Levinson, et al v. Primedia, Inc., et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-02222
District Judge Deborah A. Batts, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Deborah A. Batts
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 10:50 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Andrew George Vadas, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Angela Thor, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Ann Zeise, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Anne E. Cerva, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Anthony Parente, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Barbara Sehr, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Boise Matthews, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Bonnie Bruno, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Charles E. Haynes, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Cheryl Imboden, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Dale E. Lehman, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo David J. Sweet, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo David Orozco, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Deborah Levinson, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Diane Dobbs, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Durant Imboden, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Edward A. Bott, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Eponine Sallee, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Gayle Olson, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Glen Schmall, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Harold Hagquist, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Jana M. Jones, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Janet W. Burns, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Jeannine Lahey, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Jim Zwick, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo John Anderson, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo John Gordon Ross, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo John Irons, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo John Michael Drehobl, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Judith A. Kautz, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Julia Armstrong Murphy, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Julie Altebrando, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Kathy Stolley, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Kelly Rivera, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Kimberly Pauley, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Krista Marie Beck, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Kristyn Schmall, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Linda Nelson, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Lisa Lorden, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Lita Epstein, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Lori Holuta, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Margaret Lorraine Smith, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Mark A. Filetti, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Mark E. Hessey, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Marlene Dziegeleski, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Marshall Bowden, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Michael Griffis, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Michael J. Helba, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo MICHAEL MILLS, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Michelle Peterson, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Murray Wayne Lundberg, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Paivi Helena Suomi, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Patricia Michaels, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Paul H. Ting, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Peter D. Lathan, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Philip G. DeLoach, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Richard W. Gray, Jr., Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Robert A Olson, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Robert Rak, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Scott Rettberg, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Shane William Dell, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Simi K. Valley, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Stephen Granade, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Steven Graham Venter, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Susi Nuss, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Suzanne J. Barrett, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Teri Olcott, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Theresa Jansen, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Traci Lee Morris, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Walter Blair Logie, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Walter Metcalf, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo Wendy Hogan, Plaintiff

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
v.
No Logo About.com, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Friedman Kaplan Seiler & Adelman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Bruce Stephen Kaplan +1 212 833 1100 +1 212 833 1250 bkaplan@fklaw.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert S. Whitman +1 212 218 5629 +1 212 218 5526 rwhitman@seyfarth.com
No Logo General Internet, Defendant

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
No Logo John Does, Defendant

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert S. Whitman +1 212 218 5629 +1 212 218 5526 rwhitman@seyfarth.com
No Logo Primedia Inc., Defendant

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert S. Whitman +1 212 218 5629 +1 212 218 5526 rwhitman@seyfarth.com
No Logo Scott Kurnit, Defendant

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com

Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert S. Whitman +1 212 218 5629 +1 212 218 5526 rwhitman@seyfarth.com
Other Parties
No Logo Michael Shen & Associates, PC, All Plaintiffs

Represented by Leon Greenberg Professional Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Leon Marc Greenberg +1 702 383 6085 +1 702 385 1827 leongreenberg@overtimelaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 17 U.S.C. § 501
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
Timeline
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/7/2010 before Judge Deborah A. Batts. (ja) (Entered: 11/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL ORDER AND JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/07/10) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 147 Filed: 10/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The Fairness Hearing of October 7, 2010, the Final Order and Judgment signed by the Court October 7, 2010 and this Memorandum and Order constitute the Court's findings and rulings in this matter. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/7/10) (rjm) (Entered: 10/08/2010)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Leon Greenberg in Support of Class Counsel's Unopposed Motion for an Award of Attorney's Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses. Document filed by Julie Altebrando, John Anderson, Suzanne J. Barrett, Krista Marie Beck, Edward A. Bott, Marshall Bowden, Bonnie Bruno, Janet W. Burns, Anne E. Cerva, Philip G. DeLoach, Shane William Dell, Diane Dobbs, John Does, John Michael Drehobl, Marlene Dziegeleski, Lita Epstein, Mark A. Filetti, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Michael Griffis, Harold Hagquist, Charles E. Haynes, Michael J. Helba, Mark E. Hessey, Wendy Hogan, Lori Holuta, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, John Irons, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Judith A. Kautz, Jeannine Lahey, Peter D. Lathan, Dale E. Lehman, Deborah Levinson, Walter Blair Logie, Lisa Lorden, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Boise Matthews, Walter Metcalf, Patricia Michaels, Michael Mills, Traci Lee Morris, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Teri Olcott, Gayle Olson, Robert A Olson, David Orozco, Anthony Parente, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Primedia, Inc., Robert Rak, Scott Rettberg, Kelly Rivera, John Gordon Ross, Eponine Sallee, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Barbara Sehr, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kathy Stolley, Paivi Helena Suomi, David J. Sweet, Angela Thor, Paul H. Ting, Andrew George Vadas, Simi K. Valley, Steven Graham Venter, Ann Zeise, Jim Zwick. (mbe) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 144 MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Julie Altebrando, John Anderson, Suzanne J. Barrett, Krista Marie Beck, Edward A. Bott, Marshall Bowden, Bonnie Bruno, Janet W. Burns, Anne E. Cerva, Philip G. DeLoach, Shane William Dell, Diane Dobbs, John Michael Drehobl, Marlene Dziegeleski, Lita Epstein, Mark A. Filetti, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Michael Griffis, Harold Hagquist, Charles E. Haynes, Michael J. Helba, Mark E. Hessey, Wendy Hogan, Lori Holuta, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, John Irons, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Judith A. Kautz, Jeannine Lahey, Peter D. Lathan, Dale E. Lehman, Deborah Levinson, Walter Blair Logie, Lisa Lorden, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Boise Matthews, Walter Metcalf, Patricia Michaels, Michael Mills, Traci Lee Morris, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Teri Olcott, Gayle Olson, Robert A Olson, David Orozco, Anthony Parente, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Robert Rak, Scott Rettberg, Kelly Rivera, John Gordon Ross, Eponine Sallee, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Barbara Sehr, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kathy Stolley, Paivi Helena Suomi, David J. Sweet, Angela Thor, Paul H. Ting, Andrew George Vadas, Simi K. Valley, Steven Graham Venter, Ann Zeise, Jim Zwick. (mbe) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. Document filed by Julie Altebrando, John Anderson, Suzanne J. Barrett, Krista Marie Beck, Edward A. Bott, Marshall Bowden, Bonnie Bruno, Janet W. Burns, Anne E. Cerva, Philip G. DeLoach, Shane William Dell, Diane Dobbs, John Michael Drehobl, Marlene Dziegeleski, Lita Epstein, Mark A. Filetti, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Michael Griffis, Harold Hagquist, Charles E. Haynes, Michael J. Helba, Mark E. Hessey, Wendy Hogan, Lori Holuta, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, John Irons, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Judith A. Kautz, Jeannine Lahey, Peter D. Lathan, Dale E. Lehman, Deborah Levinson, Walter Blair Logie, Lisa Lorden, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Boise Matthews, Walter Metcalf, Patricia Michaels, Michael Mills, Traci Lee Morris, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Teri Olcott, Gayle Olson, Robert A Olson, David Orozco, Anthony Parente, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Robert Rak, Scott Rettberg, Kelly Rivera, John Gordon Ross, Eponine Sallee, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Barbara Sehr, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kathy Stolley, Paivi Helena Suomi, David J. Sweet, Angela Thor, Paul H. Ting, Andrew George Vadas, Simi K. Valley, Steven Graham Venter, Ann Zeise, Jim Zwick.(mbe) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Leon Greenberg. Document filed by Julie Altebrando, John Anderson, Suzanne J. Barrett, Krista Marie Beck, Edward A. Bott, Marshall Bowden, Bonnie Bruno, Janet W. Burns, Anne E. Cerva, Philip G. DeLoach, Shane William Dell, Diane Dobbs, John Michael Drehobl, Marlene Dziegeleski, Lita Epstein, Mark A. Filetti, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Michael Griffis, Harold Hagquist, Charles E. Haynes, Michael J. Helba, Mark E. Hessey, Wendy Hogan, Lori Holuta, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, John Irons, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Judith A. Kautz, Jeannine Lahey, Peter D. Lathan, Dale E. Lehman, Deborah Levinson, Walter Blair Logie, Lisa Lorden, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Boise Matthews, Walter Metcalf, Patricia Michaels, Michael Mills, Traci Lee Morris, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Teri Olcott, Gayle Olson, Robert A Olson, David Orozco, Anthony Parente, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Robert Rak, Scott Rettberg, Kelly Rivera, John Gordon Ross, Eponine Sallee, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Barbara Sehr, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kathy Stolley, Paivi Helena Suomi, David J. Sweet, Angela Thor, Paul H. Ting, Andrew George Vadas, Simi K. Valley, Steven Graham Venter, Ann Zeise, Jim Zwick. (mbe) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
PARTIES' MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF THEIR JOINT APPLICATION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION re: 141 MOTION for Settlement. Document filed by Julie Altebrando, John Anderson, Suzanne J. Barrett, Krista Marie Beck, Edward A. Bott, Marshall Bowden, Bonnie Bruno, Janet W. Burns, Anne E. Cerva, Philip G. DeLoach, Shane William Dell, Diane Dobbs, John Michael Drehobl, Marlene Dziegeleski, Lita Epstein, Mark A. Filetti, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Michael Griffis, Harold Hagquist, Charles E. Haynes, Michael J. Helba, Mark E. Hessey, Wendy Hogan, Lori Holuta, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, John Irons, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Judith A. Kautz, Scott Kurnit, Jeannine Lahey, Peter D. Lathan, Dale E. Lehman, Deborah Levinson, Walter Blair Logie, Lisa Lorden, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Boise Matthews, Walter Metcalf, Patricia Michaels, Michael Mills, Traci Lee Morris, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Teri Olcott, Gayle Olson, Robert A Olson, David Orozco, Anthony Parente, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Robert Rak, Scott Rettberg, Kelly Rivera, John Gordon Ross, Eponine Sallee, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Barbara Sehr, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kathy Stolley, Paivi Helena Suomi, David J. Sweet, Angela Thor, Paul H. Ting, Andrew George Vadas, Simi K. Valley, Steven Graham Venter, Ann Zeise, Jim Zwick. (mbe) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF PROPOSED CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT. Document filed by Julie Altebrando, John Anderson, Suzanne J. Barrett, Krista Marie Beck, Edward A. Bott, Marshall Bowden, Bonnie Bruno, Janet W. Burns, Anne E. Cerva, Philip G. DeLoach, Shane William Dell, Diane Dobbs, John Michael Drehobl, Marlene Dziegeleski, Lita Epstein, Mark A. Filetti, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Michael Griffis, Harold Hagquist, Charles E. Haynes, Michael J. Helba, Mark E. Hessey, Wendy Hogan, Lori Holuta, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, John Irons, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Judith A. Kautz, Jeannine Lahey, Peter D. Lathan, Dale E. Lehman, Deborah Levinson, Walter Blair Logie, Lisa Lorden, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Boise Matthews, Walter Metcalf, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Patricia Michaels, Michael Mills, Traci Lee Morris, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Teri Olcott, Gayle Olson, Robert A Olson, David Orozco, Anthony Parente, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Robert Rak, Scott Rettberg, Kelly Rivera, John Gordon Ross, Eponine Sallee, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Barbara Sehr, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kathy Stolley, Paivi Helena Suomi, David J. Sweet, Angela Thor, Paul H. Ting, Andrew George Vadas, Simi K. Valley, Steven Graham Venter, Ann Zeise, Jim Zwick.(mbe) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF SETTLEMENT OF MARCH 19, 2010 AND EXHIBITS 1 AND 4 THEREOF AND AMENDING THE OFFICIAL COURT NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT OF CLASS ACTION AND THE COURT'S ORDER OF APRIL 20, 2010: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that Exhibits 1 and 4 of the Parties' Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement of March 19, 2010, amended per Order signed and filed May 21 and May 23, 2010, are further amended to the forms annexed hereto as Exhibits 1 and 4 respectively and that the Official Court Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action, Exhibit A appended to the Preliminary Order signed on April 19, 2010, also amended per the Court's Order signed and filed May 21 and May 23, 2010, is further amended to the form annexed hereto as Exhibit 4 and in the event of any conflict between the terms of the Parties' Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement of March 19, 2010 and the annexed Exhibits 1 and 4 the terms of the annexed Exhibits 1 and 4 shall be controlling. It is further stipulated and agreed that, while not anticipated, further change in the distribution of the Net Settlement Fund specified in the Plan of Allocation may be set forth in the Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action, Exhibit 4, and Allocation Schedule, Exhibit 1 hereto, provided that the total amount of the Net Settlement Fund as currently set forth in Exhibit 4, no less than $3,616,000, does not change and that the only change in the Plan of Allocation is the number of Class Members and any resulting change in distribution of the Net Settlement Fund. It is further stipulated and agreed that the dates specified in the Court's Preliminary Approval Order of April 19, 2010, are changed as follows: (1) The Settlement Fairness Hearing set for August 16, 2010 at 2:30 p.m., specified in paragraph 5 of such Order is hereby adjourned to 10/7/2010 at 11:00 a.m. (2) The Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action and proof of claim, in the form annexed hereto as Exhibit "4", which was to be mailed and emailed as specified in paragraph 8 of such Order, shall now be so dispatched no later than 15 days from the date of this Order. (3) Proof of claim forms, which were to be filed as specified in paragraph 10 of such Order, shall now be so filed within 60 days from the date of this Order. (4) Requests for exclusion from the class, which were to be filed as specified in paragraph 11 of such Order, shall now be so filed within 60 days from the date of this Order. (5) Plaintiffs' counsels' papers in support of final approval of the settlement, which were to be filed as specified in paragraph 13 of such Order, shall now be so filed within 74 days from the date of this Order. (6) Objections and comments on the settlement, which were to be filed and served as specified in paragraph 13 of such Order, shall now be so filed and served within 60 days from the date of this Order. If any of the foregoing dates fall on a Saturday, Sunday or legal holiday the time to so act shall be the next business day. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 7/7/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 07/07/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/23/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER AMENDING EXHIBITS 1 AND 4 OF THE PARTIES' STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT OF SETTLEMENT OF MARCH 19, 2010 AND AMENDING THE OFFICIAL COURT NOTICE OF PROPOSED SETTLEMENT OF CLASS ACTION and agreed by the parties by their undersigned attorneys, that Exhibits 1 and 4 of the Parties' Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement of March 19, 2010 are hereby amended to the forms annexed hereto as Exhibits 1 and 4 respectively and that the Official Court Notice of Proposed Settlement of Class Action, Exhibit A appended to the Preliminary Order signed on April 19, 2010, is amended to the form annexed hereto as Exhibit 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/21/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen dated 5/19/2010 re: The parties jointly request an extension to June 17, 2010 of the deadline to mail and email the Notice and proof of claim, which, pursuant to paragraph 8 of the Court's Order dated April 19. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Parties are to make their best effort to keep the currently scheduled fairness hearing. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/20/2010) (tve) (Entered: 05/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
PRELIMINARY ORDER IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS: The Court does hereby preliminarily approve the Stipulation and the Settlement set forth herein, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Fairness Hearing described as further set forth in this Order. A hearing (the "Settlement Fairness Hearing") pursuant to Rule 23 is hereby scheduled to be held before this Court on 8/16/2010 at 02:30 PM before Judge Deborah A. Batts, for the purposes as further set forth in this Order. This Court retains exclusive jurisdiction over the Action to consider all further matters out of or connected with the Settlement, the plan of allocation for the Settlement Class (including the Class Member Allocation and Enhancement Schedule), the application for attorneys' fees and reimbursement of expenses, or the requested enhancement payments to certain Named Plaintiffs and the Proposed Settlement Class Representative as provided for in the plan of allocation set forth in Notice. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/19/2010) (tro) (Entered: 04/20/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION OF WITHDRAWAL: It is hereby stipulated and agreed by the parties by their undersigned attorneys, that, in light of the settlement of this matter, Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed on 7/28/09 and entered on 8/3/09, be and is hereby withdrawn without prejudice. Should the Order and Final Judgment finally approving the Settlement not be entered by the Court, then the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment may be reinstated by plaintiffs upon 10 days notice to Defendants and the Court. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 3/18/2010) (tro) (Entered: 03/19/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael Shen in Support re: 132 preliminarily approving proposed class action settlement. MOTION providing for class notice. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Does, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (djc) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Leon Greenberg in Support re: 132 MOTION preliminarily approving proposed class action serttlement. MOTION providing for class notice.Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (djc) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 132 MOTION Approving preliminarily proposed class action settlement. MOTION providing for class notice. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (djc) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/12/2010, Entered: None
MOTION preliminarily approving proposed class action settlement; and MOTION providing for class notice. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist.(djc) (Entered: 03/16/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Bruce S. Kaplan dated 2/23/10 re: counsel for defendants write that the parties believe that this challenge to documenting the settlement can be met, and remain confident that documents can be completed and a motion for preliminary approval can be filed in fairly short order. However, the deadline we proposed to Your Honor for such a motion in our last joint communication - February 24, 2010 - has proven too ambitious, and we hereby respectfully request that it be extended until March 12, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. No further extensions absent extraordinary Circumstances. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 3/1/10) (pl) (Entered: 03/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/29/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Greenberg dated 1/28/2010 re: Counsel for plaintiff writes requesting an extension of time, until 2/24/2010, for the submission of plaintiffs' motion for preliminary approval of the proposed class action settlement of this case. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 1/29/2010) (tve) Modified on 2/4/2010 (tve). (Entered: 02/01/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Bruce S. Kaplan dated 12/16/09 re: In light of Your Honor's certification of a class in this action, counsel for all parties hereby jointly request leave for plaintiffs to move for preliminary approval of the settlement prior to January 31, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/21/09) (js) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Greenberg dated 12/3/09 re: Counsel for Plaintiffs write in compliance with Your Honor's rule requiring counsel be granted permission to submit any motions to the Court. The parties are attempting to settle this litigation. Such correspondence also communicated the parties' joint request the Court take no action on any pending motions until the end of January 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Denied at this time. Plaintiff may renew request after 2/1/2010 in the event the parties do not settle. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/7/09) (tro) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 12/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Bruce S. Kaplan dated 12/2/2009 re: Counsel for defendant writes to inform the Court the defendant and plaintiff's counsel have agreed to meet in person during the second week of this month to discuss settlement and the parties jointly request that the Court defer ruling until the end of 1/2010 on plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment and on defendant's request for a pre-motion conference to seek leave to move to strike one of plaintiffs' filing. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. Parties to inform Court upon settlement or on 2/1/2010 as to case status, whichever comes first. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/2/2009) (tve) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 10/29/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bruce Stephen Kaplan on behalf of About.com, Inc. (mbe) (Entered: 10/29/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER PROVIDING FOR SUPPLEMENTAL CLASS NOTICE AS PER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 23: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the below signed parties and their attorneys, that: Pursuant to the parties' Stipulation of June 16, 2009, "So Ordered" by the Court on June 18, 2009, the parties agreed upon a form of notice to the members of the class certified by the Court's Memorandum and Order of April 13, 2009 and a process for such class members to exclude themselves from the class, the Court further finding that such process complied with all requirements of Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 23 (c)(2) and all other due process requirements; and An error having occurred in the notice dispatched by postal mail pursuant to the aforesaid Stipulation and Order, in that such notice omitted the full address of defendants' counsel, which is to receive from all excluding class members a copy of the class member's "opt out" form under the process set forth in such Stipulation and Order; and The parties having agreed to correct the aforesaid error by dispatching, by postcard, in substantially the form annexed hereto, a corrective notice to all class members who (1) Have not already validly "opted out" of the class and (2) Have not had their original mailed postal notice returned as undeliverable; and Within 12 days of this Court "So Ordering" this Stipulation plaintiffs' counsel shall mail the parties' attached and agreed upon corrective notice by first class mail postcard to all class members who have not already validly "opted out" of the class and have not had their original mailed postal notice under the parties' Stipulation of June 16, 2009 returned as undeliverable, and such persons shall have until 30 days after such mailing to validly "opt out" of this case; and The parties agree, and the Court so finds, that the form of notice provided for in this Stipulation and Order, combined with the notice already provided under the parties "So Ordered" stipulation and Order of June 16, 2009, fully complies with all requirements of Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 23 (c)(2) and all other due process requirements. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/16/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 09/23/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Glenn Pannenborg in Support re: 123 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. (attached with exhibits A,B,C and D) (mbe) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
Plaintiffs' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., Scott Kurnit, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (mbe) (Entered: 09/02/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
DECLARATION of William Day and Robert S. Whitman in Opposition to plaintiffs' motion for partial judgment. Document filed by About.com, Inc.. (mbe) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for partial summary judgment. Document filed by About.com, Inc.. (mbe) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by About.com, Inc.. (mbe) (Entered: 08/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., General Internet, Scott Kurnit, John Does, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (tro) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., General Internet, Scott Kurnit, John Does, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist.(tro) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/28/2009, Entered: None
DECLARATION OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment, Rule 56.1 Statement, Shen Declaration, and Exhibits A through F in the case of Levinson v. Primedia, Index. No. 02-cv-2222 served on Defendant on 7/9/09. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., General Internet, Scott Kurnit, John Does, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (tro) (Entered: 08/03/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER PROVIDING FOR NOTICE AS PER FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE RULE 23: The parties agree, and the Court so finds, that the form of notice provided for in this Stipulation and Order fully complies with all requirements of Fed. R. Civ. Pro. Rule 23(c) (2) and all other due process requirements. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 6/18/2009) (rw) (Entered: 06/19/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: The following group is hereby Certified as a Class Action as to Plaintiffs' contract claims: "Persons who 1) Entered into a '1997 contract' and or a '1999 contract' ('the contracts') with the defendant (or its predecessors) to 'build, maintain and enhance' a specified Internet website for the defendant, and; 2) were denied by defendants pay of the specified percentage of defendant's net advertising revenue and/or net transaction revenue and/or net syndication revenue promised by such contract." Leon Greenberg and Michael Shen are HEREBY appointed class counsel. Parties shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to serve any additional expert reports. Parties shall have sixty (60) days from the date of this Order to conduct any and all expert depositions. There SHALL BE NO EXTENSIONS. Within ninety-days (90) of the date of this Order Plaintiff SHALL FILE their motion for partial summary judgment. Defendant shall Oppose within thirty (30) days of being served with Plaintiffs' motion. In their papers Defendant may reargue those issues for which Plaintiff has already been granted summary judgment. Plaintiff SHALL FILE their Reply within fifteen (15) days of being served with Defendant's Motion. There SHALL BE NO EXTENSIONS. Failure to adhere to any of these deadlines SHALL RESULT in a waiver of additional discovery and/or motion practice. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/13/2009) (jpo) Modified on 4/17/2009 (jpo). (Entered: 04/17/2009)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Greenberg dated 12/5/08 re: counsel for plaintiffs request leave to file a sur-reply. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 12/9/08) (dle) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
REPLY in Support of their Motion to Strike Portions of Plaintiffs' Class Certification Reply Memorandum. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does. (djc) (Entered: 11/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 108 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Scott Rettberg, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (pl) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 10/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen dated 10/15/2008 re: Counsel writes to inform the Court that the parties have agreed that Plaintiffs will submit their opposition to defendants' motion to strike by 10/31/2008, and defendants will submit their reply by 11/14/2008. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/24/2008) (tve) (Entered: 10/24/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
DEFENDANTS' SURREPLY IN SUPPORT OF THEIR OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., John Does. (dle) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 108 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit. (dle) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/26/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for an order striking portions of plaintiffs' reply memorandum in support of their motion for class certification. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does.(dle) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Robert S. Whitman dated 9/11/08 re: Defendants request leave to file a brief surreply to clarify these misstatements of the record. ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file Motion to Strike granted; Leave to submit surreply granted. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/17/08) (tro) (Entered: 09/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael Shen in Support re: 97 MOTION to Certify Class. MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Michael Shen & Associates, P.C. (djc) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 97 MOTION to Certify Class. MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (djc) (Entered: 09/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen re: Counsel for Plaintiff writes in respect to plaintiffs' currently pending motion for class certification. Counsel requests the Court's approval of an extension of the reply in support of their pending motion to 9/1/08. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 7/2/08) (tro) (Entered: 07/03/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Shen on behalf of Michael Shen & Associates, P.C.. New Address: Michael Shen & Associates P.C., 55 West End Avenue, Suite S15L, New York, New York, USA 10023, 2122270300. (Shen, Michael) (Entered: 06/16/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Greenberg dated 5/21/2008 re: Counsel for the plaintiff request the Court's approval of a 1 month extension to reply in support of the Motion for Class certification [Dkt#96] June 27, 2008. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/23/2008) (jfe) Modified on 6/11/2008 (jfe). (Entered: 05/23/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Greenberg dated 5/7/08 re: Counsel for plaintiff requests until 5/27/08 to submit their reply papers in support of their pending motion for class certification. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 96 MOTION to Certify Class and to appoint the plaintiffs' counsel as attorneys for the plaintiff class:( Replies due by 5/27/2008.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/13/08) (tro) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Greenberg dated April 23,2008 re: Plaintiffs' counsel requests the Court's approval of a two week extension of that date to May 12,2008. Defendant's counsel has advised that they have no objection to such extension of time. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Granted. ( Replies due by 5/12/2008.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/25/2006) (jmi) Modified on 5/7/2008 (jmi). (Entered: 04/28/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen dated 3/20/08 re: Plaintiffs request to file a reply by April 28, 2008. Defendants do not object. ENDORSEMENT: GRANTED. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/10/08) (js) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None
OPPOSITION to Motion re: 97 MOTION to Certify Class. MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Document filed by About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does. (pl) (Entered: 03/12/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: None
MOTION for an Order partially Certifying this Class as a class action and appointing the plaintiffs' counsel as attorneys for the plaintiff class. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Michael Shen & Associates, P.C., Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist.(jar) (Entered: 01/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None
MOTION to Certify Class and to appoint the plaintiffs'counsel as attorneys for the plaintiff class. Document filed by Michael Shen & Associates, P.C.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Shen, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Leon Marc Greenberg dated 12/17/2007 re: Plaintiffs wish to submit their motion for partial summary judgment simultaneously with their motion for class certification (the later being due January 20, 2008). A decision by the Court to grant partial summary judgment would establish a common issue (that defendants owe putative plaintiff class members damages for the year 2000) and strongly support a decision to grant class certification. ENDORSEMENT: denied SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 1/9/2008) (jmi) (Entered: 01/10/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen dated 11/21/07 re: a request for a one month extension to file a motion for class certification from 12/21/2007 to 1/20/2008. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 11/27/07) (kco) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen dated 10/12/2007 re: parties jointly request a further one month extension of time within which to submit a Motion to Circulate a Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join and/or a Motion for Class Certification, from 11/23/2007 to 12/21/2007. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/16/2007) (jar) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael Shen dated 9/18/07 re: a request for a 60 day extension of time within which to submit a motion to circulate a notice of pendency and consent to join and/or a motion for class certification from 9/24/2007 to 11/23/2007. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/18/07) (kco) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
PLAINTIFFS' APPENDIX IV-V. Original filed under seal, document # 78. Document filed by Deborah Levinson.(db) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
PLAINTIFFS' APPENDIX III(B-C). Original filed under seal, document # 77. Document filed by Deborah Levinson.(db) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 89 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
PLAINTIFFS' APPENDIX I-III(A). Original filed under seal, document # 76. Document filed by Deborah Levinson.(db) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
COUNTER STATEMENT (RESPONSE) TO DEFENDANTS' STATEMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL CIVIL RULE 56.1. Original filed under seal, document # 75. Document filed by Deborah Levinson. (db) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 87 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Deborah Levinson. Original filed under seal, document # 75. (db) (Entered: 08/29/2007)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, the parties have waived any such application to seal documents. To the extent that any exhibits or moving papers other than Exhibits and Appendices I-IV (all attached to defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment) have been filed under seal (SEE letter from Lisa Swanson, dated 11/22/05), they are to be UNSEALED IMMEDIATELY. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/22/07) (db) (Entered: 08/28/2007)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: The Court issued a Memorandum and Order today in the above-referenced matter on Dfts' pending Motion for summmary judgment. A hard copy of the Memeorandum and Order will be available upon notice in chambers. It also will be on file in Open Records and available electronically shortly. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/9/2007) (jar) (Entered: 08/13/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 8/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the reasons contained herein, Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Summary Judgment also shall be Granted in part to plaintiffs. Finally, the claims of plaintiffs who did not comply with discovery requirements shall be Dismissed without prejudice, subject to the provisions stated herein. Should Plaintiffs choose to forego class certification, Proposed Requests to Charge and Proposed Voir Dire shall be submitted to this Court within 60 days of the date of this Order. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 8/9/07) (js) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/27/2007, Entered: None
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Leon Marc Greenberg on behalf of all plaintiffs. New Address: Leon Greenberg, Esq., 633 South 4th Street, Suite 9, Las Vegas, Nevada, USA 89101, 702-383-6085. (Greenberg, Leon) (Entered: 07/27/2007)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
DECLARATION of William Day and Lisa Swanson in Further Support re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does. (db, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/6/2006, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Support re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does. (db, ) (Entered: 03/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 2/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Defendants' reply papers in further support of their motion for summary judgment shall be served on or before 3/3/2006 and filed as soon as practiable thereafter. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 2/24/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 02/27/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Laura Delgado dated 2/1/2006 re: to Michael Shen & Associates filed Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, Rule 56.1 Statement and attachments, supporting Declaration of Leon Greenberg, Exhibits A through W, and Appendice I through V in the above matter. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Durant Imboden, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Primedia, Inc., Scott Kurnit, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Scott Rettberg, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist.(jmi, ) (Entered: 02/07/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER plaintiffs' time to respond to defendants' motion for summary judgment is exended from to 2/1/06, and the defendants' time to reply is extended to 2/28/06. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 1/25/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., Scott Kurnit. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/21/2005, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
MOTION for Summary Judgment. Attached is 56.1 Statement and Declarations in support. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER: Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be served by hand and filed on or before 11/21/05. Plaintiffs' opposition to that motion shall be served by hand and filed on or before 1/25/06. Any reply papers shall be served and filed on or before 2/9/06. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 10/12/05) (js, ) (Entered: 10/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/19/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Defendants' request to move for summary judgment is granted. Plaintiff's request to cross-move for summary judgment is denied. In addition, plaintiffs' motion for class certification shall be held in abeyance until the "employee/independent contractor" issue is resolved through defendants' summary judgment motion. Defendants shall file and serve their summary judgment motion papers within 45 days of the date of this order. Plaintiffs shall have 45 days from receipt of defendants' moving papers to file and seve their opposition. Defendants shall then have 15 days to file a reply, at which point defendants' motion for summary judgment will be fully-submitted. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 9/15/2005) (lb, ) (Entered: 09/21/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER; the parties are directed to send letter to Judge Batts that comply with paragraph II.B.1 of Judge Batts' Individual Practices on or before 8/29/05. ANy failure to meet this deadline will be considered an abandonment of the contemplated motion. In the event no party sends a letter, the parties shall submit the Joint Pretrial Statement required by paragraph IV.A of Judge Batts' Individual Practices on or before 9/22/05. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 8/10/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 08/12/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Judge Constance Baker Motley no longer assigned to the case. (jeh, ) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/23/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/4/05 before Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (pl, ) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: None
NOTICE to take Deposition Upon Oral Examination. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (jco, ) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER plaintiffs' letter motion for an extension of time is granted in part and denied in part. Discovery is extended to 6/20/05 with the following limitations as set forth in this Order. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 5/4/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 05/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/28/05 before Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (mo, ) (Entered: 05/02/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Lisa Swanson in Opposition re: 43 request to extend discovery deadline. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., Scott Kurnit. (ps, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/25/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 43 request to extend discovery. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit, John Does. (ps, ) (Entered: 04/28/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: for reasons stated on the record at the 3/28/05 oral argument, plaintiffs' 44 motion to compel is granted in part and denied in part. Motions for an extension of discovery shall be filed by 4/11/05; responses due 4/25/05 and replies due 5/2/05. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/31/05) Copies Mailed by Chambers.(db, ) (Entered: 04/05/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/22/2005, Entered: None
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit.(db, ) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Michael Shen in Support Motion to Compel. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Jim Zwick, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Further Support of Motion to Compel. Document filed by Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray, Jr, Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Deborah Levinson, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, Theresa Jansen, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Does, Jana M. Jones, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, Boise Matthews, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, Eponine Sallee, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Marshall Bowden, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Lisa Swanson in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., General Internet, Scott Kurnit, John Does. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
DEFENDANTS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery. Document filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., General Internet, Scott Kurnit, John Does. (jmi, ) (Entered: 03/17/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
Plaintiffs' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Compel. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/09/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions to compel discovery due by 3/3/2005. Responses due by 3/11/2005 Replies due by 3/16/2005. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/1/2005) (jp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/3/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER The Court is in receipt of a letter dated 10/29/04, containing a request for an extension of discovery from plaintiffs. Its appears that plaintiffs have been highly dilatory in conduction discovery in this matter-- in particular, with respect to their obligation to raise discovery disputes with the Court promptly. Nonetheless, the Court will not bar discovery altogether. Rather, the Court rules as follows: neither party may serve any new discovery request, other than notices of deposition. With respect to disputes about existing requests, any such dispute must be brought to the court's attention on or before 11/12/04 by means of a letter that complies with paragraph 2(A) of this Court's Individual Practices (which, it should be noted, requires attorneys to confer prior to sending any letter). Any failure to comply with this deadline will preclude the party from raising such dispute in the future. Should such a letter be received, the Court expects to act on it promptly. Depositions may be conducted as long as they are completed by 1/15/05. There will be no discovery permitted except as set forth in this Order. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/29/04) (jco, ) (Entered: 11/05/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER; The Court has considered plaintiffs' applications to have their depsositions conducted by telephone pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(b)(7). See Transcript of Conference, dated 7/1/04 (Docket #36). The Court is excusing any untimeliness as to these applications inasmuch as such untimeliness did not cause defendants any prejudice. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 10/7/04) (sac, ) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/24/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Ian F. Wallace dated 9/22/04 re: granting plaintiffs permission to submit a short letter addressing the points raised by Defendants in their 9/16/04 letter, which opposed the request by five Plaintiffs to have their depositions conducted remotely. Plaintiffs intend to submit this response by Friday, 9/24/04. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 9/27/04) (sac, ) (Entered: 09/27/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/1/2004, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM TO THE DOCKET CLERK: that a pre-trial conference was held on 7/1/04. (pl, ) (Entered: 07/28/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/1/04 before Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.(pl, ) (Entered: 07/19/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/1/04 before Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.(dfe, ) (Entered: 07/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/14/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/1/04 before Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.(dfe, ) (Entered: 07/14/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/2/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER:Plaintiff Motions for Class Certification due by 11/15/2004. Responses due by 12/13/2004 Replies due by 12/27/2004. Deposition due by 3/7/2005. Fact Discovery due by 10/15/2004. Any expert reports shall be served on opposing counsel by 1/15/2005. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 7/2/2004) (jsa, ) (Entered: 07/06/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: regarding procedures that will govern the handling of ?Discovery Materials?. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/25/04) (kw, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Hon. Judge Gorenstein from Ian Wallace dated 3/19/04 re: request for confirmation that the Court has granted plaintiff's request for an extension of 17 days until 3/22/04 of the prior 3/5/04 deadline. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/19/04) (yv, ) (Entered: 03/25/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Hon. Judge Gorenstein from Ian Wallace dated 3/18/04 re: request for a 90 day extension of the deadline for factual discovery and a corresponding 90 day extension of all the deadlines set by Judge Motley in the court order pre-trial scheduling order, dated 11/12/03. Application granted. Plaintiffs have not made the showing required at the 2/6/04 conference to obtain a extension of the due date for response to document requests and interrogatories. Nonetheless, because only a one week extension has been requested, it is granted. No further extensions. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/19/04) (yv, ) (Entered: 03/24/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/6/04 before Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from Ian Wallace dated 3/4/04 re: counsel for plaintiff requests that the court allow her additional time to respond to dfts' discovery requests. This request is denied for failure to comply with paragraph 1.E of this court's individual practices. (Signed by Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/8/04) (dle, ) (Entered: 03/11/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on January 27, 2004 before Judge Constance Baker Motley.(jw, ) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: After hearing the parties at a PTC on this date, the Court concludes that in view of the large volume of documents (thousands), the Court should appoint a special master. (Signed by Judge Constance Baker Motley on 1/27/04) (yv, ) (Entered: 02/04/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge for pretrial management. Referred to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein. (cd, ) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, that in view of the large volume of documents involved in the matter, the case is hereby referred to Mag Judge Gorenstein for full pre-trial management. (Signed by Judge Constance Baker Motley on 1/27/04) (cd, ) (Entered: 02/03/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/7/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER; the conference is therefore rescheduled for 1/27/04 at 11:30 A.M. before Judge Constance Baker Motley. (Signed by Judge Constance Baker Motley on 1/6/04) (sac, ) (Entered: 01/16/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER: Pretrial Conference set for 1/21/2004 11:00 AM before Judge Constance Baker Motley in ctrm 26A of the US District Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, NY, NY. (Signed by Judge Constance Baker Motley on 1/5/04) (kw, ) (Entered: 01/15/2004)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER, plaintiffs' initial disclosures pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(1) shall be served on or before 12/1/03; plaintiffs' responses to dfts' initial discovery requests shall be served on or before 12/1/03; dfts initial discovery responses shall be served on or before 12/19/03; joinder of parties shall be completed 45 days after circulation of a court ordered notice of pendency by plaintiffs or by 3/15/04, whichever is later; all fact discovery shall be completed by the parties no later than 5/14/04; plaintiffs' motin for class certification shall be served and filed on or before 6/15/04; dfts' opposition to that motion shall be served on or before 7/16/04; any reply papers shall be served and filed on or before 7/30/04; any expert reports shall be served on opposing counsel by 8/13/04; expert depositions shall be completed by 10/6/04. . ( signed by Judge Constance B. Motley ) (dle) (Entered: 11/17/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/6/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM OPINION # 89302 AND ORDER; denying [18-1] motion for leave of this Court to circulate a Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join. Based on the record presently before the court, plaintiffs have failed to demostrate that the putative members of the collective action are similary situated. Accordinly, plaintiffs' motion is denied without prejudice. Should further discovery disclose additional facts to support plaintiffs' application, they may renew it upon a proper showing. ( signed by Judge Constance B. Motley ) (jco) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: None
REPLY MEMORANDUM by Deborah Levinson, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Boise Matthews, Eponine Sallee, Marshall Bowden, Jim Zwick, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist, Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray Jr., Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley in support re: [18-1] motion for leave of this Court to circulate a Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join . (moc) (Entered: 11/05/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/27/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit in opposition to [18-1] motion for leave of this Court to circulate a Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join . (djc) (Entered: 10/30/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Deborah Levinson, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Boise Matthews, Eponine Sallee, Marshall Bowden, Jim Zwick, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist, Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray Jr., Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley in support of [18-1] motion for leave of this Court to circulate a Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join . (djc) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION by Deborah Levinson, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Boise Matthews, Eponine Sallee, Marshall Bowden, Jim Zwick, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist, Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray Jr., Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott, Kimberly Pauley for leave of this Court to circulate a Notice of Pendency and Consent to Join ; Return Date not indicated; Attached are Affirmations and Declarations in support. (djc) (Entered: 10/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/7/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: the next pretrial conference is set for 11/12/03 at 11:00 a.m.; pltffs shall have until 10/17/03 to file and serve a notice of pendency. The motion will be taken on submission. Opposing affidavits and answering memos due 10/27/03 and replies, if any, due 11/3/03. ( signed by Judge Constance B. Motley ) (db) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/8/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER, that the parties are hereby ordered to appear for a pretrial conference on 10/2/03 at 11:00 in courtroom 26A of the U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street . ( signed by Judge Constance B. Motley ); (dle) (Entered: 08/09/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/31/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
Notice of Case reassignment to Judge Constance B. Motley . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Leon Marc Greenberg, Robert S. Whitman . (gf) (Entered: 08/01/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/15/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER of dismissal; The defendant General Internet, Inc. having ceased to exist is dismissed from this action and the caption of this action shall be amended accordingly. ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (sb) (Entered: 04/16/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/26/2003, Entered: None
CONSENT TO Notice of Filing of Consent to by Deborah Levinson, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Boise Matthews, Eponine Sallee, Marshall Bowden, Jim Zwick, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist, Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray Jr., Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis. (jco) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/3/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER; that the caption of this action and the plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint and the defendants' Answer, are amended to add Michael J. Helba, Lisa Lorden, Paul H. Ting, and Walter Metcalf as plaintiffs . ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (jco) (Entered: 03/04/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/16/2003, Entered: None Amended Complaint
SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Deborah Levinson, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Boise Matthews, Eponine Sallee, Marshall Bowden, Jim Zwick, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist, Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray Jr., Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg, Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba, Walter Metcalf, Teri Olcott, Edward A. Bott (Answer due 1/27/03 for John Does, for Scott Kurnit, for General Internet, for About.com, Inc., for Primedia, Inc. ) amending [1-1] complaint . Summons issued. (sb) (Entered: 01/22/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/9/2003, Entered: None
NOTICE of Filing of Consent to Joinder by Edward A. Bott. (jco) (Entered: 01/16/2003)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/30/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF CONSENTS TO JOINDER by Teri Olcott and Edward A. Bott, as plaintiffs. (ae) (Entered: 12/31/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/26/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING OF CONSENTS TO JOINDER by Paul H. Ting, Lisa Lorden, Michael J. Helba and Walter Metcalf. (ae) (Entered: 12/27/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc. . (cd) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER by Primedia, Inc., About.com, Inc., Scott Kurnit to the Second Amended Complaint. (Attorney Robert S. Whitman from the Firm: Orrick & Sutcliffe). (cd) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION and ORDER, that plaintiffs shall be granted leave pursuant to FRCP 15(a) to serve and file a Second Amended Complaint ; Defendants shall answer or move in respect to the Second Amended Complaint no later then 12/20/02. Defendants shall not contest the means or manner of service of process in this matter . ( signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts ) (tp) (Entered: 12/23/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of FILING of CONSENTS to JOINDER by Deborah Levinson, Theresa Jansen, Jana M. Jones, Boise Matthews, Eponine Sallee, Marshall Bowden, Jim Zwick, Michelle Peterson, Harold Hagquist, Patricia Michaels, Julie Altebrando, Stephen Granade, Richard W. Gray Jr., Lita Epstein, Cheryl Imboden, Paivi Helena Suomi, Durant Imboden, Angela Thor, Traci Lee Morris, Jeannine Lahey, Suzanne J. Barrett, Linda Nelson, Susi Nuss, Simi K. Valley, David Orozco, Judith A. Kautz, Steven Graham Venter, Murray Wayne Lundberg, John Gordon Ross, Janet W. Burns, Julia Armstrong Murphy, Lori Holuta, Michael Griffis, John Irons, Kelly Rivera, Michael Mills, Mark E. Hessey, Margaret Lorraine Smith, Kristyn Schmall, Glen Schmall, Charles E. Haynes, Rachel Sanfordlyn Shreckengast, John Michael Drehobl, Shane William Dell, Peter D. Lathan, Wendy Hogan, Philip G. DeLoach, Anthony Parente, Anne E. Cerva, Robert A Olson, Gayle Olson, Ann Zeise, John Anderson, Walter Blair Logie, Kimberly Pauley, Kathy Stolley, Marlene Dziegeleski, Glen Schmall, Kristyn Schmall, Robert Rak, Mark A. Filetti, Barbara Sehr, Krista Marie Beck, Diane Dobbs, David J. Sweet, Dale E. Lehman, Bonnie Bruno, Andrew George Vadas, Scott Rettberg . (db) (Entered: 08/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to About.com, Inc. by serving the Office of the Secretary of State, State of N.Y. leaving with Carol Vogt, agent, on 6/12/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/2002, Entered: None
DEMAND for jury trial by Deborah Levinson, all pltffs. (sac) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/20/2002, Entered: None
CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 433973. (gmo) (Entered: 03/26/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 174 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?