The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp. v. Kenneth Lay
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-02592
District Judge VJ, Leonard B. Sand, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "The Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Enron Corp."

Represented by Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP

v.
Lay, Kenneth L Lay, Kenneth L, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kenneth L. Lay"

Toggle Switch Represented by Brown Rudnick LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin S. Siegel +1 212 209 4829 +1 212 209 4801 msiegel@brownrudnick.com
No Logo Linda P. Lay, Defendant
Enron Corporation Enron Corporation, Debtor
Officially listed as "Enron Creditors Recovery Corp."
No Logo John Hancock Life Insurance Company, Interpleader

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Vincent O'Gara +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 jogara@kelleydrye.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 157
Nature of Suit 423 - Bankruptcy Withdrawal, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 157
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A)'s Submission Pursuant to Order Dated August 3, 2011 and Declaration of Joseph S. Sano in Support of John Hancock Life Insurance (U.S.A.)'s Submission Pursuant to Order Dated August 3, 2011 served on David Bober on August 31, 2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.'s Statement Regarding the Effect of the Approval of Settlement Between Original Parties on John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.)'s Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference served on John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.); Linda P. Lay; Internal Revenue Service on 8-31-2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
      SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG). Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.'s Statement Regarding the Effect of the Approval of Settlement Between Original Parties on John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.)'s Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
        DECLARATION of Joseph S. Sano in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG).. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Gara, James) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2011, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG). Pursuant to Order Dated August 3, 2011. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 08/31/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER withdrawing 1 Motion to Withdraw Bankruptcy Reference. The parties are directed to submit simultaneous submission of no more than ten pages each on the following issue: the effect, if any, of the Bankruptcy Court's approval of the settlement between Plaintiff and Defendant Linda P. Lay on Interpleader Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw the Bankruptcy Reference. The submissions are due by 8/31/2011. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 8/3/2011) (mbe) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/28/2011, Entered: None
              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 15 Endorsed Letter,.. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (O'Gara, James) (Entered: 07/28/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Supplemental Memorandum in Further Opposition to John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.)'s Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's June 28, 2011 Order of Adjournment served on John Hancock, Linda P. Lay, and the Internal Revenue Service on 7-22-2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/22/2011, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 15 Endorsed Letter,.. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 07/22/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum in Opposition served on John Hancock, Linda P. Lay and Internal Revenue Service on 7-21-2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 15 Endorsed Letter,.. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2011, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Sherman Cohen on behalf of Enron Creditors Recovery Corp. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 17 MOTION for Reconsideration re; 15 Endorsed Letter,.. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(O'Gara, James) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/7/2011, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Reconsideration re; 15 Endorsed Letter,. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company.(O'Gara, James) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None
                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG).. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Gara, James) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from David S. Cohen dated 6/28/2011 re: I write in reference to John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.)'s motion to withdraw the reference to the Bankruptcy Court to apprise the Court that Plaintiff ECRC has reached a settlement with Defendant Linda Lay; Therefore ECRC requests that the Court defer the hearing on the Motion to Withdraw, currently scheduled for 7/11/2011 at 11:00 a.m., until after resolution of the 9019 Motion, which is currently set for hearing on 7/7/2011. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/28/2011) (mbe) Modified on 8/24/2011 (ae). (Entered: 06/29/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Joinder of Linda P. Lay, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, to the Memorandum in Opposition to John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.)s Motion to Withdraw the Reference served on Enron Creditors Recovery Corp, John Hancock Life Insurance Company (U.S.A), Internal Revenue Service on 6/27/2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Linda P. Lay. (Siegel, Martin) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                    JOINDER to join re: 10 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion /Joinder of Linda P. Lay, Individually and as Executrix of the Estate of Kenneth L. Lay, to the Memorandum in Opposition to John Hancock Life Insurance (U.S.A.)'s Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Document filed by Linda P. Lay.(Siegel, Martin) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum in Opposition and Declaration of David S. Cohen served on John Hancock Life Insurance Company, (U.S.A.), Linda P. Lay; Internal Revenue Service on 06-27-2011. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of David S. Cohen in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG).. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Cohen, David) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
                                          FIRST MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG).. Document filed by Enron Creditors Recovery Corp.. (Cohen, David) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from James V. O'Gara dated 6/3/2011 re: The parties write to request a further extension of the briefing schedule and oral argument regarding John Hancock's motion to withdraw the reference to the Bankruptcy Court. Deadline to file opposition papers would be due June 27, 2011. Deadline to file reply papers would be due July 6, 2011. The Oral Argument would be adjourned to July 11, 2011 at 11:00 AM. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Responses due by 6/27/2011. Replies due by 7/6/2011. Oral Argument set for 7/11/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/7/2011) (ab) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from James O'Gara dated 6/3/11 re: Extended briefing schedule as follows. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule adopted., Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG). ( Response due by 6/27/2011, Reply due by 7/6/2011. Motion Hearing set for 7/11/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 6/6/11) (cd) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from James V. O'Gara dated 5/20/11 re: counsel for John Hancock Life Insurance Company The parties are currently discussing the possibility of a settlement of this matter. In order to allow sufficient time for these negotiations the parties propose a further extension to the briefing schedule and oral argument regarding John Hancock's motion to withdraw the reference to the Bankruptcy Court in the above- referenced adversary proceeding (Dkt. 1-3)as follows: Deadline to tile opposition papers adjourned from May 23, 2011 to June 6, 2011; Deadline to file reply papers adjourned from May 31,2011 to June 13, 2011; and Oral Argument adjourned from June 6, 2011 to June 20, 2011 at 11:00 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. ( Responses due by 6/6/2011, Replies due by 6/13/2011., Oral Argument set for 6/20/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/24/11) (pl) (Entered: 05/24/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from James V. O'Gara dated 5/9/2011 re: Requesting an extension to the briefing schedule and oral argument as follows: Deadline to file opposition papers until May 23, 2011; Deadline to file reply papers until May 31, 2011; and Oral Argument until June 6, 2011 at 11: 00 am. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 5/10/2011) (jpo) (Entered: 05/10/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Leonard B. Sand from James V. O'Gara dated 4/25/11 re: counsel for Interpleader writes, that the parties propose the following briefing schedule with respect to the Interpleader-Plaintiffs motion to withdraw the reference to the Bankruptcy Court in the above-referenced adversary proceeding as follows: Opposition papers served and filed no later than Monday, May 9, 2011; Reply papers served and filed no later than Monday, May 16, 2011; Motion Return Date, Thursday, May 19,2011 (no appearance by counsel necessary); and Oral Argument, Monday, May 23,2011 at 11 :00 a.m. ENDORSEMENT: Schedule is granted. So Ordered. ( Responses due by 5/9/2011, Replies due by 5/16/2011., Oral Argument set for 5/23/2011 at 11:00 AM before Judge Leonard B. Sand.) (Signed by Judge Leonard B. Sand on 4/26/11) (pl) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Manulife Financial Corporation as Corporate Parent. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company.(O'Gara, James) (Entered: 04/20/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG). Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (bkar) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                          DECLARATION of James V. O'Gara in Support re: 1 MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG).. Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(bkar) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE BANKRUPTCY REFERENCE. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 03-2075A, 01-B-16034 (AJG).Document filed by John Hancock Life Insurance Company.(bkar) (Entered: 04/15/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 156 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?