Horowitz et al v. United States Of America
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 7:11-cv-02476

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 8, 2020 at 9:35 AM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carolyn Stankovich, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Richard Wilson +1 212 513 3536 +1 212 385 9010 benjamin.wilson@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Leo D'Alessandro +1 718 254 6200 +1 718 254 6327
No Logo Jay Horowitz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Benjamin Richard Wilson +1 212 513 3536 +1 212 385 9010 benjamin.wilson@hklaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Leo D'Alessandro +1 718 254 6200 +1 718 254 6327
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7422
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Sealed Document Attorney Notice to Retrieve
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
    STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 10-7978. Document filed by Jay Horowitz, Carolyn Stankovich.(Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
      DECLARATION of Benjamin R. Wilson in Support re: 3 MOTION to Seal Document , Filed with Initial Documents.. Document filed by Jay Horowitz, Carolyn Stankovich. (Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
        MOTION to Seal Document , Filed with Initial Documents. Document filed by Jay Horowitz, Carolyn Stankovich.(Wilson, Benjamin) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/14/2011, Entered: None
          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(jty) (Entered: 04/14/2011)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/12/2011, Entered: None
            REDACTED COMPLAINT against United States Of America. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401003819)Document filed by Carolyn Stankovich, Jay Horowitz.(fk) (Entered: 04/13/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 4,490 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?