Bavis v. UAL Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:02-cv-07154
District Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 2, 2017 at 12:45 PM DT (4.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mary Bavis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R. Brauchle +1 843 216 9000 +1 843 216 9440

Toggle Switch Represented by Baritz and Colman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/07/2004, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John A. Greaves

Toggle Switch Represented by Hanly Conroy Bierstein Sheridan Fisher & Hayes, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jayne H. Conroy +1 212 784 6402 +1 212 784 6420 jconroy@hanlyconroy.com

Represented by Motley Rice, LLC

v.
No Logo Air France, Defendant
No Logo Air Jamaica, Defendant
No Logo Air Transport Association, Defendant
No Logo AirTran Airways, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alaska Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo America West Airlines, Inc., Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo American Trans Air, Inc., Defendant
AMR Corporation AMR Corporation, Defendant
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
Unknown Role, Mesa Airlines Inc
No Logo Burns International Security Services Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hunton & Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey W. Gutchess +1 305 810 2500 +8102 810 810 2460 jgutchess@hunton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian V Otero +1 212 309 1020 +1 212 309 1870 botero@hunton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle R. Parker +1 212 309 1000
No Logo Cape Air, Defendant
No Logo City of Portland, Maine, Defendant
No Logo Colgan Air, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Camille V. Otero +1 212 262 2390
Continental Airlines, Inc. Continental Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Delta Air Lines, Inc. Delta Air Lines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Delta Airlines"
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
No Logo Delta Express, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
No Logo Globe Aviation Services, Defendant

Represented by Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC

No Logo Heimann Systems Corp., Defendant
No Logo Huntleigh USA Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kimberly A. Donlon +1 978 979 6531 +1 978 922 5819 kadonlon@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ed Green Attorney at Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edwin W. Green +1 212 661 4200 +1 212 661 4812

Represented by Mendes & Mount

Represented by Susman Godfrey, LLP

No Logo ICTS International NV, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jon Paul Robbins +1 212 448 1100 +1 212 448 0066 probbins@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo In Vision Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation, Defendant
No Logo L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems, Defendant
No Logo L3 Communications Holdings, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Massachusetts Port Authority, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John L. Altieri, Jr. +1 212 326 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Allen W. Burton +1 212 326 2282 +1 212 326 2061 aburton@omm.com
No Logo Midway Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Midwest Express Airlines, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Northwest Airlines Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Pinkerton's, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Quantum Magnetics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Securitas Ab, Defendant
No Logo Swiss, Defendant
The Boeing Company, Inc. The Boeing Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "The Boeing Company"
No Logo Us Airways, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by trial-lawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard P. Campbell +1 617 241 3000 +1 617 241 5115 rpcampbell@campbell-trial-lawyers.com
UAL Corporation UAL Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey J. Ellis +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 Jellis@QuirkBakalor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Patrick Sexton +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 bsexton@quirkbakalor.com
United Airlines, Inc. United Airlines, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Quirk and Bakalor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey J. Ellis +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 Jellis@QuirkBakalor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Loretta Anne Redmond +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1064 lredmond@quirkbakalor.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian Patrick Sexton +1 212 319 1000 +1 212 319 1065 bsexton@quirkbakalor.com
No Logo Airports Council International - North America, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Anderson & Kreiger LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hetal Satish Dhagat +1 617 621 6500 +1 617 621 6501 hdhagat@gmail.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (258) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 258 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
SEALED MATERIALS DISPOSED: Document(s) 232 and 234 were destroyed since the filing party did not retrieve the material(s) within 30 days of the date indicated. The sealed record(s) were destroyed on 04/28/2015.(mps) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
    LREF
    Sealed Legal Document 257 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
    SEALED MATERIALS RETRIEVED: Document(s) 238 and 239 were retrieved on 04/03/2015.(mps) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
      NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 238, 239 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/22/2015. (mps) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/23/2015, Entered: None
        NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RETRIEVE SEALED MATERIAL: Notice to the attorney of record for the filing party to retrieve sealed document number 232, 234 within thirty (30) days, or the Court will dispose of them. Sealed Records Retrieval due by 4/22/2015. (mps) (Entered: 03/23/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 6/5/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/3/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/11/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 1/23/13 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 1/23/2013 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Drevis, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Rodriguez, Somari) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER: 12/17/2012 Status Conference reset for 1/23/2013 at 03:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein, for the Cantor claims and at 3:15 for the Silverstein claims. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/10/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(cd) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 10/11/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 10/11/2012 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2013.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 10/18/12 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 6/23/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 6/23/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/8/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/19/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/15/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 10/27/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/15/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/21/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/28/2012.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 10/27/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/19/2011, Entered: None
                                  STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, WITH prejudice against the defendant(s) AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Boeing Company, Burns International Security Services Corp., Burns International Services Corp., Colgan Air Inc., Delta Air Lines, Inc., Emery Roth & Partners L.L.C., Emery Roth & Sons, P.C., Globe Airport Security Services, Inc., Globe Aviation Services Corporation, Huntleigh Corporation, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Leslie E. Robertson Associates, Massachusetts Port Authority, Minoru Yamasaki Associates, Inc., Pinkerton's Inc., Securitas AB, Silverstein Properties, Inc., Skilling Ward Magnusson Barkshire Inc., The Port Authority of New York & New Jersey, Tishman Construction Corporation, UAL Corporation, US Airways Inc., United Air Lines, Inc., AMR Corporation, Air France, Air Jamaica, Air Transport Association, Airports Council International - North America, Airtran Airways Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., America West Airlines, Inc., American Trans Air, Inc., Burns International Security Services Corporation, Cape Air, City of Portland, Maine, Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Delta Express, Inc., Globe Aviation Services, Heimann Systems Corp., Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Invision Technologies, Inc., L-3 Communications Corporation, L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems, L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc., Massachusetts Port Authority, MidWest Express Airlines, Inc., Midway Airlines Corporation, Northwest Airlines Corporation, Pinkerton's Inc., Quantum Magnetics, Inc., Securitas AB, Swiss, The Boeing Company, U.S. Airways, Inc., UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc. and WITHOUT costs to either party pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Mary Bavis.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 09/19/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, Rule 56.1 Statement and Declaration of Vincent I. Parrett served on All Parties on 9/16/2011. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                      DECLARATION of Vincent Ian Parrett in Opposition re: (1538 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 222 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exbihit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exbihit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exbihit 5 (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit Exbihit 5 (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit Exbihit 6 (Part 1), # 8 Exhibit Exbihit 6 (Part 2), # 9 Exhibit Exbihit 7, # 10 Exhibit Exbihit 8, # 11 Exhibit Exbihit 9, # 12 Exhibit Exbihit 10, # 13 Exhibit Exbihit 11, # 14 Exhibit Exbihit 12, # 15 Exhibit Exbihit 13, # 16 Exhibit Exbihit 14, # 17 Exhibit Exbihit 15, # 18 Exhibit Exbihit 16, # 19 Exhibit Exbihit 17, # 20 Exhibit Exbihit 18, # 21 Exhibit Exbihit 19, # 22 Exhibit Exbihit 20, # 23 Exhibit Exbihit 21, # 24 Exhibit Exbihit 22, # 25 Exhibit Exbihit 23, # 26 Exhibit Exbihit 24, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit Exbihit 26, # 29 Exhibit Exbihit 27, # 30 Exhibit Exbihit 28, # 31 Exhibit Exbihit 29, # 32 Exhibit Exbihit 30, # 33 Exhibit Exbihit 31, # 34 Exhibit Exbihit 32, # 35 Exhibit Exbihit 33, # 36 Exhibit Exbihit 34, # 37 Exhibit Exbihit 35, # 38 Exhibit Exbihit 36, # 39 Exhibit Exbihit 37, # 40 Exhibit Exbihit 38, # 41 Exhibit Exbihit 39, # 42 Exhibit Exbihit 40, # 43 Exhibit Exbihit 41, # 44 Exhibit Exbihit 42, # 45 Exhibit Exbihit 43, # 46 Exhibit Exbihit 44, # 47 Exhibit Exbihit 45, # 48 Exhibit Exbihit 46, # 49 Exhibit Exbihit 47, # 50 Exhibit Exbihit 48, # 51 Exhibit Exbihit 49, # 52 Exhibit Exbihit 50, # 53 Exhibit Exbihit 51, # 54 Exhibit Exbihit 52, # 55 Exhibit Exbihit 53, # 56 Exhibit Exbihit 54, # 57 Exhibit Exbihit 55, # 58 Exhibit Exbihit 56, # 59 Exhibit Exbihit 57, # 60 Exhibit Exbihit 58, # 61 Exhibit Exbihit 59, # 62 Exhibit Exbihit 60, # 63 Exhibit Exbihit 61, # 64 Exhibit Exbihit 62, # 65 Exhibit Exbihit 63, # 66 Exhibit Exbihit 64, # 67 Exhibit Exbihit 65, # 68 Exhibit Exbihit 66, # 69 Exhibit Exbihit 67, # 70 Exhibit Exbihit 68, # 71 Exhibit Exbihit 69, # 72 Exhibit Exbihit 70, # 73 Exhibit Exbihit 71, # 74 Exhibit Exbihit 72, # 75 Exhibit Exbihit 73, # 76 Exhibit Exbihit 74, # 77 Exhibit Exbihit 75, # 78 Exhibit Exbihit 76, # 79 Exhibit Exbihit 77, # 80 Exhibit Exbihit 78, # 81 Exhibit Exbihit 79, # 82 Exhibit Exbihit 80, # 83 Exhibit Exbihit 81, # 84 Exhibit Exbihit 82, # 85 Exhibit Exbihit 83, # 86 Exhibit Exbihit 84, # 87 Exhibit Exbihit 85, # 88 Exhibit Exbihit 86, # 89 Exhibit Exbihit 87, # 90 Exhibit Exbihit 88, # 91 Exhibit Exbihit 89, # 92 Exhibit Exbihit 90, # 93 Exhibit Exbihit 91, # 94 Exhibit Exbihit 92, # 95 Exhibit Exbihit 93, # 96 Exhibit Exbihit 94, # 97 Exhibit Exbihit 95, # 98 Exhibit Exbihit 96, # 99 Exhibit Exbihit 97, # 100 Exhibit Exbihit 98, # 101 Exhibit Exbihit 99, # 102 Exhibit Exbihit 100, # 103 Exhibit Exbihit 101, # 104 Exhibit Exbihit 102, # 105 Exhibit Exbihit 103, # 106 Exhibit Exbihit 104, # 107 Exhibit Exbihit 105, # 108 Exhibit Exbihit 106, # 109 Exhibit Exbihit 107, # 110 Exhibit Exbihit 108, # 111 Exhibit Exbihit 109, # 112 Exhibit Exbihit 110, # 113 Exhibit Exbihit 111, # 114 Exhibit Exbihit 112, # 115 Exhibit Exbihit 113, # 116 Exhibit Exbihit 114, # 117 Exhibit Exbihit 115, # 118 Exhibit Exbihit 116, # 119 Exhibit Exbihit 117, # 120 Exhibit Exbihit 118, # 121 Exhibit Exbihit 119, # 122 Exhibit Exbihit 120, # 123 Exhibit Exbihit 121, # 124 Exhibit Exbihit 122, # 125 Exhibit Exbihit 123, # 126 Exhibit Exbihit 124, # 127 Exhibit Exbihit 125, # 128 Exhibit Exbihit 126, # 129 Exhibit Exbihit 127)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Parrett, Vincent) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 239 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Sealed Legal Document 238 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                          SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                            RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Parrett, Vincent) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/16/2011, Entered: None
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (222 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1538 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment. . Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Parrett, Vincent) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Sarah S. Normand dated 9/12/2011 re: The Government writes to request that the Court accept filing of the consolidated schedules and the Government's objections nunc pro tunc. The parties have consented to this request. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/15/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH (ab) (Entered: 09/16/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Sealed Legal Document 234 Filed: 9/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 09/15/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 233 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 09/13/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 232 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                      SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mps) (Entered: 09/12/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/15/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/3/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/13/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/12/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            AMENDED SUMMARY ORDER SETTING NEXT CONFERENCE: My recent Order and Opinion set the next conference in this case for September 19, 2011, but indicated that it would begin both at 10:30am and 2:30pm. The conference will begin at 10:30am. The conference shall go forward in Courtroom 14D, and will continue until concluded. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/7/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH (ab) (Entered: 09/07/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                              RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Defendants Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment, Defendants Rule 56.1 Statement, Declaration of Jeffrey J. Ellis, Defendants Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment served on All Parties on 8/26/2011. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                  FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Summary Judgment Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Ellis, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/29/2011 (db). (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (222 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1538 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment. . Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support re: (1538 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 222 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit B (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit B (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit B (Part 3), # 6 Exhibit B (Part 4), # 7 Exhibit C (Part 1), # 8 Exhibit C (Part 2), # 9 Exhibit C (Part 3), # 10 Exhibit D (Part 1), # 11 Exhibit D (Part) 2, # 12 Exhibit E (Part 1), # 13 Exhibit E (Part 2), # 14 Exhibit E (Part 3), # 15 Exhibit E (Part 4), # 16 Exhibit E (Part 5), # 17 Exhibit E (Part 6), # 18 Exhibit F, # 19 Exhibit G (Part 1), # 20 Exhibit G (Part 2), # 21 Exhibit G (Part 3), # 22 Exhibit H, # 23 Exhibit I (Part 1), # 24 Exhibit I (Part 2), # 25 Exhibit J, # 26 Exhibit K, # 27 Exhibit L, # 28 Exhibit M, # 29 Exhibit N, # 30 Exhibit O, # 31 Exhibit P, # 32 Exhibit Q (Part 1), # 33 Exhibit Q (Part 2), # 34 Exhibit Q (Part 3), # 35 Exhibit R, # 36 Exhibit S, # 37 Exhibit T, # 38 Exhibit U, # 39 Exhibit V, # 40 Exhibit W, # 41 Exhibit X (Part 1), # 42 Exhibit X (Part 2), # 43 Exhibit Y (Part 1), # 44 Exhibit Y (Part 2), # 45 Exhibit Z, # 46 Exhibit AA, # 47 Exhibit BB, # 48 Exhibit CC, # 49 Exhibit DD (Part 1), # 50 Exhibit DD (Part 2), # 51 Exhibit EE, # 52 Exhibit FF, # 53 Exhibit GG, # 54 Exhibit HH (Part 2), # 55 Exhibit HH (Part 2), # 56 Exhibit II, # 57 Exhibit JJ, # 58 Exhibit KK (Part 2), # 59 Exhibit KK (Part 2), # 60 Exhibit LL, # 61 Exhibit MM, # 62 Exhibit NN (Part 1), # 63 Exhibit NN (Part 2), # 64 Exhibit NN (Part 3), # 65 Exhibit OO, # 66 Exhibit PP, # 67 Exhibit QQ, # 68 Exhibit RR, # 69 Exhibit SS, # 70 Exhibit TT, # 71 Exhibit UU, # 72 Exhibit VV, # 73 Exhibit WW)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 8/26/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Ellis, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/26/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Phillip McKeegan on behalf of Huntleigh USA Corporation (McKeegan, George) (Entered: 08/22/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/1/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 8/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/1/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Denise Richards, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/19/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 8/15/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 8/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 8/15/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/12/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/21/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/18/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Donald A. Migliori dated 8/10/11 re: The parties agree, subject to the Court's approval, to an extended briefing schedule concerning the plaintiff's motion to compel production of the CD-ROM entitled "FAA Transnational Threat to Civil Aviation" (Docket Entry #1521). Pursuant to that agreement, the defendants have until and including Friday, September 16, 2011, to file a response to the plaintiff's motion. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. ( Responses due by 9/16/2011) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/10/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(pl) (Entered: 08/12/2011)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a HEARING proceeding held on 7/27/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 8/11/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: HEARING held on 7/27/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/5/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/15/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          DECLARATION of Vincent Ian Parrett in Support re: (159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Parrett, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc. Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Law on Burden of Proof and Presumption. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Parrett, Vincent) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              BRIEF Addressed to the Inference and the Burden of Proof Issues Raised by the Court at the July 27, 2011 Hearing. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Robert T. Haefele in Support re: (1521 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 208 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION to Compel Production of CD-Rom Containing Powerpoint and Audio/Visual Presentation Entitled "FAA Transnational Threat to Civil Aviation".. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 (Part 1 of 6), # 6 Exhibit 5 (Part 2 of 6), # 7 Exhibit 5 (Part 3 of 6), # 8 Exhibit 5 (Part 4 of 6), # 9 Exhibit 5 (Part 5 of 6), # 10 Exhibit 5 (Part 6 of 6), # 11 Exhibit 6, # 12 Exhibit 7, # 13 Exhibit 8, # 14 Exhibit 9, # 15 Exhibit 10, # 16 Exhibit 11, # 17 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (208 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1521 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Compel Production of CD-Rom Containing Powerpoint and Audio/Visual Presentation Entitled "FAA Transnational Threat to Civil Aviation".. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Production of CD-Rom Containing Powerpoint and Audio/Visual Presentation Entitled "FAA Transnational Threat to Civil Aviation". Document filed by Mary Bavis.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Haefele, Robert) (Entered: 08/05/2011)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 8/1/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      SUMAMRY ORDER granting (1430) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; granting (145) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 1:02-cv-07154-AKH: For the reasons provided on the record, the motion is granted, and the Massachusetts Port Authority is dismissed from the case. The dismissal is with prejudice, with costs to be taxed by the Clerk. The Clerk shall terminate the motion (Doc. No. 145). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/29/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH (ab) (Entered: 08/01/2011)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (200 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Feagley in Opposition re: (200 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Elizabeth Smith in Support re: (200 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1507 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (200 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1507 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (200 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1507 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (200 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1507 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) Modified on 7/28/2011 (ldi). (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 228 Filed: 9/7/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER AND OPINION REGULATING BURDENS OF PROOF AND ISSUES FOR JURY INSTRUCTIONS. #100757 Presently, the parties are scheduled to submit pretrial materials on September 2, 2011 and September 23, 2011. Those materials will be affected by this Opinion an d Order, and the dates are therefore each adjourned two weeks, to September 16, 2011, and October 7, 2011. The parties shall appear for their next conference on September 19, 2011, at 10:30 a.m. The conference shall be held at 2:30 p.m., in Courtroo m 14D. The Clerk shall terminate the motions (Doc. Nos. 159 and 162 in No. 02 Civ. 7154). Re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care filed by Mary Bavis, (1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-A KH, 159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc filed by Mary Bavis. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/7/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH (as per Chambers instructions next conference to be held on 9/19/11 at 10:30 a.m. not 2:30 p.m.)(rjm) Modified on 9/9/2011 (ajc).
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 7/27/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pre-Trial Recoverable Damages Under Massachusetts Law. Document filed by Mary Bavis.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/27/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Reply Affirmation in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                        REPLY AFFIRMATION of Jason T. Cohen in Support re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P., World Trade Center Properties LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion of Plaintiff Bavis to Charge Res Ipsa Loquitur Against Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. served on All Parties on 7/15/11. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care served on All Parties on 7/15/2011. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 7/15/2011, Entered: 7/15/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 07/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/11/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Michael R. Feagley dated 7/8/11 re: I write on behalf of the Bavis Defendants - United Air Lines, Inc. United Continental Holdings (f/k/a UAL Corporation), Huntleigh USA Corporation, and The Massachusetts Port Authority ("The Bavis Defendants") - asking that the Court issue an order needed to avoid undue prejudice to defendants. Specifically, we ask that the Court issue an order revising the schedule for submission of their expert reports as further specified in this letter. ENDORSEMENT: Defendants shall disclose expert reports identified in bullet number 1 today. Defendants shall disclose expert reports identified in bullet number 2 by July 29, 2011. Defendants should not depose any Plaintiff's expert who ought to have a chance to review any of the reports identified in bullet number 2 that are relevant to the given Plaintiff's expert's testimony, until Plaintiff has received such reports. Counsel shall work together to coordinate the disclosure of these reports, the depositions, and the date. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 07/11/2011)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      JOINT MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Ellis, Esq. in Opposition re: (162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Declaration of Michael Feagley and MOL in Opposition to Plaintiff's Res Ipsa Loquitur Charge served on All Parties on 07-08-2011. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Desmond T. Barry, Jr. in Opposition re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Brief
                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF Concerning Applicable Standard of Care. Document filed by AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Barry, Desmond) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: 7/8/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Michael R. Feagley in Opposition re: (159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Air Lines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit A (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit A (Part 3), # 4 Exhibit A (Part 4), # 5 Exhibit A (Part 5), # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C, # 8 Exhibit D, # 9 Exhibit E, # 10 Exhibit F, # 11 Exhibit G, # 12 Exhibit H, # 13 Exhibit I, # 14 Exhibit J, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Exhibit M, # 18 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 07/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: 7/6/2011 Order on Motion to File Amicus BriefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on ACI-NA'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF. ENDORSEMENT: Motion denied. This amicus previously filed a brief. The Clerk shall terminate the motion. So ordered. Denying (1480) Motion to File Amicus Brief in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; Denying (178) Motion to File Amicus Brief in case 1:02-cv-07154-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/6/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 07/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 7/5/2011, Entered: 7/5/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment. [Superseding]. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority, Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of The Massachusetts Port Authoritys Motion for Summary Judgment; The Massachusetts Port Authoritys Reply to Mary Baviss Statement of Disputed Facts Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1; and Reply Declaration of Shiva Eftekhari with attached exhibits on 7/1/2011. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Shiva Eftekhari in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - C, # 2 Exhibit D - O, # 3 Exhibit P - Z, # 4 Exhibit AA - FF)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Reply
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY re: (1467 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Counter Statement to Rule 56.1,, (1471 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) Counter Statement to Rule 56.1. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 7/1/2011, Entered: 7/1/2011 Motion to File Amicus Brief
                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to File Amicus Brief (Supplemental). Document filed by Airports Council International - North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit ACI-NA's Supplemental Brief as Amicus Curiae in Support of Massport's Motion for Summary Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Lewis, Scott) (Entered: 07/01/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 6/30/2011, Entered: 6/30/2011 Protective OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER GOVERNING ACCESS TO HANDLING AND USE OF SENSITIVE SECURITY INFORMATION AT TRIAL...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/30/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jfe) Modified on 7/7/2011 (jfe). (Entered: 06/30/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 6/28/2011, Entered: 6/28/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, the parties' protective order shall be submitted to the Court by July 1, 2011. The Court will hold a hearing to consider the parties' designations and counter-designations of sensitive security information ("SSI"), and the parties' respective objections, on September 22, 2011. The Court will hold a second hearing to consider the Government's proposed substitutions for SSI, and the parties' objections, on October 17, 2011. The parties and the Government shall draft a statement regarding SSI and replacement evidence for the Court to read to the jury. The parties shall submit their proposed statement prior to the October 17,2011. conference, for approval at the conference.On July 27,2011, the parties shall appear for argument on the several motions now being briefed, The argument shall begin at 10:30am,( Oral Argument set for 7/27/2011 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/27/11) (pl) Modified on 6/28/2011 (pl). (Entered: 06/28/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to the Massachusetts Port Authority's Motion for Summary Judgment and supporting documents served on All Parties on 6/24/2011. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: 6/27/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Mary Schiavo in Opposition re: (145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7a, # 8 Exhibit 7b, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11, # 13 Exhibit 12, # 14 Exhibit 13, # 15 Exhibit 14, # 16 Exhibit 15, # 17 Exhibit 16, # 18 Exhibit 17, # 19 Exhibit 18, # 20 Exhibit 19a, # 21 Exhibit 19b, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 6/25/2011, Entered: 6/25/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (MISSING EXHIBITS) - DECLARATION of Mary Schiavo in Opposition re: (145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) Modified on 6/29/2011 (lb). (Entered: 06/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 6/25/2011, Entered: 6/25/2011 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                              COUNTER STATEMENT TO (1432 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 147 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 6/25/2011, Entered: 6/25/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Michael Pilgrim in Opposition re: (145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jason T. Cohen in Opposition re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit Exh. 1 Part 1 of 3, # 12 Exhibit Exh. 1 Part 2 of 3, # 13 Exhibit Exh. 1 Part 3 of 3)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Counter Statement to Rule 56.1
                                                                                                                                                                                      COUNTER STATEMENT TO (1432 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 147 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/24/2011, Entered: 6/24/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center, L.L.C., 4 World Trade Center, L.L.C., World Trade Center Properties, L.L.C., 1 World Trade Center LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 1 World Trade Center L.L.C., 3 World Trade Center L.L.C., 7 World Trade Center Company, L.P.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(Egan, Thomas) (Entered: 06/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion on the Applicable Standard of Care, supporting Memorandum of Law and Declaration of Vincent Parrett served on All Parties on 6/17/11. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion of Plaintiff Bavis to Charge Res Ipsa Loquitur Against Defendant United Air Lines, Inc. and supporting Memorandum of Law with Declaration of Vincent Parrett served on All Parties on 6/17/11. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Vincent I. Parrett in Support re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1457 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 162 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Motion for Pretrial
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Pre-Trial Applicable Standard of Care. Document filed by Mary Bavis.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Vincent I. Parrett in Support re: (159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1454 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 159 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 Motion for Pretrial
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Pre-Trial Res Ipsa Jury Charge Against United Air Lines, Inc. Document filed by Mary Bavis.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 6/17/2011, Entered: 6/17/2011 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion of Plaintiff Bavis to Charge Res Ipsa Loquitur Against Defendant United Air Lines, Inc.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 06/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/14/2011, Entered: 6/14/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The trial of Bavis v. United Airlines, No. 02 Civ. 7154 (AKH), previously scheduled to begin June 13,2011, has been postponed to begin November 7, 2011. (Ready for Trial by 11/7/2011.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/13/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jar) (Entered: 06/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 6/10/2011, Entered: 6/10/2011 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION: It is hereby ordered that Scott P. Lewis is admitted to practice pro hac vice in this action. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/10/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 06/10/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 6/1/2011, Entered: 6/7/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Scott P. Lewis to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Airports Council International - North America.(sjo) (Entered: 06/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 Notice of Filing Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Conference proceeding held on 5/16/11 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: 6/6/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Conference held on 5/16/2011 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/30/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/11/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2011.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/06/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: 6/3/2011 Order on Motion for Leave to File DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSED ON MOTION OF AMICUS CURIAE AIRPORTS COUNSEL INTERNATIONAL NORTH AMERICA FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF THE MASSACHUSETTS PORT AUTHORITY'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT: ENDORSEMENT: Leave to file amicus is granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/2/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(js) (Entered: 06/03/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Allen W. Burton in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits B - D, # 2 Exhibits E - J, # 3 Exhibits K - O, # 4 Exhibit P, # 5 Exhibits Q - U, # 6 Exhibit V, Part 1, # 7 Exhibit V, Part 2, # 8 Exhibits W - Z, # 9 Exhibits AA - EE, # 10 Exhibit FF, # 11 Exhibits GG - JJ, # 12 Exhibit KK, # 13 Exhibits LL - NN, # 14 Exhibit OO, # 15 Exhibits PP - UU)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Burton, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Airports Council International - North America.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Dhagat, Hetal) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Motion for Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Massachusetts Port Authority's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Airports Council International - North America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Brief of Amicus Curiae in Support of Massachusetts Port Authority's Motion for Summary Judgment)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Dhagat, Hetal) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joseph Lawless in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A Part 2)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Burton, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Burton, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1430 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 145 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Burton, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 5/27/2011, Entered: 5/27/2011 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Burton, Allen) (Entered: 05/27/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 5/26/2011, Entered: 5/26/2011 Stipulation and OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER that this action is discontinued with prejudice and without costs, solely as to defendant ICTS International, N.V. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/26/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(cd) (Entered: 05/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: 5/19/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMARY ORDER: The parties dispute the consequences if Defendants show they conformed with Federal Aviation Administration regulations that applied to the screening procedures at Logan International Airport on September 11, 2001, and shall submit briefing on the issue. Plaintiffs brief is due June 17, 2011; Defendants shall respond by July 8, 2011; and Plaintiff shall reply by July 15, 2011. Counsel for Massport shall move for summary judgment dismissing all claims against it and precluding argument, due to the absence of evidence, that weapons and other items used by the terrorists were passed to them after they passed through screening checkpoints controlled by Huntleigh and United on September 11, 2001. Massport shall file its motion and opening brief by May 27, 2011; opposition briefing shall be due June 24, 2011; and Massport shall reply by July 1,2011. Other Defendants may file briefs opposing Massport's motion, or otherwise expressing their views and the evidentiary bases for them, at the same that Plaintiff files the opposition brief. As to whether any res ipsa loquitur jury instructions are to be given, Plaintiff shall submit a brief by June 17; Defendants shall respond by July 8; and Plaintiff shall reply by July 15. The parties agree that Massachusetts law controls all damages issues, and shall submit an agreed-upon schedule for briefing the issue whether the decedent's pain and suffering gives rise to any damages claim. The United States Attorney has made substantial progress towards receiving approval from the Transportation Security Administration, and will provide the Court with an update at the next status conference. The parties shall inform the Court whether ICTS is to remain in the case by May 23, 2011, and may follow up on any representations made by May 27, 2011. The next conference in this case shall be held in Courtroom 14D on June 15, 2011, at 2:30pm. (Brief due by 6/17/2011. Status Conference set for 6/15/2011 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/18/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(tro) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 5/16/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 141 Motion for Kimberly A. Donlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/16/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 5/13/2011, Entered: 5/16/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Kimberly A. Donlon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation.(sjo) (Entered: 05/16/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 5/12/2011, Entered: 5/12/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ITEMS FOR AGENDA FOR MAY 16, 2011 CONFERENCE: The Court has reviewed the parties' proposed jury charges and in supporting memoranda and proposes to discuss the following issues at the status conference to be held May 16 at 10:00 am to write briefing on the issues, as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/12/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 05/12/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: 4/5/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Douglas M. Pravda hereby withdraws as counsel of record for defendant The Boeing Company in the above-captioned actions. Robert A. Atkins and H. Christopher Boehning of the law firm Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Ganison LLP have entered notices of appearance in this matter and together with Perkins Coie LLP and Richards Kibbe & Orbe LLP, will continue to represent The Boeing Company. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(djc) (Entered: 04/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: 3/31/2011 Stipulation and Order of Voluntary DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE: that pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2) that all claims by Plaintiff Mary Bavis, Individually and as Personal Representative of the Estate of Mark Bavis, deceased In the Second Amended Complaint (02-CV-7154 (AKH) against Defendants Burns International Security Services Corporation, Pinkerton's LLC f/k/a Pinkerton's Inc., and Securitas AB are hereby dismissed with prejudice and the aforementioned defendants are therefore dismissed from this action with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. This action shall continue against all remaining defendants. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/30/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(pl) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: 3/15/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mary Schiavo, dated 3/11/2011, re: As your Honor requested, counsel for the Bavis Plaintiffs and counsel for Defendants are jointly submitting a portion of the Fact Narrative upon which the parties were able to agree. There are additional areas that we are both continuing to discuss and anticipate offering shortly, either an agreed upon addition to the narrative or separate alternative proposals for inclusion in the narrative. ENDORSEMENT: The joint submission is accepted as a set of facts, subject to supplementation and additional proofs, to be read to the jury. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/15/2011) (Docketed in Case No. 21 MC 101) (lnl) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: 3/4/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jeffrey J. Ellis dated 3/1/11 re: I am writing jointly on behalf of the Bavis defendants and plaintiff to request that you consider extending the date for the plaintiff to file a revised draft factual narrative from March 4 to,March 11, the same day that the parties' witness submissions are due. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/3/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(djc) (Entered: 03/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: 3/2/2011 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jeffrey J. Ellis dated 3/1/11 re: Counsel writes jointly on behalf of the Bavis defendants and plaintiff to request that you consider extending the date for the plaintiff to file a revised draft factual narrative from March 4 to March 11, the same day that the parties' witness submissions are due. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered.(Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/2/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH; (djc) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/24/2011, Entered: 2/24/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER TO REGULATE PRETRIAL PROCESS: Judging from the letter of Mayer Brown, counsel for Defendants, dated February 22, 2011, the pretrial process appears in substantial disarray. Plaintiff has not provided a different perspective.The conference on February 25, 2011 will begin at 2:00 pm, rather than 2:30 pm, and shall continue until 4:00 pm. It will resume Monday, February 28, 2011 at 2:15 pm, and shall continue until 6:00 pm. If issues remain, the conference will continue until concluded on dates to be fixed. The Parties shall be prepared to discuss what problems exist preventing them from coming to rapid agreement on the following points: 1. The status of an agreed statement of introductory facts; 2. An identification of all Plaintiffs fact witnesses, a summary of each witness's expected testimony, an identification of which witnesses, if any, will be testifying by depositions, a justification for such testimony, and a means of regulating objection practice; 3. An identification of any expert witnesses, a summary of each expert witness's expected testimony, and an identification of any Daubert proceedings that may be appropriate; 4. An identification of all exhibits, and a procedure to rule on all objections; 5.An identification of issues of law along with procedures to raise and decide them; 6. A determination of dates for submissions of voir dire, jury instructions, motions in limine, and any other related submissions; 7. An identification of dates for eliminating unneeded Defendants; 8. An establishment of procedures for a timed trial; and 9. Any other issues that any of the Parties wish to raise. (Status Conference set for 2/25/2011 at 02:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/24/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(db) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/25/2011: # 2 Supplement) (cd). (Entered: 02/24/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/14/2011, Entered: 2/14/2011 Order on Motion to PrecludeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER granting in part and denying in part (1376) Motion to Preclude in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. Defendants move for a protective order to prevent Plaintiff from deposing Julie L. Ashley, and from calling her as a witness at trial. Plaintiff wishes to depose Ashley as to any communications she may have had, or has first-hand knowledge of, in which information about United Airlines' operations was communicated to one ofthe September 11 hijackers. Plaintiff also wishes to depose Ashley about activities thought to have been undertaken by her husband, Amad Farid Khorrami. Plaintiff seeks a one-hour deposition. Having reviewed the parties' submissions, I rule that Plaintiff may, in the one hour requested, depose Ashley about any communications she had with a September 11 hijacker, or about any communications ofwhich she has firsthand knowledge. Plaintiff may not depose Ashley about her husband, Khorrami. I reserve judgment on the issue whether Plaintiff may call Ashley as a witness at trial. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/14/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jmi) (Entered: 02/14/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/9/2011, Entered: 2/9/2011 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (1376 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Preclude for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Julie E. Ashley.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 02/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE served on All Defendants on 2/8/2011. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Mary Schiavo in Opposition re: (1376 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Preclude for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Julie E. Ashley.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/8/2011, Entered: 2/8/2011 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: (1376 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Preclude for a Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of Julie E. Ashley.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 02/08/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: 2/4/2011 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION granting (1382) Motion for Edwin W. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; granting (126) Motion for Edwin W. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:02-cv-07154-AKH for Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/4/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(cd) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 2/2/2011, Entered: 2/2/2011 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER ADJOURNING STATUS CONFERENCE: The status conference set for February 4, 2011, is adjourned to February 25, 2011, at 2:30pm. The conference shall be held in Courtroom 14D. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/2/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 02/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: 1/31/2011 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Edwin W. Green to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation, Huntleigh USA Corporation.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(mro) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: 1/5/2011 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on December 21, 2010 at 11:24 a.m. before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (js) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Order on Motion to ComplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TERMINATING DEFENDANTS' MOTION: Defendant UAL Corporation ("UAL") has filed a motion seeking compliance with my order dated October 22, 2010, setting forth deadlines for pretrial activities and providing guidance for those activities. Order Regulating Proceedings, Doc. No. 1320, 21 MC 101(S.D.N.Y. Oct. 22, 2010). UAL has objected to (i) Plaintiffs proposed pretrial statement to the jury and (ii) Plaintiffs proposed list of witnesses. In a recent order, I set forth my views regarding these issues. Order Regulating Procedure on Defendants' Motion, Doc. No. 1363, 21 MC 101 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 16, 2010). I invited the parties to appear to discuss the issues further and clarify the procedures for remaining pretrial activities. In view of the parties' appearance today, the issues raised in Defendants' motion have been resolved. The present motion is therefore terminated. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. No. 115 in 02 Civ. 7154; Doc. No. 1357 in 21 MC 101) terminated. ORDER terminating (1357) Motion to Comply in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; terminating (115) Motion to Comply in case 1:02-cv-07154-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(db) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 12/22/2010, Entered: 12/22/2010 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER DISMISSING GLOBE AVIATION SERVICES: On the bases of the parties' agreement and on the holding of my prior opinion, I grant Globe's motion and dismiss it from the case. The Clerk shall mark the present motion (Doc. No. 1324) terminated. ORDER granting (1324) Motion in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(db) (Entered: 12/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: 12/21/2010 Order on Motion for ReconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER DENYING HUNTLEIGH'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, that Defendant Huntleigh USA Corp. ("Huntleigh") moves for reconsideration of my recent order denying its motion to be dismissed from the pending above- captioned matter. Order Denying Huntleigh's Motion to Dismiss or Stay Actions, Doc. No. 112, 02 Civ. 7154 (21 MC 101) (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 1,2010). On December 21,2010, Huntleigh and Plaintiff Mary Bavis appeared for oral argument on the matter. For the reasons provided on the record, I decline to grant the motion. For these reasons set forth in this Order, it is inappropriate to dismiss Huntleigh at this time. Huntleigh's motion for reconsideration is therefore denied. Closer to trial, Huntleigh may move for dismissal again if future developments warrant such a motion. The Clerk shall mark the present motion (Doc. No. 1352) terminated. Denying (1352) Motion for Reconsideration in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(pl) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 12/16/2010, Entered: 12/16/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REGULATING PROCEDURE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION: Defendants filed a motion on December 8, 2010 to complain about various pretrial practices of Plaintiff. I file this order to express my preliminary views, to short-circuit regular motion practice and to promote efficiency and economy. (See ORDER as set forth) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/16/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH (lnl) (Entered: 12/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: 12/15/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mary Schiavo dated 12/7/2010 re: Counsel respectfully request permission to file a sur-reply to defendant's reply in support of its motion to enforce litigation agreement and for dismissal of claim asserted in Bavis action. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. Leave may be requested at oral argument, to the extent appropriate. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/15/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(jfe) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/10/2010, Entered: 12/10/2010 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re: (1352 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION for Reconsideration and Oral Argument.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 12/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion, Memorandum of Law, and Declaration of Jeffrey J. Ellis on 12/08/2010. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Jeffrey J. Ellis in Support re: 115 MOTION to Comply.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 115 MOTION to Comply.. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/8/2010, Entered: 12/8/2010 Motion to Comply
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Comply. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..(Sexton, Brian) (Entered: 12/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/3/2010, Entered: 12/3/2010 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Mary Schiavo in Opposition re: (1324 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH) MOTION to Enforce Litigation Agreement and for Dismissal of Claims Asserted In Bavis Action Against Globe Aviation Services Corporation.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 12/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/2/2010, Entered: 12/2/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mary Schiavo dated 11/29/10 re: I am requesting that you grant permission for the entries to be formally sealed and to allow plaintiff's counsel to re-file my declaration with the correct redacted exhibits. ENDORSEMENT: I order: 1. Plaintiff shall re-file, nunc pro tunc, the pleading with redacted exhibits 3, 5, 6, 8, suitable for public filing. 2. The Clerk of Court shall accept such pleading as substitute, and return the original pleading with full exhibits 3, 5, 6, 8 to plaintiff's counsel. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/2/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: 12/1/2010 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING HUNTLEIGH'S MOTIONS TO DISMISS OR STAY ACTIONS. Defendants Huntleigh USA Corp. ("Huntleigh") and its parent company, ICTS International N.V. ("ICTS"), move under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) to dismiss the three remaining lawsuits against them, or in the alternative to stay the suits against them pending the WTCP Plaintiffs' appeal of my approval of the property-damage settlements between the Aviation Defendants and the Property Damage Plaintiffs. The motions are denied. The Clerk shall mark the motions (Doc Nos. 1328 & 1332) terminated. denying (1328) Motion to Dismiss; denying (1332) Motion to Dismiss in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH (rjm) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: 11/24/2010 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned attorneys of record for the respective parties hereto, that the claims of Plaintiff Mary Bavis, individually and as personal representative of the Estate of Mark Bavis, ("Plaintiff") against defendant The Boeing Company ("Boeing") contained in all operative complaints, including without limitation the Second Amended Complaint for Wrongful Death and Survival in Case No. 02-CV-7154 (AKH), dated January 14, 2004 and the Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint in Case No. 21 MC 97, dated September 14, 2007, are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/24/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 10/27/2010, Entered: 10/27/2010 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON WRITTEN MOTION, granting 109 Motion for James R. Brauchle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/26/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 10/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: 10/21/2010 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for James R. Brauchle to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Mary Bavis.(mbe) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/21/2010, Entered: 9/22/2010 LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mary Shiavo dated 9/10/10 re: The Bavis plaintiffs request a status conference and a case management order for this case. Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(cd) (Entered: 09/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/20/2010, Entered: 9/20/2010 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE: In view of these various submissions, a status conference shall be held October 20, 2010, at 11:00am to plan for pretrial activities and to set a trial date. Depositions shall be complete by January 30, 2011. The Court shall hold a status conference on February 4, 2011, at 2:15pm to plan expert witness discovery, succeeding proceedings leading to trial, and relevant details concerning the mechanics of trial. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/20/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 1:08-cv-03722-AKH(jpo) (Entered: 09/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/19/2010, Entered: 8/19/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion for an Order Requiring WTCP to Post an Appeal Bond. Document filed by Industrial Risk Insurers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Clifford, Robert) (Entered: 08/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: 4/22/2010 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Notice of Change of Attorney. Document filed by Delta Air Lines, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Crowley, Michael) (Entered: 04/22/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: 2/2/2010 Order on Motion to DirectCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR DAMAGES-ONLY TRIAL. Defendants' motion for an order directing a damages-only trial is denied. The Clerk shall mark the motion (Doc. # 1005) as terminated, and as further set forth. denying (1005) Motion to Direct in case 1:21-mc-00101-AKH; denying (95) Motion to Direct in case 1:02-cv-07154-AKH. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/2/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of the Election of United Air Lines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Not to Contest Liability on February 1, 2010. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: 2/1/2010 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 95 MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154). MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154). Not to Contest Liability. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/25/2010, Entered: 1/25/2010 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Jeffrey J. Ellis dated 1/22/10 re: We are respectfully requesting an extension of time to reply to the Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages only Trial in the action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02 Civ. 7154). The motion was originally returnable on December 17, 2009 and one extension of time until January 15, 2010 was agreed upon and so ordered on December 21, 2009. Mary Schiavo, counsel for the plaintiff has agreed to our request for a one week extension for our reply submission from January 25, 2010 to February 1, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., (Replies due by 2/1/2010.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/21/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 01/25/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Certificate of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Opposition to Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation served on All Liaison Counsel on 1/15/10. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: 1/15/2010 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 95 MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154). MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154).. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Schiavo, Mary) (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: 12/22/2009 Endorsed LetterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Mary Schiavo dated 12/17/09 re: We represent the Bavis plaintiffs in one of the three remaining wrongful death September 11 Aviation litigation cases. I am writing to request an extension until January 15, 2010 for Plaintiffs response due today on United Airlines and Huntleigh's Motion for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered., (Responses due by 1/15/2010) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/21/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 1:02-cv-07154-AKH(rjm) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion and Memorandum of Law for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02 Civ. 7154) on 12/07/09. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 95 MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154). MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154).. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/7/2009, Entered: 12/7/2009 Motion to Direct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Direct Notice of Motion of United Airlines, Inc. and Huntleigh USA Corporation for an Order Directing a Damages Only Trial in the Action Bavis v. United Airlines, Inc. (02-Civ-7154). Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 12/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Cathi A. Hession in Support re: (41 in 1:04-cv-07136-AKH, 43 in 1:03-cv-10203-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05020-AKH, 32 in 1:08-cv-10646-AKH, 31 in 1:04-cv-07213-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05021-AKH, 48 in 1:02-cv-07198-AKH, 65 in 1:04-cv-07231-AKH, 169 in 1:02-cv-07188-AKH, 69 in 1:02-cv-07260-AKH, 67 in 1:04-cv-07225-AKH, 48 in 1:03-cv-06940-AKH, 13 in 1:04-cv-06788-AKH, 101 in 1:02-cv-07145-AKH, 70 in 1:04-cv-07199-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05025-AKH, 86 in 1:03-cv-00131-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05024-AKH, 9 in 1:08-cv-03701-AKH, 37 in 1:04-cv-07318-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07241-AKH, 24 in 1:07-cv-07968-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07248-AKH, 45 in 1:08-cv-03719-AKH, 13 in 1:03-cv-09965-AKH, 63 in 1:04-cv-07299-AKH, 42 in 1:03-cv-06925-AKH, 12 in 1:04-cv-07914-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07294-AKH, 83 in 1:02-cv-02987-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-01350-AKH, 351 in 1:04-cv-07272-AKH, 38 in 1:02-cv-10052-AKH, 54 in 1:04-cv-05023-AKH, 118 in 1:03-cv-06800-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-07240-AKH, 91 in 1:02-cv-07154-AKH, 48 in 1:08-cv-03722-AKH, 64 in 1:04-cv-07291-AKH, 58 in 1:04-cv-07244-AKH, 719 in 1:21-mc-00101-AKH, 60 in 1:04-cv-07238-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07298-AKH, 75 in 1:04-cv-07234-AKH, 55 in 1:04-cv-05022-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-07246-AKH, 56 in 1:04-cv-06848-AKH, 53 in 1:04-cv-04577-AKH, 12 in 1:08-cv-03700-AKH, 15 in 1:04-cv-06789-AKH, 83 in 1:03-cv-07040-AKH, 12 in 1:07-cv-07969-AKH, 81 in 1:03-cv-06811-AKH) MOTION for Summary Judgment.. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 1 0f 2, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Hession Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Hession Affidavit, # 5 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 4, # 6 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 4, # 7 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 3 of 4, # 8 Exhibit 4 to Hession Affidavit part 4 of 4, # 9 Exhibit 5 to Hession Affidavit, # 10 Exhibit 6 to Hession Affidavit, # 11 Exhibit 7 to Hession Affidavit, # 12 Exhibit 8 to Hession Affidavit, # 13 Exhibit 9 to Hession Affidavit, # 14 Exhibit 10 to Hession Affidavit, # 15 Exhibit 11 to Hession Affidavit, # 16 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 1 of 2, # 17 Exhibit 12 to Hession Affidavit part 2 of 2, # 18 Exhibit 13 to Hession Affidavit, # 19 Exhibit 14 to Hession Affidavit, # 20 Exhibit 15 to Hession Affidavit, # 21 Exhibit 16 to Hession Affidavit, # 22 Exhibit 17 to Hession Affidavit, # 23 Exhibit 18 to Hession Affidavit, # 24 Exhibit 19 to Hession Affidavit, # 25 Exhibit 20 to Hession Affidavit, # 26 Exhibit 21 to Hession Affidavit, # 27 Exhibit 22 to Hession Affidavit, # 28 Exhibit 23 to Hession Affidavit, # 29 Exhibit 24 to Hession Affidavit, # 30 Exhibit 25 to Hession Affidavit)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Rule 56.1 Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 2/13/2009, Entered: 2/13/2009 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Summary Judgment Dismissing All Subrogation Claims. Document filed by 1 World Trade Center LLC, 3 World Trade Center LLC, 7 World Trade Company, L.P., 2 World Trade Center LLC, 4 World Trade Center LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2009Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Egan, Thomas) Modified on 2/17/2009 (jar). (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: 11/6/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Protective Order Precluding the Deposition of James E. Goodwin, United's Former Chairman and CEO. Document filed by United Air Lines, Inc..Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, WTC Retail LLC and the Port Authority Trans-Hudson Corporation contained in the Complaint(08cv3701 and dated 4/16/08) against Defendant Delta Air Lines, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 in the captioned lawsuit shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiff(s) World Trade Center Properties LLC, 2 World Trade Center LLC and 4 World Trade Center LLC against Defendant(s) Delta Air Lines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. with regard to United Airlines Flight 175 shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other... and as further set forth. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/18/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00101-AKH et al.(rjm) Modified on 7/21/2008 (rjm). (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JOINT PROPOSED ORDER TRANSFERRING CASES TO 21MC101 (AKH) DOCKET AND CLOSING 21MC97 (AKH) that the cases attached hereto as "Exhibit A" are to be moved from the 21mc97(AKH) Master Docket to the 21mc101(AKH) Master Docket. The Cross-Claims of all WTCP Cross-Claim Plaintiffs and the Cross-Claims of The Port Authority of New York and New Jersey, pending in 21mc97, shall be transferred to the 21mc101 docket under four new civil action numbers, two to be purchased by the WTCP Cross-Claim Plaintiffs and two to be purchased by the Port Authority. Leave is hereby granted for Cross-Claim Plaintiffs to amend their respective cross-claims within thirty days of this order solely to recast them as direct claims by the Cross-Claim Plaintiffs as Plaintiffs against the Cross-Claim Defendants as Defendants. The Clerk is instructed to close the Master Docket numbered 21mc97(AKH) thirty days from the date of this Order. This Document relates to member cases listed on attached Exhibit A as well as: 21mc97, 21mc101, 02-7156, 02-7289, 04-0365, 03-6800, 02-7145, 02-7260, 02-7154, 03-6811, 03-6940, 04-7213, 04-1350, 03-9965, 04-6788, 04-6789, 04-7914, 03-10203. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/08) (rjm) (Entered: 03/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE... that any and all claims asserted and/or assertable by Plaintiffs against Defendant(s) ATA Airlines, Inc. in the captioned lawsuits shall be dismissed by the Court without prejudice... and without costs to either party as against the other. This Document relates to member cases listed and 03-6802, 02-6364, 02-7154, 02-7153, 03-6811, 03-6801, 02-0458, 03-7083, 02-2802, 03-7084, 02-1727, 02-6365, 02-7152. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/26/07) (rjm) (Entered: 11/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Adoption of Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (Attachments: # 1 Answer of Defendant the Boeing Company to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint)(Lent, Eric) (Entered: 11/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER OF HUNTLEIGH USA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED FLIGHT 175 COMPLAINT served on All Parties on November 13, 2007. Service was accepted by Pursuant to Court Order. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (Ross, Johnathan) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint,, filed by Mary Bavis. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit MASTER ANSWER OF HUNTLEIGH USA, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED FLIGHT 175 COMPLAINT)(Ross, Johnathan) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Adoption of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint served on All Parties on November 13, 2007. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Adoption of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Pages 1-25 of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint# 2 Pages 26-47 of Defendants United & UAL's Answer to Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint)(Redmond, Loretta) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services.(Connors, James) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of adoption of answer to amended complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV. (Attachments: # 1)(Robbins, Jon) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of of Adoption. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Wood, Willard) (Entered: 11/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/17/2006, Entered: 12/11/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER... All attorneys who have been admitted to this Court, either for all purposes or pro hac vice for purposes of this case who are not yet registered to file documents electronically, shall complete and file a CM/ECF attorney registration form by November 1, 2006. Forms can be found on the Court's website at www.nysd.uscourts.gov. As of October 17, 2006 all documents filed in the Miscellaneous case and the underlying civil cases shall be filed electronically on the Court's ECF system via the Internet at ecf.nysd.uscourts.gov. All correspondences are to be submitted in either Word or WordPerfect format to WTC_letters@nysd.uscourts.gov. The subject heading of the email must include the case number of the action or actions that the email pertains to. No correspondences are to be sent to Chambers through regular mail. No correspondences should be in the form of a motion. Amended complaints and supplemental pleading shall provide a list of the additional parties and indicate the action to which they are being added... (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2006) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK,1:02-cv-00456-AKH,1:02-cv-00458-AKH,1:02-cv-01727-AKH,1:02-cv-01728-AKH, 1:02-cv-03676-AKH,1:02-cv-06186-AKH,1:02-cv-06364-AKH,1:02-cv-06365-AKH,1:02-cv-06378-AKH, 1:02-cv-06379-AKH,1:02-cv-07144-AKH,1:02-cv-07145-AKH,1:02-cv-07147-AKH,1:02-cv-07149-AKH, 1:02-cv-07150-AKH,1:02-cv-07153-AKH,1:02-cv-07154-AKH,1:02-cv-07155-AKH,1:02-cv-07156-AKH, 1:02-cv-07259-AKH,1:02-cv-07260-AKH,1:02-cv-07261-AKH,1:02-cv-07289-AKH,1:02-cv-07290-AKH, 1:02-cv-07608-AKH,1:02-cv-07912-AKH,1:02-cv-08916-AKH,1:02-cv-08918-AKH,1:02-cv-08919-AKH, 1:02-cv-09234-AKH,1:02-cv-10273-AKH,1:03-cv-00006-AKH,1:03-cv-00029-AKH,1:03-cv-00332-AKH-THK, 1:03-cv-01016-AKH,1:03-cv-06183-AKH,1:03-cv-06801-AKH,1:03-cv-06805-AKH,1:03-cv-06843-AKH, 1:03-cv-06929-AKH,1:03-cv-06940-AKH,1:03-cv-07019-AKH,1:03-cv-07040-AKH,1:03-cv-07641-AKH, 1:03-cv-10203-AKH,1:04-cv-00365-AKH,1:04-cv-01857-AKH,1:04-cv-07189-AKH,1:04-cv-07226-AKH, 1:04-cv-07298-AKH,1:04-cv-08067-AKH,1:04-cv-09627-AKH,1:05-cv-07243-AKH,1:06-cv-02990-AKH, 1:06-cv-05115-AKH,1:06-cv-05967-AKH,2:03-cv-06105-AKH,2:03-cv-06310-AKH,2:03-cv-06800-AKH, 2:03-cv-06802-AKH,2:03-cv-06803-AKH,2:03-cv-06808-AKH,2:03-cv-06810-AKH,2:03-cv-06811-AKH, 2:03-cv-06838-AKH,2:03-cv-06966-AKH,2:03-cv-06968-AKH,2:03-cv-07021-AKH,2:03-cv-07022-AKH, 2:03-cv-07071-AKH,2:03-cv-07076-AKH,2:03-cv-07083-AKH,2:03-cv-07084-AKH(mj, ) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/17/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Justin B. Kaplan is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #872)(sn) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: 8/16/2006 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER ADMITTING COUNSEL PRO HAC VICE; purs. to Local Civil Rule 1.3(c), Joseph F. Rice is admitted pro hac vice to the bar of this Court for the purpose of representing pltffs in this proceeding and consolidated cases. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/14/06) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00097-AKH-THK. This document relates to: 03 cv 6183; 03 cv 7040; 03 cv 7073; 04 cv 365; 03 cv 7076; 03 cv 7083; 03 cv 7070; 03 cv 7084; 03 cv 7071; 02 cv 7150; 02 cv 3676; 03 cv 6802; 02 cv 6364; 02 cv 7154; 02 cv 7259; 02 cv 8918; 02 cv 6378; 02 cv 7153; 02 cv 6379; 03 cv 29; 02 cv 7920; 02 cv 7145; 03 cv 6810; 03 cv 6808; 02 cv 7147; 02 cv 7260; 03 cv 6809; 03 cv 6811; 02 cv 8916; 03 cv 6801; 02 cv 7149; 02 cv 7156; 02 cv 2802; 02 cv 7155; 02 cv 7262; 03 cv 6803; 02 cv 458; 02 cv 1728; 03 cv 7022; 02 cv 456; 03 cv 6805; 02 cv 1727; 03 cv 6800; 02 cv 6365; 02 cv 7261; 02 cv 7144; 02 cv 8919; 03 cv 1016; 02 cv 7608; 02 cv 7912; 02 cv 6186. (Original document filed under 21 mc 97 as Doc. #871)(sn) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: 10/4/2004 Stipulation and Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the above-entitled action is dismissed without prejudice as against defendant, Alaska Airlines, Inc., and without costs to either party as against the other. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/04) (dt, ) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/1/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice Adopting Amended Answer Of Defendants United Air Lines, INC. And UAL Corporation To Plaintiffs Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/31/2004, Entered: 9/14/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Amended Notice Adopting Master Answer Of Defendant US Airways, INC. To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint And Jury Demand. Document filed by U.S. Airways, Inc.. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/14/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/29/2004, Entered: 7/1/2004 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice as to Air France and Cape Air, a/k/a Hyannis Air Services, Inc., ("Cape Air"), Only. The action remains pending as it is not dismissed as to any other Defendant. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/04) (dt, ) (Entered: 07/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Airtran Airways Inc. served on 3/1/2004, answer due 3/22/2004. Service was accepted by Indra Lall, Process Clerk. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. America West Airlines, Inc. served on 3/1/2004, answer due 3/22/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Boutakova, Process Clerk. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. American Airlines, Inc. served on 3/1/2004, answer due 3/22/2004. Service was accepted by Elena Boutakova, Process Clerk. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 2/24/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Jim Waldon, Company Attorney. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Second Amended Complaint served. Alaska Airlines, Inc. served on 2/24/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Jim Waldon, Company Attorney. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. AMR Corporation served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Beatrice Casarez, CT Corp. as Registered Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Pinkerton's Inc. served on 2/25/2004, answer due 3/16/2004. Service was accepted by Brandy Anderson. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Second Amended Complaint served. Northwest Airlines Corporation served on 2/19/2004, answer due 3/10/2004. Service was accepted by Deb Van Ness, Agent for CT Corp.. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Second Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/4/2004, answer due 3/24/2004. Service was accepted by Amy Lesch. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Second Amended Complaint served. Midway Airlines Corporation served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Dot Adams, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,, served. Service was accepted by Carin Bergman, Finance Manager accepted for Thomas Berglund (President). Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Securitas AB served on 3/3/2004, answer due 3/23/2004. Service was accepted by Securitas AB. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/15/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Second Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 3/17/2004, answer due 4/6/2004. Service was accepted by Nina Svensson. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/21/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant America West Airlines, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by America West Airlines, Inc. (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/20/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendants ATA Airlines, Inc. s/h/a American Trans Air, Inc., to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by American Trans Air, Inc. (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS AMR CORPORATION AND AMERICAN AIRLINES, INC. TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (laq) Modified on 5/19/2004 (laq, ). (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ITS MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Globe Aviation Services. (sac, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/18/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of adoption of its Master Answer to plaintiffs Second Amended Flight 77 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Northwest Airlines Corporation. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Adopting master answer of defendants Delta Air Lines, Inc., Incorrectly s/h/a Delta Airlines, Inc. and Delta Express, Inc. to Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Delta Express, Inc., Delta Airlines. (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by Continental Airlines, Inc.. (gf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Adoption Of Master Answer Of Defendant Huntleigh USA Corporation. Document filed by Huntleigh USA Corporation. (jmi, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF AMENDED ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc. (ps, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Adopting Master Answer of Defendant Colgan Air, Inc. To Plaintiffs' Amended Flight 175 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Colgan Air, Inc. (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. Document filed by The Boeing Company. (sac, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: 5/19/2004 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of adopting Massachusetts Port Authority's Master Answer to plaintiffs' amended flight 11 Master Liability Complaint. Document filed by Massachusetts Port Authority. (jp, ) (Entered: 05/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE ADOPTING MASTER ANSWER AND ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by ICTS International NV. Related document: 25 Amended Complaint,, filed by Mary Bavis.(pl, ) (Entered: 05/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/19/2004, Entered: 4/8/2004 Clerk Certificate of Mailing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERK CERTIFICATE OF MAILING of Summons and Complaint mailed to Securitas AB at the following address: Securitas AB c/o Lindhagensplan 70, Box 12307, SE-102 28, Stockholm, Sweden on 3/19/04 by Registered Mail # RB 632 316 538. (ps, ) (Entered: 04/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc. served on 2/23/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Paula Kash, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 2/23/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Paula Kash, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/19/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 2/24/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Michael Muller, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Certificate of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint, 11/26/03 Order allowing Amendments; 12/18/03 Order extending time to file and serve Amended Complaint. Securitas AB served on 1/8/2004, answer due 1/28/2004. Service was accepted by Christopher Lunding. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/17/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Heimann Systems Corp. served on 3/3/2004, answer due 3/23/2004. Service was accepted by Becky Degeorge. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (cd, ) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint. Air France served on 2/23/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Gregory J. Kozlowski. Document filed by Air France. (sb, ) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/12/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and First Amended Complaint, served. L-3 Communications Corporation served on 2/24/2004, answer due 3/15/2004. Service was accepted by Kevin Perra. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/15/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and FIRST Amended Complaint, served. Swiss served on 2/10/2004, answer due 3/1/2004. Service was accepted by Dawn Schulz, Sr. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. MidWest Express Airlines, Inc. served on 3/8/2004, answer due 3/29/2004. Service was accepted by Nicholas Knight, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Air Transport Association served on 2/13/2004, answer due 3/4/2004. Service was accepted by Susan Lundquist. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/12/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Second Amended Complaint served. American Trans Air, Inc. served on 2/20/2004, answer due 3/11/2004. Service was accepted by Nikki Chapple, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Cape Air served on 2/7/2004, answer due 2/27/2004. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Gardner. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (cd, ) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Continental Airlines, Inc. served on 2/10/2004, answer due 3/1/2004. Service was accepted by Lynne W. Key, Sr., Process Specialist. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Air Jamaica served on 2/6/2004, answer due 2/26/2004. Service was accepted by Bernardo Montanez, authorized agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (kw, ) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/8/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and First Amended Complaint, served. Delta Airlines served on 2/11/2004, answer due 3/2/2004. Service was accepted by Valerie Holmes, process coordinator. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/5/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and FIRST Amended Complaint, served. Quantum Magnetics, Inc. served on 2/18/2004, answer due 3/9/2004. Service was accepted by Lowell Burnett, CEO. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (djc, ) (Entered: 03/05/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. Invision Technologies, Inc. served on 2/10/2004, answer due 3/1/2004. Service was accepted by Becky DeGeorge, Clerk. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/3/2004, Entered: 3/4/2004 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint served. The Boeing Company served on 2/11/2004, answer due 3/2/2004. Service was accepted by Dolores Wood, Agent. Document filed by Mary Bavis. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2004, Entered: 1/23/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Pinkerton's Inc., Airtran Airways Inc., Northwest Airlines Corporation, Midway Airlines Corporation, American Trans Air, Inc., America West Airlines, Inc., Alaska Airlines, Inc., AMR Corporation, American Airlines, Inc., Burns International Security Services Corporation, Colgan Air, Inc., Continental Airlines, Inc., Delta Airlines, Globe Aviation Services, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Massachusetts Port Authority, Securitas AB, The Boeing Company, U.S. Airways, Inc., UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..Document filed by Mary Bavis.(dle, ) Modified on 1/23/2004 (dle, ). (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/20/2004, Entered: 1/21/2004 Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED Document filed by Mary Bavis. ICTS International NV waiver sent on 1/6/2004, answer due 3/8/2004. (kw, ) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/22/2003, Entered: 1/15/2004 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR WRONGFUL DEATH AND SURVIVAL: amending 1 Complaint against Air Transport Association, Does, Cape Air, Air Jamaica, Swiss, Delta Airlines, Continental Airlines, Inc., Air France, MidWest Express Airlines, Inc., Heimann Systems Corp., Quantum Magnetics, Inc., Invision Technologies, Inc., L-3 Communications Holdings, Inc., L-3 Communications Corporation, L-3 Communications Corporation Security and Detection Systems, The Boeing Company, Burns International Security Services Corporation, Colgan Air, Inc., Globe Aviation Services, Huntleigh USA Corporation, ICTS International NV, Massachusetts Port Authority, Securitas AB, U.S. Airways, Inc., UAL Corporation, United Airlines, Inc..Document filed by Mary Bavis. Related document: 1 Complaint.(db, ) (Entered: 01/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/2/2003, Entered: 10/8/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE Adopting Flight 175 Master Answer of Defendant US Airways, Inc. (jco) (Entered: 10/08/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/13/2003, Entered: 6/19/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE ADOPTING MASSACHUSETTS PORT AUTHORITY'S MASTER ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' FLIGHT 175 MASTER LIABILITY COMPLAINT. (moc) (Entered: 06/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/25/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE ADOPTING FLIGHT 11 AND FLIGHT 175 MASTER ANSWER to Complaint by Colgan Air, Inc. (Attorney Jeffrey W. Moryan from the Firm: Connell Foley LLP) . (moc) (Entered: 02/26/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/13/2003, Entered: 2/20/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to Complaint by UAL Corporation, United Airlines (Attorney Jeffrey J. Ellis from the Firm: Quirk and Bakalor, P.C.) . (db) (Entered: 02/20/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2003, Entered: 2/19/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint by Huntleigh USA Corp. (Attorney Bruce R. Wildermuth, Ralph V. Pagano, Edward J. McMurrer from the Firm: Mendes & Mount, LLP) . (jco) (Entered: 02/19/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ADOPTION OF ANSWER to Complaint by Globe Aviation (Attorney James P. Connors from the Firm: Jones Hirsch Connors & Bull PC). (moc) (Entered: 02/10/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of S&C executed as to Burns International by Sydne D. Holder, on 11/21/02 . . (sac) (Entered: 01/02/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RETURN OF SERVICE of S&C executed as to Globe Aviation by Tod Smith, agent, on 11/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 12/30/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RETURN OF SERVICE of S&C executed as to Colgan Air, Inc. by Michael J. Colgan, president, on 12/2/02 . . (sac) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETURN OF SERVICE of S&C executed as to U.S. Airways, Inc. by Tinika Baylor, agent, on 11/21/02 . Answer due on 12/11/02 for U.S. Airways, Inc. . (sac) (Entered: 12/26/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to UAL Corporation by Mia Wintersmith, Supervisor on 11/18/02 . Answer due on 12/9/02 for UAL Corporation . (yv) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to Massachusetts Port A by Marguerite Imperato, Legal Manager on 11/27/02 . Answer due on 12/17/02 for Massachusetts Port A . (yv) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to City of Portland by Elizabeth Boynton, Legal Dept. on 11/19/02 . Answer due on 12/9/02 for City of Portland . (yv) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/18/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to Huntleigh USA Corp. by Crystal Hudson on 11/19/02 . Answer due on 12/9/02 for Huntleigh USA Corp. . (yv) (Entered: 12/18/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2002, Entered: 12/17/2002 Marshal's Process Receipt and Return of Service Executed Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RETURN OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint executed as to United Airlines by Mia Wintersmith, Supervisor on 11/18/02 . Answer due on 12/9/02 for United Airlines . (yv) (Entered: 12/17/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/4/2002, Entered: 12/10/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Burns International by Michelle R. Parker, Brian Vincent Otero, Jeffrey W. Gutchess. (jco) (Entered: 12/10/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER, that the Court is granting the [3-1] motion for Jeffrey W. Moryan to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants Colgan Air. ( signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein ). FORWARDED DOCUMENT TO ATTORNEY ADMISSIONS CLERK. (tp) Modified on 11/13/2002 (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of attorney appearance for Colgan Air, Inc. by Camille V. Otero. (tp) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Jeffrey W. Moryan by Colgan Air, Inc. in support of [3-1] motion for Jeffrey W. Moryan to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants Colgan Air. (tp) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2002, Entered: 11/12/2002, Terminated: 11/7/2002 motion to appear pro hac vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Colgan Air, Inc. for Jeffrey W. Moryan to appear pro hac vice on behalf of defendants Colgan Air . Return Date not indicated. (tp) (Entered: 11/12/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/18/2002, Entered: 10/1/2002 Notice of Case Assignment/ReassignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: John A. Greaves . (gmo) (Entered: 10/01/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: 9/11/2002 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00. (gmo) (Entered: 09/11/2002)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 362 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?