Geldzahler et al v. Madoff et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-05882
District Judge Deborah A. Batts, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Eithan Ephrati, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Johnson Bottini, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert Yong Chang +1 619 233 5535 albertc@johnsonbottini.com
No Logo Lucien Geldzahler, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space S Douglas Bunch +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dbunch@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED S Douglas Bunch +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dbunch@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel S. Sommers +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 dsommers@cohenmilstein.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Jeffrey Toll +1 202 408 4600 +1 202 408 4699 stoll@cmht.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schoengold Sporn Laitman & Lometti, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joel Paul Laitman +1 212 964 0046 +1 212 267 8137 jplaitman@aol.com
v.
Madoff, Bernard L. Madoff, Bernard L., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bernard L. Madoff"
No Logo Charles Sebah, Defendant
No Logo Christopher Wetherhill, Defendant
No Logo Citi Hedge Fund Services Limited, Defendant
Officially listed as "Citi Hedge Fund Services Ltd."
No Logo FIM Advisers LLP, Defendant
No Logo Graham H. Cook, Defendant
No Logo Johann Wong, Defendant
No Logo John E. Epps, Defendant
No Logo Keith R. Bish, Defendant
No Logo Kingate Management Limited, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Every, Defendant
No Logo Michael G. Tannenbaum, Defendant
No Logo Phillip A. Evans, Defendant
No Logo Preston M. Davis, Defendant
No Logo Sandra Manzke, Defendant
No Logo Shazieh Salahuddin, Defendant
No Logo Tremont (bermuda) Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Tremont (Bermuda) Limited"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 160 - Contract: Stockholders' Suits
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of and has reviewed letters from counsel for Plaintiff Andorra Banc Agricol Reig, SA ("Andbanc")(09 Civ. 6522) dated September 8, 2009, counsel for Plaintiffs in Criterium Capital Funds B.V. v. Madoff, 09 Civ. 5386 ("Criterium Plaintiffs") dated September 11, 2009, and counsel for Plaintiff Eithan Ephrati dated September 15, 2009. Counsel for Andbanc is granted ten (10) days from the date of this Order to file its memorandum in opposition to the Criterium Plaintiffs' Motion for appointment of interim co-lead counsel and in further support of its own Motion for interim lead counsel. The Criterium Plaintiffs are granted ten (10) days from the date that Andbanc files its opposition to file a single Surreply that addresses the arguments made by Plaintiffs in the related cases that oppose its Motion, including Andbanc. There shall be no further submissions. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/16/09) (js) (Entered: 09/17/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
    DECLARATION of STEVEN J. TOLL in Opposition re: 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself), Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Barrett, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of JAVIER BLEICHMAR in Opposition re: 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself), Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Barrett, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of David Barrett in Opposition re: 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself), Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Barrett, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/8/2009, Entered: None
          OPPOSITION BRIEF re: 12 Order, 9 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel. PLAINTIFFS SUBMISSION ON EFFICIENCY AND COSTS OF REPRESENTATION BY PROPOSED INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AS DIRECTED BY THE COURTS AUGUST 24, 2009 ORDER. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself), Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Barrett, David) (Entered: 09/08/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel., 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself). (Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
              DECLARATION of Hector A. Tobia in Opposition re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel., 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself). (Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of Marco Arese in Opposition re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel., 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself). (Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of Piero Colonna in Opposition re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel., 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Silvana Worldwide Corp.. (Barrett, David) (Entered: 08/27/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from David A. Barrett dated 8/20/09 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs in 09 cv 5386, jointly with counsel in the two related actions 09 cv 5470 and 09 cv 5882, requests a brief extension of time, until 8/27/09, to file a reply in further support of their Motion. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to (6 in 1:09-cv-05386-DAB) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel : ( Replies due by 8/27/2009.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/26/09) (ae) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT: NOW, THEREFORE, based on the foregoing recitals, the parties, by and through their respective counsel, stipulate and agree as follows: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that the time for Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned matter shall be extended until 30 days after the issuance of an order finally granting or denying the motions for consolidation and appointment of lead counsel and cross-motion for lead plaintiff filed by Plaintiff and plaintiffs in Criterium Capital Funds v. Madoff (No. 09-cv-5386), Ephrati v. Kingate Management Limited (No. 09-cv- 5762), and Geldzabler v. Madoff (No. 09-cv-5882) (together with the captioned action, the "Kingate Actions"). (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/19/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/26/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER: The Criterium Plaintiffs are directed to substantiate to the Court the reasons why three co-lead counsel would be more efficient than, but not more expensive than one lead counsel by Friday, September 4, 2009, at 4:00PM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/24/2009) (tve) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Eithan Ephrati in Support re: 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Eithan Ephrati. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                            DECLARATION of Albert Y. Chang in Support re: 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Eithan Ephrati. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chang, Albert) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                              CROSS MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel.. Document filed by Eithan Ephrati. (Chang, Albert) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                CROSS MOTION to Appoint Eithan Ephrati to serve as lead plaintiff(s) and appoint Johnson Bottini, LLP interim counsel. Document filed by Eithan Ephrati.(Chang, Albert) (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Bernard L. Madoff. Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/30/2009, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Douglas Bunch on behalf of Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated) (Bunch, Stephen) (Entered: 07/30/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/24/2009, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Silvana Worldwide Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Appendix A)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/24/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT #5) - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882. MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Silvana Worldwide Corp.. (Bernstein, Joel) Modified on 7/28/2009 (gp). (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/23/2009, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases 09-cv-5386, 09-cv-5470, 09-cv-5762, 09-cv-5882., MOTION to Appoint Counsel as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Silvana Worldwide Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bernstein, Joel) (Entered: 07/23/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against Bernard L. Madoff, Kingate Management Limited, Tremont (Bermuda) Limited, FIM Advisers LLP, Citi Hedge Fund Services Ltd., Graham H. Cook, John E. Epps, Sandra Manzke, Charles Sebah, Keith R. Bish, Christopher Wetherhill, Michael G. Tannenbaum, Phillip A. Evans, Margaret Every, Shazieh Salahuddin, Johann Wong, Preston M. Davis. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 692783)Document filed by Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of himself), Lucien Geldzahler(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(mro) (Entered: 06/30/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 213 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?