Agoro v. The District Director for Immigration Custom Enforcement
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-08111
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2019 at 5:56 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Babatunde Kareem Agoro, Petitioner

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephanie M. Carvlin +1 212 748 1636 +1 212 374 1506 carvlin@hotmail.com
v.
No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Respondent
Officially listed as "The Department of Homeland Security Attorney General of United States"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
No Logo The District Director for Immigration Custom Enforcement, Respondent

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sue Chen +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2786 Sue.Chen@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2241
Nature of Suit 530 - Prisoner: Habeas Corpus
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 20: Appointment of Attorney Stephanie M. Carvlin for Babatunde Kareem Agoro. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/4/10) CJA Office has mailed the original and sent a copy to the file.(sac) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER: #98432 that for the reasons set forth herein, Agoro's Petition is denied. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion (Docket No.2) and this case 09cv8111. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/4/10) (dle) Modified on 1/7/2010 (ajc). (Entered: 01/04/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Reply to the Government's Opposition to Babatunde Kareem Agoro's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus. Document filed by Babatunde Kareem Agoro. (mro) (Entered: 12/28/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: Accordingly, the CJA Office is directed to designate an attorney from its habeas panel to represent petitioner henceforth. The CJRA Office is directed to forward petitioner's letter, received by Chambers on November 10, 2009 and attached to this Order, to whomever is chosen to represent petitioner. The November 10, 2009 Order is hereby vacated (Document #7). The Clerk of the Court is directed to remove Document #7 from the docket but not re-open petitioner's application for the appointment of counsel (Document #5), which remains closed. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/16/2009) (jpo) (Entered: 11/16/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sue Chen on behalf of The District Director for Immigration Custom Enforcement, The Department of Homeland Security Attorney General of United States (mro) (Entered: 11/10/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None
            APPLICATION to Appoint Counsel pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3006(A)(g) (Habeas Corpus Petition). Document filed by Babatunde Kareem Agoro.(mbe) (Entered: 11/06/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER, petitioner's OSC is hereby denied. The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order and Petition, by certified mail, upon US Attorney for the SDNY, and shall also send a copy of this Order, by certified mail. Respondents shall file an answer to the Petition within 20 days of the date of this Order and should petitioner wish to file a reply to respondents' answer, such reply shall be filed within 10 days of the receipt of the answer and served upon respondents' counsel. The Clerk of the Court to close petitioner's Application for Issuance of Order to Show Cause (Document #3). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/2/09) (cd) (Entered: 11/03/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/30/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION (Application) for an Order (for Respondents) to Show Cause why Petitioner's petition for Writ of Habeaus Corpus should not be granted. Document filed by Babatunde Kareem Agoro.(mro) (Entered: 10/30/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None
                  PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by Babatunde Kareem Agoro.(ama) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ENDORSEMENT on Declaration in Support of Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, I.F.P. REQUEST IS GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/22/09) (ama) (Entered: 09/25/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 151 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?