Gentile et al v. Proshares Trust et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-10038
District Judge John G. Koeltl, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peter J. Gentile, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Uri Seth Ottensoser +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 ottensoser@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com
v.
No Logo Louis M. Mayberg, Defendant
No Logo Michael L. Sapir, Defendant
No Logo Michael Wachs, Defendant
No Logo Proshare Advisors LLC, Defendant
No Logo Proshares Trust, Defendant
No Logo Russell S. Reynolds, III, Defendant
No Logo SEI Investments Distribution Co., Defendant
No Logo Simon Collier, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ldi) (Entered: 12/16/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/8/2009, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, Prejudice prejudice against the defendant(s) all defendants. Document filed by Peter J. Gentile(on behalf of himself). (Seidman, Joseph) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 1 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against Proshare Advisors LLC, SEI Investments Distribution Co., Michael L. Sapir, Louis M. Mayberg, Russell S. Reynolds, III, Michael Wachs, Simon Collier, Proshares Trust. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 707964)Document filed by Peter J. Gentile(on behalf of himself), Peter J. Gentile(on behalf of himself similarly situated).(mro) (Entered: 12/08/2009)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 85 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?