Herrera v. 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-12139
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 3, 2019 at 9:59 AM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo U-Leonardo Herrera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Dubanevich +1 212 267 3700 wdubanevich@napolibern.com
v.
No Logo 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 233 Broadway Owners, LLC, Defendant
No Logo 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo 7 World Trade Company, L.P., Defendant
No Logo 90 Church Street Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Abscope Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bankers Trust Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Battery Park City Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Rita Cohen +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 cohenj@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Construction, Inc., Defendant
Bechtel Corporation Bechtel Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Boston Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo BT Private Clients Corp., Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Clayton Environmental Consultants, Defendant
No Logo Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo DB Private Clients Corporation, Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Deutsche Bank Trust Company, Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Defendant
Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Defendant
No Logo Diego Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterprise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp., Defendant
No Logo Envirotech Clean Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo ET Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Defendant
No Logo Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo F & G Mechanical, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo H.P. Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service, Inc., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc. Liberty Mutual Insurance Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Liberty Mutual Group"
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Manafort Brothers Incorporated"
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Meridian Construction Corp., Defendant
Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc. Merrill Lynch & Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Judith Rita Cohen +1 212 277 6500 +1 212 277 6501 cohenj@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Milro Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Moretrench American Corp., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New York Crane & Equipment Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Nomura Holding America, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy Marie Ferraro +1 212 931 8319 +1 212 931 8319 kferraro@sralawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard F. Strongin +1 212 931 8300 +1 212 931 8319 hstrongin@sralawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Suzanne Taylor +1 212 931 8305 +1 212 931 8319 jtaylor@sralawfirm.com
No Logo Nomura Securities International, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Nomura Holdings, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Strongin Rothman & Abrams, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristy Marie Ferraro +1 212 931 8319 +1 212 931 8319 kferraro@sralawfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard F. Strongin +1 212 931 8300 +1 212 931 8319 hstrongin@sralawfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jill Suzanne Taylor +1 212 931 8305 +1 212 931 8319 jtaylor@sralawfirm.com
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Services, Llc, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rober Silman Associates, Defendant
No Logo Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rodar Enterprises, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM, Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contracting Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Development Corp., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Defendant
No Logo Silverstein Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo Structure Tone Global Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Syska and Hennessy, Defendant
No Logo Tellabs Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
Tishman Speyer Properties Tishman Speyer Properties, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Co Inc, Defendant
No Logo Tully Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Tully Environmental Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tully Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Turner Construction Co., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates L.L.P., Defendant
No Logo W HARRIS & SONS INC, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo William F. Collins Architects, Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., Defendant
No Logo World Trade Center Properties LLC, Defendant
No Logo WSP Cantor Seinuk, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Defendant
No Logo Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., Defendant
No Logo HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC, ADR Provider

Represented by Robinson & Yablon, P.C

Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (38) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/25/2018, Entered: None Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, that the firm of Dickstein Shapiro LLP, 1633 Broadway, New York, New York, 10019 be substituted as counsel of record for defendant Battery Park City Authority in the cases set forth on Schedule A hereto (with respect to the claims therein involving Two World Financial Center (225 Liberty Street) and/or Four World Financial Center (250 Vesey Street)), in place and stead of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP. Relates to All Cases Listed in Schedule A. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/3/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 05/06/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Howard F. Strongin on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc. (Strongin, Howard) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristy Marie Ferraro on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc. (Ferraro, Kristy) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc..(Taylor, Jill) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Suzanne Taylor on behalf of Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc. (Taylor, Jill) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/22/2010, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Nomura Securities International, Inc., Nomura Holding America, Inc.. (Taylor, Jill) (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION OF DISCONTINUANCE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO ABSCOPE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. This order relates to: Cases listed in Exhibit A. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED, CONSENTED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-titled action, that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of the action, the above entitled action be, and the same hereby is discontinued without prejudice as against defendant ABSCOPE ENVIRONMENTAL INC. only, without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/27/10) (rjm) (Entered: 02/09/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Syska and Hennessy. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/7/2009, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Judith Rita Cohen on behalf of Merrill Lynch & Co., Inc. (Cohen, Judith) (Entered: 08/07/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2009, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by William F. Collins Architects. (Pollack, David) (Entered: 07/29/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                              FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC. (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Tellabs Operations Inc.. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Salvatore J. Calabrese on behalf of HILLMANN ENVIRONMENTAL GROUP, LLC (Calabrese, Salvatore) (Entered: 04/10/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Abscope Environmental, Inc.. (Gallagher, Timothy) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by and between the undersigned, that the firm of Faust Goetz, Two Rector Street, New York, New York 10006 be substituted as counsel of record for defendant Battery Park City Authority in the cases set forth on Schedule A hereto (with Respect to the claims therein involving One World Financial Center (200 Liberty Street) in place and stead of Wilson, Elser, Moskowiu, Edelman & Dicker LLP. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/10/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/16/2009, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Envirotech Clean Air, Inc..(Harfenist, Steven) (Entered: 03/16/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Milro Associates, Inc.. (Gannon, Christian) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Ann Taylor Stores Corporation. (Joyce, William) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/18/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the actions listed in "Schedule A" and "Schedule B" attached hereto, that whereas no part herein is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed or conservatee and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, and based on the representation of the within Defendant, and to the extent Plaintiff(s) can so stipulate, that each claim, cross-claim and counter-claim asserted by and against Defendant NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF SMALL BUSINESS SERVICES ("DSBS'), only as to the claims being made as to the premises located at 345 Chambers St. (Stuyvesant High School), New York, New York, shall be and are hereby discontinued without prejudice and without costs to any party as against the other. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that should evidence be discovered throughout this litigation which determines that the NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF SMALL BUSINESS SERVICES is a proper entity to this suit, that Plaintiff(s) may reinstitute the actions listed herein without regard to the applicable Statute of Limitations, assuming said original action was timely commenced, and in such instance Defendant shall not assert Statute of Limitation as a defense. This Stipulation maybe filed without notice with the Clerk of the Court. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/17/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 02/20/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for plaintiff and defendant Catamount Environmental, Inc., that whereas no party hereto is an infant, incompetent person for whom a committee has been appointed, and no person not a party has an interest in the subject matter of this action, that the above action, be and same is hereby withdrawn and discontinued without prejudice against defendant CATAMOUNT ENVIRONMENTAL, INC. only, and without costs to either party as against the other. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, that should facts or circumstances derived from future discovery indicate a relationship to the litigation and a basis of a claim against the defendant for whom this Stipulation is being entered and/or should it come to light that the information provided by said defendant in support of its request of discontinuance be discerned in the future to have been inaccurate, false or misleading, plaintiff may re-assert its claim against said defendant by motion, stipulation or otherwise, and without the necessity of additional service of process, an in no event will said defendant raise any statute of limitations defense other than as may have been asserted based upon the date of filing of the original action, at the time that the action was originally commenced against said defendant. This Stipulation may be filed without further notice with the Clerk of the Court and defendant will obtain, if necessary, any Judicial "So Order" of this Stipulation and any other Signatory, if necessary. A facsimile copy of this Stipulation shall be effective as original signatures. This order relates to: 06-07366, 06-12731, 06-12139, 07-01659, 07-04424, 04-09081, 08-6639, 07-01492, 07-01535, 07-04490. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/13/09) (rjm) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Vollmer Associates L.L.P. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Weeks Marine, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; A Russo Wrecking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; AMEC Construction Management, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Bechtel Construction, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Bechtel Environmental, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Breeze Carting Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Breeze National, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Brer-Four Transportation Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; C.B. Contracting Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Canron Construction Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Cord Contracting Co., Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Diamond Point Excavating Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Diego Construction, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Diversified Carting, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; EJ Davies, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; En-Tech Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC) served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Ewell W. Finley, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Executive Medical Services, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Fleet Trucking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; FTI Trucking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Hallen Welding Service, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; H.P. Environmental served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Koch Skanska, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Laquila Construction, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; LaStrada General Contracting Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Lucius Pitkin, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Manafort Brothers Incorporated served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Nicholson Construction Company served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Plaza Construction Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Pro Safety Services, L.L.C. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Rober Silman Associates served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Robert L. Gerosa, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Royal GM, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Safeway Environmental Corp. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006; Silverite Contracting Corporation served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by Tara Saybe. Document filed by U-Leonardo Herrera. (Rubin, Denise) (Entered: 12/06/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,,,,,,,,,,. Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc. served on 11/27/2006, answer due 12/17/2006. Service was accepted by Kristen M. Hackford. Document filed by U-Leonardo Herrera. (LoPalo, Christopher) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Battery Park City Authority. (Flannery, John) (Entered: 10/13/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Ann Taylor Stores Corporation. (Joyce, William) (Entered: 10/10/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Clayton Environmental Consultants. (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie) (Entered: 10/05/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abbie Lynn Eliasberg Fuchs on behalf of Clayton Environmental Consultants (Eliasberg Fuchs, Abbie) (Entered: 10/05/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - NOTICE of Adoption of Answer to Master Complaint. Document filed by 233 Broadway Owners, LLC. (Herrmann, Margaret) Modified on 9/23/2008 (db). (Entered: 09/22/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Corporation, Bankers Trust Corporation. (Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Deutsche Bank Trust Company. (Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by DB Private Clients Corporation, BT Private Clients Corp.. (Haglund, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      FIRST NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by 90 Church Street Limited Partnership, Boston Properties, Inc.. (Leff, Richard) (Entered: 09/15/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Structure Tone Global Services, Inc.. (Joyce, William) (Entered: 08/28/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Stella, Frances) (Entered: 08/20/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            COMPLAINT against Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC MGMT Co., L.L.C., Silverstein WTC Properties, L.L.C., Silverstein WTC, L.L.C., Simpson Gumpertz & Heger, Inc., Skidmore, Owing & Merrill, L.L.P., Survivair, Tishman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Tishman Interiors Corporation, 5 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Tishman Speyer Properties, Thorton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc., Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C., Tucci Equipment Rental Corp., Tully Construction Co., Inc., Tully Construction Company, Tully Environmental, Inc., Tully Industries, Inc., Turner Construction Co., 5 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Turner Construction Company, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling (Joint Venture), Verizon New York, Inc., Vollmer Associates L.L.P., W Harris & Sons Inc., Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates, Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting, Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 7 World Trade Company, L.P., WSP Cantor Seinuk, Yannuzzi & Sons, Inc., Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, L.L.C., Ziegenfuss Drilling, Inc., A Russo Wrecking, Inc., ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Amec Earth & Environmental, Inc., Anthony Cortese Specialized Hauling, L.L.C., Atlantic Heydt Corp., Bechtel Associates Professional Corporation, Bechtel Construction, Inc., Bechtel Corporation, Bechtel Environmental, Inc., Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp., Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Bovis Lend Lease, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Breeze National, Inc., Breeze Carting Corp., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp., Canron Construction Corp., Consolidated Edison Company of New York, Inc., Cord Contracting Co., Inc., Craig Test Boring Company, Inc., Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp., Diego Construction, Inc., Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterprise, Inc., D'Onofrio General Contractors Corp., Eagle Leasing & Industrial Supply, Inc., Eagle One Roofing Contractors, Inc., Eagle Scaffolding Co., Inc., 1 World Trade Center, L.L.C., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp., ET Environmental, Evergreen Recycling of Corona (EROC), Ewell W. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., F & G Mechanical, Inc., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Francis A. Lee Exterior Restoration, Inc., FTI Trucking, Inc., 1 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Gilsanz, Murray & Steficek, L.L.P., Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, P.L.L.C., Hallen Welding Service, Inc., H.P. Environmental, Koch Skanska, Inc., Laquila Construction, Inc., LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Liberty Mutual Group, Lockwood, Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Lucius Pitkin, Inc., LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Incorporated, Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Meridian Construction Corp., Moretrench American Corp., MRA Engineering, P.C., Mueser Rutledge Consulting Engineers, Inc., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, New York Crane & Equipment Corp., 2 WTC Holdings, L.L.C., Nicholson Construction Company, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Services, L.L.C., PT & L Contracting Corp., Regional Scaffolding & Hoisting Co., Inc., Rober Silman Associates, Robert L. Gerosa, Inc., Rodar Enterprises, Inc., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., Royal GM, Inc., SAB Trucking, Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp., Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Silverite Contracting Corporation, Silverstein Development Corp., Silverstein Properties, Inc., Silverstein Properties, Silverstein WTC Facility Manager, L.L.C., 4 WTC Holdings, L.L.C.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 589528) Document filed by U-Leonardo Herrera (Automated User) (Entered: 09/14/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                              Statistics

                                                                              This case has been viewed 290 times.

                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                              Space
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                               
                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                              Need Password Help?