De Guzman Sulayao v. Shanahan et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-07347
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Allan De Guzman Sulayao, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Scott Roehm +1 212 506 5151 sroehm@orrick.com
v.
No Logo Christopher Shanahan, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Eric Holder, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Janet Napolitano, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Respondent
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
No Logo Wayne Muller, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Natasha Oeltjen +1 212 637 2769 +1 212 637 2786 natasha.oeltjen@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 463 - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The conference scheduled for Monday, January 11, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. isadjourned to Tuesday, March 2, 2010 at 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 3/2/2010 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/4/10) (db) (Entered: 01/04/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
    DECLARATION of Natasha Oeltjen in Support re: 13 RESPONDENTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER OPPOSITION re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Christopher Shanahan, Wayne Muller, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Received in the night deposit box on 11/13/09 at 7:10pm) (mro) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
      RESPONDENTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN FURTHER OPPOSITION re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Christopher Shanahan, Wayne Muller, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Received in the night deposit box on 11/13/09 at 7:10pm) (mro) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
        SECOND DECLARATION of Scott Roehm in Support re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (mro) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, the petition for a writ of habeas corpus and request for a preliminary injunction (Docket No. 1) is DENIED without prejudice. The Court is aware that due to the Immigration Judge's decision on September 9, 2009, and petitioner's attempt to seek a waiver of inadmissibility, petitioner may continue to be detained after his next hearing in front of the Immigration Judge, on October 13, 2009. Therefore, the Court will maintain jurisdiction over this petition. In the event petitioner remains in custody as of October 31, 2009, the parties are invited to address, in written submission to be filed by November 13, 2009, whether petitioner's continued detention, without an individualized hearing to determine if there areterms and conditions that would reasonably assure petitioner's appearance if he were released, amounts to a deprivation of liberty without due process of law. A conference will be held on November 24, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. (Status Conference set for 11/24/2009 at 02:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 9/14/09) (db) (Entered: 09/15/2009)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/1/2009, Entered: None
            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Allan De Guzman Sulayao. (mbe) (Entered: 09/03/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Respondents' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Petition for Habeas Corpus, and the Declaration of Natasha Oeltjen served on Scott Roehm on 8/27/2009. Service was made by Email and Federal Express. Document filed by Christopher Shanahan, Wayne Muller, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (mbe) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of Natasha Oeltjen. Document filed by Christopher Shanahan, Wayne Muller, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (mbe) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/27/2009, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Christopher Shanahan, Wayne Muller, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (mbe) (Entered: 08/31/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Scott Roehm dated 8/21/2009 re: Counsel respectfully request that Your Honor schedule a hearing for September 3, 2009. ENDORSEMENT: Courtesy copies of all submissions shall be delivered to chambers, including complaint and all submissions in support of O.S.C. Hearing will be 2 p.m. on September 3. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 8/21/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Oeltjen on behalf of Christopher Shanahan, Wayne Muller, Janet Napolitano, Eric Holder, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (mbe) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/21/2009, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Scott Roehm on behalf of Allan De Guzman Sulayao (Roehm, Stephen) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                          DECLARATION of Scott Roehm in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause and 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Allan De Guzman Sulayao. (mro) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause and 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Allan De Guzman Sulayao. (mro) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                              PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number 697859).Document filed by Allan De Guzman Sulayao.(mro) (Entered: 08/21/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 188 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?