Wells Fargo & Co. v. CitiGroup, Inc.

Federal Court Proceeding New York Southern District Court, Case No. Unknown
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 5:34 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Wells Fargo & Co."
Officer/Director, NORWEST CORP
Officer/Director, Day Runner, Inc.
Officer/Director, Yucca Uranium Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Represented by Buckley Sandler LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew William Schilling +1 212 637 2796 +1 212 637 2730 aschilling@buckleysandler.com

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew William Goldwater +1 212 833 1106 +1 212 833 1250 agoldwater@fklaw.com
Space Bruce Stephen Kaplan +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 bkaplan@fklaw.com
Space Eric Jonathan Seiler +1 212 833 1103 +1 212 373 7903 eseiler@fklaw.com
v.
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Scholastic Corporation Officer/Director, Scholastic Corporation
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp

Represented by Gregory P Joseph Law Offices LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael B. Sloan +1 212 407 1254 +1 212 885 8754 msloan@josephnyc.com

Represented by Joseph Hage Aaronson LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul J. Bschorr +2 120 407 1248 +1 212 407 1272 pbschorr@jhany.com
Space Rachel Mead Cherington +1 212 407 1200 +1 212 407 1299 rcherington@jhany.com
Space Samuel Neil Fraidin +1 212 407 1200 +1 212 407 1299 sfraidin@jhany.com
Space Pamela H. Jarvis +1 212 407 1250 +1 212 407 1278 pjarvis@jhany.com
Space Gregory P. Joseph +1 212 407 1210 +1 212 407 1299 gjoseph@jhany.com
Space Sandra M. Lipsman +1 212 407 1220 +1 212 407 1281 slipsman@jhany.com
Space Douglas J. Pepe +1 212 407 1284 dpepe@jhany.com
Space Jeffrey Harrison Zaiger +1 212 407 1208 +1 212 407 1274 jzaiger@jhany.com

Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Russel Fleming, Jr. +1 212 407 1228 +1 212 885 8728 jamesrflemingjr@gmail.com

Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Adam Engelmayer +1 212 230 8820 +1 212 230 8888 paul.engelmayer@wilmerhale.com
Space David Sapir Lesser +1 212 230 8851 +1 212 230 8888 david.lesser@wilmerhale.com
Space Noah Adam Levine +1 212 230 8875 +1 212 230 8888 noah.levine@wilmerhale.com
Space Christopher Robin Lipsett +1 212 230 8880 +1 212 230 8888 clipsett@wilmerhale.com
Space Randolph Daniel Moss +1 202 663 6000 +1 202 663 6363 randolph.moss@wilmerhale.com
Space Peter Gillies Neiman +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2239 Peter.Neiman@wilmerhale.com
Space Charles Collier Platt +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Charles.Platt@wilmerhale.com
Space Peter Kristian Vigeland +1 212 230 8800 +1 212 230 8888 Peter.Vigeland@wilmer.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 39 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED that the above-captioned action be and the same is hereby discontinued with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/19/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER; Status Conference adjourned for 6/10/2010 at 04:30 PM before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 5/3/2010) (tve) Modified on 5/17/2010 (tve). (Entered: 05/03/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION AN EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/09) (cd) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Mr. Attorney General from Judge Shira A. Scheindlin dated 7/13/09 re: Pursuant to section 2403(a) of title 28 U.S.C., this Court hereby certifies to the Attorney General the fact that the constitutionality of an Act of Congress affecting the public interest has been drawn into question in litigation before this Court. Attached please find the notice required to be filed by Citigroup, Inc., the defendant in both actions, describing the constitutional question. Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 5.1, the Attorney General may intervene within 60 days from the date of notice. Because the notice was submitted to you on 3/10/09, the 60 day period has expired. Nevertheless, please let me know whether you wish to intervene, and if so, by what date you will be able to do so. (tro) (Entered: 07/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Eric H. Holder Jr. from Judge Shira A. Scheindlin dated 7/13/09 re: that pursuant to section 2403(a) of title 28 of the United States Code, this Court hereby certifies to the Attorney General the fact that the constitutionality of an Act of Congress affecting the public interest has been drawn into question in litigation before this Court. Attached please find the notice required to be filed by Citigroup Inc., the defendant in both actions, describing the constitutional question. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1, the Attorney General may intervene within 60 days from the date of notice. Because the notice was submitted to you on March 10, 2009, the 60-day period has expired. Nevertheless, please let me know whether you wish to intervene, and if so, by what date you will be able to do so. (pl) (Entered: 07/14/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) on March 9, 2009, Citigroup Inc. ("Citigroup") shall submit a pre-motion letter to Chambers with respect to its motion to dismiss Wachovia Corporation v.Citigroup Inc., No 08 Civ. 8503 (SAS) (the "Wachovia Action") and Wells Fargo & Co. v. Citigroup Inc., No. 08 Civ. 8716 (SAS) (the "Wells Fargo Action") for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and related issues; on March 13, 2009, Wells Fargo & Co. ("Wells Fargo") and Wachovia Corporation ("Wachovia") shall submit to Chambers their letter in response to Citigroup's pre-motion letter; on March 11, 2009 at 3:00 p.m., the Court shall entertain argument on Citigroup's motion to remand Citigroup Inc. v. Wachovia Corporation, et al., No. 08 Civ. 8668 (SAS); on March 17, 2009 at 11 :00 a.m., the Court shall hold a pre-motion conference with respect to Citigroup's motions to dismiss the Wachovia and Wells Fargo Actions; on April 15, 2009. Citigroup shall file its motions to dismiss the Wachovia and Wells Fargo Actions; on May 15, 2009, Wachovia and Wells Fargo shall file their oppositions to such motions; on May 29, 2009, Citigroup shall file any replies in further support of such motions; on April 17, 2009, the parties shall file Initial Disclosures pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(I); and on May 8, 2009, the parties shall serve initial document requests. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/9/09) (pl) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 5.1 Notice of Possible Constitutional Question served on Eric H. Holder, Jr., U.S. Attorney General on March 10, 2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc.. (Fleming, James) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE of Possible Constitutional Question (Rule 5.1). Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc.. (Fleming, James) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Russel Fleming, Jr on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Fleming, James) (Entered: 03/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by the undersigned counsel, subject to Court approval, that the pretrial conference currently scheduled for February 23, 2009 shall be adjourned to March 4, 2009 at 4:30 p.m. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/10/09) (js) (Entered: 02/10/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:... Initial Conference set for 2/23/2009 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 15C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/2/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 02/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Judge Lewis A. Kaplan is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 01/16/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint [docket item 19] is denied as moot in light of the filing of an amended complaint. This is without prejudice to any motion defendant may make with respect to the amended complaint. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/16/08) (mme) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc.. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo & Co..(Engelmayer, Paul) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 25 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against CitiGroup, Inc.. Document filed by Wells Fargo & Co. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Wells Fargo & Co. (dle) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Sapir Lesser on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Lesser, David) (Entered: 10/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jmi) (Entered: 10/22/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/17/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Randolph Daniel Moss on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Moss, Randolph) (Entered: 10/17/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Peter K. Vigeland in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Engelmayer, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 19 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc.. (Engelmayer, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc..(Engelmayer, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Barry Sloan on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Sloan, Michael) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Harrison Zaiger on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Zaiger, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rachel Mead Cherington on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Cherington, Rachel) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Neil Fraidin on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Fraidin, Samuel) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sandra M. Lipsman on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Lipsman, Sandra) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul J. Bschorr on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Bschorr, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Pamela H. Jarvis on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Jarvis, Pamela) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas J. Pepe on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Pepe, Douglas) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Joseph, Gregory) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CitiGroup, Inc..(Engelmayer, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Gillies Neiman on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Neiman, Peter) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Adam Levine on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Levine, Noah) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Robin Lipsett on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Lipsett, Christopher) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Kristian Vigeland on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Vigeland, Peter) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Charles C. Platt on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Platt, Charles) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Adam Engelmayer on behalf of CitiGroup, Inc. (Engelmayer, Paul) (Entered: 10/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wells Fargo & Co.(laq) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against CitiGroup, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 665430)Document filed by Wells Fargo & Co.(laq) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 151 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?