USA v. Delorey
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:10-cr-00682

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Matthew Delorey, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quijano & Ennis, P.C. (381 Park Ave. S.)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Nancy Lee Ennis +1 212 686 0666 +1 212 686 8690 nancy@qandelaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/15/2010, Entered: 11/16/2010 Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/4/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Judgment*
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 11/4/2010 Consent to Trial Before US Magistrate Judge
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/26/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Sentencing Memorandum
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/25/2010, Entered: 10/26/2010 Memo Endorsement
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/3/2010, Entered: 8/3/2010 Information - Misdemeanor
            INFORMATION (Misdemeanor) filed as to Matthew Delorey (1) count(s) 1. (jm) (Entered: 08/03/2010)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/7/2010, Entered: 7/8/2010 Affirmation in Support
              AFFIRMATION of Ryan P. Poscablo in Support by USA requesting a 30-day continuance from 7/7/10 to 8/6/10 as to Matthew Delorey (aba) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 07/08/2010)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/7/2010, Entered: 6/8/2010 Affirmation in Support
                AFFIRMATION of Ryan P. Poscablo in Support by USA requesting a 30-day continuance from 6/7/10 to 7/7/10 as to Matthew Delorey (aba) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 06/08/2010)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/7/2010, Entered: 5/10/2010 Affirmation in Support
                  AFFIRMATION of Ryan P. Poscablo in Support by USA requesting a 30-day continuance from 5/7/10 to 6/7/10 as to Matthew Delorey (aba) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 05/10/2010)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2010, Entered: 4/8/2010 Affirmation in Support
                    AFFIRMATION of Ryan P. Poscablo in Support by USA requesting a 30-day continuance from 4/7/10 to 5/7/10 as to Matthew Delorey (aba) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 04/08/2010)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: 3/22/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Matthew Delorey addressed to Honorable Henry B. Pitman from Nancy Lee Ennis dated 3/17/2010 re: requesting a modification of the Bail Order previously issued in this case by requiring only one responsible co-signer of the bond, rather than two...APPLICATION GRANTED ON CONSENT. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman on 3/18/2010)(gq) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 03/22/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 3/19/2010 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                        CJA 20 as to Matthew Delorey: Appointment of Attorney Nancy Lee Ennis for Matthew Delorey. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 3/15/10) CJA Office has mailed the original and sent a copy to the file.(sac) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 03/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Order to Continue - Interest of JusticeCourt Filing
                          ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Matthew Delorey. Time excluded from 3/8/10 until 4/7/10. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 3/8/10)(aba) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2010, Entered: 3/9/2010 Affirmation in Support
                            AFFIRMATION of Ryan P. Poscablo in Support by USA requesting a 30-day continuance from 3/8/10 to 4/7/10 as to Matthew Delorey (aba) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 03/09/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                              ENDORSED LETTER as to Matthew Delorey addressed to USMJ Katz from Nancy Lee Ennis, Esq dated 2/22/2010 re: USA v Matthew Delorey, 10 Mag 83. Ms. Ennis is Respectfully that Mr. Delorey's Bail Conditions be Modified by Extending The Time for Mr. Delorey to supply Two (2) Co-Signers to Thursday, March 11, 2010. Application Granted, So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Theodore H. Katz on 2/23/2010)(dif) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Advice of Penalties and Sanctions
                                ADVICE OF PENALTIES AND SANCTIONS as to Matthew Delorey. (dif) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Bond
                                  PRB APPEARANCE Bond Entered as to Matthew Delorey in amount of $ 25,000 PRB, 2 FRP'S by 2/18; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY and District of Mass (& Travel Between for Court Appearance); Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Regular Pretrial Supervision; Deft to be Released upon Sign Bond; Remaining Conditions to be Met by 2/18 (dif) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/4/2010, Entered: 2/5/2010 Financial Affidavit-CJA 23Court Filing
                                    CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Matthew Delorey. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger) (dif) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 2/3/2010 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                      COMPLAINT as to Matthew Delorey. In Violation of 18 U.S.C. 1343, 1349 and 2 (Conspiracy to Commit Wire Fraud and Wire Fraud) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frank Maas) (dif) [1:10-mj-00083-UA] (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?