Randolph v. Gerris et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-08820
District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Reginald Randolph, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Reginald Randolph
v.
No Logo Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo C.O. Chadwick, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Correction Officer Allen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Correction Officer Brown, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Correction Officer Gerris, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Correction Officer Masiey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Correction Officer Patterson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Correction Officer Santaluna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Department of Correction, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 555 - Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Gerard E. Lynch is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 10/05/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None
    PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 2/27/09 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 05-R-5291, Ogdenburg Correctional Facility, One Correctional Way, Ogdenburg, New York, 13669-2288. (mro) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None
      PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 12/29/08 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 05-R-5291, Ulster Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 800, Napanoch, NY, 12458. (mro) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: None
        PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 12/5/08 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 349-08-18014, 125 White Street, New York, NY, 10013. (mro) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
          PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 11/12/08 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 349-08-18014, 125 White Street, New York, NY, 10013. (mro) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
            PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 8/26/08 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 875 Taylor Ave., Apt #7A, Bronx, NY, 10473. (tro) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/7/2008, Entered: None
              AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 4 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, against Department of Correction, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Chadwick, The City of New York, Brown, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn.Document filed by Reginald Randolph. Related document: 4 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, filed by Reginald Randolph.(djc) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: It is hereby ordered plaintiff pro se Reginald Randolph's request for counsel is granted. The Pro Se Office is directed to make the relevant documents in this case available to all members of the Pro Bono Panel Plaintiff is reminded that he is not entitled to be represented, and an attorney can be assigned to him only when one volunteers. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 8/14/08) (js) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: None
                  APPLICATION to Appoint Counsel pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006(A)(g) (Habeas Corpus Petition). Document filed by Reginald Randolph.(djc) (Entered: 07/16/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Reginald Randolph dated 4/18/08 re: Plaintiff requests a copy of the transcripts of the phone conference held before the Court on 3/25/08. ENDORSEMENT: The telephone conference conducted on March 25, 2008 was not covered by a court reporter. As a result, no transcript will be prepared. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/25/08) (tro) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER. the Pro se Clerk's office shall mail an additional pro se litigant's manual to plaintiff at the following address: Plaintiff is advised that the lead attorney representing Mr. Wesley in Wesley v. Muhammad, 05 cv 5833 is Patrick Dongjune Oh. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/18/08); copies mailed by chambers. (djc) Modified on 4/21/2008 (djc). (copy forwarded to pro se) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: All discovery is to be completed by July 31, 2008. The parties are to submit a joint pre-trial order by September 17, 2008. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/25/2008) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(jpo) (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER Telephone Conference set for 3/25/2008 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger, at which time you are directed to call chambers at (212) 805-0204. Any requests for adjournment of this scheduled conference must be in writing, with copies to all other parties, and must be preceded by reasonable efforts by the requesting party to obtain the consent of those parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/18/2008) Copies Mailed By Chamber.(jmi) (Entered: 03/19/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Kimberly Conway dated 1/16/08 re: Accordingly, defendants request that the telephone conference currently scheduled for Friday January 18, 2008 be adjourned until Mr. Randolph notifies the Court or this office that he has been released from the infirmary. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants' counsel is to provide a written status report on plaintiff's availability by January 30, 2008. The previous scheduled telephone conference is adjourned sine die. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/16/08) (js) (Entered: 01/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER, that a telephone conference has been scheduled on Friday, 1/18/08 at 2:00 pm, at which time you are directed to call chambers at (212) 805-0204. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/18/2008 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/21/07) (cd) (Entered: 01/14/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/20/2007 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger, at which time you are directed to call chambers at (212) 805-0204. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/13/07) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(tro) (Entered: 12/17/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                  PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 11/30/07 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 05-R-5291, Mohawk Correctional Facility, 6100 School Rd., Po Box 8451, Rome, NY, 13442-8451. (tro) (Entered: 12/06/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None
                                    CITY DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, The City of New York, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn.(ae) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None
                                      PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 11/8/07 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 05-R-5291, Ulster Corr. Fac., PO Box 800, Napanoch, NY, 12458. (tro) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Kimberly Conway dated 10/25/2007 re: I write to request that the October 26, 2007 deadline for defendants in the above-referenced action. I write to request that the October 26, 2007 deadline for defendants to respond to the Second Amended Complaint be extended one-week to November 7, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendants are to answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint by Nov. 7, 2007., Department of Correction answer due 11/7/2007; Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan answer due 11/7/2007; Chadwick answer due 11/7/2007; The City of New York answer due 11/7/2007; Brown answer due 11/7/2007; Gerris answer due 11/7/2007; Santaluna answer due 11/7/2007; Brown(#8084) answer due 11/7/2007; Allen answer due 11/7/2007; Patterson answer due 11/7/2007; New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn answer due 11/7/2007. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 10/26/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None
                                          PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 10/19/07 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 349-07-15627, Anna M. Kross Center, 18-18 Hazen St., East Elmhurst, NY, 11370. (tro) (Entered: 10/23/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER, that defendants serve and file an anwer to plaintiff's amended complaint no later than 10/26/07. Department of Correction answer due 10/26/2007; Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan answer due 10/26/2007; Chadwick answer due 10/26/2007; The City of New York answer due 10/26/2007; Brown answer due 10/26/2007; Gerris answer due 10/26/2007; Santaluna answer due 10/26/2007; Brown(#8084) answer due 10/26/2007; Masiey answer due 10/26/2007; Allen answer due 10/26/2007; Patterson answer due 10/26/2007; New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn answer due 10/26/2007. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 10/16/07) copies sent by chambers.(cd) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 28 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Santaluna, Department of Correction, Chadwick, Allen, Brown, The City of New York, Masiey, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Gerris, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. Defendants' motion to dismiss will be granted in part, to the extent of (i) dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claims with regard to the prison commissary and (2) deeming the non-food equal protection claims to be limited to request for declaratory and injunctive relief. Judge Dolinger has already granted in part plaintiff's application to amend the current complaint, subject to certain conditions noted. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 9/25/07) (cd). (Entered: 09/28/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Kimberly Conway dated 9/20/07 re: Counsel for defendants request that they be granted an extension of time until 10/15/07 to submit written objections to Magistrate Judge Dolinger's Report and Recommendation dated 9/7/07. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 9/24/07) (tro) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MEMORANDUM & ORDER AND REPORT & RECOMMENDATIONS re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 34 MOTION to Dismiss. We recommend that dfts' motion to dismiss be granted in part, to the extent of (1) dismissing with prejudice plt's claims with regard to the prison commissary and (2) deeming the non-food equal-protection claims to be limited to requests for declaratory and injunctive relief. We also grant plt's application to amend the Current amended complaint, subject to the conditions that we have noted. Objections to R&R due by 9/24/2007 (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 9/7/2007) Copies mailed by chambers. (jar) Modified on 9/7/2007 (Rivera, Jazmin). (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER: re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss. It has come to the Court's attn. that a document (doc. #29) filed in support of dfts' motion to dismiss (doc. #28) has erroneously been listed as a separate motion. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close out Doc. #29 as a motion for all statistical purposes and internal reports. Motions terminated: 29 MOTION to Dismiss. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 7/2/2007) (jar) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                      PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 6/12/07 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolph. New Address: 05-R-5291, 875 Taylor Ave, #7A, Bronx, NY, 10473. (tro) (Entered: 06/15/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Dolinger from Kimberly Conway dated 3/13/07 re deft request to extend the answer deadline from 4/26 to 5/7/07: the deadline for defts to respond to the complaints in these actions is adjourned to 5/7/07. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/24/07) (cd) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Support re: 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Department of Correction, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Chadwick, The City of New York, Brown, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. (tro) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING IN NON-ECF CASE - REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 29 MOTION to Dismiss., 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint., 34 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Department of Correction, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Chadwick, The City of New York, Brown, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. (Conway, Kimberly) Modified on 4/3/2007 (lb). (Entered: 04/02/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                              DECLARATION of Reginald Randolph in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (dle) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mag. Judge3 Michael H. Dolinger from Kimberly Conway dated 3/19/07 re: City dfts request an extension of time to reply to plaintiffs opposition papers to their motion to dismiss to 3/27/07; So Ordered. Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/19/07) (pl) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 34 MOTION to Dismiss purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiff's amended complaint and accept plaintiff's newly submitted amended complaint in their entirety. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (ae) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, defendants' motion to dismiss the plaintiff's amended complaint and accept plaintiff's newly submitted amended complaint in their entirety. Document filed by Reginald Randolph.(ae) (Entered: 03/19/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Reginald Randolph dated 2/4/07 re: Application GRANTING plaintif one time extension to 3/13/07 to serve and file his opposition. Reply papers due by 3/20/07. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 2/8/07) (db) (Entered: 02/21/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        LETTER addressed to Mag. Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Reginald Randolph dated 12/22/06 re: plaintiffs requests that the deadline to respond to dft's motion t dismiss the amended complaint be extended to 4/3/07. Document filed by Reginald Randolph.(pl, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Reginald Randolph dated 12/22/06 re: pro se plaintiff requests that the 1/10/07 deadline for plaintiff to respond to the dfts' motion to dismiss the amended complaint be extended to 4/3/07. The deadline for plaintifff to serve and file his response to dfts' motion to dismiss is extended to 2/13/07. Any reply papers will be due by 2/20/07. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 1/3/07) (dle, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER, Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint., 29 MOTION to Dismiss.: Responses due by 1/10/2007. Replies due by 1/12/2007. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/11/2006) Copies Mailed By Chambers.(lb, ) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Department of Correction, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Chadwick, The City of New York, Brown, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/6/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by Department of Correction, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Chadwick, The City of New York, Brown, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kimberly Conway)(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/28/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER denying 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for lack of service, without prejudice to file a new motion within 2 weeks of the date of this order. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 11/27/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 11/28/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER;.... Defendants are to identify where plaintiff was as of July 5, 2006 and where they served their Rule 12(b)(6) motion papers upon him. If plaintiff was no longer located at the East Elmhurst DOC facility as of July 5, 2006, defendants are to explain the propriety of having served him there and why their motion to dismiss should not be denied for failure to properly serve plaintiff. In the event that defendant cannot demonstrate a good cause, the undersigned may recommend denial of their motion. Defendant are to provide the required information outlined above in writing to the Court by November 10, 2006. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 11/6/06) (djc, ) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: for the reasons set forth in this R&R we recommend that dfts' motion to dismiss be denied without prejudice. Objections to R&R due by 11/22/2006 (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 11/8/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 11/08/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Dispositive Motion (i.e. motion requiring a Report and Recommendation) and Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/9/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Kimberly Conway in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss. (jco, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Department of Correction, Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan, Chadwick, The City of New York, Brown, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. (jco, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/5/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Chadwick, The City of New York, Gerris, Santaluna, Brown(#8084), Masiey, Allen, Patterson, New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn. Return Date set for 7/24/2006 09:30 AM. (jco, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from Kimberly Conway dated 5/15/2006 re: City defendants respectfully requesting that the Court extend City defendants' time to respond to the amended complaint from 5/15/2006 to 6/19/2006. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. Defendants are to respond to the complaint by no later than 6/19/2006. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/15/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. New York City Department Commissioner Martin F. Horn served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Lombardi. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Brown(#8084). Attempted Service of Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/1/2006. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. Allen served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Pendarvic. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. Patterson served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Pendarvic. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. Chadwick served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Pendarvic, Sheild # 12200. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. Masiey served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Pendarvic, Sheild #12200. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. Santaluna served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Pendarvic, shield #12200. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. Acting Warden of AMKC - Brian Riordan served on 3/1/2006, answer due 3/21/2006. Service was accepted by C.O. Lombardi. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE UNEXECUTED as to Gerris. Attempted Service of Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint. Service was attempted on 3/1/2006. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and 30/60 Days Amended Complaint, served. The City of New York served on 3/3/2006, answer due 3/23/2006. Service was accepted by Mr. Bradshaw, Clerk. Document filed by Reginald Randolph. (jar, ) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Kimberly Conway dated 4/27/06 re: Request that the Court extend City defendants' time to respond to the complaint from April 28, 2006 to May 15, 2006. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/5/06) (js, ) (Entered: 05/09/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for general pretrial (includes initial conference, scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlemenmt). Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 3/27/06) (djc, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Kimberly Conway dated 3/24/06 re: counsel for dfts request that the 3/23/06 deadline for City dfts to respond to the amended complaint be extended to 4/28/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 3/27/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 03/30/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            PRO SE MEMORANDUM dated 1/5/06 re: CHANGE OF ADDRESS for Reginald Randolf. New Address: 05-R-5291, Ulster Correctional Facility, P.O.Box 800, Napanoch, New York, 12458. (dle, ) (Entered: 01/06/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gerard E. Lynch. Judge Michael B. Mukasey no longer assigned to the case. (kco, ) (Entered: 01/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chadwick, The City of New York, Department of Correction, Brian Riordan, Gerrigs, Santalina, Brown, Masley, Allen, Patterson, Commissioner of New York City amending 2 Complaint with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Reginald Randolf. Related document: 2 Complaint filed by Reginald Randolf,.(cd, ) (Entered: 12/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  60 DAYS ORDER....Should plaintiff decide to file an amended complaint,it must be submitted to this Court's Pro Se Office within 60 days of the date of this Order, be captioned as an "Amended Complaint" and bear the lower docket number of these two actions. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case with the higher docket number. A copy of this Order must be attached to the Amended Complaint. No summons shall be issued at this time and all further proceedings shall be stayed for sixty (60)days or until plaintiff has complied with this Order. Plaintiff is advised that any amended complaint submitted will completely replace, not supplement, his original compalint. Therefore, any allegations and/or claims plaintiff wishes to preserve must be included in his amended complaint. Any defendants plaintiff wishes to preserve from original compalint must be listed as defendants in this caption of his amended compalint. If plaintiff fails to comply with this Order within the time allowed, or fails to show good cause why he is unable to comply, the instant action will be dismissed without prejudice. Once submitted, the amended complaint shall be reviewed for compliance with this order and substantive sufficiency and then, if proper, the case shall be reassigned to a district judge in accordance with the procedures of the Clerk's Office.I certify that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. (Signed by Judge Michael B. Mukasey on 10/18/2005) (jmi, ) Modified on 10/21/2005 (jmi, ). (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Department of Correction, Brian Riordan, Gerrigs, Santalina, Brown, Masley, Allen, Patterson, Commissioner of New York City. Document filed by Reginald Randolf.(jmi, ) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Reginald Randolf.(jmi, ) (Entered: 10/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?