In Re: Biovail Corporation Securities Litigation
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:03-cv-08917

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 8, 2017 at 11:38 PM DT (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Vera A. Hays, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kahn Swick & Foti LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael Andrew Swick +1 212 696 3730 +1 504 455 1498 michael.swick@ksfcounsel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Alfred G. Yates Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Alfred G. Yates, Jr. +1 412 391 5164 +1 412 471 1033

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 192

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Randell Scott +1 860 537 5537 +1 860 537 4432 drscott@scott-scott.com
v.
No Logo Biovail Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brochett and Lentz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joseph.finnertyIII@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE ANDREW D. LAZEROW +1 202 662 5081 alazerow@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Barry Kingham +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bkingham@curtis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchel Robert Aeder +1 646 471 2902
TERMINATED: 06/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark D. Wegener +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 wegenerm@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Lisbeth Fine +1 212 277 6300
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007 Emily Alexandra Poler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 epoler@schlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Schindler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 SSchindler@SCHlaw.com
No Logo Brian H. Crombie, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE ANDREW D. LAZEROW +1 202 662 5081 alazerow@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Barry Kingham +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bkingham@curtis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joseph.finnertyIII@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchel Robert Aeder +1 646 471 2902
TERMINATED: 06/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark D. Wegener +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 wegenerm@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Lisbeth Fine +1 212 277 6300
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007 Emily Alexandra Poler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 epoler@schlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Schindler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 SSchindler@SCHlaw.com
No Logo Eugene N. Melnyk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brochett and Lentz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joseph.finnertyIII@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE ANDREW D. LAZEROW +1 202 662 5081 alazerow@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Barry Kingham +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bkingham@curtis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchel Robert Aeder +1 646 471 2902
TERMINATED: 06/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark D. Wegener +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 wegenerm@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Lisbeth Fine +1 212 277 6300
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007 Emily Alexandra Poler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 epoler@schlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Schindler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 SSchindler@SCHlaw.com
No Logo John R. Miszuk, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE ANDREW D. LAZEROW +1 202 662 5081 alazerow@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Barry Kingham +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bkingham@curtis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joseph.finnertyIII@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchel Robert Aeder +1 646 471 2902
TERMINATED: 06/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark D. Wegener +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 wegenerm@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Lisbeth Fine +1 212 277 6300
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007 Emily Alexandra Poler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 epoler@schlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Schindler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 SSchindler@SCHlaw.com
No Logo Kenneth G. Howling, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington & Burling, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE ANDREW D. LAZEROW +1 202 662 5081 alazerow@cov.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Barry Kingham +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bkingham@curtis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joseph.finnertyIII@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchel Robert Aeder +1 646 471 2902
TERMINATED: 06/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark D. Wegener +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 wegenerm@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Lisbeth Fine +1 212 277 6300
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007 Emily Alexandra Poler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 epoler@schlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Schindler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 SSchindler@SCHlaw.com
No Logo Rolf K. Reininghaus, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Brochett and Lentz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/20/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III +1 212 335 4500 +1 212 335 4501 joseph.finnertyIII@dlapiper.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Curtis, Mallet-Prevost, Colt & Mosle, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Barry Kingham +1 212 696 6000 +1 212 697 1559 bkingham@curtis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Howrey LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/19/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark D. Wegener +1 202 783 0800 +1 202 383 6610 wegenerm@howrey.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Rebecca Lisbeth Fine +1 212 277 6300
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007 Emily Alexandra Poler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 epoler@schlaw.com
TERMINATED: 10/01/2007, LEAD ATTORNEY Steven R. Schindler +1 212 277 6300 +1 212 277 6333 SSchindler@SCHlaw.com
No Logo Ann Matthies, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Movant
No Logo Cyril Berkeley, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo David Alter, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Isaac M. Ovadiah, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine A. Torell +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 ctorell@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo Jack W. Scholl, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Janice M. Ovadiah, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine A. Torell +1 212 838 7797 +1 212 838 7745 ctorell@cohenmilstein.com
No Logo Jim Pierce, Movant
No Logo Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George A. Bauer +1 212 946 9310 +1 212 868 1229 gbauer@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Mr. Mohammed Sobhan, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Neil Matties, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Movant
Officer/Director, Paragon Trade Brands, Inc.
Officer/Director, Inter City Products Corp
Officer/Director, Samsonite Corp/fl
Officer/Director, Wolverine Tube, Inc.
Officer/Director, INC Research Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Athene Holding Ltd.
Officer/Director, Aircastle LTD
Officer/Director, DTZ Jersey Holdings Ltd
Officer/Director, 1700480 Ontario Inc
Officer/Director, Macerich Co
Officer/Director, CPG Newco LLC
Officer/Director, XTRA CORP /DE/
Officer/Director, Pivotal Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, 1397225 Ontario Ltd

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas M. McKeige +1 212 554 1406 +1 212 554 1444
LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald Harlan Silk +1 212 554 1282 +1 212 554 1444 jerry@blbglaw.com
No Logo Sheaff Brock Investment Advisors, LLC, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ken H. Chang +1 212 451 9667 +1 212 486 2093 kchang@wolfpopper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Craig Finkel +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rfinkel@wolfpopper.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert M. Kornreich +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rkornreich@wolfpopper.com
No Logo The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas M. McKeige +1 212 554 1406 +1 212 554 1444
LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald Harlan Silk +1 212 554 1282 +1 212 554 1444 jerry@blbglaw.com
No Logo Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Hutcher +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 286 1884 lkh@dmlegal.com
No Logo Congor Investments Ltd, Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Hutcher +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 286 1884 lkh@dmlegal.com
No Logo Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Hutcher +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 286 1884 lkh@dmlegal.com
No Logo Southridge Management S.a.r.l., Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davidoff Malito & Hutcher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Larry Hutcher +1 212 557 7200 +1 212 286 1884 lkh@dmlegal.com
No Logo Brian Felgoise, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY PHV Robert M. Rothman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 rrothman@csgrr.com
No Logo David Welsh, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 200

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mitchel Robert Aeder +1 646 471 2902
LEAD ATTORNEY PHV Robert M. Rothman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 rrothman@csgrr.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Douglas Sobel, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John E. Lawlor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
No Logo Jim L. Pierce, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan M. Plasse +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 jplasse@glrslaw.com
No Logo Ling Shi, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian P Murray +1 212 682 5340 +1 212 884 0988 bmurray@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Eric James Belfi +1 212 907 0878 +1 212 818 0477 ebelfi@labaton.com
No Logo Mark Newby, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Craig Finkel +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rfinkel@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Paul H. Wojciechowski, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Susan R. Schwaiger +1 212 838 7797
No Logo S.D. Gokhale, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
No Logo Wayne Bruce Abrahamson, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael S. Bigin +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 bigin@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo William A. Emery, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Prongay & Murray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brian P Murray +1 212 682 5340 +1 212 884 0988 bmurray@glancylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Eric James Belfi +1 212 907 0878 +1 212 818 0477 ebelfi@labaton.com
No Logo William C. Rand, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Eduard Korsinsky +1 212 363 7500 +1 212 363 7171 ek@zlk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Law, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Adam Osborn +1 212 725 9800 +1 212 725 9808 dosborn@osbornlawpc.com
No Logo Dow Jones & Company, Inc., Intervenor

Toggle Switch Represented by Dow Jones & Company, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward G. Toptani +1 212 699 8930
No Logo Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kent Andrew Bronson +1 646 733 5724 +1 212 504 8054 kbronson@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas M. McKeige +1 212 554 1406 +1 212 554 1444
LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald Harlan Silk +1 212 554 1282 +1 212 554 1444 jerry@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Lawrence Berger +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 dberger@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford P. Dumain +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sdumain@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Lead Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Wallace Berger +1 212 554 1403 +1 212 554 1489 MWB@blbglaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Kent Andrew Bronson +1 646 733 5724 +1 212 504 8054 kbronson@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas M. McKeige +1 212 554 1406 +1 212 554 1444
LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald Harlan Silk +1 212 554 1282 +1 212 554 1444 jerry@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Lawrence Berger +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 dberger@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George A. Bauer +1 212 946 9310 +1 212 868 1229 gbauer@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford P. Dumain +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sdumain@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Sharon Maine Lee +1 212 631 8605 +1 212 273 4430 slee@lchb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
Space Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
No Logo Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Lead Plaintiff
Officer/Director, Paragon Trade Brands, Inc.
Officer/Director, Inter City Products Corp
Officer/Director, Samsonite Corp/fl
Officer/Director, Wolverine Tube, Inc.
Officer/Director, INC Research Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Athene Holding Ltd.
Officer/Director, Aircastle LTD
Officer/Director, DTZ Jersey Holdings Ltd
Officer/Director, 1700480 Ontario Inc
Officer/Director, Macerich Co
Officer/Director, CPG Newco LLC
Officer/Director, XTRA CORP /DE/
Officer/Director, Pivotal Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, 1397225 Ontario Ltd

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Kent Andrew Bronson +1 646 733 5724 +1 212 504 8054 kbronson@milberg.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niki L. Mendoza +1 858 793 0070 +1 858 793 0323 nikim@blbglaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Grant & Eisenhofer, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Lawrence Berger +1 646 722 8500 +1 646 722 8501 dberger@gelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Labaton Sucharow, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Joseph Keller +1 212 907 0700 +1 212 818 0477 ckeller@labaton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sanford P. Dumain +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sdumain@milberg.com
  Entries (287) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION OF NON-PARTY EMANUEL GOLDBERG, M.D. re: 303 Memorandum of Law in Opposition. (tn) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MEMORANDUM OF LAW OF NON-PARTY EMANUEL GOLDBERG, M.D. IN OPPOSITION TO BIOVAIL'S MOTION TO COMPEL. (tn) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DECLARATION OF MICHAEL BLUMSTEIN IN SUPPORT OF GERSON LEHRMAN'S OPPOSITION TO BIOVAIL'S MOTION TO COMPEL. (tn) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Costs Taxed as to 300 USCA Mandate, USCA Case Number 11-0348. in the amount of $382.37. Docketed as Judgment #12,1019 on 06/11/2012 in favor of Appellees Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board against Appellants Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Congor Investments Ltd., Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Southridge Management S.a.r.l.. (nd) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MANDATE of USCA (Certified Copy) as to 295 Notice of Appeal, filed by Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Congor Investments Ltd., Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Southridge Management S.a.r.l. USCA Case Number 11-0348-cv. Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the order of the District Court is AFFIRMED. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA for the Second Circuit. Issued As Mandate: 03/19/2012. (nd) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by defendants. (This document was previously filed under seal in envelope # 133 and unsealed on 3/18/11)(mro) (Entered: 03/25/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 295 Notice of Appeal, filed by Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Congor Investments Ltd., Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Southridge Management S.a.r.l. USCA Case Number 11-0348-cv, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 3/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER, that the Answer, dated October 20, 2006, is hereby released from the seal of the Stipulated Protective Order, and may be provided to counsel for the rejected Trusts, and included in the public record in the United States Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Docket No. 11-348 cv. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/18/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 03/18/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 2/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: ORDERED, that the fourth Ordering paragraph of the January 19, 2011 Class Distribution Order, is amended as follows to authorize the withholding of a $3,468,000 reserve in case the Disputed Claims are ultimately accepted (new language in italics): ORDERED, that the balance of the Settlement Fund after deducting the payments previously allowed and set forth herein, and after payment of any estimated taxes and the costs of preparing appropriate final tax returns and any escrow fees and after withholding, from those Authorized Claimants otherwise eligible to currently receive a payment of$100 or more, an amount sufficient to pay the Disputed Claims the proportionate amount that they would have been allowed if they were actually Class Members (the "Net Settlement Fund") shall be distributed to the eligible claimants listed on parts 1 and 2 of the computer printout submitted with the Affidavit of Peter M. Craig in proportion to the Recognized Claim allocable to each such eligible claimant as shown on such printout whose pro rata share of the Net Settlement Fund would be at least $10. It is further ORDERED, that this Court retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with this Action. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/25/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 02/28/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL from 294 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Document filed by Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Congor Investments Ltd., Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Southridge Management S.a.r.l. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number E 927904. (tp) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 1/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER APPROVING CLASS DISTRIBUTION AND OVERRULING OBJECTION: Having obtained judicial approval of their class-action settlement, Plaintiffs Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund ("Lead Plaintiffs") move for an order granting distribution of settlement funds to eligible members of the class. Lead Plaintiffs' proposed terms, which consider the form and method of individual payments and payment to the claims administrator, are provided in the attached exhibit. Disputed Claimants, four trusts who have been excluded from the settling class, object to Lead Plaintiffs' motion. I have reviewed the extensive briefing and exhibits submitted, and find the Disputed Claimants were properly excluded from the class. I therefore overrule their objections. Further, I have reviewed the terms of the class distribution order; I find them fair, reasonable, and adequate, and I approve them. ORDER granting 282 Motion. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/19/11) (db) (Entered: 01/19/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George A. Bauer on behalf of Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund (Bauer, George) (Entered: 01/06/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from T. Barry Kingham, dated 12/2/2010, re: counsel for Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc. formerly known as Biovail Corporation, a defendant in this action, and related individuals (collectively, "Biovail") writes: We have received a copy of this Court's Order dated November 22, 2010 directing counsel in this action to appear for oral argument on a pending motion on January 20, 2011. I write to request that Biovail be excused from this appearance and all future appearances unless specifically directed by this Court. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/3/2010) (lnl) (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 11/22/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER You are hereby notified that you are required to appear for an oral argument. That counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel involved in this case and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. ( Oral Argument set for 1/20/2011 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/22/2010) (jmi) (Entered: 11/23/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of Rochelle Feder Hansen in Reply to disputed Claimants and in further support of re: 282 MOTION for Entry of Class Distribution Order. (mbe) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 10/28/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY TO DISPUTED CLAIMANTS AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT re: 282 MOTION FOR CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (mbe) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 10/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ENDORSED LETTER: addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Rochelle Feder Hansen dated 10/19/2010 re: Lead Plaintiffs, hereby request a one week extension making their reply papers due on October 28, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/19/2010) (js) (Entered: 10/20/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW of Disputed Claimants in Opposition to Leas Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Distribution. Document filed by Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Congor Investments Ltd., Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Southridge Management S.a.r.l. ***Unpublished cases and Exhibits 1-20 attached hereto. (mro) Modified on 10/13/2010 (mro). (Entered: 10/13/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Larry Hutcher dated 9/8/2010 re: Requesting a four week extension to serve and file responsive papers, so that they are to be served and filed by no later than October 7, 2010, with reply papers to be served and filed no later than October 21, 2010, making the motion returnable on October 22, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/8/2010) (jpo) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 9/8/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Hutcher on behalf of Archer Investments S.a.r.l., Congor Investments Ltd., Conset Investments S.a.r.l., Southridge Management S.a.r.l. (Hutcher, Larry) (Entered: 09/08/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT of Peter M. Craig in Support re: 282 MOTION for Entry of Class Distribution Order. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (mro) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 282 MOTION for Entry of Class Distribution Order. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (mro) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 8/27/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTION for Entry of Class Distribution Order. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and Defendants. (mro) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 8/24/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Judge Gerard E. Lynch is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) (Entered: 08/24/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/08/8 before Judge Gerard E. Lynch. (ama) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/08/08 before Judge Gerard E. Lynch. (ama) (Entered: 09/04/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      JUDGMENT approving the settlement and dismissing the consolidated second amended class action complaint with prejudice and without costs, except as provided in the Stipulation, as against the defendants. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/8/08) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-GEL et al.(ml) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES: Plaintiffs' Counsel are hereby awarded 16.0145% of the Gross Settlement Fund, which sum the Court finds to be fair and reasonable, and $2,986,098.14 in reimbursement of expenses, which expenses shall be paid to Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel from the Gross Settlement Fund with interest from the date the Settlement Fund was funded to the date of the payment at the same net rate that the Settlement Fund earns, as set forth herein. Lead Plaintiff Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board is hereby awarded $32,278.69, and named plaintiff City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System is hereby awarded $1,750.00. Such awards are for reimbursement of these Plaintiffs' reasonable costs and expenses (including lost wages) directly related to their representation of the Class. In the event that the Settlement is terminated or does not become Final in accordance with terms of the Stipulation, this order shall be rendered null and void to the extent provided by the Stipulation and shall be vacated in accordance with the Stipulation. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 8/8/2008) (jpo) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                          Objection to application for attorneys' fees and expenses. (pl) (Entered: 08/08/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                            SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 271 MOTION to Approve final approval of settlement and plan of allocation of settlement proceeds and final caertification of the class for settlement pujrposes; and. MOTION for Attorney Fees.. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (djc) (Entered: 07/25/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                              MANDATE of USCA WITHDRAWING APPEAL (Certified Copy) as to 185 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc. USCA Case Number 07-0973-cv....that the appeal is hereby WITHDRAWN pursuant to Rule 42(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Catherine O'Hagan Wolfe, Clerk USCA. Certified: 7/14/2008. (nd) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 271 MOTION to Approve final approval of settlement and plan of allocation of settlement proceeds and final caertification of the class for settlement purposes; and. MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (djc) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 271 MOTION to Approve final approval of settlement and plan of allocation of settlement proceeds and final caertification of the class for settlement purposes; and. MOTION for Attorney Fees. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (djc) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Final Apprioval of settlement and plan of allocation of settlement proceeds and final certification of the class for settlement purposes; and MOTION for Attorney Fees and reimbursement of expenses. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund.(djc) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Gerard E. Lynch from Jenifer J. Liu dated 6/12/2008 re: Counsel for defendants write to inform the Court that Mark D. Wegener, of the firm Horwrey LLP, passed away last week and respectfully request that the Court order the withdrawal of his appearance as counsel for the Defendants. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. Attorney Mark Douglas. Wegener terminated. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 6/18/2008) (tve) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 33 Amended Complaint, against Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk.Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (previously filed under seal as doc #114) Related document: 33 Amended Complaint, filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund.(cd) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          ORDER DIRECTING THAT THE CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT BE UNSEALED, that the complaint be unsealed immediately and a copy bearing the legend "UNSEALED PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER" be filed in the public record. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 4/28/08) (cd) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            PRELIMINARY ORDER FOR NOTICE AND HEARING IN CONNECTION WITH SETTLEMENT PROCEEDINGS: The Court does hereby preliminary approve the Stipulation and Settlement set forth therein, subject to further consideration at the Settlement Fairness Hearing... A hearing (the "Settlement Fairness Hearing") pursuant to Rule 23(e) of the Federal Rule of Civil Procedures is hereby scheduled to be held before the Court on August 8, 2008 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 6B, United States District Court, 500 pearl Street, New York NY 10007... (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 4/9/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-GEL et al.(mr) (Entered: 04/10/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 265 Notice of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Preliminary Certifications of the Class and Approval of Notice to the Class. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (jmi) (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement, Preliminary Certifications of the Class and Approval of Notice to the Class. Document filed by Vera A. Hays, Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Sheaff Brock Investment Advisors, LLC, Jack W. Scholl, Cyril Berkeley, David Alter, Ann Matthies, Neil Matties, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Mohammed Sobhan, Janice M. Ovadiah, Isaac M. Ovadiah, Jim Pierce, The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System, The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Brian Felgoise, Mark Newby, David Welsh, Douglas Sobel, Ling Shi, Wayne Bruce Abrahamson, S.D. Gokhale, Jim L. Pierce, William A. Emery, Paul H. Wojciechowski, William C. Rand, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk, Banc of America Securities LLC, Dow Jones and Company, Inc.. (jmi) Modified on 4/7/2008 (jmi). (Entered: 04/07/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM NAMEESS by Christopher J. Keller on behalf of Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. New Address: Milberg, L.L.P., One Pennsylvania Plaza, New York, New York, 10119, (212) 594-5300. (dle) Modified on 3/26/2008 (dle). (Entered: 03/26/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: that all pending motions in this matter are deemed withdrawn, without prejudice to their resubmission should the settlement for any reason fail. The Clerk is respectfully directed to close out all open motions in above-captioned cases. (Signed by Judge Gerard E. Lynch on 2/27/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-GEL et al.(tro) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Gerard E. Lynch. Judge Richard Owen is no longer assigned to the case. (jeh) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        OPINION & ORDER # 95479 re: 85 MOTION to Compel filed by Brian H. Crombie, John R. Miszuk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Kenneth G. Howling. I find that the requested discovery is unnecessary and irrelevant, and production would be a wholly improper high burden on the non-parties. Biovail's motion to compel compliance with its subpoenas is therefore denied. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/30/2007) (jar) (Entered: 12/05/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/11/2007 and 6/13,28,29/2007 before Judge Richard Owen. (jpo) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/8/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (db) (Entered: 11/06/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by T. Barry Kingham on behalf of Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (db) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                REVISED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Summary judgment motions due by 5/9/2008. Responses due by 6/6/2008. Replies due by 7/3/2008. Fact Discovery due by 2/29/2008 (expert discovery by 4/25/08), see document for other discovery deadlines. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 10/31/07) (cd) (Entered: 11/02/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER: Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP and its attorneys is granted leave to withdraw as attorney of record for all defendants in the above-captioned matter. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 10/30/2007) (jar) (Entered: 11/01/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 254 MOTION for Law firm of Schindler cohen & Hochman LLP to Withdraw as Attorney. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (djc) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MOTION for Steven R. Schindler of Law firm of Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of all defendants. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk.(djc) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard Owen from Steven B. Singer dated 10/9/07 re: Counsel for Lead Plaintiffs write in connection with an issue that has arisen concerning the amount of time alloted for the depositions of the five Individual Defendants listed in foot note 1. Counsel asks that the Court Order that the Individual Defendants each be produced for two days. ENDORSEMENT: Given the extensive scope of the several allegations to be explored. It seems entirely realistic that case of the defendants listed in footnote 1 below be produced for two days for depositions. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 10/18/07) (tro) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard Owen from Gary Svirsky dated 9/13/2007 re: Banc of America Securities LLC we write to request respectfully that the Court endorse this letter so that the non-confidential portions of the attached transcript may be unsealed. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/14/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 09/18/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Dfts' Motion to Compel Production of Documents From David W. Maris and Motion For Clarification And/Or Reconsideration of This Court's Order Entered on 1/30/07. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie.(dle) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Non-Party Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP Proposed Conclusion of Law. (pl) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                EXHIBIT: TRANSCRIPTS IN TABLE 2 - (Transcripts; Tab 1-6). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Proceeding Date/Type of Proceeding).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 8 (Letters; Tab 61-83). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 7 (Letters; Tab 45-60). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm). (db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 6 (Letters; Tab 44). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 5 (Letters; Tab 34-43). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 4 (Letters; Tab 27-33). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 3 (Letters; Tab 22-26). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 2 (Letters; Tab 16-21). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm).(db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT: LETTERS IN TABLE 1 - VOLUME 1 (Letters; Tab 1-15). (SEE 237 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Date/Author/Firm). (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER Requiring the Clerk of the Court to Docket Certain Letters and Transcripts: (1) The letters listed in Table 1 (copies of which are annexed hereto) shall be docketed by the Clerk of the Court as part of the record in this case. (2) The transcripts listed in Table 2 (copies of which are annexed hereto) shall be docketed by the Clerk of the Court as part of the record in this case. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/11/07) (db) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL: It is hereby ordered that this matter is dismissed as to Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP. The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/10/07) (js) (Entered: 09/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      REVISED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Motions for summary judgment due by 4/25/2008.,Responses due by 5/23/2008,Replies due by 6/20/2008.,Fact Discovery due by 11/30/2007. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/7/07) (pl) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Dfts' Reply To Lead Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings Of Fact and Conclusions Of Law. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle) (Entered: 08/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Non-Party Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP's REPLY proposed findings of fact. (mbe) (Recieved in the night deposit box on 8/3/2007 at 9:10 p.m.) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Relating to non-party Schindler Cohen & Hochman LLP. Document filed by Biovail Corp..(mbe) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Non-Party Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman, LLP's Reply Proposed Conclusion of Law.. (mbe) (Recieved in the night deposit box on 8/3/2007 at 9:10 p.m.) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Lead Plantiff's RESPONSE to Biovail's, Howrey's and Kasowitz Benson's Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. (mbe) (Recieved in the night deposit box on 8/3/2007 at 10:28 p.m.) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Bas's Proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law.. Document filed by Biovail Corp.. (mbe)(Recieved in the night deposit box on 8/3/2007 at 5:17 p.m.) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    REPLY to Lead Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (ae) (Entered: 08/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 221 Remark. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (pl) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard Owen from T. Barry Kingham dated 7/30/07 re: Counsel for Biovail Corporation request until Friday, August 3, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 7/31/07) (tro) Modified on 8/9/2007 (Entered: 08/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          INDEX OF UNPUBLISHED CASES CITED IN BANC OF AMERICA LLC'S PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC.(djc) Modified on 8/9/2007 (kco). (Entered: 07/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Joinder of Non Party David W. Maris In Banc of America Securities LLC's Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (dle) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Lead Plaintiffs' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (dle) (Entered: 07/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Supplemental Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Relating to Howrey LLP. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Conclusions of Law of dft Biovail Corporation. Document filed by Biovail Corp. (dle) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Findings Of Fact of Dft Biovail Corporation. Document filed by Biovail Corp. (dle) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher J. Keller on behalf of Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. New Address: Milberg, Weiss, One Pennsylvania Plaza, New York, NY, 10119, (212) 868-1229. (jmi) (Entered: 07/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/4/2007 before Judge Richard Owen. (jp) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/26/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 07/02/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/23/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/23/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/8/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 03/16,20/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (es) (Entered: 06/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Peter Jerdee, Pamela Jarvis, Gregory P. Joseph on behalf of Biovail Corp. New Address: Gregory P. Joseph Law Offices, L.L.C., 485 Lexington Avenue, 30th Floor, New York, New York, 10017, (212) 407-1200. (db) (Entered: 06/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      REVISED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Any Motions for summary judgment due by 3/14/2008.,Responses due by 4/11/2008, Replies due by 5/9/2008; Fact Discovery due by 10/29/2007 (expert discovery by 2/8/09). (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 6/6/07) (cd) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for an Order, purs. to Rule 1.3(c) for Niki Mendoza to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board.(tro) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard Owen from John S. Siffert dated 5/24/2007 re: to we write with respect to schedule for the submission of findings of facts and conclusions of law. Submissions will be filed on Monday July 2, 2007. ENDORSEMENT: Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 5/25/2007) (jmi) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Joseph McBride in Support re: MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv10058, 03cv8979, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10221 pusuant to Rule 42 of the FRCP, creating a subclass, and MOTION to Appoint William A. Emery to serve as lead plaintiff of the subclass in the consolidated action. In addition, Dr. Emery moves this Court for an order, pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B)(v) of the SEC Act of 1934, 15 USC 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v), approving his selection of the law firm of Rabin, Murray & Frank LLP as Lead Counsel for the Subclass. to Appoint. Document filed by William A. Emery. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO et al.(jar) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv10058, 03cv8979, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10221 pusuant to Rule 42 of the FRCP, creating a subclass, and MOTION to Appoint William A. Emery to serve as lead plaintiff of the subclass in the consolidated action. In addition, Dr. Emery moves this Court for an order, pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B)(v) of the SEC Act of 1934, 15 USC 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v), approving his selection of the law firm of Rabin, Murray & Frank LLP as Lead Counsel for the Subclass. Document filed by William A. Emery, William A. Emery. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO et al.(jar) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 1/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv10058, 03cv8979, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10221 pusuant to Rule 42 of the FRCP, creating a subclass, and MOTION to Appoint William A. Emery to serve as lead plaintiff of the subclass in the consolidated action. In addition, Dr. Emery moves this Court for an order, pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B)(v) of the SEC Act of 1934, 15 USC 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v), approving his selection of the law firm of Rabin, Murray & Frank LLP as Lead Counsel for the Subclass. Document filed by William A. Emery, William A. Emery.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO et al.(jar) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Index). Notice that the Original index to the record on Appeal for 185 Notice of Appeal, filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc. USCA Case Number 07-0973, 3 Copies of the index, Certified Clerk Certificate and Certified Docket Sheet were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (nd) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/29/2007 (D., Nezam). (Entered: 05/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/23/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (tro) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/11/2007 before Judge Richard Owen. Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO et al.(jar) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/11/2007 before Judge Richard Owen. (jp) (Entered: 04/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 4/5/2007 before Judge Richard Owen. (jp) (Entered: 04/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard Owen from Peter Fleming, Jr. dated 4/17/07 re: requests that Mr. Melnyk's appearance be moved from friday, May 4 to Friday, May 11 if the Corut is available; So Ordered. May 11 date is granted. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/17/07) (pl) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 197 Filed: 4/18/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 3/23/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 04/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; that Kasowitz, Benson, Torres & Friedman LLP produce, by 4/9/07 by 5:00 p.m. all documents in its possession, custody, or control relating to the Protective Order, including all correspondence, e-mails and other communications (internal or otherwise. Additional relief as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/2/07) (pl) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/27, 3/1, 3/2, 3/5, 3/6, 2007 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 03/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on stipulation postponing the 3/23/07 hearing on lead plaintiffs' motion for class certification and the parties' respective motions to strike. I decline to extend the time. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/22/07) (dle) (Entered: 03/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 3/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 2/16/07 before Judge Richard Owen. (jbe) (Entered: 03/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in futher Support re: 150 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jco) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Sanford P. Dumain in Support re: 176 MOTION for Reconsideration. (jco) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CO-LEAD PLAINTIFF SUPPLEMENTAL SUR REPLY in further Support re: 176 MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (jco) (Entered: 03/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER I am directing Joseph Finnerty, Biovail's signatory thereto, to appear before this Court to give testimony on Friday, 3/16/07 at 10 o'clock in the morning, as to who he thereafter informed of the existence of the order, and when that information was imparted. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/13/07) (jco) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 3/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Richard Owen from Steven B. Singer dated 3/13/07 re: Counsel writes to request an extension until 3/14/07 to file supplemental submission and reply papers on their motion to strike. Granted. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/13/07) (jco) (Entered: 03/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS TO STRIKE: Lead Plaintiff's time to serve their supplemental submission on their Motion for Class Certification and their reply papers on their Motion to Strike be extended to 3/13/07.Replies due by 3/13/2007. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/9/07) (rag) (Entered: 03/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL from 172 Order on Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc. Copies of notice of appeal mailed to attorney(s) of record : Milberg, Weiss, Bershad, Hynes & Lerach, LLP, Bernstein, Litowitz, Berger & Grossman, L.L.P., Howrey LLP and Schindler, Cohen & Hochman LLP. (nd) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 2/26/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Bradley J. Butwin in Support of re: 167 Memorandum & Opinion. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (kw) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name to Milberg Weiss & Bershad LLP. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (sac) (Entered: 02/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Emily A. Poler in Support re: 181 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Biovail Corp. (jco) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 176 MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Biovail Corp. (jco) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Shiva Eftekhari in Support re: 179 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (cd) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 176 MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (cd) (Entered: 02/26/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER: for reasons further set forth in said Order, the briefing schedule is revised so that Lead Plaintiff's time to serve their supplemental submission on their Motion for Class Certification and their reply papers on their Motion to strike is extended to 3/6/07. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/21/07) (db) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 176 MOTION for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of this Court's Order entered on 1/30/07. Document filed by Biovail Corp.. (ae) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Clarification and/or Reconsideration of this Court's Order entered on 1/30/07. Document filed by Biovail Corp..(ae) (Entered: 02/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        THIRD REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER:Motions due by 11/16/2007.,Responses due by 12/14/2007,Replies due by 1/11/2008.,Discovery due by 6/29/2007. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/13/07) (db) (Entered: 02/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Andrew Lazerow in Support, filed by defendants re: 173 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. (cd) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 2/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition, filed bt defendants re: 150 MOTION to Strike.. (cd) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Non-party Dow Jones Company, Inc. has moved to intervene to urge the Court to unseal the sealed complaint. i denied a motion by plaintiffs to unseal the complaint at a hearing on October 13, 2006, and today denied plaintiff's motion to reconsider that ruling. I do not find that the proposed intervention will contribute to development of either factual or legal questions, and accordingly at this time deny Dow Jones' motion to intervene. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/2/07) (js) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; at a hearing on 10/13/2006, the Court denied plaintiffs' motion to unseal the second amended class action complaint. Plaintiffs now move the Court to reconsider that denial. For all the reasons listed in this order the motion for reconsideration is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/2/07) (kco) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in further Opposition re: 75 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk. (cd) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Andrew Lazerow in Support re: 109 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk. (cd) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 109 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk et al. (cd) (Entered: 02/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        OPINION AND ORDER # 94208; Banc is hereby awarded its attorney fees and expenses for the bringing of this motion. Banc is to submit to this Court w/in 30 days of this Order an affidavit supporting said attorney fees and expenses. Biovail, should it in good faith dispute the amount of fees or expenses asserted, may demand a hearing which the Court will schedule. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/26/07) (ae) (Entered: 01/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 1/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS TO STRIKE; The parties request that Defendants' time to serve their sur-reply papers on Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, their Reply in further Support of their Motion to Strike, and their Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike be extended one week from 1/19/07 to 1/26/07 and that Lead Plaintiffs' time to serve their supplemental submission on their Motion for Class Certification and their reply papers on their Motion to Strike be commensurately extended from 2/16/07 to 2/23/07. The parties also request that the Court move the hearing from the currently-scheduled date of 3/2/07 to 3/16/07. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/22/07) (ae) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND THE PARTIES' RESPECTIVE MOTIONS TO STRIKE; the parties request that Defendants' time to serve their sur-reply papers on Lead Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification, the Reply in further Support of their motion to Strike, and their Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike be extended one week from January 12, 2007 to January 19, 2007 and that Lead Plaintiffs' time to serve their supplemental submission on their Motion for Class Certification and their reply papers on their Motion to Strike be commensurately extended from Feb. 9, 2007 to February 16, 2007. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/18/07) (djc) (Entered: 01/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; granting the parties requests that dfts time to serve their response to Plaintiffs' motion to Strike be extended to 1/12/07 and that Plaintiff's time to serve their reply, if any, to dfts' Opposition to Plaintiffs' motion to strike be extended to 2/9/07. That 3/2/07 @2:00 is the new return date for the motions. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 12/13/06) (pl, ) (Entered: 12/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 141 MOTION to Unseal Document. MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc.. (dle, ) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 MOTION for Reconsideration. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (pl, ) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER; granting 140 Motion to Withdraw. . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/20/06) (pl, ) (Entered: 11/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DEFENDANTS' Opposition to Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider the Denial of Lead Plaintiffs' Motion to Unseal the Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Andrew D.Lazerow in Support re: 155 Response in Opposition to Motion. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, John R. Miszuk. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 11/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re: 141 MOTION to Unseal Document. MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Lead Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification; (2) Lead Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Stike the Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Candace Preston; (3) Lead Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion to Strike the Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Defendants' Expert Richard L. Smith and the Memorandum of Law in Support thereof; and (4) the Supplemental Declaration of Steven B. Singer and the exhibits served on Mark D. Wegener; Edward Han; Martin Cunniff; Walter M. Berger; Steven R. Schindler; Rebecca L. Fine; Schindler Cohen & Hochman on 11/3/06. Service was made by FedEx overnight service.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO,1:03-cv-08979-RO,1:03-cv-09002-RO,1:03-cv-09011-RO,1:03-cv-09293-RO, 1:03-cv-09480-RO,1:03-cv-09590-RO,1:03-cv-09616-RO,1:03-cv-09701-RO,1:03-cv-09914-RO, 1:03-cv-10058-RO,1:03-cv-10221-RO,1:04-cv-00188-RO(ae, ) (Entered: 11/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 150 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 109 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/9/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/13/2006 before Judge Richard Owen. (aba, ) (Entered: 11/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike the Opinions and Proposed Testimony of Dets' Expert Richard L. Smith. Document filed by ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Steven Singer in Support re: 148 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 139 MOTION for Reconsideration of Motion for Class Certification re Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan and Local 282 Welfare Trust. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION that defts serve their opposition to the Motion to Reconsider by 11/17/06. The parties shall serve their responses to the Motion to Intervene by 11/17/06. Lead plntfs shall serve their reply brief, if an, to the Motion to Reconsider by 12/1/06. Dow Jones shall serve its Reply brief, if an, to the Motion to Intervene by 12/1/06. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/3/06) (cd, ) (Entered: 11/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Lead plaintiffs' motion for class certification. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (jco, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Joshua E. Keller in support of Lead Plaintiff Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund's supplemental reply memorandum of law in support lead plaintiff's motion for class certification. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (jco, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 11/2/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION AND DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT CANDACE PRESTON: The parties request that plaintiffs' time to serve papers in reply to defendants' opposition to their motion for class certification and their opposition to defendants' motion to strike be extended one week from 10/27/2006 to 11/3/2006 and that defendants' time to serve their sur-reply, if any, to lead plaintiffs' opposition to defendants' motion to strike be extended from 12/20/2006 to 1/12/2007. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/1/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 11/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 141 MOTION to Unseal Document. MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc.. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Unseal Judicial Document; and MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc.. (djc, ) (Entered: 11/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 10/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF UNOPPOSED MOTION to Withdraw Counsel of Record. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. Return Date set for 11/17/2006 02:30 PM. (jmi, ) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Reconsider of the denial of lead plaintiffs' motion to unseal the consolidated second amended class action complaint. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (djc, ) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Motion to Reconsider the Denial of led Plaintiffs' Motion to unseal the Consolidated Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Lead Plaintiffs Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (djc, ) (docmt received in night dep on 10/25/06 at 10:05 p.m.) (Entered: 10/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 136 MOTION to Intervene.. Document filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Unreported Decision# 2 Appendix Unreported Decision)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO,1:03-cv-08979-RO,1:03-cv-09002-RO,1:03-cv-09011-RO,1:03-cv-09293-RO, 1:03-cv-09480-RO,1:03-cv-09590-RO,1:03-cv-09616-RO,1:03-cv-09701-RO,1:03-cv-09914-RO, 1:03-cv-10058-RO,1:03-cv-10221-RO,1:04-cv-00188-RO(Gooding, Alison) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Intervene. Document filed by Dow Jones and Company, Inc.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO,1:03-cv-08979-RO,1:03-cv-09002-RO,1:03-cv-09011-RO,1:03-cv-09293-RO, 1:03-cv-09480-RO,1:03-cv-09590-RO,1:03-cv-09616-RO,1:03-cv-09701-RO,1:03-cv-09914-RO, 1:03-cv-10058-RO,1:03-cv-10221-RO,1:04-cv-00188-RO(Gooding, Alison) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 10/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Supplement Report of Professor Richard L. Smith in support of defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification...; Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (djc, ) (Entered: 10/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of Thier Motion to Unseal the Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (djc, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION to Unseal.. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (djc, ) (Entered: 10/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 10/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 126 Motion for Jason Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 10/11/06) (js, ) (Entered: 10/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Rebecca Fine in Support re: 128 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion. (cd, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 10/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition, filed by Defendants re: 124 MOTION to Unseal. (cd, ) (Entered: 10/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Jason Norwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attached are Poler and Norwood Affidavits. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 10/13/2006 02:30 PM. (djc, ) (Entered: 10/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 124 MOTION to Unseal. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jco, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Unseal the consolidated second amended class action complaint. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jco, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request for International Judicial Assistance (Letter Rogatory). Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jar, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Steven B. Singer in Support re: 121 MOTION for Issuance of Request for Letters Rogatory pursuant to FRCP 28, 28 USC 1781 and 28 USC 1781 (b)(2). Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jar, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Issuance of Request for Letters Rogatory pursuant to FRCP 28, 28 USC 1781 and 28 USC 1781 (b)(2). Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jar, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND REVISED PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Motions due by 8/17/2007. Responses due by 9/14/2007 Replies due by 10/12/2007. Fact Discovery due by 3/30/2007. Expert Discovery due by 7/13/2007. The hearing on plaintiffs' motion for Class Certification scheduled for 11/17/06 is adjourned. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/26/06) (kco, ) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER revising briefing schedule for lead plaintiffs' motion for class certification and defendants' motion to strike the opinions and proposed testimony of plaintiffs' expert Candace Preston. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/11/06) (jco, ) (Entered: 09/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER that dfts will have until 9/27/06 to serve their answer or other responsive pleading. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/8/06) (dle, ) (Entered: 09/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE OPINIONS AND PROPOSED TESTIMONY OF PLAINTIFFS' EXPERT CANDACE PRESTON: The parties request that plaintiffs' papers in opposition to defendants' motion to strike be served 9/20/06, the same day as plaintiffs' reply in further support of plaintiffs' motion for class certification is due; and that defendants shall serve their reply, if any, to plaintiffs' opposition to strike on 10/6/06. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/5/06) (js, ) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of FILING CONSOLIDATED SECOND AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jco, ) Modified on 9/12/2006 (ae, ). (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 8/25/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk.(jar, ) (Entered: 08/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 8/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/21/06 @3:45p.m. before Judge Richard Owen. (mo, ) (Entered: 08/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Walter M. Berger in Opposition re: 75 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 75 MOTION to Certify Class.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 109 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for an order striking the expert report and testimony of Candace Preston and should the court deem it necessary an order purs. to Federal Rule of Evidence 702 prohibiting Candace Preston from appearing at any evidentiary hearing on class certification. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 10/6/2006 02:30 PM. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 MOTION for Sanctions and in opposition to Biovail's motion to modify protective order. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AFFIRMATION of Rebecca L. Fine. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition to: 93 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Biovail Corp.. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 85 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIRMATION of Rebecca Fine. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (dle, ) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Yosef J. Riemer in Support re: 85 MOTION to Compel. (jco, ) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 85 MOTION to Compel. (jco, ) (Entered: 07/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 85 MOTION to Compel.. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (cd, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Brian Herman in Opposition of non party Arthur Cohen re: 85 MOTION to Compel.. (cd, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition of non party Arthur Cohen re: 85 MOTION to Compel.. (cd, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re: 85 MOTION to Compel.. (cd, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 93 MOTION for Sanctions.. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (cd, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Sanctions against deft Biovail Corp. Document filed by Banc of America Securities LLC. (cd, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Martin Klotz in Opposition to motion of Biovail Corporation to compel compliance with subpoenas dated February 22, 2006...; (document filed by SAC Capital Advisors, LLC, SAC Capital Management, LLC, SAC Capital Associates, LLC, Sigma Capital Management, LLC and Steven A. Cohen (djc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Laura Cappiello in opposition to the motion of Biovail to compel compliance with subpoenas dated February 22, 2006. (document filed by SAC Capital Advisors, LLC, SAC Capital Management, LLC, SAC Capital Associates, LLC, Sigma Capital Management, LLC and Steven A. Cohen (djc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 85 MOTION to Compel.(document filed by S.A.C. Capital Advisors, LLC, S.A.C. Capital Management, LLC, S.A. C. Capital Associates, LLC, Sigma Capital Management, LLC and Steven A. Cohen. (djc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Alexander Lawrence. (document filed by non party David Maris) (djc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Non-Party David Maris's Opposition to Defendants Motion to compel and Motion to Modify the Stipulated Protective Order;re: 85 MOTION to Compel.. (djc, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: Specifically, the parties request an extension of the current deadline for Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion from July 3, 2006 to July 25, 2006. Plaintiffs will have until September 15, 2006 to file their response, if any to defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 6/27/06) (js, ) (Entered: 06/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 85 MOTION to Compel. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (jco, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for an order compelling non-parties Steven A. Cohen, Arthur Cohen, Timothy McCarthy, S.A.C. Capital Advisors LLC, S.A.C. Capital Associates, S.A.C. Capital Management LLC, S.A.C. Capital Advisors LLC, S.A.C. Capital Management LLC, S.A.C. Healthco and Sigma Funds, David Maris, Gerson Lehrman Brokerage Services, LLC, Gerson Lehrman Group, LLC and Dr. Emanuel Goldberg to produce documents pursuant to the subpoenas served on each of them; and (2) should the Court deem it necessary, an order modifying the Stipulated Protective Order currently in place in this action. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 7/7/2006 02:30 PM. (jco, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Compel Memo of Law in Support of Motion to Compel and Modify Protective Order. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 7/7/2006 02:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Emily A. Poler and Rebecca L. FIne and Ex. A-B# 2 Exhibit Exhibits C-D# 3 Exhibit Exhibit E part 1# 4 Exhibit Exhibit E part 2# 5 Exhibit Exhibits F-J# 6 Exhibit Exhibits K-N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO,1:03-cv-08979-RO,1:03-cv-09002-RO,1:03-cv-09011-RO,1:03-cv-09293-RO, 1:03-cv-09480-RO,1:03-cv-09590-RO,1:03-cv-09616-RO,1:03-cv-09701-RO,1:03-cv-09914-RO, 1:03-cv-10058-RO,1:03-cv-10221-RO,1:04-cv-00188-RO(Poler, Emily) Modified on 6/7/2006 (gf, ). (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING FOR NON-ECF CASE - MOTION to Compel and Modify Protective Order. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 7/7/2006 02:30 PM. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:03-cv-08917-RO,1:03-cv-08979-RO,1:03-cv-09002-RO,1:03-cv-09011-RO,1:03-cv-09293-RO, 1:03-cv-09480-RO,1:03-cv-09590-RO,1:03-cv-09616-RO,1:03-cv-09701-RO,1:03-cv-09914-RO, 1:03-cv-10058-RO,1:03-cv-10221-RO,1:04-cv-00188-RO(Poler, Emily) Modified on 6/7/2006 (gf, ). (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 6/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 81 Motion for Walter M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 6/5/2006) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Walter M. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (db, ) (Entered: 06/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/30/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION TO MODIFY SCHEDULE FOR BRIEFING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION: The parties request an extension of the current deadline for defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion by 60 days from 5/2/2006 to 7/3/2006, and an extension of the deadline for plaintiffs' reply thereto from 6/7/2006 to 8/18/2006. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 5/26/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 05/30/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 78 Motion for Andrew D. Lazerow to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/19/2006) (lb, ) (Entered: 04/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for an order, admitting Andrew D. Lazerow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 3/31/2006 02:30 PM. (sac, ) (Entered: 03/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Sanford P. Dumain in Support re: 75 MOTION to Certify Class. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 75 MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Certify Class. Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jco, ) (Entered: 03/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 8/25/2006. Motions due by 3/9/2007. Responses due by 4/6/2007 Replies due by 5/4/2007. Discovery due by 10/27/2006. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 2/22/06) (db, ) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 69 Motion for Martin F. Cunniff to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/20/2006) (jmi, ) (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark Douglas. Wegener on behalf of Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk (dle, ) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Martin F. Cunniff in Support re: 69 MOTION for Martin F. Cunniff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Biovail Corp et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Rebecca Fine in Support re: 69 MOTION for Martin F. Cunniff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Biovail Corp et al. (cd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Martin F. Cunniff to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. (cd, ) (Entered: 01/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 12/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER; regarding Lead Plaintiffs, letter of 12/9; dfts has submitted extensive support for declining to produce the requested documents. On this record, I accept their position and deny the request. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 12/22/05) (pl, ) (Entered: 12/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: granting 66 Motion for Mark D. Wegener to Appear Pro Hac Vice . (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 12/22/05) (js, ) (Entered: 12/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for an order allowing tyhe admission of Mark Wegener as attorney pro hac vice to argue or try this case in whole or in part as counsel for dfts. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie, Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk. Return Date set for 12/23/2005 02:30 PM. (dle, ) (Entered: 12/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/18/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendants shall substantially complete production of all documents responsive to lead plaintiffs' first request for the production of documents and things by 12/30/05, lead plaintiffs shall file motion for class certification and the appointment of class representatives by 1/31/06. Defendants shall file any opposition to lead plaintiffs' motion for class certification and the appointment of class representatives by 3/7/06. Lead plaintiffs shall reply to defendants' opposition to their motion for class certification and the appointment of class representatives by 4/7/06. The joinder of parties and any amendment of pleadings shall be completed by 4/28/06. Fact discovery shall be completed by 6/30/06. Initial expert reports shall be served by 7/31/06. Rebuttal expert reports shall be served by 8/31/06. Expert discovery shall be completed by 9/29/06. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 10/31/06. oppositions to any motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 12/11/06. Replies to oppositions to any motions for summary judgment shall be filed by 12/29/06. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 10/14/05) (js, ) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REVISED PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/24/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2006. Motions due by 8/25/2006. Responses due by 10/13/2006 Replies due by 11/10/2006. Discovery due by 5/12/2006. Additional deadlines are as set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 7/19/05) (pl, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 62 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joseph Gregory Finnerty, III terminated (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 7/19/05) (sac, ) (Entered: 07/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    UNOPPOSED MOTION for Joseph G. Finnerty III to Withdraw as Attorney of Record and for Substitution of Counsel. Document filed by Kenneth G. Howling, John R. Miszuk, Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie. (ae, ) (Entered: 06/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of "confidential information" (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/29/05) (jco, ) (Entered: 05/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO RULE 26(A)(1). Document filed by Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie. (pl, ) (Entered: 04/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/13/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as a Lead Plaintiff. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (sac, ) (Entered: 04/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/5/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER;... Houston Municipals' motoio to withdraw as a Lead Plaintiff in this Action is granted. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 4/1/05) (djc, ) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/5/2005. Joinder of Parties due by 12/5/2005. Motions due by 5/15/2005. Responses due by 6/15/2005 Replies due by 6/30/2005. Expert Discovery due by 11/15/2005. Pretrial Order due by 2/28/2006. See document for further discovery and motion deadlines; (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/29/05) (djc, ) (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Lisbeth Fine, Steven R. Schindler on behalf of Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Brian H. Crombie (jp, ) (Entered: 03/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  The Joint Report of Counsels' Meeting Purs to FRCP 26(f). Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. (djc, ) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER to Amended Complaint. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie. Related document: 33 Amended Complaint, filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board,, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund,.(fk, ) (Entered: 02/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND ORDER; that defts will answer the Consolidated Amended Complaint on or before 2/4/2005. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/28/2005) (jp, ) (Entered: 02/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Firm Name: Piper Rudnick LLP has changed its name to Piper Rudnick Gray Cary US LLP. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus, Brian H. Crombie. (db, ) (Entered: 01/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER, that defts shall have through and including 1/21/05 to answer the Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/12/05) (cd, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 01/17/04 before Judge Richard Owen. (es, ) (Entered: 01/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/6/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Strike.. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (jmi, ) (Entered: 12/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Joseph G. Finnerty III in Support re: 47 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. Received in the night deposit box on 11/23/04 at 7:27 p.m.. (sac, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. Received in the night deposit box on 11/23/04 at 7:27 p.m.. (sac, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 40 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. Received in the night deposit box on 11/23/04 at 7:27 p.m..(sac, ) (Entered: 11/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER, that subject to to the Order of the Court, the defendants shall have through and including 11/18/2004 to respond to the plaintiffs' motion to strike, and the plaintiffs shall have through and including 12/6/2004 to file their reply memorandum in support of their motion to strike. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/17/04) (tp, ) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/18/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 32 Motion for David Clarke, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/17/04) (tp, ) (Entered: 11/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: defendant shall have until 11/23/04 to file reply to their motion to dismiss and their response to plaintiffs motion to strike. Plaintiffs to submit reply to their motion to strike by 12/6/04. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 11/18/04) (db, ) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/1/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE IN FIRM NAME AND ADDRESS: that the law firm of Rabin, Murray & Frank LLP has changed its name to Murray, Frank & Sailer LLP. Document filed by Wayne Bruce Abrahamson, William A. Emery, Brian Felgoise, S.D. Gokhale, Vera A. Hays, Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Mark Newby, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board, Jim L. Pierce, William C. Rand, Ling Shi, Douglas Sobel, David Welsh, Paul H. Wojciechowski. (pl, ) Modified on 11/4/2004 (pl, ). Modified on 11/4/2004 (pl, ). (Entered: 11/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 40 MOTION to Strike. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (pl, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Strike certain exhibits and portions of defendants' Memorandum Of Law. Document filed by Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. (pl, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (cd, ) (Entered: 11/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk.(jmi, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Joseph G. Finnerty III in Support re: 35 MOTION to Dismiss.. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/28/2004, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. (jmi, ) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER; defendants will now answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the consolidated amended complaint on or before 09/28/04; lead plaintiffs will have until 10/28/04 to respond to the motion. defendants shall have until 11/18/04 to submit a reply in support of their motion; the revised dates are necessary due to scheduling conflicts which have recently arisen with the parties; (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 9/10/04) (djc, ) (Entered: 09/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CONSOLIDATED AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus.Document filed by Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Received in night deposit box on 6/18/04 at 7:37 p.m. Related document: 1 Complaint.(db, ) (Entered: 06/28/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/28/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for David Clarke, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus. Affidavit of Keara M. Gordon in support attached. (sac, ) (Entered: 06/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2004. Responses due by 9/30/2004 Replies due by 10/21/2004. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 5/14/04) (dfe, ) (Entered: 05/18/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Law Firm Name. Document filed by Wayne Bruce Abrahamson, William A. Emery, Brian Felgoise, S.D. Gokhale, Vera A. Hays, Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Mark Newby, Jim L. Pierce, William C. Rand, Ling Shi, Douglas Sobel, David Welsh, Paul H. Wojciechowski. New Firm Name: Milberg, Weiss, Bershad & Schulman, LLP. (db, ) (Entered: 05/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/30/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Co-Lead Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint within 60 days from the date of this Order. Defendants shall have 60 days from the filing of Co-Lead Plaintiffs' Consolidated Amended Complaint in which to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Consolidated Amended Complaint. If Defendants' response is in the form of a Motion to Dismiss, Co-Lead Plaintiffs shall have 30 days to respond to the Motion and Defendants shall have 21 days in which to submit a Reply Memorandum. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/29/04) (yv, ) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Patrick Anthony Klingman; New Address: that the firm of Schatz & Nobel, P.C. new address is Schatz & Nobel, P.C., One Corporate Ctr., 20 Church Street, Sutie 1700, Hartford, CT 06103, atty. Andrew M. Schatz and Patrick A. Klingman. (pl, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael Padfield, Fred Holmes, Gary La Barbera and Frank Finkel in Support re: 21 MOTION to Appoint Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve movants' selection of lead counsel. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of lead counsel. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221.. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. (cd, ) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER; consolidating all related actions, appointing co-lead plaintiffs and approving their selections of co-lead counsel; that pursuant to Rule 42(a) of the F.R.C.P. actions 03cv8917(RO), 03cv8979 (RO), 03cv9002, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616(JFK), 03cv9701 (GBD), 03cv9914 (RO), 03cv10058, 03cv10221 (HB), and 04cv188, and any subsequently filed or transferred actions on behalf of investors who purchased or otherwise acquired Biovail Corp. securities, related to the claims asserted in these cases, are hereby Consolidated for all purposes. This action shall be captioned ?In Re Biovail Corporation Securities Litigation,? and the file shall be maintained under Master File 03cv8917 (RO).that Ontario, Houston Municipal Employees Pension System and the Local 282 are hereby appointed to serve as Co-Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated action, pursuant to Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. section 78u-4(a)(3)(B), as amended by Sec. 101(a) of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995; the law firms of Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossman LLP and Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP are hereby appointed to serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the Class, pursuant to pursuant to Sec. 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, 15 U.S.C. section 78u-4(a)(3)(B), as amended by Sec. 101(a) of the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, action and all related actions hereby pursuant to paragraph 1 of this Order. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 3/3/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 03/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/26/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER;that Ontario, Houston and Local 282 shall, subject to the approval of the Court, serve as Co-Lead Plaintiffs in this action and all related actions consolidated herewith; the law firms of Bernstein Litowitz and Milberg Weiss shall, subject to the approval of the Court, serve as Co-Lead Counsel for the Class. (Signed by Judge Richard Owen on 1/30/04) (pl, ) (Entered: 03/02/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System withdrawing motion for appointment as Lead Plaintiff. (sb, ) (Entered: 02/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Gerald H. Silk in Support of 21 MOTION to Appoint Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as lead plaintiffs. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, and 1:03-cv-10221. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System. Received in the night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 10:56 p.m.(sb, ) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 21 MOTION to Appoint Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as lead plaintiffs. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, and 1:03-cv-10221. Document filed by Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System.Received in the night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 10:55 p.m. (sb, ) (Entered: 01/27/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Appoint Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board and The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System to serve as lead plaintiffs. MOTION to Approve movants' selection of lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221.Document filed by The Houston Municipal Employees Pension System, Ontario Teachers' Pension Plan Board. Received in the night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 10:56 p.m. Proposed Order attached. (sb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Robert C. Finkel in Support of 18 MOTION to Appoint The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve the movant's selection of Wolf Popper LLP to serve as Lead Counsel in this action. Document filed by The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System. Received in the night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 5:44 p.m.(sb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 18 MOTION to Appoint The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve the movant's selection og Wolf Popper LLP to serve as Lead Counsel in this action. Document filed by The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System. Received in the night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 5:44 p.m.(sb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Appoint The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve the movant's selection of Wolf Popper LLP to serve as Lead Counsel in this action. Document filed by The City of Dearborn Heights Act 345 Pension System. Return Date set for 2/20/2004 02:30 PM before Judge Richard Owen. Return Date set for 2/20/2004 at 02:30 PM before Judge Richard Owen. Proposed Order attached. Received in the night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 5:44 p.m.(sb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support of 12 MOTION to Appoint Jim Pierce to serve as lead plaintiff. MOTION to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv8917, 03cv8979, 03cv9002, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10058, 03cv10221. Document filed by Jim Pierce. (sb, ) (Entered: 01/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Catherine A. Torell in Support re: 14 MOTION to Appoint Isaac M. Ovadiah, individually, Janice M. Ovadiah, individually, and Isaac and Janice Ovadiah, jointly to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. Document filed by Isaac M. Ovadiah, Janice M. Ovadiah. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 5:34 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 14 MOTION to Appoint Isaac M. Ovadiah, individually, Janice M. Ovadiah, individually, and Isaac and Janice Ovadiah, jointly to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. Document filed by Isaac M. Ovadiah, Janice M. Ovadiah. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 5:34 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Isaac M. Ovadiah, individually, Janice M. Ovadiah, individually, and Isaac and Janice Ovadiah, jointly to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve their choice of the law firm of Cohen, Milstein, Hausfeld & Toll, P.L.L.C. to serve as lead counsel., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221. Proposed Order attached. Document filed by Janice M. Ovadiah, Isaac M. Ovadiah. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 5:34 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Christopher Keller in Support of Plaintiff Jim Pierce's re: 12 MOTION to Appoint Jim Pierce to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel. MOTION to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv8917, 03cv8979, 03cv9002, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10058, 03cv10221. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv8917, 03cv8979, 03cv9002, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10058, 03cv10221. (ps, ) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION to Appoint Jim Pierce to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve Proposed Lead Plaintiff's Selection of Lead Counsel., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv8917, 03cv8979, 03cv9002, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590, 03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10058, 03cv10221.. (ps, ) (Entered: 01/23/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Christopher Hinton in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint. MOTION to Approve. Document filed by Mohammed Sobhan. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 11:13 p.m. (db, ) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 9 MOTION to Appoint. MOTION to Approve. Document filed by Mohammed Sobhan. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 11:13 p.m. (db, ) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Appoint Mr. Mohammed Sobhan as lead plaintiff(s).,to Approve the law firm of Schatz & Nobel, P.C. to serve as Lead counsel and Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP to serve as liaison counsel. Proposed Order attached. Document filed by Mr. Mohammed Sobhan. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 11:13 p.m. (db, ) Modified on 1/22/2004 (db, ). (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Peter E. Seidman in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Neil and Ann Matthies, David Alter, Cyril Berkeley and Jack W. Scholl to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188.. Document filed by Cyril Berkeley, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ann Matthies, Neil Matties, Jack W. Scholl. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 10:48 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 6 MOTION to Appoint Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Neil and Ann Matthies, David Alter, Cyril Berkeley and Jack W. Scholl to serve as lead plaintiff(s). MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions. MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188. MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188.. Document filed by Cyril Berkeley, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Ann Matthies, Neil Matties, Jack W. Scholl. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 10:48 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Appoint Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund, Neil and Ann Matthies, David Alter, Cyril Berkeley and Jack W. Scholl to serve as lead plaintiff(s)., MOTION to Approve selection of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Scott & Scott LLC pursuant to PSLRA as co-lead counsel of the actions., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 1:03-cv-8917, 1:03-cv-8979, 1:03-cv-9002, 1:03-cv-9011, 1:03-cv-9293, 1:03-cv-9480, 1:03-cv-9590, 1:03-cv-9616, 1:03-cv-9701, 1:03-cv-9914, 1:03-cv-10058, 1:03-cv-10221, 1:04-cv-00188. Document filed by Jack W. Scholl, Cyril Berkeley, David Alter, Ann Matthies, Neil Matties, Local 282 Welfare Trust Fund. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 10:48 p.m. (yv, ) (Entered: 01/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: 3 MOTION to Appoint. MOTION to Consolidate Cases. MOTION to Approve. Document filed by Sheaff Brock Investment Advisors, LLC. Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 6:59 p.m.(db, ) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 3 MOTION to Appoint. MOTION to Consolidate Cases. MOTION to Approve. Document filed by Sheaff Brock Investment Advisors, LLC. Recieved in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 7:00 p.m. (db, ) (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Appoint Sheaff Brock Investment Advisors, LLC as lead plaintiff(s).,to Approve the law firm of Schiffrin and Barroway, LLP to serve as Lead counsel and Cauley Geller Bowman & Rudman, LLP to serve as liaison counsel, MOTION to Consolidate Cases 03cv8917 (RO) (as lead case), 03cv8979, 03cv9002, 03cv9011, 03cv9293, 03cv9480, 03cv9590,03cv9616, 03cv9701, 03cv9914, 03cv10058 and 03cv10221. Proposed Order attached. Document filed by Sheaff Brock Investment Advisors, LLC. (db, ) Modified on 1/21/2004 (db, ). Received in night deposit box on 1/12/04 at 6:59 p.m. (Entered: 01/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/30/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Gregory Finnerty III on behalf of Biovail Corp., Brian H. Crombie, Eugene N. Melnyk, Rolf K. Reininghaus (pl, ) (Entered: 01/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/12/2003, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 491088. (jjm) (Entered: 11/13/2003)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 231 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Need Password Help?