Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc. et al v. Jones et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:05-cv-10859
District Judge Stephen C. Robinson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Antonella DeBello, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cushnergarveyllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Arthur Garvey +1 914 524 9400 +1 914 524 0422 lgarvey@cushnergarveyllp.com
No Logo John DeBello, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cushnergarveyllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Arthur Garvey +1 914 524 9400 +1 914 524 0422 lgarvey@cushnergarveyllp.com
No Logo Joseph LaManna, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cushnergarveyllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Arthur Garvey +1 914 524 9400 +1 914 524 0422 lgarvey@cushnergarveyllp.com
No Logo Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by cushnergarveyllp.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Arthur Garvey +1 914 524 9400 +1 914 524 0422 lgarvey@cushnergarveyllp.com
v.
No Logo Albert Tarantino, Defendant
No Logo Barry Levites, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Singer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Patricia Nigro +1 212 554 7808 +1 212 554 7700 jnigro@mosessinger.com
No Logo Cherico, Cherico & Associates, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cherico & Cherico Associates"

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Porter, Jr. +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 richard.porter@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fensterstock & Partners LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanne Marie Valentine +1 212 785 4100 +1 212 785 4040 jvalentine@fensterstock.com

Represented by Furman, Kornfeld & Brennan LLP

Represented by Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan, LLP

No Logo Daniel Forbes, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen N. Massey +1 212 698 3686 +1 212 698 3599 kathleen.massey@dechert.com
No Logo Esq. Louis Cherico, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Benjamin Porter, Jr. +1 212 490 3000 +1 212 490 3038 richard.porter@wilsonelser.com
No Logo Esq. Stephen Jones, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fensterstock & Partners LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/24/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanne Marie Valentine +1 212 785 4100 +1 212 785 4040 jvalentine@fensterstock.com

Represented by Furman, Kornfeld & Brennan LLP

Represented by Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan, LLP

No Logo George Stone, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by conpen.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Christopher Carroll +1 914 949 6996 +1 914 949 6203 conpen.pcarroll@gmail.com
No Logo Howard Ripps, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Faga Savino, L.L.P.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin Brian Faga +1 718 931 6000 +1 718 931 6056 kfaga@yahoo.com
No Logo John Liscio, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keidel, Weldon & Cunningham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Carson Cunningham +1 914 948 7000 +1 914 918 7010 SCunningham@kwcllp.com
No Logo John Liscio Insurance Co., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Keidel, Weldon & Cunningham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Carson Cunningham +1 914 948 7000 +1 914 918 7010 SCunningham@kwcllp.com
No Logo Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fensterstock & Partners LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeanne Marie Valentine +1 212 785 4100 +1 212 785 4040 jvalentine@fensterstock.com

Represented by Furman, Kornfeld & Brennan LLP

Represented by Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan, LLP

No Logo Jr. Dominick DeVito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by George L. Santangelo, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George L. Santangelo +1 212 269 4488 +1 212 363 6978 gls@santangelo.ws
No Logo Judicial Title Insurance Agency Llc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kurzman Eisenberg Corbin Lever & Goodman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Fred David Weinstein +1 914 285 9800 +1 914 285 9855 fweinstein@kelaw.com
No Logo Julia B. Fee Real Estate, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by conpen.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Christopher Carroll +1 914 949 6996 +1 914 949 6203 conpen.pcarroll@gmail.com
No Logo Levites Realty Management Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Singer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Patricia Nigro +1 212 554 7808 +1 212 554 7700 jnigro@mosessinger.com
No Logo Lou Cardasco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward S. Panzer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/01/2006, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sam Panzer +1 212 514 5335 +1 212 363 6978 panzer2@rcn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lawrence S. Goldman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annie Joy D'Elia +1 212 997 7499 +1 212 997 7797 ajd@lsgoldmanlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lawrence Saul Goldman +1 212 997 7499
No Logo Nancy Armano, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Michael Kratt +1 212 941 1277 +1 212 274 1189 edkratt@verizon.net
No Logo Robert DiDonato, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by conpen.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Christopher Carroll +1 914 949 6996 +1 914 949 6203 conpen.pcarroll@gmail.com
No Logo Sr. Dominick DeVito, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by George L. Santangelo, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George L. Santangelo +1 212 269 4488 +1 212 363 6978 gls@santangelo.ws
No Logo The Crystal Restoration Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Lawrence S. Goldman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Annie Joy D'Elia +1 212 997 7499 +1 212 997 7797 ajd@lsgoldmanlaw.com
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Intervenor
Officially listed as "USA USA Govt through Dept. of Justice, Attorney General"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Andrew O'Neil +1 212 637 2533 +1 212 637 2527 david.o'neil@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (142) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ADJOURNMENT NOTICE:The matter of Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc. et al v. Stephan Jones, Esq. et al. case management conference before the Hon. Stephen C. Robinson, United States District Judge, scheduled for January 20th, 2010 has been adjourned. (rj) (Entered: 01/14/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 1/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    RESCHEDULING NOTICE:The matter of Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc. v. Stephen Jones, has been rescheduled for case management conference before the Hon. Stephen C. Robinson, Untied States District Judge, from January 20th at 10:00am to January 20th at 3:30pm in Courtroom 621,6th Floor. Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2010 at 03:30 PM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (rj) (Entered: 01/05/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER:...Whereas plaintiffs do not oppose the granting of the foregoing motion and agree to dismiss their claims against defendant Forbes pursuant to Rule 41(a)of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with prejudice and without costs to any parties;Now, therefore, the Court, for good cause shown,grants the foregoing motion to withdraw and dismisses plaintiffs' claims against defendant Forbes with prejudice and without costs. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 10/7/2009) (rj) (Entered: 10/07/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Jonathan B. New dated 9/30/2009 re: :...Therefore, the Government respectfully requests that its motion to intervene and stay be withdrawn. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 10/1/2009) (mml) (Entered: 10/01/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 7/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          SCHEDULING NOTICE:Scheduled case management conference: Case Management Conference set for 9/24/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (gco) (Entered: 07/27/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 6/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            SCHEDULING NOTICE:The matter of Purchase Real Estate Group v. Jones et al. has been scheduled for a case management conference before the Hon. Stephen C. Robinson, Untied States District Judge, for July 22,2009, at 10:00am in Courtroom 621,6th Floor. Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen C. Robinson. (rj) (Entered: 06/29/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Stephen C. Robinson. Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 6/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kevin Thomas Duffy. Judge Stephen C. Robinson is no longer assigned to the case. (gco) (Entered: 06/18/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Stephen Carson Cunningham on behalf of John Liscio Insurance Co.. New Address: Keidel, Weldon & Cunningham, LLP, 925 Westchester Avenue, Suite 302, White Plains, New York, USA 10604, (914)948-7000. (Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 09/10/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Document filed by Stephen Jones. Added attorney A. Michael Furman for Stephen Jones. Attorney Jeanne Marie Valentine; Jonathan B. Bruno and Andrew Seth Kowlowitz terminated. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 7/22/08) (fk) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Seth Kowlowitz on behalf of Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C. (Kowlowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Old Attorney: Jonathan Bruno, New Attorney: Andrew S. Kowlowitz, Address: Furman Kornfeld & Brennan LLP, 545 Fifth Avenue, Suite 401, New York, New York, USA 10017, 212-867-4100. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C.. (Kowlowitz, Andrew) (Entered: 07/02/2008)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Edward A. McDonald on behalf of Daniel Forbes. New Address: DECHERT LLP, 1095 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, 10036-6797, (212)698-3500. (McDonald, Edward) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: None
                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kathleen N. Massey on behalf of Daniel Forbes. New Address: DECHERT LLP, 1095 AVENUE OF THE AMERICAS, NEW YORK, NEW YORK, 10036-6797, (212)698-3500. (Massey, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/09/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Stephen Carson Cunningham on behalf of John Liscio, John Liscio Insurance Co.. New Address: Lustig & Brown, LLP, 150 Grand Street, 5th Floor, White Plains, New York, usa 10601, 2128323235. (Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Annie Joy D'Elia on behalf of Lou Cardasco, The Crystal Restoration Corporation (D'Elia, Annie) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                  AFFIRMATION of Kevin B. Faga in Opposition re: 120 FIRST MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Howard Ripps. (Faga, Kevin) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 120 FIRST MOTION to Intervene., 121 FIRST MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support. Memorandum of Law in Partial Opposition. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 120 FIRST MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1# 2 Exhibit A - Part 2)(Bruno, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: None
                                        AFFIRMATION of Lawrence S. Goldman in Opposition re: 120 FIRST MOTION to Intervene., 121 FIRST MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support.. Document filed by Lou Cardasco, The Crystal Restoration Corporation. (D'Elia, Annie) (Entered: 10/05/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Howard S. Kronberg in Opposition. Document filed by John Liscio. (Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                            FILING ERROR - THIS DOCUMENT IS NOT A MOTION - FIRST MOTION to Intervene Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by USA Govt through Dept. of Justice, Attorney General. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(O'Neil, David) Modified on 11/10/2008 (fk). (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                              FIRST MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by USA Govt through Dept. of Justice, Attorney General.(O'Neil, David) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER re: 118 Bond,....If, after this Court rules on the various motions to dismiss that have been submitted in this matter, the Notice of Pendency continues to secure an active interest of the Plaintiff based on this lawsuit, Defendants may once again commence the double-bonding procedure detailed in this Court's June 1, 2007 Order. Defendants will have 30-days from the date of this Court's order on the motions to dismiss to post a bond in the amount of $500,000 to guarantee adequate relief to Plaintiff. If Defendants post that bond to post a bond in the amount of $2,5000,000 in order to maintain the Notice of Pendency. In conclusion, this Court orders that Defendants' bond - docket number 118-be discharged, and that the Notice of Pendency remain in place. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 08/01/2007) (jma) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 6/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                  SURETY BOND No. #CGB 7592477 in the amount of $ 500,000..BOND TO SECURE LIS PENDES...NOW, THEREFORE, the Fidelity & Deposit Company of Maryland..does hereby undertake pursuant to said order that Defendants will indemnity the Plaintiffs for the damages that they may incur if the Notice Of Pendency of action filed by the Defendants in this action is not cancelled; PROVIDED, HOWEVER, that in no event shall the liability under this undertaking exceed the amount of FIVE HUNDRED THOUSAND AND NO/100--($500,000.00) Dollars.. (mde) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 6/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Eric Fendt dated 6/11/07 re: Request for a ten day extension to comply with the Court's Order of June 1, 2007. Endorsement: Defendants deadline for posting bond is extended until June 29, 2007. Plaintiffs deadline for posting bond is extended until July 6, 2007. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 6/12/07) (fk) (Entered: 06/14/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...Pursuant to CPLR 6515, the Notice of Pendency entered against the Subject Property (Westchester County, Section 6, Block 671, Lot 23), shall be cancelled if the following conditions occur: First, within 10 days from the date of this order, Defendants post a bond in the amount of $500,000 to guarantee adequate relief to Plaintiff if he should succeed on the merits of his lawsuit. Once the first condition has been met, and no later than 20 days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall fail to post a bond in the amount of $2, 500,000 to indemnify Defendants for any damages flowing from the continuation of the Notice of Pendency. If either of these two conditions does not occur-that is, if Defendants do not timely post a bond in the amount specified above, or if Plaintiff does timely post the specified indemnification bond-the Notice of Pendency shall remain in effect. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 06/01/2007) (jma) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric G. Fendt on behalf of Louis Cherico (jma) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                          PLAINTIFF'S AFFIRMATION AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S Motion re: 113 MOTION ORDER PURSUANT TO CPLR 6515 DENYING MOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY UPON CONDITION THAT PLAINTIFF INDEMNIFY DEFENDANT. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (jma) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2007 (Martinez, Johnny). (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION ORDER PURSUANT TO CPLR 6515 DENYING MOTION TO CANCEL NOTICE OF PENDENCY UPON CONDITION THAT PLAINTIFF INDEMNIFY DEFENDANT. Document filed by Louis Cherico.(jma) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2007 (Martinez, Johnny). (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan B. Bruno on behalf of Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C. (Bruno, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan B. Bruno on behalf of Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C. (Bruno, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 69 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Louis Cherico, Cherico & Cherico Associates. (Porter, Richard) (Entered: 09/06/2006)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 79 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Howard Ripps. (Faga, Kevin) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 80 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Robert DiDonato, Julia B. Fee Real Estate. (Carroll, Patrick) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Further Support of Judicial's Motion to Dismiss served on Cushner & Garvey, LLP; Edward Michael Kratt, Esq.; Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan, LLP; Lustig & Brown, LLP; Penino Moynihan, LLP; Faga Savino, LLP; Dechert, LLP; George L. Santangelo, Esq.; Thomas L. Kanasky, Jr.; Lou Cardasco; The Crystal Restoration Corp.; Wilson, Elser, et al. on 09/05/06. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: # 1)(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss., 37 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss complaint.. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: # 1)(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 81 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by John Liscio. (Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 9/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Substitution of Attorney. Document filed by Lou Cardasco. Added attorney Lawrence S. Goldman for Lou Cardasco. Attorney Edward S. Panzer terminated. (fk, ) (Entered: 09/01/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Cancel Lis Pendens & Supporting Affidavit served on Louis Cherico, pro se on August 16, 2006. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 92 MOTION to Discharge Notice of Pendency, Affidavit of Louis Cherico in Support., 89 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Notice of Pendency Should Not Be Canceled. Affidavit of Joseph LaManna in Opposition. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Attachments: # 1)(Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Hon. Stephen C. Robinson from Lawrence A. Garvey dated 08/11/2006 re: requested an Order to Show Cause with a motion to dismiss the Notice of Pendency filed by the Plaintiff on June 22, 2006....ENDORSED, APPLICATION DENIED.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 08/11/2006) (jma, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint served on George Sirignano, Esq.Attorney for Dominick Devito Sr., Sherri DeVito, Johnson Family Trust - Non-ECF Registered Attorney on August 14, 2006. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                          FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss., 67 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., 69 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., 85 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., 86 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint., 83 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT., 74 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., 78 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of., 80 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint., 79 MOTION to Dismiss., 81 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/14/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - NOTICE of Opposition to Request to Adjourn OTSC Hearing re: 96 Response to Motion,. Document filed by Louis Cherico. (Fendt, Eric) Modified on 8/11/2006 (gf, ). (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion re: 92 MOTION to Discharge Notice of Pendency, Affidavit of Louis Cherico in Support., 89 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Notice of Pendency Should Not Be Canceled. Request For Adjournment. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 08/11/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Affidavit of Louis Cherico in Support, with exhibits, and Memorandum of Law served on all parties on 8/8/06. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by Louis Cherico. (Cherico, Louis) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Order to Show Cause, Affidavit of Louis Cherico in Support with exhibits, and Memorandum of Law served on Plaintiffs' Counsel on 8/8/06. Service was made by Fed Ex. Document filed by Louis Cherico. (Cherico, Louis) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                    BRIEF re: 92 MOTION to Discharge Notice of Pendency, Affidavit of Louis Cherico in Support., 65 Notice of Lis Pendens, 90 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Louis Cherico.(Cherico, Louis) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION to Discharge Notice of Pendency, Affidavit of Louis Cherico in Support. Document filed by Louis Cherico. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C Part 1# 4 Exhibit C Part 2# 5 Exhibit D Part 1# 6 Exhibit D Part 2)(Cherico, Louis) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Lawrence Garvey dated 7/27/06 re: Request to file a document exceeding 25 pages. Endorsement: Application Granted.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 7/27/06) (fk, ) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Louis Cherico Show Cause Hearing set for 8/17/2006 10:00 AM in Court Room 6A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Stephen C. Robinson. IT IS ORDERED that service of this Order and the accompanying papers be made upon respondent's attorney.....on or before the 9th day of August, 2006.... (ENTERED and signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 08/07/2006) The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies.(jma, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/8/2006 (jma, ). (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Notice of Pendency Should Not Be Canceled. Document filed by Louis Cherico. Return Date set for 8/17/2006 10:00 AM. (Cherico, Louis) (Entered: 08/08/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Lawrence Garvey dated 7/17/06 re: Request for permission to consolidat response to motion to dismiss. Endorsement: Application Granted.. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 7/18/06) (fk, ) (Entered: 07/21/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss. Document filed by Nancy Armano. (Kratt, Edward) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/7/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Nancy Armano. (Kratt, Edward) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Lou Cardasco. (Panzer, Edward) (Entered: 07/06/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 83 MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT.. Document filed by Daniel Forbes. (Massey, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss AMENDED COMPLAINT. Document filed by Daniel Forbes. Return Date set for 9/22/2006 09:30 AM. (Massey, Kathleen) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 81 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6).. Document filed by John Liscio Insurance Co.. (Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 9(b) and 12(b)(6). Document filed by John Liscio Insurance Co.. Return Date set for 9/22/2006 09:30 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint - Part A# 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint - Part B)(Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Robert DiDonato, Julia B. Fee Real Estate. Responses due by 8/14/2006 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Memorandum of Law# 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint Exhibit 'A')(Carroll, Patrick) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Howard Ripps. (Faga, Kevin) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss Notice of. Document filed by Cherico & Cherico Associates. (Porter, Richard) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    AFFIRMATION of Richard B. Porter in Support. Document filed by Cherico & Cherico Associates. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3)(Porter, Richard) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Memorandum Of Law served on Plaintiff and Co-Defendants Counsel on June 29, 2006. Service was made by Federal Express and/or Mail. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Dominick DeVito. (Santangelo, George) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Affidavit and Exhibits served on Plaintiffs & Co-Defendants Respective Counsel on June 29, 2006. Service was made by Federal Express and/or MAIL. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of FRED D. WEINSTEIN in Support re: 71 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit # 2 Exhibit)(Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC. Responses due by 8/14/2006 Return Date set for 9/22/2006 09:30 AM. (Weinstein, Fred) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Louis Cherico.(Porter, Richard) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Louis Cherico, Cherico & Cherico Associates. (Porter, Richard) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 67 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Dominick DeVito. (Santangelo, George) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        FIRST MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint. Document filed by Dominick DeVito. (Santangelo, George) (Entered: 06/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C.. Related document: 62 Amended Complaint,, filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.,, Joseph LaManna,, John DeBello,, Antonella DeBello,.(Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 06/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Lis Pendens. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06cv2761. Document filed by John DeBello. Return Date set for 6/7/2006 09:00 AM. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                FIRST MOTION to Consolidate Cases 06cv2760. Document filed by Joseph LaManna. Return Date set for 6/7/2006 09:00 AM. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 5/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Stephen Jones, Nancy Armano, John Liscio, John Liscio Insurance Co., Robert DiDonato, Julia B. Fee Real Estate, Howard Ripps, Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC, Daniel Forbes, Dominick DeVito, Sherri Devito, Dominick DeVito, Albert Tarantino, Lou Cardasco, The Crystal Restoration Corporation, Louis Cherico, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, The Johnson Family Trust, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C., John and Jane Does 1-100.Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.,, Joseph LaManna,, John DeBello,, Antonella DeBello,. (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5)(dcr, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/5/2008: # 6 Missing Amended Complaint Pages 73 to 76) (gco). (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Concourse Foot Care, P.C., Antonella DeBello, John DeBello, Oak Valley Real Estate Group Corporation, Purchase Real Estate Group Inc..(Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 05/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDERED that the Amended Complaint be submitted by May 16, 2006. ORDERED that all deft's. shall submit a response, or otherwise move to the Amended Complaint by June 30, 2006; that Plaintiff has until August 14, 2006 to respond to any Motions to Dismiss....see document for more details. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 04/25/2006) (jma, ) (Entered: 04/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ANSWER served on DEVITO on 04/22/06. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello.(Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of ANSWER served on DEVITO on 04/22/06. Service was made by ECF. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello.(Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion re: 51 FIRST MOTION for Conference Leave to Amend. Court granted motion to amend: letter with revised motion schedule. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C.. (Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED MOTION to Reassign Case DEVITO. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED MOTION to Reassign Case DEVITO. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion re: 51 FIRST MOTION for Conference Leave to Amend. Requesting movant provide the proposed amended pleading. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C.. (Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 04/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST MOTION for Conference Leave to Amend. Document filed by Joseph LaManna. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 04/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 48 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The Crystal Restoration Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 tabel of contents# 3 table of cases)(Santangelo, George) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT of edward s. panzer in Support re: 48 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by The Crystal Restoration Corporation. (Santangelo, George) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by The Crystal Restoration Corporation. Responses due by 4/21/2006 (Santangelo, George) (Entered: 04/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Stephen C. Robinson from Jennifer Nigro dated 3/23/06 re:....dfts will file a pre-answer motion to dismiss on or before 5/5/06... ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. So Ordered: (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 3/27/06) Copies sent by Clerk's office.(pf, ) (Entered: 03/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Brian Faga on behalf of Howard Ripps (Faga, Kevin) (Entered: 03/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Patricia Nigro on behalf of Barry Levites, Levites Realty Management Corp. (Nigro, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT. (Letter to all parties with notice of 3/3/06 conference at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Robinson) Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C..(Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C..(Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne Marie Valentine on behalf of Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C. (Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Stephen Jones, Christian Esq. Zebicoff, Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C..(Valentine, Jeanne) (Entered: 02/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by John Liscio, John Liscio Insurance Co..(Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by John Liscio, John Liscio Insurance Co..(Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 37 FIRST MOTION to Dismiss complaint.. Document filed by Dominick DeVito. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet # 2 Appendix # 3 Appendix)(Santangelo, George) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST MOTION to Dismiss complaint. Document filed by Dominick DeVito. (Attachments: # 1)(Santangelo, George) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time to answer... So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 2/14/06) (fk, ) (Entered: 02/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas L. Kanasky, Jr on behalf of Albert Tarantino (Kanasky, Thomas) (Entered: 02/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PARTIAL STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND. IT IS HEREBY AGREED by and between the parties that the time for Defendant Dominick DeVito Jr. to submit an answer or otherwise move in the above in the above titled action has been extended until the 15th day of February, 2006. Defendants Dominick DeVito Jr. hereby waives all objections or affirmative defenses related to Personal Jurisdiction or Service of Process. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 01/27/2006) (jma, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PARTIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY AGREED by and between the parties that the time for Defendants Louis Cherico, and Cherico, Cherico and Associates to submit an answer or otherwise move in the above titled action has been extended until the 11th day of February 2006.....SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 01/30/2006) (jma, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned parties herein, that the time for Defendants Stephen Jones, Esq., Christian Zebicoff, Esq., and Jones Garneau, LLP......to respond to the Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended from January 20, 2006, on consent of the parties up to and including February 24, 2006. These Defendants do hereby waive any objection to personal jurisdiction. No prior request for this relief has been made. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 01/30/2006) (jma, ) (Entered: 02/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward Michael Kratt on behalf of Nancy Armano (Kratt, Edward) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patrick Christopher Carroll on behalf of Robert DiDonato, George Stone, Julia B. Fee Real Estate (Carroll, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Julia B. Fee Real Estate.(Carroll, Patrick) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Carson Cunningham on behalf of John Liscio, John Liscio Insurance Co. (Cunningham, Stephen) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PARTIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER; Defendants, Sherri DeVito, Dominick DeVito, Sr. and The Johnson Family Trust, that the time w/in which said Defendants must answer or move w/ respect to the complaint in this action is hereby extended up to and including 2/15/06. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/27/06) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(ae, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PARTIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER as to Defendant, Judicial Title Insurance Agency LLC; w/out prejudice to the rights of either party hereto, the time for defendant, Judicial Title Insurance Agency LLC to answer and/or move w/ respect to the complaint in this action is adjourned to 3/3/06. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/30/06) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(ae, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER, that the time for Defendants to respond to the Plaintiffs' Complaint is hereby extended from 1/20/06, on consent of the parties up to and including 2/24/06. (Signed by Judge Stephen C. Robinson on 1/27/06) "The Clerk's Office Has Mailed Copies".(ae, ) (Entered: 02/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Stephen Jones served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Joan Fenninger. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Christian Esq. Zebicoff served on 1/11/2005, answer due 1/31/2005. Service was accepted by Ed Mulholland. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Albert Tarantino served on 1/5/2006, answer due 1/25/2006. Service was accepted by Lynn Tarantino. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. George Stone served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Lucretia Andries. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sherri Devito served on 1/4/2006, answer due 1/24/2006. Service was accepted by Sherri DeVito. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Howard Ripps served on 1/12/2006, answer due 2/1/2006. Service was accepted by Jennifer Ripps. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Liscio served on 1/4/2006, answer due 1/24/2006. Service was accepted by Elaine Monti. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. John Liscio Insurance Co. served on 1/4/2006, answer due 1/24/2006. Service was accepted by Elaine Monti. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Barry Levites served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Richard Roth. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Levites Realty Management Corp. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Richard Roth. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Johnson Family Trust served on 1/4/2006, answer due 1/24/2006. Service was accepted by Dominick DeVito, Sr.. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Daniel Forbes served on 1/10/2006, answer due 1/30/2006. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Julia B. Fee Real Estate served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Lucretia Andries. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Robert DiDonato served on 1/5/2006, answer due 1/25/2006. Service was accepted by Andrea DiDonato. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Dominick DeVito, Sr.. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Dominick DeVito served on 1/4/2006, answer due 1/24/2006. Service was accepted by Sherri DeVito. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. The Crystal Restoration Corporation served on 1/5/2006, answer due 1/25/2006. Service was accepted by Ann DiTomasso. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Louis Cherico served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Eric Fendt, Esq.. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Cherico & Cherico Associates served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Eric Fendt, Esq.. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lou Cardasco served on 1/5/2006, answer due 1/25/2006. Service was accepted by Ann DiTomasso. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Nancy Armano served on 1/10/2006, answer due 1/30/2006. Service was accepted by Nancy Armano. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Judicial Title Insurance Agency, LLC served on 1/5/2006, answer due 1/25/2006. Service was accepted by Peter Brogan. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Jones Sledgwick & Nardone, P.C. served on 12/30/2005, answer due 1/19/2006. Service was accepted by Joan Fenninger. Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc.. (Garvey, Lawrence) (Entered: 01/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against all defendants. (Filing Fee $ 250.00, Receipt Number 560847)Document filed by Purchase Real Estate Group, Inc., Joseph LaManna, John DeBello, Antonella DeBello. (Attachments:, # 1, # 2, # 3, # 4, # 5, # 6)(dcr, ) (Entered: 01/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 246 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?