Tymoshenko et al v. Firtash et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:11-cv-02794

Tags
Last Updated November 5, 2017 at 12:09 AM DT (4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Christy Gregory Rullis, Plaintiff
No Logo John Does "1" Through "50", Plaintiff
No Logo John Does "1" through "10,", Plaintiff
No Logo Scott Snizek, Plaintiff
No Logo Yulia Tymoshenko, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by McCallion & Associates LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space kfm@mccallionlaw.com
No Logo Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Arthur G. Cohen, Defendant
No Logo Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, Defendant
No Logo Brad S. Zackson, Defendant
No Logo Centragas Holding AG, Defendant
No Logo CMZ Ventures, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard A. Hibey +1 202 626 5888 +1 202 626 5801 rhibey@milchev.com
Space Andrew Todd Wise +1 202 626 5818 awise@milchev.com
No Logo Firtash, Dmitry, Defendant
Officially listed as "Dmytro Firtash"
No Logo Group DF, Defendant
No Logo Group DF Finance Limited, Defendant
No Logo Group DF Limited, Defendant
No Logo Group DF Real Estate, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1 through 100, Defendant
No Logo Kallista Investments LLC, Defendant
No Logo Karen Cohen, Defendant
No Logo Lilia Frolova, Defendant
No Logo Mykola Azarov, Defendant
No Logo Nadra Bank, Defendant
No Logo Oleksandr Nechvoglod, Defendant
Manafort, Paul J., Jr. Manafort, Paul J., Jr., Defendant
Officially listed as "Paul J. Manafort"
No Logo Renat Kuzmin, Defendant
No Logo Rosukrenergo AG, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Paul Coles +1 212 336 2130 +1 212 336 2222 anthony.coles@dlapiper.com
No Logo Semyon Mogilevich, Defendant
No Logo The Dynamic Group, Defendant
No Logo Valeriy Khoroshkovsky, Defendant
No Logo Viktor Pshonka, Defendant
No Logo Viktor Yanukovych, Defendant
No Logo Vulcan Properties, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Matthew Ethan Hearle +1 212 221 5700 +1 212 221 6532 mhearle@gwulaw.com
No Logo Yuriy Boyko, Defendant
No Logo Yulia Tymoshenko, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc., Intervenor-Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George Alex Lambert +1 202 640 1897 +1 202 747 7797 lawdc10@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by President and Fellows of Harvard College

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Peter Alan Joseph +1 212 924 1498 +1 845 634 2807 peter.joseph72@post.harvard.edu
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1346t
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated September 18, 2015, the motion to dismiss the TAC is granted and Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint for a fourth time is denied; accordingly, the case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/18/2015) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal, # 2 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 09/18/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    OPINION AND ORDER: Given that this is now Plaintiffs' fourth unsuccessful attempt to plead RICO claims, and given that the changes in the TAC fail to remedy the deficiencies found in the SAC, the Court declines to grant Plaintiffs yet another opportunity to amend their pleadings. When further amendment is likely to be futile, leave to amend need not be granted. See De Jesus v. Sears, Roebuck & Co., 87 F.3d 65, 72 (2d Cir. 1996) ("Plaintiffs were accorded four opportunities to plead their claims in this case, and the deficiencies in their federal claims are fundamental. The district court did not abuse its discretion by refusing them a fifth opportunity." (internal citations omitted)); see also Ruffolo v. Oppenheimer & Co., 987 F.2d 129, 131; BNP Paribas Mortgage Corp. v. Bank of Am., N.A., No. 09 Civ. 9783, 2013 WL 6484727, at 6* (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 9, 2013) (Sweet, J.). The changes from the SAC to the TAC are largely superficial or irrelevant and have not remedied the fundamental defects identified by this Court in Tymoshenko II. For the foregoing reasons, the TAC is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/18/2015) (kl) Modified on 9/18/2015 (kl). (Entered: 09/18/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: None
      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 121 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 02/09/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 121 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint., 124 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc.. . Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 127 Letter filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. The January 8, 2015 letter from Mr. Hibey that assumes that plaintiffs have "conceded" to dismiss the TAC is refuted by this letter. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 127 Letter, 121 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint: Responses due by 2/2/2015. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 1/12/2015) (tn) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Kenneth F. McCallion dated 1-8-2015 re: Response to Defendants' letter. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko.(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Richard A. Hibey dated 1/8/15 re: Status of Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc.. . Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc.. Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc..(Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: None
                    FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc.. Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law)(Hearle, Matthew) Modified on 12/8/2014 (db). (Entered: 12/05/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 121 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                        THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 87 Amended Complaint,,, 119 Amended Complaint,,,,,, against Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, Yuriy Boyko, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Arthur G. Cohen, Karen Cohen, Dmytro Firtash, Group DF, Group DF Finance Limited, Group DF Limited, Group DF Real Estate, John Does 1 through 100, Kallista Investments LLC, Renat Kuzmin, Paul J. Manafort, Semyon Mogilevich, Viktor Pshonka, The Dynamic Group, Vulcan Properties, Inc., Brad S. Zackson, Viktor Yanukovych, Mykola Azarov, Yuriy Boyko with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Scott Snizek, Christy Gregory Rullis, Yulia Tymoshenko, John Does 1 through 50, John Does 1 through10. Related document: 87 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Scott Snizek, Christy Gregory Rullis, John Does 1 through 50, Yulia Tymoshenko, 119 Amended Complaint,,,,,, filed by Scott Snizek, Christy Gregory Rullis, John Does 1 through 50, John Does 1 through10, Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit list, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Errata Exhibit 3A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3B, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3C, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3D, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4A, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 4B, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 5-10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11-15, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 16-20, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 21-24, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 25A, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 25B, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 27-30, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 31-36, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 30)(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 11/10/2014, Entered: None
                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 87 Amended Complaint,,, against Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, Yuriy Boyko, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Centragas Holding AG, Arthur G. Cohen, Karen Cohen, Dmytro Firtash, Lilia Frolova, Group DF, Group DF Finance Limited, Group DF Limited, Group DF Real Estate, John Does 1 through 100, Kallista Investments LLC, Valeriy Khoroshkovsky, Renat Kuzmin, Paul J. Manafort, Semyon Mogilevich, Nadra Bank, Oleksandr Nechvoglod, Viktor Pshonka, Rosukrenergo AG, The Dynamic Group, Vulcan Properties, Inc., Brad S. Zackson with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Scott Snizek, Christy Gregory Rullis, Yulia Tymoshenko, John Does 1 through 50, John Does 1 through10. Related document: 87 Amended Complaint,,, filed by Scott Snizek, Christy Gregory Rullis, John Does 1 through 50, Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit list, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 3A, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 3B, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 3C, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 3D, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 4A, # 10 Errata Exhibit 4B, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 5-10, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 11-15, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 16-20, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 21-24, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 26, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 27-30, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 31-36, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 37, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 38, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 39, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 40, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 25B)(McCallion, Kenneth) Modified on 11/13/2014 (jom). (Entered: 11/10/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 118 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          OPINION AND ORDER #104830 re: 92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc., 88 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Brad S. Zackson, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC: For the reasons further set forth below, the Court GRANTS the motions to dismiss the SAC, but with leave for Plaintiffs to amend. The Court now grants leave to amend the SAC so that Plaintiffs may reconsider their pleadings in light of European Community's holding. This Opinion and Order resolves Docket entries 88 and 92. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/30/2014) (tn) Modified on 10/1/2014 (ca). (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Matthew Hearle dated August 19, 2014 re: Tymoshenko v. Firtash, et al. Docket No.: 11 Cv. 2794. Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc..(Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Richard A. Hibey dated August 19, 2014 re: Response to Court Order dated August 4, 2014 (Dkt. No. 114). Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Vulcan Properties, Inc., Brad S. Zackson.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Kenneth F. McCallion dated August 12, 2014 re: Response to question by Court re European Cmty v. RJR Nabisco, Inc.. Document filed by John Does 1 through 50, John Does 1 through10, Christy Gregory Rullis, Scott Snizek, Yulia Tymoshenko.(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/12/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER: Currently pending before the Court is a motion to dismiss the Second Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Paul Manafort, Brad Zackson, CMZ Ventures, LLC, the Dynamic Group, Barbara Ann Holdings, LLC, and Vulcan Properties, Inc. After this motion became fully briefed, the Second Circuit issued a decision in European Cmty. v. RJR Nabisco, Inc. The Court directs the parties to address the following question by letter to the Court: To what extent, if any, does RJR Nabisco. Inc. affect the arguments raised in the pending motion to dismiss? Plaintiffs shall submit their letter by Tuesday, August 12, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. Defendants shall submit their response by Tuesday, August 19, 2014, at 12:00 p.m. No reply is necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/4/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 08/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Response to Defense Counsel's Letter dated June 25, 2014 re: 112 Letter. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Richard A. Hibey dated June 25, 2014 re: Case Status/Deadlines. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 06/25/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER re: 101 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for a 90 day period to provide the Court with further support for their opposition to the pending motion to dismiss and/or plaintiffs application to further amend their pleadings addressed to Judge Kimba M. W filed by Yulia Tymoshenko, 103 Response to Motion, filed by Brad S. Zackson, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC. The Court finds that Plaintiffs' memoranda and exhibits fail to show that the newly discovered documents are likely to provide "significant additional evidentiary support with regard to the legal issues raised in the pending motion to dismiss." The Court acknowledges that this is partially because Plaintiffs have not yet obtained copies of certain documents and are still reviewing other newly discovered documents. The Court therefore grants Plaintiffs until June 20, 2014, to provide additional support for the pending motion to dismiss. Defendants may submit a response by June 30, 2014. No reply is required. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 5/20/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 05/21/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 105 Memorandum of Law, 106 Memorandum of Law (Response to Plaintiffs' Memoranda Regarding Newly Discovered Evidence). Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Constance Kim on behalf of Nadra Bank. New Address: Connon Wood LLP, 35 East Union Street, Suite C, Pasadena, California, United States 91103, (626) 638-1760. (Kim, Constance) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kathleen M. Wood on behalf of Nadra Bank. New Address: Connon Wood LLP, 35 East Union Street, Suite C, Pasadena, California, United States 91103, (626) 638-1765. (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Robert Arnold de By on behalf of Nadra Bank. New Address: Connon Wood LLP, 35 East Union Street, Suite C, Pasadena, California, United States 91103, (626) 638-1762. (de By, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None
                                                  SECOND MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 104 Memo Endorsement,, Supplemental. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memo Russian, # 2 Exhibit Memo English)(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None
                                                  SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: 104 Memo Endorsement,,. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on 103 Response to Motion, filed by Brad S. Zackson, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC. ENDORSEMENT: Because Miller Chevalier was not afforded an opportunity to be heard before the Court entered its March 5, 2014 Order, the Court hereby reconsiders that Order. On April 4, plaintiffs shall file a memorandum explaining the import of the newly-discovered documents, attaching the documents and English translations thereof. By April 18, defendants shall respond. Any Reply must be filed by April 25, 2014. Discovery may continue until further notice. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/6/2014) (ft) (Entered: 03/06/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Richard A. Hibey dated March 5, 2014 re: 101 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for a 90 day period to provide the Court with further support for their opposition to the pending motion to dismiss and/or plaintiffs application to further amend their pleadings addressed to Judge Kimba M. W. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/5/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 101 Letter Motion for Extension of Time for a 90 day period to provide the Court with further support for their opposition to the pending motion to dismiss and/or plaintiffs' application to further amend their pleadings. Granted. Any further briefing/support with respect to the pending motion to Dismiss is due 5/5/2014. Brief due by 5/5/2014. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/5/2014) (cd) (Entered: 03/05/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for a 90 day period to provide the Court with further support for their opposition to the pending motion to dismiss and/or plaintiffs application to further amend their pleadings addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Kenneth F. McCallion dated 3-3-14. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko.(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Richard A. Hibey dated 2/21/2014 re: Supreme Court Decision in Relevance to the Issue of Jurisdiction over Paul J. Manafort. Document filed by Paul J. Manafort.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                            AFFIRMATION of Matthew Hearle in Support re: 92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b).. Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)., 88 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  DECLARATION of Kenneth F. McCallion in Opposition re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/17/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 94 Letter filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. SO ORDERED. Set Deadlines/Hearing as to 92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b), 88 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint: Responses due by 1/17/2014, Replies due by 1/31/2014. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 1/8/2014) (tn) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER addressed to Judge Kimba M. Wood from Kenneth F. McCallion dated 12-16-2013 re: Briefing Schedule Change. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko.(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 91 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)., 92 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b).. Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b). Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Hearle, Matthew) Modified on 12/11/2013 (ldi). (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER: On August 28, 2013, this Court dismissed Plaintiffs' Alien Tort Statute ("ATS") and Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations Act ("RICO") claims. Having dismissed Plaintiffs' federal claims, the Court held that it could no longer exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiffs' state-law claims and dismissed those claims as well. The Court denied Plaintiffs leave to amend their ATS claim, but granted Plaintiffs leave to amend their complaint with respect to their RICO claim. On November 12, 2013, the plaintiffs filed a Second Amended Complaint realleging their RICO claim and asserting state-law fraud and malicious prosecution claims. The Court therefore directs the Clerk of the Court to reopen the case. Still pending is Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 12/4/2013) (ja) Modified on 12/5/2013 (ja). (Entered: 12/04/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 88 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. Responses due by 12/19/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 23 Amended Complaint against Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Dmytro Firtash, Group DF, Group DF Finance Limited, Group DF Limited, Group DF Real Estate, John Does 1 through 100, Kallista Investments LLC, Paul J. Manafort, Semyon Mogilevich, The Dynamic Group, Vulcan Properties, Inc., Brad S. Zackson, Arthur G. Cohen, Karen Cohen with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko, John Does 1 through 50, Christy Gregory Rullis, Scott Snizek. Related document: 23 Amended Complaint filed by John Does 1 through 50, Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List, # 2 Exhibit 3A, # 3 Exhibit 3B, # 4 Exhibit 3C, # 5 Exhibit 3D, # 6 Exhibit 4A, # 7 Exhibit 4B, # 8 Exhibit 5-10, # 9 Exhibit 11-15, # 10 Exhibit 16-20, # 11 Exhibit 21-22, # 12 Exhibit 25A, # 13 Exhibit 25B, # 14 Exhibit 26, # 15 Exhibit 27-30, # 16 Exhibit 31-36)(ft) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 9/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: that this action is dismissed and discontinued without costs and without prejudice to the right to reopen the action within sixty (60) days. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Any pending motions are moot. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 9/10/2013) (tn) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document 85 Filed: 8/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER re: #103574 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim filed by Nadra Bank. For the foregoing reasons, Nadra Bank's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint is GRANTED, with prejudice as to Plaintiffs' ATS claim and without prejudice with respect to Plaintiffs' RICO claim. This Opinion resolves Docket Entry 66. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 8/28/2013) (lmb) Modified on 9/16/2013 (sdi). (Entered: 08/28/2013)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            RESPONSE in Support re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim. Per Court Order dated 04/22/13. Document filed by Nadra Bank. (de By, Robert) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              UNSIGNED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: It is hereby ORDERED that the Government of Ukraine and its General Prosecutor's Office show cause as to why an order should not be entered pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 65(a) and (b), for issuance of Temporary Restraining Order and for a Preliminary Injunction, staying the scheduled deposition of Petro Kyrychenko ("the Witness") at the Ukraine Consulate in San Francisco, California this Friday, April 19, 2013.(lmb) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER: Former Ukrainian Prime Minister Yulia Tymoshenko filed the above-captioned action in 2011, and stated several claims, including one alleging violations of the Alien Tort Statute ("ATS"). (Amended Compl. [Dkt. No. 23]). Currently pending before the Court is a motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Nadra Bank. [Dkt. No. 66]. On April 17, 2013, the United States Supreme Court decided Kiobel v. Royal Dutch Petroleum Co., No. 10-1491, 2013 WL 1628935. The Kiobel decision concerns the scope and substantive reach of the ATS, and may affect the Courts resolution of Nadra Bank's pending motion to dismiss. Accordingly, Nadra Bank and Tymoshenko are directed to file supplemental briefs addressing the effect, if any, of the Kiobel decision on the issues presented in the motion to dismiss. These briefs are not to exceed ten double-spaced pages. Nadra Bank shall submit its brief by April 29, 2013. Tymoshenko shall file its brief by May 6, 2013. (Brief due by 5/6/2013.) (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/22/2013) (ft) Modified on 4/22/2013 (ft). (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: The Court denies Tymoshenko's motion for several reasons, not least of which is that the Court lacks personal jurisdiction over the Ukrainian government. Tymoshenko has also entirely failed to suggest her claim has any likelihood of success on the merits. First, Tymoshenko has failed to demonstrate why the interrogation of Kyrychenko is at all related to her civil claims. Second, contrary to Tymoshenko's assertion, the Treaty includes no affirmative mandate to notify the DOJ about a pending investigation. Rather, the Treaty supplies procedures for requesting assistance in foreign proceedings; it does not require Ukraine to involve the DOJ in Ukrainian criminal investigations involving witnesses located on U.S. soil Consequently, Tymoshenko's request for a TRO is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 4/18/2013) (ft) Modified on 4/18/2013 (ft). (Entered: 04/18/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 79 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    OPINION & ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendant RUE's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for lack of personal jurisdiction. [Dkt. No. 56]. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/26/2013) (ft)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 79 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      OPINION & ORDER: #103054 The Court GRANTS Defendant RUE's motion to dismiss Plaintiffs' claims for lack of personal jurisdiction. [Dkt. No. 56]. Plaintiffs' claims are dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/26/2013) (ft) Modified on 4/1/2013 (jab). (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 78 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER: The U.S. Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice. This Opinion resolves Docket Entries 44 and 50. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/26/2013) (ft)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 78 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          OPINION & ORDER: #103057 The U.S. Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED without prejudice. This Opinion resolves Docket Entries 44 and 50. (Signed by Judge Kimba M. Wood on 3/26/2013) (ft) Modified on 4/1/2013 (jab). (Entered: 03/26/2013)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Kimba M. Wood. Judge Alison J. Nathan is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Nadra Bank. (de By, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 72 Motion for Constance Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Against Rosukrenergo AG.. Document filed by Rosukrenergo AG. (Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 09/19/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Constance Kim to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-7809919. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nadra Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Kim, Constance) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan, from Kenneth F. McCallion, re: request permission to file a slightly expanded Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant Rosukrenergo AG Motion to Dismiss. ENDORSEMENT: The Application is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 9/5/2012) (ja) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Against Rosukrenergo AG.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Oleksandr Merezhko in Support re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Nadra Bank. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(de By, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Svitlana Kholevan in Support re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Nadra Bank. (de By, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim.. Document filed by Nadra Bank. (de By, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and For Failure to State a Claim. Document filed by Nadra Bank.(de By, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Centragas Holding AG for Nadra Bank. Document filed by Nadra Bank.(de By, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Arnold de By on behalf of Nadra Bank (de By, Robert) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen M. Wood on behalf of Nadra Bank (Wood, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: If Plaintiff wishes to oppose the Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Rosukrenergo, it shall do so on or before September 5, 2012. Rosukrenergo's Reply, if any, shall be submitted on or before September 19, 2012. If any other Defendant submits a Motion to Dismiss, Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date that such motion is filed to submit an opposition brief. Replies, if any, shall be due within 14 days of the filing of an opposition. ( Replies due by 9/19/2012.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 8/9/2012) (ja) (Entered: 08/10/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert A. de By dated 8/6/2012 re: request that Your Honor endorse this letter granting Nadra Bank an extension of time until 10/31/2012 to respond to the Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: The application is denied. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on Robert A. de By) (jar) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Centragas Holding Limited, Corporate Parent Gazprom for Rosukrenergo AG. Document filed by Rosukrenergo AG.(Seniawski, Barbara) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Slawa Margulis in Support re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Against Rosukrenergo AG.. Document filed by Rosukrenergo AG. (Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Lars Haussmann in Support re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Against Rosukrenergo AG.. Document filed by Rosukrenergo AG. (Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 56 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Against Rosukrenergo AG.. Document filed by Rosukrenergo AG. (Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint Against Rosukrenergo AG. Document filed by Rosukrenergo AG.(Coles, Anthony) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Richard A. Hibey dated 3/26/2012 re: We sent an email to Mr. McCallion earlier today seeking his position on our request for additional pages but have not received a reply as of the time this letter is being sent to the Court. ENDORSEMENT: The Reply may be 20 pages. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/11/2012) (djc) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Robert A. De By dated 6/8/2012 re: Counsel requests that Your Honor grant Nadra Bank an extension of time to respond to the Amended Complaint until September 4, 2012. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. Oleksandr Nechvoglod answer due 9/4/2012. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/11/2012) (djc) (Entered: 06/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 50 MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc.., 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO MOTIONS TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b) OF DEFENDANTS PAUL MANAFORT, BRAD JACKSON, CMZ VENTURES, LLC, THE DYNAMIC GROUP, BARBARA ANN HOLDINGS LLC AND VULCAN PROPERTIES, INC.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Anthony P. Coles dated 5/25/2012 re: Request for extension of time to respond to Amended Complaint. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/25/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 05/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc.. Document filed by Vulcan Properties, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of the Motion of Defendant Vulcan Properties Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) to Dismiss the Complaint)(Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Dynamic Group.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CMZ Ventures, LLC.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Ethan Hearle on behalf of Vulcan Properties, Inc. (Hearle, Matthew) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 44 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Document filed by Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Paul J. Manafort, The Dynamic Group, Brad S. Zackson.(Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Wise on behalf of The Dynamic Group (Wise, Andrew) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Wise on behalf of CMZ Ventures, LLC (Wise, Andrew) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Wise on behalf of Brad S. Zackson (Wise, Andrew) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Todd Wise on behalf of Barbara Ann Holdings LLC (Wise, Andrew) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Hibey on behalf of The Dynamic Group (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Hibey on behalf of CMZ Ventures, LLC (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Hibey on behalf of Brad S. Zackson (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard A. Hibey on behalf of Barbara Ann Holdings LLC (Hibey, Richard) (Entered: 04/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Richard A. Hibey dated 4/11/2012 re: The first purpose of this letter is to ask the Court to extend its March 30, 2012 Order granting Pro Hac Vice admission for Mr. Wise and me to our representation of these four defendants. Assuming the Court is willing to do so, we resepectfully ask that the March 30, 2012 scheduling order apply to each of the parties we now represent. ENDORSEMENT:So ordered. Mr. Hibey shall put in a notice of appearance for each defendant he is representing., ( Motions due by 4/27/2012.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/12/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 27 Motion for Andrew T. Wise to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Andrew T. Wise is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Paul Manafort. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/30/2012) (mro) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 28 Motion for Richard A. Hibey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Richard A. Hibey is admitted Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for Paul Manafort. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/30/2012) (mro) (Entered: 04/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. CMZ Ventures, LLC served on 3/8/2012, answer due 3/29/2012; The Dynamic Group served on 3/8/2012, answer due 3/29/2012; Brad S. Zackson served on 3/8/2012, answer due 3/29/2012. Service was accepted by Charles Birnbaum from Atelier Properties, 853 Broadway, Room 802 acccepted services for Brad S. Zackson, CMZ Ventures LLC and The Dynamic Group a/k/a The Dynamic Fund.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Vulcan Properties, Inc. served on 3/19/2012, answer due 4/9/2012. Service was accepted by Betsy Scott c/o WK Incorporating Services Inc., 3500 South Dupont Highway, Dover, DE 19901. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Barbara Ann Holdings LLC served on 3/19/2012, answer due 4/9/2012. Service was accepted by Sue Rhea c/o CSC, 2711 Centerville Road, Suite 400, Wilmington, DE 19808. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paul J. Manafort served on 3/17/2012, answer due 4/9/2012. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Richard A. Hibey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Paul J. Manafort.(bwa) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Andrew T. Wise to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Paul J. Manafort.(bwa) (Entered: 04/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As discussed at the conference held on March 30, 2012, Plaintiffs shall submit on or before April 20, 2012, a letter detailing all steps that have been taken to serve Defendants, including the dates on which those steps were taken. If Plaintiffs wish to file a second amended complaint, it must do so on or before April 13, 2012. Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss shall be submitted on or before April 27, 2012. Plaintiffs' opposition is due on or before May 28, 2012, and Defendants' reply is due on or before June 11, 2012., ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/13/2012., Motions due by 4/27/2012., Responses due by 5/28/2012., Replies due by 6/11/2012.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/2/2012) (lmb) (Entered: 04/02/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/30/2012 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 23B, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan, and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/22/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 02/22/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Richard J. Sullivan is no longer assigned to the case. (pgu) (Entered: 02/16/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Barbara Ann Holdings LLC, Yuriy Boyko, CMZ Ventures, LLC, Centragas Holding AG, Dmytro Firtash, Lilia Frolova, Group DF, Group DF Finance Limited, Group DF Limited, Group DF Real Estate, John Does 1 through 100, Kallista Investments LLC, Valeriy Khoroshkovsky, Renat Kuzmin, Paul J. Manafort, Semyon Mogilevich, Nadra Bank, Oleksandr Nechvoglod, Viktor Pshonka, Rosukrenergo AG, The Dynamic Group, Vulcan Properties, Inc., Brad S. Zackson with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko, John Does 1 through 50.(ft) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2011: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Ex. 4-8, # 3 Ex. 9-10, # 4 Ex. 11-17, # 5 Ex 18 Part 1 of 6, # 6 Ex. 18 Part 2 of 6, # 7 Ex 18 Part 3 of 6, # 8 Ex 18 Part 4 of 6, # 9 Ex 18 Part 5 of 6, # 10 Ex 18 Part 6 of 6, # 11 Ex 19, # 12 Ex 20 Part 1, # 13 Ex 20 Part 2 of 2, # 14 Ex 21-22, # 15 ex 23-26, # 16 Ex 27-36, # 17 Ex 37-41, # 18 Ex 42, # 19 Ex 43-56, # 20 Ex 57-61, # 21 Ex 62) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2011: # 22 Ex 63 Part 1, # 23 Ex 63 Part 2, # 24 Ex 64, # 25 Ex 65-69 Part 1, # 26 Ex 65-69 Part 2, # 27 Ex 70-76, # 28 Ex 77-84, # 29 Ex 85-102, # 30 Ex 103-118, # 31 Ex 119-131) (ama). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/29/2011: # 32 Ex 132-151) (ama). (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. For the foregoing reasons, UTICo's motion to intervene is denied. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion located at Doc. No. 8 and to terminate Universal Trading & Investment Co. as a party to this action. Denying 8 Motion to Intervene. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/19/11) (rjm) (Entered: 10/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Intervene pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 24(a) and (b).. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Lambert, George) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - REPLY to Response to Motion re: 8 MOTION to Intervene pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 24(a) and (b). Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-D)(Lambert, George) Modified on 9/16/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER: On July 13, 2011, Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc. filed a motion to intervene in this action, seeking to collect from Plaintiff Tymoshenko a default judgment that it obtained against United Energy Systems of Ukraine PFG. (Doc. No. 8.) By submission dated July 29, 2011, Plaintiffs opposed Universal's motion. (Doc. Nos. 17-18.) It is hereby Ordered that the Court will address Universal's motion at the initial status conference scheduled for Friday, September 9, 2011, at 12:15 p.m. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/25/2011) (mro) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Kenneth F. McCallion in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Intervene pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 24(a) and (b).. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Intervene pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 24(a) and (b). Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion for Intervention By Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc.. Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko. (McCallion, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/29/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RELATED CASE AFFIDAVIT of George Lambert re: that this action be filed as related to 11-mc-249. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc..(Lambert, George) (Entered: 07/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER ON MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 14 Motion for George Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Intervener Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/20/2011) (ab) (Entered: 07/20/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/14/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for George Lambert to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc.(pgu) (Entered: 07/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COUNTERCLAIM against Yulia Tymoshenko.Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc..(Joseph, Peter) (Entered: 07/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc..(Joseph, Peter) (Entered: 07/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to 1 Complaint. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc..(Joseph, Peter) (Entered: 07/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER: On July 11, 2011, Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc. ("Universal") filed a motion to intervene in this action, asserting that it is a judgment creditor of Plaintiff Tymoshenko. Any party wishing to join or oppose Universal's motion may do so by July 29, 2011. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/15/2011) (js) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Roman A. Plyamovaty in Support re: 8 MOTION to Intervene pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 24(a) and (b).. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)(Joseph, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/13/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Intervene pursuant to F.R.Civ.P 24(a) and (b). Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc..(Joseph, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Intervene by Judgment Creditor Universal Trading & Investment Co., Inc.. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Joseph, Peter) Modified on 7/13/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER, that the Court is in receipt of a letter from Plaintiffs, dated July 11, 2011, requesting an adjournment of the initial status conference in order to provide time for service of Defendants pursuant to the Hague Convention. This request is granted. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' time to serve Defendants is extended beyond 120 days, pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Additionally, the initial status conference is adjourned until Friday, September 9, 2011, at 12:15 p.m. in Courtroom 21C. The parties shall make their initial submissions (as described in the June 21, 2011 Order) no later than Friday,September 2, 2011. ( Initial Conference set for 9/9/2011 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/11/11) (pl) Modified on 7/12/2011 (pl). (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by George Lambert. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc.(Joseph, Peter) Modified on 7/12/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter Alan Joseph on behalf of Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc. (Joseph, Peter) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Universal Trading & Investment Co. Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit)(Joseph, Peter) Modified on 7/12/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER. The parties are HEREBY ORDERED to appear for a status conference on Friday, July 22, 2011, at 11:45 a.m. in Courtroom 21 C of the United States District Court for the Southern District ofNew York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, by Wednesday, July 13, 2011, at 4:00p.m., the parties shall jointly submit a letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information as set forth herein in separate paragraphs; By Wednesday, July 13, 2011, at 4:00 p.m., the parties shall submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. (Status Conference set for 7/22/2011 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/21/11) (djc) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: 4/27/2011 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against Dmytro Firtash, John Does 1 through 100, Rosukrenergo AG (RUE). (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 1005089)Document filed by Yulia Tymoshenko, John Does 1 through10.(ama)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 626 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?