United States of Ame v. Local 1804-1
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:90-cv-00963

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 8, 2020 at 3:10 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney for the SDNY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chad A. Vignola +1 212 791 1972

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lara K. Eshkenazi +1 212 637 2758 +1 212 637 2730 Lara.Eshkenazi@usdoj.gov
Space Beth E. Goldman +1 212 637 2200 +1 212 637 2686 Beth.Goldman@usdoj.gov
Space Benjamin H. Torrance +1 212 637 2703 +1 212 637 2702 benjamin.torrance@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Alfred Small, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gerald J. McMahon, Esq.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald Joseph McMahon +1 212 797 1877 +1 212 797 1419 gm@geraldjmcmahon.com
No Logo Anthony Anastasio, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Ciccone, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Gallagher, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Pimpinella, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Salerno, Defendant
No Logo Anthony Scotto, Defendant
No Logo Blase Terraciano, Defendant
No Logo Carlos Mora, Defendant
No Logo Dominick Sanzo, Defendant
No Logo Donald J Carson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of FREDRIC J. GROSS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FREDRIC J. GROSS
No Logo Doreen Supply Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Douglas Rago, Defendant
No Logo Frank Lonardo, Defendant
No Logo Frank Scollo, Defendant
No Logo George Barone, Defendant
No Logo George Bradley, Defendant
No Logo George Lachnicht, Defendant
No Logo Gregory Lagana, Defendant
No Logo Harold Daggett, Defendant
No Logo Harry Cashin, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1588, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donna R. Newman +1 212 229 1516 +1 212 676 7497 donnanewmanlaw@aol.com
No Logo Ila Local 1588 Executive Board, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1804-1, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1804-1 Executive Board, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1809, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1809 Executive Board, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1814, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1814 Executive Board, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1909, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 1909 Executive Board, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 824, Defendant
No Logo Ila Local 824 Executive Board, Defendant
No Logo James Cashin, Defendant
No Logo James Coonan, Defendant
No Logo James McElroy, Defendant
No Logo John Barbato, Defendant
No Logo John Bowers, Defendant
No Logo John Gotti, Defendant
No Logo John Potter, Defendant
No Logo Joseph C.F. Kenny, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Colozza, Defendant
No Logo Joseph Randazzo, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Leroy Gwynn, Defendant
No Logo Louis Pernice, Defendant
No Logo Metropolitan Marine Maintenance Contractors, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lord Day & Lord, Barrett Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Simon +1 212 969 6000
No Logo Michael Coppola, Defendant
No Logo New York Shipping Association, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lambos & Giardino

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard P. Lerner
Space richard P. Richard P. Lerner +1 212 943 2470

Toggle Switch Represented by The Lambos Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Robert Campbell +1 212 381 9700 +1 212 797 9213 jrcampbell@lambosfirm.com
Space Donato Caruso +1 212 943 2470 +1 212 381 9774 dcaruso@lambosfirm.com
No Logo Nodar Pump Repair, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Perello, Defendant
No Logo Richard Pierce, Defendant
No Logo Robert Gleason, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Capri, Defendant
No Logo Santo Calabrese, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Buzzanca, Defendant
No Logo Thomas, Ryan, Defendant
No Logo Tino Fiumara, Defendant
No Logo Venero Mangano, Defendant
No Logo Vincent Colucci, Defendant
No Logo Margaret Dillin, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James Lisa +1 917 992 0974 jameslisaesq@gmail.com
No Logo Ila Local 1588, ADR Provider

Toggle Switch Represented by Zazzali, Fagella, Nowak, Kleinbaum & Friedman

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert A. Fagella +1 973 623 1822 rfagella@zazzali-law.com
Space Kenneth Ira Nowak +1 973 623 1822 +1 973 623 2209 knowak@zazzali-law.com
No Logo Ila Local 1588 Executive Board, ADR Provider
No Logo Ila Local 1814, ThirdParty Plaintiff
No Logo Ila Local 1814 Executive Board, ThirdParty Plaintiff
No Logo Locals 1, 791, 824, 856, 895, 901, 1198, 1233, 1235, 1588, 1804-1 and 1814 of the International Longshoremen's Association, AFL-CIO, Movant
No Logo WATERFRONT COMMISSION OF NEW YORK HARBOR, ThirdParty Defendant
  Entries (793) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1388 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1387 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1386 Filed: 6/8/2020, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1385 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Affidavit of Service Other
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1384 Filed: 5/30/2019, Entered: None Declaration (non-motion)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 1348 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 1/30/2015 re: Counsel submits an invoice for Robert C. Stewart covering the months of September through October 2014. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, this invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/11/2015) (tn) (Entered: 02/11/2015)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1347 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 1345 Letter filed by United States of America, 1346 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/11/2015) (tn) (Entered: 01/13/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1346 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. La Morte dated January 7, 2015 re: Additional Criterion Regarding Creation of Union Position (corrected letter). Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1345 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. La Morte dated January 7, 2015 re: Additional Criterion Governing Creation of Union Position. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1344 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 1343 LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. La Morte dated December 29, 2014 re: Request for Extension of Time. Document filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/30/2014) (rjm) (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 12/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                      LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. La Morte dated December 29, 2014 re: Request for Extension of Time. Document filed by United States of America.(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 12/29/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1342 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 12/4/2014 re: Counsel submits an invoice for Robert C. Stewart covering the months of July through August 2014. ENDORSEMENT: The invoice is approved. The level of detail is consistent with prior practice, and reasonably and sufficiently discloses the nature and extent of the work performed. It was reasonable for the Administrator to perform this work, in response to my inquiry. The Administrator more than anyone else, could give me appropriate history and expectations, necessary for me to determine how much longer is the need for the Administrator under court supervision. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/9/2014) (tn) (Entered: 12/09/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1341 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 11/25/2014 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1340 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 11/25/2014 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/12/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1339 Filed: 12/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER granting 1312 Motion: that the term of the Administrator is extended for an additional eighteen-month period, from April 30, 2014, until October 31, 2015, during which time the Administrator retains all authority set forth in the January 30, 2003, Order, as modified by the Court's Orders dated December 8, 2008, July 1, 2010, May 3, 2011, and November 15, 2012. The criteria attached to this Order will govern assessment of Local 1588's compliance with the January 2003 Order and the Consent Decree. Within a month of the date this Order is executed, the parties will submit an additional criterion governing the union's creation of the position of ethical practices officer, who shall have responsibilities to the Court and over which the Court will have continuing jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/2014) (tn) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1338 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. La Morte dated 11/26/2014 re: Proposed Order Extending Monitorship. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Attachment to Proposed Order)(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1337 Filed: 11/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Tara M. La Morte dated November 21, 2014 re: Proposed Criteria re: Monitorship. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Criteria)(La Morte, Tara) (Entered: 11/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1336 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert A. Fagella dated 10/24/2014 re: the parties request that the matter be adjourned for approximately three weeks in an effort to resolve remaining differences regarding a proposed form of agreement regarding Local 1588 compliance with this court's earlier Decree. ENDORSEMENT: The conf is adjourned to Nov. 25, 2014, 11:00 a.m. (Status Conference set for 11/25/2014 at 11:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/28/2014) (tn) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1335 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 1334 Letter filed by United States of America. ENDORSEMENT: The Conference is adjourned to October 29, 2014, 2:00 p.m. ( Status Conference set for 10/29/2014 at 02:00 PM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/23/2014) (ama) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1334 Filed: 9/23/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lara Eshkenazi dated September 23, 2014 re: adjournment of conference scheduled for September 24, 2014. Document filed by United States of America.(Torrance, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/23/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1333 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on INVOICE submitted by Robert J. McGuire re: an invoice covering the months of April through June 2014 for Robert C. Stewart. ENDORSEMENT: Without objections, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/8/2014) (tn) (Entered: 09/11/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1332 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 1331 Letter filed by United States of America: ENDORSEMENT: The conf is adjourned to Sep. 24, 2014, 10:30 a.m. (Status Conference set for 9/24/2014 at 10:30 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/27/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1331 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lara K. Eshkenazi dated August 27, 2014 re: request for extension. Document filed by United States of America.(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1330 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a conference proceeding held on 8/4/14 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1329 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: conference held on 8/4/2014 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Thomas Murray, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/8/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/17/2014.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 08/14/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1328 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                    DECLARATION of Robert C. Stewart in Support re: 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588.. Document filed by United States of America. (Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1327 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588. . Document filed by United States of America. (Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1326 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Declaration of New York Shipping Association, Inc. Concerning New Members served on George Lachnicht and Anthony Ciccone on June 13, 2014. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by New York Shipping Association. (Campbell, James) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1325 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Robert Campbell on behalf of New York Shipping Association. (Campbell, James) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1324 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Donato Caruso on behalf of New York Shipping Association. (Caruso, Donato) (Entered: 07/01/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1323 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588. . Document filed by Ila Local 1588, Ila Local 1588 Executive Board. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Virgil Maldonado)(Fagella, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1322 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 5/22/2014 re: Invoices covering the months of January through March 2014 for Robert C. Stewart and for the months of February and March 2014 for Stephen R. Max. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/29/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1321 Filed: 5/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  FIFTEENTH DECLARATION OF NEW YORK SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, INC. CONCERNING NEW MEMBERS. Document filed by New York Shipping Association. (mro) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1320 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER granting 1319 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588. Time to oppose is enlarged to July 13, 2014; to reply, to July 20, 2014. Stay to continue until determination of motion. Responses due by 7/13/2014. Replies due by 7/20/2014. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/12/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1319 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588. addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert A. Fagella dated May 7, 2014. Document filed by Ila Local 1588, Ila Local 1588 Executive Board.(Fagella, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1318 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert A. Fagella on behalf of Ila Local 1588, Ila Local 1588 Executive Board. (Fagella, Robert) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1317 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ira Nowak on behalf of Ila Local 1588, Ila Local 1588 Executive Board. (Nowak, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1316 Filed: 4/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the authority of the Administrator established pursuant to the January 2003 Order, as modified by the Orders of December 8, 2008, July 1, 2010, May 3, 2011, and November 15, 2012, is hereby extended pending a decision by the Court on the Government's motion to extend the Administrator's term for an additional eighteen months. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/29/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1315 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Lara K. Eshkenazi dated April 24, 2014 re: Motion to Extend Term Administrator for Local 1588. Document filed by United States of America.(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1314 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                DECLARATION of Robert J. McGuire in Support re: 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588.. Document filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1312 MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588.. Document filed by United States of America. (Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1312 Filed: 4/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    MOTION to Extend the Term of the Administrator for Local 1588. Document filed by United States of America.(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 04/24/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1311 Filed: 3/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on INVOICE. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/6/2014) (ft) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1310 Filed: 11/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert McGuire dated 11/12/13 re: In accordance with Your Honor's directions, the enclosed invoice was sent to Robert Fagella, Counsel for Local 1588, on October 22, 2013, requesting that any objections be forwarded to me within two weeks. I have not received any comments or objections as of this date. ENDORSEMENT: Without any objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/20/2013) (mro) (Entered: 11/20/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1309 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          STANDING ORDER M10-468: Stay of Certain Civil Cases Pending the Restoration of Department of Justice Funding. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2013) ***Original Standing Order docketed in case no. 1:13-mc-00334-LAP, document no. 2 on 10/1/2013.***(tro) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1308 Filed: 7/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on INVOICE. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/23/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 07/23/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1307 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Copies of the Fourteenth Declaration of New York Shipping Association, Inc. served on Gerald L. Shargel, Esq. and George L. Santangelo, Esq. on 6/20/2013. Service was made by Mail. (ft) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1306 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 5/07/2013 re: In accordance with Your Honor's directions, the enclosed invoice was sent to Robert Fagella, Counsel for Local 1588, on April 18, 2013, requesting that any objections be forwarded to me within two weeks. I have not received any comments or objections as of this date. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/10/2013) (ama) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1305 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 2/13/2013 re: Pursuant to paragraph 6 (Compensation and Expenses) and paragraph 3(f) (Hiring Authority) ofthe Court Order relating to Local 1588 of the International Longshoremen's Association, I submit invoices covering the months of October through December 2012 for Robert C. Stewart and for the months of October and November for Stephen R. Max. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/23/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1304 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT ON INVOICE OF DESCRIPTION OF SERVICES AND EXPENSES: So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/2/2013) (djc) Modified on 1/11/2013 (djc). (Entered: 01/11/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1303 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that (1) the pending civil cases noted in the attachment to this Order are designated as cases to the Electronic Case Filing database (ECF); and (2) The Clerk of Court shall docket a copy of this Order in each case and designate the case as an ECF case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, Counsel to any party who is not a registered user of this Court's ECF database is directed to register immediately and obtain a log in and password to this Court's ECF database. Attorneys appearing as counsel for plaintiff(s) or defendant(s) shall file their pleading(s) and other permitted papers using the ECF system. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/4/2012) (djc) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1302 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the authority of the Administrator established pursuant to the January 2003 Order, as modified by the Orders of December 8, 2008, July 1, 2010, and May 3, 2011, is hereby extended pending a decision by the Court on the Government's motion to extend the Administrator's term for an additional eighteen months. ENDORSEMENT: nunc pro tunc October 31, 2012 (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/14/2012) (js) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1301 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER EXTENDING TERM OF MONITOR TO APRIL 30 2014: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the term of the Administrator is extended for an additional eighteen-month period, from October 31, 2012, until April 30, 2014, during which time the Administrator retains all authority set forth in the January 30, 2003, Order, as modified by the Court's Orders dated December 8, 2008, July 1, 2010, and May 3, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 11/15/2012) (js) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1300 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1299 MOTION for an order extending the term of the Administrator for Local 1588. Document filed by United States of America. (cd) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1299 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION for an order extending the term of the Administrator for Local 1588 until 4/30/2014. Document filed by United States of America.(cd) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1298 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for an order extending the term of the Administrator. Document filed by United States of America.(Eshkenazi, Lara) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1297 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on INVOICE, dated 8/9/12 for expenses totaling $3,193.75. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 9/4/2012) (ft) Modified on 9/11/2012 (ft). (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1296 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER GRANTING GOVERNMENT'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW re: granting 1284 Motion for Judgment. The Government's motion for judgment as a matter of law on Dillin's notice of appeal is granted. The Clerk shall mark Document No. 1284 terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/27/2012) (djc) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1295 Filed: 7/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 7/16/12 re: Counsel advises that in accordance with Your Honor's directions, the enclosed invoice was sent to James Cohen, Counsel for Local 1588, on 6/28/12, requesting that any objections be forwarded to him within two weeks and counsel has not received any comments or objections as of this date. ENDORSEMENT: Approved for payment. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/20/2012) (mro) (Entered: 07/24/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1294 Filed: 6/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Robert J. McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 4/28/2012 re: Attached is my invoice for professional services provided at your direction in the above-referenced matter during the two month period specified. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/25/2012) (rjm) (Entered: 06/26/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1293 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis, for Inquest After Default/Damages Hearing. (pgu) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1292 Filed: 6/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Ronald L. Ellis. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (pgu) (Entered: 06/13/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1291 Filed: 5/22/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of copies of the Thirteenth Declaration of New York Shipping Association Inc served on Susan Singer, Esq. and Gerald Shargel, Esq. on 5/22/2012. Service was made by first class mail (after the initial mailings to these individuals were returned because of changed or incorrect addresses). (djc) (Entered: 06/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1290 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                THIRTEENTH DECLARATION OF NEW YORK SHIPPING ASSOCIATION, INC. CONCERNING NEW MEMBERS. (mro) (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1289 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Robert J. McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 2/15/2012 re: Attached is my invoice for professional services provided at your direction in the above-referenced matter during the two month period specified above. Thank you for your attention to this invoice. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/23/2012) (djc) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1288 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Robert J. McGuire, Esq. from Stephen R. Max dated 12/31/2011 re: Enclosed is my invoice for services performed from December 1, 2011 to December 31, 2011 in the above-mentioned matter. I have enclosed a detailed printout of all time and expenses charged. Your assistance in processing this for payment would be greatly appreciated. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 4/23/2012) (djc) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1287 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Administrator McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 12/3/2011 re: Counsel writes to provide the Court with his professional services provided at the Court's direction. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 2/29/2012) (ab) Modified on 3/13/2012 (ab). (Entered: 03/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1286 Filed: 12/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER DENYING APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF ADMINISTRATOR'S ORDER EXPELLING APPELLANT FROM UNION: terminating 1280 Motion to Stay. The motion for a stay is denied. Appellant Margaret Dillin may file any opposition to the government's Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by January 20, 2012. The government may file any reply by January 27, 2012. The Clerk shall mark Document No. 1280 terminated. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/22/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1285 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1284 MOTION for Judgment. Document filed by United States of America. (cd) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1284 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Judgment on Dillin's Notice of Appeal. Document filed by United States of America.(cd) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 12/9/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Letter addressed to Judge Alvin K Hellerstein from Tara M LaMorte dated 12/1/2011 re: Government's motion for judgment on Dillin's Notice of Appeal, not docketed when filed on 11/10/2011. Document filed by United States of America.(cd) (Entered: 12/09/2011)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1282 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Robert J. McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 10/12/2011 re: Attached is my invoice for professional services provided at your direction in the above-referenced matter during the two month period specified above. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/2/2011) (rjm) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1281 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Administrator McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 8/22/11 re: Robert C. Stewart attaches his invoice for professional services during the period of June and July 2011. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 10/17/2011) (mro) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1280 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay her expulsion from ILA Local 1588 pending determination of the underyling appeal. Document filed by Margaret Dillin.(ae) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1279 Filed: 8/22/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      APPEAL OF ADMINISTRATOR DECISION to District Court. Document filed by Maragret Dillin. Notice is hereby given that Margaret "Margo" Dillin, the Respondent in the above named case, hereby appeals to the United States District Court, Southern District of New York from the decision of Robert J. McGuire, Esq., the Administrator of ILA Local 1588, expelling Respondent from Local 1588, which was entered in this action on July 20, 2011. A true and correct copy ofthe decision is attached hereto as Exhibit "A". (tp) (Entered: 08/25/2011)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1278 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Bob from Stephen R. Max dated 5/31/2011 re: Enclosed is counsels invoices for service performed from 5/1/11 to 5/31/2011 in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: without obligation, the invoice is approved for payment. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1277 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Bob from Stephen R. Max dated 4/30/2011 re: Enclosed is counsels invoices for service performed from 4/1/11 to 4/30/2011 in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: without obligation, the invoice is approved for payment. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1276 Filed: 8/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mr. McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 7/6/2011 re: Attached is counsels invoice for professional services provided partially at Your Honors direction and otherwise in accordance with established directives from the United States Attorney's Office in the above-referenced matter during the two month period specified above. ENDORSEMENT: Without obligation, the invoice is approved for payment. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 8/2/2011) (jfe) (Entered: 08/02/2011)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1275 Filed: 7/6/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMARY ORDER: On May 4, 2011, I granted a motion to extend the administrator's term of monitorship to October 31, 2012. Order Extending Term of Monitor to October 31, 2012, United States v. Local 1804-1, In'l Longshoremen's Assoc., 90 Civ. 963 (Doc. No. 1270) (S.D.N.Y. May 4,2011). That Order resolved the motion to extend the term of monitors hip. The Clerk is directed to terminate that motion (Doc. No. 1268). (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/6/11) (laq) (Entered: 07/07/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1274 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Bob from Stephen R. Max dated 2/28/2011 re: Enclosed is my invoice for services performed from 2/1/2011 to 2/28/2011 in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/2011) (tro) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Bob from Stephen R. Max dated 3/31/2011 re: Enclosed is my invoice for services performed from 3/1/2011 to 3/31/2011 in this matter. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/2011) (tro) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1272 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Mr. McGuire from Robert C. Stewart dated 4/15/2011 re: Attached is my invoice for professional services provided at your direction in this action during the past two month period. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/19/2011) (tro) (Entered: 05/19/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1271 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER. NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the authority of the Administrator established pursuant to the January 2003 Order, as modified by the December 8, 2008, and July 1, 2010, Orders is hereby extended pending a decision by the Court on the Government's motion to extend the Administrator's term for an additional eighteen months. ENDORSEMENT: So ordered, nunc pro tunc, as of May 1, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/3/11); May 3rd signature date as per Chambers. (djc) (Entered: 05/05/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1270 Filed: 5/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER EXTENDING TERM OF MONITOR TO OCTOBER 31, 2012, that the term of the Administrator is extended for an additional eighteen-month period, from April 30, 2011, until October 31, 2012, during which time the Administrator retains all authority set forth in the January 30, 2003, Order, as modified by the Court's Orders dated December 8, 2008, and July 1, 2010. ENDORSEMENT: Nuc Pro Tunc, as of May 1, 2011. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 5/3/11) (pl) (Entered: 05/04/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1269 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 1268 MOTION for Extending the term of the Administrator for Local 1588, International Longshoreman's Association. Document filed by United States of America. (mbe) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1268 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extending the term of the Administrator for Local 1588, International Longshoreman's Association. Document filed by United States of America.(mbe) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1267 Filed: 4/25/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Robert J. McGuire. (mbe) (Entered: 04/26/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1266 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire dated 3/3/2011 re: Invoice submissions. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 3/16/2011) (rjm) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1265 Filed: 1/15/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Robert J. McGuire, Date Illegible, re: Pursuant to paragraph 6 (Compensation and Expenses) and paragraph 3(t) (Hiring Authority) ofthe Court Order relating to Local 1588 of the International Longshoremen's Association, I submit invoices covering the months of October and November 2010 for Robert C. Stewart and October 2010 for Stephen R. Max. In accordance with Your Honor's directions, the enclosed invoice was sent to James Cohen, Counsel for Local 1588, on December 9, 2010, requesting that any objections be forwarded to me within two weeks. I have not received any comments or objections as of this date. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 1/14/2011) (lnl) (Entered: 01/18/2011)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1264 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on INVOICE, dated 9/30/10 for expenses totaling $1,275.00. ENDORSEMENT: Without objection, the invoice is approved for payment. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 12/1/10) (cd) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1263 Filed: 9/2/2010, Entered: 9/2/2010 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1262 Filed: 7/27/2010, Entered: 7/27/2010 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1261 Filed: 7/1/2010, Entered: 7/2/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1260 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: 6/25/2010 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1259 Filed: 6/1/2010, Entered: 6/1/2010 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1258 Filed: 4/30/2010, Entered: 4/30/2010 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1257 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1256 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: 4/29/2010 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1255 Filed: 4/16/2010, Entered: 4/16/2010 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1254 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: 3/4/2010 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1253 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: 2/24/2010 Consent Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1252 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: 2/22/2010 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1251 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1250 Filed: 11/20/2009, Entered: 11/20/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1249 Filed: 9/24/2009, Entered: 9/24/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1248 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: 8/19/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1247 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: 7/8/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1246 Filed: 5/14/2009, Entered: 5/19/2009 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1245 Filed: 5/7/2009, Entered: 5/7/2009 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1244 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: 3/9/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1243 Filed: 2/6/2009, Entered: 2/6/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1242 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: 1/12/2009 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1241 Filed: 12/8/2008, Entered: 12/8/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1240 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1239 Filed: 10/30/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1238 Filed: 10/31/2008, Entered: 10/31/2008 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1237 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/22/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1236 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1235 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1234 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1233 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/27/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1232 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1231 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1230 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1229 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1228 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1227 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1226 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1225 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1224 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/19/2008 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1223 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1222 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1221 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1220 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1219 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1218 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1217 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1216 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1215 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1214 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1213 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1212 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1211 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1210 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1209 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1207 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/26/2007 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1206 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1205 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1204 Filed: 6/6/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1203 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1202 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1201 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1200 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/6/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1199 Filed: 2/15/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1197 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1196 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1195 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1194 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1193 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: 1/8/2007 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1192 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1191 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1190 Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: 11/22/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1189 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/26/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1188 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1187 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1186 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1185 Filed: 10/19/2006, Entered: 10/20/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1184 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1183 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1182 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1181 Filed: 9/7/2006, Entered: 9/8/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1180 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: 9/7/2006 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1179 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1178 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1177 Filed: 8/22/2006, Entered: 8/23/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1176 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1175 Filed: 8/17/2006, Entered: 8/18/2006 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1174 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1173 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1172 Filed: 7/17/2006, Entered: 7/17/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1171 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: 6/22/2006 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1170 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1169 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1168 Filed: 6/8/2006, Entered: 6/9/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1167 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1166 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1165 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: 5/8/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1164 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1163 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1162 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: 4/3/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1161 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1160 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1159 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1158 Filed: 3/23/2006, Entered: 3/24/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1157 Filed: 2/16/2006, Entered: 2/16/2006 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1156 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1155 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1154 Filed: 1/24/2006, Entered: 1/24/2006 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1153 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1152 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1151 Filed: 12/19/2005, Entered: 12/19/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1150 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1149 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1148 Filed: 11/2/2005, Entered: 11/3/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1147 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1146 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1145 Filed: 10/7/2005, Entered: 10/11/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1144 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1143 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1142 Filed: 9/9/2005, Entered: 9/14/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1141 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1140 Filed: 8/31/2005, Entered: 9/1/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1139 Filed: 8/30/2005, Entered: 8/31/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1138 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: 8/8/2005 Consent Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1137 Filed: 7/15/2005, Entered: 7/19/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1136 Filed: 7/11/2005, Entered: 7/13/2005 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1135 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: 6/28/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1134 Filed: 6/16/2005, Entered: 6/20/2005 Memo Endorsement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1133 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1132 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: 6/7/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1131 Filed: 5/24/2005, Entered: 5/25/2005 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1130 Filed: 5/16/2005, Entered: 5/17/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1129 Filed: 4/4/2005, Entered: 4/6/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1128 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: 3/21/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1127 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: 3/7/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1126 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: 2/14/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1125 Filed: 1/5/2005, Entered: 1/13/2005 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1124 Filed: 12/22/2004, Entered: 12/28/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1123 Filed: 12/8/2004, Entered: 12/13/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1122 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: 10/26/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1121 Filed: 9/17/2004, Entered: 9/21/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 9/14/2004, Entered: 9/15/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1119 Filed: 9/8/2004, Entered: 9/8/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1118 Filed: 9/2/2004, Entered: 9/2/2004 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1117 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1116 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1115 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1114 Filed: 8/9/2004, Entered: 8/9/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1113 Filed: 7/28/2004, Entered: 7/29/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1112 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1111 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1110 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1109 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: 7/22/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1108 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1107 Filed: 6/30/2004, Entered: 7/7/2004 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1106 Filed: 6/17/2004, Entered: 6/21/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1105 Filed: 6/4/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Affidavit of Service Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1104 Filed: 6/7/2004, Entered: 6/8/2004 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1103 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: 5/25/2004 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1102 Filed: 5/14/2004, Entered: 5/17/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1101 Filed: 4/12/2004, Entered: 4/14/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1100 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/19/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1099 Filed: 3/11/2004, Entered: 3/16/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1098 Filed: 2/9/2004, Entered: 2/13/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1097 Filed: 1/6/2004, Entered: 1/30/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1096 Filed: 12/17/2003, Entered: 1/5/2004 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1095 Filed: 11/3/2003, Entered: 11/21/2003 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1094 Filed: 11/13/2003, Entered: 11/18/2003 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1093 Filed: 10/21/2003, Entered: 10/23/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1092 Filed: 8/29/2003, Entered: 9/3/2003 Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1091 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: 7/31/2003 Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1090 Filed: 6/3/2003, Entered: 6/17/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1089 Filed: 5/29/2003, Entered: 6/2/2003 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1088 Filed: 5/16/2003, Entered: 5/19/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1087 Filed: 5/12/2003, Entered: 5/15/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1086 Filed: 5/13/2003, Entered: 5/13/2003 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1085 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1084 Filed: 5/6/2003, Entered: 5/7/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1083 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 5/2/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1082 Filed: 3/31/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1081 Filed: 3/28/2003, Entered: 4/1/2003 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1080 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/27/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1079 Filed: 3/24/2003, Entered: 3/26/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1078 Filed: 3/4/2003, Entered: 3/4/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1077 Filed: 2/24/2003, Entered: 2/26/2003 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1076 Filed: 2/20/2003, Entered: 2/21/2003 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1075 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: 2/10/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1074 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 2/5/2003 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1073 Filed: 1/29/2003, Entered: 2/4/2003 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1072 Filed: 1/28/2003, Entered: 1/31/2003 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1071 Filed: 1/30/2003, Entered: 1/30/2003 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1070 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1069 Filed: 1/22/2003, Entered: 1/27/2003 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1068 Filed: 12/27/2002, Entered: 1/2/2003 Memorandum to the Docket Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1067 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1066 Filed: 12/20/2002, Entered: 12/30/2002 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1065 Filed: 12/23/2002, Entered: 12/26/2002 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1064 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1063 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1062 Filed: 12/6/2002, Entered: 12/11/2002 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1061 Filed: 8/19/2002, Entered: 8/22/2002 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1060 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: 7/19/2001 Order of Dismissal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1059 Filed: 5/25/2001, Entered: 6/1/2001 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1058 Filed: 8/3/2000, Entered: 8/3/2000 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1057 Filed: 5/10/2000, Entered: 5/11/2000 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1056 Filed: 1/26/2000, Entered: 1/27/2000 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1055 Filed: 10/5/1999, Entered: 10/12/1999 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1054 Filed: 9/20/1999, Entered: 9/22/1999 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1053 Filed: 7/30/1999, Entered: 8/2/1999 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1052 Filed: 7/19/1999, Entered: 7/20/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1051 Filed: 7/7/1999, Entered: 7/7/1999 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1050 Filed: 7/1/1999, Entered: 7/6/1999 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1049 Filed: 6/28/1999, Entered: 6/30/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1048 Filed: 5/13/1999, Entered: 5/14/1999 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1047 Filed: 12/18/1998, Entered: 12/21/1998 Administrative Closing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1046 Filed: 5/19/1998, Entered: 5/20/1998 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1045 Filed: 12/11/1997, Entered: 12/12/1997 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1044 Filed: 11/17/1997, Entered: 11/19/1997 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1043 Filed: 11/13/1997, Entered: 11/14/1997 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1042 Filed: 7/15/1997, Entered: 7/15/1997 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1041 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: 6/30/1997 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1040 Filed: 6/5/1997, Entered: 6/6/1997 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1039 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1038 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: 5/16/1997 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1037 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: 5/8/1997 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1034 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: 4/16/1997 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1033 Filed: 4/3/1997, Entered: 4/7/1997 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1032 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: 3/18/1997 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1031 Filed: 3/10/1997, Entered: 3/10/1997 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1030 Filed: 12/24/1996, Entered: 12/26/1996 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1029 Filed: 10/10/1996, Entered: 10/16/1996 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1028 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1027 Filed: 10/1/1996, Entered: 10/8/1996 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1026 Filed: 7/26/1996, Entered: 7/30/1996 Appeal Reinstated
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1025 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 6/11/1996 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1024 Filed: 5/22/1996, Entered: 5/29/1996 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1023 Filed: 5/21/1996, Entered: 5/22/1996 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1022 Filed: 5/1/1996, Entered: 5/10/1996 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1021 Filed: 4/18/1996, Entered: 4/19/1996 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1020 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/15/1996 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1019 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Judgment*
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1017 Filed: 4/10/1996, Entered: 4/11/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1016 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1015 Filed: 3/25/1996, Entered: 3/26/1996 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 3/13/1996, Entered: 3/14/1996 Acknowledgment of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1013 Filed: 3/11/1996, Entered: 3/12/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1012 Filed: 2/29/1996, Entered: 3/4/1996 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1011 Filed: 2/22/1996, Entered: 2/23/1996 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1010 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1009 Filed: 2/14/1996, Entered: 2/15/1996 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1008 Filed: 1/30/1996, Entered: 2/1/1996 Memorandum and Opinion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1007 Filed: 1/23/1996, Entered: 1/30/1996 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1006 Filed: 1/22/1996, Entered: 1/23/1996 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1005 Filed: 1/3/1996, Entered: 1/4/1996 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1004 Filed: 12/13/1995, Entered: 12/14/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1003 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1002 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1001 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1000 Filed: 12/8/1995, Entered: 12/12/1995 Motion for Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/11/1995 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 998 Filed: 12/1/1995, Entered: 12/8/1995 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 997 Filed: 11/28/1995, Entered: 12/6/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 996 Filed: 12/5/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 995 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 994 Filed: 11/22/1995, Entered: 12/5/1995 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 11/10/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 11/10/1995, Entered: 11/21/1995 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 10/9/1995, Entered: 11/17/1995 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 11/2/1995, Entered: 11/13/1995 Consent Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 989 Filed: 10/16/1995, Entered: 10/18/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 10/5/1995, Entered: 10/5/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 987 Filed: 9/29/1995, Entered: 10/4/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 986 Filed: 9/25/1995, Entered: 10/3/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 985 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/30/1995 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 984 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/30/1995 Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 9/22/1995, Entered: 9/30/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 982 Filed: 9/20/1995, Entered: 9/27/1995 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 981 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 980 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 979 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 978 Filed: 9/15/1995, Entered: 9/19/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 977 Filed: 9/7/1995, Entered: 9/15/1995 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 9/14/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 975 Filed: 8/28/1995, Entered: 8/28/1995 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 974 Filed: 8/18/1995, Entered: 8/24/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 973 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 972 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/14/1995 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 971 Filed: 8/8/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 8/10/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 969 Filed: 8/7/1995, Entered: 8/10/1995 Order to Show Cause
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 968 Filed: 8/3/1995, Entered: 8/9/1995 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 967 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 966 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 965 Filed: 8/1/1995, Entered: 8/1/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 964 Filed: 7/27/1995, Entered: 7/31/1995 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 963 Filed: 7/28/1995, Entered: 7/31/1995 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 962 Filed: 6/19/1995, Entered: 6/23/1995 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 961 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 5/15/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 959 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 958 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 957 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 956 Filed: 5/11/1995, Entered: 5/18/1995 Remark
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 955 Filed: 4/27/1995, Entered: 5/2/1995 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 954 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 953 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 952 Filed: 4/20/1995, Entered: 4/26/1995 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 951 Filed: 4/14/1995, Entered: 4/14/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: 4/5/1995 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/29/1995 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 948 Filed: 3/28/1995, Entered: 3/28/1995 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 947 Filed: 3/21/1995, Entered: 3/21/1995 USCA Mandate Withdrawing Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 946 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/14/1995 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 945 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 943 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 942 Filed: 3/1/1995, Entered: 3/1/1995 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 941 Filed: 2/17/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 940 Filed: 2/16/1995, Entered: 2/21/1995 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 939 Filed: 2/2/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 937 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 936 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 935 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/24/1995 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 934 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/11/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 933 Filed: 1/10/1995, Entered: 1/10/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 932 Filed: 1/4/1995, Entered: 1/9/1995 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 931 Filed: 12/22/1994, Entered: 1/5/1995 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 930 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/3/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 929 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/3/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 928 Filed: 12/30/1994, Entered: 1/3/1995 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 12/15/1994, Entered: 12/19/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 926 Filed: 12/8/1994, Entered: 12/16/1994 Objection (non-motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 925 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 924 Filed: 12/12/1994, Entered: 12/14/1994 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 923 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994 Report and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 922 Filed: 11/30/1994, Entered: 12/6/1994 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 921 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/6/1994 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 920 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 919 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 918 Filed: 11/21/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 917 Filed: 9/28/1994, Entered: 11/23/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 916 Filed: 11/10/1994, Entered: 11/15/1994 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 915 Filed: 11/4/1994, Entered: 11/10/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 914 Filed: 10/27/1994, Entered: 11/4/1994 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 913 Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/25/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 912 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: 10/6/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 911 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 10/6/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 910 Filed: 9/30/1994, Entered: 10/4/1994 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 9/30/1994, Entered: 10/4/1994 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 908 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 10/3/1994 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 907 Filed: 9/26/1994, Entered: 10/3/1994 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 906 Filed: 9/29/1994, Entered: 9/29/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994 Affidavit of Service Complaints
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 904 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 903 Filed: 9/23/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 9/27/1994, Entered: 9/27/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 901 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 900 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 899 Filed: 9/9/1994, Entered: 9/13/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 898 Filed: 8/26/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 897 Filed: 8/26/1994, Entered: 8/29/1994 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 896 Filed: 8/25/1994, Entered: 8/26/1994 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 895 Filed: 8/18/1994, Entered: 8/18/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 894 Filed: 8/18/1994, Entered: 8/18/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 893 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 8/5/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 890 Filed: 8/3/1994, Entered: 8/9/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 889 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 887 Filed: 7/29/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 8/1/1994, Entered: 8/5/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 7/26/1994, Entered: 7/27/1994 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 7/19/1994, Entered: 7/22/1994 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 882 Filed: 7/6/1994, Entered: 7/14/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 881 Filed: 7/12/1994, Entered: 7/12/1994 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 880 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/8/1994 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 879 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/8/1994 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 878 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/8/1994 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/8/1994 Declaration in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/8/1994 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 875 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 7/8/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 6/27/1994, Entered: 7/6/1994 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 873 Filed: 6/28/1994, Entered: 7/5/1994 Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 872 Filed: 6/29/1994, Entered: 6/29/1994 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 871 Filed: 3/23/1994, Entered: 6/29/1994 Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 6/21/1994, Entered: 6/28/1994 Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Index
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 869 Filed: 6/23/1994, Entered: 6/24/1994 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 868 Filed: 6/16/1994, Entered: 6/17/1994 Notice of cross-appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 6/15/1994, Entered: 6/15/1994 USCA Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 866 Filed: 6/8/1994, Entered: 6/10/1994 Stipulation and Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 865 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/10/1994 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 864 Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 863 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/6/1994 Reply Memorandum of Law
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/2/1994, Entered: 6/3/1994 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 5/25/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 860 Filed: 5/18/1994, Entered: 5/31/1994 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 859 Filed: 5/24/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 858 Filed: 5/24/1994, Entered: 5/25/1994 Declaration in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 857 Filed: 5/6/1994, Entered: 5/23/1994 Endorsed Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 856 Filed: 5/20/1994, Entered: 5/23/1994 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 855 Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/12/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 854 Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/12/1994 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?