Scheiner et al v. Bloomberg et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-09072
District Judge Sidney H. Stein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Brandi Dawn Scheiner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brandi Dawn Scheiner

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Dan Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Dan Smith

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Eleanor Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andre Kydala, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Gloria Chavez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gloria Chavez

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Jane Levine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andre Kydala, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Joann Hart, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joann Hart

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Josephina Cruz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Josephina Cruz

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Julianne Polito, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Andre Kydala, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Michael Ebewo, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Ebewo

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
No Logo Thomasina Robinson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomasina Robinson

Toggle Switch Pro Se

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/20/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Davis Fagan +1 646 378 2225 +1 646 417 5558 foo@500pearl.com
v.
No Logo Alan J. Gerson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Albert Vann, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Annabel Palma, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Como, Defendant
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill de Blasio"
No Logo Charles Barron, Defendant
No Logo Christine C. Quinn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Council of the City of New York, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "Council of the City of New York"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Daniel R. Garodnick, Defendant
No Logo Darlene Mealy, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo David I. Weprin, Defendant
No Logo Diana Reyna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Domenic M. Recchia, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Eric N. Gioia, Defendant
No Logo Erik Martin Dilan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Office of the New York Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "G. Oliver Koppell"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Gail A. Brewer, Defendant
No Logo Helen D. Foster, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Helen Sears, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Hiram Monserrate, Defendant
No Logo Inez E. Dickens, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo James B. Sanders, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo James F. Gennaro, Defendant
No Logo James S. Oddo, Defendant
No Logo James Vacca, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Jessica S. Lappin, Defendant
No Logo Joel Rivera, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo John C. Liu, Defendant
No Logo Joseph P. Addabbo, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Kendall Stewart, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Larry B. Seabrook, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Leroy G. Comrie, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo James, Letitia, Defendant
Officially listed as "Letitia James"
No Logo Lewis Fidler, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Maria Baez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Maria Del Carmen Arroyo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Mathieu Eugene, Defendant
No Logo Melinda R. Katz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Melissa Mark-Viverito, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo MICHAEL E. MCMAHON, Defendant
No Logo Michael, Nelson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo MIGUEL MARTINEZ, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Peter F. Vallone, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Robert, Jackson &., Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert Jackson"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Rosie Mendez, Defendant
No Logo Sara M. Gonzalez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Simcha Felder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
No Logo Tony Avella, Defendant
No Logo Vincent Ignicio, Defendant
No Logo Vincent J. Gentile, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 17, 2009, defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint is granted. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 3/18/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Edward D. Fagan, former attorney far the plaintiffs in this action, is directed to immediately send a copy of the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 17, 2009, to each of his former clients, all plaintiffs in this action. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/09) (js) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER #97233 re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Erik Martin Dilan, Peter F. Vallone, Jr., Diana Reyna, G. Oliver Koppell, Helen D. Foster, Simcha Felder, Darlene Mealy, Domenic M. Recchia, Jr., Melinda R. Katz, Leroy G. Comrie, Jr., Alan J. Gerson, Lewis Fidler, Michael Nelson, James B. Sanders, Jr., Miguel Martinez, Inez E. Dickens, Kendall Stewart, James Vacca, Larry B. Seabrook, Council of the City of New York, Maria Del Carmen Arroyo, Michael Bloomberg, Maria Baez, Robert Jackson, Joel Rivera, Albert Vann, Helen Sears, Sara M. Gonzalez, Christine C. Quinn. Because plaintiffs' "oath of office" claim is not actionable and plaintiffs' "civil rights" claim fails to articulate any constitutional violation, defendants' motion to dismiss the complaint is granted. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 3/17/09) (tro) Modified on 3/18/2009 (mro). (Entered: 03/17/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Stephen Kitzinger dated 2/6/2009 re: Defendant's respectfully request that the Court adjourn the conference to a date convenient to the Court and parties. ENDORSEMENT: The conference remains at 2/27 at 12 Noon; another asst corp. counsel can attend. The purpose of the conference is to have new counsel appear for plaintiffs and to determine if plaintiff wish to pursue this action or have it dismissed. Mr Fagan is directed to forward this order to plaintiff. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 2/9/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 02/09/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Plaintiffs' attorney, Edward D. Fagan, having been stricken by Order dated January 15, 2009, from the roll of attorneys admitted to this Court, plaintiffs shall have 30 days in which to be represented by new counselor shall appear pro se. A pretrial conference shall take place on February 27, 2009, at 12:00 p.m. SO ORDERED( Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2009 at 12:00 PM before Judge Sidney H. Stein.) (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 1/17/2009) (jmi) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Plaintiffs must file an opposition by December 12, 2008. Failure to do so will result in either a dismissal of this action pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) or a determination of the motion on the existing papers. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 12/10/08) (mme) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge Stein from Stephen Kitzinger dated 10/23/08 re: defendants request that the Court deny any and all requests for interim injunctive relief that are sought prior to the Term Limits bill becoming effective, without scheduling a hearing. Document filed by Council of the City of New York, Michael Bloomberg(individually).(djc) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Sidney H. Stein from Edward D. Fagan dated 11/7/2008 re: Counsel writes to propose the Court enter an Order adjourning the present briefing schedule as relate to the individually named Defendant Counsel Members Plaintiffs so that their responsive pleadings and/or Motions to Dismiss are not due until after the Court has ruled on the Motion to be filed by Defendants Bloomberg, NYC and NYC Council. ENDORSEMENT: Request denied. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 11/7/2008) (tve) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint.. Document filed by Council of the City of New York, Michael Bloomberg(individually), Michael Bloomberg(as Mayor of the City of New York), Christine C. Quinn(individually), Christine C. Quinn(New York City Council, and as Speaker of New York City Council), Maria Del Carmen Arroyo, Maria Baez, Leroy G. Comrie, Jr, Inez E. Dickens, Erik Martin Dilan, Simcha Felder, Lewis Fidler, Helen D. Foster, Alan J. Gerson, Sara M. Gonzalez, Robert Jackson, Melinda R. Katz, G. Oliver Koppell, Miguel Martinez, Darlene Mealy, Michael Nelson, Domenic M. Recchia, Jr, Diana Reyna, Joel Rivera, James B. Sanders, Jr, Larry B. Seabrook, Helen Sears, Kendall Stewart, James Vacca, Peter F. Vallone, Jr, Albert Vann. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                    MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Document filed by Council of the City of New York, Michael Bloomberg(individually), Michael Bloomberg(as Mayor of the City of New York), Christine C. Quinn(individually), Christine C. Quinn(New York City Council, and as Speaker of New York City Council), Maria Del Carmen Arroyo, Maria Baez, Leroy G. Comrie, Jr, Inez E. Dickens, Erik Martin Dilan, Simcha Felder, Lewis Fidler, Helen D. Foster, Alan J. Gerson, Sara M. Gonzalez, Robert Jackson, Melinda R. Katz, G. Oliver Koppell, Miguel Martinez, Darlene Mealy, Michael Nelson, Domenic M. Recchia, Jr, Diana Reyna, Joel Rivera, James B. Sanders, Jr, Larry B. Seabrook, Helen Sears, Kendall Stewart, James Vacca, Peter F. Vallone, Jr, Albert Vann. Responses due by 12/8/2008(Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of Christine C. Quinn(individually), Christine C. Quinn(New York City Council, and as Speaker of New York City Council), Maria Del Carmen Arroyo, Maria Baez, Leroy G. Comrie, Jr, Inez E. Dickens, Erik Martin Dilan, Simcha Felder, Lewis Fidler, Helen D. Foster, Alan J. Gerson, Sara M. Gonzalez, Robert Jackson, Melinda R. Katz, G. Oliver Koppell, Miguel Martinez, Darlene Mealy, Michael Nelson, Domenic M. Recchia, Jr, Diana Reyna, Joel Rivera, James B. Sanders, Jr, Larry B. Seabrook, Helen Sears, Kendall Stewart, James Vacca, Peter F. Vallone, Jr, Albert Vann (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                        LETTER addressed to Judge Stein from Edward D. Fagan dated 2/24/08 re: counsel requests an expedited Rule 16 conference at its earliest convenience next week, at which Conference plaintiffs' above requests for Immediate Entry of an Evidence Preservation and Production Order, Entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order and other relief can be addressed and considered. Document filed by Eleanor Johnson, Jane Levine, Julianne Polito, Thomasina Robinson, Dan Smith, Brandi Dawn Scheiner, Gloria Chavez, Josephina Cruz, Michael Ebewo, Joann Hart.(djc) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                          LETTER addressed to Judge Stein from Edward D. Fagan dated 10/24/08 re: counsel requests that the Court direct Mr. Kitzinger to appear at a date and time convenient for the court as early as possible next week to address Plaintiffs' requests for Immediate Entry of an Evidence Preservation and Production Order, Entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order and the other relief outlined in Plaintiffs' Oct. 24th letter. Document filed by Eleanor Johnson, Jane Levine, Julianne Polito, Thomasina Robinson, Dan Smith, Brandi Dawn Scheiner, Gloria Chavez, Josephina Cruz, Michael Ebewo, Joann Hart.(djc) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: It is hereby ordered that: 1. The following defendants are dismissed without prejudice as agreed to on the record today by plaintiffs: Joseph P. Addabbo, Jr. Tony Avella, Charles Barron, Gale A. Brewer, Anthony Como, Bill de Blasio, Mathieu Eugene, Daniel R. Garodnick,James F. Gennaro Vincent J. Gentile, Eric N. Gioia, Vincent Ignizio, Letitia James S.Lappin John C. Liu, Melissa Mark-Viverito, Michael E. McMahon, Rosie Mendez, Hiram Monserrate, James S. Oddo, Annabel Palma, David I. Weprin. 2. The last day for defendants to move to dismiss the complaint is November 7,2008; 3. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion to dismiss is due on or before December 8, 2008; 4. Defendants' reply to the motion is due on or before December 22, 2008; and 5. Discovery is stayed pending the Court's decision on the motion to dismiss. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/31/08) (js) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on All Named Defendants on 10/23/08 and 10/31/08. Service was accepted by Alvin L. Bragg, Chief of Litigation & Investigations NYC Council. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/29/2008, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of Council of the City of New York, Michael Bloomberg(individually), Michael Bloomberg(as Mayor of the City of New York) (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/31/2008 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Sidney H. Stein. (Signed by Judge Sidney H. Stein on 10/27/2008) (jfe) (Entered: 10/27/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Bill de Blasio served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Kendall Stewart served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; James Vacca served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Peter F. Vallone, Jr served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Albert Vann served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; David I. Weprin served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Larry B. Seabrook served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Helen Sears served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. James B. Sanders, Jr served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Christine C. Quinn(individually) served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Christine C. Quinn(New York City Council, and as Speaker of New York City Council) served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Domenic M. Recchia, Jr served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Diana Reyna served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Joel Rivera served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Melissa Mark-Viverito served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Miguel Martinez served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Michael E. McMahon served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Darlene Mealy served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Rosie Mendez served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Hiram Monserrate served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Michael Nelson served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; James S. Oddo served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Annabel Palma served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Melinda R. Katz served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; G. Oliver Koppell served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Jessica S. Lappin served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Vincent Ignicio served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Robert Jackson served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Letitia James served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                  ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Mathieu Eugene served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Simcha Felder served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Lewis Fidler served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Helen D. Foster served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Daniel R. Garodnick served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; James F. Gennaro served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Vincent J. Gentile served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Alan J. Gerson served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Eric N. Gioia served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Sara M. Gonzalez served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Maria Del Carmen Arroyo served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Inez E. Dickens served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Erik Martin Dilan served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                      ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Anthony Como served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Leroy G. Comrie, Jr served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE. Michael Bloomberg(individually) served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Michael Bloomberg(as Mayor of the City of New York) served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Joseph P. Addabbo, Jr served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Tony Avella served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Maria Baez served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Charles Barron served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008; Gail A. Brewer served on 10/23/2008, answer due 11/12/2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint served on Defendants Michael Bloomberg, NYC Council, Christine Quinn, Joseph P. Addabbo Jr., Maria del Carmen Arroyo, Tony Avella, Maria Baez, Charles Barron, Gail A. Brewer, Anthony Como, Leroy G. Comrie Jr., Bill deBlasio, Inez E. Dickens, Erik Martin Dilan, Mathieu Eugene, Simcha Felder, Lewis Fidler, Helen D. Foster, Daniel R. Garodnick, James F. Gennaro, Vincent J. Gentile, Alan J. Gerson, Eric N. Gioia, Sara M. Gonzalez, Vincent Ignicio, Robert Jackson, Letitia James, Melinda R. Katz, G. Oliver Koppell, Jessica Lappin, John C. Liu, Melissa Mark-Viverito, Miguel Martinez, Michael E. McMahon, Darlene Mealy, Rosie Mendez, Hiram Monserrate, Michael Nelson, James S. Oddo, Annabel Palma, Dominic M. Recchia Jr., Diana Reyna, Joel Rivera, James B. Sanders Jr., Larry B. Seabrook, Helen Sears, Kendall Stewart, James Vacca, Peter F. Vallone Jr., Albert Vann, David I. Weprin, Thomas White Jr. and David Yassky on October 23, 2008. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent at Office of Corporation Counsel. Document filed by Brandi Dawn Scheiner. (Fagan, Edward) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                            COMPLAINT against Michael Bloomberg(individually), Michael Bloomberg(as Mayor of the City of New York), Christine C. Quinn(individually), Christine C. Quinn(New York City Council, and as Speaker of New York City Council), Joseph P. Addabbo, Jr, Maria Del Carmen Arroyo, Tony Avella, Maria Baez, Charles Barron, Gail A. Brewer, Anthony Como, Leroy G. Comrie, Jr, Bill de Blasio, Inez E. Dickens, Erik Martin Dilan, Mathieu Eugene, Simcha Felder, Lewis Fidler, Helen D. Foster, Daniel R. Garodnick, James F. Gennaro, Vincent J. Gentile, Alan J. Gerson, Eric N. Gioia, Sara M. Gonzalez, Vincent Ignicio, Robert Jackson, Letitia James, Melinda R. Katz, G. Oliver Koppell, Jessica S. Lappin, John C. Liu, Melissa Mark-Viverito, Miguel Martinez, Michael E. McMahon, Darlene Mealy, Rosie Mendez, Hiram Monserrate, Michael Nelson, James S. Oddo, Annabel Palma, Domenic M. Recchia, Jr, Diana Reyna, Joel Rivera, James B. Sanders, Jr, Larry B. Seabrook, Helen Sears, Kendall Stewart, James Vacca, Peter F. Vallone, Jr, Albert Vann, David I. Weprin. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 666990)Document filed by Eleanor Johnson, Jane Levine, Julianne Polito, Thomasina Robinson, Dan Smith, Brandi Dawn Scheiner, Gloria Chavez, Josephina Cruz, Michael Ebewo, Joann Hart.(mbe) (Entered: 10/23/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?