Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
71 |
Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and through counsel for the parties, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, that all of the claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear his, her, or its own costs. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 1/5/10) (rjm) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
70 |
Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Sarah Netburn dated 12/3/09 re: In light of this settlement, the parties jointly request to be relieved of the obligation to submit a pretrial order or any motions in limine today, as previously ordered by the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are relieved of their obligation to submit a pretrial order and motions in limine, as previously ordered by the Court. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/3/09) (rjm) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
69 |
Filed: 10/6/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Matthew D. Brinckerhoof dated 10/5/09 re: the parties jointly request that the joint pre-trial order and any motions in limine be served and filed on or before December 3, 2009 that responses to any motions in limine be served and filed on or before December 9, 2009 and that any replies to the responses by served and filed on or before December 14, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: granted. Parties shall file a joint pretrial order and any motions in limine on or before December 3, 2009, responses to any motions in limine on or before December 9, 2009; and replies to any responses on or before December 14, 2009. This case is deemed ready trial as of February 22, 2010. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 10/6/09) (pl) (Entered: 10/06/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
68 |
Filed: 9/30/2009, Entered: None |
 |
|
OPINION & ORDER re:#98116 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Fishelson Productions, Inc., Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., David Fishelson, Golda Tour 1, L.P. For the reasons stated above, the Court DENIES Defendants' motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs breach of contract and promissory estoppel claim. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motion for summary judgment on Plaintiffs invasion of privacy claim. No later than October 14, 2009, the parties shall submit a joint pre-trial order. The pre-trial order must conform to the Court's Individual Practices, a copy of which may be obtained at http://www1.nysd.uscourts.gov/cases/show.php?db=judge_info&id=427. The pre-trial order also must contain a one-page joint statement of the nature of the case to be read to prospective jurors by the Court at voir dire. Any motions in limine shall be submitted with the pre-trial order, no later than October 14, 2009. No later than October 19, 2009, the parties shall submit responses to any motions in limine. No later than October 22, 2009, the parties shall submit any replies to the responses. This case is set for pre-trial conference on October 19, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. This case is deemed ready trial as of October 14, 2009. At any time after the Ready Trial Date, the Court may call the parties to trial upon forty-eight hours notice. No adjournment of that trial date will be permitted, unless counsel has faxed to chambers an affidavit stating that he or she is engaged in trial in another court. This affidavit shall include: (1) the caption of the other case, including its index number; (2) the expected length of the trial; (3) the court in which the other case is to be tried; and (4) the name and telephone number of the judge presiding over the case. Counsel shall notify the Court and all other counsel in writing, at the earliest possible time, of any particular scheduling problems involving out-of-town witnesses or other exigencies. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/27/09) (tro) Modified on 10/2/2009 (jab). (Entered: 09/30/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
67 |
Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah Netburn on behalf of Anna Pearce. New Address: see attached document for address change of co-counsel for Plaintiff, Timothy A. Macht,. (Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
66 |
Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Stephen Kaplan on behalf of Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc. (Kaplan, Bruce) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
65 |
Filed: 8/13/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Matthew Brinckerhoff in Opposition re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part I, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Part II, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 2 - 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 4 - 12)(Brinckerhoff, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
64 |
Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Chief Judge Wood from Hal Neier dated 7/23/08 re: response to order of the Court dated July 16, 2008. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.(djc) (Entered: 08/01/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
63 |
Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Hal Neier in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
62 |
Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
RESPONSE re: 56 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
61 |
Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/18/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
60 |
Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: Accordingly, the Court vacates Judge Peck's confidentiality order. The Court orders the parties to jointly submit, in writing, a proposed confidentiality order and a brief explanation of why such an agreement is necessary, citing relevant Second Circuit law. Upon receipt of this joint submission, the Court will determine what, if any, confidentiality agreement should be ordered. The Court will then determine whether the documents submitted on or about July 10, 2008 shall be sealed under any confidentiality order's terms. Until then, the Court will hold these documents in Chambers. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/16/08) (js) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
59 |
Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Gaurav Shah dated 7/10/08 re: Request that my name be removed from the docket sheet and all service lists in this action. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 7/14/08) (cd) (Entered: 07/14/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
58 |
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Brinckerhoff, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
57 |
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
COUNTER STATEMENT TO 51 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Brinckerhoff, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
56 |
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Brinckerhoff, Matthew) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
55 |
Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Sarah Netburn in Opposition re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit, # 12 Exhibit, # 13 Exhibit, # 14 Exhibit)(Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
54 |
Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
53 |
Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
DECLARATION of Hal Neier in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (part 1 of 4), # 2 Exhibit 1 (part 2 of 4), # 3 Exhibit 1 (part 3 of 4), # 4 Exhibit 1 (part 4 of 4), # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit 7, # 11 Exhibit 8, # 12 Exhibit 9, # 13 Exhibit 10, # 14 Exhibit 11, # 15 Exhibit 12, # 16 Exhibit 13, # 17 Exhibit 14, # 18 Exhibit 15, # 19 Exhibit 16, # 20 Exhibit 17, # 21 Exhibit 18, # 22 Exhibit 19, # 23 Exhibit 20, # 24 Exhibit 21, # 25 Exhibit 22, # 26 Exhibit 23, # 27 Exhibit 24, # 28 Exhibit 25, # 29 Exhibit 26, # 30 Exhibit 27, # 31 Exhibit 28, # 32 Exhibit 29, # 33 Exhibit 30, # 34 Exhibit 31, # 35 Exhibit 32, # 36 Exhibit 33, # 37 Exhibit 34, # 38 Exhibit 35, # 39 Exhibit 36, # 40 Exhibit 37, # 41 Exhibit 38, # 42 Exhibit 39, # 43 Exhibit 40, # 44 Exhibit 41, # 45 Exhibit 42, # 46 Exhibit 43, # 47 Exhibit 44, # 48 Exhibit 45, # 49 Exhibit 46, # 50 Exhibit 47, # 51 Exhibit 48)(Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
52 |
Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
51 |
Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None |
|
|
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
50 |
Filed: 6/6/2008, Entered: None |
Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc..(Krakowsky, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/06/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
49 |
Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M Wood from Hal Neier dated 5/2/08 re: Request with respect to defendants motion for summary judgment: motions papers by 6/6/08, opposition papers by 7/3/08, reply papers by 7/18/08. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. ( Motion due by 6/6/2008., Response due by 7/3/2008, Reply due by 7/18/2008.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/2/08) (cd) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
48 |
Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER: The Court concludes that a pre-motion conference is unnecessary, and grants Defendants leave to file a motion for summary judgment. No later than May 6, 2008, the parties shall submit a joint briefing scheduled to the Court. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/1/08) (tro) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
47 |
Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Matthew Brinckerhoff dated 3/13/08 re: Request that plaintiff's time to serve a response to defendants Rule 56.1 Statement and Counterstatement be extended to 3/18, and defendant's time to serve a response be extended to 3/27. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/13/08) (cd) (Entered: 03/14/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
46 |
Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER; that any party seeking to file a motion for summary judgment shall serve and file a Local Civil Rule 56.1 Statement by 2/29/08. Opposing counsel shall serve and file a response it the manner that is set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 2/14/08) (pl) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
45 |
Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Matthew Brinckerhoff dated 12/18/2007 re: request that the 12/31/2007 deadline for the one-half day deposition of Meredith Blair be extended to 1/18/2008. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/19/2007) Copies faxed by chambers. (jar) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
44 |
Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Matthew D. Brinckerhoff dated 12/11/07 re: Plaintiff requests that the Court grant additional time to question Mr. Fishelson in his capacity as an individual defendant and 30 (b)(6) witness. ENDORSEMENT: The Court reluctantly grants plaintiff another 3 hours of deposition of Mr. Fishelson. Use the time wisely. And all exhibits are to be provided to defense counsel 3 business days in advance of the continued deposition or they cannot be used at the deposition. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/17/07) (tro) Copies Mailed By Chambers. Modified on 12/20/2007 (tro). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
43 |
Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Matthew Brinckerhoff dated 12/14/07 re: Counsel for Plaintiff suggests that there is no legitimate reason for Defendant to withhold the limited but critical documents mentioned within this letter. Now, at the close of discovery, after several witnesses have testified to their existence, they should be produced immediately. ENDORSEMENT: The requests are DENIED as (1) untimely and (2) for the additional reasons set forth in Bruce Kaplan's 12/16/letter. This is what happens when a party waits until the last minute to take depositions or follow up on the opposing party's objections to document requests. The Court notes that it is either sharp practice, or sloppy practice, to enclose plaintiff's document demands without the defendants' responses/objections to those requests. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/17/07) (tro) Copies Mailed By Chambers. Modified on 12/20/2007 (tro). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
42 |
Filed: 12/17/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Matthew Brinckerhoff dated 12/14/07 re: Counsel for Plaintiff request a discreet and limited extension of the discovery deadline. Plaintiff requests that the Court permit Plaintiff to subpoena Ms. Blair forthwith (her counsel as agreed to accept service of any subpoena) and to depose her at a time that is convenient for all concerned. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will, reluctantly, allow a 1/2 day deposition of Ms. Blair, in New York, at plaintiff's expense (inc. free transcript copy for defendants). Depo to be done at a date convenient for all but ASAP (and before 12/31). ( Deposition due by 12/31/2007.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 12/17/07) (tro) Copies Mailed By Chambers. Modified on 12/20/2007 (tro). (Entered: 12/17/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
41 |
Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Andrew J. Peck from Sarah Netburn dated 11/26/07 re: We along with co-counsel represent Plaintiff Anna Pearce p/k/a Patty Duke. We write, pursuant to Local Rule 37.2, to request an informal conference with the Court in order to resolve a discovery dispute related to the taking of a telephonic deposition.. ENDORSEMENT: The deposition may be taken by telephone. If defense counsel wishes to appear in person rather than on the telephone, they are free to do so. The Court reporter is to be in the same location as the witness. Exhibits must be pre-marked and supplied to the witness and opposing counsel before the deposition. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck on 11/26/07) (js) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
40 |
Filed: 11/21/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
CONSENT TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL & ORDER that Epstein Becker & Green is withdrawing as counsel for plaintiff and will be replaced by the firm Emery Celli Brinckerhoff & Abady LLP and the Law Offices of Timonty A. Macht (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 11/20/07) (cd). (Entered: 11/21/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
39 |
Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Matthew D. Brinckerhoff dated 11/7/07 re: a request for modification of the deadlines for expert disclosure reports. ENDORSEMENT: First expert report cutoff extended from 11/15/2007 to 11/21/07. Second expert report cutoff extended from 12/15/07 to 12/21/07. Further application will not be looked upon with favor, but may be made on 11/13/07. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 11/9/07) (kco) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
38 |
Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/19/2007 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jmi) (Entered: 11/08/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
37 |
Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Traycee Ellen Klein dated 11/6/2007 re: Plaintiff respectfully request that Your Honor immediately grant Epstein Becker & Green' s request to withdraw Linda Allderdice, Jennifer Nutter and myself as counsel for Plaintiff. ENDORSEMENT: The "preferred" approach is a stipulation, signed by new counsel, withdrawing counsel and the client (Ms. Pearce), to be submitted for the Court's approval. Please do same. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 11/6/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
36 |
Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/29/2007 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jmi) (Entered: 11/07/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
35 |
Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/25/07 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (db) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
34 |
Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy A. Macht on behalf of Anna Pearce (Macht, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
33 |
Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah Netburn on behalf of Anna Pearce (Netburn, Sarah) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
32 |
Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew D. Brinckerhoff on behalf of Anna Pearce (Brinckerhoff, Matthew) (Entered: 10/30/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
30 |
Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck from Bruce S. Kaplan dated 10/23/07 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that the parties have agreed that the depositions of Anna Pearce and Michael Pearce will take place on November 19, and 20, 2007, respectively, and the deposition of David Fishelson will take place on December 7, 2007, all in New York. The deposition of Bernard Tansey will proceed in Albany on November 14, 2007, and those of Valerie Harper and Tony Cacciotti will proceed in Los Angeles on October 31 and, if necessary November 1, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule for depos. approved. No change absent written stip. and/or Court order. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 10/23/07) (tro) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
29 |
Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 10/19/2007 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 10/18/07) Copies Faxed/ECF By Chambers.(tro) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
28 |
Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Traycee Ellen Klein dated 10/17/2007 re: request, in order that Ms. Pearce not be prejudiced due to her change in counsel, that next week's depositions be adjourned. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiff is to advise who new counsel is and whether they will be able to "hit the ground running" or if this is the first stop down the slippery slope of a request for a lengthier adjournment (and stay) of discovery to allow new counsel to get up to speed. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 10/17/2007) Copies faxed by chambers. (jar) Modified on 10/18/2007 (Rivera, Jazmin). (Entered: 10/18/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
27 |
Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/15/07 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jbe) (Entered: 09/06/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
26 |
Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/23/07 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jbe) (Entered: 08/21/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
25 |
Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/30/07 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (jbe) (Entered: 08/09/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
24 |
Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 07/23/07 before Judge Andrew J. Peck. (es) (Entered: 08/01/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
23 |
Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER SCHEDULING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE that a conference is scheduled for Monday, July 30, 2007 at 11:30 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 20D (500 Pearl Street). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 7/24/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 07/25/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
22 |
Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE: It is hereby ordered that a status conference is scheduled for July 23, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 20D (500 Pearl Street). (Signed by Judge Andrew J. Peck on 6/27/07) (js) (Entered: 06/28/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
21 |
Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/19/2007. Joinder of Parties due by 10/19/2007. Motions due by 2/22/2008. Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/14/2007. Expert Discovery due by 1/31/2008. Pretrial Order due by 2/29/2008. Ready for Trial by 3/1/2008. Trial is estimated to last 4-5 days and it is to be a Jury trial. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/22/07) (kco) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription. |
|
|
20 |
Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
DISCOVERY SCHEDULE; all non-expert discovery shall be complete by 12/14/2007 and all expert discovery shall be complete by 1/31/2008. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/22/07) (kco) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
19 |
Filed: 6/22/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for For general pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 6/22/07) (pl) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
18 |
Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order For Conference Pursuant to Rule 16(c) served on Defendants on May 25, 2007. Service was made by Facsimile. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Klein, Traycee) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
17 |
Filed: 3/22/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hal Neier on behalf of Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc. (Neier, Hal) (Entered: 03/22/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
16 |
Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc..(Shah, Gaurav) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
15 |
Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None |
|
|
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc..(Shah, Gaurav) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
14 |
Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION # 94385 re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Fishelson Productions, Inc., Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., David Fishelson, Golda Tour 1, L.P. Defts' motion to dismiss is granted in part and denied in part. Counts One, Three, and Four are sustained. Counts Two, Five, Six, and Seven are dimissed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/6/2007) (jar) Modified on 3/13/2007 (rw). (Entered: 03/08/2007)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
13 |
Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Shah, Gaurav) (Entered: 05/19/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
12 |
Filed: 5/12/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Klein, Traycee) (Entered: 05/12/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
11 |
Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
AFFIDAVIT of Hal Neier in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Shah, Gaurav) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
10 |
Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Shah, Gaurav) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
9 |
Filed: 4/28/2006, Entered: None |
Motion to Dismiss |
|
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Shah, Gaurav) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
8 |
Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
LETTER addressed to Judge Wood from Traycee Ellen Klein dated 3/29/06 re: response to the two letters submitted to the Court on today's date. Document filed by Anna Pearce.(djc, ) (Entered: 04/11/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
7 |
Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Bruce S. Kaplan dated 3/29/06 re: the conference set forth for 3/31/06 is adjourned sine die. The Court has carefully reviewed this letter and plaintiff's response dated 3/29/06. The Court finds that discovery should be stayed during the pending dfts' motion to dismiss. The Court orders the following briefing schedule for the motion. Motions due by 4/28/2006. Responses due by 5/12/2006 Replies due by 5/19/2006. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/31/06) (pl, ) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
6 |
Filed: 3/16/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
STIPULATION AND ORDER, the time for defendants to answer the complaint is extended until 4/20/2006. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/16/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 03/16/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
5 |
Filed: 3/13/2006, Entered: None |
 |
|
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 4 MOTION for Linda Auerbach Allderdice and Jennifer L. Nutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. filed by Anna Pearce. The application for admission, pro hac vice, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.3(C)01, Linda Auerbach Allderdice and Jennifer L. Nutter are granted. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/10/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 03/13/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
4 |
Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
MOTION for an order, admitting Linda Auerbach Allderdice and Jennifer L. Nutter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/08/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
3 |
Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Golda Tour 1, L.P. served on 2/28/2006, answer due 3/20/2006; David Fishelson served on 2/28/2006, answer due 3/20/2006; Fishelson Productions, Inc. served on 2/28/2006, answer due 3/20/2006. Service was accepted by Eraina, person of suitable age and discrection at residence. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Klein, Traycee) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
2 |
Filed: 3/2/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc. served on 2/28/2006, answer due 3/20/2006. Service was accepted by Louis Cardenia, Manager. Document filed by Anna Pearce. (Klein, Traycee) (Entered: 03/02/2006)
|
|
Request |
 |
|
|
1 |
Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None |
|
|
COMPLAINT against Manhattan Ensemble Theater, Inc., Golda Tour 1, L.P., David Fishelson, Fishelson Productions, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 570983)Document filed by Anna Pearce.(jbe, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/28/2006 (mbe, ). (Entered: 02/27/2006)
|
|
|
 |