Doss, Inc. et al v. Christies Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-10577
District Judge Loretta A. Preska, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Doss, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Allen Altman +1 917 353 4077 +1 917 453 1006 altmanlaw@earthlink.net
No Logo Yoon Young IM, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Allen Altman +1 917 353 4077 +1 917 453 1006 altmanlaw@earthlink.net
v.
No Logo Christie's Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Andrews & Kurth, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Anthony Patella +1 212 850 2839 +1 212 850 2929 jpatella@akllp.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/16/2010, Entered: 2/17/2010 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL from 19 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 20 Clerk's Judgment, 26 Order on Motion to Alter Judgment,. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM. (nd) (Entered: 02/17/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: 1/20/2010 Order on Motion to Alter JudgmentCourt Filing
    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 21 Motion to Alter Judgment. ENDORSEMENT: The motion is denied. Plaintiff's have not sufficiently pleaded any basis for relief from the statue if limitations. The proposed amendment would be futile. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/19/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: 10/30/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 20 Clerk's Judgment,.. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM. (Altman, Richard) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/23/2009, Entered: 10/23/2009 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 20 Clerk's Judgment,. and for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Document filed by Christies Inc.. (Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 10/23/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 20 Clerk's Judgment,. and for leave to amend complaint. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM. (Altman, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 Declaration in Support of Motion
            DECLARATION of Richard A. Altman in Support re: 21 MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 20 Clerk's Judgment,.. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Court decision, # 2 Exhibit Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit A to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit B to Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit C to Amended Complaint, # 7 Exhibit D to Amended Complaint)(Altman, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/8/2009, Entered: 10/8/2009 ~Motion to Alter Judgment
              MOTION to Alter Judgment re: 20 Clerk's Judgment,. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM.(Altman, Richard) (Entered: 10/08/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Clerks Judgment
                CLERK'S JUDGMENT That for the reasons stated in the Court's Memorandum and Order dated September 22, 2009, defendant's motion to dismiss is granted; accordingly, the case is closed and all pending motions denied as moot. (Signed by J. Michael McMahon, clerk on 9/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 09/24/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: 9/23/2009 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                  MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendant's motion to dismiss [dkt. no. 10] is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall mark this action closed and all pending motions DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/22/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: 4/3/2009 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Christies Inc.. (Porsch, Cassandra) (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM. (Altman, Richard) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/23/2009, Entered: 3/23/2009 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                        DECLARATION of Richard A. Altman in Opposition re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Rosenberg Documents)(Altman, Richard) (Entered: 03/23/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: 3/6/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard A. Altman dated 3/6/2009 re: Counsel writes to request a second two-week extension of time to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint until March 23, with defendant's reply papers due on April 3. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/6/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/23/2009, Entered: 2/23/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Richard A. Altman dated 2/19/09 re: Request for an extension of the opposition papers to the Motion to Dismiss until 3/9/09; with reply papers extended to 3/20/09. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint: (Responses due by 3/9/2009, Replies due by 3/20/2009.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/23/09) (db) (Entered: 02/23/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Certificate of Service Other
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Motion to Dismiss, Affidavit of Joseph A. Patella in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Memorandum of Law served on Richard A. Altman, Esq. on February 6, 2009. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Christies Inc.. (Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Christies Inc.. (Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Joseph A. Patella in Support re: 10 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Christies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to J. Patella Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit B to J. Patella Affidavit in Support)(Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Motion to Dismiss
                                    MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Christies Inc..(Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Christies Inc..(Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 02/06/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/2/2009, Entered: 2/2/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas R. Kline dated 1/26/09 re: counsel for defendant requests a one week extension of time to answer or respond to plaintiffs' complaint and the following schedule: defendant's answer or motion to dismiss by 2/6/09, plaintiffs' opposition by 2/23/09 and defendant's reply by 3/6/09. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 2/2/09) (dle) (Entered: 02/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/28/2009, Entered: 1/28/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas R. Kline dated 1/26/2009 re: Counsel for Defendant Christie's writes to request a one week extension of time to answer or respond to Plaintiff's complaint. The new schedule Defendant requests is as follows: Defendant's Answer or Motion to Dismiss: 2/6/2009; Plaintiffs' Opposition: 2/23/2009; Defendant's Reply: 3/6/2009. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/27/2009) (tve) (Entered: 01/28/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: 1/13/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Russell Kline on behalf of Christies Inc. (Kline, Thomas) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2009, Entered: 1/9/2009 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Anthony Patella on behalf of Christies Inc. (Patella, Joseph) (Entered: 01/09/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: 12/24/2008 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Thomas R. Kline dated 12/23/08 re: Counsel requests an extension to answer or respond to the complaint to Friday, January 30, 2009. If Defendant files a motion to dismiss Plaintiffs complaint, the parties have agreed to a briefing schedule for this motion subject to the Courts approval: Defendants Motion to Dismiss: January 30, 2009; Plaintiffs Opposition: February 16, 2009; Defendants Reply: February 27, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/08) (mme) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: 12/12/2008 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Christies Inc. served on 12/5/2008, answer due 12/29/2008. Service was accepted by Linda Henderson, Managing Agent. Document filed by Doss, Inc.; Yoon Young IM. (Altman, Richard) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM.(laq) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank 1 Filed: 12/5/2008, Entered: 12/10/2008 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT against Christies Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 671569)Document filed by Doss, Inc., Yoon Young IM.(laq) (ama). (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 3,256 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?