Foster v. Astrue
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:07-cv-03782-RMW
District Judge Ronald M. Whyte, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Aron Foster, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Paul & Sugerman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harvey Peter Sackett +1 408 295 7755 +1 408 295 7444 hps@hpspc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sackett and Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Betty Herrera +1 408 295 7755 +1 408 295 7444 betty@sackettlaw.com
v.
No Logo Michael J. Astrue, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Small Business Administration

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gina Shin +1 415 977 8926 +1 415 744 0134 gina.shin@ssa.gov
Office San Jose
Filed 7/24/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 862 - Social Security: Black Lung
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County Santa Clara
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag E-Filing
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Whyte on 3/27/09. (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER by Judge Whyte denying 10 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 11 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (rmwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
      Letter from Betty Herrera. (Herrera, Betty) (Filed on 3/18/2009) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/6/2009, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Mark Win (Win, Mark) (Filed on 3/6/2009) (Entered: 03/06/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
          STIPULATION AND ORDER for extension of time re [12] Stipulation filed by Aron Foster, Jr. Signed by Judge Ronald M. Whyte on 4/25/08. (cm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2008)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byAron Foster, Jr. (Herrera, Betty) (Filed on 4/18/2008)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Stipulation
              STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by Aron Foster, Jr. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 4/3/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: 3/21/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael J. Astrue. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment)(Shin, Gina) (Filed on 3/21/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/20/2008, Entered: 2/20/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Aron Foster, Jr. (Attachments: # (1) Notice, # (2) Order)(Herrera, Betty) (Filed on 2/20/2008)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/22/2008 Stipulation
                    STIPULATION and Order for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Aron Foster, Jr. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 1/22/2008)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Stipulation
                      STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment by Aron Foster, Jr. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 12/14/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007 ~Notice (other)
                        Administrative Transcript to [6] Defendant's Answer by Michael J. Astrue (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Answer
                          Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint byMichael J. Astrue. (Shin, Gina) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/6/2007 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                            CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Michael J. Astrue.. (Shin, Gina) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                              CONSENT to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Aron Foster, Jr.. (Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/13/2007, Entered: 8/13/2007 Certificate Of Service.
                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aron Foster, Jr (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Sackett, Harvey) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Social Security Procedural Order
                                  SOCIAL SECURITY PROCEDURAL ORDER (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT for Judicial Review of Decision of Commissioner of Social Security against Michael J. Astrue ( Filing fee $ 350.00, receipt number 5461101391.). Filed byAron Foster, Jr. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/26/2007 (dhm, COURT STAFF).
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Case Referred to ECF
                                      CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (gm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/24/2007)
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?