Worden et al v. Proshares Trust et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-08662
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karen Worden, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christian Patrick Siebott +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 Siebott@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Louis M. Mayberg, Defendant

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

No Logo Michael L. Sapir, Defendant

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

No Logo Michael Wachs, Defendant
No Logo Proshare Advisors LLC, Defendant

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

No Logo Proshares Trust, Defendant

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

No Logo Russell S. Reynolds, III, Defendant
No Logo SEI Investments Distribution Co., Defendant

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

No Logo Simon Collier, Defendant

Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/23/2009, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-08662, 1:09-cv-08953, 1:09-cv-08958. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine, Maryanne D. Piplica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
    RESPONSE to Motion re: 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8662; 1:09-cv-8953; 1:09-cv-8958. MOTION to Appoint Clal Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Clal Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by CLAL Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd.. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/11/2009, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-08662, 1:09-cv-08953, 1:09-cv-08958. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine, Maryanne D. Piplica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 12/11/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Document filed by Carl Carey. (D'Agnenica, Jason) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/24/2009, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Alan Lieberman on behalf of CLAL Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd. (Lieberman, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/24/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
            DECLARATION of Kenneth G. Gilman in Support re: 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-08662, 1:09-cv-08953, 1:09-cv-08958. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine, Maryanne D. Piplica. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-08662, 1:09-cv-08953, 1:09-cv-08958. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine, Maryanne D. Piplica. (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-08662, 1:09-cv-08953, 1:09-cv-08958., MOTION to Appoint Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine and Maryanne D. Piplica to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Amir Mostafavi, Alan Parker, Kalvinder S. Bassi, James Vidrine, Maryanne D. Piplica.(Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                  DECLARATION of James E. Lahm in Support re: 8 MOTION to Appoint Carl Carey and Alexander Yancher to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Carl Carey, Alexander Yancher. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lahm, James) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 8 MOTION to Appoint Carl Carey and Alexander Yancher to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by Carl Carey, Alexander Yancher. (Lahm, James) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Appoint Carl Carey and Alexander Yancher to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by Carl Carey, Alexander Yancher. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lahm, James) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8662; 1:09-cv-8953; 1:09-cv-8958. MOTION to Appoint Clal Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Appoint Clal Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s).. Document filed by CLAL Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-5)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/23/2009, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:09-cv-8662; 1:09-cv-8953; 1:09-cv-8958., MOTION to Appoint Clal Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd. to serve as lead plaintiff(s). Document filed by CLAL Finance Batucha Investment Management, Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gross, Marc) (Entered: 11/23/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            STIPULATION AND ORDER CONCERNING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Lead Plaintiff shall notify Defendants within fifteen (15) days after appointment by the Court whether Lead Plaintiff will file a consolidated or amended complaint. Lead Plaintiff shall file any consolidated or amended complaint within thirty (30) days thereafter. Defendants shall have thirty (30) days following the filing of any consolidated or amended complaint to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to that complaint. In the event that Lead Plaintiff does not file a consolidated or amended complaint, Defendants shall have forty-five (45) days after appointment of Lead Plaintiff to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the original complaint. In the event that Defendants file one or more motions to dismiss either the original complaint or the consolidated or amended complaint, Lead Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days to file its opposition or oppositions, and Defendants shall have thirty (30) days thereafter to file their reply or replies. Defendants waive formal service of the summons and complaint. ENDORSEMENT: No motion to dismiss shall be filed without a prior conference with the Court. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 10/28/09) (tro) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/22/2009, Entered: None
                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Proshare Advisors LLC, SEI Investments Distribution Co., Michael L. Sapir, Louis M. Mayberg, Simon Collier, Proshares Trust.(Skinner, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 10/22/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/20/2009, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Robert A. Skinner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Proshare Advisors LLC, SEI Investments Distribution Co., Michael L. Sapir, Louis M. Mayberg, Simon Collier, Proshares Trust.(mro) (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                    COMPLAINT against Proshare Advisors LLC, SEI Investments Distribution Co., Michael L. Sapir, Louis M. Mayberg, Russell S. Reynolds, III, Michael Wachs, Simon Collier, Proshares Trust. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 702676)Document filed by Karen Worden(on behalf of himself), Karen Worden(on behalf of all others similarly situated).(mro) (mro). (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 130 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?