MBIA Insurance Corporation et al v. Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:09-cv-10093
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 30, 2021 at 5:10 PM EST (1.7 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Natbony +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6666

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Nicholas Abdo +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6666 mabdo@cwt.com
No Logo Mbia Insurance Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William J. Natbony +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6666

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Nicholas Abdo +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6666 mabdo@cwt.com
v.
No Logo Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank BA, Defendant
Officer/Director, Robeco Sage Triton Fund LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Polk & Wardwell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Joseph Fenrich +1 212 450 4000 +1 212 450 3800 william.fenrich@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Stuart Scheinkman +1 212 450 4363 +1 212 450 3363 michael.scheinkman@dpw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel Jacob Schwartz +1 212 450 4581 +1 212 450 3581 daniel.schwartz@dpw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Stryker Weinstein +1 212 450 4972 +1 212 450 3972 brian.weinstein@dpw.com
No Logo Paragon Cdo Limited, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Seward & Kissel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael James McNamara +1 212 574 1200 +1 212 480 8421 McNamara@sewkis.com
No Logo Bank Of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association"

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lynch Dunn +1 212 735 3000 +1 917 735 2000 rdunn@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (61) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/30/2021, Entered: None Internet Citation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER THAT by no later than April 29, 2011, the parties shall submit a joint letter (1) describing the contemplated expert discovery and the need for the proposed expert disclosure deadlines, and (2) proposing a deadline by which the parties wish to be referred for settlement discussions to Magistrate Judge Maas. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/25/2011) (jmi) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/7/11, 11:22 a.m. before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (rjm) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER: #100129 For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is denied in its entirety, BONY's motion for summary judgment is granted in its entirety, and Rabobank's motion for summary judgment is granted in part except as to Plaintiffs' breach of contract claim for failure to receive notice of the sales of Reference Obligations, By Monday, April 25, 2011, Plaintiffs and Defendant Rabobank shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order with respect to the discovery remaining to be taken on the notice claim, A template for the order is available at http://wwwl.nysd,uscourts,gov/judge_info,p hp?id=99, The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions located at document numbers 28, 36, and 41. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/25/2011) (jpo) Modified on 3/30/2011 (ajc). (Entered: 03/25/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings (Motions) held on 3/7/2011 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ja) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Stryker Weinstein on behalf of Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (Weinstein, Brian) (Entered: 02/24/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER. The parties shall appear at oral argument on the pending cross-motions for summary judgment on March 7, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/18/11) (djc) (Entered: 02/22/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                DECLARATION of William J. Fenrich in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/4/2010, Entered: None
                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 06/04/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/24/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the request is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants may reallocate pages as they see fit, but may not exceed twenty pages in total. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/21/2010) (jfe) (Entered: 05/24/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. and in Opposition to Defendants' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                          COUNTER STATEMENT TO 39 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                            COUNTER STATEMENT TO 45 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT of William J. Natbony in Opposition re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment., 36 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/14/2010, Entered: None
                                AFFIDAVIT of Anthony McKiernan in Opposition re: 36 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment., 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 05/14/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                    DECLARATION of William J. Fenrich in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT of HARJAN KUIPER in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A..(Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                            COUNTER STATEMENT TO 32 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                DECLARATION of Jonathan N. Eisenberg in Support re: 36 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (s) 1 Through 5)(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 36 CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. And Opposition To Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment re: 28 Motion For Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association. (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                    CROSS MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association.(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 04/15/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER re The Court is in receipt of a proposed stipulation from the parties seeking permission to file combined memoranda of law and to extend Defendants' deadline to file their replies. The request is granted in part and denied in part. The parties shall abide by the following briefing schedule:Defendants' oppositions and cross-motions shall be filed no later than April 15, 2010. Each Defendant shall file a single memorandum of law that is both in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion and in support of its cross-motion. The combined memoranda shall not exceed thirty pages in length Plaintiffs' reply on their motion and oppositions to Defendants' cross-motions shall be filed no later than May 14,2010. Plaintiffs' shall file a single memorandum of law that is both in reply to Defendants' oppositions to their motion and in opposition to Defendants' motions for summary judgment. The combined memorandum shall not exceed forty pages in length. Defendants shall file their replies no later than June 4, 2010. So ordered. ( Cross Motions due by 4/15/2010. Replies due by 5/14/2010. Responses due by 4/15/2010) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/12/10) (cd) (Entered: 04/13/2010)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER ON THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON JONATHAN EISENBERG, granting 17 Motion for Jonathan Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/31/10) (cd) (Entered: 04/01/2010)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                            RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Anthony McKiernan in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT of William J. Natbony in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                  FILING ERROR - DUPLICATED DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Anthony McKiernan in Support re: 28 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Hawkins, Howard) Modified on 3/17/2010 (db). (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC.(Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 16, 2010 9:40 a.m. before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ajc) (Entered: 03/04/2010)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on February 16, 2010 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (djc) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment shall be filed no later than March 15, 2010. Defendants' oppositions and cross-motions shall be filed no later than April 15, 2010. Plaintiffs' reply on their initial motion shall be filed no later than April 29, 2010. Plaintiffs' oppositions to Defendants' cross-motions shall be filed no later than May 14, 2010. Defendants' replies on their cross-motions shall be filed no later than May 31, 2010. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/18/2010) (tve) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this action is dismissed solely as to defendant Paragon CDO. Limited without costs to any party.... (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/16/10) (cd) (Entered: 02/18/2010)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER: the any party seeking to file a motion shall submit a pre-motion letter no later than February 3, 2010. The parties shall respond to any pre-motion letters submitted no later than February 8, 2010. Each submission shall comply with Rule 2.A of my individual practices. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the initial conference scheduled for February 5, 2010 is adjourned until February 16,2010 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/1/2010) (tve) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Kotwick on behalf of Paragon CDO, Limited (Kotwick, Mark) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/20/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael James McNamara on behalf of Paragon CDO, Limited (McNamara, Michael) (Entered: 01/20/2010)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/19/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the time for defendant Paragon CDO. Limited to answer, move or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint is hereby extended to and including 1/27/10. ENDORSEMENT: Paragon CDO, Limited shall serve its response to the complaint so that it is received by plaintiffs' counsel by 5:00 p.m. on 1/27/10. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/15/10) (dle) (Entered: 01/19/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A..(Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association.(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/14/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Jonathan Eisenberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association.(mbe) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER: It is hereby stipulated and agreed that the time for Defendants The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association and Corperative Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A., to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' complaint is hereby extended to January 15, 2010. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/29/2009) (jfe) (Entered: 12/30/2009)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Stuart Scheinkman on behalf of Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (Scheinkman, Michael) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jacob Schwartz on behalf of Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A..(Fenrich, William) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Joseph Fenrich on behalf of Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. (Fenrich, William) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association.(Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Lynch Dunn on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (Dunn, Robert) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Scott D. Musoff on behalf of The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association (Musoff, Scott) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Paragon CDO, Limited served on 12/10/2009, answer due 12/31/2009. Service was accepted by Mr. Peter Lundin, Vice President of Maples Finance, as Registered Agent. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation; Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Johanna K. Tokunaga, Vice President. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association served on 12/10/2009, answer due 12/31/2009. Service was accepted by Arron Almarez, Senior Manager. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation; Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A. served on 12/10/2009, answer due 12/31/2009. Service was accepted by Ms. Elizabeth Sharrier, Senior Paralegal. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation; Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC. (Hawkins, Howard) (Entered: 12/21/2009)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER: The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to appear for a status conference on February, 2010 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 21 C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED THAT, by January 29, 2009 at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the information further set forth in this Order in separate paragraphs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by January 29, 2009 at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT Defendants shall serve a copy of this Order on Plaintiff forthwith. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/11/2009) (tve) (ad). (Entered: 12/14/2009)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying LaCrosse Financial Products Member, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC.(rdz) (mro). (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying MBIA, Inc. as Corporate Parent. Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation.(rdz) (mro). (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, Paragon CDO, Limited, Cooperatieve Centrale Raiffeisen-Boerenleenbank B.A.. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 708155)Document filed by MBIA Insurance Corporation, Lacrosse Financial Products, LLC.(rdz) (mro). (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 137 times.

                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?