Allivar v. 1 World Trade Center L.L.C.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:05-cv-09821
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 17, 2019 at 2:27 PM DT (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Raul Allivar, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher R. LoPalo +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 clopalo@nkblaw.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 150 Broadway Corp., Defendant
No Logo 150 Broadway N.Y. Assocs. L.P., Defendant
No Logo 2 Broadway LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Harris Beach PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Andrew Bender +21268701 00x 313 5405 +1 212 687 0659 jsavitsky@harrisbeach.com
No Logo 2 World Trade Center L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holding L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holding L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 63 Wall Inc., Defendant
No Logo 63 Wall Street, Inc., Defendant
No Logo 75 Broad LLC, Defendant
No Logo 90 Church Street Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Acrow Corporation Of America, Defendant
No Logo Allcom Electric Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
American Express Bank Ltd American Express Bank Ltd, Defendant
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant
Officer/Director, Ids Financial Corp/mn/
Officer/Director, Concur Technologies, Inc.
American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc. American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo American Stock Exchange Clearing LLC, Defendant
No Logo American Stock Exchange Realty Associates LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo ASG Pest Control, Defendant
No Logo Atc Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Atlas Concrete Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Defendant
No Logo Bailey N.Y. Associates, Defendant
No Logo Bankers Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Bankers Trust Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bankers Trust New York Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Battery Park City Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allyson A. Avila +1 845 359 9019 +1 914 323 7001 allyson.avila@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Belfor Usa Group Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., Defendant
No Logo BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C Co. L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo BFP Tower C MM LLC, Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, LP, Defendant
No Logo Brown Brothers Harriman & Co, Inc., Defendant
No Logo BT Private Clients Corp., Defendant
No Logo BT Private Clients Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., Defendant
No Logo C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Certified Fence Corp., Defendant
No Logo Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Colliers ABR, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Coordinated Metals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criticom International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DB Private Clients Corporation, Defendant
No Logo DCM Erectors, Inc., Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F&G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Felix Equities, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo G&G Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo General RE Services Corp., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Gino Cracolici & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Grace Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmsman Management Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HGC Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo High-Rise Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HP Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hunter Construction, Defendant
No Logo Hunter Construction Co., Defendant
No Logo Jemb Realty Corp., Defendant
No Logo JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc. Lehman Brothers Holdings, Inc., Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp
No Logo Lehman Commercial Paper Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Lehman Commerical Paper, Inc."
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Insurance Company"
No Logo Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Defendant
No Logo LIRO, INC, Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo M.G. McLaren, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzochi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Defendant
No Logo Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Group, Defendant
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Rita Cohen +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 cohenj@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Moody's Investors Service Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Moody's Investors Service"
No Logo Moretrench American Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Musco Sports Lighting, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo National Association of Securities Dealers Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc.,
No Logo New York City Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Nomura Holding America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy Marie Ferraro +1 212 931 8319 +1 212 931 8319 kferraro@sralawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard F. Strongin +1 212 931 8300 +1 212 931 8319 hstrongin@sralawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Suzanne Taylor +1 212 931 8305 +1 212 931 8319 jtaylor@sralawfirm.com
No Logo Nomura Securities International, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Nomura Holdings, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy Marie Ferraro +1 212 931 8319 +1 212 931 8319 kferraro@sralawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard F. Strongin +1 212 931 8300 +1 212 931 8319 hstrongin@sralawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Suzanne Taylor +1 212 931 8305 +1 212 931 8319 jtaylor@sralawfirm.com
No Logo NYC Industrial Development Agency, Defendant
No Logo Off Road Welding, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Parson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Management Corp., Defendant
No Logo Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT& L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rich-Mark Environmental Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert C. Stewart, Defendant
No Logo Robert Errat, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Simpson, Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Star Delta Electric, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Steir Anderson, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Structure Tone Global Servcies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Summit Structures, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Telenet Communications, Inc., Defendant
No Logo The American Stock Exchange, LLC, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo The Deutsche Bank Building, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Toretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Trammell Crow Company, Defendant
No Logo Trammell Crow Corporate Service, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Trio Asbestos Removal, Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tully Construction Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Tyrrell, JR., +1 973 639 1234 +1 973 639 7298
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Tyrrell, JR., +1 973 639 1234 +1 973 639 7298
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Edward Tyrrell, JR., +1 973 639 1234 +1 973 639 7298
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction International L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
No Logo United States Rebar, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vertical Lend, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC Holding L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Westfield WTC, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo WFP Retail Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D Co. G. P. Corp, Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, Defendant
No Logo Ambient Group Inc., ADR Provider
No Logo HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, ADR Provider

Represented by Robinson & Yablon, P.C

City of New York City of New York, ADR Provider
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Ewell E. Finley, P.C., Defendant-in-Rem
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (120) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/17/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 6/12/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from James E. Tyrrell, Jr. dated 1/19/2011 re: Requesting an extension of time to object to the terms contained in the Order Accepting Report of Special Counsel and Providing for Effectiveness of Settlement. ENDORSEMENT: The request is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/20/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: On June 23, 2010, I entered Case Management Order Nos. 10, 7, and 2 in the 21 MC 100, 21 MC 102, and 21 MC 103 Consolidated Master Dockets, respectively. On October 27, 2010, I extended the potential expiration date of all three Case Management Orders to December 21, 2010. For the reasons stated on the record at the conference held on December 22, 2010, I hereby extend the December 21, 2010 deadline to February 2, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/28/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(db) (Entered: 12/29/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Ambient Group Inc.. (Cookson, John) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT Related to the Master Complaint 109 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint against ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., Acrow Corporation of America, Allcom Electric Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., American Express Bank, Ltd., American Express Company, American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc., American Stock Exchange Clearing LLC, American Stock Exchange Realty Associates LLC, Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. L.L.C., BFP Tower C MM LLC, BT Private Clients Corp., BT Private Clients Corporation, Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bailey N.Y. Associates, Bankers Trust Company, Bankers Trust Corporation, Bankers Trust New York Corporation, Battery Park City Authority, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Belfor USA Group Inc, Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc., Boston Properties, Boston Properties, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brown Brothers Harriman & Co, Inc., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Colliers ABR, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., DB Private Clients Corporation, DCM Erectors, Inc., DMT Enterprises, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., ET Environmental, Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., En-Tech Corp., Robert Errat, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., G&G Contracting Inc., General RE Services Corp., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Gino Cracolici & Sons, Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Grace Industries, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., HP Environmental, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., High-Rise Electric, Inc., Hunter Construction, Hunter Construction Co., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Jemb Realty Corp., Koch Skanska, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Laquila Construction Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp., Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc., Lehman Commerical Paper, Inc., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., M.G. McLaren, P.C., MRA Engineering, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzochi Wrecking, Inc., Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., NYC Industrial Development Agency, Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc., New York City Industrial Development Agency, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nicholson Construction Company, Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., PT& L Contracting Corp., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environment Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, Pro Safety Services L.L.C., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services, Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein Properties Inc., Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Simpson, Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Steir Anderson, L.L.C., Robert C. Stewart, Structure Tone Global Servcies, Inc., Summit Structures L.L.C., Survivair, Telenet Communications, Inc., The American Stock Exchange, L.L.C., The City of New York, The Deutsche Bank Building, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Toretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trammell Crow Company, Trammell Crow Corporate Service, Inc, Trio Asbestos Removal, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co. Inc., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International L.L.C., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), United States Rebar, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons, Inc., WFP Retail Co. L.P., WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. G. P. Corp, WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding L.L.C., Westfield WTC, L.L.C., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 150 Broadway Corp., 150 Broadway N.Y. Assocs. L.P., 2 Broadway LLC, 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center L.L.C., 4 WTC Holding L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center L.L.C., 5 WTC Holding L.L.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, 5 World Trade Center L.L.C., 63 Wall Inc., 63 Wall Street, Inc., 75 Broad LLC, 90 Church Street Limited Partnership, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM, ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Raul Allivar. Related document: 109 Complaint By Adoption/Check-Off Complaint filed by Raul Allivar.(ama) (Entered: 11/04/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER ADJOURNING STATUS CONFERENCE 11/18/10 Status Conference reset for 12/3/2010 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION: It is hereby sitpulated and agreed by and between the parties, that with respect to the actions listed "Schedule A" attached hereto, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp., only as to the claims being made as to the premises identified in the First Amended Master Complaint and individual; Check-off Complaint as 140 West Street, New York, NY 1007, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs as to any party against the other. It is further stipulated and agreed that upon Amended Master Complaint and Amended Form Check-Off Complaint, Plaintiffs will remove all references to Defendant Pinnacle Environmental Corp. with regard to 140 West Street, New York, NY 10007. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/30/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                        AMENDED COMPLAINT BY ADOPTION/CHECK-OFF COMPLAINT against defendants with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Raul Allivar.(mro) (Entered: 10/04/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                          ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 8/19/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/9/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00102-AKH et al.(jpo) (Entered: 08/12/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the firm of Dickstein Shapiro LLP, 1633 Broadway, New York, New York, 10019 be substitution as counsel of record for defendant Battery Park City Authority in the cases set forth on Schedule A hereto (with respect to the claims therein involving Two World Financial Center (225 Liberty Street) and/or Four World Financial Center (250 Vesey Street)), in place and stead of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/3/10) (rjm) (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/23/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Rita Cohen on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co. Inc. (Cohen, Judith) (Entered: 03/23/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard F. Strongin on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/10/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Suzanne Taylor on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Taylor, Jill) (Entered: 03/10/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc..(Ferraro, Kristy) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristy Marie Ferraro on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Ferraro, Kristy) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristy Marie Ferraro on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Ferraro, Kristy) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristy Marie Ferraro on behalf of Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc. (Ferraro, Kristy) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc.. (Ferraro, Kristy) (Entered: 02/23/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None
                                              FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC. (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 96 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints. against Battery Park City Authority. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Avila, Allyson) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/15/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaints. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Affirmation in Support)(Avila, Allyson) (Entered: 05/15/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Jim Desmond. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Ramona Rosado. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Bailey N.Y. Associates served on 6/22/2007, answer due 7/12/2007. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Joseph A Fitapelli. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by FRONT DEST. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 04/16/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by William J. Smith. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by BFP Tower C MM LLC, Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., WFP Retail Co. L.P., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower A Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co. G. P. Corp, WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., BFP Tower C Co. L.L.C., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc.. (Marino, Nicholas) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore J. Calabrese on behalf of HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by and between the undersigned, that the firm of Faust Goetz, Two Rector Street, New York, New York 10006 be substituted as counsel of record for defendant Battery Park City Authority in the cases set forth on Schedule A hereto (with Respect to the claims therein involving One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in place and stead of Wilson, Elser, Moskowiu, Edelman & Dicker LLP. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/10/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Josh Folger. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 2/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 02/16/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Margaret Walsh. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp. served on 3/3/2006, answer due 3/23/2006. Service was accepted by Unreadable. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Weeks Marine, Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Lou Cannuzzo. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Linda Johnson. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Magdalina Cruz. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Nora Dindyal. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Margaret Wabash. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/15/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC) served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by B. Thompson. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/14/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Edith Patrlano. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Gail Gruschow. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 02/14/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Alan Macky. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Breeze Carting, Inc.. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Atlantic Heydt Corp. served on 3/3/2006, answer due 3/23/2006. Service was accepted by Tom E Byrne. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Gail Gruschow. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 3/2/2006, answer due 3/22/2006. Service was accepted by Alan Mackey. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Boston Properties, Inc. served on 6/22/2007, answer due 7/12/2007. Service was accepted by Ramona Rosado. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 10/30/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P. served on 3/3/2006, answer due 3/23/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Josh Folger. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Safeway Environmental Corp. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Magdalina Cruz. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Laquila Construction Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Breeze National Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Edith Patrlano. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Lastrada General Contracting Corp. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Margaret Walsh. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Service was accepted by Vernelle Brown. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Breeze Carting Corp. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Ann Taylor Stores Corporation. (Joyce, William) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tishman Interiors Corporation served on 9/2/2007, answer due 9/22/2007. Service was accepted by Jim Desmond. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. 150 Broadway N.Y. Assocs. L.P. served on 7/5/2007, answer due 7/25/2007. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. 150 Broadway Corp. served on 6/22/2007, answer due 7/12/2007. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc. served on 3/20/2006, answer due 4/9/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by 63 Wall Inc., 63 Wall Street, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Brown Brothers Harriman & Co, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Colliers ABR, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Trammell Crow Company, Trammell Crow Corporate Service, Inc. (Lichtenstein, Jon) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by American Express Company, American Express Bank, Ltd., American Express Travel Related Services Company, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Structure Tone Global Servcies, Inc.. (Joyce, William) (Entered: 08/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc., Lehman Commerical Paper, Inc., Lehman Brothers Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc. (Keenan, Frank) Modified on 8/22/2008 (jar). (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Castastophe, Inc.. (Keenan, Frank) (Entered: 08/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by 2 Broadway LLC. (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 08/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stanley Goos on behalf of 2 Broadway LLC (Goos, Stanley) (Entered: 08/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Dubanevich, William) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Whitney Contracting Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Joanne Pisano. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Tucci Equipment Rental Corp. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/26/2006. Service was accepted by Daneen Gazzola. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Gitelman, Robert) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the actions, the above actions listed are discontinued without prejudice against -Cushman and Wakefield, Inc.- only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation and order. This Document relates to All Cases listed in this document. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00100-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Company. (Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by Bankers Trust Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation. (Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by BT Private Clients Corp., DB Private Clients Corporation. (Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 01/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY AFFIRMATION of Joseph E. Hopkins in Support re: 28 MOTION to Transfer Case of Defendants Tully Construction Co. Inc. and Tully Industries, Inc... Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Transfer Case of Defendants Tully Construction Co. Inc. and Tully Industries, Inc... Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 12/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adoption of Amended Answer. Document filed by BFP One Liberty Plaza Co. LLC., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc.. (Smith, William) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 28 MOTION to Transfer Case of Defendants Tully Construction Co. Inc. and Tully Industries, Inc... Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, DB Private Clients Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Certification of Marc D. Crowley, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E to Crowley Certification, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits F-I to Crowley Certification, # 4 Certification of Service)(Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Joseph E. Hopkins in Support re: 28 MOTION to Transfer Case of Defendants Tully Construction Co. Inc. and Tully Industries, Inc... Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Certificate of Service)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION to Transfer Case of Defendants Tully Construction Co. Inc. and Tully Industries, Inc... Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Transfer Case of Defendants Tully Construction Co. Inc. and Tully Industries, Inc.. Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Certificate of Service)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 11/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT, NEW YORK CITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION ONLY... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above action is discontinued against Defendant(s) -New York City Economic Development Corporation only- as to the claims being made as to the premises located at One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York and 78-86 Trinity Place, NY, NY... in the captioned lawsuits shall be discontinued by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. This Document relates to all cases listed which are member cases and also cases listed on this document NOT listed as member cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/8/07) (rjm) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John P. Cookson on behalf of Ambient Group Inc. (Cookson, John) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AS TO DEFENDANT, NEW YORK CITY ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION ONLY... that whereas no party hereto is an infant or incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above action is discontinued against Defendant(s) -New York City Economic Development Corporation only- as to the claims being made as to the premises located at One Liberty Plaza, New York, New York... in the captioned lawsuits shall be discontinued by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to any party as against the other... and as further set forth in said stipulation of discontinuance. This Document relates to all cases listed as member cases and also 06-12701, 06-2528, 06-2527, 07-5292, 06-4885, 07-3446, 05-9821, 05-10747, 06-1340, 07-1446, 06-14486, 05-1272, 06-14660, 06-3422, 06-3301, 06-2884, 06-10781, 06-14741, 06-14781, 06-4376, 05-9333, 06-14807, 06-178606-12341, 05-10738, 05-9822, 06-3850, 06-1341, 05-9951. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/23/07) (rjm) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adoption. Document filed by Structure Tone Global Servcies, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Service)(Joyce, William) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by General RE Services Corp.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by 90 Church Street Limited Partnership, Boston Properties, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by National Association of Securities Dealers, Inc., Nasdaq Stock Market, Inc., The American Stock Exchange, L.L.C., American Stock Exchange Clearing LLC, American Stock Exchange Realty Associates LLC, New York City Industrial Development Agency. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Tishman Interiors Corporation. (Desmond, James) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT. Document filed by 150 Broadway Corp., 75 Broad LLC, Bailey N.Y. Associates, Jemb Realty Corp., 150 Broadway N.Y. Assocs. L.P.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Adoption of Ambient Group, Inc.'s Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Ambient Group Inc.. (Cookson, John) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of ADOPTION (ANSWER TO MASTER COMPLAINT). Document filed by HP Environmental, Inc.. (Rosmarin, Sam) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by Belfor USA Group Inc. (Desmond, James) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY AFFIRMATION of Joseph E. Hopkins in Support re: 7 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay.. Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay.. Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc., Tully Construction Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay.. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 08/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 7 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay.. Document filed by Bankers Trust Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, DB Private Clients Corporation, BT Private Clients Corporation, Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Bankers Trust Company, Bankers Trust New York Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Marc D. Crowley# 2 Exhibit to Crowley Certification# 3 Certification of Service)(Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tully Industries, Inc..(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tully Construction Co. Inc..(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Joseph E. Hopkins in Support re: 7 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay.. Document filed by Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 7 MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay.. Document filed by Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Industries, Inc.. (Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Transfer Case and/or Stay. Document filed by Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Tyrrell, James) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan served on 2/23/2006, answer due 3/15/2006; Tishman Construction Corporation of New York served on 2/23/2006, answer due 3/15/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The City of New York served on 2/22/2006, answer due 3/14/2006. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Port Authority of New York and New Jersey served on 2/27/2006, answer due 3/19/2006. Service was accepted by Michele Givard. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (Napoli, Paul) (Entered: 07/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of Structure Tone Global Servcies, Inc. (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 03/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. En-Tech Corp. served on 3/6/2006, answer due 3/27/2006. Service was accepted by Vernice Brown. Document filed by Raul Allivar. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Hunter Construction Co., JP Equipment Rental Materials, Inc., Jemb Realty Corp., Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction Inc., Lastrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Managed Care Inc., Liro, Inc., 5 World Trade Center L.L.C., Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lower Manhattan Development Corp., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, M.G. McLaren, P.C., Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzochi Wrecking, Inc., Medcor Medical and Hospital Supply, Ment Bros. Iron Works Co., Inc., Meridian Construction Group, 5 WTC Holding L.L.C., M.G. McLaren, P.C., Moody's Investors Service, Moretrench American Corporation, MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Musco Sports Lighting, L.L.C., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Nyc Industrial Development Agency, Nicholson Construction Company, 150 Broadway N.Y. Assocs. L.P., Off Road Welding, Inc., Olympic Plumbing & Heating Corp., Ove Arup & Partners, P.C., Parson Group, Inc., Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle, Pinnacle Environment Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Plaza Construction Management Corp., Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Pro Safety Services L.L.C., PT& L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rich-Mark Environmental Services, Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert C. Stewart, Robert Errat, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Royal GM, Inc., ABM, SAB Trucking, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment and Manufacturing Corporation, Sheldrake Organization, Inc., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager L.L.C., Silverstein WTC L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Mgmt. Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties L.L.C., Simpson, Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill L.L.P., Star Delta Electric, Inc., Steir Anderson, L.L.C., Summit Structures L.L.C., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Survivair, Telenet Communications, Inc., The Deutsche Bank Building, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Speyer Properties, Tomasetti Group, Inc., Toretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Trio Asbestos Removal, Acrow Corporation of America, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., Turner Construction Company, Turner Construction International L.L.C., Tyyssenkrupp Elevator Corporation, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Allcom Electric Inc., United States Rebar, Inc., Vertical Lend Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons, Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Westfield America, Inc., Westfield WTC Holding L.L.C., Westfield WTC, L.L.C., WFP Tower D. Co., L.P., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc.,, Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling L.L.C., ASG Pest Control, ATC Associates, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Atlas Concrete Corp., Bacou-Dalloz US Headquarters, Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Bergen Concrete Cutting, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., BFP One Liberty Plaza Co., L.P., BFP Tower C Co. L.L.C., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Boston Properties, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., C & D Fireproofing & Plastering Corp., C & D Painting & Decorating, Inc., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Cantor Seinuk Group, Certified Fence Corp., Civetta-Cousins JV, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., Clarcor Air Filtration Products, Inc., Component Assembly Systems, Inc., Consolidated Edison Communications Holding Company, Inc., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Consolidated Edison Development, Inc., Consolidated Edison Energy, Inc., Consolidated Edison Solutions, Inc., Consolidated Edison, Inc., Coordinated Metals, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., 1 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Criticom International Corporation, Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Dakota Demo-Tech, Inc., DCM Erectors, Inc., Diamond Point Excavating Corp., 2 World Trade Center L.L.C., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprises, Inc., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), 2 WTC Holdings L.L.C., Ewell E. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F&G Mechanical, Inc., Felix Equities, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Frank Micelli Jr. Contracting, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., G&G Contracting Inc., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., 4 World Trade Center L.L.C., Gino Cracolici & Sons, Inc., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Grace Industries, Inc., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Helmsman Management Services, Inc., HGC Contracting Corp., High-Rise Electric, Inc., High Rise Hoisting and Scaffolding, Inc., HP Environmental, Inc., Hunter Construction, 4 WTC Holding L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 562414)Document filed by Raul Allivar.(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2005 (mbe, ). (Entered: 11/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 264 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?