Kacperski et al v. 111 Wall Street LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-05233
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jadwiga Kacperski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert A. Grochow, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Allen Grochow +1 212 233 5400 +1 212 233 0919 rgrochow@aol.com
No Logo Zbigniew Kacperski, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robert A. Grochow, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Allen Grochow +1 212 233 5400 +1 212 233 0919 rgrochow@aol.com
v.
No Logo 111 Wall Street LLC, Defendant
No Logo 230 Central Co., Defendant
No Logo 55 Water Street Condominium, Defendant
No Logo A Russo Wrecking, Defendant
No Logo Abatement Professionals, Defendant
ABM Industries, Inc. ABM Industries, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by jeffreysamel.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothy Samel +1 212 587 9690 +1 212 587 9673 ds@jeffreysamel.com
No Logo ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bognar, Nadine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dorothy Samel +1 212 587 9690 +1 212 587 9673 jeffreysamel@gmail.com
No Logo Abscope Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alan Kasman DBS Kasco, Defendant
No Logo AMEC Construction Management, Inc., Defendant
No Logo AMEC Earth & Enviromental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Applied Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Heydt Corp, Defendant
No Logo Berkel & Company Contractors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp, Defendant
No Logo Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Breeze Carting Corp, Defendant
No Logo Breeze National Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Defendant
No Logo Bristol Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Financial Properties, LP, Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Partners, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Brookfield Properties Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.c., Defendant
No Logo C.B. Contracting Corp, Defendant
No Logo Canron Construction Corp, Defendant
No Logo Cantor Seinuk Group, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cantor Seinuk Group"
No Logo Catamount Environmental, Inc., Defendant
Citibank, NA Citibank, NA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Kemet Corporation
Officer/Director, STRATOS LIGHTWAVE, INC.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Citicorp Holdings, Inc.
Citigroup, Inc. Officer/Director, Citigroup, Inc.
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Citigroup, Inc. Citigroup, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Court Square Capital Ltd.
Officer/Director, Chippac, Inc.
Officer/Director, Amis Holdings, Inc.
Citibank, NA Officer/Director, Citibank, NA
Officer/Director, Keane, Inc.
Officer/Director, Macdermid Inc.
Officer/Director, Travelers Insurance Co
Officer/Director, CITICORP
Officer/Director, Imc Mortgage Co
Officer/Director, Fashion Dynamics Corp
Officer/Director, Pfs Services Inc
Officer/Director, Citicorp Banking Corp
Officer/Director, Intersil Holding Co
Officer/Director, Citigroup Holdings Co
Officer/Director, Cvc Partners LLC
Officer/Director, Ness Technologies Inc
Officer/Director, Primerica, Inc.
Officer/Director, Student Loan Corp
Officer/Director, Mfs Municipal Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pilgrim Prime Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Pimco Corporate Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Pacholder Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
Officer/Director, Municipal Partners Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Nuveen Senior Income Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Salomon Inc
Officer/Director, Jones Energy, Inc.
Officer/Director, Cryomedical Sciences, Inc.
Officer/Director, S Y Bancorp Inc
Officer/Director, Scholastic Corp
Officer/Director, Corvel Corp
Officer/Director, Buckle, Inc.,
Officer/Director, Avid Technology, Inc.
Officer/Director, O'reilly Automotive, Inc.
Officer/Director, Healthrite, Inc.
Officer/Director, Smith Midland Corp
Officer/Director, Mitcham Industries Inc
Officer/Director, Tc Group L.l.c.
Darden Restaurants, Inc. Officer/Director, Darden Restaurants, Inc.
Officer/Director, American Tire Corp
Officer/Director, Synalloy Corp
No Logo Clayton Environmental Consultants, Defendant
No Logo Comprehensive Environmental Services Co., Defendant
No Logo Contaminant Control, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cord Contracting Co., Inc, Defendant
No Logo Covino Environmental Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Criterion Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield 111 Wall, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dakota Demo-Tech, Defendant
No Logo Darling Asbestos Disposal Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diamond Point Excavating Corp, Defendant
No Logo Diversified Carting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Diversified Environmental Corporation, Defendant
No Logo DMT Enterpise, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Dynaserv Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eagle Leasing and Industrial Supply, Defendant
No Logo Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., Defendant
No Logo EJ Davies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo En-Tech Corp, Defendant
No Logo Environmental Products & Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Environmental Services and Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Environmental Testing Inc., Defendant
No Logo Enviroserve Inc., Defendant
No Logo Envirotech Clean Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Freidman, Harfenist, Langer & Kraut (LIs)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jay Harfenist +1 516 775 5800 +1 516 775 4082 sharfenist@friedharf.com
No Logo Evergreen Recycling of Corona, Defendant
No Logo Ewell E. Finley, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Executive Medical Services, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Fleet Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Francis A. Lee Company, Defendant
No Logo FTI Trucking, Defendant
No Logo Gilsanz Murray Steficek LLP, Defendant
No Logo Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC, Defendant
No Logo GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc., Defendant
No Logo H.P. Environmental, Defendant
No Logo Hallen Welding Service,Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hillman Environmental Group, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Hygienetics Environmental Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kasco Restoration Services Co., Defendant
Koch Skanska Inc. Koch Skanska Inc., Defendant
No Logo Laquila Construction Inc, Defendant
No Logo LaStrada General Contracting Corp., Defendant
No Logo Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineer P.C., Defendant
No Logo Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lucius Pitkin, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lvi Environmental Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lvi Services. Inc., Defendant
No Logo LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Defendant
No Logo Manafort Brothers, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mancor Remediation, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company, Defendant
No Logo Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Merrill Lynch & Co Inc, Defendant
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Validus Holdings, Ltd.
Officer/Director, Mk Rail Corp
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Ithaca Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Bibb Co /de
Officer/Director, Digirad Corp
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Merrill Lynch Ventures LLC Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Ventures LLC
Officer/Director, ML Hertz Co-Investor, L.P.
Officer/Director, GMI Investments, Inc.
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund II Inc
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pioneer High Income Trust
Officer/Director, Utility Income Trust
Officer/Director, Pioneer Floating Rate Trust
Officer/Director, Gabelli Equity Trust Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Michigan Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Florida Fund
Officer/Director, Muniyield Insured Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Pennsylvania Fund
No Logo Milro Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo MRA Engineering P.C., Defendant
No Logo Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Defendant
No Logo New Water Street Corp., Defendant
No Logo Nicholson Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Nomura Holding America, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nomura Securities International, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Nomura Holdings, Inc.
No Logo Norwich Associates, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Environmental Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corp, Defendant
No Logo Pinnacle Environmental Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Plaza Construction Corp., Defendant
No Logo Potomac Abatement, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Pro Safety Service, LLC, Defendant
No Logo PT & L Contracting Corp, Defendant
No Logo Robert L Gerosa, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Royal Environmental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Royal GM Inc., Defendant
No Logo SAB Trucking Inc., Defendant
No Logo Safeway Environmental Corp, Defendant
No Logo Seasons Industrial Contracting, Defendant
No Logo Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Defendant
No Logo Sencam, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Silverite Contractors, Defendant
No Logo Skidmore, Owings & Merrill LLP, Defendant
No Logo Specialty Service Contracting, Inc., Defendant
No Logo State Street Bank and Trust Company, as owner Trustee of ZSF/Office NY Trust, Defendant
No Logo Structure Tone Global Services, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Structure Tone, (UK) Inc., Defendant
No Logo Survivair, Defendant
No Logo Syska and Hennessy, Defendant
No Logo Tellabs Operations, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Thornton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Coproration of Manhattan, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Defendant
No Logo Tishman Interiors Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Torretta Trucking, Inc, Defendant
No Logo Toscorp Inc., Defendant
No Logo Total Safety Consulting, LLC., Defendant
No Logo Tucci Equipment Rental Corp, Defendant
No Logo Tucker Anthony, Inc., Defendant
Turner Construction Company Turner Construction Company, Defendant
No Logo Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, Defendant
Verizon New York Inc. Verizon New York Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vollmer Associates LLP, Defendant
No Logo Weeks Marine Inc., Defendant
No Logo Weidlinger Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Defendant
No Logo Weston Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp.., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower B Holding Co., LP, Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D Co. L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D Holding Co. I L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D Holding Co. II L.P., Defendant
No Logo WFP Tower D Holding I G.P. Corp., Defendant
No Logo Whitney Contracting Inc., Defendant
No Logo William F. Collins, Defendant
No Logo Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp, Defendant
No Logo Yannuzzi & Sons Inc, Defendant
No Logo YONKERS CONTRACTING Company INC., Defendant
No Logo York Hunter Construction , LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 49 U.S.C. § 40101
Nature of Suit 360 - Personal Injury: Other
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc..(Samel, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/10/2009, Entered: None
    ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by ABM Industries, Inc..(Samel, Dorothy) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Structure Tone Global Services, Inc, Structure Tone, (UK) Inc.. (Joyce, William) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by TIshman Construction Corporation of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York; Tishman Interiors Corporation. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00103-AKH, 1:09-cv-05233-AKH(Schwarz, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None
          ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Envirotech Clean Air, Inc..(Harfenist, Steven) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/13/2009, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF MASTER ANSWER. Document filed by Cushman & Wakefield 111 Wall, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc.. (Stella, Frances) (Entered: 10/13/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
              COMPLAINT against Diversified Carting, Inc., DMT Enterpise, Inc., Eagle Leasing and Industrial Supply, Eagle One Roofing Contractors Inc., EJ Davies, Inc., En-Tech Corp, Evergreen Recycling of Corona, Ewell E. Finley, P.C., Executive Medical Services, P.C., Fleet Trucking, Inc., Alan Kasman DBS Kasco, Francis A. Lee Company, FTI Trucking, Gilsanz Murray Steficek, LLP, Goldstein Associates Consulting Engineers, PLLC, Hallen Welding Service,Inc., H.P. Environmental, Koch Skanska Inc., Laquila Construction Inc, Lastrada General Contracting Corp, Leslie E. Robertson Associates Consulting Engineer P.C., Ann Taylor Stores Corporation, Lockwood Kessler & Bartlett, Inc., Lucius Pitkin, Inc, LZA Tech-Div of Thorton Tomasetti, Manafort Brothers Inc., Mazzocchi Wrecking, Inc., MRA Engineering P.C., Nacirema Industries Incorporated, Nicholson Construction Company, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Inc., Pinnacle Environmental Corp, Applied Environmental, Inc., Plaza Construction Corp., Pro Safety Service, LLC, PT & L Contracting Corp, Robert L Gerosa, Inc, Royal GM Inc., SAB Trucking Inc., Safeway Environmental Corp, Seasons Industrial Contracting, Semcor Equipment & Manufacturing Corp., Silverite Contractors, Blackmon-Mooring-Steamatic Catastophe, Inc., Skidmore Owings & Merrill LLP, Survivair, Tishman Construction Coproration of Manhattan, Tishman Construction Corporation of New York, Thornton-Tomasetti Group, Inc., Torretta Trucking, Inc, Total Safety Consulting, L.L.C, Tucci Equipment Rental Corp, Turner Construction Company, Ultimate Demolition/CS Hauling, Vollmer Associates LLP, Weeks Marine, Inc., Weidlinger Associates Consulting Engineers, P.C., Whitney Contracting Inc., Wolkow-Braker Roofing Corp, Yannuzzi & Sons Inc, Yonkers Contracting Company, Inc., York Hunter Construction, LLC, Bristol Environmental, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, Inc., Brookfield Financial Properties, L.P., Brookfield Partners, L.P., Brookfield Properties Corporation, Catamount Environmental, Inc., Citibank, N.A., CitiGroup, Inc., Clayton Environmental Consultants, Comprehensive Environmental Services Co., Contaminant Control, Inc., Covino Environmental Associates, Inc., Criterion Laboratories, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield 111 Wall, Inc., Cushman & Wakefield, Inc., Darling Asbestos Disposal Company, Inc., Diversified Environmental Corporation, Dynaserv Industries, Inc., Environmental Products and Services, Inc., Environmental Services and Technologies, Inc., Environmental Testing Inc., Enviroserve, Inc., Envirotech Clean Air, Inc., GPS Environmental Consultants, Inc., Hillman Environmental Group, LLC., Hygienetics Environmental Company, Inc., Indoor Environmental Technology, Inc., Kasco Restoration Services Co., Lvi Environmental Services, Inc., LVI Services, Inc., Manufacturers Hanover Trust Company, Mancor Remediation, Inc., Merrill Lynch & Co, Inc., Milro Associates, Inc., New Water Street Corp., Nomura Holding America, Inc., Nomura Securities International, Inc., Norwich Associates, Inc., Par Environmental Corporation, Pinnacle Environmental Corporation, Potomac Abatement, Inc., Royal Environmental, Inc., Sencam, Inc., Specialty Service Contracting, Inc., State Street Bank and Trust Company, as owner Trustee of ZSF/Office NY Trust, 111 Wall Street LLC, Structure Tone Global Services, Inc, Structure Tone, (UK) Inc., Syska and Hennessy, Tellabs Operations, Inc., Tishman Interiors Corporation, Toscorp. Inc., Tucker Anthony, Inc., Verizon New York, Inc., Weston Solutions, Inc., WFP Tower A Co., 230 Central Co., WFP Tower A Co. L.P., WFP Tower A. Co. G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Co. L.P., WFP Tower B Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower B Holding Co., LP, WFP Tower D Co. L.P., WFP Tower D Co., G.P. Corp., WFP Tower D Holding Co. I L.P., WFP Tower D Holding Co. II L.P., WFP Tower D Holding I G.P. Corp., 55 Water Street Condominium, William F. Collins, AMEC Construction Management, Inc., A Russo Wrecking, ABM Industries, Inc., ABM Janitorial Northeast, Inc., AMEC Earth & Enviromental, Inc., Atlantic Heydt Corp, Berkel & Company, Contractors, Inc., Big Apple Wrecking & Construction Corp, Bovis Lend Lease LMB, Inc., Abatement Professionals, Breeze Carting Corp, Breeze National, Inc., Brer-Four Transportation Corp., Buro Happold Consulting Engineers, P.C., C.B. Contracting Corp, Canron Construction Corp, Cantor Seinuk Group, Cord Contracting Co., Inc, Dakota Demo-Tech, Diamond Point Excavating Corp, Abscope Environmental, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 690085)Document filed by Zbigniew Kacperski, Jadwiga Kacperski.(mro) (Entered: 06/05/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 248 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?