Shakhnes v. Robert Doar
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-04778
District Judge Richard J. Holwell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 12:39 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Boris Shakhnes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Scott Gugig +1 212 768 6700 +1 212 768 6800 mgugig@sonnenschein.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandra Denise Hauser +1 212 768 6802 +1 212 768 6800 sandra.hauser@dentons.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lydia Ann Keaney +1 212 398 4866 +1 212 768 6800 lydia.keaney@snrdenton.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eva Lopez-Paredes +1 212 398 4877 +1 212 768 6800 elopez@sonnenschein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by New York Legal Assistance Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Beth Magida +1 646 602 5649 +1 212 533 4598 jmagida@nylag.org
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Greengold Stevens +1 212 613 5031 +1 212 750 0820 jstevens@nylag.org

Toggle Switch Represented by NYLAG Pro Se Legal Services Clinic

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Susan Lee Greene +1 212 613 5000 +1 212 750 0820 sgreene@nylag.org
TERMINATED: 05/02/2008 Amy E Lowenstein +1 212 750 0820 alowenstein@nylag.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Jane Hickey +1 212 613 5077 +1 212 750 0820 caroline.hickeyzalka@weil.com
v.
No Logo Antonia C. Novello, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah Ellen Hochhauser +1 212 416 8629 +1 212 416 6077 Deborah.Hochhauser@oag.state.ny.us
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lewis Kraft +1 212 416 8632 +1 212 416 6075 robert.kraft@oag.state.ny.us
No Logo Commissioner Verna Eggleston, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly Dorothy Conway +1 212 788 0865 +1 212 788 0877 kconway@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Robert Doar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Michael Joseph Myers

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Deborah Ellen Hochhauser +1 212 416 8629 +1 212 416 6077 Deborah.Hochhauser@oag.state.ny.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the New York Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lewis Kraft +1 212 416 8632 +1 212 416 6075 robert.kraft@oag.state.ny.us
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 444 - Civil Rights: Welfare
  Entries (145) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Lee Greene on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Greene, Susan) (Entered: 12/23/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 12/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER, the evidentiary record must be supplemented before the Court can determine the nature and content of any order. Plaintiffs are directed to file by December 17, 2010 both (a) a sworn affidavit from Mr. Cruz's treating physician at Kingsbridge Heights Rehabilitation and Care Center as to the physician's opinion regarding whether Mr. Cruz's "health and supportive needs can be met safely and adequately at home and (b) any supplemental argument concerning the satisfaction or absence of any further conditions to Mr. Cruz's legal entitlement to twenty-four hour home health services. The State Defendants shall file a statement of their position by 5:00 p.m. on December 20, 2010. If either party requests a hearing, it shall be held on December 21, 2010 at 2:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/14/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 12/14/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Robert L. Kraft in Opposition re: 138 Endorsed Letter,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,,. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: None
        BRIEF re: 138 Endorsed Letter,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, Letter Brief In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Proposed Order. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello.(Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 12/7/2010, Entered: None
          BRIEF re: 139 Declaration Letter filed in Response to State Defendants' Declaration of David B. Amiraian. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his friend Chaio Zhang, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 12/07/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re: 137 Brief,,., DECLARATION in Opposition re: 137 Brief,,. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None
              DECLARATION of Robert L. Kraft re: 138 Endorsed Letter,,, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, with Decision After Fair Hearing. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 11/5/10 re: Plaintiff writes to seek assistance from the Court on behalf of Ramon Cruz. Plaintiff respectfully requests that the Court schedule a conference on this matter at its earliest convenience. ENDORSEMENT: A telephone conference shall be held on December 2, 2010 at 10:00 a.m. Plaintiff's counsel to initiate the call. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 12/2/2010 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/30/10); (djc) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                  BRIEF Plaintiffs' Letter Brief and Proposed Order. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his friend Chaio Zhang, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 11/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 11/9/10 re: Request that the impending deadline in the 9/30/10 Opinion be extended an additional two weeks, until 11/24/10. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/15/10) (cd) (Entered: 11/17/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 10/19/2010 re: Counsel writes on behalf of all the parties in this action to request that the Court grant the parties a three week extension of time to comply with the directive of the Court's Opinion and Order dated September 30, 2010 that the parties submit, by October 21, 2010, letter briefs addressing (a) the appropriate injunctive, declaratory and remedial measures consistent with the opinion, and (b) whether an evidentiary hearing is needed to resolve factual issues related to (a) The parties seek an extension of this impending deadline until November 10, 2010, and have not requested any prior extensions with respect to the letter briefs at issue. the parties request this extension in order to explore the possibility of resolving this case in its entirety, or at least narrow the issues before the Court. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/20/2010) (js) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his friend Chaio Zhang, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). New Address: SNR Denton US LLP (NY), 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10020, (212) 768-6802. (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Lydia Ann Keaney on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his friend Chaio Zhang, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). New Address: SNR Denton US LLP (NY), 1221 Avenue of the Americas, New York, New York, USA 10020, (212) 398-4866. (Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 10/07/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #99505 For the foregoing reasons the motions to dismiss in both Shakhnes and Menking are denied as to the 90 day claims. (06-cv-04778 84; 09-cv-04103 12 Motion to Dismiss.) The State defendants motion to dismiss in Shakhnes is granted in part: the notice and inadequate supervision claims against State defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Additionally in the Shakhnes action. Plaintiffs' motion and class certification 93 is granted and the following class is certified pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 23(b)(2). City defendants motion for summary judgment 86 is denied. (3) Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment 88 is granted as against the State defendants and denied as against the City. In lieu of entering an order providing for specific injunctive and remedial relief, the Court directs the parties to submit, within twenty (20) days of the filing of this opinion, letter briefs addressing (a) the appropriate injunctive, declaratory and remedial measures consistent with this opinion, and (b) whether an evidentiary hearing is needed to resolve factual issues related to (a). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/30/10) (djc) (Entered: 10/01/2010); (djc) Modified on 10/4/2010 (ajc). (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on July 22, 2010 11:11 a.m. before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (ajc) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/21/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 6/17/10 re: counsel for plaintiff write on behalf of all parties to the Shakhnes case as well as the parties in the related case Menking v. Daines, to request an adjournment of the oral argument on all pending motions in both cases, now scheduled by the Court to be beard on June 30, 2010. We make this request to accommodate counsels' schedules and case demands. I spoke with Mr. Donald and he advised that the Court is available to hear the arguments on July 22, 2010 at 10:30. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/18/10) (pl) (Entered: 06/21/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby schedules oral argument on the pending motions in these matters for 3:30 PM on Wednesday, June 30, 2010. The parties are to appear in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/16/09) (js) (Entered: 06/16/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 3/8/2010 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs write regarding Plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction on behalf of class members Christopher Carter. Plaintiffs are currently seeking official confirmation from Defendants that ongoing home health services have been authorized for Mr. Carter, so that Plaintiffs can be assured that the issues raised by Plaintiffs' motion are not likely to recur. Assuming Defendants are able to provide such confirmation, and at such time, Plaintiffs will withdraw their motion. ENDORSEMENT: The OSC hearing is adjourned sine die. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/8/2010) (tro) (Entered: 03/08/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his friend Chaio Zhang, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). defendants shall show cause as to why an order should not be entered granting a preliminary injunction as further set forth herein. Show Cause Hearing set for 3/8/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/3/10, Part One) (dle) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jennifer Magida dated 1/27/2010 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes to respectfully suggest that filing 2 reply briefs of 20 pages or less would be the most efficient way to proceed in support of Plaintiff's motions for class certification and partial summary judgment. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/1/2010) (tve) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 1/21/2010 re: ACC writes requesting that the Court grant City defendant a one-week extension of time to submit reply papers to plaintiffs' opposition to City defendant's motion for summary judgment. City defendant seeks an extension of the impending deadline until Friday, January 29, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/29/2010) (tve) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/30/2010, Entered: None
                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/30/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO 112 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Sandra D. Hauser in Support re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class., 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                  DECLARATION of Benjamin Taylor in Support re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class., 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Their Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class. Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Class Certification. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None
                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 84 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 01/29/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 1/21/2010 re: Requesting that the January 22nd deadline be extended to January 29th for all parties to simultaneously submit reply papers. ENDORSEMENT: Extension Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/21/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 01/22/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                            DECLARATION of Kimberly Conway in Opposition re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class., 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B- part I, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B- part II, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D- Part I, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D- Part II, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E- Part I, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit E- Part II, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit W- Part II, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit X, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit Y)(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO 100 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/15/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                COUNTER STATEMENT TO Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 12/9/09 re: Plaintiffs write to respectfully request that the Court grant plaintiffs permission to filed their Memorandum in Response to City Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment five pages over the 25 page limit. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/11/09) (tro) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                    FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (Counter Statement to Rule 56.1) - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) Modified on 12/14/2009 (jar). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (Counter Statement to Rule 56.1) - RESPONSE in Opposition re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Response To Plaintiffs' Local Civil Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) Modified on 12/14/2009 (jar). (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO 100 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 84 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                  DECLARATION of Jane Greengold Stevens in Opposition re: 84 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint., 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit F Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit F Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits G - O, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits P through T)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                      DECLARATION of Russell J. Hanks in Opposition re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class. filed by State Defendants. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 12/1/09 re: Counsel request that the Court grant City defendants a one-week extension of time to submit opposition papers to plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment and plaintiffs' renewed motion for class certification. Plaintiffs and the State defendant consent to this requests on the condition that the 12/4/09 deadline be extended to 12/11/09 for all parties to simultaneously submit motion papers. The parties further request that the current deadline for the submission of reply papers be extended one additional week from 1/5/2010 to 1/22/2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/2/09) (tro) (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                            RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 10/7/2009 re: Pursuant to Your Honor's Individual Practices, I write to respectfully request that the Court grant City defendant permission to submit a memorandum of law in support of City defendant's motion for summary judgment in excess of 25 pages. Specifically, City defendant seeks permission to submit a memorandum of law containing 40 pages. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/8/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIRMATION in Support re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) Modified on 10/14/2009 (db). (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Benjamin Taylor in Support re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C, # 2 Exhibit D through F)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Sandra D. Hauser in Support re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through F, # 2 Exhibit G through P, # 3 Exhibit Q through X, # 4 Exhibit Y through CC, # 5 Exhibit DD)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Responses due by 12/4/2009(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Plaintiffs' Statement of Undisputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Benjamin Taylor in Support re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through C, # 2 Exhibit D through F)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Sandra D. Hauser in Support re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through F, # 2 Exhibit G through P, # 3 Exhibit Q through X, # 4 Exhibit Y through CC, # 5 Exhibit DD)(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Responses due by 12/4/2009(Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Kimberly Conway in Support re: 86 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit Y, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit Z, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit AA, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit BB, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit CC, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit DD, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit EE, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit FF, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit GG, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit HH, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit II, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit JJ, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit KK, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit LL, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit MM, # 38 Exhibit Exhibit NN, # 39 Exhibit Exhibit OO, # 40 Exhibit Exhibit PP- part I, # 41 Exhibit Exhibit PP- Part II, # 42 Exhibit Exhibit PP- Part III, # 43 Exhibit Exhibit PP- Part IV, # 44 Exhibit Exhibit PP- Part VI, # 45 Exhibit Exhibit PP- Part VI)(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Verna Eggleston.(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 84 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. Responses due by 12/4/2009(Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Michael S. Gugig dated 9/16/2009 re: Specifically, the parties have agreed to the following schedule for simultaneous briefing of, any dispositive motions they may file, along with Plaintiffs' class certification motion: Opening Papers due on or before October 9, 2009; Opposition Papers due on or before December 4, 2009; and Reply Papers due on or before January 15, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. ( Motions due by 10/9/2009, Replies due by 1/15/2010, Responses due by 12/4/2009) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/17/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 09/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lydia Ann Keaney on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Keaney, Lydia) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra Denise Hauser on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Hauser, Sandra) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 7/15/09 re: City defendant respectfully requests an extension of the to 8/11/09 to permit City defendant to depose the proposed intervenor and provide sufficient notice for said deposition. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/21/09) (tro) (Entered: 07/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 7/6/2009 re: Requesting that the Court grant City defendant an extension of time to submit opposition papers to plaintiffs' motion for leave to intervene. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/13/2009) (jpo) Modified on 7/15/2009 (jpo). (Entered: 07/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jane Greengold Stevens in Support re: 75 MOTION to Intervene Mayra Valle, by her next friend Shirley Campos-Valle.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Campos-Valle Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B-Kenneally Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C- Valle Decision After Fair Hearing, # 4 Exhibit D-Transcript Excerpt 12.4.08 Oral Argument, # 5 Exhibit E-Proposed Intervenor Complaint)(Magida, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - DECLARATION of Jane Greengold Stevens in Support re: 75 MOTION to Intervene Mayra Valle, by her next friend Shirley Campos-Valle.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Campos-Valle Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B- Kenneally Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C - Valle Decision After Fair Hearing, # 4 Exhibit D - Transcript of 12.4.08 Hearing)(Magida, Jennifer) Modified on 6/25/2009 (jar). (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION to Intervene Mayra Valle, by her next friend Shirley Campos-Valle.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Magida, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene Mayra Valle, by her next friend Shirley Campos-Valle. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Return Date set for 7/8/2009 at 10:00 AM.(Magida, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER. Dispositive motions to be filed by 9/18/09; Opposition papers due by 10/19/09; reply papers due by 11/2/09. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/1/09) (djc) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Robert L. Kraft dated 4/27/09 re: Counsel for defendants request that the Court approve an extension of time from April 27, 2009 to June 15, 2009, for all defendants to submit their expert reports, and revision of dates in a previously agreed upon briefing schedule by 49 days to account for the extension of time. Counsel requests an additional two week extension beyond June 1 so that State Defendants' counsel may properly review his submission and prepare supporting papers. City defendant's counsel joins the request and plaintiffs counsel neither consents to nor opposes my request. If approved, the revised schedule is as follows: Defendants' expert report(s) (if any) due June 15, 2009; Plaintiffs' rebuttal report (if any) due July 17, 2009; Completion of fact and expert discovery 7/28/09; Plaintiffs' motion for class certification due August 27, 2009. Defendants' opposition to class certification due September 28, 2009. Plaintiffs' class certification reply due 10/26/09. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/11/09) (js) (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 4/28/09 re: Counsel respectfully request that the Court adjourn the pretrial conference currently scheduled from 5/8/09 to any day during the week of 5/10/09 that is convenient for the Court. ENDORSEMENT: Conference adjourned to 5/22/09 at 10:30. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/11/09) (tro) (tro). (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Robert L. kraft dated 3/27/09 re: Counsel for defendants request that the Court approve an extension of time from March 23, 2009 to April 27, 2009 for all defendants to submit their expert reports, and revision dates in a previously agreed upon briefing schedule to account for the extension of time. All parties consent to the proposed extension and briefing schedule. Defendants' expert report(s) (if any) due April 27, 2009; Plaintiff' rebuttal report (if any) due May 29, 2009:Completion off fact and expert discovery June 9, 2009; Plaintiff' motion for class certification due July 9, 2009; Defendants' opposition to class certification due August 10, 2009; Plaintiffs' class certification reply due September 7, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Discovery due by 6/9/2009. Motions due by 7/9/2009. Replies due by 9/7/2009. Responses due by 8/10/2009) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/2/09) (js) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER The pretrial conference scheduled for April 23, 2009 is rescheduled to May 08, 2009, at 10:30 a.m., in the courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/17/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: The following schedule is established for fact discovery, expert discovery, and class certification motions: Plaintiffs expert report due: March 6, 2009; Defendants expert report (if any) due : March 23, 2009; Completion of fact and expert discovery: May 5, 2009; Plaintiffs motion for class certification due: June 4, 2009; Defendants opposition to class certification due: July 6, 2009; Plaintiffs class certification reply due: July 24, 2009; Next PTC 05/15/09 at 10:00 AM. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 3/2/09) (mme) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on December 4, 2008 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (djc) (Entered: 02/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/4/2008 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (D'Avanzo, Daniel) (Entered: 01/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification due by 5/13/2009. Response (up to 17,500 words) due by 6/12/2009. Reply (up to 7,500 words) due by 7/2/2009. All Discovery due by 4/13/2009, see document for other discovery deadlines. Status Conference set for 4/23/2009 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/12/08) (cd) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; For the reasons stated on the record, defendants' motions (45,60] are denied. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/4/08) (pl) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 11/7/08 re: Counsel for Defendant City request that the Court extend their time to submit City defendant's papers joining the State's motion to dismiss all claims in the Amended Class Action Complaint until 11/13/08. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/24/08) (tro) (Entered: 11/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: the City defendants shall produce the documents referenced in the Court's 10/28/08 Scheduling Order by Jan. 13, 2009. Plaintiffs may file supplemental memorandum of law, not to exceed 1,000 words on the issue of justiciability. The conference and oral argument previously scheduled for Friday, November 21, 2008 at 2:30 p.m. is rescheduled to Thursday, December 4, 2008 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 11/21/08) (tro) (Entered: 11/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 60 MOTION to Dismiss A Claim., 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of Art 3 standing and failure to join party needed for defendants to provide complete relief to plaintiffs.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Gugig, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Kimberly Conway in Support re: 60 MOTION to Dismiss A Claim., 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of Art 3 standing and failure to join party needed for defendants to provide complete relief to plaintiffs.. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. (Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss A Claim. Document filed by Verna Eggleston.(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss A Claim. Document filed by Verna Eggleston.(Conway, Kimberly) Modified on 11/12/2008 (jar). (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of Art 3 standing and failure to join party needed for defendants to provide complete relief to plaintiffs. Filed pursuant to the Court's October 10, 2008 Order treating State Defendants' motion for leave to amend answer as a motion to dismiss for failure to join necessary parties.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Gugig, Michael) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of Art 3 standing and failure to join party needed for defendants to provide complete relief to plaintiffs.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Robert L. Kraft in Support re: 55 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of Art 3 standing and failure to join party needed for defendants to provide complete relief to plaintiffs.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction lack of Art 3 standing and failure to join party needed for defendants to provide complete relief to plaintiffs. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. Return Date set for 11/21/2008 at 02:30 PM.(Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) Plaintiffs shall serve no more than five interrogatories regarding each of the case files produced by the City by Friday, October 24,2008. Plaintiffs may request that the City produce any documents or electronically stored information used by the City in responding to plaintiffs' interrogatories. (2) The City shall advise the Court of how long it will require to respond to plaintiffs' requests by Wednesday, November 12, 2008. (3) A discovery conference, as well as oral argument on all pending motions to dismiss, shall be held on Friday, November 21,2008 at 2:30 p.m. in thecourtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007.(Discovery Hearing set for 11/21/2008 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. Oral Argument set for 11/21/2008 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) Set Hearing as to 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 Answer to Amended Complaint: (Motion Hearing set for 11/21/2008 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/28/08) (db) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/17/08 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (cd) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER setting argument on the State Defendants motion for 10/31/08 at 3:00 pm. Because the issues are closely related, the Court will treat the State Defendants' motion, in the alternative, as a motion to dismiss the complaint...Any party wishing to make a supplemental filing must do so by 10/24/08. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 Answer to Amended Complaint. ( Motion Hearing set for 10/31/2008 at 03:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/10/08) (cd) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Sandra Hauser dated 9/23/08 re: Request for a premotion conference. ENDORSEMENT: A conference will be held on 10/17/08 at 10:30 am. ( Conference set for 10/17/2008 at 10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/2/08) (cd) (Entered: 10/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Cases)(Lopez-Paredes, Eva) (Entered: 08/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Beth Magida on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Magida, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER withdrawing 31 Motion to Intervene. By letter dated July 21, 2008, Plaintiffs informed the Court that they have withdrawn their Motion to Intervene 31 . The clerk of the court is requested to mark this motion as resolved. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/21/08) (tro) (Entered: 07/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Robert L. Kraft in Support re: 45 MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 Answer to Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Amend/Correct 20 Answer to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello.(Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lewis Kraft on behalf of Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello (Kraft, Robert) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 6/26/2008 at 04:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call to the Chambers of Judge Richard J. Holwell. The telephone number for Chambers is (212)805-0256. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/23/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Richard J. Holwell from Deborah Hochhauser dated 6/17/2008 re: Requesting permission for State defendants to amend their answer to the amended complaint. ENDORSEMENT: State defendants may file a motion for leave to amend supported by appropriate legal authorities. Motion to be filed by July 7, 2008. Opposition papers to be filed by July 21, 2008. No reply papers are necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/23/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER Settlement Conference set for 7/29/2008 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 18D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least three business days before the scheduled conference and only after the parties have consulted with each other. Direct inquires to Michael Brantley, 212-805-0242. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis on 6/18/08) (mme) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Settlement. Referred to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/12/08) (js) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Amend/Correct State Defendants' Answer to First Amended Complaint(LETTER). Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer)(Hochhauser, Deborah) Modified on 6/18/2008 (KA). (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL: Please be advised that Amy E. Lowenstein is no longer employed by the New York Legal Assistance Group, effective June 14, 2007, and accordingly withdraws as counsel in the above-captioned case. Attorney Amy E Lowenstein terminated. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/2/08) (tro) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Eva Lopez-Paredes dated 4/22/08 re: Request for the following revised scheduling - Fact Discovery concluded by 6/30/08; All Discovery including Expert Discovery due 9/30/08. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Expert Discovery due by 9/30/2008.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/25/08) (db) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 1/29/08 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs request that the deadline for fact discovery be extended from 3/31/08 until 5/12/08. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. No further extensions. ( Discovery due by 5/12/2008.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 2/1/08) (tro) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: Defendant Verna Eggleston, as Commissioner of the New York Human Resources Administrate shall provide Plaintiffs with fifty additional case files including, the specific types of documents previously requested by Plaintiffs within eight weeks of December 24, 2007, the date it received Plaintiffs' list of additional randomly selected individuals. The City Defendant shall, no later than fourteen (14) days from the execution of this order provide counsel for Plaintiffs with a list of all New York City applicants for, or recipients of, home health services who were threatened with and/or suffered a denial, reduction, or termination of home health services during the three-month period from March 1, 2007, through May 31, 2007. The list shall contain CTN numbers identifying information sufficient to permit plaintiffs to ascertain whether notices were sent to such individuals. The City defendant shall simultaneously certify to the Court and all counsel that any and all notices of adverse action sent to the individuals identified in this list have been produced. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 1/31/08) (tro) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Withdrawal of Amy Lowenstein as Counsel. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Berkman, Deborah) (Entered: 01/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 31 MOTION to Intervene and Class Action Intervenor Complaint.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Lopez-Paredes, Eva) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Sharna Pinnock in Support re: 31 MOTION to Intervene and Class Action Intervenor Complaint.. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Lopez-Paredes, Eva) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Intervene and Class Action Intervenor Complaint. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: # 1 Class Action Intervenor Complaint)(Lopez-Paredes, Eva) (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Eva Lopez-Paredes dated 9/27/2007 re: The parties propose the following revised schedule: Completion of City document production by 10/20/2007. Fact Discovery concluded by 3/31/2008. Expert disclosures and expert reports of all parties exchanged by 5/1/2008. Rebuttal expert disclosures and rebuttal expert reports exhcanged by 7/1/2007. All Discovery due by 8/1/2008, including expert discovery. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Status Conference adjourned to 11/30/2007 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 10/2/2007) (jar) (Entered: 10/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Stevens dated 5/3/07 re: counsel for plaintiffs requests the following discovery schedule: City dft will produce the described fifty case files and all outstanding discovery by 7/2/07; fact discovery will conclude by 9/30/07; each party's expert disclosures and expert reports, if any, will be exchanged by 10/30/07; each party's rebuttal expert disclosures and rebuttal expert reports, if any, will be exchanged by 1/3/08; all discovery, including expert discovery, will conclude by 2/4/08. Above schedule is hereby adopted. A status conference shall be held on 10/12/07 at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 5/15/07) (dle) Modified on 5/17/2007 (Lewis, Diahan). (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The parties are directed to appear on April 16, 2007 at 10:00 a.m. in the Courtroom of the Honorable Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 for a conference to resolve outstanding discovery issues. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 4/5/07) (js) (Entered: 04/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUGGESTION OF DEATH upon the record as to Sha-Sha Willis. Document filed by Verna Eggleston(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold Stevens dated 12/15/2006 re: to request an extension of the discoverydeadlines in this case. Discovery due by 3/30/2007. Status Conference set for 7/26/2007 10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/18/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Jane Greengold dated 11/28/06 re: Request that a conference with the Court be set for December 8, 11 or 12, or on another date that is convenient for the Court. Should the parties resolve all of their discovery disputes, we will inform the Court that a conference is not necessary. ENDORSEMENT: If discovery dispute remain outstanding a meet and confer, the parties shall submit letter briefs not to exceed five pages. The Court will thereafter schedule a conference if it concludes a conference will be expedient. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 12/1/06) (js, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    THE PARTIES' JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P.26(f) : Discovery due by 12/31/2006. Status Conference set for 3/9/2007 at10:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/29/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 8/25/06 re: Request that the Court extend City defendant's time to respond to plaintiffs' Amended Complaint from August 28, 2006 to September 5, 2006. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 9/5/06) (js, ) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Verna Eggleston. Related document: 16 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Boris Shakhnes,.(Conway, Kimberly) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 8/1/06: granting request to extend the City's time to respond to the Amended Complaint to 8/28/06. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 8/22/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 08/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. Related document: 16 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Boris Shakhnes,.(Hochhauser, Deborah) (Entered: 08/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER that a conference shall be held on 7/25/06 at 3:00 p.m. in the courtroom of the Hon. Richard J. Holwell, Courtroom 17B, 500 Pearl Street; counsel for plaintiffs and state dfts shall attend. If necessary the preliminary injunction hearing previously scheduled for 7/25/06 will be rescheduled at that time. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/21/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amy E Lowenstein on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Lowenstein, Amy) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER: City defendant will determine, on the following schedule, whether each individual on the State list described above is receiving aid continuing, as set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/19/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Verna Eggleston, Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello.Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his friend Chaio Zhang, Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related document: 1 Complaint,, filed by Boris Shakhnes,.(db, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/19/2006 (db, ). (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Barbera, Gino) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Barbera, Gino) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Barbera, Gino) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/22/06 before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (jw, ) (Entered: 07/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/22/06 @ 1:30 p.m. before Judge Richard J. Holwell. (kco, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 7/10/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caroline Jane Hickey on behalf of Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Hickey, Caroline) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Ruchard J. Holwell from Kimberly Conway dated 6/28/2006 re: to request that the Court schedule a conference concerning the Court's order on June 22, 2006 that the plaintiffs are entitled to "limited expedited discovery" concerning the plaintiffs' request for a preliminary injunction.Responses due by 7/21/2006 Replies due by 7/24/2006. ENDORSEMENT: The City's application for stay of expedited discovery is denied. The City will fie its opposition papers on July 14, 2006. The state may file its opposition July 21, 2006. Plaintiffs' Reply, if any, is due July 24, 2006. A preliminary injunction hearing will be held in Courtroom 17B on July 26, 2006 at 3:00 p.m. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Holwell on 6/30/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is now stipulated and agreed that if not otherwise adjourned by appellant or by the administrative Law Judge for good cause shown stare defendants will hold a fair hearing for named plaintiff Feldman on Monday June 26, 2006 and will issue a DAFH within 8 business days after such fair hearing is held; and defendant Eggleston will implement the DAFH within 4 days thereafter. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 6/26/06) (js, ) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Richard J. Holwell. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (laq, ) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2006 (jeh, ). (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2006 (jeh, ). (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2006 (jeh, ). (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(laq, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2006 (jeh, ). (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Verna Eggleston, Robert Doar, Antonia C. Novello. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number not ind)Document filed by Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Alla Shakhnes, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Mikhail Feldman, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Fei Mock, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Boris Shakhnes(by his next friend Sha-Sha Willis, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(laq, ) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 369 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?