # 44 Tab 41, # 45 Tab 42, # 46 Tab 43, # 47 Tabs 44 - 46, # 48 Tabs 47 - 48, # 49 Tabs 49 - 51, # 50 Tab 52, # 51 Tab 53, # 52 Tab 54, # 53 Tab 55, # 54 Compendium Vol. 4 - Payment Objections Tabs 1 - 5, # 55 Tab 6, # 56 Tabs 7 - 8, # 57 Tab 9, # 58 Tabs 10 - 11)(Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/15/2010, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Approve Final Distribution Plan. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board.(Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rochelle Feder Hansen on behalf of Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Hansen, Rochelle) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/14/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Alexander Grossmann on behalf of Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Grossmann, Edward) (Entered: 10/14/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Edward A. Grossmann dated 10/8/10 re: Pursuant to prior orders of the Court, an initial distribution or settlement proceeds was made to Class Members whose claims were approved by the Court for payment. We are now ready to file a motion for approval of a final distribution plan for the balance of the net proceeds of the settlement; counsel also requests leave from Your Honor's Individual Practice 2.A. requiring a pre-motion conference. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may proceed with the motion. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/12/10) (djc) Modified on 10/14/2010 (djc). (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/29/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arthur C. Leahy on behalf of Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, Indiana Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund IBEW. New Address: Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP, 655 West Broadway, Suite 1900, San Diego, Ca, US 92101, 6192311058. (Leahy, Arthur) (Entered: 03/29/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/6/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES TO CANADIAN CLASS COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: 1. Lead Counsel is authorized to direct payment to Ontario National Class Counsel Rochon Genova LLP the sum of $48,820.16 Canadian dollars without further delay from the Nortel II Settlement Fund. 2. This Court retains jurisdiction to consider any further applications concerning the administration of the settlement and such other and further relief as this Court deems appropriate. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/5/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(rjm) Modified on 11/10/2009 (rjm). (Entered: 11/06/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER that, within ten (10) days of being presented with invoices of Nortel's transfer agent in connection with the settlement of the above action, Lead Counsel for the Class shall cause the claims administrator, the Garden City Group, Inc., to reimburse Nortel from the settlement fund, via wire transfer or check (as may be agreed to by the parties), for all items reflected on such invoices except the costs of preparing the Q&A; sheets and responding to calls from shareholders, which such costs shall be identified by reference to the line-item labels appearing on such invoices. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/15/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(jmi) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER. Nortel's motion for reimbursement of transfer agent fees and expenses [dkt. no. 94] is granted as to all items except preparation of Q&A; sheets and responding to calls from shareholders. Nortel's counsel shall submit a proposed order. 1:04-cv-02115-LAP; Re:(94) Motion for reimbursement of transfer agent fees and expenses in case 1:05-md-01659-LAP. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/7/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER APPROVING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS' FEES TO CANADIAN CLASS COUNSEL Lead Counsel is authorized to direct payment to Quebec Class Counsel Trudel & Johnston the sum of $1,438,994.99 Canadian Dollars without further delay from the Nortel II Settlement Fund. This Court retains jurisdiction to consider any further applications concerning the administration of the settlement and such other and further relief as this Court deems appropriate. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/26/2009) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(jmi) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Edward A. Grossmann dated 6/4/2009 re: we hereby request the Court's approval to pay Quebec Class Counsel $1,438,994.99 Canadian dollars from the Nortel II Settlement Fund in accordance with the Judgment of the Superior Court of Quebec. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall submit a proposed order promptly. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/24/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER. Any party who objects to Plaintiffs' request that Quebec class counsel be paid $1,438,994.99 Canadian dollars from the Nortel II Settlement Fund shall so notify the Court in writing no later than June 22, 2009. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/09) (rjm) (Entered: 06/09/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION of Brian G. Burke in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Park, Tai) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                        DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Leibell in Opposition re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Coffey, John) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Coffey, John) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of Lara Donaldson in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Brian G. Burke in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 94 MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses.. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Park, Tai) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION for Reimbursement of Transfer Agent Fees and Expenses. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation.(Park, Tai) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tai H. Park dated 12/15/08 re: I write on behalf of Nortel Networks Corporation ("Nortel") to propose the briefing schedule set forth below. Lead Plaintiffs' counsel has consented to this proposed schedule: December 22, 2008: Nortel's motion and opening brief due. January 9, 2009: Lead Plaintiffs' opposition brief due. January 14, 2009: Nortel's reply brief due. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/22/2008. Replies due by 1/14/2009. Responses due by 1/9/2009) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/17/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP, 1:04-cv-02115-LAP(db) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta Preska from John P. Coffey dated 11/3/08 re: Nortel's request for a pre-motion conference as requested in its letter to the Court dated 10/1/08. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may proceed with the motion. they shall confer and inform the Court by letter of the proposed briefing schedule. Counsel shall inform the Court if there is any reason the briefs have to exceed ten pages. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP, 1:04-cv-02115-LAP(rjm) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tai H. Park dated 10/16/08 re: Request on behalf of "Nortel" for a one-week extension of the deadline indicated in the Court's endorsement of John P. Coffey's letter, entered on 10/15/08... from October 27 to November 3. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/17/08) (rjm) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tai H. Park dated 10/1/08 re: Nortel Networks Corp requests a pre-motion conference in this action. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tai H. Park dated 10/1/08 re: I write on behalf of Nortel Networks Corporation to request a pre-motion conference in the referenced action. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation.(rjm) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John P. Coffey dated 10/9/08 re: We represent plaintiffs and the Class in the noted matter. We write in response to the request by Nortel Networks Corp. for a pre-motion conference, as set forth in the letter dated 10/1/08 to the Court from Nortel's counsel Shearman & Sterling LLP. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel shall meet to review the invoices in question towards reaching agreement. Counsel shall inform the Court by letter no later than October 27 of the results of such meeting(s). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/14/08) (rjm) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                AMENDED ORDER APPROVING INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS and as further set forth in said Amended Order... GCG's fees and expenses in connection with the administration of the Settlement through 11/30/07, and its estimated fees for the initial distribution of the Cash Settlement Fund and allocation of the Settlement Shares and estimated postage expenses for the initial distribution, are hereby approved, and the outstanding balance of such fees and expenses in the amount of $732,913.82 shall be paid out of the Gross Cash Settlement Fund. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/7/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER APPROVING INITIAL DISTRIBUTION OF CLASS SETTLEMENT PROCEEDS... that the administrative determinations of the Claims Administrator accepting the claims of the Accepted Claimants, as set forth in Exhibit C to, and described in the Cirami Affidavit... be hereby approved in the amounts specified in each "Reorganized Claim." Ordered that in light of the acceptance of Proofs of Claims filed through 12/5/07, the Court's prior Order dated 1/31/07 is hereby vacated... that CGC's fees and expenses in connection with the administration of the Settlement through 11/30/07, and its estimated fees for the initial distribution of the Cash Settlement Fund and allocation of the Settlement Shares and estimated postage expenses for the initial distribution, are hereby approved, and the outstanding balance of such fees and expenses in the amount of $732,913.82 shall be paid out of the Gross Cash Settlement Fund... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/14/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Coffey, John) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: 82 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C-1 Part 1, # 4 Exhibit C-1 PART 2, # 5 Exhibit C-2, # 6 Exhibit C-3 PART 1, # 7 Exhibit C-3 PART 2, # 8 Exhibit D)(Coffey, John) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 82 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Coffey, John) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Disbursement of Funds. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Coffey, John) (Entered: 02/21/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Jeffrey N. Leibel dated 1/16/08 re: counsel writes with respect to their motion for initial distribution of Class Settlement Proceeds to request leave from Your Honor's Individual Practice Rule 2.A requiring a pre-motion conference. Counsel anticipates being ready to file the motion by the end of next week. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/17/08) (djc) (Entered: 01/23/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Lore Levine on behalf of James Kinney, James B. Kinney Filed In Associated Cases: 1:07-cv-02058-LAP, 1:05-md-01659-LAP(Levine, Matthew) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of of Firm Name Change. Document filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, Mary Urlrick, Indiana Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund IBEW, John Campagnuola. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 09/11/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER... that Andrew H. Dral's request to extend deadline to participate in the settlement of this class action is denied. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/31/07) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER settling action. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/26/06) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml, ) (Entered: 12/26/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Randi Alarcon Collotta Supplemental Affidavit to Additional Late Exclusions and Objections (Third GCG Report). Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Douglas C. Beatty. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 12/22/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tai H. Park dated 12/19/06 re: Requests for exclusion from the settlement dated on or after 10/27/06 are rejected as untimely. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/06) (rjm, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER... this Court rejects Mr. Esson's untimely objection to the Class Period (4/24/03 - 4/27/04, inclusive)... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER... Mr. Nourse's untimely request for exclusion is rejected. Mr. Nourse is thus a member of the U.S. Global Class, and he is bound by all determinations and judgments in this case... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of David A. Isaac in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B1# 3 Exhibit Ex B2# 4 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jeanne C. Finegan in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Table of Contents# 2 Exhibit 1# 3 Exhibit 2# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 4# 6 Exhibit 5# 7 Exhibit 6# 8 Exhibit 7A# 9 Exhibit 7B# 10 Exhibit 7C# 11 Exhibit 7D# 12 Exhibit 7E# 13 Exhibit 7F# 14 Exhibit 7G# 15 Exhibit 7H# 16 Exhibit 8# 17 Exhibit 9# 18 Exhibit 10# 19 Exhibit 11# 20 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Leibell in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Part 1# 2 Affidavit Part 2# 3 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex A Part 1# 4 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex A Part 2# 5 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex B part 1# 6 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex C# 7 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex D# 8 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex E# 9 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex F# 10 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeffrey N. Leibell in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Solicitor's Affidavit# 2 Affidavit Solicitor's Affidavit Part 2# 3 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex A Part 1# 4 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex A part 2# 5 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex B Part 1# 6 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex B part 2# 7 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex C# 8 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex D# 9 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex E# 10 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex F# 11 Exhibit Solicitor's Affidavit Ex G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose Lead Plaintiffs' response to Late-Filed Objections. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/24/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of David A. Issac re: 63 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion,,,, Regarding Exclusion Requests and Objections Received for Nortel II. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B Part 1# 3 Exhibit B Part 2# 4 Exhibit B Part 3# 5 Exhibit B Part 4# 6 Exhibit B Part 5)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 10/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Settlement Compendium of Declarations of Plaintiffs' Counsel In Support of Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Settlement Compendium of Unreported Cases and Relevant Information Part 2. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10# 2 Exhibit 11# 3 Exhibit 12# 4 Exhibit 13# 5 Exhibit 14# 6 Exhibit 15# 7 Exhibit 16# 8 Exhibit 17# 9 Exhibit 18# 10 Exhibit 19)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Settlement Compendium of Unreported Cases and Relevant Information Part 1. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose Memorandum of Law in Support of Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose Memorandum of Law in Support of Final Approval of Settlement and Plan of Allocation and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of John P. Coffey in Support re: 55 MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purpose. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 # 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Settlement Final Approval of Proposed Settlement and Plan of Allocation; Lead Counsel's Application for an Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses; and Certification of the Class for Settlement Purposes. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Patrick Coffey on behalf of Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board (Coffey, John) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT against Douglas Beatty. Document filed by Michael F. Walsh.(Kozberg, Joel) (Entered: 08/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Firm Name. Document filed by Michael J. Gollogly. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Richards, Lee) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Michael J. Gollogly. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Richards, Lee) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David W.T. Daniels dated 7/14/06 re: Granted request for a twenty day extension of answer deadline to August 7, 2006 for both Michael J. Gollogly and Frank Dunn. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/17/06) (rjm, ) (Entered: 07/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER... that Judge Sweet has reviewed the Stipulation and preliminarily finds that it reflects a fair and reasonable settlement for the class. All of the parties have acted diligently and in good faith, with the desire to conclude the various Nortel Actions. The Stipulation, if finally approved, will resolve all remaining issues in this Docket and allows Nortel to move forward, which is in the best interest of all of the parties. Therefore, Judge Sweet recommends that the Stipulation be preliminarily approved, and that the Preliminary Order be entered forthwith... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Robert W. Sweet on 6/26/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              PRELIMINARY ORDER FOR NOTICE AND HEARING IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS... Settlement Fairness Hearing pursuant to Rule 23(e) set for 10/26/2006 01:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska... and as further set forth in said Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/29/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ENDORSEMENT that further proceedings toward finalizing the agreement-in-principle that the parties reached to resolve these cases shall be conducted by Judge Sweet. The parties shall keep Judge Preska and Berman apprised of significant developments on a periodic (e.g., monthly) basis. This Document relates to 01cv1855. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/21/06) (rjm, ) (Entered: 04/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Association of Counsel. Document filed by Michael F. Walsh. (Gradstein, Henry) (Entered: 04/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from John P. Coffey dated 3/16/06 re: Application GRANTED. That Lead Plaintiffs withdraw their 141 (in Case No. 04cv2115) motion for class certification. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/17/06) (db, ) (Entered: 03/20/2006) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/17/06) (rjm, ) (Entered: 03/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/10/06, 3:15pm. before Judge Robert W. Sweet. This Document relates to 01cv1855.(rjm, ) (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by David Avi Rosenfeld on behalf of Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust, Dong Wen, Indiana Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund IBEW. New Address: Lerach Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP, 58 South Service Road, Suite 200, Melville, NY, United States 11747, 631-367-7100. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 12/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,,,,. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSEMENT ORDER that pursuant to the parties' letter dated 9/16/05, the Hon. Robert W. Sweet has graciously agreed to oversee settlement negotiations in these actions. Lead counsel shall call Judge Sweet's chambers at (212) 805-0254 to arrange a date. This Document relates to and entered in 01cv1855(RMB) as Doc. #162. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska and Judge Richard M. Berman on 9/29/05) (rjm, ) Modified on 9/30/2005 (rjm, ). (Entered: 09/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              SECOND AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Nortel Networks Corporation, Frank A. Dunn, Douglas C. Beatty, Michael J. Gollogly, Sherwood Hubbard Smith, Jr, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn.Document filed by Cary Savitz, Department of the Treasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Tom Cosgrove, Ralph Favilla, Henry & Patricia Kolokowsky, Paul Krsek, Filipe & Paulino Yap, Milton Pfeiffer, Thomas Rotchford, Julie Kapsch, Leonard Semerad, Bernard Lubinsky, Rolland Schach, Bobby D. Torres, Kamran Mirza, Susan Daniels, Pierre A. Nader, Indiana Electrical Workers Pension Trust Fund IBEW, Gunther Jurgen Neuhauser, Sara A. Wilkens, James D. Wilkens III, Franklin L. Hanks, Myron Goldstein, Bernard Barry, Donald J. Kelly & Adma Management Inc. Jury Trial Demanded. This Document relates to 04-2115, 04-2164, 04-2189, 04-2190, 04-2233, 04-2246, 04-2249, 04-2342, 04-2572, 04-2360, 04-2372, 04-2503, 04-2507, 04-2532, 04-2554.(rjm, ) (Entered: 09/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by David Avi Rosenfeld on behalf of Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. New Address:. (Rosenfeld, David) (Entered: 09/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deft. Nortel will complete document production by 9/30/05 rather than 6/30/05; Defts. Nortel, Dunn & Gollogly Responses to Lead Ptffs' Motion for Class Certification due by 10/7/2005 rather than 8/26/05; Lead Ptffs. Replies due by 11/11/2005 rather than 9/30/05. Lead Ptffs. will amend Class Action complaint and/or add parties by no later than 9/12/05 rather than 8/1/05; Lead Ptffs will serve expert reports no later than 1/31/06 rather than 12/20/05; Deft. Nortel Dunn & Gollogly will serve expert reports in case no. 04-2115(LAP) by no later that 3/7/06; Fact discovery will conclude no later than 3/14/06 rather than 1/31/06; Lead Ptffs. will serve expert rebuttal reports no later than 3/30/06, rather than 2/16/06; Expert discovery will conclude on 4/17/06, rather than 3/6/06 (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/3/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 08/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Tai H. Park dated 6/28/05 re: Nortel's request that the Court deny plaintiffs' request that the Court consider the substantive arguments made therein on the ground that Nortel's reply memo of law and associated papers in support of its motion to dismiss do not raise any new issues... "The unauthorized sur-reply is stricken." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/8/05) (rjm, ) Modified on 7/15/2005 (rjm, ). (Entered: 07/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER (this document relates to all actions); counsel shall appear on 8/2/2005 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12A for oral argument on defendants' motion to dismiss the derivative action. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/23/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(kkc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deft. Nortel will complete its document production by no later than 6/30/05; Defts Nortel, Dunn & Gollogly Responses to Ptffs' Motion for Class Certification due by 8/26/2005; Lead Ptffs. will amend the Class Action Complaint or add parties by 8/1/05; Lead Ptffs Replies in Support of Motion for Class Certification due by 9/30/05; Deft. Dunn & Gollogly will answer Class Action Complaint & Amended Walsh Complaint by no later than 12/5/05; Lead Ptffs will serve their expert reports no later than 12/20/05; Defts. Nortel, Dunn, and Gollogly will serve their expert reports in 04-2115 by 1/24/06; Fact Discovery will conclude on 1/31/2006, expert discovery will conclude on 3/6/06; Lead Ptffs will serve their expert rebuttal reports by no later than 2/16/06... and as further set forth in said order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/21/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 06/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/31/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold F. McGuire, Jr on behalf of Ken Taylor (McGuire, Harold) (Entered: 05/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of / Compendium of Authorities Cited in Expert Declarations (Cont) - Part 8 re: 28 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by James J. Blanchard, Yves Fortier, Lynton R. Wilson, Frank C. Carlucci, Nicholas J. DeRoma, Clarence J. Chandran, Brian W. McFadden, Jean C. Monty, Chahram Bolouri, Richard J. Currie, Pascal Debon, Susan Spadley, Gary R. Donahee, Frank Plastina, Nortel Networks Corporation, Sherwood Hubbard Smith, Jr, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn, John Andrew Roth. (Attachments: # 1 Part 9# 2 Part 10# 3 Part 11# 4 Part 12# 5 Part 13)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of / Compendium of Authorities Cited in Expert Declarations - Part 1 re: 28 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by James J. Blanchard, Yves Fortier, Lynton R. Wilson, Frank C. Carlucci, Nicholas J. DeRoma, Clarence J. Chandran, Brian W. McFadden, Jean C. Monty, Chahram Bolouri, Malcom K. Collins, Richard J. Currie, Pascal Debon, Susan Spadley, Gary R. Donahee, Frank Plastina, Nortel Networks Corporation, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn, John Andrew Roth. (Attachments: # 1 Part 2# 2 Part 3# 3 Part 4# 4 Part 5# 5 Part 6# 6 Part 7)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of / Declaration of Tai H. Park re: 28 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by James J. Blanchard, Yves Fortier, Lynton R. Wilson, Frank C. Carlucci, Nicholas J. DeRoma, Clarence J. Chandran, Brian W. McFadden, Jean C. Monty, Chahram Bolouri, Malcom K. Collins, Richard J. Currie, Pascal Debon, Susan Spadley, Gary R. Donahee, Frank Plastina, Nortel Networks Corporation, Sherwood Hubbard Smith, Jr, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn, John Andrew Roth. (Attachments: # 1 Compendium of Certain Memorandum Authorities (Part 1)# 2 Compendium of Certain Memorandum Authorities (Part 2)# 3 Compendium of Certain Memorandum Authorities (Part 3)# 4 Compendium of Certain Memorandum Authorities (Part 4))(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of / Declaration of the Honorable Peter Decarteret Cory re: 28 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by James J. Blanchard, Yves Fortier, Lynton R. Wilson, Frank C. Carlucci, Nicholas J. DeRoma, Clarence J. Chandran, Brian W. McFadden, Jean C. Monty, Chahram Bolouri, Malcom K. Collins, Richard J. Currie, Pascal Debon, Susan Spadley, Gary R. Donahee, Frank Plastina, Nortel Networks Corporation, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn, John Andrew Roth. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Stanley Beck)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of / Declaration of Gordon A. Davies re: 28 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other). Document filed by James J. Blanchard, Yves Fortier, Lynton R. Wilson, Frank C. Carlucci, Nicholas J. DeRoma, Clarence J. Chandran, Brian W. McFadden, Jean C. Monty, Chahram Bolouri, Malcom K. Collins, Richard J. Currie, Pascal Debon, Susan Spadley, Gary R. Donahee, Frank Plastina, Nortel Networks Corporation, Sherwood Hubbard Smith, Jr, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn, John Andrew Roth. (Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of / Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant Nortel Networks Corporation's and Certain Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint. Document filed by James J. Blanchard, Yves Fortier, Lynton R. Wilson, Frank C. Carlucci, Nicholas J. DeRoma, Clarence J. Chandran, Brian W. McFadden, Jean C. Monty, Chahram Bolouri, Malcom K. Collins, Richard J. Currie, Pascal Debon, Susan Spadley, Gary R. Donahee, Frank Plastina, Nortel Networks Corp. Securities Litigation, Sherwood Hubbard Smith, Jr, Gaylaine Saucier, Robert Alexander Ingram, Robert Ellis Brown, John Edward Cleghorn, John Andrew Roth. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum served on ALL. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Michael J. Gollogly. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP(Richards, Lee) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 5 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint.. Document filed by Michael J. Gollogly. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP(Richards, Lee) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation.(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Nortel Networks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Park, Tai) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding the procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of "Confidential Information." (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/19/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Signed (PROPOSED) PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Deft. Nortel will begin its document production & serve its responses and objections to Lead Ptffs' First Document Requests by no later than 3/17/05; Defts Dunn & Gollogly will begin their document production & serve their responses & objections to Lead Ptffs' First Document Requests by no later than 4/15/05. Deft. Nortel will answer the Consolidated Class Action Complaint and answer or otherwise respond to, the Amended Walsh Complaint by no later that 5/25/05... Defts Nortel, Dunn & Gollogy will complete their document production by no later than 5/31/05. Lead Ptffs. will serve their expert reports by no later than 12/20/05. Defts Nortel, Dunn & Gollogy will serve their expert reports in Case No. 04-cv-2115 by no later than 1/24/06. Fact Discovery will conclude on 1/31/06. Lead Ptffs. will serve their expert rebuttal reports by no later than 2/16/06. Expert discovery will conclude on 3/6/06. Amended Pleadings due by 4/25/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 8/1/2005. Motions due by 5/13/2005. Responses due by 7/8/2005 Replies due by 8/5/2005. Discovery Conference set for 6/22/2005 04:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/19/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Daniel L. Berger dated 5/10/05 re: Granted Permission for Co-Lead Ptffs., the Ontario Reachers' Pension Plan Board & the Dept. of the Treasury of the State of NJ and its Division of Investment, to file a motion for Class Certification on Friday, May 13, 2005. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/12/05) (rjm, ) (Entered: 05/17/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER on Motion for Admission pro hac vice that David W.T. Daniels is admitted pro hac vice on behalf of Deft. Michael Gollogly for all purposes in this action. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/12/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(rjm, ) (Entered: 05/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Candace L. Preston in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of William G. Clark in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Michael Padfield in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Daniel L. Berger in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit # 3 Exhibit # 4 Exhibit # 5 Exhibit # 6)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 12 MOTION to Certify Class. Lead Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion for Class Certification. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Department of theTreasury of the State of New Jersey and its Division of Investment, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP(Berger, Daniel) (Entered: 05/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (this document relates to all actions); plaintiff Walsh will file his amended complaint by no later than 4/25/2005; lead plaintiffs will file their motion for class certification by no later than 5/13/2005; defendant Nortel will answer the consolidated class action complaint and answer, or otherwise respond to, the amended Walsh complaint by no later than 5/25/2005; the parties will participate in the discovery conference scheduled to be held before Judge Preska on 6/22/2005 at 4:00 pm; defendants Nortel, Dunn and Gollogly will file their opposition to lead plaintiffs' motion for class certification by no later than 7/8/2005; lead plaintiffs will amend the class action complaint and/or add parties by no later than 8/1/2005; lead plaintiffs will file their reply in support of their motion for class certification by no later than 8/5/2005; defendants Nortel, Dunn and Gollogly will answer the class action complaint and the amended Walsh complaint by no later than 12/5/2005; fact discovery will conclude on 1/31/2006; expert discovery will conclude on 3/6/2006; all other deadlines are set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/10/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(kkc, ) (Entered: 05/12/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Arthur C. Leahy dated 4/26/05 GRANTING Ptffs. request that they be allowed to file a memo in opposition to defts' motions of up to 25 pages. Counsel for deft. Nortel & most of the individual defts. have agreed to an opposition memo of that length. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/28/05) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP(rjm, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2005 (kkc, ). (Entered: 05/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF Declaration of Arthur C. Leahy in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8# 2 Exhibit 9-12# 3 Exhibit 13-14# 4 Exhibit 15-17# 5 Exhibit 18# 6 Exhibit 19-20# 7 Exhibit 21-23# 8 Exhibit 24)(Leahy, Arthur) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF Declaration of Gregory Thomas Johnson in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leahy, Arthur) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF Declaration of Bruce Welling in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Leahy, Arthur) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                BRIEF Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Locals 302 and 612 of the International Union of Operating Engineers-Employers Construction Industry Retirement Trust.(Leahy, Arthur) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Document filed by Michael F. Walsh. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(Gradstein, Henry) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY PRO HAC VICE. Attorney Henry D. Gradstein for Michael F. Walsh admitted Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/22/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1 (this document relates to all actions) 1. All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form. Forms can be found on the court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. 2. All attorneys who wish to be admitted for purposes of this case shall send a motion to be admitted pro hac vice to John Sacco at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, Room 249, New York, NY 10007. In addition to the documentation required by the Local Rules for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York, Civil Rule 1.3, attorneys wishing to appear pro hac vice must also include with their motion a check for $25.00 payable to the Clerk of the Court and a completed CM/ECF attorney registration form. 3. As of April 25, 2005, all documents filed in the MDL case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov.4. Amended complaints and supplemental pleadings shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action or actions to which they are being added. Similarly, a filing removing parties shall indicate the parties being removed and the action or actions from which they are being removed. A filing which adds a party or parties who has not been named in any of the consolidated actions shall provide a separate listing of such parties, indicating that they have not yet been named.5. Courtesy copies of all pleadings (including the complaint), motions, memoranda of law, etc., shall be clearly marked as such and submitted to chambers as soon as practicable after filing. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/11/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:04-cv-02115-LAP,1:04-cv-02164-LAP,1:04-cv-02189-LAP,1:04-cv-02190-LAP, 1:04-cv-02233-LAP,1:04-cv-02246-LAP,1:04-cv-02249-LAP,1:04-cv-02342-LAP,1:04-cv-02360-LAP, 1:04-cv-02372-LAP,1:04-cv-02503-LAP,1:04-cv-02507-LAP,1:04-cv-02532-LAP,1:04-cv-02546-LAP, 1:04-cv-02554-LAP,1:04-cv-02572-LAP,1:04-cv-02695-LAP,1:04-cv-02738-LAP,1:04-cv-03056-LAP, 1:04-cv-03101-LAP,1:04-cv-03158-LAP,1:04-cv-03570-LAP,1:04-cv-03572-LAP,1:04-cv-03597-LAP, 1:04-cv-03615-LAP,1:04-cv-03726-LAP,1:04-cv-03727-LAP,1:04-cv-05954-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(kkc, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER (this document relates to 05cv2344); that Defendant Nortel Networks Corporation and Plaintiff Michael F. Walsh stipulate and agree to extend Nortel's time to file an answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to 4/8/2005. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/28/2005) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:05-md-01659-LAP,1:05-cv-02344-LAP(kkc, ) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER IN ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL... that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407, the actions listed on the attached schedule A and pending in the Central District of California, Southern District of New York, and the same hereby are, transferred to the Southern District of New York, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Judge Loretta A. Preska, for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with the actions pending in those districts and listed on Schedule A. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/22/2005) (kkc, ) (Entered: 02/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 250 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?